MTGLQ Investors v. Wellington, et al
Defendant: ALTURA VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION and THE MONICA L. WELLINGTON DECLARATION OF TRUST, Dated December 28, 2007
Counter Defendant: ELIZABETH V. FRIEDENSTEIN, J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, PROFOLIO HOME MORTGAGE CORPORATION and WEINSTEIN & RILEY, P.S.
Not Yet Classified: MTGLQ INVESTORS, LP and MONICA WELLINGTON
Case Number: 19-2162
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 [10697710] Lack of jurisdiction; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished;. Judges Lucero, Phillips and Carson. [19-2162] Please see order for additional detailed information. [Entered: 11/25/2019 10:28 AM]
November 18, 2019 [10697249] Appellant second supplemental memorandum brief filed by Monica Wellington. Original. Served on 11/18/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-2162] [Entered: 11/22/2019 08:01 AM]
November 14, 2019 [10697244] Appellant supplemental memorandum brief filed by Monica Wellington. Original. Served on 11/14/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-2162] [Entered: 11/22/2019 07:58 AM]
November 5, 2019 [10692697] Response filed by MTGLQ Investors to Response to Order filed October 22, 2019 Regarding Appellate Jurisdiction. Served on 11/05/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-2162] EVF [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:02 PM]
October 31, 2019 [10691277] Entry of appearance filed by Monica Wellington. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/28/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-2162] [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:49 AM]
October 24, 2019 [10689812] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Elizabeth V. Friedenstein for Weinstein & Riley, P.S., Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, MTGLQ Investors and Elizabeth V. Friedenstein. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previously disclosed). Served on 10/24/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-2162] [Entered: 10/24/2019 04:13 PM]
October 24, 2019 [10689807] Entry of appearance submitted by Elizabeth V. Friedenstein for Appellees Elizabeth V. Friedenstein, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Weinstein & Riley, P.S. and MTGLQ InvestorsElizabeth V. Friedenstein for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/24/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. --[Edited 10/24/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-2162] EVF [Entered: 10/24/2019 04:06 PM]
October 24, 2019 This entry has been removed from the docket - counsel was contacted to re-file with corrected parties and certificate of service. [LAB] [10689781] Entry of appearance submitted by Elizabeth V. Friedenstein for Appellee Elizabeth V. Friedenstein for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/24/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-2162] EVF [Entered: 10/24/2019 03:05 PM]
October 22, 2019 [10688894] Order filed by Clerk of the Court response to Appellant's memo brief due on 11/05/2019 for MTGLQ Investors. Served on 10/22/2019. [19-2162] [Entered: 10/22/2019 09:00 AM]
October 21, 2019 [10688666] Appellant memorandum brief filed by Monica Wellington. Original and. Served on 10/18/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-2162] [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:08 PM]
October 21, 2019 [10688657] Notice of change of address filed by Monica Wellington. [19-2162] [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:05 PM]
October 7, 2019 [10684934] Jurisdiction challenged. Appellant's memorandum brief addressing the issue set forth in the attached order due10/28/2019 for Monica Wellington. See order for details and additional information. Served on 10/07/2019. [19-2162] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:40 AM]
October 3, 2019 [10684112] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/02/2019. Notice of appearance due on 10/17/2019 for Elizabeth V. Friedenstein, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., MTGLQ Investors, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC and Weinstein & Riley, P.S., and Notice of appearance due on 11/04/2019 for Monica Wellington. [19-2162] [Entered: 10/03/2019 09:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTGLQ Investors v. Wellington, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: ELIZABETH V. FRIEDENSTEIN
Represented By: Elizabeth V. Friedenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Gregory Sudbury
Represented By: Edward DeV. Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth V. Friedenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: PROFOLIO HOME MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: WEINSTEIN & RILEY, P.S.
Represented By: Elizabeth V. Friedenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTURA VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MONICA L. WELLINGTON DECLARATION OF TRUST, Dated December 28, 2007
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MTGLQ INVESTORS, LP
Represented By: Elizabeth V. Friedenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MONICA WELLINGTON
Represented By: Monica Wellington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?