Collins v. United Airlines Inc.

Case Number: M:2006cv01793
Filed: October 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2009 358 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Fees. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/10/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
March 13, 2009 350 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 349 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Ronald H. Cowan, Attorney Jennie Lee Anderson and Lori Erin Andrus terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/13/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
December 16, 2008 339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 331 Motion for Leave to File motion for reconsideration. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 10, 2008 338 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 333 . Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/10/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008) Modified on 12/15/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2008 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER awarding fees and costs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/31/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 2, 2008 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/2/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 17, 2008 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting hearing re 272 Stipulation filed by All Plaintiffs, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 272 Stipulation, 270 MOTION to Quash Depositions. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/17/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. United Airlines Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?