Snyder, et al v. Acord Corporation, et al
Petitioner: UNITED POLICYHOLDERS
Defendant / Appellee: NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, THE BUCKEYE STATE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Buckeye Insurance Group, ELECTRIC INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation, ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, ABC ORGANIZATION, an entity or group of entities, whose true names are unknown, SENTRY INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, SHELTER MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation, VERISK ANALYTICS INC., a Delaware corporation, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, an Iowa corporation a/k/a Farmers Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Farmers Insurance Exchange, AMERICAN INDEMNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a Guideone Insurance, AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP., a Florida corporation, NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation, STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas corporation, SECURA INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., a Wisconsi corporation, CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a The Central Insurance Companies, PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, a Colordo non-profit corporation, HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation a/k/a Fireman's Fund Insurance Company of Missouri, ACORD CORPORATION, NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Ohio corporation, STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, AMERICAN RELIABLE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation, GRANGE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, a Washington corporation, FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation b/b/a First American Property & Casualty Group, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, COLORADO FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., a Colorado corporation, TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY, GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation, KEMPER CORPORATE SERVICES, INC., an Illinois corporation, METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN MODERN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, UNITED FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, MUNICH-AMERICAN HOLDING CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES INC., A Minnesota corporation, UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a United Fire Group, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation, QBE INSURANCE GROUP, LIMITED, STILLWATER PROPERTY AND CAUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation a/k/a Fidelity National Property and Casulty Insurance Company d/b/a Stillwater Insurance Group, ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation, FIRST AMERICAN FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, LM INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation, MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation, STATE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Ohio corpoarion, UNITED FIRE INSURANCE GROUP, INC., an Iowa corporation d/b/a United Fire Group, INSURANCE SERVICES OFFICE, INC., a Delaware corporation, THE CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE, a California corporation, PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, ADDISON INSURANCE COMPANY, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation, FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation, UNITRIN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, PHARMACISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation a/k/a McKinsey & Company, Inc. washington D.C., AMERICAN MODERN HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, ALLIANZ OF AMERICA, INC., a Delaware corporation, OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporationd/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance d/b/a Home-Owners Insurance, UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, a Texas corporation, THE TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, a Massachusetts corporation, MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, METLIFE AUTO & HOME INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinois corporation, ZURICH INSURANCE GROUP LTD/FI, a Switzerland corporation, FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, a Maryland corporation, COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., a Delaware non-profit corporation, QBE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation a/k/a QBE Insurance Corporation, ASSOCIATED INDEMNITY CORPORATION, a California corporation, AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation, THE TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., a Connecticut corporation, CASUALTY ACTUARIAL SOCIETY, an Illinois not for profit corporation, LAFAYETTE INSURANCE COMPANY, a/k/a United Lifre Insurance Company, Inc., PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation, AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD CONNECTICUT, a Connecticut corporation, EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a EMC Incurance Companies, UNITED FIRE LLOYDS, a Texas corporation, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a New Hampshire corporation, TEXAS GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Colorado corporation, NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Nationwide Insurance, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation, CHUBB SERVICES CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation, UNITED LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation, AMERICAN MODERN INSURANCE GROUP, INC., an Ohio corporation, AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, a Florida corporation, ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, an entity whose true name is unknown d/b/a Untied Fire Group, CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Wisconsin corporation, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, NATIONAL FARMERS UNION PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, ALLIANZ LIFE INSURANCE CO. OF NORTH AMERICA, a Minnesota corporation, THE CHUBB CORPORATION, a New Jersey corporation, QBE HOLDINGS, INC., a Delaware corporation, AMERICAN FAMILY HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation, METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation, ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Illinoise corporation d/b/a Encompass Insurance, FARMERS ALLIANCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Kansas corporation, UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, A New York corporation, KEMPER CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, INTERNATION INSURANCE SOCIETY, INC., a Delware non-profit corporation, VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Connecticut corporation, AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Michigan corporation d/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance, HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, ALL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY and UNITED FIRE AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Texas corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: TOMMY MEYER, KENNETH DALE YODER, JANET KOCH, IAN SIEMPLENSKI, SUEHAM KAY HOFFMAN, MARY HARROW, LOUISE CREAGER, MARTHA LEMERT, ESTATE OF DOROTHY WOOD HAMMER, DALE SNYDER, MARILYN SNYDER, CATHERINE TAYLOR, JEFFREY RAY, LAILA SAEDA URBAN, NICOLE WRIGHT-MEYER, MARY ANN GELDREICH, JENNIFER RAY and GARY LEMERT
Case Number: 16-1215
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 [10526767] Supreme Court order dated 01/08/2018 denying certiorari filed by Dale Snyder in 16-1111 & 16-1215. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 01/08/2018 04:08 PM]
December 6, 2017 [10519147] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney Robert A. Zupkus' motion to withdraw as attorney for Secura. Served on 12/06/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 12/06/2017 08:57 AM]
December 6, 2017 [10519135] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney Robert A. Zupkus' motion to withdraw as counsel for Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company in this appeal. Muliha A. Khan will remain as counsel for FAMIC. Served on 12/06/2017. [16-1215] [Entered: 12/06/2017 08:36 AM]
December 5, 2017 [10519078] Motion filed by Appellee Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. in 16-1215, 16-1111 for attorney Robert A. Zupkus Attorney Ms. Muliha A. Khan, Esq. for Appellees Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company and Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. in 16-1215, Attorney Ms. Muliha A. Khan, Esq. for Appellee Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. in 16-1111 to withdraw as counsel.. Served on: 12/05/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1215, 16-1111] MAK [Entered: 12/05/2017 04:17 PM]
December 5, 2017 [10519077] Motion filed by Appellee Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company for attorney Robert A. Zupkus Attorney Ms. Muliha A. Khan, Esq. for Appellees Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company and Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. to withdraw as counsel.. Served on: 12/05/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1215] MAK [Entered: 12/05/2017 04:14 PM]
October 30, 2017 [10509489] Supreme Court order dated 10/30/2017 denying the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by Dale Snyder, et al. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 10/30/2017 01:41 PM]
August 30, 2017 [10494615] Petition for writ of certiorari filed by Dale Snyder on 08/24/2017. Supreme Court Number 17-309. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 08/30/2017 01:09 PM]
July 13, 2017 Sanction paid by Josue David Hernandez in 16-1111, 16-1215. Amount: $ 500.00 [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 07/13/2017 03:49 PM]
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order [10479888] Order filed by Judges Kelly, Baldock and Hartz admonishing and imposing a sanction as to Attorney Josue D. Hernandez consisting of a monetary sanction in the amount of $500.00. This monetary sanction is Mr. Hernandez's personal responsibility and is due 07/17/2017. See order for additional details and instructions. This order shall supplement the court's mandate issued 5/26/17. Served on 07/03/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 07/03/2017 03:43 PM]
June 19, 2017 [10475760] Returned mail filed. Addressed To: Lawrence D. Stone, Dufford & Brown, PC, 1700 Broadway, Ste 2100, Denver, CO 80290-2101. Reason Returned: Moved Left No Address, Unable to Forward. Document Returned: 6/14/17 Order. Action Taken: None. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 06/19/2017 12:38 PM]
June 15, 2017 [10475239] Response filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215, Josue David Hernandez to Served on 06/15/2017. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 06/15/2017 11:39 PM]
June 14, 2017 [10474722] Supplement to mandate issued. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 06/14/2017 02:56 PM]
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order [10474618] Order filed by Judges Kelly, Baldock and Hartz denying petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc, construed as a motion to reconsider filed by Appellants Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Catherine Taylor, Martha Lemert, Gary Lemert, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Louise Creager, Janet Koch, Ian Siemplenski, Tommy Meyer, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Laila Saeda Urban and Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer; . [16-1111, 16-1215] Please see order for additional important information. [Entered: 06/14/2017 11:02 AM]
June 9, 2017 [10473755] Petition for rehearing, and for rehearing en banc, construed as motion to reconsider per the court's order of 6/14/2017, filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215, Josue D. Hernandez. 8 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 06/09/2017. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215]--[Edited 06/14/2017 by LG to clarify filing] JDH [Entered: 06/09/2017 11:48 PM]
June 5, 2017 [10472648] Returned mail filed. Addressed To: Lawrence D. Stone, Dufford & Brown, 1700 Broadway, Ste 2100, Denver, CO 80290-2101. Reason Returned: Moved, Left No Address. Document Returned: Opt Out Notice and Waiver of Claims. Action Taken: None. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 06/06/2017 02:30 PM]
May 26, 2017 [10470588] Mandate issued. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 05/26/2017 05:07 PM]
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order [10470586] Order filed by Judges Kelly, Baldock and Phillips (CW) - Attorney Josue D. Hernandez is required, to show cause why he should not be sanctioned pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 46.4(A) and/or disciplined pursuant to the court's Plan for Attorney Disciplinary Enforcement. Attorney disciplinary response due on 06/15/2017 for Josue David Hernandez. Served on 05/26/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215] --[Edited 06/12/2017 by AT to add Judge Baldock's name to docket entry.] [Entered: 05/26/2017 05:06 PM]
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order [10470580] Order filed by Judges Kelly, Baldock and Hartz (CW) As an initial matter, we sua sponte STRIKE the Errata which shall be removed from the docket by the Clerk's Office. Further we note that Appellants' Petition includes nearly 400 pages of attachments that were not part of the district court record. Accordingly, with the exception of our 4/6/17 order and judgment, and our orders of 4/24/17 and 5/4/17, we sua sponte STRIKE the attachments to the petition which shall be removed from the docket by the Clerk's Office. Order denying Appellants' petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc. The mandate shall issue forthwith. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 05/26/2017 04:49 PM]
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order [10470574] Order filed by Judges Kelly, Baldock, Hartz (CW) granting Appellees' Motion for Award of Appellate Attorney Fees. This matter is remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado for a determination of the amount of appellate attorneys' fees. Served on 05/26/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215]--[Edited 06/12/2017 by AT] [Entered: 05/26/2017 04:41 PM]
May 26, 2017 [10470356] Opt-Out Notice filed. Served on 05/26/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 05/26/2017 09:46 AM]
May 26, 2017 [10470355] Op-Out Notice filed. Served on 05/26/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 05/26/2017 09:44 AM]
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order [10467806] Order filed by Judges Kelly, Baldock and Hartz denying appellants' motion to amend requested relief and to further consolidate appellants defenses with requested relief filed by Appellants Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Catherine Taylor, Martha Lemert, Gary Lemert, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Louise Creager, Janet Koch, Ian Siemplenski, Tommy Meyer, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Laila Saeda Urban and Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer. Counsel is cautioned against filing any additional documents that are not expressly permitted by the applicable federal and loal rules. Please see order for additonal information. Served on 05/17/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 05/17/2017 09:44 AM]
May 16, 2017 [10467580] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215 to amend requested relief and to further consolidate appellants defenses with requested relief. Served on: 05/16/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus)--[Edited 05/16/2017 by LG to correct relief sought] certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 05/16/2017 01:39 PM]
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order [10467006] Order filed by Judges Kelly, Baldock, and Hartz - Striking the appellants' Reply, Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 27(a)(3)(b), on Appellants' Response on Motion for Attorneys' Fees, and Request Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927, Including Hearing Request and Jury Demand ("Reply"). The Reply is, in substance, an unauthorized sur-reply to the Moving Appellees' reply in support of their Motion for Award of Appellate Attorneys' Fees. See attached order for further information. Served on 05/15/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 05/15/2017 08:46 AM]
May 12, 2017 This entry has been striken from the docket pursuant to the court's 05/15/2017 Order. [AT] [10466780] Reply filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215 to Response on Motion for Attorneys' Fees, and REQUEST pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927, Including Hearing Request and Jury Demand. Served on 05/12/2017. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 05/12/2017 09:27 AM]
May 8, 2017 [10465435] Reply filed by First American Financial Corporation and First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company in 16-1215, filed on behalf of the Defendants-Appellees identified in Exhibit A, to Appellees' Motion for Award of Appellate Attorneys' Fees. Served on 05/08/2017. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1215, 16-1111] EBS [Entered: 05/08/2017 03:54 PM]
May 6, 2017 [10465100] Errata sheet to petition for rehearing, for rehearing en banc filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Original and 8 copies. Served on. [Docketed by clerk to apply filing to related case] [16-1215] [Entered: 05/08/2017 08:06 AM]
May 4, 2017 [10464747] Petition for rehearing, for rehearing en banc filed by Appellants in 16-1215, 16-1111. Original and 8 copies. Served on 05/04/2017. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.. Original and 8 copies. Served on 05/04/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1111, 16-1215] Note: This entry has been edited per the court's order of 5/26/17 to reflect that portions of the attachments have been stricken-- Edited 05/26/2017 by NA] [Entered: 05/05/2017 08:10 AM]
May 4, 2017 This entry has been removed from the docket. PLEADING REDOCKETED BY CLERK TO CORRECT EVENT. [sds] [10464716] Petition filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1215, 16-1111. Original and 8 copies. Served on 05/04/2017. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1215, 16-1111] JDH [Entered: 05/04/2017 11:49 PM]
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order [10464643] Order filed by Judges Kelly, Baldock and Hartz denying "Appellants Motion for Relief Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 as to All Future Proceedings, Including Reinstatement of Rights and Factual Defenses Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927, Hearing Request and Continuing Jury Demand" filed by Appellants Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Catherine Taylor, Martha Lemert, Gary Lemert, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Louise Creager, Janet Koch, Ian Siemplenski, Tommy Meyer, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Laila Saeda Urban and Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer. Served on 05/04/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 05/04/2017 03:57 PM]
May 3, 2017 [10464113] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1215, 16-1111 for relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 as to all future proceedings. Served on: 05/03/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 05/03/2017 by SDS to modify event and docket text] [16-1215, 16-1111] JDH [Entered: 05/03/2017 02:30 AM]
May 1, 2017 [10463763] Response filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder to Motion for Appellate Attorneys; Fees. Served on 05/01/2017. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1215] JDH [Entered: 05/01/2017 11:58 PM]
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order [10461866] Order filed by Judges Kelly, Baldock and Hartz denying appellants motion for attorney fees. Response to appellees motion for attorney fees due on 05/01/2017 for Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder; denying Attorney motion for attorney fees filed by Appellants Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Catherine Taylor, Martha Lemert, Gary Lemert, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Louise Creager, Janet Koch, Ian Siemplenski, Tommy Meyer, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Laila Saeda Urban and Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer. Served on 04/24/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 04/24/2017 03:53 PM]
April 20, 2017 This entry has been removed from the docket. Duplicate filing. [sds] [10461167] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1215, 16-1111 for attorney fees. Served on: 04/20/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1215, 16-1111] JDH [Entered: 04/20/2017 11:52 PM]
April 20, 2017 [10461166] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1215, 16-1111 for attorney fees. Served on: 04/20/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1215, 16-1111] JDH [Entered: 04/20/2017 11:39 PM]
April 20, 2017 [10461184] Motion filed by Appellees First American Financial Corporation and First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, We are filing this motion on behalf of the Defendants-Appellees identified in Exhibit A to the motion. for attorney fees. Served on: 04/20/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [Docketed in clerk to apply to related case] [16-1215] [Entered: 04/21/2017 08:07 AM]
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order [10460555] Order filed by Judges Kelly, Baldock, and Hartz - This matter is before the court on appellants' motion for extension of time to file a petition for rehearing and for leave to file an oversized petition for rehearing, which is opposed by appellees' counsel. Upon consideration, the motion is granted in part. The appellants may file a petition for rehearing on or before 05/04/2017. Appellants' request to file an oversized petition for rehearing is denied. Any petition for rehearing must comply with Fed. R. App. P. Rule 35 and Fed. R. App. Rule 40. Served on 04/19/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 04/19/2017 09:08 AM]
April 17, 2017 [10460044] Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File a Petition for Rehearing and to Exceed the Typical Word Count of a Joint Petition filed in 16-1111, 16-1215. Served on 04/17/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 04/17/2017 03:23 PM]
April 17, 2017 This entry has been removed from the docket. [lg] This is a duplicate. Counsel filed this via ECF after getting permission to file through email due to computer issues. [10460032] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Served on: 04/17/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 04/17/2017 03:03 PM]
April 14, 2017 [10459634] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney Gary L. Flemings motion to withdraw as counsel for Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, and American Strategic Insurance Corp. Served on 04/14/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 04/14/2017 01:41 PM]
April 14, 2017 [10459509] Motion filed by Gary L. Fleming to withdraw as counsel for Appellees Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company and American Strategic Insurance Corp. in 16-1215, 16-1111. Served on: 04/14/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1215, 16-1111]--[Edited 04/14/2017 by DD to unapply 16-1277 and to correct motion relief.] GLF [Entered: 04/14/2017 09:52 AM]
April 6, 2017 [10457271] Affirmed. Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing. Written, signed, unpublished. Judges Kelly, author; Baldock and Hartz. Mandate to issue. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 04/06/2017 09:05 AM]
March 31, 2017 [10455825] Motion filed by Appellees American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida and American Reliable Insurance Company in 16-1111, 16-1215, Appellee American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida in 16-1277, American Reliable Insurance Company in 16-1277 for attorney Robert D. Helfand to withdraw as counsel.. Served on: 03/31/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215, 16-1277] RDH [Entered: 03/31/2017 08:41 AM]
March 30, 2017 [10455584] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney Mark A. Sares' motion to withdraw as attorney for appellees American Strategic Insurance Corp. and Acuity in appeal nos. 16-1111 and 16-1215. Served on 03/30/2017. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 03/30/2017 11:39 AM]
March 28, 2017 [10455031] Motion filed by Appellees Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company and American Strategic Insurance Corp. in 16-1111, Mark Andrew Sares for attorney Mark Andrew Sares to withdraw as counsel.. Served on: 03/28/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] MAS [Entered: 03/28/2017 03:41 PM]
March 24, 2017 [10454178] Response filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 16-1111, 16-1215, Filing on behalf of all Defendants-Appellees to Plaintiffs-Appellants' Fed.R.App.P. 28(j) letter. Served on 03/24/2017. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JS [Entered: 03/24/2017 12:20 PM]
March 20, 2017 [10452942] Supplemental authority filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Served on 03/20/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 03/20/2017 10:47 PM]
March 2, 2017 [10448617] Notice of appearance filed by Jamey W. Jamison for American Strategic Insurance Corp. and Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company in 16-1215, 16-1111. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/02/2017. Manner of Service: email [16-1215, 16-1111] [Entered: 03/02/2017 04:58 PM]
March 2, 2017 [10448583] Notice of appearance submitted by Jamey W. Jamison for Appellees Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company and American Strategic Insurance Corp. in 16-1215Jamey W. Jamison for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/02/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215, 16-1111]--[Edited 03/02/2017 by PDW to remove the PDF from this entry and attach it to a subsequent entry] JWJ [Entered: 03/02/2017 04:11 PM]
March 1, 2017 [10447958] Notice of appearance filed by Thomas H Falivene for Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company and American Strategic Insurance Corp. in 16-1215 and 16-1111. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/01/2017. Manner of Service: email [16-1215, 16-1111] [Entered: 03/01/2017 08:09 AM]
February 28, 2017 [10447929] Notice of appearance submitted by Thomas Howard Falivene for Appellees Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company and American Strategic Insurance Corp. in 16-1215Thomas H. Falivene for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/28/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215, 16-1111]--[Edited 03/01/2017 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 3/1/2017] THF [Entered: 02/28/2017 04:32 PM]
February 16, 2017 [10444810] Notice of appearance filed by Mark A. Sares for American Strategic Insurance Corp. in 16-1215, 16-1111. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/16/2017. Manner of Service: email [16-1215, 16-1111] [Entered: 02/16/2017 09:05 AM]
February 16, 2017 [10444802] Notice of appearance filed by Mark A. Sares for Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company in 16-1215, 16-1111. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/16/2017. Manner of Service: email [16-1215, 16-1111] [Entered: 02/16/2017 08:59 AM]
February 14, 2017 [10444319] Notice of appearance submitted by Mark Andrew Sares for Appellee American Strategic Insurance Corp. in 16-1215Mark A. Sares for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/14/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215, 16-1111 ]--[Edited 02/15/2017 by DD to remove from 16-1277]--[Edited 02/16/2017 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/16/17] MAS [Entered: 02/14/2017 04:22 PM]
February 14, 2017 [10444318] Notice of appearance submitted by Mark Andrew Sares for Appellee Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company in 16-1111Mark A. Sares for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/14/2017. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215, 16-1111 ]--[Edited 02/15/2017 by DD to remove from 16-1277]--[Edited 02/16/2017 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/16/17] MAS [Entered: 02/14/2017 04:21 PM]
January 26, 2017 [10439652] Motion filed by Appellee Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company in 16-1111, 16-1215 for attorney Rachel Ollar Entrican to withdraw as counsel.. Served on: 01/26/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] ROE [Entered: 01/26/2017 02:13 PM]
December 29, 2016 [10432740] Notice of change of address filed by Bennett L. Cohen, Esq. for Shelter Mutual Insurance Company in 16-1111. [16-1111, 16-1215, 16-1277] BLC [Entered: 12/29/2016 03:39 PM]
December 13, 2016 [10428760] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring appellants reply on motion for sanctions [ # 10428689-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 12/13/2016. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 12/13/2016 08:45 AM]
December 12, 2016 [10428689] Reply filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215 to Served on 12/12/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 12/12/2016 11:16 PM]
December 6, 2016 [10426918] Order filed by Clerk of the Court (CMW). Appellants' "Motion for Sanctions, Pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 46.5(D) [ # 10423833-2 ] and Appellees' response [ # 10426893-2 ] are referred to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time) in 16-1111 and 16-1215. Served on 12/06/2016. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 12/06/2016 07:49 AM]
December 5, 2016 [10426893] Response filed by State Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 16-1111, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in 16-1215, This Response is being filed of all Defendants. to Plaintiffs-Appellants' Motion for Sanctions Pursaunt to 10th Cir. R. 46.5(D). Served on 12/05/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JS [Entered: 12/05/2016 04:35 PM]
December 5, 2016 [10426660] Errata sheet filed by Josue David Hernandez for Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Catherine Taylor, Martha Lemert, Gary Lemert, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Louise Creager, Janet Koch, Ian Siemplenski, Tommy Meyer, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Laila Saeda Urban and Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer in 16-1111. Original and 8 copies. Served on 12/05/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 12/05/2016 10:31 AM]
November 21, 2016 [10423833] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215 for attorney fees. Served on: 11/21/2016. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 11/21/2016 08:50 PM]
October 21, 2016 [10415570] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Marie E. Williams' motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Appellee American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Michael S. McCarthy will continue to represent the appellee, American Family Mutual Insurance Company in these appeals. Served on 10/21/2016. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 10/21/2016 12:18 PM]
October 21, 2016 [10415546] Response filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215 to motion of marie e. williams to withdraw as counsel. Served on 10/21/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 10/21/2016 11:41 AM]
October 21, 2016 [10415475] Motion filed by Appellee American Family Mututal Insurance Company in 16-1111, 16-1215 for attorney Marie E. Williams to withdraw as counsel.. Served on: 10/21/2016. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] MEW [Entered: 10/21/2016 09:34 AM]
October 20, 2016 [10415132] Appellants' corrected reply brief filed by Dale Snyder, et al. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 10/19/2016. Manner of Service: email. (filed by clerk per the 10/20/2016 order) [16-1111, 16-1215]--[Edited 12/05/2016 by JM to attach Errata sheet filed on 12/5/16] [Entered: 10/20/2016 10:10 AM]
October 20, 2016 [10415131] Order filed by Clerk of the Court (LLS) granting appellants' motion to file a corrected reply brief. The clerk shall file the corrected reply brief. Within 2 business days from the date of this order, appellants shall provide the court with 7 paper copies of the corrected reply brief. Served on 10/20/2016. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 10/20/2016 10:07 AM]
October 19, 2016 [10415015] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215 to file corrected/substitute brief. Served on: 10/19/2016. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 10/19/2016 10:00 PM]
October 11, 2016 This entry has been removed from the docket. Corrected reply brief filed 10/20/2016 per order of the court. [sds] [10412755] Appellant/Petitioner's reply brief filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. 8 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 10/11/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 10/11/2016 11:30 PM]
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order [10410997] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Phillips granting in part Appellants' motion to exceed the word count of their reply brief. The word limit for Appellants' reply brief is increased by 750 words, to a total of 7,750 words. Served on 10/04/2016. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 10/04/2016 01:38 PM]
October 4, 2016 [10410803] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215 to file an oversize brief 10500 words long. Served on: 10/04/2016. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 10/04/2016 12:35 AM]
September 22, 2016 [10407627] Minute order filed - Appellants optional reply brief now due 10/11/2016 for Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Catherine Taylor, Martha Lemert, Gary Lemert, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Louise Creager, Janet Koch, Ian Siemplenski, Tommy Meyer, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Laila Saeda Urban and Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer. (Text Only - No Attachment) [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 09/22/2016 04:08 PM]
September 21, 2016 [10407282] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, We are filing this Brief on behalf of all Defendants-Appellants who have appeared and who are participating.. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 09/21/2016. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [Docketed in companion case by clerk] [16-1215] [Entered: 09/22/2016 08:12 AM]
September 19, 2016 [10406286] Order filed by Clerk of the Court (LLS) granting Appellees' motion to submit appellees brief exceeding word limit by 1,500 words. Appellees may file a consolidated response brief of no more than 15,500 words. The response brief remains due on or before September 21, 2016. Served on 09/19/2016. --[Edited 09/20/2016 by SDS to attach corrected order] [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 09/19/2016 03:53 PM]
September 19, 2016 [10406162] Motion filed to submit appellees brief exceeding word limit by 1,500 words filed by all defendants-appellees. Served on 09/19/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 09/19/2016 01:49 PM]
August 17, 2016 [10397490] Appellants' corrected opening brief (filed per the court's 8/17/16 Order), filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Original and 7 copies. Served on 08/16/2016 by emaill. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 08/17/2016 02:25 PM]
August 17, 2016 [10397449] Order filed by Clerk of the Court (JKC) granting Appellants' motion to file a corrected brief. the clerk shall file the corrected opening brief. Within 2 business days from the date of this order, Appellants shall provide the court with 7 paper copies of the corrected opening brief. Served on 08/17/2016. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 08/17/2016 01:19 PM]
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order [10397431] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Phillips granting Appellees' motion to extend time to file their brief. Appellees' brief now due 09/21/2016. Served on 08/17/2016. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 08/17/2016 12:45 PM]
August 17, 2016 [10397246] Response filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215 to Appellees' Motion for 21-Day Extension of Time to File Answer Brief. Served on 08/17/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 08/17/2016 05:50 AM]
August 16, 2016 [10397245] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215 to file corrected/substitute brief. Served on: 08/16/2016. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 08/16/2016 11:15 PM]
August 16, 2016 [10397135] Motion filed by Appellee Farmers Insurance Exchange in 16-1111, 16-1215 to extend time to file appellee/respondent's brief until 09/21/2016. Served on: 08/16/2016. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] KWB [Entered: 08/16/2016 03:17 PM]
August 11, 2016 [10396059] Order filed by Clerk of the Court (LLS). Appellants "Notice of Errata as to Their Opening Brief" will not be accepted. If Appellants wish to make the changes identified in the "Notice," they must file a motion for leave to file a corrected brief (which includes opposing counsel's position), with the corrected brief attached. Appellants' motion and brief are due on 08/16/2016 for Appellants Dale Snyder, et al. Please refer to the order for additional information. Served on 08/11/2016. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 08/11/2016 02:11 PM]
August 10, 2016 [10395647] Errata sheet to Appellants' Opening Brief received, not filed (per the court's 8/11/16 Order). Served on 08/10/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 08/10/2016 03:31 PM]
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order [10395350] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Phillips referring United Policyholders motion to become amicus [ # 10391607-2 ] and appellees' response [ # 10395026-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 08/09/2016. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 08/09/2016 04:18 PM]
August 8, 2016 [10395026] Response filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange in 16-1111, 16-1215 to United Policyholders' Motion for Leave to File a Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Appellants. Served on 08/08/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] KWB [Entered: 08/08/2016 04:23 PM]
August 2, 2016 [10393135] Minute order filed correcting 8/1/16 docket entry - Appellees' response brief due 08/31/2016. (Text Only - No Attachment) [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 08/02/2016 08:30 AM]
August 1, 2016 This entry has been removed from the docket. [JMN a corrected hyperlinked version was filed on 8/17/16.] [10392992] Hyperlinked version of appellants' brief filed per court order of 8/1/16. Served on 07/28/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1111, 16-1215]--[Edited 08/03/2016 by JM to replace PDF with working hyperlinks.] [Entered: 08/01/2016 03:24 PM]
August 1, 2016 [10392986] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Kyle W. Brenton for Farmers Insurance Exchange. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/01/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 08/01/2016 03:17 PM]
August 1, 2016 [10392874] Notice of appearance submitted by Kyle W. Brenton for Appellee Farmers Insurance Exchange for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/01/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 08/01/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 8/1/16] [16-1215] KWB [Entered: 08/01/2016 01:58 PM]
August 1, 2016 [10392816] Order filed by Clerk of the Court (JKC) granting Appellants' motions to file their brief and appendix out of time, and to file a hyperlinked version of their opening brief. Appellants shall file within two business days from the date of this order, seven hard copies of the errata which was electronically filed on July 28, 2016. Appellees' response brief is now due 09/06/2016 for Allstate Insurance Company, et al. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 08/01/2016 12:09 PM]
July 29, 2016 [10392440] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215 to file brief out of time. Served on: 07/29/2016. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/29/2016 11:08 AM]
July 28, 2016 [10392244] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215 for leave to file a supplemental brief. Served on: 07/28/2016. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/28/2016 11:19 PM]
July 28, 2016 [10392243] Errata sheet filed by Josue David Hernandez for Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Original and 7 copies. Served on 07/28/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/29/2016 by SDS to modify party filers][16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/28/2016 11:07 PM]
July 27, 2016 [10391674] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - appellees' response to United Policyholders motion for leave to file an amicus brief due on 08/08/2016 for Acord Corporation, et al. Served on 07/27/2016. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 07/27/2016 10:37 AM]
July 26, 2016 [10391607] Motion for leave to file an amicus brief filed by United Policyholders in 16-1111, 16-1215. Served on 07/26/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 07/27/2016 08:03 AM]
July 26, 2016 [10391580] Amicus Curiae brief received from but not filed by United Policyholders (Amy Bach). 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 07/26/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 08/09/2016 by SDS to show received not filed] [16-1111, 16-1215] ARB [Entered: 07/26/2016 06:15 PM]
July 26, 2016 This entry has been removed from the docket. Motion filed by clerk as of 07/26/2016. [sds] [10391579] Motion submitted by United Policyholders (Amy Bach) for leave to file an amicus brief. Served on: 07/26/2016 Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] ARB [Entered: 07/26/2016 06:13 PM]
July 22, 2016 [10390847] Notice of appellants' deficient brief and appendix received from Dale Snyer, et al. in 16-1111, 16-1215. Type of deficiencies for brief: One day late. Type of deficiencies for appendix: No certificates of compliance. See attached letter for specifics. Corrected appendix via errata sheet and motion re late brief now due 08/01/2016 for appellants' Dale Snyer, et al. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 07/22/2016 04:36 PM]
July 21, 2016 [10390119] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Volumes 20 & 21. Total number of volumes filed: 21. Served on 07/21/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/21/2016 03:41 AM]
July 21, 2016 [10390118] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Volumes 18 & 19. Total number of volumes filed: 21. Served on 07/21/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/21/2016 03:39 AM]
July 21, 2016 [10390117] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Volumes 16 & 17. Total number of volumes filed: 21. Served on 07/21/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/21/2016 03:36 AM]
July 21, 2016 [10390116] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Volume 15. Total number of volumes filed:. Served on 07/21/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/21/2016 03:31 AM]
July 21, 2016 [10390115] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Volumes 12 thru 14. Total number of volumes filed: 21. Served on 07/21/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/21/2016 03:29 AM]
July 21, 2016 [10390114] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Volumes 9 thru 11. Total number of volumes filed: 21. Served on 07/21/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/21/2016 03:26 AM]
July 21, 2016 [10390113] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Volumes 7 & 8. Total number of volumes filed: 21. Served on 07/21/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/21/2016 03:15 AM]
July 21, 2016 [10390112] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Volumes 5 & 6. Total number of volumes filed: 21. Served on 07/21/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/21/2016 03:11 AM]
July 21, 2016 This entry has been removed from the docket. [JMN PDF deleted a corrected hyperlinked version was filed on 8/1/16.] [10390111] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111 and 16-1215. 8 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 07/21/2016 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 07/29/2016 by SDS to attach errata to entry] [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/21/2016 03:09 AM]
July 21, 2016 [10390110] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Volumes 1 thru 4. Total number of volumes filed: 4. Served on 07/21/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 07/29/2016 by SDS to attach errata to entry] [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/21/2016 03:06 AM]
July 21, 2016 This entry has been removed from the docket. [Per a conversation with counsel, the errata sheet was filed in error. KF] [10390109] Errata sheet to appellants' brief filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111 and 16-1215. Original and 1 copies. Served on 07/20/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/21/2016 12:00 AM]
July 20, 2016 This entry has been removed from the docket. [Per a conversation with counsel, this is a duplicate filing. KF] [10390108] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Volumes 3 and 4. Total number of volumes filed: 21. Served on 07/20/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/20/2016 11:37 PM]
July 20, 2016 This entry has been removed from the docket. [Per a conversation with counsel, this is a duplicate filing. KF] [10390107] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111, 16-1215. Volumes 1 and 2. Total number of volumes filed: 21. Served on 07/20/2016. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 07/20/2016 11:27 PM]
July 13, 2016 [10387961] Notice of appearance filed by Josue David Hernandez for Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer in 16-1111, 16-1215. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/12/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 07/13/2016 12:18 PM]
July 12, 2016 [10387680] Notice of appearance submitted by Josue David Hernandez for Appellant Dorothy Wood Hammer in 16-1277, 16-1111, 16-1215The Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/12/2016. Manner of Service: email--[Edited 07/13/2016 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 7/13/16]. [16-1215, 16-1111] JDH [Entered: 07/12/2016 03:42 PM]
June 22, 2016 [10380925] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Robert J. Kelly and Mr. Daniel M. Reilly for Insurance Services Office, Inc. and Verisk Analytics Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/22/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/22/2016 12:37 PM]
June 22, 2016 [10380913] Notice of appearance submitted by Daniel M. Reilly and Robert J. Kelly for Appellees Insurance Services Office, Inc. and Verisk Analytics Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/22/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/22/2016 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/22/2016] DMR [Entered: 06/22/2016 12:21 PM]
June 16, 2016 [10378956] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Randall A. Hack and Brian Ignatius Hays for Farmers Insurance Exchange. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/16/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/16/2016 10:16 AM]
June 16, 2016 [10378947] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Thomas Peyton Johnson, Esq. for Farmers Insurance Exchange. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/16/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/16/2016 10:07 AM]
June 16, 2016 [10378901] Notice of appearance submitted by Randall Allan Hack and Brian I. Hays for Appellee Farmers Insurance Exchange for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/16/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/16/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 6/16/16] [16-1215] TPJ [Entered: 06/16/2016 08:49 AM]
June 16, 2016 [10378899] Notice of appearance submitted by Thomas P. Johnson for Appellee Farmers Insurance Exchange for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/16/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/16/2016 by JM to remove PDF as pleading was filed by the court on 6/16/16. ] TPJ [Entered: 06/16/2016 08:48 AM]
June 15, 2016 [10378732] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Ms. Holly Stein Sollod for Casualty Actuarial Society. [16-1215] HSS [Entered: 06/15/2016 02:08 PM]
June 15, 2016 [10378576] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. William F. Jones, Esq. for American International Group, Inc. in 16-1215. [16-1215, 16-1111] WFJ [Entered: 06/15/2016 11:40 AM]
June 15, 2016 [10378557] Notice of appearance filed by Robert Zupkus and Ms. Muliha A. Khan for Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/15/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/15/2016 11:29 AM]
June 15, 2016 [10378552] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Robert Zupkus for Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company. [16-1215] RZ [Entered: 06/15/2016 11:22 AM]
June 15, 2016 [10378543] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Muliha A. Khan, Esq. and Robert Zupkus for Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/15/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/15/2016 11:07 AM]
June 15, 2016 [10378540] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Ms. Muliha A. Khan, Esq. for Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc.. [16-1215] MAK [Entered: 06/15/2016 11:01 AM]
June 15, 2016 [10378532] Notice of appearance submitted by Muliha A. Khan Robert A. Zupkus for Appellee Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/15/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/15/2016 by LG to remove PDF from entry, a pleading was filed on 6/15/2016] MAK [Entered: 06/15/2016 10:58 AM]
June 15, 2016 [10378530] Notice of appearance submitted by Muliha A. Khan and Robert A. Zupkus for Appellee Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/15/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/15/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 6/15/16] [16-1215] MAK [Entered: 06/15/2016 10:56 AM]
June 15, 2016 [10378523] Notice of appearance filed by Holly Stein Sollod for Casualty Actuarial Society. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/15/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/15/2016 10:33 AM]
June 15, 2016 [10378485] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. James P. Gaughan for State Automobile Insurance Company and Milbank Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/15/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/15/2016 09:34 AM]
June 15, 2016 [10378463] Notice of appearance submitted by Holly Stein Sollod for Appellee Casualty Actuarial Society for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/15/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/15/2016 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 6/15/16][16-1215] HSS [Entered: 06/15/2016 08:59 AM]
June 15, 2016 [10378454] Notice of appearance submitted by James P. Gaughan Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP for Appellees Milbank Insurance Company and State Automobile Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/15/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/15/2016 by JM to remove PDF as pleading was filed by the court on 6/15/16. ] JPG [Entered: 06/15/2016 08:47 AM]
June 15, 2016 [10378414] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. William F. Jones and Mr. Eric B. Liebman for American International Group, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/14/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/15/2016 07:20 AM]
June 14, 2016 [10378403] Notice of appearance submitted by William F. Jones and Eric B. Liebman for Appellee American International Group, Inc. in 16-1215 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/14/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/15/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 6/15/16] [16-1215] WFJ [Entered: 06/14/2016 05:44 PM]
June 14, 2016 [10378371] Notice issued. Notice of appearance due on 06/24/2016 for ABC Insurance Company, ABC Organization, American International Group, Inc., Casualty Actuarial Society, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Internation Insurnace Society, Inc., Milbank Insurance Company, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc. and Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. If these parties do not intend to particiapte in this appeal, please file a notice of non-participation with the court as soon as possible. [Text only entry - no document attached] [16-1215] [Entered: 06/14/2016 04:16 PM]
June 13, 2016 [10377803] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Thomas W. Curvin for Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Zurich American Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/13/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/13/2016 12:12 PM]
June 13, 2016 [10377792] Notice of appearance submitted by Thomas W. Curvin for Appellees Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Zurich American Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/13/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/13/2016 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [16-1215] TWC [Entered: 06/13/2016 11:54 AM]
June 13, 2016 [10377768] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Alan Epstein for American Automobile Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., Associated Indemnity Corporation and Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Mr. Thomas John Lyons for American Automobile Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., Associated Indemnity Corporation and Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company and Ms. Lisa F. Mickley for American Automobile Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., Associated Indemnity Corporation and Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company. [16-1215] LFM [Entered: 06/13/2016 11:12 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377515] Notice of appearance filed by Gary L. Fleming for Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company and American Strategic Insurance Corp. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 03:28 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377508] Notice of appearance submitted by Gary L. Fleming for Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company and American Strategic Insurance Corp. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email, US mail. --[Edited 06/10/2016 by SDS to modify event and docket text and to remove from case 16-1111. Pdf removed as pleading refiled by clerk] [16-1215] GLF [Entered: 06/10/2016 03:18 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377506] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Gary L. Fleming for Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company and American Strategic Insurance Corp. in 16-1215. [16-1215, 16-1111] GLF [Entered: 06/10/2016 03:15 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377465] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Kendall W Harrison for Praetorian Insurance Company, National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company and QBE Insurance Group, Limited. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 02:34 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377446] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Gregory Giometti and Mr. John D. Mereness for Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 02:14 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377435] Notice of appearance submitted by Gregory R. Giometti and John D. Mereness for Appellees Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/10/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 6/10/16] [16-1215] GG [Entered: 06/10/2016 01:43 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377425] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Bradley L. Snyder for The Buckeye State Mututal Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 01:29 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377416] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Sheryl Anderson for Allstate Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company of America, Mr. Richard L. Fenton for Allstate Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company of America, Mark L Hanover for Allstate Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company of America and Brandi J. Pummell for Allstate Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company of America in 16-1215. [16-1215, 16-1111] SA [Entered: 06/10/2016 01:20 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377412] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Bradley L. Snyder for The Buckeye State Mututal Insurance Company. [16-1215] BLS [Entered: 06/10/2016 01:12 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377410] Notice of appearance submitted by Bradley L. Snyder for Appellee The Buckeye State Mututal Insurance CompanyAppellee/Respondent for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/10/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 6/10/16] [16-1215] BLS [Entered: 06/10/2016 01:10 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377384] Notice of appearance submitted by Kendall W. Harrison for Appellees National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company and QBE Insurance Group, Limited for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/10/2016 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [16-1215] KWH [Entered: 06/10/2016 12:37 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377379] Minute order filed by Clerk of the Court - Pursuant to the court's 06/08/2016 order, Appellants' brief and appendix due on 07/20/2016 for Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Served on 06/10/2016. Text only entry - no attachment. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 12:30 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377373] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 06/10/2016. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 12:22 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377370] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Alan Johnson for American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Mordern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, Munich-American Holding Corporation, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company and Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (Interested parties listed already appear in the case.) Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 12:19 PM]
June 10, 2016 [10377332] Notice of appearance submitted by Mark A. Johnson for Appellees American Family Home Insurance Company, American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Select Insurance Company, American Mordern Insurance Group, Inc., Cincinnati Insurance Company, Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of America, The California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company and Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/10/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 9/10/16] [16-1215] MAJ [Entered: 06/10/2016 11:23 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377283] Notice of appearance filed by Mark Frederick Horning for Acord Corporation and Mr. Frank W. Visciano, Esq. for Acord Corporation. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (The name listed is an attorney previously listed in this case.) Served on 06/10/2015. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 10:18 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377272] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Frank W. Visciano, Esq. for Acord Corporation in 16-1215. [16-1215] FWV [Entered: 06/10/2016 10:11 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377268] Notice of appearance filed by Sheryl Anderson, Mr. Richard L. Fenton, Mark L Hanover and Brandi J. Pummell for Allstate Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 10:03 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377264] Notice of appearance submitted by Frank W. Visciano and Mark F. Horning for Appellee Acord Corporation in 16-1215 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/10/2016 by KF. PDF remvoed. The pleading is filed on 6/10/16 in 16-1215.] [16-1215] FWV [Entered: 06/10/2016 09:55 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377238] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Lisa M. Lilly for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party already listed in case. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 09:21 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377231] Notice of appearance submitted by Sheryl L. Anderson Brandi J. Pummell Richard L. Fenton Mark L. Hanover for Appellees Allstate Insurance Company, Encompass Indemnity Company and Encompass Insurance Company of America in 16-1215 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/10/2016 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [16-1215] SA [Entered: 06/10/2016 09:15 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377220] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Ms. Lisa M. Lilly for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. [16-1215] LML [Entered: 06/10/2016 09:00 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377218] Notice of appearance submitted by Lisa M. Lilly for Appellees MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/10/2016 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/10/2016] LML [Entered: 06/10/2016 08:55 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377208] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 07/05/2016 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 08:46 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377198] Docketing statement filed by Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1215. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/10/2016 by SDS to remove from case 16-1111] [16-1215] JDH [Entered: 06/10/2016 08:30 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377162] Notice of deficient docketing statement received from all Appellants. Type of deficiency: The order/judgment appealed from is not attached. Corrected docketing statement or an errata sheet is due on 06/20/2016 for Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 07:33 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377160] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Lelia Kathleen Chaney and Mr. Jerad Adam West for United Fire & Casualty Company, Addison Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, Employers Mututal Casualty Company, Lafayette Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, United Fire Insurance Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Fire Lloyds and United Life Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 07:27 AM]
June 10, 2016 [10377157] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Matthew David Spohn for Markel Insurance Company and Markel American Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. (Interested parties lised already appear in the case.) Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 07:20 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10377221] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Casie D. Collignon, Esq. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Liberty Insurance Corporation, American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Mordern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, LM Insurance Corporation, Munich-American Holding Corporation, The California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company and Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 09:01 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10377213] Notice of appearance filed by Josue David Hernandez for Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Catherine Taylor, Martha Lemert, Gary Lemert, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Louise Creager, Janet Koch, Ian Siemplenski, Tommy Meyer, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Laila Saeda Urban and Dorothy Wood Hammer. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 08:51 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10377197] Notice of appearance filed by Jason D. Krueger and Stuart Morse for Central Mutual Insurance Company, All America Insurance Compnay and Grange Insurance Association. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 08:29 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10377192] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Michael Lawrence O'Donnell, Esq. and Mr. Terence M. Ridley, Esq. for Electric Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 06/10/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/10/2016 08:26 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10377152] Notice that the transcript is already on file filed by Josue David Hernandez for Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Catherine Taylor, Martha Lemert, Gary Lemert, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Louise Creager, Janet Koch, Ian Siemplenski, Tommy Meyer, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Laila Saeda Urban and Dorothy Wood Hammer in 16-1215. Served on: 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/10/2016 by LG to correct event code] JDH [Entered: 06/09/2016 10:28 PM]
June 9, 2016 This entry has been removed from the docket. Corrected docketing statement filed 06/10/2016. [sds] [10377151] Docketing statement filed by Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1215. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] JDH [Entered: 06/09/2016 10:26 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377150] Notice of appearance submitted by Josue David Hernandez for Appellants Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1215 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/10/2016 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [16-1215] JDH [Entered: 06/09/2016 10:24 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377147] Notice of appearance submitted by L. Kathleen Chaney and Jerad A. West for Appellees Addison Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, Employers Mututal Casualty Company, Lafayette Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds and United Fire and Indemnity Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/10/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 9/10/16] [16-1215] LKC [Entered: 06/09/2016 05:34 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377143] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Matthew David Spohn for Markel Insurance Company and Markel American Insurance Company. [16-1215] MDS [Entered: 06/09/2016 05:01 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377141] Notice of appearance submitted by Matthew David Spohn for Appellees Markel American Insurance Company and Markel Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/10/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 6/10/16] [16-1215] MDS [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:57 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377140] Notice of appearance submitted by Casie D. Collignon for for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/10/2016 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [16-1215] CDC [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:57 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377136] Notice of appearance submitted by Jason D. Krueger Stuart D. Morse for Appellees All American Insurance Company, Central Mutual Insurance Company and Grange Insurance Association for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/10/2016 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/10/2016] JDK [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:50 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377129] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Robert David Helfand and John C. Pitblado for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida and American Reliable Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested parties already listed in case. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:32 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377127] Notice of appearance filed by Alan Epstein, Thomas John Lyons and Lisa F. Mickley for American Automobile Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., Associated Indemnity Corporation and Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:30 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377126] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Terence M. Ridley, Esq. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, First American Financial Corporation, Electric Insurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company and First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. [16-1215] TMR [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:30 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377117] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Terence M. Ridley, Esq. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, First American Financial Corporation, Electric Insurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company and First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. [16-1215] TMR [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:19 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377116] Notice of appearance filed by Terence M. Ridley, Ms. Erin F. Frohardt and Evan Bennett Stephenson for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, and American Reliable Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:18 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377111] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Terence M. Ridley, Esq. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, First American Financial Corporation, Electric Insurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company and First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. [16-1215] TMR [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:10 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377110] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Evan B. Stephenson for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, First American Financial Corporation, Electric Insurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company and First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. [16-1215] EBS [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:09 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377105] Notice of appearance submitted by Thomas J. Lyons, Lisa F. Mickley, and Alan Epstein for Appellees Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation and Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/09/2016 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 6/9/16] [16-1215] TJL [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:04 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377104] Notice of appearance submitted by Robert D. Helfand John C. Pitblado for Appellees American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida and American Reliable Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/09/2016 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/9/2016] EBS [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:04 PM]
June 9, 2016 This entry has been removed from the docket as attached document was Entry of Appearance which was already filed. Designation of Record not needed. [DD] [10377098] Designation of record filed by Appellees Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation and Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] TJL [Entered: 06/09/2016 03:57 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377089] Notice of appearance submitted by Michael L. O'Donnell Terence M. Ridley for Appellee Electric Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/10/2016 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [16-1215] TMR [Entered: 06/09/2016 03:51 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377072] Notice of appearance submitted by Terence M. Ridley Evan Bennett Stephenson Erin F. Frohardt for Appellees American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida and American Reliable Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/09/2016 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/9/2016] TMR [Entered: 06/09/2016 03:40 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377063] Notice of appearance filed by Stephen J. Jorden for Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 03:32 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377043] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffrey C. Ruebel, Esq. for Guideone Mutual Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 03:07 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377041] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Michael Scott Campbell and Mr. Robert Charles Blume for Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Companies Inc., The Travelers Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company and Travelers Indemnity Company of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 03:05 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377026] Notice of appearance filed by Jessica L. Fuller and Joel A. Glover for American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 02:54 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377023] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Michael S. McCarthy and Ms. Marie Elizabeth Williams for American Family Mututal Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 02:51 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377022] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Stephen J. Jorden for Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America. [16-1215] SJJ [Entered: 06/09/2016 02:51 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377020] Notice of appearance submitted by Stephen James Jorden for Appellee Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] --[Edited 06/09/2016 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/9/2016] SJJ [Entered: 06/09/2016 02:49 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10377013] Notice of appearance submitted by Robert C. Blume M. Scott Campbell for Appellees Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Companies Inc., The Travelers Insurance Company, Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company and Travelers Indemnity Company of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/09/2016 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [16-1215] RCB [Entered: 06/09/2016 02:44 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376983] Notice of appearance filed by Rowe W. Snider and Julia C. Webb for American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 02:26 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376981] Notice of appearance submitted by Jeffrey Clay Ruebel for Appellee Guideone Mutual Insurance Company in 16-1215 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/09/2016 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/9/2016] JCR [Entered: 06/09/2016 02:25 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376974] Notice of appearance submitted by Joel A. Glover Jessica L. Fuller for Appellee American Association of Insurance Services, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/09/2016 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 6/9/16] [16-1215] JLF [Entered: 06/09/2016 02:20 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376932] Notice of appearance filed by Lori McAllister for Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 01:50 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376916] Notice of appearance filed by Christopher Ash and Stephen Clawson Robertson for McKinsey & Company, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 01:34 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376913] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Michael S. McCarthy for American Family Mututal Insurance Company and Ms. Marie Elizabeth Williams for American Family Mututal Insurance Company. [16-1215] MSM [Entered: 06/09/2016 01:29 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376909] Notice of appearance submitted by Michael S. McCarthy and Marie E. Williams for Appellee American Family Mututal Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/09/2016 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [16-1215] MSM [Entered: 06/09/2016 01:27 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376905] Notice of appearance filed by Mrs. Cynthia Mitchell for Hartford Fire Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. and Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 01:21 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376902] Notice of appearance submitted by Christopher Carr Ash and Stephen Clawson Robertson for Appellee McKinsey & Company, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/09/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 6/9/16] [16-1215] SCR [Entered: 06/09/2016 01:19 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376893] Notice of appearance filed by Douglas W. Dunham, Marilyn S. Chappell, Elizabeth Helmer, Mr. Michael P. Kenny and Jon Sands for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, and State Automobile Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 01:11 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376887] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mrs. Cynthia Mitchell for Hartford Fire Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. and Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. [16-1215] CM [Entered: 06/09/2016 01:07 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376885] Notice of appearance submitted by Cynthia Mitchell for Appellees Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/09/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 6/9/16] [16-1215] CM [Entered: 06/09/2016 01:05 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376869] Notice of appearance submitted by Rowe W. Snider and Julia C. Webb for Appellee American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.American Association of Insurance Services, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/09/2016 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 6/9/16][16-1215] JCW [Entered: 06/09/2016 12:50 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376868] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. William J. Kelly, III, Esq. for Country Mutual Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 12:49 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376861] Notice of appearance submitted by Jon F. Sands Douglas Dunham Marilyn S. Chappell Michael P. Kenny Elizabeth Helmer for Appellees State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/09/2016 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/9/2016] JS [Entered: 06/09/2016 12:41 PM]
June 9, 2016 This entry has been removed from the docket. [KF. McKinsey & Company, Inc. Wshington D.C. is not a party in this case. Counsel contacted and will re-file] [10376840] Notice of appearance submitted by Christopher Carr Ash and Stephen C. Robertson for Appellees McKinsey & Company, Inc. and McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] SCR [Entered: 06/09/2016 12:22 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376823] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Erin F. Frohardt , Mr. Terence M. Ridley and Mr. Evan B. Stephenson for First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (Interested party listed already appears in the case.) Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 12:00 PM]
June 9, 2016 [10376804] Notice of appearance submitted by Terence M. Ridley, Evan Bennett Stephenson and Erin F. Frohardt for Appellee First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/09/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 6/9/16] [16-1215] TMR [Entered: 06/09/2016 11:32 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376803] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Erin F. Frohardt , Mr. Terence M. Ridley, and Mr. Evan B. Stephenson for First American Financial Corporation. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party already listed in case. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 11:32 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376790] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Lori McAllister for Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company. [16-1215] LM [Entered: 06/09/2016 11:19 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376787] Notice of appearance submitted by Lori McAllister for Appellees Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/09/2016 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 6/9/16][16-1215] LM [Entered: 06/09/2016 11:17 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376786] Notice of appearance submitted by Terence M. Ridley Evan Bennett Stephenson Erin F. Frohardt for Appellee First American Financial Corporation for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/09/2016 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/9/2016] TMR [Entered: 06/09/2016 11:15 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376773] Notice of appearance filed by James Bernard and Elizabeth C. Carter for McKinsey & Company, Inc., a/k/a McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 11:06 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376764] Notice of appearance filed by John Mark Vaught for United Services Automobile Association and USAA Casualty Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 10:57 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376753] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Jeremy Andrew Moseley for United Services Automobile Association, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and Electric Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 10:51 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376739] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. William J. Kelly, III, Esq. for Country Mutual Insurance Company. [16-1215] WJK [Entered: 06/09/2016 10:45 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376732] Notice of appearance submitted by William J. Kelly III for Appellee Country Mutual Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/09/2016 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [16-1215] WJK [Entered: 06/09/2016 10:44 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376702] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Rachel Ollar Entrican, Esq.and Mr. Larry S. McClung for Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/09/2016 10:05 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376698] Notice of appearance submitted by James L. Bernard and Elizabeth Carter for Appellee Mckinsey & Company, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/09/2016 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 6/9/16][16-1215] JB [Entered: 06/09/2016 09:58 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376687] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Jeremy Andrew Moseley for United Services Automobile Association, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and Electric Insurance Company. [16-1215] JAM [Entered: 06/09/2016 09:50 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376685] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Ms. Rachel Ollar Entrican, Esq. for Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company. [16-1215] ROE [Entered: 06/09/2016 09:48 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376684] Notice of appearance submitted by Jeremy A. Moseley for Appellees Electric Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and United Services Automobile Association for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/09/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 6/9/16] [16-1215] JAM [Entered: 06/09/2016 09:47 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376678] Notice of appearance submitted by Larry S. McClung, Rachel Ollar Entrican for Appellee Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/09/2016 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [16-1215] ROE [Entered: 06/09/2016 09:43 AM]
June 9, 2016 [10376675] Notice of appearance submitted by John M. Vaught for Appellees USAA Casualty Insurance Company and United Services Automobile Association for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/09/2016 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 6/9/16] [16-1215] JMV [Entered: 06/09/2016 09:40 AM]
June 8, 2016 [10376510] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Jacob C. Cohn and Mr. John M. Palmeri for Federal Insurance Company, Vigilant Insurance Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, The Chubb Corporation, Chubb National Insurance Compnay and Chubb Services Corporation. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. (Interested parties listed already appear in this case.) Served on 06/08/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/08/2016 03:23 PM]
June 8, 2016 [10376491] Notice of appearance submitted by John M. Palmeri and Jacob C. Cohn for Appellees Chubb National Insurance Compnay, Chubb Services Corporation, Federal Insurance Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, The Chubb Corporation and Vigilant Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/08/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/08/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 6/8/16] [16-1215] JMP [Entered: 06/08/2016 03:01 PM]
June 8, 2016 [10376355] Notice of appearance filed by Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen for Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/08/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/08/2016 12:01 PM]
June 8, 2016 [10376278] Order filed by Clerk of the Court (ERR) granting in part Appellants' unopposed motion to consolidate appeals. The appeals are consolidated for the purposes of briefing, appendix and submission. Appellants may file an opening brief of no more than 15,500 words. Further ordered that the consolidated opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed within 40 days of the date the notice of record complete is received in appeal no. 16-1215. Served on 06/08/2016. [16-1111, 16-1215] [Entered: 06/08/2016 10:06 AM]
June 8, 2016 [10376227] Notice of appearance filed by Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen for National Casualty Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company fo America and Nationwide Insurance Company of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previously disclosed). Served on 06/08/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/08/2016 08:20 AM]
June 8, 2016 [10376222] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen for National Casualty Company, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company fo America and Nationwide Insurance Company of America in 16-1215, 16-1111. [16-1215, 16-1111] SKI [Entered: 06/08/2016 08:09 AM]
June 8, 2016 [10376215] Notice of appearance submitted by S. Kirk Ingebretsen for Appellees National Casualty Company, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company fo America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company in 16-1215 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/08/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/08/2016 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed. Entry also removed from case 16-1111] [16-1215] SKI [Entered: 06/08/2016 07:56 AM]
June 8, 2016 [10376209] Notice of appearance submitted by S. Kirk Ingebretsen for Appellee Property Casualty Insurers Association of America in 16-1215 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/08/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/08/2016 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 6/8/16][16-1215] SKI [Entered: 06/08/2016 07:53 AM]
June 7, 2016 [10376018] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Mark W. Bayer for Insurance Services Office, Inc. and Verisk Analytics Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/07/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215] [Entered: 06/07/2016 01:03 PM]
June 7, 2016 [10376005] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Mark W. Bayer for Insurance Services Office, Inc. and Verisk Analytics Inc.. [16-1215] MWB [Entered: 06/07/2016 12:47 PM]
June 7, 2016 [10375997] Notice of appearance submitted by Mark W. Bayer for Appellees Insurance Services Office, Inc. and Verisk Analytics Inc. in 16-1215 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/07/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215, 16-1111]--[Edited 06/07/2016 by JM to remove PDF as pleading was filed by the court on 6/7/16.] MWB [Entered: 06/07/2016 12:40 PM]
June 3, 2016 [10375240] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1111 to consolidate appeals. Served on: 06/03/2015. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215] JDH [Entered: 06/03/2016 04:04 PM]
June 1, 2016 [10374325] Notice of appearance filed by Richard Mancino for Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/01/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/01/2016 03:44 PM]
June 1, 2016 [10374322] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Ty Gee, Esq. for Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/01/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1215] [Entered: 06/01/2016 03:37 PM]
June 1, 2016 [10374315] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Mr. Ty Gee, Esq. for Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. [16-1215] TG [Entered: 06/01/2016 03:23 PM]
June 1, 2016 [10374312] Notice of appearance submitted by Richard William Mancino for Appellee Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/01/2016. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/01/2016 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 6/1/16][16-1215] TG [Entered: 06/01/2016 03:20 PM]
June 1, 2016 [10374309] Notice of appearance submitted by Ty Gee for Appellee Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/01/2016. Manner of Service: email. [16-1215]--[Edited 06/01/2016 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/1/2016] TG [Entered: 06/01/2016 03:18 PM]
May 26, 2016 [10372756] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/26/2016. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 06/09/2016 for Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Notice of appearance due on 06/09/2016 for ABC Insurance Company, ABC Organization, Acord Corporation, Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., Allstate Insurance Company, American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Family Mututal Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Select Insurance Company, American Mordern Insurance Group, Inc., American Reliable Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Compnay, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mututal Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Internation Insurnace Society, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Corporation, Markel Insurance Company, Mckinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Milbank Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, National Casualty Company, National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, National Surety Corporation, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company fo America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Standard Fire Insurance Company, State Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stillwater Property and Caualty Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, The Buckeye State Mututal Insurance Company, The California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The Chubb Corporation, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The Travelers Companies Inc., The Travelers Insurance Company, The Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Group, Inc., United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Verisk Analytics Inc., Vigilant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company and Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. [16-1215] [Entered: 05/26/2016 12:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Snyder, et al v. Acord Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BUCKEYE STATE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Buckeye Insurance Group
Represented By: Bradley L. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELECTRIC INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Moseley
Represented By: Michael Lawrence O'Donnell Esq.
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley Esq.
Represented By: Evan B. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Brandi J. Pummell
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABC ORGANIZATION, an entity or group of entities, whose true names are unknown
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SENTRY INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHELTER MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation
Represented By: Bennett L. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Philip Wayne Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERISK ANALYTICS INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, an Iowa corporation a/k/a Farmers Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Randall A. Hack
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Represented By: Brian Ignatius Hays
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN INDEMNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a Guideone Insurance
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ruebel Esq.
Represented By: Laurie Jo Wiedenhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP., a Florida corporation
Represented By: Thomas H. Falivene
Represented By: Jamey W. Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas corporation
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Moseley
Represented By: John Mark Vaught
Represented By: Jessica G. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SECURA INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., a Wisconsi corporation
Represented By: Muliha A. Khan Esq.
Represented By: Shaun McParland Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a The Central Insurance Companies
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: William A. Savino
Represented By: Stuart D. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, a Colordo non-profit corporation
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Cynthia Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation a/k/a Fireman's Fund Insurance Company of Missouri
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACORD CORPORATION
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Douglas W. Dunham
Represented By: Marilyn Sue Chappell Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Jon Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN RELIABLE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley Esq.
Represented By: Robert David Helfand
Represented By: Erin F. Frohardt
Represented By: John Pitblado
Represented By: Evan B. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRANGE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, a Washington corporation
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Stuart D. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation b/b/a First American Property & Casualty Group
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley Esq.
Represented By: Erin F. Frohardt
Represented By: Evan B. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Brandi J. Pummell
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLORADO FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., a Colorado corporation
Represented By: Ellis Mayer
Represented By: William Arnold Waddell Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Thomas H. Falivene
Represented By: Jamey W. Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew David Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEMPER CORPORATE SERVICES, INC., an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Lisa M. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN MODERN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MUNICH-AMERICAN HOLDING CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES INC., A Minnesota corporation
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a United Fire Group
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation
Represented By: Randall A. Hack
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QBE INSURANCE GROUP, LIMITED
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STILLWATER PROPERTY AND CAUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation a/k/a Fidelity National Property and Casulty Insurance Company d/b/a Stillwater Insurance Group
Represented By: Lawrence D. Stone Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation
Represented By: Lisa M. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST AMERICAN FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley Esq.
Represented By: Erin F. Frohardt
Represented By: Evan B. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LM INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Jacqueline K. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation
Represented By: James P. Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Ohio corpoarion
Represented By: James P. Gaughan
Represented By: Jon Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE INSURANCE GROUP, INC., an Iowa corporation d/b/a United Fire Group
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INSURANCE SERVICES OFFICE, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Represented By: Robert J. Kelly
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE, a California corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADDISON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Cynthia Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation
Represented By: Thomas W. Curvin
Represented By: Michael R. McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITRIN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHARMACISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Larry S. McClung
Represented By: Rachel Ollar Entrican Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation a/k/a McKinsey & Company, Inc. washington D.C.
Represented By: James Bernard
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Carter
Represented By: Stephen Clawson Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN MODERN HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLIANZ OF AMERICA, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporationd/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance d/b/a Home-Owners Insurance
Represented By: John D. Mereness
Represented By: Gregory Giometti
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, a Texas corporation
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Moseley
Represented By: John Mark Vaught
Represented By: Jessica G. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, a Massachusetts corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Jacqueline K. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew David Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METLIFE AUTO & HOME INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.
Represented By: Lisa M. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Jacqueline K. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZURICH INSURANCE GROUP LTD/FI, a Switzerland corporation
Represented By: Richard Mancino
Represented By: Saskia A. Jordan
Represented By: Andrew T. Hanrahan
Represented By: Ty Gee Esq.
Represented By: Joseph G. Davis
Represented By: Frank M. Scaduto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, a Maryland corporation
Represented By: Thomas W. Curvin
Represented By: Michael R. McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Chanda Marie Feldkamp
Represented By: William J. Kelly Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., a Delaware non-profit corporation
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Jessica L. Fuller
Represented By: Rowe W. Snider
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Knuckey
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QBE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation a/k/a QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASSOCIATED INDEMNITY CORPORATION, a California corporation
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Sara Z. Moghadam
Represented By: Timothy Michael Swanson
Represented By: Eric B. Liebman
Represented By: William Frederick Jones
Represented By: Keara M. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CASUALTY ACTUARIAL SOCIETY, an Illinois not for profit corporation
Represented By: Holly Stein Sollod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAFAYETTE INSURANCE COMPANY, a/k/a United Lifre Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD CONNECTICUT, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a EMC Incurance Companies
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE LLOYDS, a Texas corporation
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a New Hampshire corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Jacqueline K. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEXAS GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Colorado corporation
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Nationwide Insurance
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Jacqueline K. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHUBB SERVICES CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN MODERN INSURANCE GROUP, INC., an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, a Florida corporation
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley Esq.
Represented By: Robert David Helfand
Represented By: Erin F. Frohardt
Represented By: John Pitblado
Represented By: Evan B. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, an entity whose true name is unknown d/b/a Untied Fire Group
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Douglas W. Dunham
Represented By: Marilyn Sue Chappell Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Jon Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Michael S. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL FARMERS UNION PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLIANZ LIFE INSURANCE CO. OF NORTH AMERICA, a Minnesota corporation
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE CHUBB CORPORATION, a New Jersey corporation
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QBE HOLDINGS, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN FAMILY HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation
Represented By: Lisa M. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Illinoise corporation d/b/a Encompass Insurance
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Brandi J. Pummell
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FARMERS ALLIANCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Kansas corporation
Represented By: Robert Zupkus
Represented By: Muliha A. Khan Esq.
Represented By: James A. Pinderski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, A New York corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEMPER CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERNATION INSURANCE SOCIETY, INC., a Delware non-profit corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Michigan corporation d/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance
Represented By: John D. Mereness
Represented By: Gregory Giometti
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Cynthia Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Texas corporation
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TOMMY MEYER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH DALE YODER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANET KOCH
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IAN SIEMPLENSKI
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUEHAM KAY HOFFMAN
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY HARROW
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LOUISE CREAGER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARTHA LEMERT
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ESTATE OF DOROTHY WOOD HAMMER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DALE SNYDER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARILYN SNYDER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CATHERINE TAYLOR
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY RAY
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAILA SAEDA URBAN
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NICOLE WRIGHT-MEYER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY ANN GELDREICH
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER RAY
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GARY LEMERT
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED POLICYHOLDERS
Represented By: Amy R. Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?