Snyder, et al v. Acord Corporation, et al
Defendant / Appellee: NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, THE BUCKEYE STATE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Buckeye Insurance Group, ELECTRIC INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation, ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, ABC ORGANIZATION, an entity or group of entities, whose true names are unknown, SENTRY INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, SHELTER MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation, VERISK ANALYTICS INC., a Delaware corporation, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, an Iowa corporation a/k/a Farmers Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Farmers Insurance Exchange, AMERICAN INDEMNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a Guideone Insurance, AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP., a Florida corporation, NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation, STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas corporation, SECURA INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., a Wisconsi corporation, CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a The Central Insurance Companies, PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, a Colordo non-profit corporation, HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation a/k/a Fireman's Fund Insurance Company of Missouri, ACORD CORPORATION, NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Ohio corporation, STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, AMERICAN RELIABLE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation, GRANGE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, a Washington corporation, FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation b/b/a First American Property & Casualty Group, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, COLORADO FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., a Colorado corporation, TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY, GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation, KEMPER CORPORATE SERVICES, INC., an Illinois corporation, METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN MODERN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, UNITED FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, MUNICH-AMERICAN HOLDING CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES INC., A Minnesota corporation, UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a United Fire Group, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation, QBE INSURANCE GROUP, LIMITED, STILLWATER PROPERTY AND CAUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation a/k/a Fidelity National Property and Casulty Insurance Company d/b/a Stillwater Insurance Group, ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation, FIRST AMERICAN FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, LM INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation, MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation, STATE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Ohio corpoarion, UNITED FIRE INSURANCE GROUP, INC., an Iowa corporation d/b/a United Fire Group, INSURANCE SERVICES OFFICE, INC., a Delaware corporation, THE CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE, a California corporation, PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, ADDISON INSURANCE COMPANY, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation, FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation, UNITRIN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, PHARMACISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation a/k/a McKinsey & Company, Inc. washington D.C., AMERICAN MODERN HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, ALLIANZ OF AMERICA, INC., a Delaware corporation, OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporationd/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance d/b/a Home-Owners Insurance, UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, a Texas corporation, THE TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, a Massachusetts corporation, MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, METLIFE AUTO & HOME INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinois corporation, ZURICH INSURANCE GROUP LTD/FI, a Switzerland corporation, FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, a Maryland corporation, COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., a Delaware non-profit corporation, QBE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation a/k/a QBE Insurance Corporation, ASSOCIATED INDEMNITY CORPORATION, a California corporation, AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation, THE TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., a Connecticut corporation, CASUALTY ACTUARIAL SOCIETY, an Illinois not for profit corporation, LAFAYETTE INSURANCE COMPANY, a/k/a United Lifre Insurance Company, Inc., PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation, AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD CONNECTICUT, a Connecticut corporation, EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a EMC Incurance Companies, UNITED FIRE LLOYDS, a Texas corporation, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a New Hampshire corporation, TEXAS GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Colorado corporation, NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Nationwide Insurance, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation, CHUBB SERVICES CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation, UNITED LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation, AMERICAN MODERN INSURANCE GROUP, INC., an Ohio corporation, AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, a Florida corporation, ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, an entity whose true name is unknown d/b/a Untied Fire Group, CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Wisconsin corporation, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, NATIONAL FARMERS UNION PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, ALLIANZ LIFE INSURANCE CO. OF NORTH AMERICA, a Minnesota corporation, THE CHUBB CORPORATION, a New Jersey corporation, QBE HOLDINGS, INC., a Delaware corporation, AMERICAN FAMILY HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation, METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation, ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Illinoise corporation d/b/a Encompass Insurance, FARMERS ALLIANCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Kansas corporation, UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, A New York corporation, KEMPER CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, INTERNATION INSURANCE SOCIETY, INC., a Delware non-profit corporation, VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Connecticut corporation, AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Michigan corporation d/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance, HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, ALL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY and UNITED FIRE AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Texas corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: TOMMY MEYER, KENNETH DALE YODER, JANET KOCH, IAN SIEMPLENSKI, SUEHAM KAY HOFFMAN, MARY HARROW, LOUISE CREAGER, MARTHA LEMERT, ESTATE OF DOROTHY WOOD HAMMER, DALE SNYDER, MARILYN SNYDER, CATHERINE TAYLOR, JEFFREY RAY, LAILA SAEDA URBAN, NICOLE WRIGHT-MEYER, MARY ANN GELDREICH, JENNIFER RAY and GARY LEMERT
Case Number: 16-1277
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 [10455825] Motion filed by Appellees American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida and American Reliable Insurance Company in 16-1111, 16-1215, Appellee American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida in 16-1277, American Reliable Insurance Company in 16-1277 for attorney Robert D. Helfand to withdraw as counsel.. Served on: 03/31/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1111, 16-1215, 16-1277] RDH [Entered: 03/31/2017 08:41 AM]
December 29, 2016 [10432740] Notice of change of address filed by Bennett L. Cohen, Esq. for Shelter Mutual Insurance Company in 16-1111. [16-1111, 16-1215, 16-1277] BLC [Entered: 12/29/2016 03:39 PM]
July 12, 2016 [10387720] Mandate issued. [16-1277] [Entered: 07/12/2016 04:48 PM]
July 12, 2016 [10387719] Appellants motion to dismiss is granted. FRAP 42. 10th Cir. R. 27.4(A)(9). Procedural termination without judicial action. Clerk of the Court. [16-1277] [Entered: 07/12/2016 04:47 PM]
July 12, 2016 [10387715] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellants motion to dismiss case. Served on 07/12/2016. Text only entry - no attachment. [16-1277] Final order to be found in case termination entry. [Entered: 07/12/2016 04:42 PM]
July 12, 2016 [10387648] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder, Josue David Hernandez, Esq., counsel for Plaintiffs-Appellants, personally. to dismiss case. Served on: 07/12/2016. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [16-1277] JDH [Entered: 07/12/2016 03:23 PM]
July 12, 2016 [10387621] Notice of appearance filed by Josue David Hernandez for Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Catherine Taylor, Martha Lemert, Gary Lemert, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Louise Creager, Janet Koch, Ian Siemplenski, Tommy Meyer, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Laila Saeda Urban and Dorothy Wood Hammer. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/12/2016. Manner of Service: email [16-1277] [Entered: 07/12/2016 02:58 PM]
July 12, 2016 [10387582] Notice of appearance submitted by Josue David Hernandez for Appellants Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder in 16-1277Josue David Hernandez, Esq., Plaintiffs-Appellants' counsel, personally. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/12/2016. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 07/12/2016 by KF. PDF removed. The pleading is filed on 7/12/16] [16-1277] JDH [Entered: 07/12/2016 02:27 PM]
July 7, 2016 [10386268] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/07/2016. Docketing statement due 07/21/2016 for Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Transcript order form due 07/21/2016 for Josue David Hernandez. Notice of appearance due on 07/21/2016 for ABC Insurance Company, ABC Organization, Acord Corporation, Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., Allstate Insurance Company, American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Family Mututal Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Select Insurance Company, American Mordern Insurance Group, Inc., American Reliable Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Compnay, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Louise Creager, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mututal Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Mary Ann Geldreich, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Mary Harrow, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Internation Insurnace Society, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, Janet Koch, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Insurance Company, McKinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Tommy Meyer, Milbank Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, National Casualty Company, National Farmers Union Property and Casualty Company, National Surety Corporation, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company fo America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Standard Fire Insurance Company, State Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stillwater Property and Caualty Insurance Company, Catherine Taylor, Texas General Indemnity Company, The Buckeye State Mututal Insurance Company, The California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The Chubb Corporation, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The Travelers Companies Inc., The Travelers Insurance Company, The Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Insurance Group, Inc., United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Laila Saeda Urban, Verisk Analytics Inc., Vigilant Insurance Company, Dorothy Wood Hammer, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Zurich American Insurance Company and Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. [16-1277] [Entered: 07/07/2016 04:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Snyder, et al v. Acord Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BUCKEYE STATE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Buckeye Insurance Group
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELECTRIC INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABC ORGANIZATION, an entity or group of entities, whose true names are unknown
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SENTRY INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHELTER MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERISK ANALYTICS INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, an Iowa corporation a/k/a Farmers Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN INDEMNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a Guideone Insurance
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP., a Florida corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas corporation
Represented By: John Mark Vaught
Represented By: Jessica G. Scott
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SECURA INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., a Wisconsi corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a The Central Insurance Companies
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley Esq.
Represented By: Erin F. Frohardt
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Rowe W. Snider
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Knuckey
Represented By: John Pitblado
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Gary L. Fleming
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jessica L. Fuller
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Brandi J. Pummell
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Robert David Helfand
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: William A. Savino
Represented By: Stuart D. Morse
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Evan B. Stephenson
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, a Colordo non-profit corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Evan B. Stephenson
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation a/k/a Fireman's Fund Insurance Company of Missouri
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Rowe W. Snider
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Knuckey
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Gary L. Fleming
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jessica L. Fuller
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Brandi J. Pummell
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACORD CORPORATION
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN RELIABLE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRANGE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, a Washington corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation b/b/a First American Property & Casualty Group
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Gary L. Fleming
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Brandi J. Pummell
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLORADO FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., a Colorado corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEMPER CORPORATE SERVICES, INC., an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN MODERN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MUNICH-AMERICAN HOLDING CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES INC., A Minnesota corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a United Fire Group
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley Esq.
Represented By: William A. Savino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QBE INSURANCE GROUP, LIMITED
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STILLWATER PROPERTY AND CAUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation a/k/a Fidelity National Property and Casulty Insurance Company d/b/a Stillwater Insurance Group
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Gary L. Fleming
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST AMERICAN FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LM INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Ohio corpoarion
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE INSURANCE GROUP, INC., an Iowa corporation d/b/a United Fire Group
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Rowe W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INSURANCE SERVICES OFFICE, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE, a California corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADDISON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Gary L. Fleming
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITRIN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHARMACISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation a/k/a McKinsey & Company, Inc. washington D.C.
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN MODERN HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLIANZ OF AMERICA, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Gary L. Fleming
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporationd/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance d/b/a Home-Owners Insurance
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, a Texas corporation
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, a Massachusetts corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METLIFE AUTO & HOME INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZURICH INSURANCE GROUP LTD/FI, a Switzerland corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, a Maryland corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., a Delaware non-profit corporation
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Rowe W. Snider
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Knuckey
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Gary L. Fleming
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jessica L. Fuller
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Brandi J. Pummell
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QBE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation a/k/a QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASSOCIATED INDEMNITY CORPORATION, a California corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CASUALTY ACTUARIAL SOCIETY, an Illinois not for profit corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAFAYETTE INSURANCE COMPANY, a/k/a United Lifre Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD CONNECTICUT, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a EMC Incurance Companies
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE LLOYDS, a Texas corporation
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a New Hampshire corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEXAS GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Colorado corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Nationwide Insurance
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHUBB SERVICES CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN MODERN INSURANCE GROUP, INC., an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, a Florida corporation
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley Esq.
Represented By: Erin F. Frohardt
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Rowe W. Snider
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Knuckey
Represented By: John Pitblado
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Gary L. Fleming
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jessica L. Fuller
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Brandi J. Pummell
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Robert David Helfand
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Evan B. Stephenson
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, an entity whose true name is unknown d/b/a Untied Fire Group
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL FARMERS UNION PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLIANZ LIFE INSURANCE CO. OF NORTH AMERICA, a Minnesota corporation
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Gary L. Fleming
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE CHUBB CORPORATION, a New Jersey corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QBE HOLDINGS, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN FAMILY HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Erin F. Frohardt
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Knuckey
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Gary L. Fleming
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jessica L. Fuller
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Robert David Helfand
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Stuart D. Morse
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Illinoise corporation d/b/a Encompass Insurance
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FARMERS ALLIANCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Kansas corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, A New York corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEMPER CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERNATION INSURANCE SOCIETY, INC., a Delware non-profit corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Michigan corporation d/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Gary L. Fleming
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Texas corporation
Represented By: Kristin Anderson George
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TOMMY MEYER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH DALE YODER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANET KOCH
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IAN SIEMPLENSKI
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUEHAM KAY HOFFMAN
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY HARROW
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LOUISE CREAGER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARTHA LEMERT
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ESTATE OF DOROTHY WOOD HAMMER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DALE SNYDER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARILYN SNYDER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CATHERINE TAYLOR
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY RAY
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAILA SAEDA URBAN
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NICOLE WRIGHT-MEYER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY ANN GELDREICH
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER RAY
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GARY LEMERT
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?