Trentadue v. FBI, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellee: JESSE CARL TRENTADUE
Defendant - Appellant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION and FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION'S OKLAHOMA CITY FIELD OFFICE
Case Number: 08-4207
Filed: November 6, 2008
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 2, 2009 Trentadue v. FBI, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2009 [9714080] Case file closed. Shipment to records center due 10/22/2012.
August 24, 2009 Filing 25 [9686886] Mandate issued.
July 2, 2009 Filing 24 [9672158] Judgment for opinion filed.
July 2, 2009 Filing 23 [9672157] Reversed. Terminated on the merits after oral hearing. Written, signed, published. Judges Tacha, Ebel and Hartz (authoring Judge). Mandate to issue.
July 2, 2009 [9672150] Order filed by Judges Tacha, Ebel and Hartz denying Appellee's motion to supplement the record on appeal, and Appellant's motion to file supplemental appendix. This is a text-only entry. See termination entry of 07/02/09 for order issued.
March 9, 2009 Filing 21 [9640560] Case argued by Nicholas Bagley for the Appellant; Jesse Trentadue for the Appellee; and submitted to Judges Tacha, Ebel and Hartz.
February 19, 2009 Filing 20 [9635607] Appellee's motion to supplement the record on appeal filed by Mr. Jesse C. Trentadue. Served on 02/16/2009. Manner of Service: US mail.
January 30, 2009 Filing 19 [9630799] Calendar notice sent to counsel. Arguments to be held Monday, March 9, 2009, at 1:00 p.m., in Courtroom III, Byron White U.S. Courthouse, Denver, CO. Counsel is required to go to http://www.ca10.uscourts.gov under the argument calendar tab to obtain an important notice regarding calendared cases and required forms that must be completed and returned to the clerk's office within 10 days.
January 29, 2009 [9631198] Sealed Supplemental Appendix and 2 DVD's received from Federal Bureau Of Investigation and Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office but not filed pending ruling on motion to file supplemental appendix. Original and 1 copy. Served on 01/29/2009. Manner of Service: US mail.
January 29, 2009 Filing 17 [9631197] Appellant's reply brief filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation and Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office. Original and 7 copies. Served on 01/29/2009. Manner of Service: US mail.
January 29, 2009 Filing 16 [9630432] Appellant's motion to file supplemental appendix. Served on 01/29/2009. Manner of Service: US mail.
January 12, 2009 Filing 15 [9626519] Appellee's brief filed by Mr. Jesse C. Trentadue. Original and 7 copies. Served on: 01/12/2009. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? n. Appellant's reply brief is due 1/29/09 (per the court's 11/26/09 order.)
December 15, 2008 Filing 14 [9619817] Appellant brief filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation and Federal Bureau of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office. Original and 7 copies. Served on 12/15/2008 by email. Oral argument requested? y. Appendix filed. Original and 1 copy. Appendix pages: 1313 (in 4 volumes). Appellee's brief due 1/14/09 as previously scheduled in this court's 11/26/08 order.
December 1, 2008 Filing 13 [9615552] Order filed by Clerk of the Court (lss) referring Appellee's Motion to Waive Oral Argument [9615519-2]. Appellee's Unopposed Motion for Expedited Consideration [9615514-2], and appellant's Statement Requesting Oral Argument [9615138-2] to the panel on the merits. Served on 12/01/2008.
December 1, 2008 Filing 12 [9615519] Appellee's motion to waive Oral Argument. filed by Mr. Jesse C. Trentadue. Served on 11/30/2008. Manner of Service: US mail.
December 1, 2008 Filing 11 [9615514] Appellee's (response to 11/26/08 order) motion Unopposed Motion for Expedited Consideration filed by Mr. Jesse C. Trentadue. Served on 11/30/2008. Manner of Service: US mail.
November 26, 2008 Filing 10 [9615344] Notice received from Federal Bureau Of Investigation and Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal.
November 26, 2008 Filing 9 [9615138] Response to 11/26/08 order indicating request for oral argument filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation and Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office. Served on 11/26/2008. Manner of Service: US mail.
November 26, 2008 Filing 8 [9615048] Order filed by Clerk of the Court (lss) granting Appellant's motion to expedite case. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 12/15/2008 for Federal Bureau Of Investigation and Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office; Appellee's brief due 01/14/2009 for Jesse C. Trentadue; Appellant's reply brief due 01/29/2009 by Federal Bureau Of Investigation and Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office. The parties, either jointly or separately, must file a either (1) a request for oral argument which addresses the issues presented in F.R.A.P. 34 and 10th Circuit Rule 34, or (2) a motion to waive oral argument and submit the appeal on the briefs on or before 12/08/2008 for Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office and Jesse C. Trentadue. Served on 11/26/2008.
November 24, 2008 Filing 7 [9614352] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 11/24/2008. Manner of Service:. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/05/2009 for Federal Bureau Of Investigation and Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office.
November 21, 2008 Filing 6 [9613908] Appellants' motion filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation and Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office to expedite case. Served on 11/21/2008. Manner of Service: US mail.
November 20, 2008 Filing 5 [9613767] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Jesse C. Trentadue. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/17/2008. Manner of Service: US mail
November 18, 2008 Filing 4 [9612733] Case referred for mediation conferencing. Please open the document link in this notice for additional information.
November 14, 2008 Filing 3 [9612138] Docketing statement filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation and Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office. Served on 11/14/2008. Manner of Service: US mail.
November 14, 2008 Filing 2 [9612133] Notice of appearance filed by Nicholas Bagley for Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office and Federal Bureau Of Investigation. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 11/14/2008. Manner of Service: US mail.
November 6, 2008 Filing 1 [9610450] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/05/2008 Docketing statement due 11/21/2008 for Federal Bureau Of Investigation and Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office. Transcript order form due 11/21/2008 for Carlie Christensen. Notice of appearance due on 11/21/2008 for Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Federal Bureau Of Investigation's Oklahoma City Field Office and Jesse C. Trentadue.

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Trentadue v. FBI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: JESSE CARL TRENTADUE
Represented By: Jesse Carl Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: Nicholas Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION'S OKLAHOMA CITY FIELD OFFICE
Represented By: Nicholas Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?