State of New Mexico, et al v. Aamodt, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: STATE OF NEW MEXICO, ex rel. State Engineer
Not Yet Classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, PUEBLO DE NAMBE, PUEBLO DE POJOAQUE, PUEBLO DE SAN ILDEFONSO and PUEBLO DE TESUQUE
Defendant / Appellant: NANSY CARSON, PAUL DOTSON, HELEN RINKE, ANNETTE DURAN, GRACE L. GOMEZ, MARGO GOMEZ, BARBARA AAMODT, VIOLA GONZALES, PAUL AAMODT, GILBERT GONZALES, PETE ARAGON, LUCILLE GONZALES, MARGIE ARCHIBEQUE, DALILA ARCHULETA, JOSE G. GONZALES, MARDY GONZALES, EDUARDO ARCHULETA, LARRY HERRERA, ANGIE ARCHULETA, JOHN HOGDEN, ISAAC ARCHULETA, M. A. LATHROP, JOE ARCHULETA, JANE LIPMAN, JOHN P. ARCHULETA, ELVIRA ARCHULETA, MATHEW LOGGHE, JOSE P. ARCHULETA, TAMMY LOGGHE, JERRY LUGO, LYDIA ARCHULETA, JANET B. ARROWSMITH, STEPHANIE KELLY MADRID, JAMES R. ATTLESEY, EDNA MAES, KATHLEEN S. ATTLESEY, ANNE MARTINEZ, WALTER MARTINEZ, BAUDILIO G. BACA, ROBERTO F. BACA, EUGENE ORTIZ, JOHN ORTIZ, JAMES P. BARBER, JOHN PROVOST, RAY JAMES ROYBAL, MARK BLEA, STELLA SHELBURN, APRIL BLEA, TONY TRUJILLO, JOHN BORREGO, CHRISTI OFFUTT, CATHERINE BORREGO, JUAN BORREGO, JOSEPH P. VALDEZ, NATHAN L. BORREGO, DAN VALENCIA, WARREN HALL YOUNG, M. J. BUSTOS, LUCY YUAN, IGNACIO CARRENO, ANNABELLE CARRENO, STEVE CARSON, TIM CASH, MELVIN CHANEY, ELAINE CHAVEZ, MANUEL CHAVEZ, FELIX CHAVEZ, LYNNE COMEAU, LUCY M. CORNWELL, MARCELLA CUR, GERARD CUR, MICHAEL DEMARIA, BRUCE DURAN, DAVE DURAN, LEROY DURAN, MICHELLE DURAN, PRISCILLA DURAN, ROBERT L. DURAN, RONNIE DURAN, STEVE DURAN, BEVERLY DURAN-CASH, TANYA EDWARDS, MATHEW EDWARDS, VIRGINIA ESPINOSA, ANDREA FISHER, LINDA FLUK, ARNOLD GABALDON, DAVID GALLEGOS, ELAINE GALLEGOS, MANNY GALLEGOS, NICK GALLEGOS, GLORIA J. GALLEGOS, PHYLLIS GALLEGOS, LIA GALLEGOS, RAMON GALLEGOS, VALDEZ GALLEGOS, JANITO GALLEGOS, ANTHONY GARCIA, JERRY L. GARCIA, JOE GARCIA, AMELIA GARCIA, KATHLEEN GARCIA, LEONARDO GARCIA, MARIA E. GARCIA, MARIANO GARCIA, RAMON GARCIA, RAMONA GARCIA, GILBERT GARDUNO, GILBERT JOHN GARDUNO, KATHERINE GARDUNO, JD PAUL GARDUNO, MARGARET GARDUNO, FERNANDO GARZON, FERNIE M. GIRON, GEORGE GOMEZ, JOHN GOMEZ, LOYOLA GOMEZ, RAMONA GOMEZ, BETH GONZALES, DEBBIE GONZALES, FERMIN GONZALES, JUAN GONZALES, MARLENE GONZALES, ROBERT GONZALES, RODOLFO GONZALES, SUSAN GONZALES, JAKE GONZALES, DIANA GONZALEZ, TONY GONZALEZ, EILEEN M. GOODWIN, NANCY GRABOWSKI, JOHN GUTTING, PUANANI G. HARVEY, ERNESTINE HERRERA, MARTHA HERRERA, KEVIN HERRERA, NICOLE VOIGHT, THOMAS HICKS, CAROL HOGSETT, VICTOR HOGSETT, DOLORES B. JACOBS, BENITO JACQUEZ, CARLA M. JACQUEZ, EDWARD JACQUEZ, FACUNDO CUNDY JIMENEZ, JUAN C. JIMENEZ, LOUISE L. JIMENEZ, SARA JIMENEZ, LORRAINE JIMINEZ, FRANK R. JIMINEZ, JAMES JIRON, JUAN F. JIRON, ARABELLA A. JIRON, LYNN R. KELLY, KIM HELMS, PATRICIA MCMAHON KENNEDY, RICHARD L. KREISCHER, DIANE P. KREISCHER, AARON LAW, ROSE LAW, KARLA LEYBA, CHRISTINA D. LOPEZ, JOSEPH C. LOPEZ, SHERRY LOPEZ, MANUEL LOPEZ, PETRONILA M. LOPEZ, MARGARET E. LOPEZ, ORLANDO L. LOPEZ, EDWARD LUCERO, JR., STEPHANIE LUCERO, NANCY F. LUJAN, (Doherty), AMADEO R. LUJAN, PEDRO LUJAN, EVELYN LUJAN, JANET HERRERA, TOM LYNCH, LARRY MAASSEN, MARYBETH MAASSEN, ROMERO MAES, LUCY MAES, VIRGINIA MAES, MICHAEL MARGIOTTA, MARY ELLEN MARINO, ALEX MARTINEZ, BERNADETTE MARTINEZ, EDWARD F. MARTINEZ, EMILIO MARTINEZ, GERARD MARTINEZ, SUSIE MARTINEZ, JOSE AB MARTINEZ, MANUEL MARTINEZ, ANGIE MARTINEZ, PAUL MOORE, FAVIOLA MARTINEZ, MARY G. MARTINEZ, MICHAEL MARTINEZ, RODNEY DAVID MARTINEZ, VICTOR MARTINEZ, BERLINDA MARTINEZ, CINDY MARTINEZ, MARY WOODSON, Woodson Family Trust, MARCELLA MATHIESON, PETER GOMEZ, RAYMOND MCALLISTER, ESTATE OF ALLEN MCNOUN, MARK MCNOUN, A. GREER MCSPADDEN, JACOB MENDEZ, JESSICA L. MENDEZ, SANDRA MENDOZA, BRENDA MOLINA, ELEAZAR MOLINA, SYLVIA MOLINA, JOSEPH MONTES, ANTHONY MONTOYA, VICKIE MONTOYA, BEN MONTOYA, CARMEN MONTOYA, DAVID MONTOYA, CYNTHIA MONTOYA, HENRY MONTOYA, VIRGINIA MONTOYA, LEE NARANJO, DAVE NEAL, CHRISTELLA NEAL, KEITH J. OBERMAIER, HEATHER NORDQUIST, TERRENCE NORDQUIST, MIKE O'KEEFE, JOHANNA W. OGLE, JOSE F. ORTIZ TRUST, BART ORTIZ, TERI A. ORTIZ, MARGARET ORTIZ, EDDIE H. ORTIZ, JENNIE ORTIZ, ROSA M. ORTIZ, STEPHANIE PADILLA, DAVID PAUL, C. ROBERT QUINTANA, ANNETTE PEREZ, BERSABELLA R. PEREZ, KRISTOPPHER PETERSON, FRANCES QUINTANA, CELESTINO QUINTANA, ANDREW RIVERA, J. E. ROYBAL, SYLVIA QUINTANA, HERMAN TRUJILLO, KATHY ROMERO, KATHRYN L. ROMERO, FERNANDO QUINTANA, ARCY RIVERA, JOHN VALENCIA, AMELIA ROYBAL, JUAN F. ROMERO, GUS ROYBAL, MARY QUINTANA, LUCY RIOS, MARY RICHERSON, ROBERT RIOS, AMANDA RIVAS, THOMAS RIVAS, JOSEPH J. ROMERO, CAROLYN ROMERO, DANETTE TRUJILLO, AUGINALDO ROMERO, JOHN ROMERO, LOLA THOMPSON, REUBEN ROYBAL, JOSE ALFREDO ROYBAL, JOSEPH A. VALDEZ, JOANN S. ROMERO, JUNE ROYBAL, JOE ROMERO, CAROLYN HALL YOUNG, OLIVIA ROMERO, MARGARITA TRUJILLO, MONICA TRUJILLO, RUBANNA RODRIGUEZ, AUDREY TORRES, LARRY S. ROYBAL, ANNA BELLE RIVERA, OLIVER RIVERA, LARRY RODRIGUEZ, STEVE SALAZAR, PHILBERT ROMERO, VINCENT YUAN, FLORENCIO ROMERO, ELIZABETH ROMERO, CLEO B. VALDEZ, ATANACIO ROMERO, ORALIA M. ROMERO, DIANE TRUJILLO, PATRICIA ROYBAL, GERALDINE R. TOWLES, ANNETTE ROYBAL, BERTHA L. ROMERO, CIPRIANO ROMERO, HENRY ROYBAL, LYNNE VELASCO, DIANE ROYBAL, ELLEN TRUJILLO, MONA VALENCIA, PATSY SANDOVAL, FREDDY ROYBAL, FABIE VALDEZ, SEFERINO VALDEZ, JEFF TRUJILLO, JAKE TRUJILLO, JOHN B. TRUJILLO, PATRICIA GONZALES-URIOSTE, THE ESTATE OF PEDRO ROYBAL, JENNIFER DURAN ULIBARRI, STEVEN DUNBAR, Spin, CASA LAS BARRANCAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, MANUEL F. VALDEZ, LEVI SANDOVAL, SUSAN WOLFF, JERRY WOLFF, FLAVIO VALENCIA, CELIA C. ULIBARRI, MAUREEN TRUJILLO, BARBARA WOLF, A. E. VALDEZ, PEDRO ROMERO, GEORGE VIGIL, JOE TRUJILLO, DORIS ROYBAL, DAVID WOLF, CHRISTELLA A. SALAZAR, ISADOR VALDEZ, DIANA TRUJILLO, MONICA ROYBAL, DELBERT ROYBAL, RICARDO ROMERO, CORDELIA ROYBAL, ANDY WELCH, CATHY SALAZAR, THOMAS A. SISNEROS, ARTHUR & LAURA ROYBAL ESTATE, CARMELITO SWEENEY, JESSICA TRUJILLO, PAMELA J. TRUJILLO, ELIZA VALDEZ, ESTER VIGIL, LOUISE VIGIL, GARY SULLIVAN, CRISTINA SALAZAR-LANGLEY, ERNIE TRUJILLO, JOANN SERNA, EDWARD VALDEZ, PATRICIA TRUJILLO, STELLA TRUJILLO, JOSE TRUJILLO, PITA VALENCIA, ARNOLD VIGIL, VANESSA STEIN, CHRIS VALDEZ, ROMAN VALDEZ, CARL TRUJILLO, PHILLIP VILLAREAL, LOYOLA TRUJILLO, ALEX TRUJILLO, PHILLIP ROYBAL, LINDA SALAZAR, LORETTA VALERIO, VICTOR SANDOVAL, JOHN SENA, ANNA V. TRUJILLO, ALBERT STALDELMAIER, VICENT ROYBAL, JAKE SCARBOROUGH, DAN TRUJILLO, MARTHA TRUJILLO, LARRY ULIBARRI, TEOFILO VIGIL, PRESCILLA ROYBAL, JEOFF URIOSTE, WILLIAM ROYBAL, FRANK SENA, SHARON TRUJILLO, DANIEL J. TRUJILLO, RONALD TRUJILLO, ERIK VALDEZ, ROY TRUJILLO, ANNIE VIGIL, SYLVIA TRUJILLO, PHILLIP ULIBARRI, ESQUIPULA N. VALDEZ, OLIVIA TRUJILLO, SOCORRO TRUJILLO, ERNEST ULIBARRI, JR., JOHN VALDEZ, RUBY VALDEZ, DARLENE VALDEZ, GUSTAVO VIGIL, MATTHEW WHEELER, SYLVIA VILLAREAL, PAUL WHITE, RICHARD BERNARD, JACQUELINE CORDOVA, DEBORAH DANT, ASHLEY GARCIA, GABRIEL C. HERRERA, GABRIEL C. HERRERA, JR., GLENDA IRVING, LORRAINE JOHNSON, BLAIR NAYLOR, DAVID M. SUSZCYNSKY, MARK WOLFF and WOODSON FAMILY TRUST
Defendant / Appellee: SANTA FE COUNTY, RIO DE TESUQUE ASSOCIATION, INC. and CITY OF SANTA FE
Appellant: BG & CO, LLC, MARIE BERNARD, CLARA DEMARIA, CHRISTOPHER GARCIA, GABRIEL A. HERRERA, GARY JOHNSON, ELIZABELLE MARTINEZ, LIONEL NAYLOR, MARY ELLEN ORTIZ, DEBORAH PENA, FRANK ROMERO, JR., BILL ROYBAL, DANNY ROYBAL, JOSEPH LARRY ROYBAL, ELISABETH SANDOVAL and ROBERTO C. ORTIZ
Case Number: 17-2147
Filed: September 7, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 [10615332] Mandate issued. [17-2147] [Entered: 01/02/2019 08:31 AM]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order [10604410] Order filed by Judges Lucero, McKay and Moritz - granting the United States and associated appellees' petition for rehearing in part and for the limited purpose of clarifying the operative language used in the opinion to reverse the district court. The United States and associated appellees' petition is otherwise denied. The petitions for panel rehearing filed by Rio de Tesuque Association, Inc. and the appellants are denied. The request for en banc consideration is likewise denied [17-2147] [Entered: 11/09/2018 03:57 PM]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order [10604411] Order filed by Judges Lucero, McKay and Moritz reopening appeal. Served on 11/09/2018. Text only entry - no attachment. [17-2147] [Entered: 11/09/2018 03:59 PM]
November 9, 2018 [10604425] Remanded; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, published; Judges Lucero, authoring, McKay and Moritz. Mandate to issue. [17-2147] [Entered: 11/09/2018 04:14 PM]
November 9, 2018 [10604429] Judgment for opinion filed. [17-2147] [Entered: 11/09/2018 04:17 PM]
September 28, 2018 [10593581] Petition for rehearing en banc filed by Barbara Aamodt, et al. [text only entry for internal purposes] [17-2147] [Entered: 09/28/2018 03:42 PM]
September 28, 2018 [10593601] Notice of deficient petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc received from Barbara Aamodt, et al. Type of deficiency: Decision not attached. Corrected petition for rehearing due 10/09/2018 for Barbara Aamodt, et al. [17-2147] [Entered: 09/28/2018 04:21 PM]
September 28, 2018 This entry has been removed from the docket - corrected petition filed 9/28/2018. [LAB] [10593579] Petition for rehearing filed by Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, Marie Bernard, Mr. Richard Bernard, BG & Co, LLC, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Clara DeMaria, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel A. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Mr. Gary Johnson, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Elizabelle Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Lionel Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Mary Ellen Ortiz, Roberto C. Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Deborah Pena, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Frank Romero, Jr., Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Kathy Romero, Kathy Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Bill Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Danny Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, Joseph Larry Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Linda Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Elisabeth Sandoval, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, Carmelito Sweeney, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan. 6 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/28/2018. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] ABD [Entered: 09/28/2018 03:34 PM]
September 28, 2018 [10593632] Petition for rehearing filed by Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, Marie Bernard, Mr. Richard Bernard, BG & Co, LLC, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Clara DeMaria, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel A. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Mr. Gary Johnson, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Elizabelle Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Lionel Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Mary Ellen Ortiz, Roberto C. Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Deborah Pena, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Frank Romero, Jr., Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Kathy Romero, Kathy Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Bill Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Danny Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, Joseph Larry Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Linda Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Elisabeth Sandoval, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, Carmelito Sweeney, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan. 6 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/28/2018. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] ABD [Entered: 09/28/2018 04:34 PM]
September 25, 2018 [10592493] Petition for rehearing filed by Rio de Tesuque Association, Inc.. 0 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/25/2018. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] LCW [Entered: 09/25/2018 04:29 PM]
September 25, 2018 [10592315] Petition for rehearing filed by United States of America, State of New Mexico, Pueblo of Nambe, Pueblo de San Ildefonso, Pueblo of Pojoaque, Pueblo de Tesuque, County of Santa Fe, City of Santa Fe. 0 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/25/2018. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] JLS [Entered: 09/25/2018 12:52 PM]
August 22, 2018 [10583667] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard W. Hughes for Appellee Pueblo de Tesuque for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/22/2018. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 08/22/2018 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 8/22/2018.] [17-2147] RWH [Entered: 08/22/2018 02:02 PM]
August 22, 2018 [10583684] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard Warren Hughes for Pueblo de Tesuque. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/22/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] [Entered: 08/22/2018 02:35 PM]
August 22, 2018 [10583721] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney motion to withdraw as attorney. Majel Russell is now withdrawn from this appeal. Served on 08/22/2018. [17-2147] [Entered: 08/22/2018 03:37 PM]
August 21, 2018 [10583448] Motion filed by Appellee Pueblo de Tesuque for attorney Majel Russell to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 08/21/2018. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] MMR [Entered: 08/21/2018 04:56 PM]
August 15, 2018 [10581879] Reversed and Remanded; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, published. Judges Lucero (authoring), McKay, and Moritz. Mandate to issue. [17-2147] [Per the order on rehearing, an amended decision has been filed as of 11/9/18 and the original opinion removed-- Edited 11/09/2018 by NA] [Entered: 08/15/2018 08:20 AM]
August 15, 2018 [10581882] Judgment for opinion filed. [17-2147] [Per the order on rehearing an amended decision has been filed as of 11/9/18 and the original judgment removed-- Edited 11/09/2018 by NA] [Entered: 08/15/2018 08:22 AM]
May 15, 2018 [10559118] Case argued by Dori Richards for the Appellants; John Smeltzer and Gregory Ridgley for the Appellees; and submitted to Judges Lucero, McKay and Moritz. [17-2147] [Entered: 05/15/2018 01:32 PM]
April 23, 2018 [10553310] Appellee/Respondent's supplemental brief filed by City of Santa Fe, Sante Fe County, State of New Mexico and Rio De Tesque Association . 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 04/23/2018. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 04/23/2018 by SDS to add party filers] [17-2147] MDM [Entered: 04/23/2018 04:07 PM]
April 23, 2018 [10553227] Appellee/Respondent's supplemental brief filed by United States of America, Pueblo De Nambe, Pueblo De Pojoaque, Pueblo De San Ildefonso, and Pueblo de Tesuque. 0 (Per Court Order) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 04/23/2018. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 04/23/2018 by LAB to add additional filers to docket text.] [17-2147] JLS [Entered: 04/23/2018 02:50 PM]
April 16, 2018 [10551141] Minute order filed - in accordance with the the court's 04/05/2018, supplemental brief due 04/23/2018 for Appellees City of Santa Fe, Pueblo De Nambe, Pueblo De Pojoaque, Pueblo De San Ildefonso, Pueblo de Tesuque, Rio de Tesuque Association, Inc., Santa Fe County, State of New Mexico and United States of America. (Text Only - No Attachment) [17-2147] [Entered: 04/16/2018 07:21 AM]
April 13, 2018 [10551101] Appellant's supplemental memorandum brief filed by Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, Marie Bernard, Mr. Richard Bernard, BG & Co, LLC, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Clara DeMaria, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel A. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Mr. Gary Johnson, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Elizabelle Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Lionel Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Mary Ellen Ortiz, Roberto C. Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Deborah Pena, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Frank Romero, Jr., Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Kathy Romero, Kathy Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Bill Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Danny Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, Joseph Larry Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Linda Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Elisabeth Sandoval, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, Carmelito Sweeney, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan. 0 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 04/13/2018. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] ABD [Entered: 04/13/2018 04:44 PM]
April 10, 2018 [10549979] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by State of New Mexico. Served on 04/10/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] GCR [Entered: 04/10/2018 11:43 AM]
April 10, 2018 [10549842] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by City of Santa Fe. Served on 04/10/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] MDM [Entered: 04/10/2018 08:25 AM]
April 9, 2018 [10549610] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Pueblo De San Ildefonso. Served on 04/09/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] ABR [Entered: 04/09/2018 02:34 PM]
April 9, 2018 [10549604] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Pueblo De San Ildefonso. Served on 04/09/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] PC [Entered: 04/09/2018 02:28 PM]
April 9, 2018 [10549531] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by United States of America. Served on 04/09/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] JLS [Entered: 04/09/2018 01:06 PM]
April 9, 2018 [10549711] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Pueblo De Pojoaque. Served on 04/09/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] MO [Entered: 04/09/2018 03:58 PM]
April 9, 2018 [10549550] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Pueblo De Nambe. Served on 04/09/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] SBM [Entered: 04/09/2018 01:22 PM]
April 9, 2018 [10549764] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Rio de Tesuque Association, Inc.. Served on 04/09/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] LCW [Entered: 04/09/2018 05:18 PM]
April 9, 2018 [10549737] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Santa Fe County. Served on 04/09/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] JWU [Entered: 04/09/2018 04:35 PM]
April 9, 2018 [10549752] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by State of New Mexico. Served on 04/09/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] AS [Entered: 04/09/2018 04:52 PM]
April 5, 2018 [10548825] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - this matter is before the Court directing supplemental briefing. Supplemental brief due 04/16/2018 for Appellants Barbara Aamodt, et al. Appellees may file a supplemental response brief within 10 days of the date of service of Appellants' supplemental brief. Supplemental briefs shall be limited to 15 pages in length; paper copies are not required. See attached order for details. Served on 04/05/2018. [17-2147] [Entered: 04/05/2018 02:54 PM]
April 2, 2018 [10547714] Appellant/Petitioner's reply brief filed by Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, Marie Bernard, Mr. Richard Bernard, BG & Co, LLC, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Clara DeMaria, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel A. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Mr. Gary Johnson, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Elizabelle Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Lionel Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Mary Ellen Ortiz, Roberto C. Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Deborah Pena, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Frank Romero, Jr., Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Kathy Romero, Kathy Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Bill Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Danny Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, Joseph Larry Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Linda Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Elisabeth Sandoval, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, Carmelito Sweeney, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 04/02/2018. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] ABD [Entered: 04/02/2018 04:33 PM]
March 20, 2018 [10544409] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, Marie Bernard, Mr. Richard Bernard, BG & Co, LLC, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Roberto C. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Deborah Pena, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Frank Romero, Jr., Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Kathy Romero, Kathy Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Bill Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Danny Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, Joseph Larry Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Linda Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Elisabeth Sandoval, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, Carmelito Sweeney, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan. Served on 03/20/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] DER [Entered: 03/20/2018 12:50 PM]
March 14, 2018 [10542768] Calendar notice sent to counsel. Arguments to be held on 05/15/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom III, of the Byron White United States Courthouse, Denver, CO. Counsel is required to go to http://www.ca10.uscourts.gov under the argument calendar tab to obtain an important notice regarding calendared cases and required forms. The calendar acknowledgment form must be completed and filed with the clerk via Electronic Case Filing within 10 days of today's date. [17-2147] [Entered: 03/14/2018 11:50 AM]
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order [10538986] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting Attorney second motion to extend time to file apet reply brief Appellant's optional reply brief now due 04/02/2018 for Barbara Aamodt, et al. The court will not grant additional extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. Served on 02/27/2018. [17-2147] [Entered: 02/27/2018 03:12 PM]
February 23, 2018 [10538099] Motion filed by Appellants Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, Mr. Richard Bernard, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Kathy Romero, Kathy Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Linda Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, Carmelito Sweeney, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan to extend time to file a reply brief until 04/02/2018. Served on: 02/23/2018. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] ABD [Entered: 02/23/2018 10:10 AM]
February 12, 2018 [10535415] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting in part, appellant's motion to extend time to file appellant's reply brief. Appellant's optional reply brief now due 03/02/2018 for Kathleen Garcia, et al. No further extensions will be granted under the clerk's authority. Served on 02/12/2018. [17-2147] [Entered: 02/12/2018 04:04 PM]
February 12, 2018 [10535390] Motion filed by Appellants Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, Marie Bernard, Mr. Richard Bernard, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Kathy Romero, Kathy Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Linda Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, Carmelito Sweeney, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan to extend time to file a reply brief until 04/02/2018. Served on: 02/12/2018. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] ABD [Entered: 02/12/2018 03:37 PM]
February 6, 2018 [10534064] Minute order filed - Appellant's optional reply brief now due 02/16/2018 for Barbara Aamodt, et al. (Text Only - No Attachment) [17-2147] [Entered: 02/06/2018 01:16 PM]
February 2, 2018 [10533522] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by State of New Mexico. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 02/02/2018. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] KBS [Entered: 02/02/2018 10:16 PM]
February 2, 2018 [10533521] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by Pueblo De Nambe, Pueblo de San Ildefonso, Appellee; Pueblo de Pojoaque, Appellee; Pueblo de Tesuque, Appellee. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 02/02/2018. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] AEW [Entered: 02/02/2018 07:58 PM]
February 2, 2018 [10533518] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by Rio de Tesuque Association, Inc.. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 02/02/2018. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] LCW [Entered: 02/02/2018 06:28 PM]
February 2, 2018 [10533394] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by Santa Fe County, City of Santa Fe. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 02/02/2018. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] JWU [Entered: 02/02/2018 01:23 PM]
February 2, 2018 [10533464] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by United States of America. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 02/02/2018. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] JLS [Entered: 02/02/2018 03:25 PM]
February 2, 2018 [10533470] Appellee's appendix filed by United States of America. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 02/02/2018. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] JLS [Entered: 02/02/2018 03:37 PM]
January 30, 2018 [10532429] Notice of appearance submitted by Lawrence C. White for Rio de Tesuque Association, Inc., Marguerite Cutler; David Dougherty for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/30/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147]--[Edited 01/30/2018 by LG to remove PDF from entry,as pleading was filed on 1/30/2018] LCW [Entered: 01/30/2018 03:02 PM]
January 30, 2018 [10532445] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Larry C White for Rio de Tesuque Association, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/30/2018. Manner of Service: email [17-2147] [Entered: 01/30/2018 03:23 PM]
January 22, 2018 [10530335] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Marcos D. Martinez for City of Santa Fe. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/22/2018. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] [Entered: 01/22/2018 04:09 PM]
January 22, 2018 [10530113] Notice of appearance submitted by Marcos D. Martinez for City of Santa Fe for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/22/2018. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/22/2018 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 1/22/2018][17-2147] MDM [Entered: 01/22/2018 11:00 AM]
November 29, 2017 [10517414] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - At the direction of the court, order granting Appellees' motion to extend time to file eres brief. Appellees' brief now due 02/02/2018 for United States of America, Pueblo De Pojoaque, Pueblo De Nambe, Pueblo De San Ildefonso, Pueblo de Tesuque, Rio de Tesuque Association, Inc., Santa Fe County and State of New Mexico. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Served on 11/29/2017. [17-2147] [Entered: 11/29/2017 03:07 PM]
November 28, 2017 [10517064] Motion filed by Appellee United States of America to extend time to file appellee/respondent's brief until 02/02/2018. Served on: 11/28/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] JLS [Entered: 11/28/2017 04:24 PM]
November 14, 2017 [10513265] Motion filed by Appellee United States of America to extend time to file appellee/respondent's brief until 02/02/2018. Served on: 11/14/2017. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] JLS [Entered: 11/14/2017 07:53 AM]
November 14, 2017 [10513323] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on the United States' Unopposed Motion for 60-Day Extension of Time for the Filing of Appellee Briefs (the "Motion"). Upon consideration the Motion is granted in part. The appellees response briefs are now due on or before 01/03/2018 for United States of America, Pueblo De Pojoaque, Pueblo De Nambe, Pueblo De San Ildefonso, Pueblo de Tesuque, Rio de Tesuque Association, Inc., Santa Fe County, and State of New Mexico. No further extensions will be granted on the Clerk's authority. Served on 11/14/2017. Text only entry - no attachment. [17-2147] [Entered: 11/14/2017 08:57 AM]
November 7, 2017 [10511725] Minute order filed - Appellees' brief now due 12/04/2017 for Pueblo De Pojoaque, United States of America, Pueblo De Nambe, Pueblo De San Ildefonso, Pueblo de Tesuque, Rio de Tesuque Association, Inc., Santa Fe County and State of New Mexico. (Text Only - No Attachment) [17-2147] [Entered: 11/07/2017 12:59 PM]
November 2, 2017 [10510512] Errata sheet filed by Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, Marie Bernard, Mr. Richard Bernard, BG & Co, LLC, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Clara DeMaria, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel A. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Mr. Gary Johnson, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Elizabelle Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Lionel Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Mary Ellen Ortiz, Roberto C. Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Deborah Pena, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Frank Romero, Jr., Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Kathy Romero, Kathy Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Bill Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Danny Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, Joseph Larry Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Linda Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Elisabeth Sandoval, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, Carmelito Sweeney, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan to Opening Brief. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 11/02/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] ABD [Entered: 11/02/2017 11:31 AM]
November 1, 2017 [10510240] Notice of appellants' deficient brief received from Barbara Aamodt, et al. Type of deficiency: Missing final orders being appealed. See attached letter for specifics. Appellants' corrections to the brief due on 11/13/2017 for Appellants Barbara Aamodt, et al. [17-2147] [Entered: 11/01/2017 12:29 PM]
October 30, 2017 [10509654] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, Marie Bernard, Mr. Richard Bernard, BG & Co, LLC, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Clara DeMaria, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel A. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Mr. Gary Johnson, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Elizabelle Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Lionel Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Mary Ellen Ortiz, Roberto C. Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Deborah Pena, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Frank Romero, Jr., Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Kathy Romero, Kathy Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Bill Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Danny Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, Joseph Larry Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Linda Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Elisabeth Sandoval, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, Carmelito Sweeney, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 10/30/2017 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes.-- This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] --[Edited 11/02/2017 by DD to attach Errata] ABD [Entered: 10/30/2017 04:11 PM]
October 30, 2017 [10509683] Appellant's appendix filed by Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, Marie Bernard, Mr. Richard Bernard, BG & Co, LLC, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Clara DeMaria, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel A. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Mr. Gary Johnson, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Elizabelle Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Lionel Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Mary Ellen Ortiz, Roberto C. Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Deborah Pena, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Frank Romero, Jr., Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Kathy Romero, Kathy Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Bill Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Danny Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, Joseph Larry Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Linda Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Elisabeth Sandoval, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, Carmelito Sweeney, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan. Total number of volumes filed:. Served on 10/30/2017. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [17-2147] ABD [Entered: 10/30/2017 04:47 PM]
October 25, 2017 [10508537] Notice of appearance filed by Daniel S. Wenner for Pueblo de Tesuque. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/25/2017. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [17-2147] [Entered: 10/25/2017 01:41 PM]
October 25, 2017 [10508507] Notice of appearance submitted by Daniel Wenner for Appellee Pueblo de Tesuque for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/25/2017. Manner of Service: email, US mail. --[Edited 10/25/2017 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [17-2147] DSW [Entered: 10/25/2017 12:35 PM]
October 2, 2017 [10502522] Notice of appearance submitted by John L. Smeltzer for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/02/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147]--[Edited 10/02/2017 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 10/2/2017] JLS [Entered: 10/02/2017 10:34 AM]
October 2, 2017 [10502530] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. John Luther Smeltzer for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/02/2017. Manner of Service: email [17-2147] [Entered: 10/02/2017 10:45 AM]
September 28, 2017 [10501997] Notice of appearance submitted by Majel M. Russell for Appellee Pueblo de Tesuque for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/28/2017. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [17-2147]--[Edited 09/28/2017 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 9/28/17] MMR [Entered: 09/28/2017 03:39 PM]
September 28, 2017 [10502018] Notice of appearance filed by Majel M. Russell for Pueblo de Tesuque. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/28/2017. Manner of Service: email, US mail [17-2147] [Entered: 09/28/2017 04:02 PM]
September 25, 2017 [10500636] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Appellees' notice of appearance due and not filed. Notice of appearance is now due on 10/05/2017 for Pueblo de Tesuque, Rio de Tesuque Association, Inc. and United States of America. [17-2147] [Entered: 09/25/2017 11:50 AM]
September 21, 2017 [10499787] Notice of appearance submitted by John W. Utton for Appellee Santa Fe County for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/21/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] --[Edited 09/21/2017 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 9/21/2017.] JWU [Entered: 09/21/2017 10:04 AM]
September 21, 2017 [10499682] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Dori Ellen Richards and A. Blair Dunn for the appellants. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/20/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] [Entered: 09/21/2017 08:17 AM]
September 21, 2017 [10499793] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court following review of the appellants' docketing statement. A jurisdictional question presents itself for this appeal. Specifically, the court has concerns about whether "Final Judgment and Decree of the Water Rights of the Nambe, Pojoaque and Tesuque Stream System" being appealed is final and appealable. Accordingly, we specifically direct the parties to address in their merits briefs the jurisdictional question of finality for purposes of appellate review, including whether the document titled as a "final judgment" satisfies the requirements of a Rule 54(b) certification. See attached order. Served on 09/21/2017. [17-2147] [Entered: 09/21/2017 10:16 AM]
September 21, 2017 [10499800] Notice of appearance filed by John W Utton for State of New Mexico. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/21/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] [Entered: 09/21/2017 10:27 AM]
September 21, 2017 [10500024] Notice of appearance filed by Gregory C. Ridgley, Ms. Arianne Singer and Ms. Kelly Brooks Smith for State of New Mexico. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/21/2017. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [17-2147] [Entered: 09/21/2017 03:31 PM]
September 21, 2017 [10500012] Notice of appearance submitted by Arianne Singer; Kelly Brooks Smith; Gregory Campbell Ridgley for Appellee State of New Mexico for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/21/2017. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 09/21/2017 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [17-2147] KBS [Entered: 09/21/2017 03:16 PM]
September 20, 2017 [10499512] Notice of appearance submitted by A. Blair Dunn, Esq. and Dori E. Richards, Esq. for Appellants Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, Marie Bernard, Mr. Richard Bernard, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, Laura Burrows, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Clara DeMaria, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel A. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Mr. Gary Johnson, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Elizabelle Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Mary Ellen Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Mr. David Paul, Deborah Pena, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Rubanna Rodriguez, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Frank Romero, Jr., Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Roybal Estate (Arthur & Laura), Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Elisabeth Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/20/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] --[Edited 09/21/2017 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 9/21/2017] ABD [Entered: 09/20/2017 02:29 PM]
September 20, 2017 [10499527] Docketing statement filed by Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Roberto F. Baca, Baudilio G. Baca, James P. Barber, Marie Bernard, Mr. Richard Bernard, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Laura Burrows, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Clara DeMaria, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Walter Martinez, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Ben Montoya, Anthony Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, Henry Montoya, David Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Olivia Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Roybal Estate (Arthur & Laura), Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan. Served on 09/20/2017. Manner of Service: email. [17-2147] ABD [Entered: 09/20/2017 02:48 PM]
September 20, 2017 [10499560] Notice received from Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, Marie Bernard, Mr. Richard Bernard, BG & Co, LLC, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, Laura Burrows, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Jacqueline Cordova, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cur, Marcella Cur, Deborah Dant, Clara DeMaria, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edwards, Tanya Edwards, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramona Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales-Urioste, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Gabriel A. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Gabriel C. Herrera, Jr., Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Glenda Irving, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Mr. Gary Johnson, Lorraine Johnson, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Elizabelle Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Blair Naylor, Lionel Naylor, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Christi Offutt, Johanna W. Ogle, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Mary Ellen Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Deborah Pena, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Frank Romero, Jr., Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Kathy Romero, Kathy Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Roybal Estate (Arthur & Laura), Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Bill Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Danny Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, Joseph Larry Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Linda Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Elisabeth Sandoval, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, David M. Suszcynsky, Carmelito Sweeney, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Celia C. Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Mark Wolff, Susan Wolff, Woodson Family Trust, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 09/20/2017. Manner of Service: email [17-2147] ABD [Entered: 09/20/2017 03:25 PM]
September 20, 2017 [10499697] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 09/20/2017. Appellants brief and appendix due on 10/30/2017 for Barbara Aamodt and Paul Aamodt, et al. [17-2147] [Entered: 09/21/2017 08:38 AM]
September 20, 2017 [10499605] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 10/16/2017 for Matthew (NMsf) Dykman, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [17-2147] [Entered: 09/20/2017 04:20 PM]
September 15, 2017 [10498132] Notice of appearance filed by Ms. Maria O'Brien and Ms. Sarah Marie Stevenson for Pueblo De Pojoaque. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/15/2017. Manner of Service: email [17-2147] [Entered: 09/15/2017 07:43 AM]
September 15, 2017 [10498378] Notice of appearance submitted by Peter C. Chestnut and Ann Berkley Rodgers for Appellee Pueblo De San Ildefonso for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/15/2017. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [17-2147] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 09/15/2017 by NA] PC [Entered: 09/15/2017 04:15 PM]
September 15, 2017 [10498264] Clarification of appellants filed by Barbara Aamodt, Paul Aamodt, Pete Aragon, Margie Archibeque, Angie Archuleta, Dalila Archuleta, Eduardo Archuleta, Elvira Archuleta, Isaac Archuleta, Joe Archuleta, John P. Archuleta, Jose P. Archuleta, Ms. Lydia Archuleta, Janet B. Arrowsmith, Arthur & Laura Roybal Estate, James R. Attlesey, Kathleen S. Attlesey, Baudilio G. Baca, Roberto F. Baca, James P. Barber, April Blea, Mark Blea, Catherine Borrego, Mr. John Borrego, Juan Borrego, Nathan L. Borrego, Laura Burrows, M. J. Bustos, Annabelle Carreno, Ignacio Carreno, Nansy Carson, Steve Carson, Casa Las Barrancas Homeowners Association, Tim Cash, Melvin Chaney, Elaine Chavez, Felix Chavez, Manuel Chavez, Lynne Comeau, Lucy M. Cornwell, Gerard Cyr, Marcella Cyr, Michael DeMaria, Paul Dotson, Steven Dunbar, Annette Duran, Bruce Duran, Dave Duran, Leroy Duran, Michelle Duran, Priscilla Duran, Robert L. Duran, Ronnie Duran, Steve Duran, Beverly Duran-Cash, Mathew Edmunds, Tanya Edmunds, Virginia Espinosa, Estate of Allen McNoun, Andrea Fisher, Linda Fluk, Arnold Gabaldon, David Gallegos, Elaine Gallegos, Gloria J. Gallegos, Janito Gallegos, Lia Gallegos, Manny Gallegos, Nick Gallegos, Phyllis Gallegos, Ramon Gallegos, Valdez Gallegos, Ms. Amelia Garcia, Mr. Anthony Garcia, Jerry L. Garcia, Mr. Joe Garcia, Kathleen Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Maria E. Garcia, Mariano Garcia, Ramon Garcia, Ramona Garcia, Gilbert Garduno, Gilbert John Garduno, JD Paul Garduno, Katherine Garduno, Margaret Garduno, Fernando Garzon, Fernie M. Giron, George Gomez, Grace L. Gomez, Mr. John Gomez, Loyola Gomez, Margo Gomez, Peter Gomez, Ramon Gomez, Beth Gonzales, Debbie Gonzales, Fermin Gonzales, Gilbert Gonzales, Jake Gonzales, Jose G. Gonzales, Juan Gonzales, Lucille Gonzales, Mardy Gonzales, Marlene Gonzales, Patricia Gonzales, Robert Gonzales, Rodolfo Gonzales, Susan Gonzales, Viola Gonzales, Diana Gonzalez, Tony Gonzalez, Eileen M. Goodwin, Nancy Grabowski, John Gutting, Carolyn Hall Young, Warren Hall Young, Puanani G. Harvey, Kim Helms, Ernestine Herrera, Janet Herrera, Kevin Herrera, Larry Herrera, Martha Herrera, Thomas Hicks, John Hogden, Carol Hogsett, Victor Hogsett, Dolores B. Jacobs, Benito Jacquez, Carla M. Jacquez, Edward Jacquez, Facundo Cundy Jimenez, Juan C. Jimenez, Louise L. Jimenez, Sara Jimenez, Frank R. Jiminez, Lorraine Jiminez, Arabella A. Jiron, James Jiron, Juan F. Jiron, Jose F. Ortiz Trust, Lynn R. Kelly, Diane P. Kreischer, Richard L. Kreischer, M. A. Lathrop, Aaron Law, Rose Law, Karla Leyba, Jane Lipman, Mathew Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Tammy Logghe, Christina D. Lopez, Joseph C. Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Margaret E. Lopez, Orlando L. Lopez, Petronila M. Lopez, Sherry Lopez, Edward Lucero, Jr., Stephanie Lucero, Chris Luchini, Jerry Lugo, Amadeo R. Lujan, Evelyn Lujan, Nancy F. Lujan, Pedro Lujan, Mr. Tom Lynch, Larry Maassen, Marybeth Maassen, Stephanie Kelly Madrid, Edna Maes, Lucy Maes, Romero Maes, Virginia Maes, Michael Margiotta, Doctor Mary Ellen Marino, Mr. Alex Martinez, Angie Martinez, Anne Martinez, Berlinda Martinez, Bernadette Martinez, Cindy Martinez, Edward F. Martinez, Emilio Martinez, Faviola Martinez, Gerard Martinez, Jose AB Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Manuel Martinez, Mary G. Martinez, Honorable Michael Martinez, Rodney David Martinez, Susie Martinez, Mr. Victor Martinez, Walter Martinez, Marcella Mathieson, Maryellen McAfee, Raymond McAllister, Patricia McMahon Kennedy, Mark McNoun, A. Greer McSpadden, Jacob Mendez, Jessica L. Mendez, Sandra Mendoza, Brenda Molina, Eleazar Molina, Ms. Sylvia Molina, Joseph Montes, Anthony Montoya, Ben Montoya, Ms. Carmen Montoya, Cynthia Montoya, David Montoya, Henry Montoya, Vickie Montoya, Virginia Montoya, Mr. Paul Moore, Lee Naranjo, Christella Neal, Dave Neal, Heather Nordquist, Terrence Nordquist, Mr. John O'Connor, Mike O'Keefe, Keith J. Obermaier, Johanna W. Ogle, Almudena Ortiz, Bart Ortiz, Eddie H. Ortiz, Eugene Ortiz, Jennie Ortiz, John Ortiz, Margaret Ortiz, Rosa M. Ortiz, Teri A. Ortiz, Stephanie Padilla, Mr. David Paul, Annette Perez, Bersabella R. Perez, Kristoppher Peterson, John Provost, C. Robert Quintana, Celestino Quintana, Fernando Quintana, Frances Quintana, Frances Quintana, Mary Quintana, Sylvia Quintana, Mary Richerson, Helen Rinke, Lucy RIos, Robert Rios, Amanda Rivas, Thomas Rivas, Andrew Rivera, Anna Belle Rivera, Arcy Rivera, Oliver Rivera, Larry Rodriguez, Rubanna Rodriguez, Atanacio Romero, Auginaldo Romero, Bertha L. Romero, Carolyn Romero, Cipriano Romero, Elizabeth Romero, Florencio Romero, Joann S. Romero, Joe Romero, John Romero, Joseph J. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Juan F. Romero, Kathryn L. Romero, Kathy Romero, Kathy Romero, Olivia Romero, Oralia M. Romero, Pedro Romero, Philbert Romero, Ricardo Romero, Amelia Roybal, Annette Roybal, Cordelia Roybal, Delbert Roybal, Diane Roybal, Doris Roybal, Freddy Roybal, Gus Roybal, Gustavo A. Roybal, Henry Roybal, J. E. Roybal, Jose Alfredo Roybal, June Roybal, Larry S. Roybal, Monica Roybal, Monica Roybal, Patricia Roybal, Phillip Roybal, Prescilla Roybal, Ray James Roybal, Reuben Roybal, Vicent Roybal, William Roybal, Cathy Salazar, Christella A. Salazar, Linda Salazar, Steve Salazar, Cristina Salazar-Langley, Levi Sandoval, Patsy Sandoval, Victor Sandoval, Jake Scarborough, Frank Sena, John Sena, JoAnn Serna, Stella Shelburn, Thomas A. Sisneros, Albert Staldelmaier, Vanessa Stein, Mr. Gary Sullivan, Carmelito Sweeney, The Estate of Pedro Roybal, Lola Thompson, Audrey Torres, Geraldine R. Towles, Alex Trujillo, Anna V. Trujillo, Carl Trujillo, Dan Trujillo, Danette Trujillo, Daniel J. Trujillo, Diana Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Ellen Trujillo, Ernie Trujillo, Herman Trujillo, Jake Trujillo, Jeff Trujillo, Jessica Trujillo, Mr. Joe Trujillo, John B. Trujillo, Jose Trujillo, Loyola Trujillo, Margarita Trujillo, Martha Trujillo, Maureen Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Ms. Olivia Trujillo, Pamela J. Trujillo, Patricia Trujillo, Ronald Trujillo, Roy Trujillo, Sharon Trujillo, Socorro Trujillo, Stella Trujillo, Sylvia Trujillo, Mr. Tony Trujillo, Christi Uffatt, Celia Ulibarri, Ernest Ulibarri, Jr., Jennifer Duran Ulibarri, Larry Ulibarri, Phillip Ulibarri, Jeoff Urioste, A. E. Valdez, Chris Valdez, Cleo B. Valdez, Darlene Valdez, Edward Valdez, Eliza Valdez, Erik Valdez, Esquipula N. Valdez, Fabie Valdez, Isador Valdez, John Valdez, Joseph A. Valdez, Joseph P. Valdez, Manuel F. Valdez, Roman Valdez, Ruby Valdez, Seferino Valdez, Dan Valencia, Flavio Valencia, John Valencia, Mona Valencia, Pita Valencia, Loretta Valerio, Lynne Velasco, Annie Vigil, Arnold Vigil, Ester Vigil, George Vigil, Gustavo Vigil, Louise Vigil, Teofilo Vigil, Phillip Villareal, Sylvia Villareal, Nicole Voight, Andy Welch, Matthew Wheeler, Paul White, Barbara Wolf, David Wolf, Jerry Wolff, Susan Wolff, Mary Woodson, Lucy Yuan and Vincent Yuan. Served on 09/15/2017 by email. --[Edited 09/19/2017 by SDS to modify title of pleading filed in entry] [17-2147] ABD [Entered: 09/15/2017 12:48 PM]
September 15, 2017 [10498382] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Peter Chestnut and Ms. Ann B. Rodgers for Pueblo De San Ildefonso. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/15/2017. Manner of Service: US mail, email [17-2147] [Entered: 09/15/2017 04:21 PM]
September 14, 2017 [10498119] Notice of appearance submitted by Maria O'Brien and Sarah M. Stevenson for Appellee Pueblo De Pojoaque for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/14/2017. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [17-2147]--[Edited 09/15/2017 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 9/15/2017] SMS [Entered: 09/14/2017 04:59 PM]
September 12, 2017 [10497289] Notice of appearance submitted by Scott B. McElroy and Alice E. Walker for Appellee Pueblo De Nambe for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/12/2017. Manner of Service: email, US mail. --[Edited 09/12/2017 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [17-2147] AEW [Entered: 09/12/2017 03:15 PM]
September 12, 2017 [10497291] Notice of appearance filed by Mr. Scott B. McElroy and Ms. Alice E. Walker for Pueblo De Nambe. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/12/2017. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [17-2147] [Entered: 09/12/2017 03:24 PM]
September 8, 2017 [10496461] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court following the opening of this appeal, to clarify the individuals and entities that are Defendants-Appellants. Defendants-Appellants' response due 09/15/2017. Appellees may, but are not required, to file a response within 7 days. Served on 09/08/2017. [17-2147] [Entered: 09/08/2017 09:53 AM]
September 7, 2017 [10496376] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/07/2017. Docketing statement, and transcript order form due 09/21/2017 for Barbara Aamodt, et al. Entry of appearance due for State of New Mexico and Barbara Aamodt, et al. [17-2147] [Entered: 09/07/2017 06:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

</
Search for this case: State of New Mexico, et al v. Aamodt, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF NEW MEXICO, ex rel. State Engineer
Represented By: Gregory C. Ridgley
Represented By: Arianne Singer
Represented By: Kelly Brooks Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bradley S. Bridgewater
Represented By: David W. Gehlert
Represented By: Andrew J. Guarino
Represented By: Steven Miskinis
Represented By: John Luther Smeltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PUEBLO DE NAMBE
Represented By: Scott B. McElroy
Represented By: Stanley M. Pollack
Represented By: Alice E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PUEBLO DE POJOAQUE
Represented By: Maria O'Brien
Represented By: Sarah Marie Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PUEBLO DE SAN ILDEFONSO
Represented By: Peter Chestnut
Represented By: Ann B. Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PUEBLO DE TESUQUE
Represented By: Richard W. Hughes I
Represented By: Daniel S. Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NANSY CARSON
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PAUL DOTSON
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HELEN RINKE
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANNETTE DURAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GRACE L. GOMEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARGO GOMEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BARBARA AAMODT
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: VIOLA GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PAUL AAMODT
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GILBERT GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PETE ARAGON
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LUCILLE GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARGIE ARCHIBEQUE
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DALILA ARCHULETA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSE G. GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARDY GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EDUARDO ARCHULETA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LARRY HERRERA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANGIE ARCHULETA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN HOGDEN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ISAAC ARCHULETA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: M. A. LATHROP
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOE ARCHULETA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JANE LIPMAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN P. ARCHULETA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELVIRA ARCHULETA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MATHEW LOGGHE
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSE P. ARCHULETA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TAMMY LOGGHE
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JERRY LUGO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LYDIA ARCHULETA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JANET B. ARROWSMITH
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEPHANIE KELLY MADRID
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAMES R. ATTLESEY
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EDNA MAES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KATHLEEN S. ATTLESEY
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANNE MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WALTER MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BAUDILIO G. BACA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROBERTO F. BACA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EUGENE ORTIZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN ORTIZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAMES P. BARBER
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN PROVOST
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RAY JAMES ROYBAL
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARK BLEA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STELLA SHELBURN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: APRIL BLEA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TONY TRUJILLO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN BORREGO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHRISTI OFFUTT
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CATHERINE BORREGO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JUAN BORREGO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSEPH P. VALDEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NATHAN L. BORREGO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAN VALENCIA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WARREN HALL YOUNG
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: M. J. BUSTOS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LUCY YUAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: IGNACIO CARRENO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANNABELLE CARRENO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEVE CARSON
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TIM CASH
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MELVIN CHANEY
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELAINE CHAVEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MANUEL CHAVEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FELIX CHAVEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LYNNE COMEAU
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LUCY M. CORNWELL
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARCELLA CUR
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GERARD CUR
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL DEMARIA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BRUCE DURAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAVE DURAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LEROY DURAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHELLE DURAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PRISCILLA DURAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROBERT L. DURAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RONNIE DURAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEVE DURAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BEVERLY DURAN-CASH
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TANYA EDWARDS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MATHEW EDWARDS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: VIRGINIA ESPINOSA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANDREA FISHER
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LINDA FLUK
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ARNOLD GABALDON
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAVID GALLEGOS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELAINE GALLEGOS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MANNY GALLEGOS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NICK GALLEGOS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GLORIA J. GALLEGOS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PHYLLIS GALLEGOS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LIA GALLEGOS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RAMON GALLEGOS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: VALDEZ GALLEGOS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JANITO GALLEGOS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANTHONY GARCIA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JERRY L. GARCIA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOE GARCIA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMELIA GARCIA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KATHLEEN GARCIA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LEONARDO GARCIA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARIA E. GARCIA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARIANO GARCIA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RAMON GARCIA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RAMONA GARCIA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GILBERT GARDUNO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GILBERT JOHN GARDUNO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KATHERINE GARDUNO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JD PAUL GARDUNO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARGARET GARDUNO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FERNANDO GARZON
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FERNIE M. GIRON
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GEORGE GOMEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN GOMEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LOYOLA GOMEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RAMONA GOMEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BETH GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DEBBIE GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FERMIN GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JUAN GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARLENE GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROBERT GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RODOLFO GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SUSAN GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAKE GONZALES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DIANA GONZALEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TONY GONZALEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EILEEN M. GOODWIN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NANCY GRABOWSKI
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN GUTTING
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PUANANI G. HARVEY
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ERNESTINE HERRERA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARTHA HERRERA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KEVIN HERRERA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NICOLE VOIGHT
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: THOMAS HICKS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CAROL HOGSETT
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: VICTOR HOGSETT
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DOLORES B. JACOBS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BENITO JACQUEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CARLA M. JACQUEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EDWARD JACQUEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FACUNDO CUNDY JIMENEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JUAN C. JIMENEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LOUISE L. JIMENEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SARA JIMENEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LORRAINE JIMINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FRANK R. JIMINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAMES JIRON
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JUAN F. JIRON
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ARABELLA A. JIRON
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LYNN R. KELLY
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KIM HELMS
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PATRICIA MCMAHON KENNEDY
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RICHARD L. KREISCHER
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DIANE P. KREISCHER
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AARON LAW
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROSE LAW
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KARLA LEYBA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHRISTINA D. LOPEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSEPH C. LOPEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SHERRY LOPEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MANUEL LOPEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PETRONILA M. LOPEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARGARET E. LOPEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ORLANDO L. LOPEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EDWARD LUCERO, JR.
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEPHANIE LUCERO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NANCY F. LUJAN, (Doherty)
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMADEO R. LUJAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PEDRO LUJAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EVELYN LUJAN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JANET HERRERA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TOM LYNCH
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LARRY MAASSEN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARYBETH MAASSEN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROMERO MAES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LUCY MAES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: VIRGINIA MAES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL MARGIOTTA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARY ELLEN MARINO
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEX MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BERNADETTE MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EDWARD F. MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EMILIO MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GERARD MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SUSIE MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSE AB MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MANUEL MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANGIE MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PAUL MOORE
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FAVIOLA MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARY G. MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RODNEY DAVID MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: VICTOR MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BERLINDA MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CINDY MARTINEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARY WOODSON, Woodson Family Trust
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARCELLA MATHIESON
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PETER GOMEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RAYMOND MCALLISTER
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ESTATE OF ALLEN MCNOUN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARK MCNOUN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: A. GREER MCSPADDEN
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JACOB MENDEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JESSICA L. MENDEZ
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SANDRA MENDOZA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BRENDA MOLINA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELEAZAR MOLINA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SYLVIA MOLINA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSEPH MONTES
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANTHONY MONTOYA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: VICKIE MONTOYA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BEN MONTOYA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CARMEN MONTOYA
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards