Standing Akimbo, et al v. United States
Respondent / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, through its agency the Internal Revenue Service
Petitioner / Appellant: JOHN MURPHY, an individual, PETER HERMES, an individual, STANDING AKIMBO, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company, SAMANTHA MURPHY, an individual and KEVIN DESILET, an individual
Case Number: 19-1049
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 7, 2020 Summary Standing Akimbo, LLC v. United States

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 [10639305] Appellant's appendix filed by Kevin Desilet, Peter Hermes, Mr. John Murphy, Samantha Murphy and Standing Akimbo, LLC. Total number of volumes filed: 2. Served on 04/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1049] JDT [Entered: 04/05/2019 10:28 PM]
April 5, 2019 [10639304] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Kevin Desilet, Peter Hermes, Mr. John Murphy, Samantha Murphy and Standing Akimbo, LLC. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 04/05/2019 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1049] JDT [Entered: 04/05/2019 10:03 PM]
February 25, 2019 [10628939] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 02/25/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 04/08/2019 for Kevin Desilet, Peter Hermes, John Murphy, Samantha Murphy and Standing Akimbo, LLC. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-1049] [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:00 AM]
February 22, 2019 [10628763] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 03/01/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1049] [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:28 PM]
February 22, 2019 [10628762] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Nathaniel S. Pollock for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (note, interested parties listed have been previously disclosed). Served on 02/22/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1049] [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:26 PM]
February 22, 2019 [10628759] Notice received from Kevin Desilet, Peter Hermes, Mr. John Murphy, Samantha Murphy and Standing Akimbo, LLC that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 02/22/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1049] JDT [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:17 PM]
February 22, 2019 [10628758] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. James D. Thorburn for Mr. John Murphy, Standing Akimbo, LLC, Peter Hermes, Kevin Desilet and Samantha Murphy. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1049] [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:15 PM]
February 22, 2019 [10628755] Entry of appearance submitted by James David Thorburn for Appellants Kevin Desilet, Peter Hermes, Mr. John Murphy, Samantha Murphy and Standing Akimbo, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/22/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1049] JDT [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:11 PM]
February 22, 2019 [10628754] Docketing statement filed by Kevin Desilet, Peter Hermes, Mr. John Murphy, Samantha Murphy and Standing Akimbo, LLC. Served on 02/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1049] JDT [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:09 PM]
February 22, 2019 [10628723] Entry of appearance submitted by Nathaniel S. Pollock for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1049] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed and to reflect that the interested parties listed have been previously disclosed-- Edited 02/22/2019 by NA] NSP [Entered: 02/22/2019 02:11 PM]
February 8, 2019 [10625422] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/07/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 02/22/2019 for Kevin Desilet, Peter Hermes, John Murphy, Samantha Murphy and Standing Akimbo, LLC. Notice of appearance due on 02/22/2019 for United States of America. [19-1049] [Entered: 02/08/2019 08:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Standing Akimbo, et al v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, through its agency the Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Nathaniel S. Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JOHN MURPHY, an individual
Represented By: James D. Thorburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PETER HERMES, an individual
Represented By: James D. Thorburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: STANDING AKIMBO, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company
Represented By: James D. Thorburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: SAMANTHA MURPHY, an individual
Represented By: James D. Thorburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: KEVIN DESILET, an individual
Represented By: James D. Thorburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?