In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Plaintiff / Appellee: MICHAEL GRIES, MARVIN MILLER, BIEBER FARM, CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC, LEROY EDLUND, GRAFEL FARMS, LLC, ROGER WARD, DAVID POLIFKA, PETER V. ANDERSON, TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP, JPPL, INC., KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC., RICHARD CRONE, VJW FARM, INC., PINE HURST ACRES, ROBERT NIEMEYER, NEBCO, INC., KENNETH OSBORN, DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, FIVE STAR FARMS, RON WETZ, BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC., AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC, DAVID SCHWANINGER, DEMMER FARMS, INC., CHARLES COBB, MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, GRANT ANNEXSTAD, KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY, BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP, CHARLES B. LEX, BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC., NORMAN SIGRIST, ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC, TODD NIEMEYER, CHARLES A. WELSH, BRADLEY J. VERMEER, STEVEN A. WENTWORTH, DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms and CE COBB FARMS
Undetermined: JAMI HAYHURST and DALE BROOKOVER
Defendant / Appellee: SYNGENTA BIOTECHNOLOGY, INC., SYNGENTA SEEDS, LLC, FKA Syngenta Seeds, Inc., SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION AG, SYNGENTA CORPORATION, WATTS GUERRA LLP, SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC and SYNGENTA AG
Case Number: 19-3005
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 [10631301] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Scott Ashley Powell for "All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross Appellants" in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 03/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3032, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:03 AM]
March 6, 2019 [10631254] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott A.Powell for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Steven A. Wentworth and Appellees Peter V. Anderson, Mr. Richard Crone, Michael Gries, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. Norman Sigrist, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Mr. Charles A. Welsh and Mr. Ron Wetz in 19-3032, Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Mr. Richard Crone, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Michael Gries, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, Mr. Norman Sigrist, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Roger Ward, Mr. Charles A. Welsh, Steven A. Wentworth and Mr. Ron Wetz in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] --[Edited 03/06/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] SAP [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:33 AM]
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order [10630496] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach consolidating the objector appeals for all purposes; directing the opening brief to be filed within 60 days of the date of this order. (appellants brief and appendix due on 04/30/2019 for Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts, Dale Brookover, Jami Hayhurst, Egler Brothers, Inc., W. Lee Egler Farms, Inc and F. Ronalds Walker); directing the parties to file any objections to briefing proposed within 14 days from the date of this order; directing Watts Guerra to file a response at set forth in the order within 14 days of the date of this order; directing the parties to file a joint list of parties within 14 days of the date of this order. (The various responses are due 3/15/19 for Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Richard Crone, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Michael Gries, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, David Polifka, Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, David Schwaninger, Norman Sigrist, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, VJW Farm, Inc., Bradley J. Vermeer, Roger Ward, Watts Guerra LLP, Charles A. Welsh, Steven A. Wentworth, Ron Wetz, Dale Brookover, Jami Hayhurst, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Egler Brothers, Inc., Syngenta Participations AG, W. Lee Egler Farms, Inc and F. Ronalds Walker.) Served on 03/01/2019. (Please see the attachment for the entire order.) [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3009] [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:10 PM]
February 22, 2019 [10628768] Appellee/Respondent's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Mr. Richard Crone, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Michael Gries, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Todd Niemeyer, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Roger Ward, Mr. Charles A. Welsh and Steven A. Wentworth in 18-3253, 19-3005, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Mr. Richard Crone, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Michael Gries, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Todd Niemeyer, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Participations AG, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Roger Ward, Mr. Charles A. Welsh and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, Peter V. Anderson, Mr. Richard Crone, Michael Gries, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc. and Mr. Charles A. Welsh in 19-3032. Served on 02/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certificatio--[Edited 03/01/2019 by KLP to delete from 19-3032.]ns: Yes. [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] BW [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:37 PM]
February 20, 2019 [10627889] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 03/22/2019 for Jennifer B. Wieland. [19-3005] [Entered: 02/20/2019 09:04 AM]
February 20, 2019 [10627873] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 03/22/2019 for Scott A. Love. [19-3005] [Entered: 02/20/2019 08:43 AM]
February 20, 2019 [10627870] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 03/22/2019 for Clayton A Clark. [19-3005] [Entered: 02/20/2019 08:38 AM]
February 19, 2019 [10627562] Entry of appearance filed by Jennifer B. Wieland and Thomas P. Schult for Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/19/2019. Manner of Service: email [18-3253, 19-3032, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:07 PM]
February 19, 2019 [10627506] Entry of appearance submitted by Jennifer B. Wieland and Thomas P. Schult for Appellees Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC in 18-3253, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, Not Parties Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC in 19-3032, 19-3005 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3005] --[Edited 02/19/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JBW [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:18 AM]
February 15, 2019 [10627417] Entry of appearance filed by Clayton A Clark and Scott A. Love for Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Charles A. Welsh and Ron Wetz. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/15/2019. Manner of Service: email [18-3253, 19-3032, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/19/2019 08:39 AM]
February 15, 2019 [10627402] Entry of appearance filed by Jason Mark Milne and Martin John Phipps for Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Charles A. Welsh, and Ron Wetz. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50. Served on 02/15/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3032, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009] [Entered: 02/19/2019 08:18 AM]
February 15, 2019 [10627244] Entry of appearance submitted by Clayton A. Clark, Scott A. Love for Not Party Clark, Love & Hutson GP in 19-3032, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Charles A. Welsh, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, and Ron Wetz for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] --[Edited 02/19/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/19/19] CAC [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:58 PM]
February 15, 2019 [10627200] Entry of appearance submitted by Martin J. Phipps and Jason M. Milne for Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Charles A. Welsh, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, and Ron Wetz for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032] --[Edited 02/19/2019 by DD. REmoved PDF as pleading filed 2/19/19] MJP [Entered: 02/15/2019 12:42 PM]
February 8, 2019 [10625678] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing all Appellees to file a consolidated responsive memorandum brief due 02/22/2019 for Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, David Schwaninger, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Watts Guerra LLP, Steven A. Wentworth and Syngenta Participations AG. Served on 02/08/2019. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-3008, 19-3022, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3009, 19-3021] [Entered: 02/08/2019 04:03 PM]
February 8, 2019 [10625661] Appellant/Petitioner's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3022. Served on 02/08/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] EAI [Entered: 02/08/2019 03:16 PM]
February 8, 2019 [10625409] Appellant/Petitioner's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021. Served on 02/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3022] JAL [Entered: 02/08/2019 07:11 AM]
February 7, 2019 [10625170] Appellant/Petitioner's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by Simon Rademacher and Christopher Roberts in 18-3253, 19-3009. Served on 02/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] RC [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:10 AM]
February 6, 2019 [10625193] Attorney Mr. George Willard Cochran, Jr. for Jami Hayhurst and Dale Brookover admitted to the bar of this court. [19-3005] [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:38 AM]
February 1, 2019 [10623912] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for plaintiffs-appellees Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms in 18-3253. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50. Served on 02/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3022, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021] [Entered: 02/04/2019 07:45 AM]
February 1, 2019 [10623701] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on the Entry of Appearance filed on 2/1/19 by Daniel E. Gustafson. This entry states that counsel is entering an appearance on behalf of All Appellees/Respondents. Within seven days of the date of this order, Attorney Gustafson shall file an amended Entry of Appearance specifically identifying which appellees he represents. (Amended entry due on 02/08/2019 for Daniel E. Gustafson.) Served on 02/01/2019. [18-3253, 19-3022, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021] [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:31 PM]
February 1, 2019 [10623635] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022]--[Edited 02/04/2019 by KLP. This entry was filed on 2/4/19.] DEG [Entered: 02/01/2019 11:36 AM]
February 1, 2019 [10623569] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022]--[Edited 02/01/2019 by KLP to delete the PDF. This entry must be amended per the 2/1/19 order.] DEG [Entered: 02/01/2019 09:55 AM]
January 25, 2019 [10621788] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing appellants in all five appeals to file memorandum briefs within 14 days from the date of this order; directing appellees in all five appeals to file responsive memorandum briefs within 14 days of service of the last appellant's memorandum brief. (Appellants' memorandum briefs due 02/08/2019 for Simon Rademacher, Christopher Roberts, Dale Brookover, Jami Hayhurst, Egler Brothers, Inc., W. Lee Egler Farms, Inc, F. Ronalds Walker, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, W. Dean Belk Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Aaron D. Hovan, John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Joseph F. Manak, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A..) Served on 01/25/2019. (See the attachment for the entire order.) [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009] [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:39 PM]
January 24, 2019 [10621487] Notice filed by Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership and Steven A. Wentworth in 18-3253, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009. Served on 01/24/2019 by email. [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009] PJS [Entered: 01/24/2019 04:00 PM]
January 24, 2019 [10621260] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew K. York and Mr. William B. Chaney for Watts Guerra LLP, Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/24/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005] [Entered: 01/24/2019 10:39 AM]
January 24, 2019 [10621231] Entry of appearance submitted by William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/24/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005]--[Edited 01/24/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] WBC [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:45 AM]
January 23, 2019 [10621047] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/23/2019. [19-3005] [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:33 PM]
January 23, 2019 [10620836] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 02/22/2019 for George Willard Cochran Jr.. [19-3005] [Entered: 01/23/2019 08:45 AM]
January 22, 2019 [10620464] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 01/29/2019 for Timothy M. O'Brien, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3005] [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:03 AM]
January 22, 2019 [10620443] Entry of appearance filed by George Willard Cochran, Jr. for Jami Hayhurst and Dale Brookover. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005] [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:37 AM]
January 22, 2019 [10620427] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Dale Brookover and Jami Hayhurst in 19-3005. Transcript ordered: NONE. Served on: 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005] --[Edited 01/22/2019 by DD to remove from 18-3253, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009] GWC [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:14 AM]
January 22, 2019 [10620426] Docketing statement filed by Dale Brookover and Jami Hayhurst in 19-3005. Served on 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/24/2019 by MLB to remove misapplied case numbers][19-3005] GWC [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:10 AM]
January 22, 2019 [10620424] Entry of appearance submitted by GEORGE WILLARD COCHRAN for Appellants Dale Brookover and Jami Hayhurst in 19-3005 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005] --[Edited 01/22/2019 by SLS to remove docket entry from 18-3253, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009 and to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] GWC [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:09 AM]
January 16, 2019 [10619413] Entry of appearance filed by Rachel E. Schwartz and Patrick Joseph Stueve for Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms in 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009] [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:53 PM]
January 16, 2019 [10619383] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3006, 19-3005, 19-3008, 19-3009 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3006, 19-3005, 19-3008, 19-3009] --[Edited 01/16/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] PJS [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:15 PM]
January 16, 2019 [10619367] Entry of appearance filed by Bradley T. Wilders for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009] [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:46 PM]
January 16, 2019 [10619352] Entry of appearance submitted by Bradley T. Wilders for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/16/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 1/16/18][19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009] BW [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:33 PM]
January 15, 2019 [10618853] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Don Manley Downing and Ms. Gretchen Garrison for Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, CE Cobb Farms, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., Triple BG Partnerhsip, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, and Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005] [Entered: 01/15/2019 12:07 PM]
January 15, 2019 [10618819] Entry of appearance submitted by Don Downing and Gretchen Garrison for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005] --[Edited 01/15/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] DMD [Entered: 01/15/2019 11:13 AM]
January 14, 2019 [10618450] Entry of appearance filed by Leslie M. Smith for Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005] [Entered: 01/14/2019 10:47 AM]
January 11, 2019 [10618255] Entry of appearance filed by Patrick T. Haney and Edwin U for Syngenta AG, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/11/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3005] [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:31 PM]
January 11, 2019 [10618207] Entry of appearance submitted by Leslie M. Smith for Not Parties Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC and Syngenta Seeds, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005]--[Edited 01/14/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 1/14/19.] LMS [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:27 PM]
January 11, 2019 [10618193] Entry of appearance submitted by Edwin John U and Patrick Haney for Not Parties Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC and Syngenta Seeds, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005] --[Edited 01/11/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/11/19] EU [Entered: 01/11/2019 02:12 PM]
January 10, 2019 [10617669] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Diogenes P. Kekatos, Esq.and Stephen A. Weiss for Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Will be provided upon request 1,900 pages. Served on 01/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005] [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:21 AM]
January 10, 2019 [10617640] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher Adam Seeger for Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Mr. Roger Ward, Mr. Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Mr. Charles Cobb, Mr. Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Mr. Robert Niemeyer, Mr. Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. List of attorneys/parties is 1,900 pages.) Served on 01/10/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3005] [Entered: 01/10/2019 08:20 AM]
January 10, 2019 [10617593] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen A. Weiss and Diogenes P. Kekatos for All Appellees/Respondents for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005]--[Edited 01/10/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 1/10/19.] SAW [Entered: 01/10/2019 07:19 AM]
January 10, 2019 [10617588] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher A. Seeger for All Appellees/Respondents for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3005] --[Edited 01/10/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/10/19] CAS [Entered: 01/10/2019 07:11 AM]
January 7, 2019 [10616793] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/07/2019 Docketing statement due 01/22/2019 for Dale Brookover and Jami Hayhurst. Transcript order form due 01/22/2019 for Dale Brookover and Jami Hayhurst. Notice of appearance due on 01/22/2019 for Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, Dale Brookover, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Jami Hayhurst, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, David Schwaninger, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Watts Guerra, LLP and Steven A. Wentworth. [19-3005] [Entered: 01/07/2019 03:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL GRIES
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARVIN MILLER
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BIEBER FARM
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEROY EDLUND
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GRAFEL FARMS, LLC
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROGER WARD
Represented By: William J. Maiberger Jr.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Charles S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Bradley C. Buhrow
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Edward W. Allred
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Hart L. Robinovitch
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID POLIFKA
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PETER V. ANDERSON
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JPPL, INC.
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Gregory R. Flax
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD CRONE
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VJW FARM, INC.
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PINE HURST ACRES
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT NIEMEYER
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NEBCO, INC.
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENNETH OSBORN
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FIVE STAR FARMS
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RON WETZ
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID SCHWANINGER
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEMMER FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES COBB
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GRANT ANNEXSTAD
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES B. LEX
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NORMAN SIGRIST
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TODD NIEMEYER
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES A. WELSH
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRADLEY J. VERMEER
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEVEN A. WENTWORTH
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CE COBB FARMS
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JAMI HAYHURST
Represented By: George Willard Cochran Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DALE BROOKOVER
Represented By: George Willard Cochran Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SYNGENTA BIOTECHNOLOGY, INC.
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Shiran Zohar
Represented By: Michael D. Jones
Represented By: Jodi Wu
Represented By: Edwin U
Represented By: Brandon P. Smith
Represented By: William Patrick J. Kimmitt
Represented By: Devin Allan DeBacker
Represented By: John B. Dempsey
Represented By: Sarah J. Schultes
Represented By: Marcy Blattner
Represented By: D. Scott Aberson
Represented By: R. Alexander Pilmer
Represented By: Mike Brock
Represented By: Max E. Corrick II
Represented By: Joel E. Sechler
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Jonathan Jeffrey Faria
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Bridget Kathleen O'Connor
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lipps
Represented By: Michael Onufer
Represented By: Carson M. Hinderks
Represented By: Joseph Jay Stroble
Represented By: Zachary W. Byer
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Represented By: David Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SYNGENTA SEEDS, LLC, FKA Syngenta Seeds, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Edwin U
Represented By: Brandon P. Smith
Represented By: Mike Brock
Represented By: Max E. Corrick II
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Carson M. Hinderks
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION AG
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Stephen L. Thomas
Represented By: Shiran Zohar
Represented By: Jodi Wu
Represented By: Edwin U
Represented By: William Patrick J. Kimmitt
Represented By: Devin Allan DeBacker
Represented By: Sarah J. Schultes
Represented By: Marcy Blattner
Represented By: R. Alexander Pilmer
Represented By: Mike Brock
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Jonathan Jeffrey Faria
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Bridget Kathleen O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Onufer
Represented By: Carson M. Hinderks
Represented By: Joseph Jay Stroble
Represented By: Zachary W. Byer
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Represented By: David Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SYNGENTA CORPORATION
Represented By: Gregory G. Holland
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Stephen L. Thomas
Represented By: Shiran Zohar
Represented By: Timothy J. Bomhoff
Represented By: John E. Goodman
Represented By: Michael D. Jones
Represented By: Jodi Wu
Represented By: Edwin U
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Represented By: Brandon P. Smith
Represented By: Wallace K. Lightsey
Represented By: Michael Franklin Smith
Represented By: William Patrick J. Kimmitt
Represented By: John B. Dempsey
Represented By: Sarah J. Schultes
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz Esq.
Represented By: Robin A. McCue
Represented By: John L. Tate
Represented By: Marcy Blattner
Represented By: D. Scott Aberson
Represented By: Henry L. Parr Jr.
Represented By: Marjorie A. Farris
Represented By: William F. Goodman III
Represented By: R. Alexander Pilmer
Represented By: Mike Brock
Represented By: Mark C. Surprenant
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Max E. Corrick II
Represented By: Joel E. Sechler
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Jonathan Jeffrey Faria
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: John E. Thies
Represented By: Talbot J. Wieczorek
Represented By: Joseph W. Price II
Represented By: Jaime L. Theriot
Represented By: Bridget Kathleen O'Connor
Represented By: Mark R. Trachtenberg
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lipps
Represented By: Michael Onufer
Represented By: Carson M. Hinderks
Represented By: John E. Tull III
Represented By: Jordan M. Heinz
Represented By: Joseph Jay Stroble
Represented By: Zachary W. Byer
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Represented By: David Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WATTS GUERRA LLP
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Represented By: Thomas Wiegand
Represented By: Eric R. Nitz
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC
Represented By: Gregory G. Holland
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Stephen L. Thomas
Represented By: Shiran Zohar
Represented By: Timothy J. Bomhoff
Represented By: John E. Goodman
Represented By: Michael D. Jones
Represented By: Jodi Wu
Represented By: Edwin U
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Represented By: Brandon P. Smith
Represented By: Wallace K. Lightsey
Represented By: Michael Franklin Smith
Represented By: William Patrick J. Kimmitt
Represented By: Devin Allan DeBacker
Represented By: John B. Dempsey
Represented By: Sarah J. Schultes
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz Esq.
Represented By: Robin A. McCue
Represented By: John L. Tate
Represented By: Marcy Blattner
Represented By: D. Scott Aberson
Represented By: Henry L. Parr Jr.
Represented By: Marjorie A. Farris
Represented By: William F. Goodman III
Represented By: R. Alexander Pilmer
Represented By: Mike Brock
Represented By: Mark C. Surprenant
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Max E. Corrick II
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Jonathan Jeffrey Faria
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: John E. Thies
Represented By: Talbot J. Wieczorek
Represented By: Joseph W. Price II
Represented By: Dennis M. Barnes
Represented By: Jaime L. Theriot
Represented By: Bridget Kathleen O'Connor
Represented By: Mark R. Trachtenberg
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lipps
Represented By: Michael Onufer
Represented By: Carson M. Hinderks
Represented By: John E. Tull III
Represented By: Jordan M. Heinz
Represented By: Joseph Jay Stroble
Represented By: Zachary W. Byer
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SYNGENTA AG
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Stephen L. Thomas
Represented By: Shiran Zohar
Represented By: Jodi Wu
Represented By: Edwin U
Represented By: William Patrick J. Kimmitt
Represented By: Sarah J. Schultes
Represented By: Marcy Blattner
Represented By: R. Alexander Pilmer
Represented By: Mike Brock
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Jonathan Jeffrey Faria
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Bridget Kathleen O'Connor
Represented By: Mark R. Trachtenberg
Represented By: Michael Onufer
Represented By: Carson M. Hinderks
Represented By: Joseph Jay Stroble
Represented By: Zachary W. Byer
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Represented By: David Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?