Magluta v. Daniels, et al
Defendant / Appellee: NIXON ROBERTS, Dentist, FCC Florence, in his individual and official capacities,, LISA MCDERMOTT, Assistant Health Services Administrator, FCC Florence, in her individual and official capacities, CHARLES DANIELS, Former Warden, FCC Florence, in his individual and official capacities, TERESA NEHLS, former Nurse Practitioner, FCC Florence, in her individual and official capacities,, JOHN DOE #1-15, GEORGE SANTINI, MD, Clinical director, FCC Florence, in his individual and official capacities and DAVID ALLRED, DO, former Clinical Director, FCC Florence, in his individual and official capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: SALVADOR MAGLUTA
Case Number: 19-1130
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 29, 2020 Magluta v. Daniels

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 [10649422] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on Appellant's letter, which states that Appellant needs additional time to file his opening brief. Upon consideration, the letter is construed as a motion for extension of time to file the opening brief, and, so construed, the motion is granted. The opening brief is now due on or before 07/17/2019. No further extensions will be granted on the Clerk's authority. Served on 05/17/2019. [19-1130] [Entered: 05/17/2019 08:25 AM]
May 16, 2019 [10649421] Miscellaneous correspondence received from appellant, which has been construed as a "motion for extension of time to file the opening brief." Response letter sent to appellant. [19-1130] [Entered: 05/17/2019 08:21 AM]
May 16, 2019 [10649217] Entry of appearance filed by Salvador Magluta. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y(The parties listed are parties to the appeal). Served on 05/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1130] [Entered: 05/16/2019 12:38 PM]
May 8, 2019 [10647116] Record on appeal filed. Four volumes containing pleadings. [19-1130] [Entered: 05/08/2019 11:08 AM]
May 7, 2019 [10646774] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and notice of appearance due on 06/17/2019 for Salvador Magluta. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 05/28/2019. [19-1130] [Entered: 05/07/2019 09:04 AM]
May 7, 2019 [10646772] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 05/07/2019. [19-1130] [Entered: 05/07/2019 09:02 AM]
April 30, 2019 [10645061] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring the issue raised in the 4/9/19 order order to show cause [ # 10639964-3 ] and appellant's 4/29/19 response [ # 10644753-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Appellant is reminded he must file a motion for leave to proceed 1915 or pay the fee by 5/9/2019. Served on 04/30/2019. [19-1130] [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:07 AM]
April 29, 2019 [10644753] Response to order filed by Salvador Magluta. Served on 04/25/2019. Manner of Service: US mail (court only). [19-1130] [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:24 PM]
April 22, 2019 [10643145] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. J. Bishop Grewell for George Santini, Doctor Nixon Roberts, Teresa Nehls, Ms. Lisa McDermott, Mr. Charles Daniels and David Allred. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/22/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1130] [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:13 PM]
April 22, 2019 [10643142] Entry of appearance submitted by J. Bishop Grewell for Appellees David Allred, Mr. Charles Daniels, Ms. Lisa McDermott, Teresa Nehls, Doctor Nixon Roberts and George Santini for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/22/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1130]--[Edited 04/22/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 4/22/2019] JBG [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:08 PM]
April 9, 2019 [10639964] Order filed by Clerk of the Court to show cause. On or before 04/30/2019 Salvador Magluta must show cause in writing why his right to appellate review has not been waived by his failure to timely object to the district court's 08/01/2017 and 03/01/2019 Recommendations. The briefing schedule is suspended pending further order of the court. Served on 04/09/2019. [19-1130] [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:54 PM]
April 9, 2019 [10639825] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/09/2019. Fee or 1915 forms due 05/09/2019 in district court for Salvador Magluta. Notice of appearance due on 04/23/2019 for David Allred, Charles Daniels, John Doe #1-15, Lisa McDermott, Teresa Nehls, Nixon Roberts and George Santini, and Notice of appearance due on 05/09/2019 for Salvador Magluta. [19-1130] [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Magluta v. Daniels, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NIXON ROBERTS, Dentist, FCC Florence, in his individual and official capacities,
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Represented By: J. Bishop Grewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA MCDERMOTT, Assistant Health Services Administrator, FCC Florence, in her individual and official capacities
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Represented By: J. Bishop Grewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES DANIELS, Former Warden, FCC Florence, in his individual and official capacities
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Represented By: J. Bishop Grewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERESA NEHLS, former Nurse Practitioner, FCC Florence, in her individual and official capacities,
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Represented By: J. Bishop Grewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE #1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGE SANTINI, MD, Clinical director, FCC Florence, in his individual and official capacities
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Represented By: J. Bishop Grewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID ALLRED, DO, former Clinical Director, FCC Florence, in his individual and official capacities
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Represented By: J. Bishop Grewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SALVADOR MAGLUTA
Represented By: Salvador Magluta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?