Young v. Whitaker
Defendant / Appellee: JEFF SESSIONS, United States Attorney General, Department of Justice, United States and MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, United States Attorney General, Department of Justice, United States
Plaintiff / Appellant: TIMOTHY DOYLE YOUNG
Case Number: 19-1019
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 [10627571] Mandate issued. [19-1019] [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:19 PM]
February 19, 2019 [10627570] Default; Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [19-1019] [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:19 PM]
January 28, 2019 [10622143] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Timothy Doyle Young. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/23/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-1019] [Entered: 01/28/2019 03:10 PM]
January 22, 2019 [10620479] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - briefing on the merits is tolled pending further order of the court. Appellant's response to PLRA show cause order due on 02/12/2019 for Timothy Doyle Young. See order for details. Served on 01/22/2019. [19-1019] [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:48 AM]
January 16, 2019 [10619378] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/16/2019. Notice of appearance due on 02/15/2019 for Timothy Doyle Young. [19-1019] [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFF SESSIONS, United States Attorney General, Department of Justice, United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, United States Attorney General, Department of Justice, United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY DOYLE YOUNG
Represented By: Timothy Doyle Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?