Tso v. Murray, et al
Defendant / Appellee: KILLIS RIDINGS & VANAU PC, RICHARD F. SPIEGLE, Individually Psy. D., CYNTHIA COFFMAN, official capacity, JENNIFER ALELMANN, individually and in her official capacity, TANYA AKINS, RUSSELL M. MURRAY, DENA MURRAY, REBECCA MURRAY, MICHAEL DIXON, official capacity, JOANNE JENSEN, CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, MONICA JACKSON, official capacity, ELIZABETH STARRS, individually, LARA DELKA, individually and in her official capacity, CHRISTIAN MADDY, individually and in his official capacity, DAVID P. BRODSKY, individually, COLORADO DIVISION OF MOTOR VEHICLES, DON MARES, official capacity, DAVID H. GOLDBERG, individually, PHIL WEISER, official capacity, DENVER DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, SHERR PUTTMAN AKINS LAMB PC, COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, ROSS B.H. BUCHANAN, individually, 2ND DISTRICT COURT, DENVER COUNTY, COLORADO, JEANNIE RIDINGS, 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT, LAKE CO., ILLINOIS, BARRY PARDUS, official capacity and CHARLES D. JOHNSON, individually
Plaintiff / Appellant: GILBERT T. TSO
Case Number: 19-1352
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 [10692937] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting attorney Rachel Bradley's motion to withdraw as attorney for appellee Richard Spiegle. Attorneys Kevin S. Taylor, James D. Murdock, and Valentine Uduebor remain as counsel of record for appellee Richard Spiegle. Served on 11/06/2019. [19-1021, 19-1352] [Entered: 11/06/2019 04:34 PM]
November 6, 2019 [10692924] Amended Motion filed by Appellee Richard F. Spiegle in 19-1021, 19-1208, 19-1352 to Withdraw Rachel Bradley as Counsel of Record. Served on: 11/06/2019. Manner of service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 11/06/2019 by LAB to note motion is amended.] [19-1021, 19-1208, 19-1352] RLB [Entered: 11/06/2019 03:59 PM]
November 6, 2019 This entry has been removed from the docket; see amended motion filed 11/6/2019. [LAB] [10692911] Motion filed by Appellee Richard F. Spiegle in 19-1021, 19-1352, 19-1208 for attorney Rachel L. Bradley to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 11/06/2019. Manner of service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1021, 19-1352, 19-1208] RLB [Entered: 11/06/2019 03:13 PM]
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order [10692751] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach denying Appellant's motion to reconsider motion to file electronically filed by Appellant Mr. Gilbert T. Tso. Served on 11/06/2019. [19-1352, 19-1021] Please see order for additional detailed information. [Entered: 11/06/2019 09:21 AM]
November 5, 2019 [10692493] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Gilbert T. Tso in 19-1352 & 19-1021 to reconsider [ # 10690251-2 ] this court's order denying motion for permission file electronically. Served on 11/04/2019. Manner of Service: hand delivery. [19-1352, 19-1021] [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:33 AM]
October 29, 2019 [10690596] Attorney admission letter, second notice sent. Attorney admission response date set to 11/08/2019. [19-1352] [Entered: 10/29/2019 09:08 AM]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order [10690251] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach denying Appellant's motion for permission to file electronically in these consolidated appeals filed by Appellant Mr. Gilbert T. Tso in 19-1352 and 19-1021. Served on 10/28/2019. [19-1352, 19-1021] The opening brief in these consolidated appeals remains due 12/2/2019. [Entered: 10/28/2019 11:47 AM]
October 25, 2019 [10689965] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Gilbert T. Tso for permission to file electronically. Served on 10/25/2019. Manner of Service: hand delivery. [19-1352] [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:27 PM]
October 22, 2019 [10688830] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol 3 - pleadings (Vols 1-2 pleadings and Sup Vol 1 found in 19-1021). Record on appeal filed 10/22/2019. Appellant's brief due on 12/02/2019 for Gilbert T. Tso. [19-1352, 19-1021] [Entered: 10/22/2019 06:45 AM]
October 21, 2019 [10688589] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Upon consideration of the court's 9/20/19 order. The record on appeal has been prepared in 19-1021. The clerk shall prepare the record in 19-1352. Appellant's consolidated opening brief shall be filed and served within 40 days after the record on appeal being filed in 19-1352 (please see order for further details). Record on appeal due circuit court 11/12/2019. Served on 10/21/2019. [19-1021, 19-1352] [Entered: 10/21/2019 12:20 PM]
October 18, 2019 [10688394] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 10/18/2019. [19-1352] [Entered: 10/18/2019 04:32 PM]
September 30, 2019 [10683159] Entry of appearance filed by Allison R Ailer for Michael Dixon, Mr. Barry Pardus, Colorado Department of Human Services, Ms. Elizabeth Starrs, Ross B.H. Buchanan, David H. Goldberg, Michael Dixon, 2nd District Court, Denver County, Colorado, Colorado Division of Motor Vehicles and Phil Weiser. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/30/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-1352] [Entered: 09/30/2019 04:09 PM]
September 30, 2019 [10683106] Entry of appearance submitted by Allison R. Ailer for Appellees 2nd District Court, Denver County, Colorado, Ross B.H. Buchanan, Colorado Department of Human Services, Colorado Division of Motor Vehicles, David H. Goldberg, Michael Dixon, Mr. Barry Pardus, Ms. Elizabeth Starrs and Phil Weiser for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/30/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 09/30/2019 by GH to remove PDF as pleading filed] [19-1352] ARA [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:38 PM]
September 30, 2019 [10683070] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Kelly L. Kafer and Mr. Tory D. Riter for Tanya Akins and Sherr Puttman Akins Lamb PC., Jeannie Ridings and Kililis Ridings & Vonan P.C. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/30/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1352] [Entered: 09/30/2019 02:52 PM]
September 30, 2019 [10683004] Entry of appearance submitted by Kelly L. Kafer, Esq. and Tory D. Riter, Esq. for Appellees Killis Ridings & Vanau PC, Tanya Akins, Sherr Puttman Akins Lamb PC and Jeannie Ridings for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/30/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1352]--[Edited 09/30/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 9/30/2019] KLK [Entered: 09/30/2019 01:33 PM]
September 27, 2019 [10682347] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric Michael Ziporin for David P. Brodsky and Mr. Jonathan Neal Eddy for David P. Brodsky, Charles D. Johnson, and 19th Judicial Circuit Court, Lake Co., Illinois. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/27/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-1352] [Entered: 09/27/2019 09:48 AM]
September 27, 2019 [10682327] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric M. Ziporin and Jonathan N. Eddy for Appellees Charles D. Johnson, David P. Brodsky and 19th Judicial Circuit Court, Lake Co., Illinois for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1352] --[Edited 09/27/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 9/27/2019.] EMZ [Entered: 09/27/2019 09:24 AM]
September 27, 2019 [10682297] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 10/28/2019 for Rachel Lisotta Bradley I. [19-1352] [Entered: 09/27/2019 08:25 AM]
September 26, 2019 [10682209] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard Maxton Murray for Rebecca Murray, Russell M. Murray, Dena Murray and Joanne Jensen. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/26/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email [19-1352] [Entered: 09/26/2019 03:35 PM]
September 26, 2019 [10682196] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard M. Murray for Appellees Dena Murray, Rebecca Murray, Russell M. Murray and Joanne Jensen for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/26/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-1352] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 09/26/2019 by NA] RMM [Entered: 09/26/2019 03:21 PM]
September 26, 2019 [10682157] Entry of appearance filed by Amy Jean Packer, Sherri L. Catalano and Mr. Robert Wolf for Denver Department of Human Services, Ms. Lara Delka, City and County of Denver, Don Mares, Monica Jackson, Christian Maddy and Jennifer Alelmann in 19-1021 & 19-1352. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/26/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1352, 19-1021] [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:42 PM]
September 26, 2019 [10682134] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert A. Wolf; Amy J. Packer; Sherri L. Catalano for Appellees City and County of Denver, Denver Department of Human Services, Monica Jackson, Ms. Lara Delka, Christian Maddy, Jennifer Alelmann and Don Mares in 19-1352, 19-1021 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1352, 19-1021]--[Edited 09/26/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 9/26/2019] RW [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:21 PM]
September 25, 2019 [10681496] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Rachel Lisotta Bradley and Mr. James D. Murdock, II for Richard F. Spiegle. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/25/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1352] [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:41 PM]
September 25, 2019 [10681472] Entry of appearance submitted by Rachel L. Bradley, James D. Murdock for Appellee Richard F. Spiegle for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 09/25/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed][19-1352] RLB [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:28 PM]
September 20, 2019 [10680122] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter comes on for consideration of the appellant's Motion for Order to Supplement/Append to the Notice of Appeal; Leave to Supplement Record on Appeal and Extension of the Deadline to File Appellant's Opening Brief filed in appeal no. 19-1021. Upon consideration thereof, the motion is denied as moot. Appeals 19-1021 and 19-1352 are consolidated for purposes of briefing and submission. The due date of September 23, 2019 for the opening brief in no. 19-1021 is vacated. The court will enter an order at a later date setting the due date for the consolidated opening brief. The appellant is reminded that he must pay the filing fees or file a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis in the district court for appeal no. 19-1352 by October 21, 2019. Served on 09/20/2019. [19-1021, 19-1352] [Entered: 09/20/2019 10:03 AM]
September 19, 2019 [10679984] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/19/2019 Fee and entry of appearance are due by 10/21/2019 for Gilbert T. Tso. Notice of appearance due on 10/03/2019 for 19th Judicial Circuit Court, Lake Co., Illinois, 2nd District Court, Denver County, Colorado, Tanya Akins, Jennifer Alelmann, David P. Brodsky, Ross B.H. Buchanan, City and County of Denver, Colorado Division of Motor Vehicles, Lara Delka, Michael Dixon, David H. Goldberg, Monica Jackson, Joanne Jensen, Charles D. Johnson, Killis Ridings & Vanau PC, Christian Maddy, Don Mares, Dena Murray, Rebecca Murray, Russell M. Murray, Barry Pardus, Jeannie Ridings, Sherr Puttman Akins Lamb PC, Richard F. Spiegle, Elizabeth Starrs and Phil Weiser. [19-1352] [Entered: 09/19/2019 03:42 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tso v. Murray, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KILLIS RIDINGS & VANAU PC
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD F. SPIEGLE, Individually Psy. D.
Represented By: James D. Murdock II
Represented By: Rachel Lisotta Bradley I
Represented By: Valentine Uduebor
Represented By: Kevin Scott Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CYNTHIA COFFMAN, official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER ALELMANN, individually and in her official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TANYA AKINS
Represented By: Tory D. Riter
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUSSELL M. MURRAY
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENA MURRAY
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REBECCA MURRAY
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL DIXON, official capacity
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOANNE JENSEN
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONICA JACKSON, official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIZABETH STARRS, individually
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARA DELKA, individually and in her official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTIAN MADDY, individually and in his official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID P. BRODSKY, individually
Represented By: Jonathan Neal Eddy
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLORADO DIVISION OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DON MARES, official capacity
Represented By: Robert Wolf
Represented By: Sherri L. Catalano
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID H. GOLDBERG, individually
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHIL WEISER, official capacity
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENVER DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Amy Jean Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHERR PUTTMAN AKINS LAMB PC
Represented By: Tory D. Riter
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROSS B.H. BUCHANAN, individually
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 2ND DISTRICT COURT, DENVER COUNTY, COLORADO
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEANNIE RIDINGS
Represented By: Kelly L. Kafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT, LAKE CO., ILLINOIS
Represented By: Jonathan Neal Eddy
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARRY PARDUS, official capacity
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES D. JOHNSON, individually
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Jonathan Neal Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GILBERT T. TSO
Represented By: Gilbert T. Tso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?