Allen, Jr., et al v. Environmental Restoration
Defendant: KINROSS GOLD USA, INC., SUNNYSIDE GOLD CORPORATION, KINROSS GOLD CORP., UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, GOLD KING MINES CORPORATION and WESTON SOLUTIONS, INC.
Respondent: LAURENCE BEKISE
Plaintiff / Appellee: MARLENE KING, RAYMOND PETTIGREW, ANNIE OLDMAN, AARON BARBER, THE ESTATE OF LEON JONES, DAISY BARBER, CHARLES PHILLIPS, JAMES MASON, STEVE BENALLY, ROGER L. SIMPSON, SARAH FRANK, NORMAN JIM, SR., DON CURLEY, JR., CECIL DUNCAN, LOREN GARNANEZ, IVAN TYLER, JIMMY NAKAI, RUTH NEZ, HARRY BENALLY, SHANDIE PIOCHE, DANIEL JIM, RUBY B. SILAS, MICHAEL N. LITTLE, RACHEL DEE, TONITA NELSON, JONAH JIM, LORRAINE BLACK, LARRY B. SAM, ALLEN E. ETSITTY, HURON ETSITTY, FANNIE MARIE JIM, SHERRELL G. MESA, ROSELYN TOLEDO, BETTY JONES NAKAI, LENORA WILLIAMS, TOMMY DRAPER, MARLIYN MUSTACHE, EMERSON HATATHLEY, NELSON ROCKWELL, HARRY PESHLAKAI, SR., TAYLOR BLACK, VIRGINA JIM, BESSIE S. PELT, KYLE JIM, ERNEST BENALLY, ALICE BEGAY, LYNALLA BENN, WILSON PHILLIPS, FRANCINE KIEFERT, MICHELLE A. LEE, MARY ENOAH, ETTA BEGAYE, WILBERT COWBOY, JR., HARRY LANE, JEAN JONES, ANNA VIGIL, DUANE ASPAAS, CHARLES D. PHILLIPS, LARENA BENN, CHRISTINA SILENTMAN, ANNIE HENRY, LEONTYNE ATCITTY, SUSIE SCOTT, WESLEY JONES, LULA ATCITTY, VERNIDA BISSONETTE, CORNELIA WESTON, IRVIN YAZZIE, MARY JAY, JENATHAN BEGAYE, MARGARET HARRISON, TOM HORSE, HERMAN JOHN, SAMMY CHARLEY, SUSIE DODGE, ROSELYN WATCHMAN, FREDDIE HOBSON, MARY TSO, BESSIE DUNCAN, IRITA JAMES, MAE BEGAY, SHAWNA HAMM, WILMA CHARLEY, HUBERT HARWOOD, MARY ANN MANYGOAT, ROBERT BEKISE, ROGER BARBER, KEE DAN, ANNIE BLUEEYES, VERNON PHILLIPS, BEVERLY MAXWELL, JERRY TODACHENNE, LUCY RENTZ, ALBERT BYLILLY, DARREN KEE, JUANITA KEE, WANDA BENALLY, MARIE LEE, JACKSON BUNNY, JR., ROSE ANN TANNER, SUSAN BENALLY, EMMA MITCHELL, EMERSON LEE, HARRISON JOHNSON, FLORENCE B. KING, THOMAS PETE, JEANNIE BENALLY, LITA JOE, BESSIE SHORTHAIR, FRANK JOHN, JR., ERIC BEGAY, SUSIE YAZZIE, RUBY NELSON, MELVIN CURLEY, PRISCILLA BIGMAN, ROSINA T. MERRITT, LUCY DICK, PERFINA ROCKWELL, JAMES GRANT, JAY YAZZIE, ROY BEGAY, MARTHA CURTIS, RAYMOND JONES, SCOTT BRADY, BETTY BEGAY, ROWENA LITTLEHAT, JACQUELINE L. BEGAY, GERALD MARYBOY, RONNIE ROSS, TEDDY SMALLCANYON, PAUL BARBER, CELESTE SILAS, THERON JONES, JOHNSON WASHBURN, SR., ELSIE JOE, WALLACE MCGILBERT, GENEVA JIM, RENITA T. JONES, BERNITA BEGAY, IRENE LIVINGSTON, SYLVIA MITCHELL, DOROTHY PHILLIPS, JESSIE JOHNSON, ROBERT HAYES, CORLIVIA BEGAY, GEORGE L. SISCO, JR., PHYLLIS VALDEZ, JULIE HARRISON, MABLE BLACK, LENA WILLIE, WALLACE HAYES, RAYMOND G. WILLIE, LULA SANDOVAL, LORENZO YAZZIE, THOMAS T. TYLER, CRYSTAL GREY, JUDY BEGAY, DINA BENALLY, JONAH BEGAY, JAMES SIMPSON, TOM BLACKHORSE, FLORA TODECHINE, ANDREW BREWSTER, DELLA WESTON, ESTHER A. YANITO, ELIZABETH BEGAY, BESSIE TESSWOOD, CALVIN YAZZIE, VIRGINIA BEGAY, ELLA SILAS, DAISY HOUSER, HAROLD WILLIAMS, LUCY B. MITCHELL, CHERYL ARMENTA, MARLENE DOBEY, GARRY JAY, SARAH POLICE, JOE C. ALLEN, HERMAN ENOAH, HELEN HOWARD, JOANNE HOLLIDAY, DORIS COOLIDGE, DOROTHY TODECHINE, ALBERT H. LEE, LORETTA HATATHLEY, PERRY HAYES, SHIRLEY BIA, ROGER SHAGGY, CECILIA WALLACE, ARLENE BEGAY, THE ESTATE OF ROSE MERRITT, MARY J. PHILLIPS, HERBERT TODACHENNIE, NINA BENALLY, WILFORD ATSON, ANITA HAYES, ELTON DODGE, SARAH A. TONY BENALLY, HELEN TOM, CHARLENE BEGAY, WADE SHORTHAIR, ROSE BENALLY, EVELYN M. LEE, MAX KELLYWOOD, SR., ANNE JOHNSON 8, DARRELL CLAH, VERNESE ESPLAIN, SHALINA GRANDSON, DARLENE BRONSTON, JOHNSON WASHBURN, JR., RENA FASTHORSE, GENE FRED, DAVIDSON DEVORE, REYVETTE GREY, CAROL ANAGAL, ANDY BEGAY, ELSIE HENRY, BOBBY SANDOVAL, HILDA BALDWIN, VINCENT TODECHENE, EDDIE JAY, EARL D. YAZZIE, ROSELYN LEE, LEONARD LEE, SR., LAHOMA CLY, JIMMIE COOLIDGE, ALFRED CURLEY, DAVID BEN, LOUISE HENDERSON, HERMAN HUNT, IRENE TODACHENNIE, JANICE TERRI BROWN, JOHN LANSING, CHARLEY JIM, TONI CLAW, ANTHONY NABAHE, CARMELITA LOWE, ESTHER REDDOOR, RON MILLER, PAULINE D. NELSON, ADA LANSING, TERRI LAMEMAN-AUSTIN, DARRELL JIM, SARAH SLOWMAN, RAYMOND OLDMAN, JANICE FRANK, RAYMOND G. SELLS, HELEN BEGAY, BERTHA A. ETSITTY, BYRON NELSON, RECHELLEDA BENALLIE, GLORIA LANE, MARY CLARK, STELLA CLY, ALICE D. YAZZIE, MARYLITA BEGAY, CAROLINE BEGAY, LENA J. JONES, ROGER SHERMAN, HARRY S. NAKAI, WAYNE BEGAY, HERBERT WILLIE, HARRISON CATTLEMAN, JR., PHILLIP RENTZ, DORA TODACHEENE, MAX BENALLY, ESTHER MARK, MARIE YAZZIE, THURSTON EDDIE, CLARENCE D. WESTON, ELLA REDHOUSE, BERNADINE TODECHENE, ROBIN HAYES, SHEILA JIM, PEARLENE BENALLY, CYNTHIA MADISON, ERIC SMALLCANYON, MAE MARTIN, THE ESTATE OF WAYNE SALTWATER, SANDRA BEGAY, LAURA M. MITCHELL, MARILYN SILAS, LEWIS TODACHENNE, RICHARD BEGAYE, BENJAMIN CLARK, CHARLIE N, TODACHENNIE, DAVID SHORTHAIR, JOE C. ALLEN, JR., JACQUELINE S. BEGAY, CHARLIE N. TODACHEENIE, JERRY TODACHEENE, MARLENA KING, ANNE JOHNSON, CORLIVIA BEGAYE, LEWIS TODACHEENE and TIMOTHY BEN
Defendant / Appellant: ENVIRONMENTAL RESTORATION, LLC
Case Number: 19-2197
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 [10705400] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-2197] [Entered: 12/26/2019 03:09 PM]
December 12, 2019 [10702068] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/12/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/21/2020 for Environmental Restoration, LLC. [19-2197] [Entered: 12/12/2019 12:28 PM]
December 12, 2019 [10701989] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Rory S Miller for Environmental Restoration, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2197] [Entered: 12/12/2019 11:05 AM]
December 12, 2019 [10701878] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/19/2019 for Mitchell R. Elfers, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-2197] [Entered: 12/12/2019 09:58 AM]
December 12, 2019 [10701868] Notice received from Environmental Restoration, LLC that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-2197] RSM [Entered: 12/12/2019 09:48 AM]
December 12, 2019 [10701866] Entry of appearance submitted by Rory S. Miller for Appellant Environmental Restoration, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 12/12/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 12/12/19] [19-2197] RSM [Entered: 12/12/2019 09:47 AM]
December 12, 2019 [10701865] Docketing statement filed by Environmental Restoration, LLC. Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2197] RSM [Entered: 12/12/2019 09:46 AM]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order [10701149] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach denying motion to intervene. Served on 12/10/2019. [19-2197] [Entered: 12/10/2019 10:40 AM]
December 5, 2019 [10700407] Reply submitted by Sunnyside Gold Corporation regarding motion for leave to file an intervenor brief. Served on: 12/05/2019 Manner of service: email. [19-2197] NGW [Entered: 12/05/2019 04:29 PM]
December 5, 2019 [10700160] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Appellant's preliminary documents due and not filed with the court. Appellant's notice of appearance, docketing statement, and transcript order form are now due 12/16/2019 for Environmental Restoration, LLC. [19-2197] [Entered: 12/05/2019 09:35 AM]
December 3, 2019 [10699391] Entry of appearance filed by Neil G. Westesen for Sunnyside Gold Corporation. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2197] [Entered: 12/03/2019 10:32 AM]
December 3, 2019 [10699347] Entry of appearance submitted by Neil G. Westesen for Sunnyside Gold Corporation for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/02/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 12/03/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 12/3/2019.] [19-2197] NGW [Entered: 12/03/2019 08:53 AM]
December 2, 2019 [10699279] Response filed by Joe C. Allen, Carol Anagal, Cheryl Armenta, Duane Aspaas, Leontyne Atcitty, Lula Atcitty, Wilford Atson, Hilda Baldwin, Aaron Barber, Daisy Barber, Paul Barber, Roger Barber, Ms. Alice Begay, Andy Begay, Arlene Begay, Bernita Begay, Betty Begay, Caroline Begay, Charlene Begay, Corlivia Begay, Elizabeth Begay, Eric Begay, Helen Begay, Jacqueline L. Begay, Jonah Begay, Judy Begay, Mae Begay, Marylita Begay, Roy Begay, Sandra Begay, Virginia Begay, Wayne Begay, Etta Begaye, Jenathan Begaye, Mr. Richard Begaye, Laurence Bekise, Robert Bekise, David Ben, Rechelleda Benallie, Dina Benally, Ernest Benally, Harry Benally, Jeannie Benally, Max Benally, Nina Benally, Pearlene Benally, Ms. Rose Benally, Steve Benally, Susan Benally, Ms. Wanda Benally, Larena Benn, Lynalla Benn, Shirley Bia, Priscilla Bigman, Vernida Bissonette, Lorraine Black, Mable Black, Taylor Black, Tom Blackhorse, Annie BlueEyes, Scott Brady, Andrew Brewster, Darlene Bronston, Janice Terri Brown, Jackson Bunny, Jr., Albert Bylilly, Harrison Cattleman, Jr., Sammy Charley, Wilma Charley, Darrell Clah, Benjamin Clark, Mary Clark, Toni Claw, Lahoma Cly, Stella Cly, Doris Coolidge, Jimmie Coolidge, Wilbert Cowboy, Jr., Alfred Curley, Don Curley, Jr., Melvin Curley, Martha Curtis, Kee Dan, Rachel Dee, Davidson Devore, Lucy Dick, Marlene Dobey, Elton Dodge, Susie Dodge, Tommy Draper, Bessie Duncan, Cecil Duncan, Thurston Eddie, Herman Enoah, Mary Enoah, Vernese Esplain, Allen E. Etsitty, Bertha A. Etsitty, Huron Etsitty, Rena Fasthorse, Janice Frank, Sarah Frank, Gene Fred, Loren Garnanez, Shalina Grandson, Mr. James Grant, Crystal Grey, Reyvette Grey, Shawna Hamm, Julie Harrison, Margaret Harrison, Hubert Harwood, Emerson Hatathley, Loretta Hatathley, Anita Hayes, Perry Hayes, Robert Hayes, Robin Hayes, Wallace Hayes, Louise Henderson, Annie Henry, Elsie Henry, Freddie Hobson, Joanne Holliday, Tom Horse, Daisy Houser, Helen Howard, Herman Hunt, Irita James, Eddie Jay, Garry Jay, Mary Jay, Charley Jim, Darrell Jim, Fannie Marie Jim, Geneva Jim, Jonah Jim, Kyle Jim, Norman Jim, Sr., Sheila Jim, Virgina Jim, Elsie Joe, Lita Joe, Frank John, Jr., Herman John, Anne Johnson 8, Harrison Johnson, Jessie Johnson, Ms. Jean Jones, Lena J. Jones, Mr. Raymond Jones, Renita T. Jones, Theron Jones, Wesley Jones, Darren Kee, Max Kellywood, Sr., Francine Kiefert, Florence B. King, Marlene King, Terri Lameman-Austin, Gloria Lane, Harry Lane, Ada Lansing, John Lansing, Albert H. Lee, Emerson Lee, Evelyn M. Lee, Leonard Lee, Sr., Marie Lee, Michelle A. Lee, Roselyn Lee, Michael N. Little, Rowena Littlehat, Irene Livingston, Carmelita Lowe, Cynthia Madison, Mary Ann Manygoat, Esther Mark, Mae Martin, Gerald Maryboy, James Mason, Ms. Beverly Maxwell, Wallace McGilbert, Rosina T. Merritt, Sherrell G. Mesa, Ron Miller, Emma Mitchell, Laura M. Mitchell, Lucy B. Mitchell, Sylvia Mitchell, Marliyn Mustache, Anthony Nabahe, Betty Jones Nakai, Harry S. Nakai, Jimmy Nakai, Byron Nelson, Pauline D. Nelson, Ruby Nelson, Tonita Nelson, Ruth Nez, Annie Oldman, Raymond Oldman, Bessie S. Pelt, Harry Peshlakai, Sr., Thomas Pete, Raymond Pettigrew, Charles Phillips, Charles D. Phillips, Dorothy Phillips, Mary J. Phillips, Vernon Phillips, Wilson Phillips, Shandie Pioche, Sarah Police, Esther Reddoor, Ella Redhouse, Lucy Rentz, Phillip Rentz, Nelson Rockwell, Perfina Rockwell, Ronnie Ross, Larry B. Sam, Bobby Sandoval, Lula Sandoval, Susie Scott, Raymond G. Sells, Roger Shaggy, Roger Sherman, Bessie Shorthair, Wade Shorthair, Celeste Silas, Ella Silas, Marilyn Silas, Ruby B. Silas, Christina Silentman, James Simpson, Roger L. Simpson, George L. Sisco, Jr., Sarah Slowman, Eric Smallcanyon, Teddy Smallcanyon, Rose Ann Tanner, Bessie Tesswood, The Estate of Leon Jones, The Estate of Rose Merritt, The Estate of Wayne Saltwater, Dora Todacheene, Jerry Todachenne, Lewis Todachenne, Charlie N, Todachennie, Herbert Todachennie, Irene Todachennie, Bernadine Todechene, Vincent Todechene, Dorothy Todechine, Flora Todechine, Roselyn Toledo, Helen Tom, Sarah A. Tony Benally, Mary Tso, Ivan Tyler, Thomas T. Tyler, Phyllis Valdez, Anna Vigil, Cecilia Wallace, Johnson Washburn, Jr., Johnson Washburn, Sr., Roselyn Watchman, Clarence D. Weston, Cornelia Weston, Della Weston, Harold Williams, Lenora Williams, Herbert Willie, Lena Willie, Raymond G. Willie, Esther A. Yanito, Alice D. Yazzie, Calvin Yazzie, Earl D. Yazzie, Irvin Yazzie, Jay Yazzie, Lorenzo Yazzie, Marie Yazzie and Susie Yazzie to Sunnyside Gold Corporation's Motion to Intervene. Served on 12/02/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-2197] KF [Entered: 12/02/2019 07:02 PM]
November 25, 2019 [10697955] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Cox, Kate Ferlic, and Brian Egolf for James Simpson, Harold Williams, Ron Miller, Ms. Wanda Benally, Ronnie Ross, Harrison Johnson, Ms. Jean Jones, Mr. James Grant, Mr. Raymond Jones, Mr. Richard Begaye, Eric Begay, Ms. Alice Begay, James Mason, Harry Benally, Jimmie Coolidge, Cecil Duncan, Ms. Rose Benally, Anita Hayes, Ms. Beverly Maxwell, Joe C. Allen, Carol Anagal, Cheryl Armenta, Duane Aspaas, Leontyne Atcitty, Lula Atcitty, Wilford Atson, Hilda Baldwin, Aaron Barber, Daisy Barber, Louise Henderson, Paul Barber, Roger Barber, Andy Begay, Arlene Begay, Bernita Begay, Betty Begay, Caroline Begay, Charlene Begay, Elizabeth Begay, Helen Begay, Jacqueline L. Begay, Jonah Begay, Judy Begay, Mae Begay, Marylita Begay, Roy Begay, Sandra Begay, Virginia Begay, Wayne Begay, Corlivia Begay, Etta Begaye, Jenathan Begaye, Laurence Bekise, Robert Bekise, David Ben, Rechelleda Benallie, Dina Benally, Ernest Benally, Jeannie Benally, Max Benally, Nina Benally, Pearlene Benally, Steve Benally, Susan Benally, Larena Benn, Lynalla Benn, Shirley Bia, Priscilla Bigman, Vernida Bissonette, Lorraine Black, Mable Black, Taylor Black, Tom Blackhorse, Annie BlueEyes, Scott Brady, Andrew Brewster, Darlene Bronston, Janice Terri Brown, Jackson Bunny, Jr., Albert Bylilly, Harrison Cattleman, Jr., Sammy Charley, Wilma Charley, Darrell Clah, Benjamin Clark, Mary Clark, Toni Claw, Lahoma Cly, Stella Cly, Doris Coolidge, Wilbert Cowboy, Jr., Alfred Curley, Don Curley, Jr., Melvin Curley, Martha Curtis, Kee Dan, Rachel Dee, Davidson Devore, Lucy Dick, Marlene Dobey, Elton Dodge, Susie Dodge, Tommy Draper, Bessie Duncan, Thurston Eddie, Herman Enoah, Mary Enoah, Vernese Esplain, Allen E. Etsitty, Bertha A. Etsitty, Huron Etsitty, Rena Fasthorse, Janice Frank, Sarah Frank, Gene Fred, Loren Garnanez, Shalina Grandson, Crystal Grey, Reyvette Grey, Shawna Hamm, Julie Harrison, Margaret Harrison, Sherrell G. Mesa, Hubert Harwood, Emerson Hatathley, Loretta Hatathley, Perry Hayes, Robert Hayes, Robin Hayes, Wallace Hayes, Annie Henry, Elsie Henry, Freddie Hobson, Joanne Holliday, Tom Horse, Daisy Houser, Helen Howard, Herman Hunt, Irita James, Garry Jay, Mary Jay, Eddie Jay, Daniel Jim, Darrell Jim, Fannie Marie Jim, Charley Jim, Geneva Jim, Jonah Jim, Kyle Jim, Norman Jim, Sr., Sheila Jim, Virgina Jim, Elsie Joe, Lita Joe, Frank John, Jr., Herman John, Anne Johnson 8, Jessie Johnson, Lena J. Jones, Renita T. Jones, Theron Jones, The Estate of Leon Jones, Wesley Jones, Darren Kee, Juanita Kee, Max Kellywood, Sr., Francine Kiefert, Florence B. King, Marlene King, Terri Lameman-Austin, Harry Lane, Gloria Lane, Ada Lansing, John Lansing, Albert H. Lee, Emerson Lee, Evelyn M. Lee, Leonard Lee, Sr., Marie Lee, Michelle A. Lee, Roselyn Lee, Michael N. Little, Rowena Littlehat, Irene Livingston, Carmelita Lowe, Cynthia Madison, Mary Ann Manygoat, Esther Mark, Mae Martin, Gerald Maryboy, Wallace McGilbert, The Estate of Rose Merritt, Rosina T. Merritt, Emma Mitchell, Laura M. Mitchell, Lucy B. Mitchell, Sylvia Mitchell, Marliyn Mustache, Anthony Nabahe, Betty Jones Nakai, Harry S. Nakai, Jimmy Nakai, Byron Nelson, Tonita Nelson, Pauline D. Nelson, Ruby Nelson, Ruth Nez, Annie Oldman, Raymond Oldman, Bessie S. Pelt, Harry Peshlakai, Sr., Thomas Pete, Raymond Pettigrew, Charles Phillips, Charles D. Phillips, Dorothy Phillips, Mary J. Phillips, Vernon Phillips, Wilson Phillips, Shandie Pioche, Sarah Police, Esther Reddoor, Cecilia Wallace, Ella Redhouse, Lucy Rentz, Phillip Rentz, Nelson Rockwell, Perfina Rockwell, The Estate of Wayne Saltwater, Larry B. Sam, Bobby Sandoval, Lula Sandoval, Susie Scott, Raymond G. Sells, Roger Shaggy, Roger Sherman, Bessie Shorthair, Wade Shorthair, Celeste Silas, Ella Silas, Marilyn Silas, Ruby B. Silas, Christina Silentman, Roger L. Simpson, George L. Sisco, Jr., Sarah Slowman, Eric Smallcanyon, Teddy Smallcanyon, Rose Ann Tanner, Bessie Tesswood, Dora Todacheene, Jerry Todachenne, Lewis Todachenne, Herbert Todachennie, Irene Todachennie, Charlie N, Todachennie, Bernadine Todechene, Vincent Todechene, Dorothy Todechine, Flora Todechine, Roselyn Toledo, Helen Tom, Sarah A. Tony Benally, Mary Tso, Ivan Tyler, Thomas T. Tyler, Phyllis Valdez, Anna Vigil, Johnson Washburn, Jr., Johnson Washburn, Sr., Roselyn Watchman, Clarence D. Weston, Cornelia Weston, Della Weston, Lenora Williams, Herbert Willie, Lena Willie, Raymond G. Willie, Esther A. Yanito, Alice D. Yazzie, Calvin Yazzie, Earl D. Yazzie, Irvin Yazzie, Jay Yazzie, Lorenzo Yazzie, Marie Yazzie and Susie Yazzie. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/25/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-2197] [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:09 PM]
November 25, 2019 [10697914] Entry of appearance submitted by Kate Ferlic, Brian Egolf, Mark Cox for Appellees Joe C. Allen, Carol Anagal, Cheryl Armenta, Duane Aspaas, Leontyne Atcitty, Lula Atcitty, Wilford Atson, Hilda Baldwin, Aaron Barber, Daisy Barber, Paul Barber, Roger Barber, Ms. Alice Begay, Andy Begay, Arlene Begay, Bernita Begay, Betty Begay, Caroline Begay, Charlene Begay, Corlivia Begay, Elizabeth Begay, Eric Begay, Helen Begay, Jacqueline L. Begay, Jonah Begay, Judy Begay, Mae Begay, Marylita Begay, Roy Begay, Sandra Begay, Virginia Begay, Wayne Begay, Etta Begaye, Jenathan Begaye, Mr. Richard Begaye, Laurence Bekise, Robert Bekise, David Ben, Rechelleda Benallie, Dina Benally, Ernest Benally, Harry Benally, Jeannie Benally, Max Benally, Nina Benally, Pearlene Benally, Ms. Rose Benally, Steve Benally, Susan Benally, Ms. Wanda Benally, Larena Benn, Lynalla Benn, Shirley Bia, Priscilla Bigman, Vernida Bissonette, Lorraine Black, Mable Black, Taylor Black, Tom Blackhorse, Annie BlueEyes, Scott Brady, Andrew Brewster, Darlene Bronston, Janice Terri Brown, Jackson Bunny, Jr., Albert Bylilly, Harrison Cattleman, Jr., Sammy Charley, Wilma Charley, Darrell Clah, Benjamin Clark, Mary Clark, Toni Claw, Lahoma Cly, Stella Cly, Doris Coolidge, Jimmie Coolidge, Wilbert Cowboy, Jr., Alfred Curley, Don Curley, Jr., Melvin Curley, Martha Curtis, Kee Dan, Rachel Dee, Davidson Devore, Lucy Dick, Marlene Dobey, Elton Dodge, Susie Dodge, Tommy Draper, Bessie Duncan, Cecil Duncan, Thurston Eddie, Herman Enoah, Mary Enoah, Vernese Esplain, Allen E. Etsitty, Bertha A. Etsitty, Huron Etsitty, Rena Fasthorse, Janice Frank, Sarah Frank, Gene Fred, Loren Garnanez, Shalina Grandson, Mr. James Grant, Crystal Grey, Reyvette Grey, Shawna Hamm, Julie Harrison, Margaret Harrison, Hubert Harwood, Emerson Hatathley, Loretta Hatathley, Anita Hayes, Perry Hayes, Robert Hayes, Robin Hayes, Wallace Hayes, Louise Henderson, Annie Henry, Elsie Henry, Freddie Hobson, Joanne Holliday, Tom Horse, Daisy Houser, Helen Howard, Herman Hunt, Irita James, Eddie Jay, Garry Jay, Mary Jay, Charley Jim, Daniel Jim, Darrell Jim, Fannie Marie Jim, Geneva Jim, Jonah Jim, Kyle Jim, Norman Jim, Sr., Sheila Jim, Virgina Jim, Elsie Joe, Lita Joe, Frank John, Jr., Herman John, Anne Johnson 8, Harrison Johnson, Jessie Johnson, Ms. Jean Jones, Lena J. Jones, Mr. Raymond Jones, Renita T. Jones, Theron Jones, Wesley Jones, Darren Kee, Juanita Kee, Max Kellywood, Sr., Francine Kiefert, Florence B. King, Marlene King, Terri Lameman-Austin, Gloria Lane, Harry Lane, Ada Lansing, John Lansing, Albert H. Lee, Emerson Lee, Evelyn M. Lee, Leonard Lee, Sr., Marie Lee, Michelle A. Lee, Roselyn Lee, Michael N. Little, Rowena Littlehat, Irene Livingston, Carmelita Lowe, Cynthia Madison, Mary Ann Manygoat, Esther Mark, Mae Martin, Gerald Maryboy, James Mason, Ms. Beverly Maxwell, Wallace McGilbert, Rosina T. Merritt, Sherrell G. Mesa, Ron Miller, Emma Mitchell, Laura M. Mitchell, Lucy B. Mitchell, Sylvia Mitchell, Marliyn Mustache, Anthony Nabahe, Betty Jones Nakai, Harry S. Nakai, Jimmy Nakai, Byron Nelson, Pauline D. Nelson, Ruby Nelson, Tonita Nelson, Ruth Nez, Annie Oldman, Raymond Oldman, Bessie S. Pelt, Harry Peshlakai, Sr., Thomas Pete, Raymond Pettigrew, Charles Phillips, Charles D. Phillips, Dorothy Phillips, Mary J. Phillips, Vernon Phillips, Wilson Phillips, Shandie Pioche, Sarah Police, Esther Reddoor, Ella Redhouse, Lucy Rentz, Phillip Rentz, Nelson Rockwell, Perfina Rockwell, Ronnie Ross, Larry B. Sam, Bobby Sandoval, Lula Sandoval, Susie Scott, Raymond G. Sells, Roger Shaggy, Roger Sherman, Bessie Shorthair, Wade Shorthair, Celeste Silas, Ella Silas, Marilyn Silas, Ruby B. Silas, Christina Silentman, James Simpson, Roger L. Simpson, George L. Sisco, Jr., Sarah Slowman, Eric Smallcanyon, Teddy Smallcanyon, Rose Ann Tanner, Bessie Tesswood, The Estate of Leon Jones, The Estate of Rose Merritt, The Estate of Wayne Saltwater, Dora Todacheene, Jerry Todachenne, Lewis Todachenne, Charlie N, Todachennie, Herbert Todachennie, Irene Todachennie, Bernadine Todechene, Vincent Todechene, Dorothy Todechine, Flora Todechine, Roselyn Toledo, Helen Tom, Sarah A. Tony Benally, Mary Tso, Ivan Tyler, Thomas T. Tyler, Phyllis Valdez, Anna Vigil, Cecilia Wallace, Johnson Washburn, Jr., Johnson Washburn, Sr., Roselyn Watchman, Clarence D. Weston, Cornelia Weston, Della Weston, Harold Williams, Lenora Williams, Herbert Willie, Lena Willie, Raymond G. Willie, Esther A. Yanito, Alice D. Yazzie, Calvin Yazzie, Earl D. Yazzie, Irvin Yazzie, Jay Yazzie, Lorenzo Yazzie, Marie Yazzie and Susie Yazzie for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2197] --[Edited 11/25/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 11/25/2019.] KF [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:45 PM]
November 21, 2019 [10697081] Order filed by Clerk of the Court on non-party Sunnyside Golden Corporation's Motion to Intervene (The "Motion"). The appellees - and only the appellees- shall file a response to the Motion on or before 12/02/2019. Served on 11/21/2019. [19-2197] [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:21 PM]
November 21, 2019 [10696903] Motion to Interevene under 10 Cir. R. 15.2. filed by: Sunnyside Gold Corporation. Supporting: Appellant/Petitioner. Served on 11/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-2197]--[Edited 11/21/2019 by AT to reflect counsel filed a motion to intervene ] NGW [Entered: 11/21/2019 09:16 AM]
November 20, 2019 [10696734] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/20/2019. Docketing statement due 12/04/2019 for Environmental Restoration, LLC. Transcript order form due 12/04/2019 for Environmental Restoration, LLC. Notice of appearance due on 12/04/2019 for Joe C. Allen, Carol Anagal, Cheryl Armenta, Duane Aspaas, Leontyne Atcitty, Lula Atcitty, Wilford Atson, Hilda Baldwin, Aaron Barber, Daisy Barber, Paul Barber, Roger Barber, Alice Begay, Andy Begay, Arlene Begay, Bernita Begay, Betty Begay, Caroline Begay, Charlene Begay, Corlivia Begay, Elizabeth Begay, Eric Begay, Helen Begay, Jacqueline L. Begay, Jonah Begay, Judy Begay, Mae Begay, Marylita Begay, Roy Begay, Sandra Begay, Virginia Begay, Wayne Begay, Etta Begaye, Jenathan Begaye, Richard Begaye, Laurence Bekise, Robert Bekise, David Ben, Rechelleda Benallie, Dina Benally, Ernest Benally, Harry Benally, Jeannie Benally, Max Benally, Nina Benally, Pearlene Benally, Rose Benally, Steve Benally, Susan Benally, Wanda Benally, Larena Benn, Lynalla Benn, Shirley Bia, Priscilla Bigman, Vernida Bissonette, Lorraine Black, Mable Black, Taylor Black, Tom Blackhorse, Annie BlueEyes, Scott Brady, Andrew Brewster, Darlene Bronston, Janice Terri Brown, Jackson Bunny Jr., Albert Bylilly, Harrison Cattleman Jr., Sammy Charley, Wilma Charley, Darrell Clah, Benjamin Clark, Mary Clark, Toni Claw, Lahoma Cly, Stella Cly, Doris Coolidge, Jimmie Coolidge, Wilbert Cowboy Jr., Alfred Curley, Don Curley Jr., Melvin Curley, Martha Curtis, Kee Dan, Rachel Dee, Davidson Devore, Lucy Dick, Marlene Dobey, Elton Dodge, Susie Dodge, Tommy Draper, Bessie Duncan, Cecil Duncan, Thurston Eddie, Herman Enoah, Mary Enoah, Environmental Restoration, LLC, Vernese Esplain, Allen E. Etsitty, Bertha A. Etsitty, Huron Etsitty, Rena Fasthorse, Janice Frank, Sarah Frank, Gene Fred, Loren Garnanez, Shalina Grandson, James Grant, Crystal Grey, Reyvette Grey, Shawna Hamm, Julie Harrison, Margaret Harrison, Hubert Harwood, Emerson Hatathley, Loretta Hatathley, Anita Hayes, Perry Hayes, Robert Hayes, Robin Hayes, Wallace Hayes, Louise Henderson, Annie Henry, Elsie Henry, Freddie Hobson, Joanne Holliday, Tom Horse, Daisy Houser, Helen Howard, Herman Hunt, Irita James, Eddie Jay, Garry Jay, Mary Jay, Charley Jim, Daniel Jim, Darrell Jim, Fannie Marie Jim, Geneva Jim, Jonah Jim, Kyle Jim, Norman Jim Sr., Sheila Jim, Virgina Jim, Elsie Joe, Lita Joe, Frank John Jr., Herman John, Harrison Johnson, Jessie Johnson, Anne Johnson 8, Jean Jones, Lena J. Jones, Raymond Jones, Renita T. Jones, Theron Jones, Wesley Jones, Darren Kee, Juanita Kee, Max Kellywood Sr., Francine Kiefert, Florence B. King, Marlene King, Terri Lameman-Austin, Gloria Lane, Harry Lane, Ada Lansing, John Lansing, Albert H. Lee, Emerson Lee, Evelyn M. Lee, Leonard Lee Sr., Marie Lee, Michelle A. Lee, Roselyn Lee, Michael N. Little, Rowena Littlehat, Irene Livingston, Carmelita Lowe, Cynthia Madison, Mary Ann Manygoat, Esther Mark, Mae Martin, Gerald Maryboy, James Mason, Beverly Maxwell, Wallace McGilbert, Rosina T. Merritt, Sherrell G. Mesa, Ron Miller, Emma Mitchell, Laura M. Mitchell, Lucy B. Mitchell, Sylvia Mitchell, Marliyn Mustache, Anthony Nabahe, Betty Jones Nakai, Harry S. Nakai, Jimmy Nakai, Byron Nelson, Pauline D. Nelson, Ruby Nelson, Tonita Nelson, Ruth Nez, Annie Oldman, Raymond Oldman, Bessie S. Pelt, Harry Peshlakai Sr., Thomas Pete, Raymond Pettigrew, Charles Phillips, Charles D. Phillips, Dorothy Phillips, Mary J. Phillips, Vernon Phillips, Wilson Phillips, Shandie Pioche, Sarah Police, Esther Reddoor, Ella Redhouse, Lucy Rentz, Phillip Rentz, Nelson Rockwell, Perfina Rockwell, Ronnie Ross, Larry B. Sam, Bobby Sandoval, Lula Sandoval, Susie Scott, Raymond G. Sells, Roger Shaggy, Roger Sherman, Bessie Shorthair, Wade Shorthair, Celeste Silas, Ella Silas, Marilyn Silas, Ruby B. Silas, Christina Silentman, James Simpson, Roger L. Simpson, George L. Sisco Jr., Sarah Slowman, Eric Smallcanyon, Teddy Smallcanyon, Rose Ann Tanner, Bessie Tesswood, The Estate of Leon Jones, The Estate of Rose Merritt, The Estate of Wayne Saltwater, Dora Todacheene, Jerry Todachenne, Lewis Todachenne, Charlie N, Todachennie, Herbert Todachennie, Irene Todachennie, Bernadine Todechene, Vincent Todechene, Dorothy Todechine, Flora Todechine, Roselyn Toledo, Helen Tom, Sarah A. Tony Benally, Mary Tso, Ivan Tyler, Thomas T. Tyler, Phyllis Valdez, Anna Vigil, Cecilia Wallace, Johnson Washburn Jr., Johnson Washburn Sr., Roselyn Watchman, Clarence D. Weston, Cornelia Weston, Della Weston, Harold Williams, Lenora Williams, Herbert Willie, Lena Willie, Raymond G. Willie, Esther A. Yanito, Alice D. Yazzie, Calvin Yazzie, Earl D. Yazzie, Irvin Yazzie, Jay Yazzie, Lorenzo Yazzie, Marie Yazzie, and Susie Yazzie. [19-2197] [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen, Jr., et al v. Environmental Restoration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARLENE KING
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAYMOND PETTIGREW
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNIE OLDMAN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AARON BARBER
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THE ESTATE OF LEON JONES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAISY BARBER
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES PHILLIPS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES MASON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEVE BENALLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROGER L. SIMPSON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARAH FRANK
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NORMAN JIM, SR.
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DON CURLEY, JR.
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CECIL DUNCAN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LOREN GARNANEZ
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IVAN TYLER
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JIMMY NAKAI
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RUTH NEZ
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HARRY BENALLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHANDIE PIOCHE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DANIEL JIM
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RUBY B. SILAS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL N. LITTLE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RACHEL DEE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TONITA NELSON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JONAH JIM
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LORRAINE BLACK
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LARRY B. SAM
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALLEN E. ETSITTY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HURON ETSITTY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FANNIE MARIE JIM
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHERRELL G. MESA
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSELYN TOLEDO
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BETTY JONES NAKAI
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LENORA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TOMMY DRAPER
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARLIYN MUSTACHE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EMERSON HATATHLEY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NELSON ROCKWELL
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HARRY PESHLAKAI, SR.
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TAYLOR BLACK
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VIRGINA JIM
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BESSIE S. PELT
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KYLE JIM
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERNEST BENALLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALICE BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LYNALLA BENN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILSON PHILLIPS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRANCINE KIEFERT
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHELLE A. LEE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY ENOAH
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ETTA BEGAYE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILBERT COWBOY, JR.
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HARRY LANE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEAN JONES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNA VIGIL
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DUANE ASPAAS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES D. PHILLIPS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LARENA BENN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTINA SILENTMAN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNIE HENRY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEONTYNE ATCITTY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SUSIE SCOTT
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WESLEY JONES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LULA ATCITTY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VERNIDA BISSONETTE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CORNELIA WESTON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IRVIN YAZZIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY JAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JENATHAN BEGAYE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARGARET HARRISON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TOM HORSE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HERMAN JOHN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SAMMY CHARLEY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SUSIE DODGE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSELYN WATCHMAN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FREDDIE HOBSON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY TSO
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BESSIE DUNCAN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IRITA JAMES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MAE BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHAWNA HAMM
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILMA CHARLEY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HUBERT HARWOOD
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY ANN MANYGOAT
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT BEKISE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROGER BARBER
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEE DAN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNIE BLUEEYES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VERNON PHILLIPS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BEVERLY MAXWELL
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JERRY TODACHENNE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUCY RENTZ
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALBERT BYLILLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DARREN KEE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JUANITA KEE
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WANDA BENALLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARIE LEE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JACKSON BUNNY, JR.
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSE ANN TANNER
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SUSAN BENALLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EMMA MITCHELL
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EMERSON LEE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HARRISON JOHNSON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FLORENCE B. KING
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THOMAS PETE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEANNIE BENALLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LITA JOE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BESSIE SHORTHAIR
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRANK JOHN, JR.
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERIC BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SUSIE YAZZIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RUBY NELSON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELVIN CURLEY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PRISCILLA BIGMAN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSINA T. MERRITT
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUCY DICK
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PERFINA ROCKWELL
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES GRANT
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAY YAZZIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROY BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARTHA CURTIS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAYMOND JONES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SCOTT BRADY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BETTY BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROWENA LITTLEHAT
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JACQUELINE L. BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GERALD MARYBOY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RONNIE ROSS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TEDDY SMALLCANYON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAUL BARBER
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CELESTE SILAS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THERON JONES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHNSON WASHBURN, SR.
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELSIE JOE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WALLACE MCGILBERT
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GENEVA JIM
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RENITA T. JONES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BERNITA BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IRENE LIVINGSTON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SYLVIA MITCHELL
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DOROTHY PHILLIPS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JESSIE JOHNSON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT HAYES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CORLIVIA BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GEORGE L. SISCO, JR.
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PHYLLIS VALDEZ
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JULIE HARRISON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MABLE BLACK
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LENA WILLIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WALLACE HAYES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAYMOND G. WILLIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LULA SANDOVAL
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LORENZO YAZZIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THOMAS T. TYLER
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CRYSTAL GREY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JUDY BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DINA BENALLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JONAH BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES SIMPSON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TOM BLACKHORSE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FLORA TODECHINE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDREW BREWSTER
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DELLA WESTON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ESTHER A. YANITO
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELIZABETH BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BESSIE TESSWOOD
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CALVIN YAZZIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VIRGINIA BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELLA SILAS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAISY HOUSER
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HAROLD WILLIAMS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUCY B. MITCHELL
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHERYL ARMENTA
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARLENE DOBEY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GARRY JAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARAH POLICE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOE C. ALLEN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HERMAN ENOAH
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HELEN HOWARD
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOANNE HOLLIDAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DORIS COOLIDGE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DOROTHY TODECHINE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALBERT H. LEE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LORETTA HATATHLEY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PERRY HAYES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHIRLEY BIA
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROGER SHAGGY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CECILIA WALLACE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ARLENE BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THE ESTATE OF ROSE MERRITT
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY J. PHILLIPS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HERBERT TODACHENNIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NINA BENALLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILFORD ATSON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANITA HAYES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELTON DODGE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARAH A. TONY BENALLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HELEN TOM
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLENE BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WADE SHORTHAIR
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSE BENALLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EVELYN M. LEE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MAX KELLYWOOD, SR.
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNE JOHNSON 8
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DARRELL CLAH
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VERNESE ESPLAIN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHALINA GRANDSON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DARLENE BRONSTON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHNSON WASHBURN, JR.
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RENA FASTHORSE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GENE FRED
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVIDSON DEVORE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: REYVETTE GREY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAROL ANAGAL
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDY BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELSIE HENRY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BOBBY SANDOVAL
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HILDA BALDWIN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VINCENT TODECHENE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDDIE JAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EARL D. YAZZIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSELYN LEE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEONARD LEE, SR.
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAHOMA CLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JIMMIE COOLIDGE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALFRED CURLEY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID BEN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LOUISE HENDERSON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HERMAN HUNT
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IRENE TODACHENNIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JANICE TERRI BROWN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN LANSING
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLEY JIM
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TONI CLAW
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANTHONY NABAHE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARMELITA LOWE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ESTHER REDDOOR
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RON MILLER
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAULINE D. NELSON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ADA LANSING
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TERRI LAMEMAN-AUSTIN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DARRELL JIM
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARAH SLOWMAN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAYMOND OLDMAN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JANICE FRANK
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAYMOND G. SELLS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HELEN BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BERTHA A. ETSITTY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BYRON NELSON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RECHELLEDA BENALLIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GLORIA LANE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY CLARK
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STELLA CLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALICE D. YAZZIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARYLITA BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAROLINE BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LENA J. JONES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROGER SHERMAN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HARRY S. NAKAI
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WAYNE BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HERBERT WILLIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HARRISON CATTLEMAN, JR.
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PHILLIP RENTZ
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DORA TODACHEENE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MAX BENALLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ESTHER MARK
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARIE YAZZIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THURSTON EDDIE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLARENCE D. WESTON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELLA REDHOUSE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BERNADINE TODECHENE
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBIN HAYES
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHEILA JIM
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PEARLENE BENALLY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CYNTHIA MADISON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERIC SMALLCANYON
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MAE MARTIN
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THE ESTATE OF WAYNE SALTWATER
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SANDRA BEGAY
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAURA M. MITCHELL
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARILYN SILAS
Represented By: Katherine Ferlic
Represented By: Mark Cox
Represented By: Brian F. Egolf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]