Peterson v. Nelnet Diversified Solutions
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANDREW PETERSON, on behalf of himself and all similarly situated persons
Defendant / Appellee: NELNET DIVERSIFIED SOLUTIONS, LLC
Case Number: 19-1348
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 [10694402] Minute order filed - This matter is before the court on the appellant's status report filed on 11/12/2019. This court continues the abatement of this appeal, directs the appellant to file another status report within 30 days of the date of this minute order, or sooner should events occur in the probate case that are relevant to the future proceedings in this appeal. Status report now due 12/13/2019 by Andrew Peterson. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1348] [Entered: 11/13/2019 08:57 AM]
November 12, 2019 [10694278] Status report filed by Andrew Peterson. Served on 11/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1348] AWH [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:26 PM]
October 31, 2019 [10691328] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: status report not filed. Status report now due 11/12/2019 by Andrew Peterson. [19-1348] [Entered: 10/31/2019 01:40 PM]
October 1, 2019 [10683463] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 10/01/2019. [19-1348] TEXT ONLY. [Entered: 10/01/2019 12:11 PM]
October 1, 2019 [10683433] Entry of appearance filed by Matthew C. Arentsen, Mr. Richard Benenson, Martine Tariot Wells and Julian R. Ellis Jr. for Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previously disclosed). Served on 10/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/01/2019 by SDS to add attorney Ellis to entry] [19-1348] [Entered: 10/01/2019 11:39 AM]
October 1, 2019 [10683419] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard B. Benenson, Martine T. Wells, Matthew C. Arentsen, Julian R. Ellis for Appellee Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/01/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1348] MTW [Entered: 10/01/2019 11:15 AM]
October 1, 2019 [10683371] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Michael Palitz for Andrew Peterson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y(The parties listed are or were counsel of record). Served on 10/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1348] [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:22 AM]
October 1, 2019 [10683355] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael J. Palitz, Esq. for Appellant Andrew PetersonAll appellants for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1348] --[Edited 10/01/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 10/1/2019.] MP [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:03 AM]
October 1, 2019 [10683241] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 10/08/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1348] [Entered: 10/01/2019 07:42 AM]
September 30, 2019 [10683204] Notice that a transcript is not necessary filed by Andrew Peterson. Transcript ordered: N/A. Served on: 09/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1348] --[Edited 10/01/2019 by AT - Transcripts were not requested.] BG [Entered: 09/30/2019 05:21 PM]
September 30, 2019 [10683030] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case in light of appellants' suggestion of death filing. Appellant must file a transcript order form no later than 10/1/2019, however. Status report regarding the status of appellant's estate due by 10/30/2019 for counsel for appellant. Served on 09/30/2019. [19-1348] [Entered: 09/30/2019 02:07 PM]
September 30, 2019 [10682826] Appellants' suggestion of death. Served on 09/30/2019 by email. --[Edited 09/30/2019 by GH to correct docket text] [19-1348] AWH [Entered: 09/30/2019 09:02 AM]
September 27, 2019 [10682694] Docketing statement filed by Andrew Peterson. Served on 09/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1348] AWH [Entered: 09/27/2019 03:49 PM]
September 26, 2019 [10681687] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Brian Gonzales for Andrew Peterson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (interested parties listed have been previously disclosed). Served on 09/25/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1348] [Entered: 09/26/2019 07:40 AM]
September 25, 2019 [10681619] Entry of appearance submitted by Brian David Gonzales for Appellant Andrew Peterson for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1348] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 09/26/2019 by NA] BG [Entered: 09/25/2019 04:19 PM]
September 25, 2019 [10681578] Entry of appearance filed by Eleanor Emmons Frisch and Mr. Adam W. Hansen for Andrew Peterson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previoulsy disclosed). Served on 09/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1348] [Entered: 09/25/2019 03:41 PM]
September 25, 2019 [10681553] Entry of appearance submitted by Adam W. Hansen, Eleanor E. Frisch for Appellant Andrew PetersonSee list of opt-in plaintiffs/appellants listed in document. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 09/26/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1348] AWH [Entered: 09/25/2019 03:25 PM]
September 17, 2019 [10678990] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/17/2019. Docketing statement and transcript order form due 10/01/2019 for Andrew Peterson. Notice of appearance due on 10/01/2019 for Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC and Andrew Peterson. [19-1348] [Entered: 09/17/2019 10:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Nelnet Diversified Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDREW PETERSON, on behalf of himself and all similarly situated persons
Represented By: Gregg Shavitz
Represented By: Alan L. Quiles
Represented By: Jonathan V. Rehm
Represented By: Brian Gonzales
Represented By: Brody J. Ockander
Represented By: Dustin Thomas Lujan
Represented By: Michael Palitz
Represented By: Logan Pardell
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Represented By: Eleanor Emmons Frisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NELNET DIVERSIFIED SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Martine Tariot Wells
Represented By: Charles F. Kaplan
Represented By: Richard Benenson
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Santucci
Represented By: Anna-Liisa Mullis
Represented By: Daniel F. Kaplan
Represented By: Julian R. Ellis Jr.
Represented By: Matthew C. Arentsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?