Harper v. Montezuma County Board, et al

Defendant / Appellee: MONTEZUMA COUNTY COMBINED COURTS, MONTEZUMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, CITY OF CORTEZ, COLORADO, CORTEZ POLICE DEPARTMENT, MONTEZUMA COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS and MONTEZUMA COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARION O. HARPER, III
Case Number: 19-1001
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 [10627841] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume 1-pleadings. [19-1001] [Entered: 02/20/2019 07:52 AM]
February 19, 2019 [10627586] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or ifp forms and Appellant's brief due on 04/01/2019 for Marion O. Harper III. Record on appeal 10th Circuit due 03/12/2019 [19-1001] [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:36 PM]
February 19, 2019 [10627580] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring [ # 10626993-2 ] the parties' response to the court's jurisdictional order of 1/9/19 [ # 10623300-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 02/19/2019. [19-1001] [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:32 PM]
February 14, 2019 [10626993] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by City of Cortez, Colorado and Cortez Police Department, Montezuma Defendants. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 02/14/2019. Manner of service: US mail. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1001] CBK [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:43 PM]
January 31, 2019 [10623300] Appellant memorandum brief filed by Marion O. Harper, III. Served on 01/28/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. Appellees' memorandum brief due 02/14/2019 for City of Cortez, Colorado, Cortez Police Department, Montezuma County Board of County Commissioners, Montezuma County Combined Courts, Montezuma County Department of Social Services and Montezuma County Sheriff's Department [19-1001] [Entered: 01/31/2019 12:47 PM]
January 23, 2019 [10621009] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Gordon L. Vaughan for Montezuma County Board of County Commissioners, Montezuma County Sheriff's Department and Montezuma County Department of Social Services. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/23/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email [19-1001] [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:13 PM]
January 23, 2019 [10620998] Entry of appearance submitted by Gordon L. Vaughan for Appellees Montezuma County Board of County Commissioners, Montezuma County Department of Social Services and Montezuma County Sheriff's Department for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/23/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-1001] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 01/23/2019 by NA] GLV [Entered: 01/23/2019 12:59 PM]
January 22, 2019 [10620391] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: entry of appearance not filed on behalf of Montezuma County Sheriff's Department and Montezuma County Social Services. Notice of appearance due on 02/01/2019 for Montezuma County Department of Social Services and Montezuma County Sheriff's Department. [19-1001] [Entered: 01/22/2019 09:05 AM]
January 14, 2019 [10618531] Entry of appearance filed by Marion O. Harper, III. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/11/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1001] [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:00 PM]
January 9, 2019 [10617397] Jurisdiction challenged. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of this court. Appellant's memorandum brief due 01/30/2019 for Marion O. Harper III. See order for details. Served on 01/09/2018. [19-1001] [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:12 AM]
January 7, 2019 [10616668] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Courtney Beth Kramer, Esq. for City of Cortez, Colorado and Cortez Police Department. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/07/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-1001] [Entered: 01/07/2019 12:06 PM]
January 7, 2019 [10616663] Entry of appearance submitted by Courtney B. Kramer for Appellees City of Cortez, Colorado and Cortez Police Department for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/07/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-1001] --[Edited 01/07/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 1/7/2019.] CBK [Entered: 01/07/2019 11:55 AM]
January 3, 2019 [10615953] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Gordon L. Vaughan for Montezuma County Board of County Commissioners. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/03/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-1001] [Entered: 01/03/2019 12:05 PM]
January 3, 2019 [10615866] Entry of appearance submitted by Gordon L. Vaughan for Appellee Montezuma County Board of County Commissioners for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/02/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/03/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1001] GLV [Entered: 01/03/2019 10:39 AM]
January 2, 2019 [10615601] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [19-1001] [Entered: 01/02/2019 02:24 PM]
January 2, 2019 [10615391] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/02/2018. Fee or ifp forms due 02/01/2019 for Marion O. Harper III (pending in district court). Notice of appearance due on 01/16/2019 for City of Cortez, Colorado, Cortez Police Department, Montezuma County Board of County Commissioners, Montezuma County Department of Social Services and Montezuma County Sheriff's Department, and Notice of appearance due on 02/01/2019 for Marion O. Harper III. [19-1001] [Entered: 01/02/2019 09:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Montezuma County Board, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONTEZUMA COUNTY COMBINED COURTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONTEZUMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Gordon L. Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF CORTEZ, COLORADO
Represented By: Courtney Beth Kramer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORTEZ POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Courtney Beth Kramer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONTEZUMA COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS
Represented By: Gordon L. Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONTEZUMA COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES
Represented By: Gordon L. Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARION O. HARPER, III
Represented By: Marion O. Harper III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?