Tso v. Murray, et al
Defendant / Appellee: RICHARD F. SPIEGLE, Individually Psy. D., CYNTHIA COFFMAN, official capacity, COLORADO DIVISION OF MOTOR VEHICLES, JENNIFER ALELMANN, individually and in her official capacity, DAVID H. GOLDBERG, individually, MICHAEL DIXON, official capacity, SHERR PUTTMAN AKINS LAMB PC, a law firm, CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, ELIZABETH STARRS, individually, LARA DELKA, individually and in her official capacity, CHRISTIAN MADDY, individually and in his official capacity, DAVID P. BRODSKY, individually, TANYA AKINS, individually, JEANNIE RIDINGS, individually, DON MARES, official capacity, REBECCA MURRAY, individually, AKA Tso, DENVER DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, ROSS B.H. BUCHANAN, individually, RUSSELL M. MURRAY, individually, 2ND DISTRICT COURT, DENVER COUNTY, COLORADO, DENA MURRAY, individually, KILLIS RIDINGS & VANAU PC, a law firm, 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT, LAKE CO., ILLINOIS, BARRY PARDUS, official capacity, MONICA JACKSON, official and invidual capacity, JOANNE JENSEN, individually, CHARLES D. JOHNSON, individually and MONICA JACKSON, official and individual capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: GILBERT T. TSO, a natural person and an American
Case Number: 19-1208
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 [10661459] Attorney admission letter, second notice sent. Attorney admission response date set to 07/19/2019. [19-1021, 19-1208] [Entered: 07/09/2019 12:41 PM]
July 8, 2019 [10661232] Lack of jurisdiction. Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished;. Judges Hartz, Matheson and Phillips. [19-1208] See order for additional detailed information. [Entered: 07/08/2019 02:55 PM]
June 26, 2019 [10658434] Appellant memorandum brief filed by Mr. Gilbert T. Tso. Served on 06/26/2019. Manner of Service: hand delivery. [19-1208] [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:12 PM]
June 24, 2019 [10657691] Entry of appearance filed by Amy Jean Packer, Sherri L. Catalano and Mr. Robert Wolf for Denver Department of Human Services, Ms. Lara Delka, City and County of Denver, Don Mares, Monica Jackson, Christian Maddy, Jennifer Adelmann. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/24/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1208] [Entered: 06/24/2019 10:14 AM]
June 24, 2019 [10657683] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert A. Wolf; Amy J. Packer; and Sherri L. Catalano for Appellees City and County of Denver, Colorado Department of Human Services, Ms. Lara Delka, Monica Jackson, Don Mares, Christian Maddy and Jennifer Alelmann for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/24/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/24/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1208] RW [Entered: 06/24/2019 09:56 AM]
June 17, 2019 [10656361] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Tory D. Riter and Ms. Kelly L. Kafer for Tanya Akins, Sherr Puttman Akins Lamb PC, Jeannie Ridings, and Killis Ridings & Vanau PC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/17/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1208] [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:43 PM]
June 17, 2019 [10656355] Entry of appearance submitted by Tory D. Riter. and Kelly L. Kafer for Appellees Tanya Akins, Sherr Puttman Akins Lamb PC, Jeannie Ridings and Killis Ridings & Vanau PC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/17/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1208] --[Edited 06/17/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 6/17/2019.] TDR [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:22 PM]
June 14, 2019 [10655844] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 07/15/2019 for Rachel Bradley. [19-1208] [Entered: 06/14/2019 08:53 AM]
June 13, 2019 [10655722] Appellant's brief/COA received from Mr. Gilbert T. Tso but not filed. Original and 3 copies. Served on 06/12/2019. Manner of Service: hand delivery. [19-1208] [Entered: 06/13/2019 03:10 PM]
June 13, 2019 [10655656] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Rachel Bradleyand Valentine Uduebor for Richard F. Spiegle. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1208] [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:38 PM]
June 13, 2019 [10655634] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jonathan Neal Eddy and Mr. Eric Michael Ziporin for David P. Brodsky, Charles D. Johnson and 19th Judicial Circuit Court, Lake Co., Illinois. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email [19-1208] [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:54 AM]
June 13, 2019 [10655619] Entry of appearance submitted by James D. Murdock, Rachel Bradley, Valentine Uduebor for Appellee Richard F. Spiegle in 19-1208, 19-1021 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1208, 19-1021]--[Edited 06/13/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 6/13/2019.] VU [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:22 AM]
June 13, 2019 [10655599] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric M. Ziporin and Jonathan N. Eddy for Appellees Charles D. Johnson, David P. Brodsky and 19th Judicial Circuit Court, Lake Co., Illinois for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1208] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 06/13/2019 by NA] JNE [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:47 AM]
June 13, 2019 [10655528] Entry of appearance filed by Allison R Ailer for Michael Dixon, Mr. Barry Pardus, Colorado Department of Human Services, Ms. Elizabeth Starrs, Ross B.H. Buchanan, David H. Goldberg and 2nd District Court, Denver County, Colorado; Colorado Division of Motor Vehicles. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1208] [Entered: 06/13/2019 08:43 AM]
June 13, 2019 [10655525] Entry of appearance submitted by Allison R. Ailer for Appellees 2nd District Court, Denver County, Colorado, Ross B.H. Buchanan, Mr. Cynthia Coffman, Colorado Department of Human Services, Colorado Division of Motor Vehicles, Michael Dixon, Mr. Barry Pardus, Ms. Elizabeth Starrs and David H. Goldberg for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1208]--[Edited 06/13/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/13/2019] ARA [Entered: 06/13/2019 08:37 AM]
June 12, 2019 [10655433] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard Maxton Murray for Rebecca Murray, Russell M. Murray, Dena Murray and Joanne Jensen. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/12/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email [19-1208] [Entered: 06/12/2019 03:23 PM]
June 12, 2019 [10655406] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard M. Murray for Appellees Rebecca Murray, Russell M. Murray, Dena Murray and Joanne Jensen for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/12/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-1208] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 06/12/2019 by NA] RMM [Entered: 06/12/2019 02:29 PM]
June 12, 2019 [10655397] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court sua sponte following the opening of this appeal. We have identified two potential jurisdictional problems with the appeal. Within 14 days of the date of this order, appellant shall file a memorandum brief explaining in detail why this court has jurisdiction to consider the appeal of two interlocutory procedural orders now. Appellant's memorandum brief due 06/26/2019 for Gilbert T. Tso. Served on 06/12/2019. [19-1208] Please see order for additional information. [Entered: 06/12/2019 02:21 PM]
June 12, 2019 [10655308] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/12/2019. Notice of appearance due on 06/26/2019 for Rebecca Murray, et al. and Notice of appearance due on 07/12/2019 for Gilbert T. Tso. Fee or ifp forms due 07/12/2019 for Gilbert T. Tso. [19-1208] [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:49 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tso v. Murray, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD F. SPIEGLE, Individually Psy. D.
Represented By: Rachel Bradley
Represented By: James D. Murdock
Represented By: Valentine Uduebor
Represented By: James D. Murdock II
Represented By: Rachel Lisotta Bradley I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CYNTHIA COFFMAN, official capacity
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Jonathan Neal Eddy
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLORADO DIVISION OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER ALELMANN, individually and in her official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID H. GOLDBERG, individually
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL DIXON, official capacity
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHERR PUTTMAN AKINS LAMB PC, a law firm
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Represented By: Tory D. Riter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIZABETH STARRS, individually
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARA DELKA, individually and in her official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTIAN MADDY, individually and in his official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID P. BRODSKY, individually
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Jonathan Neal Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TANYA AKINS, individually
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Represented By: Tory D. Riter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEANNIE RIDINGS, individually
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Represented By: Tory D. Riter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DON MARES, official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REBECCA MURRAY, individually, AKA Tso
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENVER DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROSS B.H. BUCHANAN, individually
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUSSELL M. MURRAY, individually
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 2ND DISTRICT COURT, DENVER COUNTY, COLORADO
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENA MURRAY, individually
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KILLIS RIDINGS & VANAU PC, a law firm
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Represented By: Tory D. Riter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT, LAKE CO., ILLINOIS
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Jonathan Neal Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARRY PARDUS, official capacity
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONICA JACKSON, official and invidual capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOANNE JENSEN, individually
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES D. JOHNSON, individually
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Jonathan Neal Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONICA JACKSON, official and individual capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GILBERT T. TSO, a natural person and an American
Represented By: Gilbert T. Tso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?