Ajaj v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Defendant: D. PARRY, Officer, in his official capacity, KENNETH CRANK, Inmate Trust Fund Supervisor, in his official capacity, D. PARRY, in his individual capacity, BILL TRUE, Warden, in his official capacity, GEORGE KNOX, Religious Counselor, in his individual capacity, MICHAEL CASTLE, Chaplain, in his official capacity, CALVIN JOHNSON, Associate Warden, in his individual capacity, JOHN OLIVER, Warden, in his individual capacity, SAMANTHA MCCOIC, Medical Staff, in her individual capacity, JASON HENDERSON, Chaplain, in his official capacity, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ROGER HUDDLESTON, Nurse, in his official capacity, RONALD CAMACHO, Physician Assistant, in his individual capacity, TARA HALL, Associate Warden, in her individual capacity, K. MORROW, Medical Staff, in her official capacity, CHRIS LAMB, Associate Warden, in his official capacity and DAVID B. BERKEBILE, Warden, in his individual capacity
Defendant / Appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Plaintiff / Appellant: AHMAD AJAJ
Case Number: 19-1250
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 [10669549] Minute order filed by Clerk of the Court- granting appellant's motion to extend time to file appellant's brief and appendix. Appellant's brief and appendix now due on 10/09/2019 for Ahmad Ajaj. No further extensions will be granted under the clerk's auithority. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-1250]--[Edited 08/09/2019 by LG to correct date due] [Entered: 08/09/2019 08:01 AM]
August 8, 2019 [10669529] Motion filed by Appellant Ahmad Ajaj to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 10/09/2019. Served on: 08/08/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1250] DCJ [Entered: 08/08/2019 06:38 PM]
July 31, 2019 [10667245] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/31/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/09/2019 for Ahmad Ajaj. [text only entry - no document attached] [19-1250] [Entered: 07/31/2019 01:01 PM]
July 30, 2019 [10667057] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/06/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1250] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:00 PM]
July 30, 2019 [10667050] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Ahmad Ajaj. Transcript ordered: Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1250] NBG [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:53 PM]
July 30, 2019 [10667033] Docketing statement filed by Ahmad Ajaj. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1250] NBG [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:38 PM]
July 30, 2019 [10667032] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Nicole Brianne Godfrey, Ms. Danielle C. Jefferis, and Ms. Laura Rovner for Ahmad Ajaj. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1250] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:35 PM]
July 30, 2019 [10667029] Entry of appearance submitted by Nicole B. Godfrey, Danielle C. Jefferis, Laura Rovner for Appellant Ahmad Ajaj for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 07/30/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 7/30/2019.] [19-1250] NBG [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:32 PM]
July 17, 2019 [10663785] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Lowell Sturgill, Jr. for United States of America, Bill True, D. Parry, John Oliver, K. Morrow, Samantha McCoic, Mr. Chris Lamb, George Knox, Calvin Johnson, Roger Huddleston, Jason Henderson, Tara Hall, Kenneth Crank, Michael Castle, Mr. Ronald Camacho, Mr. David B. Berkebile and Federal Bureau of Prisons. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1250] [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:50 PM]
July 17, 2019 [10663760] Entry of appearance submitted by Lowell V. Sturgill Jr. for Not Parties Mr. David B. Berkebile, Mr. Ronald Camacho, Michael Castle, Kenneth Crank, Tara Hall, Jason Henderson, Roger Huddleston, Calvin Johnson, George Knox, Mr. Chris Lamb, Samantha McCoic, K. Morrow, John Oliver, D. Parry, D. Parry, Bill True, United States of America and Appellee Federal Bureau of Prisons for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1250]--[Edited 07/17/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 7/17/19] LS [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:09 PM]
July 16, 2019 [10663470] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/16/2019. Docketing statement due 07/30/2019 for Ahmad Ajaj. Transcript order form due 07/30/2019 for Ahmad Ajaj. Notice of appearance due on 07/30/2019 for Ahmad Ajaj and Federal Bureau of Prisons. [19-1250] [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ajaj v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. PARRY, Officer, in his official capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH CRANK, Inmate Trust Fund Supervisor, in his official capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. PARRY, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL TRUE, Warden, in his official capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE KNOX, Religious Counselor, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CASTLE, Chaplain, in his official capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALVIN JOHNSON, Associate Warden, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN OLIVER, Warden, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMANTHA MCCOIC, Medical Staff, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON HENDERSON, Chaplain, in his official capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER HUDDLESTON, Nurse, in his official capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD CAMACHO, Physician Assistant, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARA HALL, Associate Warden, in her individual capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. MORROW, Medical Staff, in her official capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS LAMB, Associate Warden, in his official capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID B. BERKEBILE, Warden, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Represented By: Kevin T. Traskos
Represented By: Susan Begesse Prose
Represented By: Lauren Marie Dickey
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Clay C. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AHMAD AJAJ
Represented By: Laura Rovner
Represented By: Danielle C. Jefferis
Represented By: Nicole Brianne Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?