Spells v. Stencil
Petitioner / Appellant: RONNIE SPELLS
Respondent / Appellee: M.A. STENCIL, USP, Warden
Case Number: 19-1285
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 [10684438] Order filed by Clerk of the Court to show cause. Response due on 10/24/2019 for Ronnie Spells. (See attached order for details). Served on 10/04/2019. [19-1285] [Entered: 10/04/2019 07:49 AM]
September 30, 2019 [10682939] Appellant brief filed by Ronnie Spells. Original and 4 copies. Served on 09/23/2019 by.. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. [19-1285] [Entered: 09/30/2019 12:01 PM]
September 30, 2019 [10682936] Appellant's motion filed by Ronnie Spells for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Served on 09/21/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1285] [Entered: 09/30/2019 11:57 AM]
September 13, 2019 [10678154] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 2. Comments: Vol. I - Pleadings; Vol. II - Sealed Pleading. [19-1285] [Entered: 09/13/2019 08:05 AM]
September 12, 2019 [10677789] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or ifp forms due by 10/22/2019 for Ronnie Spells. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 10/03/2019. [19-1285] [Entered: 09/12/2019 07:44 AM]
August 19, 2019 [10671819] Entry of appearance filed by Ronnie Spells. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/14/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-1285] [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:09 PM]
August 12, 2019 [10669934] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/12/2019. Fee or ifp forms due 09/11/2019 in district court for Ronnie Spells. Notice of appearance due on 09/11/2019 for Ronnie Spells. [19-1285] [Entered: 08/12/2019 11:16 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spells v. Stencil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: RONNIE SPELLS
Represented By: Ronnie Spells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: M.A. STENCIL, USP, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?