Snyder, et al v. Acord Corporation, et al
Defendant / Appellee: NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, ELECTRIC INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation, ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, ABC ORGANIZATION, an entity or group of entities, whose true names are unknown, SENTRY INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, SHELTER MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation, VERISK ANALYTICS INC., a Delaware corporation, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, an Iowa corporation a/k/a Farmers Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Farmers Insurance Exchange, AMERICAN INDEMNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a Guideone Insurance, AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP., a Florida corporation, NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation, STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas corporation, SECURA INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., a Wisconsi corporation, CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a The Central Insurance Companies, PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, a Colordo non-profit corporation, HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation a/k/a Fireman's Fund Insurance Company of Missouri, ACORD CORPORATION, THE BUCKEYE STATE MUTUTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Buckeye Insurance Group, STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinois corporation, AMERICAN RELIABLE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation, GRANGE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, a Washington corporation, FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation b/b/a First American Property & Casualty Group, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, COLORADO FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., a Colorado corporation, TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY, GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation, KEMPER CORPORATE SERVICES, INC., an Illinois corporation, METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN MODERN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, UNITED FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, MUNICH-AMERICAN HOLDING CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES INC., A Minnesota corporation, UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a United Fire Group, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation, QBE INSURANCE GROUP, LIMITED, STILLWATER PROPERTY AND CAUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation a/k/a Fidelity National Property and Casulty Insurance Company d/b/a Stillwater Insurance Group, ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation, INTERNATION INSURNACE SOCIETY, INC., a Delware non-profit corporation, FIRST AMERICAN FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, LM INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation, MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation, STATE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Ohio corpoarion, AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, UNITED FIRE INSURANCE GROUP, INC., an Iowa corporation d/b/a United Fire Group, INSURANCE SERVICES OFFICE, INC., a Delaware corporation, THE CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE, a California corporation, PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, ADDISON INSURANCE COMPANY, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation, FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation, PHARMACISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation a/k/a McKinsey & Company, Inc. washington D.C., AMERICAN MODERN HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, ALLIANZ OF AMERICA, INC., a Delaware corporation, OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporationd/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance d/b/a Home-Owners Insurance, UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, a Texas corporation, THE TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, a Massachusetts corporation, MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, METLIFE AUTO & HOME INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinois corporation, ZURICH INSURANCE GROUP LTD/FI, a Switzerland corporation, FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, a Maryland corporation, COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., a Delaware non-profit corporation, QBE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation a/k/a QBE Insurance Corporation, ASSOCIATED INDEMNITY CORPORATION, a California corporation, AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation, THE TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., a Connecticut corporation, CASUALTY ACTUARIAL SOCIETY, an Illinois not for profit corporation, LAFAYETTE INSURANCE COMPANY, a/k/a United Lifre Insurance Company, Inc., PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation, AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD CONNECTICUT, a Connecticut corporation, VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation, UNITED FIRE LLOYDS, a Texas corporation, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a New Hampshire corporation, TEXAS GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Colorado corporation, NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Nationwide Insurance, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation, CHUBB SERVICES CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation, UNITED LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation, AMERICAN MODERN INSURANCE GROUP, INC., an Ohio corporation, AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, a Florida corporation, ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, an entity whose true name is unknown d/b/a Untied Fire Group, CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Wisconsin corporation, NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY FO AMERICA, an Ohio corporation, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPNAY, an Indiana corporation, NATIONAL FARMERS UNION PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation, ALLIANZ LIFE INSURANCE CO. OF NORTH AMERICA, a Minnesota corporation, THE CHUBB CORPORATION, a New Jersey corporation, QBE HOLDINGS, INC., a Delaware corporation, AMERICAN FAMILY HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation, METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation, ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Illinoise corporation d/b/a Encompass Insurance, FARMERS ALLIANCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Kansas corporation, UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, A New York corporation, KEMPER CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, UNITRIN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Connecticut corporation, EMPLOYERS MUTUTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a EMC Incurance Companies, AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Michigan corporation d/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance, HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation, ALL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, UNITED FIRE AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Texas corporation, THE BUCKEYE STATE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Buckeye Insurance Group, MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a Virginia corporation, PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, a Colorado non-profit corporation, METLIFE AUTO & HOME INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., a Rhode Island corporation, PHARMACISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation, STILLWATER PROPERTY AND CAUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation a/k/a Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Stillwater Insurance Group, STATE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Ohio corporation, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois corporation, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois corporation, EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a EMC Insurance Companies, QBE INSURANCE GROUP, LIMITED, a Sydney, Australia corporation, INTERNATION INSURANCE SOCIETY, INC., a Delaware non-profit corporation, MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois corporation, OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance d/b/a Home-Owners Insurance, ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY, an Illinois corporation, UNITRIN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinois corporation, SECURA INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., a Wisconsin corporation, LAFAYETTE INSURANCE COMPANY, a/k/a United Life Insurance Company, Inc., ALL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, DBA The Central Insurance Companies, CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation, ADDISON INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation, ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Illinois corporation d/b/a Encompass Insurance, COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois corporation, METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation, ACORD CORPORATION, a Delaware non-profit corporation, CHUBB SERVICES CORPORATION, an Illinois corporation, ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, an entity whose true name is unknown d/b/a United Fire Group, NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION, an Illinois corporation and LM INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinois corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: TOMMY MEYER, KENNETH DALE YODER, JANET KOCH, IAN SIEMPLENSKI, SUEHAM KAY HOFFMAN, MARY HARROW, LOUISE CREAGER, MARTHA LEMERT, ESTATE OF DOROTHY WOOD HAMMER, DALE SNYDER, MARILYN SNYDER, CATHERINE TAYLOR, JEFFREY RAY, LAILA SAEDA URBAN, NICOLE WRIGHT-MEYER, MARY ANN GELDREICH, JENNIFER RAY and GARY LEMERT
Case Number: 19-1112
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 [10651129] Notice of deficient appendix received from Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Type of deficiency: hard copy of volume 21 not filed; no certificate of digital submission or service in appendix.. See attached letter for specifics. Appendix due on 06/03/2019 for Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. [19-1112] [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:42 PM]
May 22, 2019 [10650523] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing appellees to file a response to Appellants' motion to seal volume 43 of the appellants' appendix by 06/03/2019. Any appellees who wish to take a position on the propriety of the continued sealing of the material in Volume 43 of appellants' appendix shall file a response to the motion. If the responding appellees take the same position, a single consolidated response shall be filed. Response due on 6/3/2019 for ABC Insurance Company, ABC Organization, Acord Corporation, Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., Allstate Insurance Company, American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Select Insurance Company, American Reliable Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Internation Insurance Society, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Insurance Company, McKinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Milbank Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, National Casualty Company, National Farmers Union Property & Casualty Company, National Surety Corporation, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Standard Fire Insurance Company, State Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stillwater Property and Caualty Insurance Company, Texas General Indemnity Company, The Buckeye State Mutual Insurance Company, The California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The Chubb Corporation, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The Travelers Companies Inc., The Travelers Insurance Company, The Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Insurance Group, Inc., United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Verisk Analytics Inc., Vigilant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company and Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI. Served on 05/22/2019. [19-1112] [Entered: 05/22/2019 08:54 AM]
May 22, 2019 [10650488] Appellant's motion filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder to seal Volume 43 of appellant's appendix. Served on 05/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 05/22/2019 07:55 AM]
May 22, 2019 [10650455] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Total number of volumes filed: 44. Served on 05/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 05/22/2019 by LAB to remove motion to seal and exhibits, motion docket separately.]--[Edited 05/23/2019 by LAB - brief cited as deficient 5/23/19.] [19-1112] JDH [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:26 AM]
May 21, 2019 [10650453] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder, Josue David Hernandez. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 05/21/2019 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1112] JDH [Entered: 05/21/2019 11:54 PM]
May 21, 2019 [10650452] Appellant's appendix filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Total number of volumes filed:. Served on 05/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 05/23/2019 by LAB - appendix cited as deficient 5/23/19.] [19-1112] JDH [Entered: 05/21/2019 11:39 PM]
May 13, 2019 [10648447] Attorney Mr. Gregory John Theo for All American Insurance Company, Central Mutual Insurance Company and Grange Insurance Association admitted to the bar of this court. [19-1112] [Entered: 05/14/2019 08:33 AM]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order [10647547] Order filed by Judges Hartz and Phillips denying motion for stay and motion to seal pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 25.6(A) filed by Appellants. See attached order. Served on 05/09/2019. [19-1112] [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:57 PM]
May 1, 2019 [10645481] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellee American Family Mutual Insurance Company's attorney motion to withdraw as attorney. Margaret Y. Cass is now withdrawn as counsel. Served on 05/01/2019. [19-1112] [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:46 PM]
May 1, 2019 [10645471] Motion filed by Appellee American Family Mutual Insurance Company for attorney Margaret Y. Cass to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 05/01/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1112] MYC [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:24 PM]
May 1, 2019 [10645452] Corporate disclosure statement filed by American International Group, Inc.. [19-1112] EBL [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:52 PM]
April 29, 2019 [10644771] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. [19-1112] LFM [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:01 PM]
April 29, 2019 [10644769] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Allianz of America, Inc.. [19-1112] LFM [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:59 PM]
April 29, 2019 [10644767] Corporate disclosure statement filed by National Surety Corporation. [19-1112] LFM [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:57 PM]
April 29, 2019 [10644765] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Associated Indemnity Corporation. [19-1112] LFM [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:54 PM]
April 29, 2019 [10644756] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. [19-1112] LFM [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:33 PM]
April 29, 2019 [10644741] Corporate disclosure statement filed by American Automobile Insurance Company. [19-1112] LFM [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:11 PM]
April 29, 2019 [10644734] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company. [19-1112] LFM [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:01 PM]
April 29, 2019 [10644683] Notice of non-participation filed by Muliha Alian Khan, Dennis N. Ventura for SECURA Insurance Holdings, Inc.. Date of Service: 04/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] MAK [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:16 AM]
April 29, 2019 [10644682] Notice of non-participation filed by Muliha Alia Khan, Michael J. DiSantis for Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company. Date of Service: 04/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] MAK [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:14 AM]
April 26, 2019 [10644534] Reply filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder, Josue David Hernandez to APPELLEES ELECTRIC INSURANCE COMPANY'S AND USAA'S RESPONSE TO APPELLANTS' MOTION PURSUANT TO 10TH CIR. R. 25.6(A). Served on 04/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1112] JDH [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:23 PM]
April 24, 2019 [10643502] Reply filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder, Josue David Hernandez to PARTICIPATING APPELLEES' RESPONSE TO APPELLANTS' MOTION FOR AN EMERGENCY STAY OF JUDGMENT. Served on 04/24/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1112] JDH [Entered: 04/24/2019 08:10 AM]
April 19, 2019 [10642809] Response filed by Electric Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and United Services Automobile Association to Appellants Motion Pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 25.6(a). Served on 04/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1112] JAM [Entered: 04/19/2019 05:48 PM]
April 19, 2019 [10642797] Response filed by First American Financial Corporation, Participating Appellees to Appellants' Motion for an Emergency Stay of Judgment. Served on 04/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1112] EFF [Entered: 04/19/2019 04:10 PM]
April 19, 2019 [10642583] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. [19-1112] RLM [Entered: 04/19/2019 09:36 AM]
April 18, 2019 [10642463] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company. [19-1112] RLM [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:05 PM]
April 18, 2019 [10642460] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company. [19-1112] RLM [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:04 PM]
April 18, 2019 [10642458] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Kemper Corporation. [19-1112] RLM [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:02 PM]
April 18, 2019 [10642456] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Kemper Corporate Services, Inc.. [19-1112] RLM [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:01 PM]
April 18, 2019 [10642412] Notice of non-participation filed by Jamey W. Jamison for American Strategic Insurance Corp. and Acuity, a Mutual Insurance Company. Date of Service: 04/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] JWJ [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:43 PM]
April 18, 2019 [10642408] Notice of non participation filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange. Served on 04/18/2019 by email. [19-1112]--[Edited 04/18/2019 by LG to correct event] TPJ [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:25 PM]
April 17, 2019 [10642069] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Central Mutual Insurance Company and All America Insurance Company. --[Edited 04/17/2019 by SDS to add party filer] [19-1112] SDM [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:32 PM]
April 17, 2019 [10642061] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Grange Insurance Association. [19-1112] SDM [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:15 PM]
April 17, 2019 [10641994] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - To date numerous appellees have not entered their appearance. Counsel for any appellees who wish to participate shall enter their appearance on or before 04/19/2019. Appellees for whom counsel have not entered their appearance by this deadline will not be permitted to participate in this appeal. Served on 04/17/2019. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:10 PM]
April 17, 2019 [10641949] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America. [19-1112] SJJ [Entered: 04/17/2019 11:02 AM]
April 16, 2019 [10641616] Corporate disclosure statement filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. [19-1112] MSM [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:34 AM]
April 12, 2019 [10641055] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Guideone Mutual Insurance Company. [19-1112] JCR [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:44 PM]
April 12, 2019 [10640921] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company. [19-1112] JDM [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:35 AM]
April 12, 2019 [10640877] Notice of non-participation filed by Michael R. McCurdy for Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Zurich American Insurance Company. Date of Service: 04/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] MRM [Entered: 04/12/2019 10:21 AM]
April 12, 2019 [10640824] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. [19-1112] CM [Entered: 04/12/2019 08:55 AM]
April 12, 2019 [10640785] Entry of appearance filed by William Frederick Jones for American International Group, Inc. and Mr. Eric B. Liebman for American International Group, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y(The parties listed are counsel of record). Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/12/2019 07:14 AM]
April 11, 2019 [10640781] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric B. Liebman and William F. Jones for Appellee American International Group, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] --[Edited 04/12/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 4/12/2019.] EBL [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:35 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640754] Entry of appearance filed by Christopher Ash for McKinsey & Company, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 04:09 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640752] Entry of appearance filed by Elizabeth C. Carter and James Bernard for McKinsey & Company, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 04:02 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640746] Corporate disclosure statement filed by First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. [19-1112] EFF [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:50 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640732] Corporate disclosure statement filed by United Services Automobile Association. [19-1112] JAM [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:31 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640728] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeremy Andrew Moseley for USAA Casualty Insurance Company and United Services Automobile Association. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 04/11/2019 by LAB to correct party.] [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:21 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640722] Entry of appearance filed by Rand L. McClellan for Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Kemper Corporation, Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Cincinnati Insurance Company, American Family Home Insurance Company and Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:15 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640702] Corporate disclosure statement filed by First American Financial Corporation. [19-1112] EFF [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:54 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640695] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Erin F. Frohardt, Mr. Terence M. Ridley, Esq. and Mr. Evan B. Stephenson for First American Financial Corporation. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested parties already listed. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:47 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640684] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Terence M. Ridley, Esq., Erin Frohardt Tatman and Mr. Evan B. Stephenson for First American Property and Casualty Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested parties are already in the appeal. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:37 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640680] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeremy Andrew Moseley and Mr. Michael Lawrence O'Donnell, Esq. for Electric Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:30 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640678] Notice of non-participation filed by Rand L. McClellan for American Family Home Insurance Co., American Modern Insurance Group, Inc., American Modern Home Insurance Co., American Modern Select Insurance Co., Munich-American Holding Corp., Liberty Insurance Corp., and Liberty Mutual Insurance, et al.. Date of Service: 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] RLM [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:24 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640664] Entry of appearance submitted by James L. Bernard and Elizabeth C. Carter for Appellee McKinsey & Company, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/11/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1112] ECC [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:11 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640662] Entry of appearance submitted by Erin Frohardt Tatman; Terence M. Ridley; Evan Bennett Stephenson for Appellee First American Financial Corporation for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112]--[Edited 04/11/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 4/11/2019] EFF [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:10 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640658] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher C. Ash for Appellee McKinsey & Company, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/11/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1112] CA [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:07 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640656] Entry of appearance submitted by Rand L. McClellan for Appellees Cincinnati Insurance Company, Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company and Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 04/11/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 4/11/19.] [19-1112] RLM [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:04 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640652] Corporate disclosure statement filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. [19-1112] JAM [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:59 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640649] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeremy A. Moseley for Appellees United Services Automobile Association and USAA Casualty Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 04/11/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 4/11/19.] [19-1112] JAM [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:57 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640646] Entry of appearance submitted by Erin Frohardt Tatman; Terence M. Ridley; Evan Bennett Stephenson for Appellee First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] --[Edited 04/11/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 4/11/2019] EFF [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:54 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640644] Entry of appearance filed by William Frederick Jones and Mr. Eric B. Liebman for American International Group, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:52 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640642] Corporate disclosure statement filed by Electric Insurance Company. [19-1112] JAM [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:51 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640641] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael L. O'Donnell and Jeremy A. Moseley for Appellee Electric Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112]--[Edited 04/11/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 4/11/2019] JAM [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:49 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640617] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric B. Liebman and William F. Jones for Appellee American International Group, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/11/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1112] WFJ [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:23 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640605] Notice of non-participation filed by Sheryl L. Anderson, Richard L. Fenton, Mark L. Hanover for Sheryl L. Anderson, Richard L. Fenton, Mark L. Hanover. Date of Service: 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] SA [Entered: 04/11/2019 01:04 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640541] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 04/11/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 05/21/2019 for Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. [text only entry - no document attached] [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:43 AM]
April 11, 2019 [10640513] Notice of non-participation filed by Julia C. Webb and Rowe Winston Snider of Locke Lord LLP; Jessica Fuller of Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP for American Association of Insurance Services, Inc.. Date of Service: 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] JCW [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:01 AM]
April 11, 2019 [10640510] Notice of non-participation filed by Holly Stein Sollod for Casualty Actuarial Society. Date of Service: 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] HSS [Entered: 04/11/2019 10:58 AM]
April 11, 2019 [10640439] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 05/13/2019 for Gregory J. Theo. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:44 AM]
April 11, 2019 [10640434] Entry of appearance filed by Mrs. Cynthia Mitchell for The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Company and Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:36 AM]
April 11, 2019 [10640371] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 04/18/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 08:50 AM]
April 11, 2019 [10640358] Entry of appearance submitted by Cynthia Mitchell for Appellees Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/11/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1112] CM [Entered: 04/11/2019 07:51 AM]
April 10, 2019 [10640425] Entry of appearance filed by Stephen J. Jorden for Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:26 AM]
April 10, 2019 [10640354] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Served on: 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] JDH [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:27 PM]
April 10, 2019 [10640353] Docketing statement filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] JDH [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:26 PM]
April 10, 2019 [10640339] Notice of non-participation filed by Richard Mancino, Joseph G. Davis for ZURICH INSURANCE GROUP LTD/FI. Date of Service: 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] RM [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:59 PM]
April 10, 2019 [10640329] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen J. Jorden for Appellee Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/11/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1112] SJJ [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:39 PM]
April 10, 2019 [10640255] Entry of appearance filed by Margaret Young Cass and Mr. Michael S. McCarthy for American Family Home Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-1112] [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:18 PM]
April 10, 2019 [10640241] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael S. McCarthy and Margaret Y. Cass for Appellee American Family Mutual Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112]--[Edited 04/10/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 4/10/2019] MSM [Entered: 04/10/2019 01:53 PM]
April 10, 2019 [10640206] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Gregory Giometti for Owners Insurance Company and Auto-Owners Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:55 PM]
April 10, 2019 [10640200] Entry of appearance submitted by Gregory R. Giometti for Appellee Auto-Owners Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 04/10/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 4/10/19.] [19-1112] JDM [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:49 PM]
April 10, 2019 [10640185] Entry of appearance filed by John D Mereness for Owners Insurance Company and Auto-Owners Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/10/2019 12:23 PM]
April 10, 2019 [10640166] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jacob C. Cohn for Chubb National Insurance Compnay, Chubb Services Corporation, Federal Insurance Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, The Chubb Corporation and Vigilant Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/10/2019 11:51 AM]
April 10, 2019 [10640137] Entry of appearance submitted by Jacob C. Cohn for Appellees Chubb National Insurance Compnay, Chubb Services Corporation, Federal Insurance Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, The Chubb Corporation and Vigilant Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/10/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1112] JCC [Entered: 04/10/2019 11:13 AM]
April 10, 2019 [10640132] Entry of appearance submitted by John D. Mereness for Appellee Auto-Owners Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 04/10/2019 by LAB to correct party filer and remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 4/10/2019.] [19-1112] JDM [Entered: 04/10/2019 11:08 AM]
April 10, 2019 [10640122] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffrey C. Ruebel, Esq. for Guideone Mutual Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1112] [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:31 AM]
April 10, 2019 [10640120] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey C. Ruebel for Appellee Guideone Mutual Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112]--[Edited 04/10/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 4/10/2019] JCR [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:22 AM]
April 10, 2019 [10640056] Entry of appearance filed by Lori McAllister for Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/10/2019 07:56 AM]
April 10, 2019 [10640053] Entry of appearance submitted by Lori McAllister for Appellees Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/10/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1112] LM [Entered: 04/10/2019 07:50 AM]
April 9, 2019 [10640034] Notice of non-participation filed by Robert C. Blume for Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Insurance Company and Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. Date of Service: 04/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] RCB [Entered: 04/09/2019 04:43 PM]
April 9, 2019 [10640001] Notice of non-participation filed by James P. Gaughan for State Automobile Insurance Company and Milbank Insurance Company. Date of Service: 04/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] JPG [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:35 PM]
April 9, 2019 [10640000] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Gregory J. Theo and Mr. Stuart D Morse for American Family Home Insurance Company and Central Mutual Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:33 PM]
April 9, 2019 [10639988] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stuart D Morse and Mr. Gregory J. Theo for Grange Insurance Association. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:28 PM]
April 9, 2019 [10639973] Entry of appearance submitted by Stuart D. Morse and Gregory J. Theo for Appellees All American Insurance Company and Central Mutual Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/09/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed][19-1112] SDM [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:08 PM]
April 9, 2019 [10639967] Entry of appearance submitted by Stuart D. Morse and Gregory J. Theo for Appellee Grange Insurance Association for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 4/9/2019. ] SDM [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:02 PM]
April 9, 2019 [10639878] Notice of non-participation filed by Jon F. Sands and Marilyn S. Chappell for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Date of Service: 04/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] JS [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:14 PM]
April 9, 2019 [10639778] Motion to Seal Exhibits filed by Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder, JOSUE DAVID HERNANDEZ to MOTION FOR AN EMERGENCY STAY OF JUDGMENT, MADE TO A SINGLE JUDGE, JUDGE SCOTT M. MATHESON, JR., PURSUANT TO FED.R.APP.P. 8(a)(2)(D), 27(c), AND 10TH CIR.R. 8.3, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PURSUANT TO 10TH CIR.R. 8.2. Served on 04/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1112] --[Edited 04/09/2019 by AT to reflect cousel filed a motion to seal exhibits.] JDH [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:10 AM]
April 9, 2019 [10639763] Entry of appearance filed by Josue David Hernandez for Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Catherine Taylor, Martha Lemert, Gary Lemert, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Louise Creager, Janet Koch, Ian Siemplenski, Tommy Meyer, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Laila Saeda Urban, and Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Entered: 04/09/2019 08:49 AM]
April 9, 2019 [10639751] Motion filed by Appellants Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder, JOSUE DAVID HERNANDEZ for stay of This is a 10th Cir. R. 8.3 application to a single judge, JUDGE SCOTT M. MATHESON, JR., seeking stay of execution of the Attorneys' Fees Judgements, Docs. 621 and 633, in the district court. We are also requesting an injunction to that effect.. Served on: 04/09/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1112] JDH [Entered: 04/09/2019 08:32 AM]
April 9, 2019 [10639735] Entry of appearance submitted by Josue David Hernandez for Appellants Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Louise Creager, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Marilyn Snyder and Dale SnyderJosue David Hernandez for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] --[Edited 04/09/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 4/9/2019] JDH [Entered: 04/09/2019 08:17 AM]
April 8, 2019 [10639578] Notice of non-participation filed by William J. Kelly III, Chanda M. Feldkamp, Shannon M. Bell for COUNTRY Mutual Insurance Company. Date of Service: 04/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] WJK [Entered: 04/08/2019 01:34 PM]
April 5, 2019 [10639278] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Alan Epstein and Ms. Lisa F. Mickley for American Automobile Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Natiional Surety Corporation and Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/05/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1112] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:17 PM]
April 5, 2019 [10639245] Entry of appearance submitted by Lisa F. Mickley and Alan Epstein for Appellees Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, American Automobile Insurance Company, Associated Indemnity Corporation, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation and Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 04/05/2019 by NA] LFM [Entered: 04/05/2019 03:42 PM]
April 3, 2019 [10638368] Notice of non-participation filed by Mark F. Horning for ACORD Corporation. Date of Service: 04/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] MFH [Entered: 04/03/2019 01:49 PM]
April 1, 2019 [10637402] Notice of non-participation filed by Larry S. McClung for Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company. Date of Service: 04/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] LSM [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:29 AM]
March 29, 2019 [10637129] Notice of non-participation filed by Mark W. Bayer for Verisk Analytics, Inc., Insurance Services Office, Inc.. Date of Service: 03/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] MWB [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:35 PM]
March 28, 2019 [10636810] Notice of non-participation filed by Bennett Cohen for Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. Date of Service: 03/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1112] BLC [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:51 PM]
March 28, 2019 [10636564] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/28/2019. Docketing statement and transcript order form due 04/11/2019 for Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Transcript order form due 04/11/2019 for Louise Creager, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Mary Ann Geldreich, Mary Harrow, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Janet Koch, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Tommy Meyer, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Catherine Taylor, Laila Saeda Urban, Nicole Wright-Meyer and Kenneth Dale Yoder. Notice of appearance due on 04/11/2019 for ABC Insurance Company, ABC Organization, Acord Corporation, Acuity, A Mutual Insurance Company, Addison Insurance Company, All American Insurance Company, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz Life Insurance Co. of North America, Allianz of America, Inc., Allstate Insurance Company, American Association of Insurance Services, Inc., American Automobile Insurance Company, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, American Family Home Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Indemnity Financial Corporation, American International Group, Inc., American Modern Home Insurance Company, American Modern Select Insurance Company, American Mordern Insurance Group, Inc., American Reliable Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp., Associated Indemnity Corporation, Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut, Casualty Actuarial Society, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Compnay, Chubb Services Corporation, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co., Country Mutual Insurance Company, Louise Creager, Electric Insurance Company, Employers Mututal Casualty Company, Encompass Indemnity Company, Encompass Insurance Company of America, Estate of Dorothy Wood Hammer, Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, First American Financial Corporation, First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Mary Ann Geldreich, Grange Insurance Association, Great Northern Insurance Company, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Mary Harrow, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Sueham Kay Hoffman, Insurance Services Office, Inc., Internation Insurnace Society, Inc., Kemper Corporate Services, Inc., Kemper Corporation, Janet Koch, LM Insurance Corporation, Lafayette Insurance Company, Gary Lemert, Martha Lemert, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company, Markel Insurance Company, McKinsey & Company, Inc., MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., Metropolitan Direct Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Tommy Meyer, Milbank Insurance Company, Munich-American Holding Corporation, National Casualty Company, National Farmers Union Property & Casualty Company, National Surety Corporation, Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company fo America, Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Company, QBE Insurance Group, Limited, Jeffrey Ray, Jennifer Ray, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Secura Insurance Holdings, Inc., Sentry Insurance, A Mutual Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Ian Siemplenski, Dale Snyder, Marilyn Snyder, Standard Fire Insurance Company, State Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Stillwater Property and Caualty Insurance Company, Catherine Taylor, Texas General Indemnity Company, The Buckeye State Mututal Insurance Company, The California Casualty Indemnity Exchange, The Chubb Corporation, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The Travelers Companies Inc., The Travelers Insurance Company, The Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Travelers Commercial Insurance Company, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of America, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Fire & Casualty Company, United Fire Insurance Company, United Fire Insurance Group, Inc., United Fire Lloyds, United Fire and Indemnity Company, United Life Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Laila Saeda Urban, Verisk Analytics Inc., Vigilant Insurance Company, Nicole Wright-Meyer, Kenneth Dale Yoder, Zurich American Insurance Company and Zurich Insurance Group Ltd/FI.--[Edited 03/28/2019 by LAB to attach preliminary record from district court.] [19-1112] [Entered: 03/28/2019 08:16 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder, et al v. Acord Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELECTRIC INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Moseley
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Lawrence O'Donnell Esq.
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Evan B. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABC ORGANIZATION, an entity or group of entities, whose true names are unknown
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SENTRY INSURANCE, A MUTUAL COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHELTER MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation
Represented By: Bennett L. Cohen Esq.
Represented By: Philip Wayne Bledsoe
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERISK ANALYTICS INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, an Iowa corporation a/k/a Farmers Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Randall A. Hack
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN INDEMNITY FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a Guideone Insurance
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Ruebel Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP., a Florida corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Texas corporation
Represented By: Jessica G. Scott
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Moseley
Represented By: John Mark Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SECURA INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., a Wisconsi corporation
Represented By: Shaun McParland Baldwin
Represented By: Muliha A. Khan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a The Central Insurance Companies
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley Esq.
Represented By: Erin F. Frohardt
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Rowe W. Snider
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Knuckey
Represented By: John Pitblado
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Stuart Morse
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jessica L. Fuller
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Robert David Helfand
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: William A. Savino
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Evan B. Stephenson
Represented By: Gregory John Theo
Represented By: Stuart D. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, a Colordo non-profit corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Cynthia Mitchell
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Evan B. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Missouri corporation a/k/a Fireman's Fund Insurance Company of Missouri
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Rowe W. Snider
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Knuckey
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jessica L. Fuller
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACORD CORPORATION
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BUCKEYE STATE MUTUTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Buckeye Insurance Group
Represented By: Bradley L. Snyder
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Joshua D. McMahon
Represented By: Jon F. Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN RELIABLE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRANGE INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, a Washington corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Gregory John Theo
Represented By: Stuart D. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation b/b/a First American Property & Casualty Group
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Erin F. Frohardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLORADO FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., a Colorado corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACUITY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Thomas H. Falivene
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jamey W. Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jason K. Fagelman
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEMPER CORPORATE SERVICES, INC., an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Lisa M. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN MODERN SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MUNICH-AMERICAN HOLDING CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES INC., A Minnesota corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a United Fire Group
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley Esq.
Represented By: William A. Savino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QBE INSURANCE GROUP, LIMITED
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STILLWATER PROPERTY AND CAUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation a/k/a Fidelity National Property and Casulty Insurance Company d/b/a Stillwater Insurance Group
Represented By: Lawrence D. Stone Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Lisa M. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERNATION INSURNACE SOCIETY, INC., a Delware non-profit corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST AMERICAN FINANCIAL CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Erin F. Frohardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LM INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MILBANK INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation
Represented By: James P. Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Ohio corpoarion
Represented By: Jon Sands
Represented By: James P. Gaughan
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael S. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE INSURANCE GROUP, INC., an Iowa corporation d/b/a United Fire Group
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Rowe W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INSURANCE SERVICES OFFICE, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE, a California corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADDISON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Jamey W. Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Jon Sands
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Joshua D. McMahon
Represented By: Cynthia Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation
Represented By: Thomas W. Curvin
Represented By: Michael R. McCurdy
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHARMACISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Larry S. McClung
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCKINSEY & COMPANY, INC., a Delaware corporation a/k/a McKinsey & Company, Inc. washington D.C.
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Carter
Represented By: James Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN MODERN HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLIANZ OF AMERICA, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporationd/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance d/b/a Home-Owners Insurance
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, a Texas corporation
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Jessica G. Scott
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: John Mark Vaught
Represented By: Jeremy Andrew Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE, a Massachusetts corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jason K. Fagelman
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METLIFE AUTO & HOME INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Lisa M. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZURICH INSURANCE GROUP LTD/FI, a Switzerland corporation
Represented By: Richard Mancino
Represented By: Andrew T. Hanrahan
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Joseph G. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, a Maryland corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Thomas W. Curvin
Represented By: Michael R. McCurdy
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Chanda Marie Feldkamp
Represented By: William J. Kelly Esq. III
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF INSURANCE SERVICES, INC., a Delaware non-profit corporation
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Rowe W. Snider
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Knuckey
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jessica L. Fuller
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QBE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation a/k/a QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASSOCIATED INDEMNITY CORPORATION, a California corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Eric B. Liebman
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Sara Z. Moghadam
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: William Frederick Jones
Represented By: Keara M. Gordon
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CASUALTY ACTUARIAL SOCIETY, an Illinois not for profit corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Holly Stein Sollod
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAFAYETTE INSURANCE COMPANY, a/k/a United Lifre Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD CONNECTICUT, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE LLOYDS, a Texas corporation
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a New Hampshire corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEXAS GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Colorado corporation
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Nationwide Insurance
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHUBB SERVICES CORPORATION, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN MODERN INSURANCE GROUP, INC., an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, a Florida corporation
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley Esq.
Represented By: Erin F. Frohardt
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Rowe W. Snider
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Knuckey
Represented By: John Pitblado
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jessica L. Fuller
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Robert David Helfand
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Evan B. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, an entity whose true name is unknown d/b/a Untied Fire Group
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY FO AMERICA, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Jon Sands
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Joshua D. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPNAY, an Indiana corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL FARMERS UNION PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Julia C. Webb
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLIANZ LIFE INSURANCE CO. OF NORTH AMERICA, a Minnesota corporation
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE CHUBB CORPORATION, a New Jersey corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QBE HOLDINGS, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN FAMILY HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida corporation
Represented By: Joel A. Glover
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Erin F. Frohardt
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Knuckey
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Stuart Morse
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jessica L. Fuller
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Robert David Helfand
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Michael S. McCarthy
Represented By: Margaret Young Cass
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Stuart D. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METROPOLITAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Lisa M. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Illinoise corporation d/b/a Encompass Insurance
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FARMERS ALLIANCE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Kansas corporation
Represented By: Muliha A. Khan Esq.
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. DiSantis
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, A New York corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul G. Karlsgodt
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEMPER CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITRIN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinoise corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMPLOYERS MUTUTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a EMC Incurance Companies
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a Michigan corporation d/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: John D. Mereness
Represented By: Gregory Giometti
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Connecticut corporation
Represented By: Cynthia Mitchell
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED FIRE AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, a Texas corporation
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BUCKEYE STATE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Buckeye Insurance Group
Represented By: Bradley L. Snyder
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a Virginia corporation
Represented By: Jason K. Fagelman
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURERS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, a Colorado non-profit corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METLIFE AUTO & HOME INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., a Rhode Island corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHARMACISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STILLWATER PROPERTY AND CAUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation a/k/a Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a Stillwater Insurance Group
Represented By: Lawrence D. Stone Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Jon Sands
Represented By: James P. Gaughan
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Stephen Kirk Ingebretsen
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Jon Sands
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Joshua D. McMahon
Represented By: Marilyn Sue Chappell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons
Represented By: Stephen J. Jorden
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY, an Iowa corporation d/b/a EMC Insurance Companies
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QBE INSURANCE GROUP, LIMITED, a Sydney, Australia corporation
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERNATION INSURANCE SOCIETY, INC., a Delaware non-profit corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Jason K. Fagelman
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation d/b/a Auto-Owners Insurance d/b/a Home-Owners Insurance
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: John D. Mereness
Represented By: Gregory Giometti
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Lori McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENCOMPASS INDEMNITY COMPANY, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITRIN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Raul A. Cuervo
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SECURA INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Shaun McParland Baldwin
Represented By: Muliha A. Khan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAFAYETTE INSURANCE COMPANY, a/k/a United Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation, DBA The Central Insurance Companies
Represented By: Jason D. Krueger
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Represented By: Gregory John Theo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHUBB NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Indiana corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADDISON INSURANCE COMPANY, an Iowa corporation
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Jerad Adam West
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, an Illinois corporation d/b/a Encompass Insurance
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Chanda Marie Feldkamp
Represented By: William J. Kelly Esq. III
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Represented By: Shannon M. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Rhode Island corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ACORD CORPORATION, a Delaware non-profit corporation
Represented By: Mark Frederick Horning
Represented By: Charles Edmond Fuller
Represented By: Frank W. Visciano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHUBB SERVICES CORPORATION, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon Esq.
Represented By: Jacob C. Cohn
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: John M. Palmeri
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABC INSURANCE COMPANY, an entity whose true name is unknown d/b/a United Fire Group
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Christopher Ash
Represented By: Alan Epstein
Represented By: Lisa F. Mickley
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LM INSURANCE CORPORATION, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Robert Charles Blume
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney Esq.
Represented By: Mark W. Bayer
Represented By: Sheryl Anderson
Represented By: Michael Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TOMMY MEYER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH DALE YODER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANET KOCH
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IAN SIEMPLENSKI
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUEHAM KAY HOFFMAN
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY HARROW
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LOUISE CREAGER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARTHA LEMERT
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ESTATE OF DOROTHY WOOD HAMMER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DALE SNYDER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARILYN SNYDER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CATHERINE TAYLOR
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY RAY
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAILA SAEDA URBAN
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NICOLE WRIGHT-MEYER
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY ANN GELDREICH
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER RAY
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GARY LEMERT
Represented By: Josue David Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?