Beicker, et al v. Hickenlooper
Petitioner: LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN MINOR, Sheriff of Summit County, GABRIEL DAVID JOINER, Sheriff of Cheyenne County, TONY SPURLOCK, Sheriff of Douglas County, JUSTIN SMITH, Sheriff of Larimer County, DAVID A. WEAVER, Sheriff of Douglas County, JAMES (JIM) CASIAS, Sheriff of Las Animas County, JAMES CRONE, Sheriff of Morgan County, DONALD KRUEGER, Sheriff of Clear Creek County, DAVID C. WALCHER, Sheriff of Arapahoe County, MICHAEL T. MCINTOSH, Sheriff of Adams County, BRIAN E. NORTON, Sheriff of Rio Grande County, ANTHONY MAZZOLA, Sheriff of Rio Blanco County, DOMINIC MATTIVI, JR., Sheriff of Ouray County, TIM JANTZ, Sheriff of Moffat County, ROD FENSKE, Sheriff of Lake County, STEVE REAMS, Sheriff of Weld County, JOHN B. COOKE, Sheriff of Weld County, CHRIS S. JOHNSON, Sheriff of Otero County, CHARLES "ROB" URBACH, Sheriff of Phillips County, LOU VALLARIO, Sheriff of Garfiled County, BRUCE W. HARTMAN, Sheriff of Gilpin County, DUKE SCHIRARD, Sheriff of La Plata County, BRUCE CONRAD, Sheriff of San Juan County, FRED D. MCKEE, Sheriff of Delta County, MIKE ENSMINGER, Sheriff of Teller County, DAVE STONG, Sheriff of Alamosa County, SI WOODRUFF, Sheriff of Rio Blanco County, JOHN "SMOKY" KURTZ, Sheriff of Crowley County, MIKE NORRIS, Sheriff of Saguache County, RICHARD A. ALBERS, Sheriff of Clear Creek County, DAVID D. CAMPBELL, Sheriff of Baca County, MILES CLARK, Sheriff of Crowley County, BILL ELDER, Sheriff of El Paso County, TED B. MINK, Sheriff of Jefferson County, SHAWN MOBLEY, Sheriff of Otero County, RICHARD VALDEZ, Sheriff of Archuleta County, DAVID ENCINIAS, Sheriff of Bent County, JEFF SHRADER, Sheriff of Jefferson County, K. C. HUME, Sheriff of Moffat County, SUE KURTZ, Sheriff of San Juan County, KEN PUTNAM, Sheriff of Cheyenne County, LARRY KUNTZ, Sheriff of Washington County, RONALD BRUCE, Sheriff of Hinsdale County, JON STIVERS, Sheriff of Washington County, RICK DUNLAP, Sheriff of Montrose County, SEAN MICHAEL SMITH, Sheriff of La Plata County, CASEY SHERIDAN, Sheriff of Kiowa County, STEVE NOWLIN, Sheriff of Montezuma County, RICK BESECKER, Sheriff of Gunnison County, TOM NESTOR, Sheriff of Lincoln County, JIM BEICKER, Sheriff of Fremont County, BRETT L. POWELL, Sheriff of Logan County, PETER GONZALEZ, Sheriff of Archuleta County, ROBERT JACKSON, Sheriff of Alamosa County, DOUGLAS N. DARR, Sheriff of Adams County, TERRY MAKETA, Sheriff of El Paso County, FRED WEGENER, Sheriff of Park County, CHAD DAY, Sheriff of Yuma County, DAVID STRUMILLO, FRED JOBE, Sheriff of Custer County, GARRETT WIGGINS, Sheriff of Routt County, BRETT SCHROETLIN, Sheriff of Grand County, GRAYSON ROBINSON, Sheriff of Arapahoe County, ret., JERRY MARTIN, Sheriff of Dolores County, AMOS MEDINA, Sheriff of Costilla County, SCOTT FISCHER, Sheriff of Jackson County, SAM ZORDEL, Sheriff of Prowers County, TOM RIDNOUR, Sheriff of Kit Carson County, RODNEY JOHNSON, Sheriff of Grand County, RANDY PECK, Sheriff of Sedgwick County, JAMES FAULL, Sheriff of Prowers County, DAN WARWICK, Sheriff of Saguache County, FRED HOSSELKUS, Sheriff of Mineral County, BRUCE NEWMAN, Sheriff of Huerfano County, FORREST FRAZEE, Sheriff of Kiowa County, SHAYNE HEAP, Sheriff of Elbert County, SHANNON KEITH BYERLY, Sheriff of Custer County, DENNIS SPRUELL, Sheriff of Montezuma County and THOMAS JAMES HANNA, Sheriff of Sedgwick County
Amicus Curiae: LAW ENFORCEMENT ACTION NETWORK, STATE OF MARYLAND, NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION, COLORADO POLICE PROTECTIVE ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA RIFLE & PISTOL ASSOCIATION, DISABLED SPORTSMEN OF NORTH AMERICA, KANSAS STATE RIFLE ASSOCIATION, EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF ILLINOIS, WESTERN SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION, BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, STATE OF WASHINGTON, LEAGUE OF KENTUCKY SPORTSMEN, STATE OF OREGON, CALGUNS SHOOTING SPORTS ASSOCIATION, SECOND AMENDMENT SISTERS, LAW ENFORCEMENT ALLIANCE OF AMERICA, INC., CONGRESS OF RACIAL EQUALITY, ILLINOIS STATE RIFLE ASSOCIATION, STATE OF IOWA, PINK PISTOLS, STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS, LAW ENFORCEMENT LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, GUN OWNERS OF CALIFORNIA, INTERNATIONAL LAW ENFORCEMENT EDUCATORS AND TRAINERS ASSOCIATION, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF HAWAII and WOMEN AGAINST GUN CONTROL
Defendant / Appellee: JOHN W. HICKENLOOPER, Govenor of the State of Colorado
Case Number: 14-1292
Filed: July 29, 2014
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2016 [10364209] Mandate issued. [14-1290, 14-1292]
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order [10355334] Order filed by Judges Holmes, McHugh and Moritz granting Appellants' motion to extend time to file a petition for rehearing. The petition for rehearing, if any, shall be filed by 4/22/16. Served on 03/31/2016. [14-1290, 14-1292]
March 30, 2016 [10355060] Motion filed by Appellants David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry, All Plaintiffs-Appellants in 14-1292 to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 04/22/2016. Served on: 03/30/2016. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
March 22, 2016 [10352912] Judgment for opinion filed. [14-1290, 14-1292]
March 22, 2016 [10352903] Affirmed in Part and Vacated in Part and Remanded.Terminated on the merits after oral hearing. Written, signed, published.. Judges Holmes, McHugh and Moritz (author). Mandate to issue. [14-1290, 14-1292]
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order [10352897] Order filed by Judges Holmes, McHugh and Moritz as found in the published opinion denying motion to strike filed by Appellee Mr. John W. Hickenlooper. Text only entry. See case termination for published opinion. [14-1290, 14-1292]
March 7, 2016 [10348753] Supplemental authority filed by Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292. Served on 03/07/2016. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292] MDG
February 15, 2016 [10342972] Response filed by Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292 to Appellants' Notice of Supplemental Authority. Served on 02/15/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] MDG
February 8, 2016 [10341387] Supplemental authority filed by David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry. Served on 02/08/2016. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
December 8, 2015 [10325602] Supplemental authority filed by David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry. Served on 12/08/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
October 26, 2015 [10313742] Response filed by Mr. Richard A. Albers, Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. Shannon Keith Byerly, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. Bruce Conrad, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, Mr. Bill Elder, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Thomas James Hanna, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. K. C. Hume, Robert Jackson, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Mr. Gabriel David Joiner, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Mr. John "Smoky" Kurtz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Mr. Jerry Martin, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Anthony Mazzola, Mr. Michael T. McIntosh, Mr. Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Shawn Mobley, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Bruce Newman, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Steve Nowlin, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Steve Reams, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Brett Schroetlin, Mr. Casey Sheridan, Mr. Jeff Shrader, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Sean Michael Smith, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Tony Spurlock, Mr. Jon Stivers, Mr. Dave Stong, Mr. David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Richard Valdez, Mr. Lou Vallario, Mr. David C. Walcher, Mr. Dan Warwick, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Garrett Wiggins, Mr. Si Woodruff and Mr. Sam Zordel to Supplemental authority filed by Mr. John W. Hickenlooper. Served on 10/26/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1292, 14-1290] JGG
October 21, 2015 [10312710] Supplemental authority filed by Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292. Served on 10/21/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292] MDG
September 28, 2015 [10306027] Case argued by Richard Westfall and David Kopel for the Appellants; Matthew Grove for the Appellee; and submitted to Judges Holmes, McHugh and Moritz. [14-1290, 14-1292]
September 24, 2015 [10304973] Supplemental authority filed by Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292. Served on 09/24/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292] KS
September 22, 2015 [10304417] Supplemental authority filed by David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry. Served on 09/22/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
September 10, 2015 [10301446] Supplemental authority filed by Mr. Richard A. Albers, Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. Shannon Keith Byerly, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. Bruce Conrad, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, Mr. Bill Elder, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Thomas James Hanna, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. K. C. Hume, Robert Jackson, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Mr. Gabriel David Joiner, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Mr. John "Smoky" Kurtz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Mr. Jerry Martin, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Anthony Mazzola, Mr. Michael T. McIntosh, Mr. Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Shawn Mobley, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Bruce Newman, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Steve Nowlin, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Steve Reams, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Brett Schroetlin, Mr. Casey Sheridan, Mr. Jeff Shrader, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Sean Michael Smith, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Tony Spurlock, Mr. Jon Stivers, Mr. Dave Stong, Mr. David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Richard Valdez, Mr. Lou Vallario, Mr. David C. Walcher, Mr. Dan Warwick, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Garrett Wiggins, Mr. Si Woodruff and Mr. Sam Zordel. Served on 09/10/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1292, 14-1290] JGG
July 22, 2015 [10288485] Order filed by the Clerk at the direction of the Court - Granting Attorney motion to enlarge time for argument in 14-1290/1292. Each side will have up to 30 minutes for oral argument on September 28, 2015 in Denver, Colorado. Served on 07/22/2015. [14-1290, 14-1292]
July 15, 2015 [10286893] Oral Argument Acknowledgment Form filed by Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292. Served on 07/15/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292] MDG
July 14, 2015 [10286728] Motion filed by Appellants David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry to enlarge time for oral argument. Served on: 07/14/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
July 13, 2015 [10286168] Oral Argument Acknowledgment Form filed by Mr. Richard A. Albers, Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. Shannon Keith Byerly, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. Bruce Conrad, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, Mr. Bill Elder, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Thomas James Hanna, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. K. C. Hume, Robert Jackson, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Mr. Gabriel David Joiner, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Mr. John "Smoky" Kurtz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Mr. Jerry Martin, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Anthony Mazzola, Mr. Michael T. McIntosh, Mr. Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Shawn Mobley, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Bruce Newman, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Steve Nowlin, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Steve Reams, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Brett Schroetlin, Mr. Casey Sheridan, Mr. Jeff Shrader, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Sean Michael Smith, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Tony Spurlock, Mr. Jon Stivers, Mr. Dave Stong, Mr. David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Richard Valdez, Mr. Lou Vallario, Mr. David C. Walcher, Mr. Dan Warwick, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Garrett Wiggins, Mr. Si Woodruff and Mr. Sam Zordel. Served on 07/13/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1292, 14-1290] DK
July 13, 2015 [10286153] Oral Argument Acknowledgment Form filed by David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry. Served on 07/13/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292] RAW
July 13, 2015 [10285958] Calendar notice sent to counsel. Arguments to be held on 09/28/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom I, in the Byron White United States Courthouse, Denver, CO. Counsel is required to go to http://www.ca10.uscourts.gov under the argument calendar tab to obtain an important notice regarding calendared cases and required forms. The calendar acknowledgment form must be completed and filed with the clerk via Electronic Case Filing within 10 days of today's date. Amici may not argue unless prior written consent is given by the court. [14-1290, 14-1292]
July 13, 2015 [10285901] Calendar notice sent to counsel. Arguments to be held on 09/28/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom I, Byron White United States Courthouse, Denver, CO. Counsel is required to go to http://www.ca10.uscourts.gov under the argument calendar tab to obtain an important notice regarding calendared cases and required forms. The calendar acknowledgment form must be completed and filed with the clerk via Electronic Case Filing within 10 days of today's date. Counsel for amici do not appear at oral argument without permission of the court. [14-1290, 14-1292]
July 10, 2015 [10285571] Response filed by Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292 to Plaintiffs' July 2, 2015, Notice of Supplemental Authority. Served on 07/10/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] MDG
July 10, 2015 [10285451] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring appellants' reply in support of alternative motion to supplement the record [ # 10285398-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 07/10/2015. [14-1290, 14-1292]
July 9, 2015 [10285398] Reply filed by David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry to Appellants' Motion to Supplement Record. Served on 07/09/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
July 2, 2015 [10283903] Supplemental authority filed by Mr. Richard A. Albers, Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. Shannon Keith Byerly, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. Bruce Conrad, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, Mr. Bill Elder, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Thomas James Hanna, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. K. C. Hume, Robert Jackson, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Mr. Gabriel David Joiner, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Mr. John "Smoky" Kurtz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Mr. Jerry Martin, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Anthony Mazzola, Mr. Michael T. McIntosh, Mr. Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Shawn Mobley, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Bruce Newman, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Steve Nowlin, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Steve Reams, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Brett Schroetlin, Mr. Casey Sheridan, Mr. Jeff Shrader, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Sean Michael Smith, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Tony Spurlock, Mr. Jon Stivers, Mr. Dave Stong, Mr. David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Richard Valdez, Mr. Lou Vallario, Mr. David C. Walcher, Mr. Dan Warwick, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Garrett Wiggins, Mr. Si Woodruff and Mr. Sam Zordel. Served on 07/02/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1292, 14-1290] JGG
July 2, 2015 [10283876] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring Appellee's reply in support of his motion to strike 56 pages of evidence that were not presented to the district court, but which appellants attached to their reply briefs. The appellee is also opposed to the appellants supplementing the record with these items, to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time) [ # 10283811-2 ] . Served on 07/02/2015. [14-1290, 14-1292]
July 2, 2015 [10283811] Reply filed by Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292 to Appellant's Response to Motion to Strike. Served on 07/02/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] MDG
June 30, 2015 [10282959] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring Appellant's Response to Motion to Strike Appendices. . . [ # 10282780-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 06/30/2015. [14-1290, 14-1292]
June 29, 2015 [10282780] Response filed by David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry to Appellee's Motion to Strike Appendices and Associated Arguments in Reply Briefs. Served on 06/29/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
June 19, 2015 [10280552] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring the Governor's Motion to Strike Appendices and Associated Arguments in Reply Briefs [ # 10280476-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 06/19/2015. [14-1290, 14-1292]
June 19, 2015 [10280476] Motion filed by Appellee Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292 to strike Exhibit 1 to reply brief in Case No. 14-1290, and appendix to reply brief in Case No. 14-1292, and accompanying arguments in reply briefs. Served on: 06/19/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] MDG
May 29, 2015 [10275490] Appellant/Petitioner's reply brief filed by Mr. Richard A. Albers, Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. Shannon Keith Byerly, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. Bruce Conrad, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, Mr. Bill Elder, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Thomas James Hanna, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. K. C. Hume, Robert Jackson, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Mr. Gabriel David Joiner, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Mr. John "Smoky" Kurtz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Mr. Jerry Martin, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Anthony Mazzola, Mr. Michael T. McIntosh, Mr. Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Shawn Mobley, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Bruce Newman, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Steve Nowlin, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Steve Reams, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Brett Schroetlin, Mr. Casey Sheridan, Mr. Jeff Shrader, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Sean Michael Smith, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Tony Spurlock, Mr. Jon Stivers, Mr. Dave Stong, Mr. David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Richard Valdez, Mr. Lou Vallario, Mr. David C. Walcher, Mr. Dan Warwick, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Garrett Wiggins, Mr. Si Woodruff and Mr. Sam Zordel. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 05/29/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1292] JGG
May 22, 2015 [10273982] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee for appellants Mr. Jim Beicker, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/22/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1292]
May 22, 2015 [10273968] Notice of appearance submitted by Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee for Appellants Mr. Richard A. Albers, Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. Shannon Keith Byerly, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. Bruce Conrad, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, Mr. Bill Elder, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Thomas James Hanna, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. K. C. Hume, Robert Jackson, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Mr. Gabriel David Joiner, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Mr. John "Smoky" Kurtz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Mr. Jerry Martin, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Anthony Mazzola, Mr. Michael T. McIntosh, Mr. Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Shawn Mobley, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Bruce Newman, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Steve Nowlin, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Steve Reams, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Brett Schroetlin, Mr. Casey Sheridan, Mr. Jeff Shrader, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Sean Michael Smith, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Tony Spurlock, Mr. Jon Stivers, Mr. Dave Stong, Mr. David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Richard Valdez, Mr. Lou Vallario, Mr. David C. Walcher, Mr. Dan Warwick, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Garrett Wiggins, Mr. Si Woodruff and Mr. Sam Zordel for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/22/2015. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 05/22/2015 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [14-1292] JGG
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order [10273744] Order filed by Judges Briscoe, Matheson and Bacharach granting appellants motion to file oversized reply brief with a limit of up to 10,000 words. The reply brief shall still include a certification in accord with Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(7)(C). Served on 05/21/2015. [14-1292]
May 21, 2015 [10273721] Order filed at the direction of the Court granting appellants motion to extend time to file appellants reply brief. Appellant's optional reply brief now due 05/29/2015 for National Shooting Sports Foundation, Magpul Industries, USA Liberty Arms, Rocky Mountain Shooters Supply, 2nd Amendment Gunsmith & Shooter Supply, Inc., Burrud Arms Inc., Green Mountain Guns, Jerrys Outdoor Sports & Supply, Specialty Sports & Supply, Goods for the Woods, Colorado State Shooting Association, Hamilton Family Enterprises, Inc., Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Outdoor Buddies, Inc., Women for Concealed Carry, David Bayne, Dylan Harrell, Jim Beicker, Rick Besecker, Ronald Bruce, David D. Campbell, James (Jim) Casias, Miles Clark, John B. Cooke, James Crone, Douglas N. Darr, Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, David Encinias, Mike Ensminger, James Faull, Rod Fenske, Scott Fischer, Forrest Frazee, Peter Gonzalez, Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Fred Hosselkus, Tim Jantz, Fred Jobe, Chris S. Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Donald Krueger, Larry Kuntz, Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Jerry Martin, Dominic Mattivi Jr., Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Ted B. Mink, John Minor, Tom Nestor, Bruce Newman, Mike Norris, Brian E. Norton, Randy Peck, Brett L. Powell, Ken Putnam, Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Duke Schirard, Justin Smith, Dennis Spruell, Dave Stong, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Lou Vallario, David A. Weaver, Fred Wegener, Garrett Wiggins, Si Woodruff, David Strumillo, John "Smoky" Kurtz, Steve Reams, Michael T. McIntosh, Sam Zordel, Casey Sheridan, Richard Valdez, K. C. Hume, Shannon Keith Byerly, Shawn Mobley, Brett Schroetlin, Richard A. Albers, Jon Stivers, Bruce Conrad, Bill Elder, Jeff Shrader, Dan Warwick, Thomas James Hanna, Gabriel David Joiner, David C. Walcher, Sean Michael Smith, Steve Nowlin, Robert Jackson, Tony Spurlock and Anthony Mazzola. Served on 05/21/2015. [14-1290, 14-1292]
May 21, 2015 [10273644] Motion filed by Appellants David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry to extend time to file a reply brief until 05/29/2015. Served on: 05/21/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
May 18, 2015 [10272554] Motion filed by Appellants Mr. Richard A. Albers, Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. Shannon Keith Byerly, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. Bruce Conrad, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, Mr. Bill Elder, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Thomas James Hanna, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. K. C. Hume, Robert Jackson, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Mr. Gabriel David Joiner, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Mr. John "Smoky" Kurtz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Mr. Jerry Martin, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Anthony Mazzola, Mr. Michael T. McIntosh, Mr. Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Shawn Mobley, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Bruce Newman, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Steve Nowlin, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Steve Reams, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Brett Schroetlin, Mr. Casey Sheridan, Mr. Jeff Shrader, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Sean Michael Smith, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Tony Spurlock, Mr. Jon Stivers, Mr. Dave Stong, Mr. David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Richard Valdez, Mr. Lou Vallario, Mr. David C. Walcher, Mr. Dan Warwick, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Garrett Wiggins, Mr. Si Woodruff and Mr. Sam Zordel to file an oversize brief 10000 words long. Served on: 05/18/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1292, 14-1290] DK
May 7, 2015 [10270055] Amicus Curiae brief filed by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence in 14-1290 and 14-1292. Original and 7 copies. Served on 05/05/2015. Manner of Service: email. (Filed per the court's 5/7/15 Order). [14-1290, 14-1292]
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order [10270053] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach. The motion to file an amicus brief, filed by the Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, is granted. The brief shall be filed as of the date of this order. Served on 05/07/2015. [14-1290, 14-1292]
May 5, 2015 This entry has been removed from the docket. [The brief is filed on 5/7/15 per the court's 5/7/15 order] [10269463] Amicus Curiae brief submitted by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 05/05/2015. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] ETR
May 5, 2015 [10269449] Corrected motion submitted by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence for leave to file an amicus brief. Served on: 05/05/2015 Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] ETR
May 4, 2015 [10268814] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Peter Canfield for Everytown for Gun Safety. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/04/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292]
May 4, 2015 [10268801] Notice of appearance submitted by Peter C. Canfield for Everytown for Gun Safety for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/04/2015. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 05/04/2015 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [14-1290, 14-1292] SS
April 30, 2015 [10268204] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Anisha Dasgupta for State of Massachusetts, District of Columbia, State of New York, State of Iowa, State of Washington, State of Illinois, State of Connecticut, State of Maryland, State of Hawaii and State of Oregon in 14-1290, 14-1292. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/30/2015. Manner of Service: email [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 30, 2015 [10268149] Notice of deficient motion received from Movant Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence in 14-1290 and 14-1292. Attorney motion to become amicus [ # 10268079-2 ]. Type of deficiency: no statement regarding consent of all parties. Served on 04/30/2015. Manner of Service: email. Corrected motion or errata due 05/11/2015 for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 30, 2015 [10268148] Notice of appearance submitted by Anisha S. Dasgupta for Amici Curiae States of New York, Connecticut, Hawaii, Illinois, Iowa, Maryland, Massachusetts, Oregon, and Washington, and the District of Columbia for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/30/2015. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/30/2015 by AD. PDF removed, pleading redocketed 4-30-15] [14-1290, 14-1292] AD
April 30, 2015 [10268114] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Edward Thain Ramey for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence in 14-1290, and 14-1292. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/30/2015. Manner of Service: email [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 29, 2015 [10268635] Amicus Curiae brief filed by States of New York, Connecticut, Hawaii, Illinois, Iowa, Maryland, Massachusetts, Oregon, and Washington, and the District of Columbia. 7 paper copies provided to the court. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [Brief redocketed as filed by clerk of court] [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 29, 2015 [10268357] Amicus Curiae brief filed by Everytown for Gun Safety in 14-1290, 14-1292. 7 copies. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email. (Redocketed by clerk) [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 29, 2015 [10268263] Amicus Curiae brief filed by Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence in 14-1290. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 29, 2015 [10268080] Notice of appearance submitted by Edward T. Ramey for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292]--[Edited 04/30/2015 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 4/30/2015] ETR
April 29, 2015 [10268079] Motion submitted by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence for leave to file an amicus brief. Served on: 04/29/2015 Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] ETR
April 29, 2015 This entry has been removed from the docket. Brief docketed as filed as of 04/29/2015 by clerk. [sds] [10268078] Amicus Curiae brief submitted by States of New York, Connecticut, Hawaii, Illinois, Iowa, Maryland, Massachusetts, Oregon, and Washington, and the District of Columbia. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] AD
April 29, 2015 [10268008] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Gregory Andrew Castanias for Everytown for Gun Safety in 14-1290, 14-1292. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 29, 2015 [10268001] Notice of appearance submitted by Gregory A. Castanias for Everytown for Gun Safety for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/29/2015 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [14-1290, 14-1292] SS
April 29, 2015 [10267960] Notice of appearance filed by Jonathan K. Baum and Mr. Mark Thomas Ciani for Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence in 14-1290 & 14-1292. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 29, 2015 This entry has been removed from the docket. [The brief was filed on 4/29/15] [10267924] Amicus Curiae brief submitted by Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] MTC
April 29, 2015 [10267920] Notice of appearance submitted by Jonathan K. Baum for Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email, hand delivery. [14-1290, 14-1292]--[Edited 04/29/2015 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 4/29/2015] MTC
April 29, 2015 [10267916] Notice of appearance submitted by Mark T. Ciani for Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email, hand delivery. [14-1290, 14-1292]--[Edited 04/29/2015 by JM to remove PDF filed in error twice by counsel.] MTC
April 29, 2015 [10267905] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Sparkle Sooknanan for Everytown for Gun Safety in 14-1290 and 14-1292. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 29, 2015 This entry has been removed from the docket. Brief redocketed by clerk 04/29/2015 [AD] [10267870] Amicus Curiae brief submitted by Everytown for Gun Safety. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] SS
April 29, 2015 [10267862] Notice of appearance submitted by Sparkle L. Sooknanan for Everytown for Gun Safety for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/29/2015. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 04/29/2015 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 4/29/15] [14-1290, 14-1292] SS
April 24, 2015 [10266849] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Reply Briefs in 14-1290 and 14-1292. Appellants' optional reply briefs now due 05/26/2015 for National Shooting Sports Foundation, Magpul Industries, USA Liberty Arms, Rocky Mountain Shooters Supply, 2nd Amendment Gunsmith & Shooter Supply, Inc., Burrud Arms Inc., Green Mountain Guns, Jerrys Outdoor Sports & Supply, Specialty Sports & Supply, Goods for the Woods, Colorado State Shooting Association, Hamilton Family Enterprises, Inc., Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Outdoor Buddies, Inc., Women for Concealed Carry, David Bayne and Dylan Harrell. No further extensions will be granted on the Clerk's authority. Served on 04/24/2015. [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 24, 2015 [10266823] Motion filed by Appellants David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry to extend time to file a reply brief until 05/26/2015. Served on: 04/24/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
April 23, 2015 [10266467] Minute order filed - Appellant's optional reply brief now due 05/11/2015 for National Shooting Sports Foundation, Magpul Industries, USA Liberty Arms, Rocky Mountain Shooters Supply, 2nd Amendment Gunsmith & Shooter Supply, Inc., Burrud Arms Inc., Green Mountain Guns, Jerrys Outdoor Sports & Supply, Specialty Sports & Supply, Goods for the Woods, Colorado State Shooting Association, Hamilton Family Enterprises, Inc., Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Outdoor Buddies, Inc., Women for Concealed Carry, David Bayne, Dylan Harrell, Jim Beicker, Rick Besecker, Ronald Bruce, David D. Campbell, James (Jim) Casias, Miles Clark, John B. Cooke, James Crone, Douglas N. Darr, Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, David Encinias, Mike Ensminger, James Faull, Rod Fenske, Scott Fischer, Forrest Frazee, Peter Gonzalez, Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Fred Hosselkus, Tim Jantz, Fred Jobe, Chris S. Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Donald Krueger, Larry Kuntz, Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Jerry Martin, Dominic Mattivi Jr., Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Ted B. Mink, John Minor, Tom Nestor, Bruce Newman, Mike Norris, Brian E. Norton, Randy Peck, Brett L. Powell, Ken Putnam, Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Duke Schirard, Justin Smith, Dennis Spruell, Dave Stong, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Lou Vallario, David A. Weaver, Fred Wegener, Garrett Wiggins, Si Woodruff, David Strumillo, John "Smoky" Kurtz, Steve Reams, Michael T. McIntosh, Sam Zordel, Casey Sheridan, Richard Valdez, K. C. Hume, Shannon Keith Byerly, Shawn Mobley, Brett Schroetlin, Richard A. Albers, Jon Stivers, Bruce Conrad, Bill Elder, Jeff Shrader, Dan Warwick, Thomas James Hanna, Gabriel David Joiner, David C. Walcher, Sean Michael Smith, Steve Nowlin, Robert Jackson, Tony Spurlock and Anthony Mazzola. (Text Only - No Attachment) [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 22, 2015 [10266010] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 04/22/2015. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] MDG
April 16, 2015 [10264380] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney Daniel D. Domenico's motion to withdraw as attorney for appellee. Daniel D. Domenico shall be removed as counsel of record. Served on 04/16/2015. [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 16, 2015 [10264273] Motion filed by Appellee Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292 for attorney Daniel D. Domenico to withdraw as counsel.. Served on: 04/16/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] KS
April 8, 2015 [10262023] Order filed by Clerk of the Court (LS) granting appellee's motion to file oversized brief containing no more than 28,000 words. Appellee's brief remains due 04/22/2015. See order for additional information. Served on 04/08/2015. [14-1290, 14-1292]
April 7, 2015 [10261964] Motion filed by Appellee Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292 to file an oversize brief 28000 words long. Served on: 04/07/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] MDG
March 17, 2015 [10255510] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting at the direction of the court Appellee's second motion to extend time to file eres brief Appellee's brief now due 04/22/2015 for John W. Hickenlooper. No further extensions will be granted. Served on 03/17/2015. [14-1290, 14-1292]
March 16, 2015 [10255262] Motion filed by Appellee Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292 to extend time to file appellee/respondent's brief until 04/22/2015. Served on: 03/16/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] MDG
February 13, 2015 [10248161] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney motion to extend time to file appellee's brief. Appellee's brief now due 03/23/2015 for John W. Hickenlooper. No further extensions on the clerk's authority. Served on 02/13/2015. [14-1290, 14-1292]
February 13, 2015 [10248123] Motion filed by Appellee Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1290, 14-1292 to extend time to file appellee/respondent's brief until 03/23/2015. Served on: 02/13/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] MDG
January 29, 2015 [10243683] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Anna M. Barvir, Mr. Carl D. Michel and Mr. Clinton B. Monfort for California Rifle & Pistol Association; Gun Owners of California; Calguns Shooting Sports Association; Illinois State Rifle Association; Kansas State Rifle Association; League of Kentucky Sportsmen; Nevada Firearms Coalition; Association of New Jersey Rifle & Pistol Clubs, Inc.; New Mexico Shooting Sports Association; Texas State Rifle Association; Utah State Rifle & Pistol Association; Vermont State Rifle & Pistol Association; Vermont Federation of Sportsmens Clubs; Virginia Citizens Defense League CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/28/2015. Manner of Service: email [14-1290, 14-1292]
January 28, 2015 [10243641] Notice of appearance submitted by C.D. Michel Clinton B. Monfort Anna Barvir for Amici Curiae Calguns Shooting Sports Association, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Gun Owners of California, Illinois State Rifle Association, Kansas State Rifle Association, League of Kentucky Sportsmen and Nevada Firearms Coalition in 14-1290, Amici Curiae Calguns Shooting Sports Association, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Illinois State Rifle Association, Kansas State Rifle Association and League of Kentucky Sportsmen in 14-1292Association of New Jersey Rifle & Pistol Clubs, Inc; New Mexico Shooting Sports Association; The Texas State & Pistol Association; Utah State Rifle & Pistol Association; Vermont State Rifle & Pistol Association; Vermont Federation of Sportsmens Clubs; for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/28/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292]--[Edited 01/29/2015 by JM to remove PDF as pleading was filed by the court on 1/29/15.] CDM
January 28, 2015 [10243296] Minute order filed - Pursuant to the Notice of Substitution of Parties filed by the appellants on January 26, 2015, the court has modified the docket to reflect the changed identification of specified sheriffs, see Fed. R. App. P. 43(c), and the modified role of others who remain parties to the appeal but not as public officers. (Text Only - No Attachment) [14-1292]
January 27, 2015 [10243184] Minute order filed - Notice of appearance due on 02/10/2015 for Calguns Shooting Sports Association, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Gun Owners of California, Illinois State Rifle Association, Kansas State Rifle Association, League of Kentucky Sportsmen. (Text Only - No Attachment) [14-1290, 14-1292]
January 26, 2015 [10242839] Notice of Substitution of Parties filed by Appellants Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Mr. Jerry Martin, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Bruce Newman, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Dave Stong, Mr. David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Mr. Lou Vallario, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Garrett Wiggins and Mr. Si Woodruff to substitute with In official capacity only (not individual capacity): Clark; Cooke; Darr; Faull; Frazee; Gonzalez; Jantz; Jobe; C.Johnson; R.Johnson; Krueger; Kuntz; Kurtz; Maketa; Mink; Norris; Peck; Putnam; Robinson; Schirard; Spruell; Stong; Weaver; Woodruff. Served on: 01/26/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1292, 14-1290] DK
January 26, 2015 [10242579] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Charles J. Cooper for NRA. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/23/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292]
January 26, 2015 [10242566] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Dan M Peterson for Western Sheriffs' Association, Law Enforcement Legal Defense Fund, Law Enforcement Alliance of America, Inc., Law Enforcement Action Network, International Law Enforcement Educators and Trainers Assocation and Colorado Police Protective Association in 14-1290 and 14-1292. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/26/2015. Manner of Service: email [14-1290, 14-1292]
January 23, 2015 [10242526] Amicus Curiae brief submitted by National Rifle Association of America, Inc. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 01/23/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] CJC
January 23, 2015 [10242524] Notice of appearance submitted by Charles J. Cooper for National Rifle Association of America, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/23/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292] CJC
January 23, 2015 [10242519] Amicus Curiae brief submitted by California Rifle & Pistol Association; Gun Owners of California; Calguns Shooting Sports Association; Illinois State Rifle Association; Kansas State Rifle Association; League of Kentucky Sportsmen; Nevada Firearms Coalition; etc. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 01/23/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] CDM
January 23, 2015 [10242509] Amicus Curiae brief submitted by THE CONGRESS OF RACIAL EQUALITY, PINK PISTOLS, WOMEN AGAINST GUN CONTROL, DISABLED SPORTSMEN OF NORTH AMERICA, AND SECOND AMENDMENT SISTERS. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 01/23/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] BSK
January 23, 2015 [10242464] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Brian S. Koukoutchos for Congress of Racial Equality, Pink Pistols, Women Against Gun Control, Disabled Sportsmen of North America and Second Amendment Sisters in 14-1290, 14-1292. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/23/2015. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292]
January 23, 2015 [10242455] Notice of appearance submitted by Brian S. Koukoutchos for THE CONGRESS OF RACIAL EQUALITY, PINK PISTOLS, WOMEN AGAINST GUN CONTROL, DISABLED SPORTSMEN OF NORTH AMERICA, AND SECOND AMENDMENT SISTERS for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/23/2015. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/23/2015 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [14-1290, 14-1292] BSK
January 22, 2015 [10241833] Minute order filed - Appellee's single consolidated brief now due on 02/20/2015 for John W. Hickenlooper. (Text Only - No Attachment) [14-1290, 14-1292]
January 21, 2015 [10241451] Minute order filed - Appellants in 14-1292 have indicated in their brief docket entry that there have been changes to certian public officers. These appellants shall file a notice of substitution of parties pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 43(c) on or before 01/27/2015. (Text Only - No Attachment) [14-1290, 14-1292]
January 16, 2015 [10240725] Appellant's appendix filed by David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry. Total number of volumes filed: 28. Served on 01/16/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
January 16, 2015 [10240724] Appellant's appendix filed by David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry. Total number of volumes filed: 28. Served on 01/16/2015. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
December 9, 2014 [10231077] Order filed at the direction of the Court granting Appellants' second unopposed motion to extend time to file apet brief. Appellants' brief and appendix are due on 01/16/2015 for 2nd Amendment Gunsmith & Shooter Supply, Inc., David Bayne, Burrud Arms Inc., Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado State Shooting Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Goods for the Woods, Green Mountain Guns, Hamilton Family Enterprises, Inc., Dylan Harrell, Jerrys Outdoor Sports & Supply, Magpul Industries, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Outdoor Buddies, Inc., Rocky Mountain Shooters Supply, Specialty Sports & Supply, USA Liberty Arms, Women for Concealed Carry, Jim Beicker, Rick Besecker, Ronald Bruce, David D. Campbell, James (Jim) Casias, Miles Clark, John B. Cooke, James Crone, Douglas N. Darr, Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, David Encinias, Mike Ensminger, James Faull, Rod Fenske, Scott Fischer, Forrest Frazee, Peter Gonzalez, Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Fred Hosselkus, Tim Jantz, Fred Jobe, Chris S. Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Donald Krueger, Larry Kuntz, Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Jerry Martin, Dominic Mattivi Jr., Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Ted B. Mink, John Minor, Tom Nestor, Bruce Newman, Mike Norris, Brian E. Norton, Randy Peck, Brett L. Powell, Ken Putnam, Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Duke Schirard, Justin Smith, Dennis Spruell, Dave Stong, David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Lou Vallario, David A. Weaver, Fred Wegener, Garrett Wiggins and Si Woodruff. Served on 12/09/2014. [14-1290, 14-1292]
December 9, 2014 [10231006] Motion filed by Appellants David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 01/16/2015. Served on: 12/09/2014. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
November 12, 2014 [10223141] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellants' motion to extend time to file apet brief. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 12/17/2014 for 2nd Amendment Gunsmith & Shooter Supply, Inc., David Bayne, Burrud Arms Inc., Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado State Shooting Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Goods for the Woods, Green Mountain Guns, Hamilton Family Enterprises, Inc., Dylan Harrell, Jerrys Outdoor Sports & Supply, Magpul Industries, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Outdoor Buddies, Inc., Rocky Mountain Shooters Supply, Specialty Sports & Supply, USA Liberty Arms, Women for Concealed Carry, Jim Beicker, Rick Besecker, Ronald Bruce, David D. Campbell, James (Jim) Casias, Miles Clark, John B. Cooke, James Crone, Douglas N. Darr, Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, David Encinias, Mike Ensminger, James Faull, Rod Fenske, Scott Fischer, Forrest Frazee, Peter Gonzalez, Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Fred Hosselkus, Tim Jantz, Fred Jobe, Chris S. Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Donald Krueger, Larry Kuntz, Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Jerry Martin, Dominic Mattivi Jr., Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Ted B. Mink, John Minor, Tom Nestor, Bruce Newman, Mike Norris, Brian E. Norton, Randy Peck, Brett L. Powell, Ken Putnam, Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Duke Schirard, Justin Smith, Dennis Spruell, Dave Stong, David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Lou Vallario, David A. Weaver, Fred Wegener, Garrett Wiggins and Si Woodruff. No further extensions of time may be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 11/12/2014. [14-1290, 14-1292]
November 10, 2014 [10222887] Motion filed by Appellant Colorado Outfitters Association, This pleading is being filed on behalf of all Plaintiffs- Appellants for case numbers 14-1290 and 14-1292 to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 12/17/2014. Served on: 11/10/2014. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
October 7, 2014 [10213156] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 10/07/2014. Appellants brief and appendix due on 11/17/2014 for 2nd Amendment Gunsmith & Shooter Supply, Inc., David Bayne, Burrud Arms Inc., Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado State Shooting Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Goods for the Woods, Green Mountain Guns, Hamilton Family Enterprises, Inc., Dylan Harrell, Jerrys Outdoor Sports & Supply, Magpul Industries, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Outdoor Buddies, Inc., Rocky Mountain Shooters Supply, Specialty Sports & Supply, USA Liberty Arms, Women for Concealed Carry, Jim Beicker, Rick Besecker, Ronald Bruce, David D. Campbell, James (Jim) Casias, Miles Clark, John B. Cooke, James Crone, Douglas N. Darr, Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, David Encinias, Mike Ensminger, James Faull, Rod Fenske, Scott Fischer, Forrest Frazee, Peter Gonzalez, Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Fred Hosselkus, Tim Jantz, Fred Jobe, Chris S. Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Donald Krueger, Larry Kuntz, Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Jerry Martin, Dominic Mattivi Jr., Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Ted B. Mink, John Minor, Tom Nestor, Bruce Newman, Mike Norris, Brian E. Norton, Randy Peck, Brett L. Powell, Ken Putnam, Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Duke Schirard, Justin Smith, Dennis Spruell, Dave Stong, David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Lou Vallario, David A. Weaver, Fred Wegener, Garrett Wiggins and Si Woodruff. A [14-1290, 14-1292]
September 26, 2014 [10210244] Order filed by Clerk of the Court (LSS). The motion to consolidate appeals in 14-1290 and 14-1292 is granted for all procedural purposes. The parties shall include both appeal numbers on all documents. Briefing on the merits will begin when district court transmits a notice record complete. 1) Appellants may file separate briefs and they need not include a statement regarding the necessity of separate briefs, 2) Appellees shall file a single consolidated brief, 3) Appellants may file separate optional reply briefs. (Please refer to the order for specific information.) Served on 09/26/2014. [14-1290, 14-1292]
September 25, 2014 [10209836] Motion filed by Appellants David Bayne, Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Dylan Harrell, Outdoor Buddies, Inc. and Women for Concealed Carry to consolidate appeals. Served on: 09/25/2014. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
August 19, 2014 [10199923] Transcript order form filed by Terri Lindblom in 14-1290, 14-1292. Transcript due 09/30/2014 for Terri Lindblom. [14-1290, 14-1292]
August 12, 2014 [10198073] Corrected docketing statement filed by Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Mr. Jerry Martin, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Bruce Newman, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Dave Stong, Mr. David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Mr. Lou Vallario, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Garrett Wiggins and Mr. Si Woodruff. Served on 08/12/2014. Manner of Service: email. [14-1292] DK
August 12, 2014 [10198038] Notice of deficient docketing statement received from Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Mr. Jerry Martin, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Bruce Newman, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Dave Stong, Mr. David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Mr. Lou Vallario, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Garrett Wiggins and Mr. Si Woodruff. Type of deficiency: no attachment. Docketing statement due 08/22/2014 for Jim Beicker, Rick Besecker, Ronald Bruce, David D. Campbell, James (Jim) Casias, Miles Clark, John B. Cooke, James Crone, Douglas N. Darr, Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, David Encinias, Mike Ensminger, James Faull, Rod Fenske, Scott Fischer, Forrest Frazee, Peter Gonzalez, Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Fred Hosselkus, Tim Jantz, Fred Jobe, Chris S. Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Donald Krueger, Larry Kuntz, Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Jerry Martin, Dominic Mattivi Jr., Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Ted B. Mink, John Minor, Tom Nestor, Bruce Newman, Mike Norris, Brian E. Norton, Randy Peck, Brett L. Powell, Ken Putnam, Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Duke Schirard, Justin Smith, Dennis Spruell, Dave Stong, David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Lou Vallario, David A. Weaver, Fred Wegener, Garrett Wiggins and Si Woodruff. [14-1292]
August 12, 2014 [10197992] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Mr. Jerry Martin, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Bruce Newman, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Dave Stong, Mr. David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Mr. Lou Vallario, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Garrett Wiggins and Mr. Si Woodruff. Served on 08/12/2014. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 08/12/2014 by KF. PDF removed. Deficiency cured with a corrected docketing statement] [14-1292] DK
August 8, 2014 [10197283] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 08/22/2014 for Terri Lindblom in 14-1290 & 14-1292. (Text Only - No Attachment) [14-1290, 14-1292]
August 8, 2014 [10197249] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Mr. Peter Krumholz, Esq. for Colorado Farm Bureau, Colorado Outfitters Association, Colorado Youth Outdoors, Outdoor Buddies, Inc., Women for Concealed Carry, David Bayne and Dylan Harrell. Transcript ordered: Trial held 03/31/14-04/10/14 Preliminary Injunction hearing held 07/10/13 Law and Motion hearing held 12/19/13 Pretrial Conference held 02/20/14. Served on: 08/08/2014. Manner of Service: email. [14-1290, 14-1292] PK
August 5, 2014 [10196416] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. David Kopel for Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Jerry Martin, Rick Dunlap, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Terry Maketa, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Lou Vallario, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Bruce Newman, Shayne Heap, Amos Medina, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Mr. David Strumillo, Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Chad Day, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Fred D. McKee, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Dave Stong, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Garrett Wiggins and Mr. Si Woodruff. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/05/2014. Manner of Service: email [14-1292]
August 5, 2014 [10196411] Notice of appearance submitted by David Benjamin Kopel for Appellants Mr. Jim Beicker, Mr. Rick Besecker, Mr. Ronald Bruce, Mr. David D. Campbell, Mr. James (Jim) Casias, Mr. Miles Clark, Mr. John B. Cooke, Mr. James Crone, Mr. Douglas N. Darr, Mr. Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, Mr. David Encinias, Mr. Mike Ensminger, Mr. James Faull, Mr. Rod Fenske, Mr. Scott Fischer, Mr. Forrest Frazee, Mr. Peter Gonzalez, Mr. Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Mr. Fred Hosselkus, Mr. Tim Jantz, Mr. Fred Jobe, Mr. Chris S. Johnson, Mr. Rodney Johnson, Mr. Donald Krueger, Mr. Larry Kuntz, Ms. Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Mr. Jerry Martin, Mr. Dominic Mattivi, Jr., Mr. Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Mr. Ted B. Mink, Mr. John Minor, Mr. Tom Nestor, Mr. Bruce Newman, Mr. Mike Norris, Mr. Brian E. Norton, Mr. Randy Peck, Mr. Brett L. Powell, Mr. Ken Putnam, Mr. Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Mr. Duke Schirard, Mr. Justin Smith, Mr. Dennis Spruell, Mr. Dave Stong, Mr. David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Mr. Lou Vallario, Mr. David A. Weaver, Mr. Fred Wegener, Mr. Garrett Wiggins and Mr. Si Woodruff in 14-1292 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/05/2014. Manner of Service: email. [14-1292]--[Edited 08/05/2014 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 8/5/2014] DK
August 1, 2014 [10195666] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Daniel D. Domenico, Mr. Matthew D. Grove, Ms. LeeAnn Morrill, Ms. Stephanie Lindquist Scoville and Ms. Kathleen Spalding for Mr. John W. Hickenlooper. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/01/2014. Manner of Service: email [14-1292]
August 1, 2014 [10195633] Notice of appearance submitted by Daniel D. Domenico, Matthew Grove, Kathleen L. Spalding, Stephanie Scoville and LeeAnn Morrill for Appellee Mr. John W. Hickenlooper in 14-1292 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/01/2014. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 08/01/2014 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed iln 14-1292 on 8/1/14] [14-1292] KS
July 29, 2014 [10194791] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/29/2014 Docketing statement due 08/12/2014 for Jim Beicker, Rick Besecker, Ronald Bruce, David D. Campbell, James (Jim) Casias, Miles Clark, John B. Cooke, James Crone, Douglas N. Darr, Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, David Encinias, Mike Ensminger, James Faull, Rod Fenske, Scott Fischer, Forrest Frazee, Peter Gonzalez, Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, Fred Hosselkus, Tim Jantz, Fred Jobe, Chris S. Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Donald Krueger, Larry Kuntz, Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Jerry Martin, Dominic Mattivi Jr., Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Ted B. Mink, John Minor, Tom Nestor, Bruce Newman, Mike Norris, Brian E. Norton, Randy Peck, Brett L. Powell, Ken Putnam, Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Duke Schirard, Justin Smith, Dennis Spruell, Dave Strong, David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Lou Vallario, David A. Weaver, Fred Wegener, Garrett Wiggins and Si Woodruff. Transcript order form due 08/12/2014 for David Kopel. Notice of appearance due on 08/12/2014 for Jim Beicker, Rick Besecker, Ronald Bruce, David D. Campbell, James (Jim) Casias, Miles Clark, John B. Cooke, James Crone, Douglas N. Darr, Chad Day, Rick Dunlap, David Encinias, Mike Ensminger, James Faull, Rod Fenske, Scott Fischer, Forrest Frazee, Peter Gonzalez, Bruce W. Hartman, Shayne Heap, John W. Hickenlooper, Fred Hosselkus, Tim Jantz, Fred Jobe, Chris S. Johnson, Rodney Johnson, Donald Krueger, Larry Kuntz, Sue Kurtz, Terry Maketa, Jerry Martin, Dominic Mattivi Jr., Fred D. McKee, Amos Medina, Ted B. Mink, John Minor, Tom Nestor, Bruce Newman, Mike Norris, Brian E. Norton, Randy Peck, Brett L. Powell, Ken Putnam, Tom Ridnour, Grayson Robinson, Duke Schirard, Justin Smith, Dennis Spruell, Dave Strong, David Strumillo, Charles "Rob" Urbach, Lou Vallario, David A. Weaver, Fred Wegener, Garrett Wiggins and Si Woodruff. [14-1292]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beicker, et al v. Hickenlooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN MINOR, Sheriff of Summit County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GABRIEL DAVID JOINER, Sheriff of Cheyenne County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TONY SPURLOCK, Sheriff of Douglas County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUSTIN SMITH, Sheriff of Larimer County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID A. WEAVER, Sheriff of Douglas County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES (JIM) CASIAS, Sheriff of Las Animas County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES CRONE, Sheriff of Morgan County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD KRUEGER, Sheriff of Clear Creek County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID C. WALCHER, Sheriff of Arapahoe County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL T. MCINTOSH, Sheriff of Adams County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRIAN E. NORTON, Sheriff of Rio Grande County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY MAZZOLA, Sheriff of Rio Blanco County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOMINIC MATTIVI, JR., Sheriff of Ouray County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIM JANTZ, Sheriff of Moffat County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROD FENSKE, Sheriff of Lake County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVE REAMS, Sheriff of Weld County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN B. COOKE, Sheriff of Weld County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRIS S. JOHNSON, Sheriff of Otero County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES "ROB" URBACH, Sheriff of Phillips County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LOU VALLARIO, Sheriff of Garfiled County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRUCE W. HARTMAN, Sheriff of Gilpin County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DUKE SCHIRARD, Sheriff of La Plata County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRUCE CONRAD, Sheriff of San Juan County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRED D. MCKEE, Sheriff of Delta County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIKE ENSMINGER, Sheriff of Teller County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVE STONG, Sheriff of Alamosa County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SI WOODRUFF, Sheriff of Rio Blanco County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN "SMOKY" KURTZ, Sheriff of Crowley County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIKE NORRIS, Sheriff of Saguache County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD A. ALBERS, Sheriff of Clear Creek County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID D. CAMPBELL, Sheriff of Baca County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MILES CLARK, Sheriff of Crowley County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BILL ELDER, Sheriff of El Paso County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TED B. MINK, Sheriff of Jefferson County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHAWN MOBLEY, Sheriff of Otero County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD VALDEZ, Sheriff of Archuleta County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID ENCINIAS, Sheriff of Bent County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFF SHRADER, Sheriff of Jefferson County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: K. C. HUME, Sheriff of Moffat County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUE KURTZ, Sheriff of San Juan County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEN PUTNAM, Sheriff of Cheyenne County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LARRY KUNTZ, Sheriff of Washington County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD BRUCE, Sheriff of Hinsdale County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JON STIVERS, Sheriff of Washington County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICK DUNLAP, Sheriff of Montrose County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SEAN MICHAEL SMITH, Sheriff of La Plata County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CASEY SHERIDAN, Sheriff of Kiowa County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVE NOWLIN, Sheriff of Montezuma County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICK BESECKER, Sheriff of Gunnison County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TOM NESTOR, Sheriff of Lincoln County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JIM BEICKER, Sheriff of Fremont County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRETT L. POWELL, Sheriff of Logan County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PETER GONZALEZ, Sheriff of Archuleta County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT JACKSON, Sheriff of Alamosa County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOUGLAS N. DARR, Sheriff of Adams County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERRY MAKETA, Sheriff of El Paso County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRED WEGENER, Sheriff of Park County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHAD DAY, Sheriff of Yuma County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID STRUMILLO
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRED JOBE, Sheriff of Custer County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GARRETT WIGGINS, Sheriff of Routt County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRETT SCHROETLIN, Sheriff of Grand County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GRAYSON ROBINSON, Sheriff of Arapahoe County, ret.
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JERRY MARTIN, Sheriff of Dolores County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMOS MEDINA, Sheriff of Costilla County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCOTT FISCHER, Sheriff of Jackson County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAM ZORDEL, Sheriff of Prowers County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TOM RIDNOUR, Sheriff of Kit Carson County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RODNEY JOHNSON, Sheriff of Grand County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RANDY PECK, Sheriff of Sedgwick County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES FAULL, Sheriff of Prowers County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAN WARWICK, Sheriff of Saguache County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRED HOSSELKUS, Sheriff of Mineral County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRUCE NEWMAN, Sheriff of Huerfano County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FORREST FRAZEE, Sheriff of Kiowa County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHAYNE HEAP, Sheriff of Elbert County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHANNON KEITH BYERLY, Sheriff of Custer County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DENNIS SPRUELL, Sheriff of Montezuma County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS JAMES HANNA, Sheriff of Sedgwick County
Represented By: David Kopel
Represented By: Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAW ENFORCEMENT ACTION NETWORK
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Charles Justin Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COLORADO POLICE PROTECTIVE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA RIFLE & PISTOL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Clinton B. Monfort
Represented By: Anna M. Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISABLED SPORTSMEN OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Brian S. Koukoutchos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KANSAS STATE RIFLE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Clinton B. Monfort
Represented By: Anna M. Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY
Represented By: Gregory Andrew Castanias
Represented By: Sparkle Sooknanan
Represented By: Peter Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WESTERN SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Edward Thain Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEAGUE OF KENTUCKY SPORTSMEN
Represented By: Clinton B. Monfort
Represented By: Anna M. Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALGUNS SHOOTING SPORTS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Clinton B. Monfort
Represented By: Anna M. Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SECOND AMENDMENT SISTERS
Represented By: Brian S. Koukoutchos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAW ENFORCEMENT ALLIANCE OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONGRESS OF RACIAL EQUALITY
Represented By: Brian S. Koukoutchos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ILLINOIS STATE RIFLE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Clinton B. Monfort
Represented By: Anna M. Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PINK PISTOLS
Represented By: Brian S. Koukoutchos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAW ENFORCEMENT LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Clinton B. Monfort
Represented By: Anna M. Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL LAW ENFORCEMENT EDUCATORS AND TRAINERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Dan M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN AGAINST GUN CONTROL
Represented By: Brian S. Koukoutchos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Jonathan K. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN W. HICKENLOOPER, Govenor of the State of Colorado
Represented By: John T. Lee Esq.
Represented By: Molly Allen Moats
Represented By: Stephanie Lindquist Scoville
Represented By: LeeAnn Morrill
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Represented By: Jonathan Fero
Represented By: Matthew D. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?