Tso v. Murray, et al
Defendant / Appellee: RICHARD F. SPIEGLE, Individually Psy. D., CYNTHIA COFFMAN, official capacity, COLORADO DIVISION OF MOTOR VEHICLES, JENNIFER ALELMANN, individually and in her official capacity, DAVID H. GOLDBERG, individually, MICHAEL DIXON, official capacity, SHERR PUTTMAN AKINS LAMB PC, a law firm, COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, MONICA JACKSON, official capacity, ELIZABETH STARRS, individually, LARA DELKA, individually and in her official capacity, CHRISTIAN MADDY, individually and in his official capacity, DAVID P. BRODSKY, individually, TANYA AKINS, individually, JEANNIE RIDINGS, individually, DON MARES, official capacity, PHIL WEISER, official capacity, DENVER DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, ROSS B.H. BUCHANAN, individually, RUSSELL M. MURRAY, individually, 2ND DISTRICT COURT, DENVER COUNTY, COLORADO, DENA MURRAY, individually, REBECCA MURRAY, individually, KILLIS RIDINGS & VANAU PC, a law firm, 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT, LAKE CO., ILLINOIS, BARRY PARDUS, official capacity, JOANNE JENSEN, individually and CHARLES D. JOHNSON, individually
Plaintiff / Appellant: GILBERT T. TSO, a natural person and an American
Case Number: 19-1021
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 22, 2020 Tso v. Murray

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 [10632986] Attorney Sherri L. Catalano for Denver Department of Human Services, Ms. Lara Delka, City and County of Denver, Don Mares, Monica Jackson, Christian Maddy and Jennifer Alelmann admitted to the bar of this court. [19-1021] [Entered: 03/13/2019 09:42 AM]
February 26, 2019 [10629529] Attorney Mr. Jonathan Neal Eddy for David P. Brodsky, Charles D. Johnson and 19th Judicial Circuit Court, Lake Co., Illinois admitted to the bar of this court. [19-1021] [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:58 AM]
February 25, 2019 [10628868] Attorney admission letter, second notice sent. Attorney admission response date set to 03/07/2019. [19-1021] [Entered: 02/25/2019 08:33 AM]
February 1, 2019 [10623500] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 03/04/2019 for Jonathan Neal Eddy. [19-1021] [Entered: 02/01/2019 08:39 AM]
January 31, 2019 [10623372] Entry of appearance filed by Jonathan Neal Eddy and Eric Michael Ziporin for David P. Brodsky, Charles D. Johnson and 19th Judicial Circuit Court, Lake Co., Illinois. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/31/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1021] [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:38 PM]
January 31, 2019 [10623368] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric M. Ziporin and Jonathan N. Eddy for Appellees Charles D. Johnson, David P. Brodsky and 19th Judicial Circuit Court, Lake Co., Illinois for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/31/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-1021]--[Edited 01/31/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 1/31/2019] EMZ [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:29 PM]
January 29, 2019 [10622508] Entry of appearance filed by Valentine Uduebor for Richard F. Spiegle. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/29/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1021] [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:23 PM]
January 29, 2019 [10622483] Entry of appearance submitted by Valentine Uduebor for Appellee Richard F. Spiegle for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/29/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-1021] --[Edited 01/29/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 1/29/2019.] VU [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:05 PM]
January 28, 2019 [10622168] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant's motion for permission to file electronically. This appeal has been abated pending the district court's resolution of two post-judgment motions. Nothing is required of or due from appellant at this time. Nevertheless, the court will suspend the abatement for sole purpose of resolving appellant's current motion. After entry of this order, the abatement returns to full force, and proceedings in the appeal will not resume until this court lifts the abatement. Please see order for additional important information. Served on 01/28/2019. [19-1021] [Entered: 01/28/2019 03:28 PM]
January 28, 2019 [10622099] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Gilbert T. Tso for permission to file electronically. Served on 01/28/2019. Manner of Service: hand delivery. [19-1021] [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:06 PM]
January 28, 2019 [10622097] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Gilbert T. Tso. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/28/2019. Manner of Service: hand delivery [19-1021] [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:03 PM]
January 23, 2019 [10621045] Entry of appearance filed by Kevin Scott Taylor for Richard F. Spiegle. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/23/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1021] [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:26 PM]
January 23, 2019 [10621017] Entry of appearance submitted by Kevin S. Taylor for Appellee Richard F. Spiegle for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/23/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1021]--[Edited 01/23/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 1/23/2019] MLB [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:29 PM]
January 23, 2019 [10620875] Entry of appearance filed by Allison R Ailer for Michael Dixon, Mr. Barry Pardus, Colorado Department of Human Services, Ms. Elizabeth Starrs, Ross B.H. Buchanan, David H. Goldberg, 2nd District Court, Denver County, Colorado, Colorado Division of Motor Vehicles and Phil Weiser. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/23/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1021] [Entered: 01/23/2019 09:57 AM]
January 23, 2019 [10620857] Entry of appearance submitted by Allison R. Ailer for Appellees 2nd District Court, Denver County, Colorado, Ross B.H. Buchanan, Mr. Cynthia Coffman, Colorado Department of Human Services, Colorado Division of Motor Vehicles, Michael Dixon, David H. Goldberg, Mr. Barry Pardus and Ms. Elizabeth Starrs for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/23/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. --[Edited 01/23/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed][19-1021] ARA [Entered: 01/23/2019 09:41 AM]
January 23, 2019 [10620832] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 02/22/2019 for Sherri L. Catalano. [19-1021] [Entered: 01/23/2019 08:38 AM]
January 22, 2019 [10620719] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Tory D. Riter and Ms. Kelly L. Kafer for Tanya Akins, Sherr Puttman Akins Lamb PC, Jeannie Ridings and Killis Ridings & Vanau PC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1021] [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:57 PM]
January 22, 2019 [10620708] Entry of appearance submitted by Kelly L. Kafer and Tory D. Riter for Appellees Tanya Akins, Sherr Puttman Akins Lamb PC, Jeannie Ridings and Killis Ridings & Vanau PC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/22/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1021] KLK [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:49 PM]
January 22, 2019 [10620650] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard Maxton Murray for Rebecca Murray, Russell M. Murray, Dena Murray and Joanne Jensen. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1021] [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:57 PM]
January 22, 2019 [10620639] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard M. Murray for Appellees Dena Murray, Rebecca Murray, Russell M. Murray and Joanne Jensen for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1021]--[Edited 01/22/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 1/22/2019] RMM [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:47 PM]
January 22, 2019 [10620497] Entry of appearance filed by Sherri L. Catalano, Amy Jean Packer and Mr. Robert Wolf for Denver Department of Human Services, Ms. Lara Delka, City and County of Denver, Don Mares, Monica Jackson, Christian Maddy and Jennifer Alelmann. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1021] [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:06 PM]
January 22, 2019 [10620486] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert A. Wolf, Amy J. Packer, and Sherri Catalano for Appellees City and County of Denver, Denver Department of Human Services, Monica Jackson, Ms. Lara Delka, Christian Maddy, Jennifer Alelmann and Don Mares for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 01/22/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1021] RW [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:55 AM]
January 18, 2019 [10620102] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case. When a dispositive order is entered by the district court, the clerk of the district court is directed to supplement the preliminary ROA . FRAP 4(a)(4) or 4(b) order due 02/19/2019. Served on 01/18/2019. [19-1021] [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:33 AM]
January 18, 2019 [10619952] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/17/2019 Notice of appearance due on 02/01/2019 for 19th Judicial Circuit Court, Lake Co., Illinois, 2nd District Court, Denver County, Colorado, Tanya Akins, Jennifer Alelmann, David P. Brodsky, Ross B.H. Buchanan, City and County of Denver, Cynthia Coffman, Colorado Department of Human Services, Colorado Division of Motor Vehicles, Lara Delka, Denver Department of Human Services, Michael Dixon, David H. Goldberg, Monica Jackson, Joanne Jensen, Charles D. Johnson, Killis Ridings & Vanau PC, Christian Maddy, Don Mares, Dena Murray, Rebecca Murray, Russell M. Murray, Barry Pardus, Jeannie Ridings, Sherr Puttman Akins Lamb PC, Richard F. Spiegle and Elizabeth Starrs. Notice of appearance due on 02/19/2019 for Gilbert T. Tso. [19-1021] [Entered: 01/18/2019 07:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tso v. Murray, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD F. SPIEGLE, Individually Psy. D.
Represented By: Valentine Uduebor
Represented By: Kevin Scott Taylor
Represented By: Margaret Louise Boehmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CYNTHIA COFFMAN, official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLORADO DIVISION OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER ALELMANN, individually and in her official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID H. GOLDBERG, individually
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL DIXON, official capacity
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHERR PUTTMAN AKINS LAMB PC, a law firm
Represented By: Tory D. Riter
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONICA JACKSON, official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIZABETH STARRS, individually
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARA DELKA, individually and in her official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTIAN MADDY, individually and in his official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID P. BRODSKY, individually
Represented By: Jonathan Neal Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TANYA AKINS, individually
Represented By: Tory D. Riter
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEANNIE RIDINGS, individually
Represented By: Tory D. Riter
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DON MARES, official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHIL WEISER, official capacity
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENVER DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROSS B.H. BUCHANAN, individually
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUSSELL M. MURRAY, individually
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 2ND DISTRICT COURT, DENVER COUNTY, COLORADO
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENA MURRAY, individually
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REBECCA MURRAY, individually
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KILLIS RIDINGS & VANAU PC, a law firm
Represented By: Tory D. Riter
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT, LAKE CO., ILLINOIS
Represented By: Jonathan Neal Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARRY PARDUS, official capacity
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOANNE JENSEN, individually
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES D. JOHNSON, individually
Represented By: Jonathan Neal Eddy
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GILBERT T. TSO, a natural person and an American
Represented By: Gilbert T. Tso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?