In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Plaintiff / Appellee: MICHAEL GRIES, MARVIN MILLER, BIEBER FARM, CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC, LEROY EDLUND, GRAFEL FARMS, LLC, ROGER WARD, DAVID POLIFKA, PETER V. ANDERSON, TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP, JPPL, INC., KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC., RICHARD CRONE, VJW FARM, INC., PINE HURST ACRES, ROBERT NIEMEYER, NEBCO, INC., KENNETH OSBORN, DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, FIVE STAR FARMS, RON WETZ, BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC., AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC, DAVID SCHWANINGER, DEMMER FARMS, INC., CHARLES COBB, MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, GRANT ANNEXSTAD, KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY, BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP, CHARLES B. LEX, BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC., NORMAN SIGRIST, ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC, TODD NIEMEYER, CHARLES A. WELSH, BRADLEY J. VERMEER, STEVEN A. WENTWORTH, DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms and CE COBB FARMS
Appellant: WATTS GUERRA LLP, HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C., DENNEY & BARRETT, PC, DANIEL QUIGLEY, MCFARLAND LAW, PC, LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY R. VAUGHAN, P.C., TED B. LYON & ASSOCIATES, P.C., BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC, RYAN MOORE & COOK, WICKENS & WICKENS, LLC, CHAPMAN LAW LLC, RICHARD M. HOLMES, CHESTER LAW OFFICE, CRYSTAL D. PULLEY, ATTORNEY AT LAW, WINSTEIN, KAVENSKY & CUNNINGHAM, LLC, KEMPTON & RUSSELL, LLC, WASKER DOOR WIMMER & MARCOUILLER, P.C., FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC, GREGORY L. CESHKER, P.C., TOM BENSON, FORDE LAW OFFICES LLP, LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA, MCNEELY STEPHENSON, TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP, OUDERKIRK LAW FIRM, GARY T. GEE LAW OFFICE, COLE, EASLEY, SCIBA & WILLIAMS, P.C., HALL HUDSON, P.C., THE CAHILL LAW OFFICES, SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C., WIL GALLOWAY & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, BARRETT MCNAGNY LLP, MAURO ARCHER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC, BOREN, OLVER AND COFFEY, LLP, FENCHEL, DOSTER & BUCK, PLC, DENTON & KEULER, LLP, CHARLES HEAR, ATTORNEY AT LAW, QUIGLEY LAW OFFICE, COLVIN, CHANEY, SAENZ & RODRIGUEZ, LLP, REICHERT LAW OFFICE, JEFF LINK, TROTH LAW OFFICE, SCHNELKER, RASSI & MCCONNELL PLC, MEYER & MEYER LLP, BERNATZ & VAN BEEK, MASSIE & QUICK, LLC, JOHN R. DELZER, BARBARA J. SIMMONS ATTORNEY AT LAW, DARLING & DARLING, NATHAN J. NOBLE, P.C., O'KOON HINTERMEISTER, PLLC, CROSS PENNAMPED WOOLSEY & GLAZIER, P.C., FEARER, NYE, & CHADWICK, BILL J. MILNER LAW OFFICES, THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC, TOURKOW CRELL ROSENBLATT & JOHNSTON LLP, JUSTIN HILL, PC, MEIER, BRAGICICH & MOORE LLP, BAKKE NORMAN, S.C., CARPENTER & SCHUMACHER, P.C., GRENFELL, SLEDGE AND STEVENS, RHOADES MCKEE PC, TROYER & GOOD, PC, CLARK & CLARK P.C., JOHNSON, MOODY, SCHMIDT & KLEINHUIZEN, P.A., MCCLURE, THOMAS & THOMAS, COTTON, BOLTON, HOYCHICK & DOUGHTY, LLP, THE CANTLIN LAW FIRM, BROOKS & OLSON, CHURCH, CHURCH, HITTLE & ANTRIM, SPENCER GILLAND, THE STROM LAW FIRM, LLC, CARABIN & SHAW, P.C., WELD, RILEY, PRENN & RICCI S.C., HEINISCH & LOVEGROVE LAW OFFICE, PC LLP, HEHNER & ASSOCIATES, LLC, CONNORS LLP, NORMAN PALOUCEK & HERMAN, GRIFFIN DIETRICH & ELLIOT, LLC, STRITTMATTER LAW FIRM, RAMMELKAMP BRADNEY, P.C., THE LAW OFFICE OF MARK L EUREK, JEFFREY A. BOGGESS, P.C., SHIMANEK, SHIMANEK, & BOWMAN, LLC, FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH, KRAFT WALSER LAW OFFICE, PLLP, MILLER PEARSON GLOE BURNS BEATTY & PARRISH, P.L.C., WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD, DOERING & GRISELL, PA, CHARLES E. CRONAUER & ASSOCIATES, BLAKEMAN & SCHROCK, LTD, WARNER NORCROSS & JUDD, LLP, BEINE & ROBERTS LAW FIRM, PLC, BRENNAN STEIL S.C., BIRD, JACOBSEN & STEVENS, PC, MICHAEL ASHAR, SATTERLEY AND KELLEY, PLLC, SORLING NORTHRUP ATTORNEYS, BROYLES KIGHT & RICAFORT, PC, BRETT DUNN PLLC, CAUGHEY, LEGNER & FREEHILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, JANZEN AGRICULTURAL LAW, LLC, SHAMBERG, WOLF, MCDERMOTT & DEPUE, VANDERVOORT CHRIST & FISHER, P.C., THE POPPE LAW FIRM, LAURIE S. WARD, MERTES & MERTES, P.C., STOCKARD, JOHNSTON, & BROWN, P.C, KEVIN W. LILES PC, EMERICK, DIGGINS & ZABONA P.C., ADAMS, RIZZI & SWEEN, P.A., FAITH INGLE SMITH LAW FIRM, JAMES & LARSON LAW, JAMES LAW, P.C., GRAYBILL & WITCHER, LLP, OSTERBAUER LAW FIRM, MICHAEL SMITH LAW, SIMON HERBERT & MCCLELLAND, LLP, CLENDENING JOHNSON & BOHRER, P.C., DOBBS LEGAL GROUP, MILTNER LAW FIRM, LLC, GELLHAUS & GELLHAUS, P. C., BRIANA DEANE, WHITMAN, BABER, & SIEGEL, VANDERGINST LAW, THE WINKIE LAW FIRM, LLC, VELA LAW OFFICES PLLC, NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW, BAKER, BODWELL, APPEL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, JENNA LAIRD LEGER, VAUGHAN LAW FIRM, P.C., SEVER STOREY, TUCKER LAW PRACTICE, WOOD & RUE, PLLP, HERITAGE LEGAL GROUP PLLC, PHILLIPPI LAW FIRM, LLC, DEBORAH K. SMITH, CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUP & NUZMAN, PLLC, SHERMAN HOFFMAN & HIPP, LC, DILLON LEGAL GROUP, ARNDT BUSWELL & THORN S.C., LEO BOOTHE, JOHNSON LAW GROUP, HECKER LAW GROUP, PLC, BRADFORD LAW FIRM, EDMUND A. WEINHEIMER, JR., P. C., JEREMY P. COHEN, KOVARIK, ELLISON & MATHIS, P.C., PEMBERTON, SORLIE, RUFER, & KERSHNER, PLLP, FAFINSKI MARK & JOHNSON, P.A., BARRETT, EASTERDAY, CUNNINGHAM & ESELGROTH, LLP, ATLEE HALL, LLP, ANGEL, ISAACSON & TRACY, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, HABUSH HABUSH & ROTTIER, S.C., LAW OFFICE OF HAMMELL & MURPHY PLLP, DREW YOUNG LAW, ALLEN, STEIN & DURBIN, PC, WADLER, PERCHES, HUNDL & KERLICK, MORNING LAW OFFICE LLC, ROBINSON, CURPHEY & O'CONNEL, LLC, MYERS HOCKEMEYER & MCNAGNY LLP, BLOOM GATES & WHITELEATHER, LLP, KC COHEN, LAWYER, PC, SCHWARZ LAW OFFICE, WILLIAM F. SMITH, HAMPTON & ROYCE, L.C., EICH, VAN DYKE, WERDAN & STEGER P.C., WEEKS & BRUCKER, LTD, KIRK LAW FIRM, LAW OFFICE OF BRENT GAINES, WILLIS & WILLIS, QUIRK & HUNTER, PC, MALONEY & CAMPOLO, CUSTY LAW FIRM, LLC, MITCHELL C. CHANEY, BORING & BORING, PC, PATRICK A. ELWARD, STOERZBACH LAW OFFICE, P.C., CRITCHFIELD CRITCHFIELD & JOHSON, LTD., THE LAW OFFICE OF ROB TULLY PC, REILING TEDER & SCHRIER, LLC, ENDURANCE LAW GROUP PLC, LANGDON & EMISON ATTORNEYS AT LAW, DAVIS & CAMPBELL, LLC, KNUTH LAW OFFICE, MINER & LEMON, LLP, FRUNDT & JOHNSON, LTD., KEULER, KELLY HUTCHINS & BLANKENSHIP, LLP, BROWN, DEPREZ & JOHNSON, P.A., LAW OFFICE OF MIKE CRANE, LLP, W. CALLOWAY HUFFAKER, CALL & GENTRY LAW GROUP, MORGAN & MEYERS, PLC, WILLADSEN & NEAL LLC, LAW OFFICE OF LESTER WEINSTINE, P.C., MICHAEL GOSS, RILEY-TANIS & ASSOCIATES PLLC, DEBORAH SMITH MCCLURE, P.C., COOTS, HENKE & WHEELER, LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER, REICHERT WENNER, P.A., BROCK LAW OFFICES PC LLO, LAMKIN & LAMKIN, P.C., FLYNN & SULLIVAN PC, LAW OFFICE OF EZEQUIEL REYNA, JR., ANTHONY O'HANLON, P.C., MARTZ & LUCAS, LLC, INGEBRITSON & ASSOCIATES, P.A., HOVLAND & RASMUS, PLLC, STONE LAW OFFICE, P.L.L.C., ROB TULLY LAW FIRM, LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER H. POYNOR, SCHMITTINGER & RODRIGUEZ, P.A., GROSBOLL, BECKER, TICE & BARR, PATTERSON COMER, BRENT C. EMBREY, MARK A. ROEDER, MORRISSEY, MORRISSEY & DALLUGE, CROSS LAW FIRM, LLC, NIDEY ERDAHL TINDAL & FISCHER, PLC, COLE LAW OFFICE, CORNELL LAW OFFICE, CLINE FARRELL CHRISTIE & LEE, P.C., JOHNSON & MOCK, PC LLO, TAYLOR & RUHNKE, PC, STOUT LAW GROUP, JEFFERSON & BREWER, LLP, CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP, CULBERTSON & ALLEN, LLC, MEADOR & CRUMP, P.A., GORDON & ASSOCIATES, P.C., THE LAW OFFICE OF SAMUEL W. BEARMAN, L.C., MICHAEL J. GALANIS, LAW OFFICE OF ADAM CRAWSHAW, KELLEY LAW FIRM, PC, WAGNER REESE, LLP, BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS LLP, LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART, WALLACE LAW, DAVE O'BRIEN LAW, FITZGERALD LAW P.A., MORRIS LAING EVANS BROCK & KENNEDY, RAY A. FERGUSON & ASSOCIATES, LTD., MUSKE, MUSKE, SUHRHOFF LTD, JASON SCHUTTE, KOEPKE & HILTABRAND ATTORNEY AT LAW, THE MCQUADES CO. LPA, RICCOLO, SEMELROTH, & HENNINGSEN, P.C., HART BELL, LLC, PEMBERTON LAW FIRM, LAW OFFICES OF LEONEL ALEJANDRO PC, ROBERTS LAW OFFICE, ALLEN WELLMAN MCNEW HARVEY, LLP, THE LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. LAPOINTE, P.C., DEWALD DEAVER, P.C., IRVIN L. MASCHING, LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY E. TONORE, BRAU LAW OFFICE, HAWKINS LAW, PC, PATTON BROWN LAW, PLLC, MAYNES LAW OFFICE, PEN COSBY, PAGEL & WEIKUM, PLLP, KATZ & KORIN, P.C., KUHLMAN & LUCAS, LLC, MIDWEST AG SOLUTIONS LLC, KRUSE & DAKIN LLP, GEORGE M. BISHOP, LIND JENSEN SULLIVAN & PETERSON P.A., ALERDING CASTOR HEWITT LLP, LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS A. NOE, III, THE PRUNEDA LAW FIRM, PLLC, VAN KLEY & WALKER, LLC, FELLHEIMER LAW FIRM LTD., ALEX KOENIGS, LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM R. SHIRK, OBEAR, OVERHOLSER, HUFFER & RIDER, LLC, BRAND & MORELOCK, THE LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS R. FIELDS, P.A., THE LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE P. ESCOBEDO & ASSOCIATES, VIRTUS LAW PLLC, TULLY LAW OFFICE, PC, HOSTETTER & ASSOCIATES, TUCKER & TUCKER, P.C., WOLF ARDIS, P.C., DELZER LAW OFFICE, CARY, WELCH, HICKMAN & HAWK, LLP, MARCH, MCMILLAN, DEJOODE & DUVALL, P.C., BYRON STONE, PLLC, MOORE, SUSLER, MCNUTT & WRIGLEY, LLC, GREGG NEAL, BRIAN FITZWATER LAW OFFICE, WAYNE J. LENNINGTON, ELLIS & JUDD LAW OFFICE, LLC, MAILANDER LAW OFFICE, OVERBOE LAW, DAVID R. ADELMAN, BOSCHMA LAW OFFICE, BARBER, SEGATTO, HOFFEE, WILKE & CATE, SONENBERG LAW LLC, PLEWS SHADLEY RACHER & BRAUN LLP, PICKNER LAW OFFICE, COPLEY ROTH & WILSON, LLC, HUME, SMITH, GEDDES, GREEN & SIMMONS, LLP, CHARNETSKI, LACINA & CLOWER, LLP, WALK & MURPHY, PLC, SWAIM LAW FIRM, PLLC, RANDLE & SAMMONS, P.C., SCHULTZ LAW, KEATON & KEATON PC, RICHARD D. LARSON, P.C., SOUNDING BOARD LEGAL, S.C., KRAMER LAW, LLC, MERCHO CAUGHEY & DELAY, SMITH GARDNER SLUSKY LAZER POHREN & ROGERS LLP, PATTON HOVERSTEN & BERG P.A, BURNS CRONAUER & BROWN LLP, COCKERILL & COCKERILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, HENSLEY LEGAL GROUP PC, KOENIG LAW FIRM, MAZZANTI LAW OFFICE, PLLC, FOREMAN WATSON HOLTREY, LEE J. LEWIS, LAW OFFICES OF HANS A. BUEHLER, LLC, ESPE LAW PLLC, VRIEZELAAR, TIGGES, EDINGTON, BOTTARO, BODEN, & ROSS, L.L.P., CRESS LAW GROUP, PC, DANIEL M. HOMOLKA, P.A., JOHNSON, KRAMER, MULHOLLAND, COCHRANE, DRISCOLL & COCHRANE, P.L.C., LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD HOFFMAN, KITTELSEN, BARRY, WELLINGTON, THOMPSON, & SCHLUESCHE, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, UNDERWOOD LAW FIRM, PC, CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC, PATTON, HOVERSTEN & BERG, P.A., WOODS ROGERS PLC, WOODARD LAW PC., WORTH LAW FIRM, WRIGHT & SCHULTE LLC, WRIGHT SCHIMMEL LLC, WYLAND, HUMPHREY & CLEVENGER LLP, YIRA LAW OFFICE, LTD and ZEILINGER LAW OFFICE
Defendant / Appellee: SYNGENTA BIOTECHNOLOGY, INC., SYNGENTA SEEDS, LLC, FKA Syngenta Seeds, Inc., SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION AG, SYNGENTA CORPORATION, SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC and SYNGENTA AG
Appellee: HOLLAND LAW FIRM, GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C., MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC, BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C., BATTLE & WINN LLP, WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC, PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P., ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON, THE GIBBS LAW FIRM, BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE, BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C., ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP, ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP, BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND, WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A., JAKE W. BROOKS ATTORNEY AT LAW, PAUL LLP, STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP, SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN, MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP, HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON, KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C., WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C., BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES, EMERSON POYNTER LLP, LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP, SNEED LANG PC, DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC, CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P., BATTS, BATTS & BELL, LLP, BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC, PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, L.L.P., BOHRER BRADY LLC, LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS, GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC, WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP, CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN, SAEED & LITTLE, LLP, WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC, WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK, SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C., EMERSON SCOTT LLP, BOLEN ROBINSON & ELLIS, LLP, SEEGER WEISS LLP, WEXLER WALLACE LLP, HODGE LAW FIRM, WHALEY LAW FIRM, MILLER SCHIRGER LLC, THRASH LAW FIRM, P.A., BASSFORD REMELE, P.A., STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON LLP, ROTH LAW FIRM, SCHWEBEL GOETZ & SIEBEN PA, SCOTT POYNTER (POYNTER LAW GROUP), SPEER LAW FIRM, PC, GRAY REED & MCGRAW LLP, BROOKS PIERCE, MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL, SIMMONS HANLY CONROY LLC, LUNDBERG LAW FIRM PLC, SOPER LEDDIN LAW FIRM, PC, BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC, CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, PLLC, PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON LLP, GREENE ESPEL PLLP, WELLER, GREEN, TOUPS & TERRELL, LLP, RICHARD L. COFFMAN, P.C., ABREO & CARTER, BARRETT WYLIE, LLC, W. DEAN BELK, JR., BIGHAM LAW FIRM, BUTLER SNOW, LLP, THOMAS P. CALHOUN, III, CONRAD F. CROPSEY, DURRETT, ARKEMA, GERSON & GILL, P.C., DYE SNYDER, LLP, NATHAN A. EAST, ESTES & KENNEDY LAW OFFICES, PLLC, FISHERBROYLES, LLP, CHRIS W. FITZGERALD, GAMBLE & RUSSELL, P.C., GREAK LAW, P.C., HAJJAR PETERS, LLP, HALLETT, HALLETT & NAGEL, TERRIE HARMAN, AARON D. HOVAN, JOHN L. JERNIGAN, III, JINKS, CROW & DICKSON, P.C., JOHN M. TOTTEN, P.C., KIZER, BONDS, HUGHES & BOWEN, PLLC, JOSEPH F. MANAK, E. RUDOLPH MCINTYRE, MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE, ORLANS, P.C., OTTS, MOORE, COALE, GODWIN, STEARNS & DARBY, JAMES M. PIETZ, RAY, WINTON & KELLEY, PLLC, RICHARDSON, PATRICK, WESTBROOK & BRICKMAN, LLC, RICHARD RUSSELL, SLAVEN LAW GROUP, JOHN E. TARBURTON, TEEL & MARONEY, PLC, WILLIAM THOMAS, THOMPSON, GARRETT & HINES, TROUSDALE RYAN, P.C., KENNETH G. WALSH, WHITE & ALLEN, P.A. and HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC
Case Number: 19-3021
Filed: January 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order [10893351] Order filed by Judges Holmes, Bacharach and McHugh granting attorney Rachel E. Schwartz's motion to withdraw as counsel. Served on 02/16/2022. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002, 21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111] [Entered: 02/16/2022 11:15 AM]
February 15, 2022 [10893137] Motion filed by Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3174, 21-3111 for attorney Rachel E. Schwartz to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 02/15/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002, 21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111] RES [Entered: 02/15/2022 02:51 PM]
July 26, 2021 [10846201] Appellant's supplemental brief filed by Hossley-Embry, LLP and Redenbaugh & Mohr, PC in 19-3178. Served on 07/26/2021. Manner of Service: email. Word/page count: 6. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. --[Edited 08/13/2021 by MLB to remove from 21-3020, 21-3021, 21-3022, 21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111, 21-3121][19-3178, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002, 20-3257] DAH [Entered: 07/26/2021 09:37 PM]
January 25, 2021 [10802425] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo in 19-3280, O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000. Served on 01/25/2021. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3079, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3280, 20-3002, 19-3032, 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] DC [Entered: 01/25/2021 10:00 AM]
January 20, 2021 [10801305] Calendar Acknowledgment Form filed by Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC and James J. Thompson, Jr. in 19-3174. Served on 01/20/2021. Manner of Service: email. [19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002, 20-3172, 20-3257]--[Edited 01/20/2021 by DJD to remove from 20-3257 and 01/22/2021 by SLS to remove from 20-3172.] CJN [Entered: 01/20/2021 10:49 AM]
January 7, 2021 [10798187] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting the Consent Motion to Dismiss Watts Guerra's Appeals. Text only entry - no attachment. Please see case termination entry for the order. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:37 AM]
January 7, 2021 [10798192] Rule 33 case terminated. FRAP 42. Procedural termination without judicial action. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:48 AM]
January 7, 2021 [10798196] Mandate issued. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:53 AM]
January 6, 2021 [10797892] Motion filed by Appellant Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172, 20-3000 to dismiss case. Served on: 01/06/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172, 20-3000] JAL [Entered: 01/06/2021 12:53 PM]
January 6, 2021 [10797792] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. The Motion to Enjoin the District Court from Granting the Motion for Disbursement of Funds from the Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Expenses and Attorney Fee Awards is denied. Served on 01/06/2021. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002]--[Edited 01/07/2021 by JM to edit docket text.] [Entered: 01/06/2021 09:07 AM]
January 4, 2021 [10797035] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Upon consideration, and at the specific direction of the court, the Motion for Limited Remand filed by Watts Guerra, LLP, Kansas MDL Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel, Minnesota Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel, and Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC (Movants) is granted. Nos. 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172 and 20-3000 are remanded as set forth in the attached order. Movants shall file a status report or appropriate motion within 14 days (01/19/2021) from the date of this order. The court will proceed with setting all 16 appeals for oral argument in March 2021. The motion by Shields, Byrd and Hossley-Embrey for an order vacating the district court's prior allocations orders in their entirety is denied. Served on 01/04/2021. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 01/04/2021 11:41 AM]
December 28, 2020 [10795989] Response filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3279, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, White & Allen, P.A. and FisherBroyles, LLP in 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002 to MOTION OF SHIELDS LAW GROUP, LLC, PAUL BYRD LAW FIRM PLLC, AND HOSLEY-EMBRY, LLP, TO ENJOIN THE DISTRICT COURT FROM GRANTING THE MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS FROM THE QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND TO PAY EXPENSES AND ATTORNEY FEE AWARDS [Doc.010110452388]. Served on 12/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 12/28/2020 09:17 PM]
December 24, 2020 [10795561] Reply filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002, Kansas Co-Lead Counsel, Minnesota Class Counsel, Heninger Garrison Davis to Shields Appellants' Joint Opposition to the Motion for Limited Remand and Motion for an Order Vacating the District Court's Prior Allocation Orders; Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel's Response in Opposition to Joint Motion for Limited Remand. Served on 12/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 12/24/2020 08:08 PM]
December 23, 2020 [10795532] Response filed by Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC and James J. Thompson, Jr. in 19-3174, Hossley-Embry, LLP to Motion for Limited Remand (Doc. #010110452220). Served on 12/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 12/23/2020 05:40 PM]
December 23, 2020 [10795542] Response filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3279, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, White & Allen, P.A. and FisherBroyles, LLP in 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002 to JOINT MOTION FOR LIMITED REMAND OF THE APPEALS FILED BY WATTS GUERRA, LLP [AND SETTLEMENT CLASS COUNSEL]. Served on 12/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 12/23/2020 10:38 PM]
December 18, 2020 [10794372] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. The Joint Motion for Limited Remand is Taken Under Advisement. The request for expedited briefing is granted as modified. Any opposition to the Joint Motion for Limited Remand shall be filed on or before December 23, 2020. Any reply to the opposition shall be filed on or before December 28, 2020. All parties are reminded that Appeal No. 19-3278 was dismissed on June 2, 2020. The parties should no longer include No. 19-3278 in the captions on their filings. Served on 12/18/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 12/18/2020 02:11 PM]
December 18, 2020 [10794431] Response filed by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000 to Motion to Enjoin the District Court From Granting the Motion for Disbursement of Funds From the Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Expenses and Attorney Fee Awards. Served on 12/18/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 12/18/2020 04:37 PM]
December 16, 2020 [10793593] Motion filed by Appellants Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC, James J. Thompson, Jr., Hossley-Embry, LLP to Enjoin the District Court from Granting the Motion for Disbursement of Funds from the Qualified Settlement Fund to Pay Expenses and Attorney Fee Awards. Served on: 12/16/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] --[Edited docket text and to remove from 19-3278 12/21/2020 by SLS.] CJN [Entered: 12/16/2020 09:34 AM]
December 16, 2020 [10793656] Notice filed by Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel of intent to file opposition to motion for limited remand and objection to request to require expedited briefing. Served on 12/16/2020 by email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] --[Edited docket text 12/16/2020 and to remove from 19-3278 12/21/2020 by SLS.] EAI [Entered: 12/16/2020 11:07 AM]
December 16, 2020 [10793845] Notice filed by Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel of intent to file response to motion to enjoin the district court from granting the motion for disbursement of funds from the qualified settlement fund to pay expenses and attorney fee awards. Served on 12/16/2020 by email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] --[Edited 12/21/2020 by SLS to condense docket text and remove from 19-3278.] EAI [Entered: 12/16/2020 06:24 PM]
December 16, 2020 [10793844] Joinder of Toups/Coffman Notice of Intent to File Opposition to Motion for Limited Remand Filed December 15, 2020 and Objection to the Movants Request to Require Expedited Briefing of any Opposition to the Limited-Remand Motion (Doc. # 010110452539). filed by Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC and Shields Law Group, LLC in 19-3174, Hossley-Embry, LLP in 19-3178. Served on 12/16/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] --[Edited 12/21/2020 by SLS to remove from 19-3278.] CJN [Entered: 12/16/2020 06:19 PM]
December 15, 2020 [10793426] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. These appeals will be set for argument during the courts March 2021 term of court. Counsel will be notified of the exact date and time of oral argument at a later date. Served on 10/15/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] --[Edited 12/21/2020 by SLS to remove from 19-3278.] [Entered: 12/15/2020 02:56 PM]
December 15, 2020 [10793488] Joint Motion filed by Appellee Stueve Siegel Hanson for limited remand of the Watts Guerra appeals and for expedited briefing. Served on: 12/15/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] --[Edited docket text 12/16/2020 and 12/21/2020 to remove from 19-3278 by SLS.] BW [Entered: 12/15/2020 07:31 PM]
December 2, 2020 [10790436] Supplemental authority filed by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000. Served on 12/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] --[Edited 12/21/2020 by SLS to remove from 19-3278.] BW [Entered: 12/02/2020 01:28 PM]
October 20, 2020 [10779875] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring Appellants' motion for leave to file additional briefing [ # 10777883-2 ] and Appellees' joint response in opposition [ # 10778802-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 10/20/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 10/20/2020 12:56 PM]
October 15, 2020 [10778802] Response filed by Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3079, 19-3082, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Clark, Love & Hutson, PLLC, Phipps Anderson Deacon LLP and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000 to Motion for Leave to File Additional Briefing. Served on 10/15/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 10/15/2020 02:39 PM]
October 13, 2020 [10777883] Motion filed by Appellants Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC and James J. Thompson, Jr. in 19-3174, Hossley-Embry, LLP for leave to file a supplemental brief. Served on: 10/13/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes..--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278.] [19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:16 PM]
September 28, 2020 [10774791] Paper copies of CONTINGENT CROSS-APPEAL REPLY BRIEF OF KANSAS CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL received.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 08:48 AM]
September 28, 2020 [10774780] Paper copies of Reply and Response Brief of Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel & Hossley-Embry (Kansas Pool Appellants) received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 08:29 AM]
September 28, 2020 [10774872] Paper copies of RESPONSE BRIEF OF HENINGER APPELLEE TO CONTINGENT CROSS-APPEAL BRIEF OF KANSAS CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:18 AM]
September 28, 2020 [10774801] Paper copies of RESPONSE BRIEF OF JOINT APPELLEES received.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 09:00 AM]
September 28, 2020 [10774881] Paper copies of OPENING BRIEF OF TOUPS/COFFMAN PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL & HOSSLEY-EMBRY (KANSAS POOL APPELLANTS) received..--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:25 AM]
September 28, 2020 [10774855] Paper copies of CONTINGENT CROSS-APPEAL BRIEF OF KANSAS CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:01 AM]
September 25, 2020 [10774937] Paper copies of CONTINGENT CROSS-APPEAL RESPONSE OF MINNESOTA CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:25 AM]
September 25, 2020 [10774931] Paper copies of Illinois Appellants and the Clark/Phipps Groups Combined Reply On Direct Appeal, Response to Kansas and Minnesota Appellants Briefs, and Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:18 AM]
September 25, 2020 [10774981] Paper copies of Illinois Appellants' Brief received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 12:49 PM]
September 24, 2020 [10774784] Paper copies of CONSOLIDATED REPLY BRIEF AND CROSS-APPEAL RESPONSE BRIEF OF MINNESOTA APPELLANTS WATTS GUERRA, LLP, PAUL BYRD LAW FIRM, PLLC AND SHIELDS LAW GROUP, LLC received.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 08:33 AM]
September 24, 2020 [10774941] Paper copies of CONSOLIDATED OPENING BRIEF OF MINNESOTA APPELLANTS WATTS GUERRA, LLP, PAUL BYRD LAW FIRM, PLLC AND SHIELDS LAW GROUP, LLC, received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:38 AM]
September 23, 2020 [10772863] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by Illinois Appellants and the Clark/Phipps Groups Combined Reply On Direct Appeal, Response to Kansas and Minnesota Appellants Briefs, and Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments. Paper copies are due 9/30/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 12:28 PM]
September 23, 2020 [10772654] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellants Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo, The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland (Illinois Appellants Brief) is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments. Paper copies due by 9/30/2020. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 07:50 AM]
September 23, 2020 [10772721] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by RESPONSE BRIEF OF JOINT APPELLEES is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments. Paper copies are due 9/30/2020. (Text Only - No Attachment). --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 09:21 AM]
September 23, 2020 [10772877] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by OPENING BRIEF OF TOUPS/COFFMAN PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL & HOSSLEY-EMBRY (KANSAS POOL APPELLANTS) is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments. Paper copies are due 9/30/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 01:14 PM]
September 23, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] This event will be re-docketed. [10772822] Minute order filed - Contingent Cross-Appeal Brief Of Kansas Co-Lead Counsel is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing Paper copies of the brief due 09/30/2020 by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, et al. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082] [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:17 AM]
September 23, 2020 [10772891] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by REPLY AND RESPONSE BRIEF OF TOUPS/COFFMAN PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL & HOSSLEY-EMBRY (KANSAS POOL APPELLANTS) is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments. Paper copies 9/30/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 01:40 PM]
September 23, 2020 [10773055] Errata sheet filed by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, Henninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002 to Response Brief of Heninger Appellee to Contingent Cross-Appeal of Kansas Co-Lead Plaintiffs (Dkt. 010110411393). Served on 09/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] WLG [Entered: 09/23/2020 04:50 PM]
September 23, 2020 [10772922] Minute order filed - The Contingent CrossAppeal Brief Of Kansas CoLead Counsel is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing. Paper copies of the brief due 09/30/2020 by Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP and Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C. (This is a redockted event.) (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082] [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:09 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772379] Notice filed by Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC and James J. Thompson, Jr. in 19-3174. Served on 09/22/2020 by email. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 09/22/2020 12:06 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772401] Minute order filed - the Consolidated Opening Brief, and the Consolidated Reply Brief and Cross-Appeal Response Brief of MN Appellants Watts Guerra, Paul Byrd Law firm and Shields Law Group are accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments. Paper copies now due by 9/29/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/22/2020 12:24 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772448] Minute order filed - Shields Law Group and Paul Byrd Law Firm's opening and reply briefs are accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/22/2020 01:59 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772474] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal Brief filed by Heninger Garrison Davis (IL Counsel). Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: US mail, email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modfiy brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] WLG [Entered: 09/22/2020 02:36 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772375] Separate Reply Brief filed by Byrd/Shields. Served on 09/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 09/22/2020 12:01 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772412] Minute order filed - the 2nd brief on cross-appeal filed by Minnesota Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments. Paper copies due by 9/29/20 from Minnesota Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel Gustafson Gluek PLLC. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/22/2020 12:54 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772311] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal Brief filed by MN Co-Lead Counsel (except Watts Guerra). Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DEG [Entered: 09/22/2020 10:17 AM]
September 22, 2020 [10772538] Conditional Cross-Appeal Reply Brief filed by KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel. Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 09/22/2020 03:45 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772252] Consolidated Opening brief brief filed by MN Appellants (Watts Guerra & Bird/Shields). Served on 09/22/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:10 AM]
September 22, 2020 [10772259] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal and Reply filed by MN Appellants (Watts Guerra & Byrd/Shields). Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: US mail, email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:27 AM]
September 22, 2020 [10772263] Errata sheet filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002, Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC and Shields Law Group, LLC to Minnesota Appellants' Opening Brief. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:31 AM]
September 22, 2020 [10772373] Separate Opening brief filed by MN Appellants (Byrd/Shields). Served on 09/22/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 09/22/2020 11:57 AM]
September 22, 2020 [10772566] Conditional Cross-Appeal Brief filed by KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel. Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:24 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772598] Reply brief filed by IL Appellants (Eiland & Demerath). Served on 09/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JD [Entered: 09/22/2020 05:06 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772606] Errata sheet filed by Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo in 19-3284, Clark Love Huston; Phipps Anderson Deacon LLP; Meyers & Flowers, LLC (Counsel for The Clark/Phipps Group) and The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, PC (Counsel for The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland) to Illinois Appellants and the Clark/Phipps Group Combined Reply on Direct Appeal, Response to Kansas and Minnesota Appellants Briefs, and Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal, originally filed with the Court on August 19, 2020. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/22/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JD [Entered: 09/22/2020 05:27 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772611] Consolidated Opening Brief filed by KS Appellants (Toups/Coffman & Hossley/Embry). Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: US mail, email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 09/22/2020 08:08 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772613] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal and Reply Brief filed by KS Appellants (Toups/Coffman & Hossley/Embry). Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: US mail, email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 09/22/2020 08:28 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772595] Consolidated Opening Brief filed by IL Appellants (Eiland & Demerath). Served on 09/22/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JD [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:56 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772586] Notice filed by Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 20-3002. Served on 09/22/2020 by email.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:40 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772564] Minute order filed - the Contingent Cross-Appeal Reply Brief of Kansas Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments. Paper copies due by 9/29/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:24 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772556] Minute order filed - the Response Brief of Heninger Appellee to Contingent Cross-Appeal Brief of Kansas Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:08 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772573] Joint Appellees' Response Brief filed by KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel, Heninger Garrison (IL Counsel), MN Co-Lead Counsel. Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:30 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772577] Errata sheet filed by Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000 to. Served on 09/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:35 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772616] Errata sheet filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3279, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, White & Allen, P.A. and FisherBroyles, LLP in 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002 to. Served on 09/22/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:59 PM]
September 21, 2020 [10774863] Paper copies of appellant brief and reply brief received from Johnson Becker, PLLC. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:07 AM]
September 18, 2020 [10771455] Opening brief filed by Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Served on 09/18/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify title of brief.][19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] TJB [Entered: 09/18/2020 10:31 AM]
September 18, 2020 [10771492] Minute order filed - the opening and reply briefs submitted by Appellant Johnson Becker, PLLC (No. 19-3175) are accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments and number of volumes filed (for appendices). Paper copies of opening and reply briefs due 09/25/2020 by Johnson Becker, PLLC. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174] [Entered: 09/18/2020 11:24 AM]
September 18, 2020 [10771461] Reply brief filed by Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Served on 09/18/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify title of brief.][19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] TJB [Entered: 09/18/2020 10:35 AM]
September 18, 2020 [10772864] Paper copies of the Joint Appendix and 2 USB drives (per 4/6/20 order) received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 12:40 PM]
September 17, 2020 [10771242] Supplemental preliminary record filed. Contents: Motions for reconsideration.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/17/2020 01:48 PM]
September 15, 2020 [10770372] Joint Deferred Appendix filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172, 20-3000 (Vols. 1-14). Total number of volumes filed: 32. Served on 09/15/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. .--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify appendix title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 09/15/2020 10:55 AM]
September 15, 2020 [10770377] Joint Deferred Appendix filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172, 20-3000 (Vols. 15-32). Total number of volumes filed: 32. Served on 09/15/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:12 AM]
September 15, 2020 [10770471] Minute order filed - the joint appendix submitted is accepted for filing. One paper copy of each volume shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing. (Text Only - No Attachment)--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/15/2020 01:40 PM]
September 14, 2020 [10770136] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying without prejudice to renewal the joint motion for leave to file additional briefing filed by Appellants Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC, and Hossley-Embrey, LLP. See order. Served on 09/14/2020.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/14/2020 02:44 PM]
September 14, 2020 [10770034] Motion filed by Appellants Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC and James J. Thompson, Jr. in 19-3174, Hossley-Embry, LLP for leave to file a supplemental brief. Served on: 09/14/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:56 AM]
September 1, 2020 [10767011] Minute order filed - the Conditional Cross-Appeal Reply brief submitted by Kansas MDL Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel is accepted for filing. Paper copies are not required per this court's 4/06/20 order. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/01/2020 11:48 AM]
September 1, 2020 [10767041] Minute order filed -.Pursuant to this court's 4/06/20 order, the joint appendix remains due 9/15/20 and the final briefs shall be filed by 9/22/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/01/2020 12:29 PM]
September 1, 2020 [10766952] Conditional Cross-appeal Reply Brief filed by KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel. Served on: 09/01/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes..--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 09/01/2020 10:28 AM]
August 26, 2020 [10765610] Paper copies of appellant's reply brief received from Johnson Bekcer, PLLC --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:43 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764247] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC is accepted for filing. (Text Only - No Attachment)--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/20/2020 08:12 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764239] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by Gustafson Gluek, PLLC, Minnesota Co-Lead Counsel is accepted for filing. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 08/20/2020 by MLB - no paper copies due at this time]--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/20/2020 07:54 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764306] Minute order filed - the Consolidated Reply/Response Brief (third brief on cross-appeal) filed by the Minnesota Appellants Watts Guerra LLP, Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, and Shields Law Group, LLC is accepted for filing. Paper copies need not be submitted per this court's 04/06/2020 order. (Text Only - No Attachment)--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/20/2020 09:19 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764270] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellants Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC and James J. Thompson, Jr. is accepted for filing. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/20/2020 08:41 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764316] Minute order filed - the Reply and Response Brief submitted by Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel & Hossley-Embry (Kansas Pool Appellants) is accepted for filing. Paper copies need not be submitted per the order of 04/06/2020. (Text Only - No Attachment)--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/20/2020 09:46 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764322] Minute order filed - Pursuant to the 04/06/2020 order, the Conditional Cross-Appeal Reply Brief (fourth brief on cross-appeal) of the Kansas MDL Co-Lead Counsel is due on 09/01/2020. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/20/2020 09:55 AM]
August 19, 2020 [10764195] Separate Reply Brief filed by Byrd/Shields. Served on 08/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 08/19/2020 04:55 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764091] Reply brief filed by Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Served on 08/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] TJB [Entered: 08/19/2020 02:01 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764073] Response to Contingent Cross Appeal Brief filed by MN Co-Lead Counse (except Watts Guerra). Served on: 08/19/2020. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 08/20/2020 by MLB to clarify docket text] --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DEG [Entered: 08/19/2020 01:28 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764206] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellant Johnson Becker, PLLC is accepted for filing. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/19/2020 06:04 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764122] Reply brief filed by IL Appellants (Eiland & Demerath). Served on 08/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JD [Entered: 08/19/2020 02:42 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764210] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal Brief filed by Heninger Garrson Davis (IL Counsel). Served on: 08/19/2020. Manner of service: US mail, email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 08/20/2020 by MLB to clarify docket text].--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] WLG [Entered: 08/19/2020 06:15 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764207] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal and Reply filed by MN Appellants (Watts Guerra & Byrd/Shields). Served on: 08/19/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] --[Edited docket text 08/20/2020 by SLS] JAL [Entered: 08/19/2020 06:07 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764208] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellants Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo in 19-3284, Clark Love Huston; Phipps Anderson Deacon LLP; Meyers & Flowers, LLC (Counsel for The Clark/Phipps Group)is accepted for filing. (Text Only - No Attachment)--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/19/2020 06:12 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764209] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal and Reply filed by KS Appellants (Toups/Coffman & Hossley/Embry). Served on: 08/19/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] --[Edited docket text 08/20/2020 by SLS.] EAI [Entered: 08/19/2020 06:14 PM]
July 31, 2020 [10759282] Notice of deficient first brief on cross-appeal received from (Kansas CoLead Plaintiffs' Counsel) Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Type of deficiency: Missing order(s) appealed. See attached letter for specifics. Corrected brief due on 08/03/2020 for Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002]--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [Entered: 07/31/2020 07:28 AM]
July 31, 2020 [10759383] Minute order filed - the Conditional Cross-Appeal Brief of Kansas CoLead Plaintiffs' Counsel is accepted for filing. The Reply and/or Response to Cross-Appeal Briefs shall be filed by 8/19/20 per this court's 4/6/20 Order. (Text Only - No Attachment)--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 07/31/2020 11:43 AM]
July 31, 2020 [10759338] Conditional Cross Appeal Brief filed by KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel. Served on: 07/31/2020. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 08/20/2020 by MLB to clarify docket text] --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 07/31/2020 09:56 AM]
July 31, 2020 [10759411] Motion filed by Appellants Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC and James J. Thompson, Jr. in 19-3174, Watts Guerra LLP to reconsider Minnesota Appellants' Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Order.. Served on: 07/31/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 07/31/2020 12:23 PM]
July 31, 2020 [10759577] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court on the Minnesota Appellants Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Order. The motion is unopposed. Upon consideration, the motion is granted. The Minnesota Appellants may file a consolidated reply brief limited to 6,000 words and Shields/Byrd may file a separate reply brief limited to 1,500 words. Both reply briefs shall be filed and served on or before August 19, 2020. Served on 07/31/2020. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 07/31/2020 04:35 PM]
July 30, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket.Brief refiled 7/31/20 [DD] [10759160] First brief on cross-appeal filed by Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002. Served on: 07/30/2020. Manner of service: email, US mail. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:12 PM]
July 21, 2020 [10756670] Minute order filed - the consolidated response brief submitted by joint appellees is accepted for filing. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002]--[Edited 07/21/2020 by DJD to remove deadline for paper copies]--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [Entered: 07/21/2020 07:57 AM]
July 20, 2020 [10756582] Joint Appellees' Response Brief filed by KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel, Heninger Garrison (IL Counsel), MN Co-Lead Counsel. Served on: 07/20/2020. Manner of service: email, US mail. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 07/20/2020 04:13 PM]
June 23, 2020 [10749244] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting motion of Jason M. Milne to withdraw as counsel for the Clark/Phipps Group. Served on 06/23/2020. Text only entry - no attachment.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/23/2020 08:33 AM]
June 22, 2020 [10749163] Motion of Jason M. Milne to withdraw as counsel for the Clark/Phipps Group. Served on 06/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. .--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/22/2020 03:49 PM]
June 4, 2020 [10745151] Consolidated Opening Brief filed by IL Appellants (Eiland & Demerath). Served on 06/04/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes..--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278 and edit brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JD [Entered: 06/04/2020 02:20 PM]
June 4, 2020 [10745202] Minute order filed - The Illinois Appellants' brief is accepted for filing. Per the Court's General Order of March 16, 2020, paper copies are not required at this time. Parties may be directed to file paper copies at a later date. (Text Only - No Attachment) .--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/04/2020 03:39 PM]
June 3, 2020 [10744884] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellant Johnson Becker PLLC is accepted for filing. Per the Court's General Order of March 16, 2020, paper copies are not required at this time. Parties may be directed to file paper copies at a later date. (Text Only - No Attachment).--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278.] [19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/03/2020 04:14 PM]
June 3, 2020 [10744877] Opening brief filed by Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Served on 06/03/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278 and modify title of brief.] [19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] TJB [Entered: 06/03/2020 03:48 PM]
June 2, 2020 [10744328] Minute order filed - The Toups/Coffman & Hossley-Embry opening brief is accepted for filing. Per the Court's General Order of March 16, 2020, paper copies are not required at this time. Parties may be directed to file paper copies at a later date. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/02/2020 08:30 AM]
June 2, 2020 [10744306] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by the Minnesota appellants Watts Gierra, Paul Byrd Law Firm and Shields Law Group is accepted for filing. Per the Court's General Order of March 16, 2020, paper copies are not required at this time. Parties may be directed to file paper copies at a later date. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3082, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/02/2020 07:59 AM]
June 2, 2020 [10744343] Notice of appellants' deficient brief received from Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C., Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo. See attached letter for specifics. Appellants' corrected brief due on 06/05/2020 for Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C., Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/02/2020 08:51 AM]
June 1, 2020 [10744231] Consolidated Opening Brief filed by MN Appellants (Watts Guerra & Byrd/Shields). Served on 06/01/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/22/2020 by LAB to modify brief title.] [19-3082, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 06/01/2020 04:34 PM]
June 1, 2020 [10744163] Notice of appellant's deficient brief received from Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Type of deficiency: Missing order appealed. See attached letter for specifics. Appellant's brief due on 06/04/2020 for Johnson Becker, PLLC [19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/01/2020 02:51 PM]
June 1, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket.Corrected brief filed 6/03/20) [DD] [10744114] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Served on 06/01/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] TJB [Entered: 06/01/2020 01:50 PM]
June 1, 2020 [10744254] Separate Opening Brief filed by MN Appellants (Byrd/Shields). Served on 06/01/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/22/2020 by LAB to edit brief title.][19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 06/01/2020 05:59 PM]
June 1, 2020 [10744265] Consolidated Opening Brief filed by KS Appellants (Toups/Coffman & Hossley Embry). Served on 06/01/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/22/2020 by LAB to modify brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 06/01/2020 08:50 PM]
June 1, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] Brief refiled. [10744255] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo in 19-3284, The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland. Served on 06/01/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002]--[Edited 06/02/2020 by KLP - cited as deficient.]--[Edited 06/04/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; brief refiled.] JD [Entered: 06/01/2020 06:07 PM]
June 1, 2020 [10744269] Notice filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002. Served on 06/01/2020 by email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 06/01/2020 10:37 PM]
April 6, 2020 [10730918] Order filed by Clerk of the Court adopting the following briefing schedule: Stage 1: Appellants' Consolidated Opening Briefs (4) are due 06/01/2020; Stage 2: Joint Appellees' Consolidated Response Brief (1) is due 07/20/2020; Stage 3: Conditional Cross-Appeal Opening Brief (1) is due 07/30/2020; Stage 4: Reply and/or Response to Cross-Appeal Briefs (6) are due 08/19/2020; and Stage 5: Conditional CrossAppeal Reply (1) is due 09/01/2020. The request to file a joint deferred appendix as well as the request for an exemption from the requirement that the entire record be included in the appendix is granted. Please see the attached order for additional information. Served on 04/06/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 04/06/2020 02:41 PM]
March 30, 2020 [10729341] Response filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002 to Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Served on 03/30/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 03/30/2020 08:20 PM]
March 24, 2020 [10727861] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting in part and denying in part the motion to suspend or extend briefing. The motion is granted in part insofar as the deadline for the parties to submit a joint briefing proposal is extended to 3/30/20, but the motion is otherwise denied as premature. See order for details. Served on 03/24/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:29 PM]
March 24, 2020 [10727737] Response filed by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3032, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3002 to Motion to Suspend or Extend Briefing in Light of Rapidly Unfolding COVID-19 Coronavirus Pandemic. Served on 03/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] PJS [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:41 AM]
March 23, 2020 [10727590] Motion filed by Appellants Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, Appellees Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3021, Appellants Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, White & Allen, P.A. and Abreo & Carter in 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002 to extend time to file a response until 04/24/2020, to vacate March 11, 2020 Order, Doc. No. 010110317648, directing parties to submit a Joint Briefing Proposal under which the briefing of these appeals would be completed by September 1, 2020 order. Served on: 03/23/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 03/23/2020 05:09 PM]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order [10724436] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting the request to lift the abatement of these appeals. Procedural consolidation and briefing will be addressed by separate order. Served on 03/11/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 03/11/2020 09:37 AM]
March 11, 2020 [10724467] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. The 17 appeals listed in the caption of this order are hereby consolidated for all procedural purposes including briefing, and submission to the court. Within 14 days from the date of this order parties are directed to confer and file a briefing proposal for the court's consideration. Briefing proposal is due on 03/25/2020 for all parties in all 17 appelas. Please see order for additional information and instructions. Served on 03/11/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 03/11/2020 10:46 AM]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order [10719041] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. The joint reply shall be filed as of the date of this order. Served on 02/20/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:35 AM]
February 20, 2020 [10719045] Reply filed by MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Served on 02/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:40 AM]
February 18, 2020 [10718502] Motion filed by Appellant Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3032, Appellee Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3002 for leave to file reply to. Served on: 02/18/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] PJS [Entered: 02/18/2020 04:24 PM]
February 14, 2020 [10718080] Response filed by Gustafson Gluek, PLLC in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 20-3000, 20-3002, MN Co-Lead Counsel to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Request to Lift Abatement. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DEG [Entered: 02/14/2020 12:22 PM]
February 13, 2020 [10717890] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178. Served on 02/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] JAL [Entered: 02/13/2020 03:37 PM]
February 11, 2020 [10717184] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. An in-person mediation conference is scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 12:00 pm, and 2/28/2020 at 9:00 am (MT). [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/11/2020 02:35 PM]
January 31, 2020 [10714688] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Any party wishing to file a response supporting or opposing MDL Co-Lead Counsels memorandum and request to lift the abatement shall do so on or before 02/14/20. The responses shall be filed only in the appeal(s) corresponding to the filing party. These appeals shall remain abated pending further order of the court. Served on 01/31/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:45 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10714672] MDL Co-Lead Counsels Memorandum Concerning Finality. Served on 01/27/2020 by email (copied from 20-3002; entered by clerk's office). [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:00 PM]
January 15, 2020 [10710090] Minute Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Upon receipt of the parties' joint status report, these appeals remain abated. The parties shall file another joint status report within 30 days of the date of this order. The parties shall notify this court in writing within 5 days of any significant developments affecting the abatement of these matters. (Joint status report due 02/14/2020.) Served on 01/15/2020. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 01/15/2020 02:01 PM]
January 15, 2020 [10709961] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178. Served on 01/15/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] JAL [Entered: 01/15/2020 09:38 AM]
December 27, 2019 [10705606] Order filed by Clerk of the Court re the 12/16/19 Joint Status Report. These matters remain abated. The parties shall continue to file status reports in accordance with the court's 5/15/19 order. The next status report is due 01/15/20. The parties may file a joint status report, which must be filed in all abated appeals. The parties shall notify this court within 5 days of any significant developments affecting any of the abated matters. Served on 12/27/2019. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3174, 19-3176] --[Edited 01/03/2020 by SLS to remove docket entry from 19-3278 and add to 19-3178.] [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:44 AM]
December 16, 2019 [10702914] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] JAL [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:08 PM]
December 2, 2019 [10698966] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. These matters are before the court on the parties' November 25, 2019 Joint Status Report. These matters remain abated. The parties shall file status reports in accordance with the court's May 15, 2019 order. The next status report remains due on December 16, 2019. Served on 12/02/2019. [19-3008, 19-3174, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 12/02/2019 10:13 AM]
November 25, 2019 [10698028] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178. Served on 11/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] JAL [Entered: 11/25/2019 04:09 PM]
November 25, 2019 [10697991] Order filed by Clerk of the Court upon consideration of the parties' status reports. The clerk shall update the dockets by removing the Representative Plaintiffs from 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176 and 19-3178. These matters remain abated. The parties shall file status reports in accordance with this court's 5/15/19 order. Next status report is due 12/16/19 and shall be filed in all abated appeals. The parties shall notify this court within 5 days of any significant developments affecting any of the abated matters. Served on 11/25/2019. [19-3008, 19-3174, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 11/25/2019 03:35 PM]
November 22, 2019 This entry has been removed from the docket. A corrected entry has been filed. [SLS] [10697432] Entry of appearance submitted by George M. Plews; Christopher J. Braun, Christopher E. Kozak for Appellant Egler Brothers, Inc. in 19-3006 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 11/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3174, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] CEK [Entered: 11/22/2019 12:34 PM]
November 14, 2019 [10695139] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178. Served on 11/14/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] JAL [Entered: 11/14/2019 02:04 PM]
October 15, 2019 [10687262] Joint status report and response re: parties filed by Watts Guerra LLP, Kansas Common Benefit Attorneys, Minnesota Lead Counsel, Johnson Becker, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC & Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Settlement Class Counsel, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel, Clark Love Hutson, Phipps Anderson Deacon LLP, and Hossley Embry. Served on 10/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] --[Edited 08/25/2020 by SLS to condense docket text.] BW [Entered: 10/15/2019 04:31 PM]
October 3, 2019 [10684113] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These matters remain abated. The parties shall file status reports in accordance with the courts 5/15/19 order. The next status report is due 10/15/19. The parties may file a joint status report. Status reports must be filed in all abated appeals. The parties shall notify this court in writing within 5 days of any significant developments affecting any of the abated matters. Served on 10/03/2019. [19-3008, 19-3174, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] (See the attachment for the entire order.) [Entered: 10/03/2019 09:32 AM]
October 1, 2019 [10683497] Entry of appearance submitted by W. Lewis Garrison, Jr.; Christopher B. Hood for Appellee Henninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3175 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] --[Edited 10/01/2019 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 10/01/19] WLG [Entered: 10/01/2019 12:55 PM]
October 1, 2019 [10683583] Entry of appearance filed by Christopher B. Hood and William Lewis Garrison, Jr. for Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 10/01/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3008, 19-3174, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 10/01/2019 03:28 PM]
October 1, 2019 [10683590] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. To the extent that there is any dispute as to proper parties, the response [ # 10678511-2 ] is referred to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits. Served on 10/01/2019. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172]--[Edited 10/02/2019 by DJD to correct response reference] [Entered: 10/01/2019 03:41 PM]
September 17, 2019 [10678935] Entry of appearance filed by Eric Alan Isaacson for Appellees Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel: White & Allen, P.A., Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Thompson, Garrett & Hines, William Thomas, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Slaven Law Group, Mr. Richard Russell, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Mr. James M. Pietz, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Orlans, P.C., Molleur Law Office, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, John M. Totten, P.C., Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Terrie Harman, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Hajjar Peters, LLP, Greak Law, P.C., Gamble & Russell, P.C., Chris W. Fitzgerald, FisherBroyles, LLP, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Mr. Nathan A. East, Dye Snyder, LLP, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Butler Snow, LLP, Bigham Law Firm, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Barrett Wylie, LLC and Abreo & Carter. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 09/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021] [Entered: 09/17/2019 08:59 AM]
September 17, 2019 [10678979] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mitchell A. Toups for Appellees Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel: White & Allen, P.A., Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Thompson, Garrett & Hines, William Thomas, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Slaven Law Group, Mr. Richard Russell, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Mr. James M. Pietz, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Orlans, P.C., Molleur Law Office, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, John M. Totten, P.C., Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Terrie Harman, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Hajjar Peters, LLP, Greak Law, P.C., Gamble & Russell, P.C., Chris W. Fitzgerald, FisherBroyles, LLP, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Mr. Nathan A. East, Dye Snyder, LLP, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Butler Snow, LLP, Bigham Law Firm, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Barrett Wylie, LLC and Abreo & Carter in 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 09/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172] [Entered: 09/17/2019 10:19 AM]
September 17, 2019 [10679005] Entry of appearance filed by Richard L. Coffman for Appellees Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel: White & Allen, P.A., Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Thompson, Garrett & Hines, William Thomas, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Slaven Law Group, Mr. Richard Russell, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Mr. James M. Pietz, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Orlans, P.C., Molleur Law Office, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, John M. Totten, P.C., Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Terrie Harman, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Hajjar Peters, LLP, Greak Law, P.C., Gamble & Russell, P.C., Chris W. Fitzgerald, FisherBroyles, LLP, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Mr. Nathan A. East, Dye Snyder, LLP, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Butler Snow, LLP, Bigham Law Firm, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Barrett Wylie, LLC and Abreo & Carter in 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 09/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172] [Entered: 09/17/2019 10:57 AM]
September 16, 2019 [10678773] Entry of appearance submitted by Mitchell A. Toups for Appellee-Plaintiff Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs Listed on Exhibit A hereto for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172] --[Edited 09/17/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] MAT [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:02 PM]
September 16, 2019 [10678837] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard L. Coffman for Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs Counsel listed on Exhibit A hereto for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172] --[Edited 09/17/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] RLC [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:26 PM]
September 16, 2019 [10678855] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] JAL [Entered: 09/16/2019 05:36 PM]
September 16, 2019 [10678860] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric Alan Isaacson for Toups/Coffman Plaitiffs' Counsel (see Ex.A to entry of appearance) for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021] --[Edited 09/17/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry.] EAI [Entered: 09/16/2019 09:41 PM]
September 13, 2019 [10678511] Notice filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3172, 19-3021, 19-3082. Served on 09/13/2019 by email. [19-3172, 19-3021, 19-3082] JAL [Entered: 09/13/2019 06:05 PM]
August 27, 2019 [10673915] Order filed by Clerk of the Court on the parties' 08/16/2019 and 08/26/2019 status reports. The court notes that the joint status reports were not filed in case number 19-3032 and reminds the parties that status reports must be filed in all abated appeals. The parties shall file the required preliminary documents in appeal numbers 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, and 19-3178; those appeals have not yet been abated. Appeal numbers 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, and 19-3082 remain abated. The next status report is due 09/16/2019 in all abated appeals and in accordance with the court's 05/15/2019 order. Served on 08/27/2019. [19-3008, 19-3174, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 08/27/2019 02:40 PM]
August 26, 2019 [10673567] Joint status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP, appellant in Nos. 19-3021, 19-3082, and 19-3172; Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs Counsel, appellants in Nos. 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3079, and 19-3176; and MDL Co-Lead Plaintiffs Counsel, Minnesota Lead Counsel (except Watts Guerra LLP), and Illinois State Lead Counsel, appellees in all appeals. Served on 08/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] --[Edited docket text 08/26/2019 by SLS.] BW [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:08 PM]
August 16, 2019 [10671434] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175. Served on 08/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175] JAL [Entered: 08/16/2019 02:32 PM]
July 19, 2019 [10664392] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - The appeal remains abated pending allocation determinations in the remaining pools. The parties shall file a status report on or before 08/16/19 or within 5 days of any significant developments affecting any of these abated matters. Served on 07/19/2019. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082] [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:59 AM]
July 17, 2019 [10663764] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3082. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3079, 19-3082] JAL [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:14 PM]
July 1, 2019 [10659602] Minute order filed -These matters are before the court on the Toups/Coffman Groups Status Report and on the Watts Guerra Groups notice that it joins in the Toups/Coffman Groups status report. These matters remain abated pending allocation determinations in the remaining pools. The parties shall file a status report in accordance with the courts May 15, 2019 order. The next status report is due July 17, 2019. The parties may file joint status reports. The parties shall notify this court in writing within 5 days of any significant developments affecting any of these abated matters. Status report due 07/17/2019 by Abreo & Carter, et al. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082] --[Edited to condense docket text 07/19/2019 by SLS.] [Entered: 07/01/2019 03:48 PM]
June 17, 2019 [10656356] Notice filed by Watts Guerra LLP Watts Guerra LLP joins in the status report filed by the Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs Counsel Group. in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082. Served on 06/17/2019 by email. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082]--[Edited 06/17/2019 by JM to add docket text. ] JAL [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:23 PM]
June 17, 2019 [10656111] Status report filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079. Served on 06/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082] EAI [Entered: 06/17/2019 07:49 AM]
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order [10648806] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach continuing the abatement of 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022 and 19-3032; abating 19-3079 and 19-3082; directing the parties in 19-3079 and 19-3082 to file a written statement within 14 days of the date of this order if they believe that additional jurisdictional briefing is needed; directing the parties to file written status reports within 30 days from the date of this order. (Status reports due 06/14/2019 by parties in 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079 & 19-3082.) Served on 05/15/2019. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082] --[Edited 05/15/2019 by KLP to correct the text.] --[Edited 05/24/2019 by SLS to condense docket text.] [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:19 AM]
April 24, 2019 [10643562] Status report filed by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3032. Served on 04/24/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3021, 19-3032] PJS [Entered: 04/24/2019 10:40 AM]
April 17, 2019 [10641888] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - MDL Co-Lead Plaintiffs Counsel, Minnesota Co-Lead Plaintiffs Counsel, and Illinois State Lead Counsel shall file an additional and separate status report to clarify their position on abatement of these matters. Response due on 04/24/2019. Served on 04/17/2019. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032] [Entered: 04/17/2019 08:46 AM]
April 12, 2019 [10641064] Status report filed by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3032. Served on 04/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032] PJS [Entered: 04/12/2019 06:19 PM]
April 1, 2019 [10637703] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3021, Toups Coffman Group I; Toups/Coffman Group II; Kansas Common Benefit Firms Group. Served on 04/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3021, 19-3032] BW [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:52 PM]
March 15, 2019 [10633598] Response filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, This is a Joint Response filed by Appellants, Appellees, Cross-Appellants, and Cross-Appellees in response to this Court's request to clarify who are the parties to these appeals. to The Court's March 1, 2019 Order directing the parties to file a Joint Response on parties to the Fee-Allocation appeals.. Served on 03/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032] EAI [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:24 PM]
March 6, 2019 [10631301] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Scott Ashley Powell for "All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross Appellants" in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 03/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3032, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:03 AM]
March 6, 2019 [10631254] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott A.Powell for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Steven A. Wentworth and Appellees Peter V. Anderson, Mr. Richard Crone, Michael Gries, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. Norman Sigrist, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Mr. Charles A. Welsh and Mr. Ron Wetz in 19-3032, Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Mr. Richard Crone, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Michael Gries, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, Mr. Norman Sigrist, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Roger Ward, Mr. Charles A. Welsh, Steven A. Wentworth and Mr. Ron Wetz in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] --[Edited 03/06/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] SAP [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:33 AM]
March 5, 2019 [10630988] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. 1,900 pages long. Pursuant to instruction of the Clerk's office, we will provide this information upon request.Served on 03/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021] [Entered: 03/05/2019 08:31 AM]
March 4, 2019 [10630894] Entry of appearance submitted by William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021]--[Edited 03/05/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 3/5/19.] WBC [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:40 PM]
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order [10630515] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach abating these cases pending a ruling by the district court on the motion for clarification; directing the parties to file a joint report within 30 days of the date of this order; directing the parties to file a joint response clarifying the parties in these appeals. (Status report due 04/01/2019 by Abreo & Carter, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., W. Dean Belk Jr., Bieber Farm, Bigham Law Firm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, Butler Snow, LLP, CE Cobb Farms, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Charles Cobb, Richard Crone, Conrad F. Cropsey, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Leroy Edlund, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Five Star Farms, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Grafel Farms, LLC, Greak Law, P.C., Michael Gries, Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Aaron D. Hovan, JPPL, Inc., John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Joseph F. Manak, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Marvin Miller, Molleur Law Office, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Orlans, P.C., Kenneth Osborn, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Pine Hurst Acres, David Polifka, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Richard Russell, David Schwaninger, Norman Sigrist, Slaven Law Group, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., VJW Farm, Inc., Bradley J. Vermeer, Kenneth G. Walsh, Roger Ward, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Charles A. Welsh, Steven A. Wentworth, Ron Wetz, White & Allen, P.A., Watts Guerra LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Response due on 03/15/2019 for Abreo & Carter, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., W. Dean Belk Jr., Bieber Farm, Bigham Law Firm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, Butler Snow, LLP, CE Cobb Farms, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Charles Cobb, Richard Crone, Conrad F. Cropsey, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Leroy Edlund, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Five Star Farms, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Grafel Farms, LLC, Greak Law, P.C., Michael Gries, Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Aaron D. Hovan, JPPL, Inc., John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Joseph F. Manak, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Marvin Miller, Molleur Law Office, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Orlans, P.C., Kenneth Osborn, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Pine Hurst Acres, David Polifka, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Richard Russell, David Schwaninger, Norman Sigrist, Slaven Law Group, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., VJW Farm, Inc., Bradley J. Vermeer, Kenneth G. Walsh, Roger Ward, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Charles A. Welsh, Steven A. Wentworth, Ron Wetz, White & Allen, P.A., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Watts Guerra LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C. and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP.) (See the attachment for the entire order.) Served on 03/01/2019. [19-3008, 19-3032, 19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:36 PM]
February 22, 2019 [10628768] Appellee/Respondent's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Mr. Richard Crone, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Michael Gries, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Todd Niemeyer, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Roger Ward, Mr. Charles A. Welsh and Steven A. Wentworth in 18-3253, 19-3005, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Mr. Richard Crone, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Michael Gries, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Todd Niemeyer, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Participations AG, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Roger Ward, Mr. Charles A. Welsh and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, Peter V. Anderson, Mr. Richard Crone, Michael Gries, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc. and Mr. Charles A. Welsh in 19-3032. Served on 02/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certificatio--[Edited 03/01/2019 by KLP to delete from 19-3032.]ns: Yes. [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] BW [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:37 PM]
February 19, 2019 [10627506] Entry of appearance submitted by Jennifer B. Wieland and Thomas P. Schult for Appellees Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC in 18-3253, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, Not Parties Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC in 19-3032, 19-3005 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3005] --[Edited 02/19/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JBW [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:18 AM]
February 19, 2019 [10627562] Entry of appearance filed by Jennifer B. Wieland and Thomas P. Schult for Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/19/2019. Manner of Service: email [18-3253, 19-3032, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:07 PM]
February 15, 2019 [10627200] Entry of appearance submitted by Martin J. Phipps and Jason M. Milne for Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Charles A. Welsh, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, and Ron Wetz for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032] --[Edited 02/19/2019 by DD. REmoved PDF as pleading filed 2/19/19] MJP [Entered: 02/15/2019 12:42 PM]
February 15, 2019 [10627244] Entry of appearance submitted by Clayton A. Clark, Scott A. Love for Not Party Clark, Love & Hutson GP in 19-3032, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Charles A. Welsh, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, and Ron Wetz for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] --[Edited 02/19/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/19/19] CAC [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:58 PM]
February 15, 2019 [10627417] Entry of appearance filed by Clayton A Clark and Scott A. Love for Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Charles A. Welsh and Ron Wetz. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/15/2019. Manner of Service: email [18-3253, 19-3032, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/19/2019 08:39 AM]
February 15, 2019 [10627387] Entry of appearance filed by Jason Mark Milne Martin John Phipps for Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Charles A. Welsh, Ron Wetz, CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/15/2019. Manner of Service: email [18-3253,19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/19/2019 07:54 AM]
February 13, 2019 [10626456] Filed notice record is complete. The necessary transcript is all ready on file in the U.S. District Court. Served on 02/13/2019. [19-3021] [Entered: 02/13/2019 08:05 AM]
February 12, 2019 [10626333] Docketing statement filed by Watts Guerra LLP. Served on 02/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021] JAL [Entered: 02/12/2019 02:34 PM]
February 12, 2019 [10626334] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Watts Guerra LLP. Served on: 02/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021] JAL [Entered: 02/12/2019 02:40 PM]
February 12, 2019 [10626358] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 02/19/2019 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KSkc), Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3021] [Entered: 02/12/2019 03:17 PM]
February 8, 2019 [10625410] Entry of appearance submitted by Thomas J. Wiegand for Appellant Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021]--[Edited 02/08/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/8/19] TW [Entered: 02/08/2019 07:13 AM]
February 8, 2019 [10625409] Appellant/Petitioner's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021. Served on 02/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3022] JAL [Entered: 02/08/2019 07:11 AM]
February 8, 2019 [10625423] Entry of appearance filed by Thomas Wiegand for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/08/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3021] [Entered: 02/08/2019 08:01 AM]
February 8, 2019 [10625678] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing all Appellees to file a consolidated responsive memorandum brief due 02/22/2019 for Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, David Schwaninger, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Watts Guerra LLP, Steven A. Wentworth and Syngenta Participations AG. Served on 02/08/2019. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-3008, 19-3022, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3009, 19-3021] [Entered: 02/08/2019 04:03 PM]
February 8, 2019 [10625451] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. William P. Ferranti for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021] [Entered: 02/08/2019 09:01 AM]
February 8, 2019 [10625661] Appellant/Petitioner's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3022. Served on 02/08/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] EAI [Entered: 02/08/2019 03:16 PM]
February 7, 2019 [10625219] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey A. Lamken, Eric R. Nitz for Appellant Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021] --[Edited 02/07/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/7/19] JAL [Entered: 02/07/2019 01:03 PM]
February 7, 2019 [10625223] Motion filed by Appellant Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021 for leave to file a separate memorandum brief regarding finality. Served on: 02/07/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3022]--[Edited 02/07/2019 by KLP to correct the event code and docket text and to delete the filing from every case except Case Nos. 19-3021 and 19-3022.] JAL [Entered: 02/07/2019 01:12 PM]
February 7, 2019 [10625170] Appellant/Petitioner's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by Simon Rademacher and Christopher Roberts in 18-3253, 19-3009. Served on 02/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] RC [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:10 AM]
February 7, 2019 [10625391] Entry of appearance submitted by William P. Ferranti for Appellant Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021]--[Edited 02/08/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 2/8/19] WPF [Entered: 02/07/2019 05:11 PM]
February 7, 2019 [10625242] Entry of appearance filed by Jeffrey A. Lamken and Eric R. Nitz for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/07/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3021] [Entered: 02/07/2019 01:46 PM]
February 7, 2019 [10625318] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Watts Guerra LLP's unopposed motion for leave to file separate memorandum brief regarding finality. The brief remains due 2/8/19. Served on 02/07/2019. [19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/07/2019 03:05 PM]
February 5, 2019 [10624572] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick Haney and Edwin John U for Appellees Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC and Syngenta Seeds, LLC in 19-3021, 19-3022 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3022]--[Edited 02/05/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/5/19] PTH [Entered: 02/05/2019 12:36 PM]
February 5, 2019 [10624601] Entry of appearance filed by Patrick T. Haney and Edwin U for Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (all previously disclosed). Served on 02/05/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/05/2019 01:25 PM]
February 5, 2019 [10624628] Entry of appearance submitted by Leslie M. Smith for Appellees Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC and Syngenta Seeds, LLC in 19-3021, 19-3022 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3022] --[Edited 02/05/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] LMS [Entered: 02/05/2019 02:04 PM]
February 5, 2019 [10624698] Entry of appearance filed by Leslie M. Smith for Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC in 19-3021, 19-3022. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 02/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:57 PM]
February 4, 2019 [10624044] Entry of appearance filed by Christopher Adam Seeger for all Plaintiffs-Appellees. Mike DaVault, Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms in 19-3021, 19-3022. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/04/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/04/2019 11:15 AM]
February 4, 2019 [10624038] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen A. Weiss and Diogenes P. Kekatos for All Plaintiffs-Appellees for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3022]--[Edited 02/04/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 2/4/19.] SAW [Entered: 02/04/2019 10:53 AM]
February 4, 2019 [10624160] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Diogenes P. Kekatos, Esq. and Mr. Stephen A. Weiss for Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms in 19-3022. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Provided upon reuest 1,900 pages. Served on 02/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/04/2019 01:50 PM]
February 4, 2019 [10624034] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher A. Seeger for All Plaintiffs-Appellees for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3022] --[Edited 02/04/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/4/19] CAS [Entered: 02/04/2019 10:51 AM]
February 4, 2019 [10624195] Entry of appearance submitted by Don Downing and Gretchen Garrison for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3021, 19-3022 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/04/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 2/4/19][19-3021, 19-3022] DMD [Entered: 02/04/2019 02:48 PM]
February 4, 2019 [10624203] Entry of appearance filed by by Don Downing and Gretchen Garrison for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3021, 19-3022. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all parties listed on appeal). Served on 02/04/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/04/2019 02:59 PM]
February 1, 2019 [10623586] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter comes on for consideration of the Entry of Appearance filed on 2/1/19 by Stephen A. Weiss and Diogenes P. Kekatos and the Entry of Appearance filed on 2/1/19 by Christopher A. Seeger. Both of these entries state that counsel is entering an appearance on behalf of Appellees/Respondents. Within 7 days of the date of this order, these attorneys shall file amended Entries of Appearance specifically stating whether they represent the Plaintiffs-Appellees or the Defendants-Appellees or both groups of appellees. (Amended notices of appearance due on 2/8/19.) Served on 02/01/2019. [19-3021] [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:39 AM]
February 1, 2019 [10623569] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022]--[Edited 02/01/2019 by KLP to delete the PDF. This entry must be amended per the 2/1/19 order.] DEG [Entered: 02/01/2019 09:55 AM]
February 1, 2019 [10623478] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen A. Weiss and Diogenes P. Kekatos for All Appellees/Respondents for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3022]--[Edited 02/01/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment. This entry has not been filed. Per the 2/1/19 order, this entry of appearance must be amended.] SAW [Entered: 02/01/2019 08:03 AM]
February 1, 2019 [10623475] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher A. Seeger for All Appellees/Respondents for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3022] --[Edited 02/01/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/1/19] CAS [Entered: 02/01/2019 07:59 AM]
February 1, 2019 [10623635] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022]--[Edited 02/04/2019 by KLP. This entry was filed on 2/4/19.] DEG [Entered: 02/01/2019 11:36 AM]
February 1, 2019 [10623490] Entry of appearance filed by Christopher Adam Seeger for Mike DaVault, Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/01/2019 08:24 AM]
February 1, 2019 [10623720] Entry of appearance submitted by Bradley T. Wilders for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021]--[Edited 02/01/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] BW [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:47 PM]
February 1, 2019 [10623912] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for plaintiffs-appellees Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms in 18-3253. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50. Served on 02/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3022, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021] [Entered: 02/04/2019 07:45 AM]
February 1, 2019 [10623701] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on the Entry of Appearance filed on 2/1/19 by Daniel E. Gustafson. This entry states that counsel is entering an appearance on behalf of All Appellees/Respondents. Within seven days of the date of this order, Attorney Gustafson shall file an amended Entry of Appearance specifically identifying which appellees he represents. (Amended entry due on 02/08/2019 for Daniel E. Gustafson.) Served on 02/01/2019. [18-3253, 19-3022, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021] [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:31 PM]
February 1, 2019 [10623820] Entry of appearance filed by Rachel E. Schwartz and Patrick Joseph Stueve for Mike DaVault, Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3021] [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:59 PM]
February 1, 2019 [10623777] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021]--[Edited 02/01/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/1/19] PJS [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:02 PM]
February 1, 2019 [10623763] Entry of appearance filed by Bradley Wilders for Plaintiffs-Appellees Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021] [Entered: 02/01/2019 02:54 PM]
January 31, 2019 [10623318] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. These matters are before the court sua sponte to direct jurisdictional briefing. Appellants are directed to file a consolidated brief with the appellants in No. 19-3008. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of this court. Please see order for additional information. Appellants' consolidated memorandum brief due 02/08/2019 for Watts Guerra LLP, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, W. Dean Belk Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Aaron D. Hovan, John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Joseph F. Manak, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. Served on 01/31/2019. [19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:05 PM]
January 30, 2019 [10622850] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/30/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 02/13/2019 for Watts Guerra LLP. Notice of appearance also due on 02/13/2019 for Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Berkowitz Oliver LLP, Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, CNAC Saturn (NL) B.V., Clark, Love & Hutson GP, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gustafson Gluek PLLC, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kirkland & Ellis LLP, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, David Schwaninger, Seeger Weiss LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Participations AG, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Watts Guerra LLP and Steven A. Wentworth [19-3021] [Entered: 01/30/2019 12:03 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL GRIES
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARVIN MILLER
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BIEBER FARM
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEROY EDLUND
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GRAFEL FARMS, LLC
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROGER WARD
Represented By: William J. Maiberger Jr.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Charles S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Bradley C. Buhrow
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Edward W. Allred
Represented By: David M. Cialkowski
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Hart L. Robinovitch
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID POLIFKA
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PETER V. ANDERSON
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JPPL, INC.
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Gregory R. Flax
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD CRONE
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VJW FARM, INC.
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PINE HURST ACRES
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT NIEMEYER
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NEBCO, INC.
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENNETH OSBORN
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FIVE STAR FARMS
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RON WETZ
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID SCHWANINGER
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEMMER FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES COBB
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GRANT ANNEXSTAD
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES B. LEX
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NORMAN SIGRIST
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Curtis Shank
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TODD NIEMEYER
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES A. WELSH
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRADLEY J. VERMEER
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEVEN A. WENTWORTH
Represented By: Stephen Six
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Hugh A. Fuller
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher M. Ellis
Represented By: Kaitlin Bridges
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CE COBB FARMS
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WATTS GUERRA LLP
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Represented By: Michael Pattillo Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Wiegand
Represented By: Eric R. Nitz
Represented By: William P. Ferranti
Represented By: Francisco Guerra
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DENNEY & BARRETT, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DANIEL QUIGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MCFARLAND LAW, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY R. VAUGHAN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TED B. LYON & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RYAN MOORE & COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WICKENS & WICKENS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CHAPMAN LAW LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RICHARD M. HOLMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CHESTER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CRYSTAL D. PULLEY, ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WINSTEIN, KAVENSKY & CUNNINGHAM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KEMPTON & RUSSELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WASKER DOOR WIMMER & MARCOUILLER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GREGORY L. CESHKER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TOM BENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: FORDE LAW OFFICES LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MCNEELY STEPHENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: OUDERKIRK LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GARY T. GEE LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: COLE, EASLEY, SCIBA & WILLIAMS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HALL HUDSON, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: THE CAHILL LAW OFFICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WIL GALLOWAY & ASSOCIATES, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BARRETT MCNAGNY LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MAURO ARCHER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BOREN, OLVER AND COFFEY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: FENCHEL, DOSTER & BUCK, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DENTON & KEULER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CHARLES HEAR, ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: QUIGLEY LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: COLVIN, CHANEY, SAENZ & RODRIGUEZ, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: REICHERT LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JEFF LINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TROTH LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SCHNELKER, RASSI & MCCONNELL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MEYER & MEYER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BERNATZ & VAN BEEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MASSIE & QUICK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JOHN R. DELZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BARBARA J. SIMMONS ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DARLING & DARLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NATHAN J. NOBLE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: O'KOON HINTERMEISTER, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CROSS PENNAMPED WOOLSEY & GLAZIER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: FEARER, NYE, & CHADWICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BILL J. MILNER LAW OFFICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TOURKOW CRELL ROSENBLATT & JOHNSTON LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JUSTIN HILL, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MEIER, BRAGICICH & MOORE LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BAKKE NORMAN, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CARPENTER & SCHUMACHER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GRENFELL, SLEDGE AND STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RHOADES MCKEE PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TROYER & GOOD, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CLARK & CLARK P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JOHNSON, MOODY, SCHMIDT & KLEINHUIZEN, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MCCLURE, THOMAS & THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: COTTON, BOLTON, HOYCHICK & DOUGHTY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: THE CANTLIN LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BROOKS & OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CHURCH, CHURCH, HITTLE & ANTRIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SPENCER GILLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: THE STROM LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CARABIN & SHAW, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WELD, RILEY, PRENN & RICCI S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HEINISCH & LOVEGROVE LAW OFFICE, PC LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HEHNER & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CONNORS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NORMAN PALOUCEK & HERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GRIFFIN DIETRICH & ELLIOT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STRITTMATTER LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RAMMELKAMP BRADNEY, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: THE LAW OFFICE OF MARK L EUREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JEFFREY A. BOGGESS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SHIMANEK, SHIMANEK, & BOWMAN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KRAFT WALSER LAW OFFICE, PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MILLER PEARSON GLOE BURNS BEATTY & PARRISH, P.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DOERING & GRISELL, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CHARLES E. CRONAUER & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BLAKEMAN & SCHROCK, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WARNER NORCROSS & JUDD, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BEINE & ROBERTS LAW FIRM, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BRENNAN STEIL S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BIRD, JACOBSEN & STEVENS, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MICHAEL ASHAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SATTERLEY AND KELLEY, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SORLING NORTHRUP ATTORNEYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BROYLES KIGHT & RICAFORT, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BRETT DUNN PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CAUGHEY, LEGNER & FREEHILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JANZEN AGRICULTURAL LAW, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SHAMBERG, WOLF, MCDERMOTT & DEPUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: VANDERVOORT CHRIST & FISHER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: THE POPPE LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LAURIE S. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MERTES & MERTES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STOCKARD, JOHNSTON, & BROWN, P.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KEVIN W. LILES PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: EMERICK, DIGGINS & ZABONA P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ADAMS, RIZZI & SWEEN, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: FAITH INGLE SMITH LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JAMES & LARSON LAW, JAMES LAW, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GRAYBILL & WITCHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: OSTERBAUER LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MICHAEL SMITH LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SIMON HERBERT & MCCLELLAND, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CLENDENING JOHNSON & BOHRER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DOBBS LEGAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MILTNER LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GELLHAUS & GELLHAUS, P. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BRIANA DEANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WHITMAN, BABER, & SIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: VANDERGINST LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: THE WINKIE LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: VELA LAW OFFICES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BAKER, BODWELL, APPEL ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JENNA LAIRD LEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: VAUGHAN LAW FIRM, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SEVER STOREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TUCKER LAW PRACTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WOOD & RUE, PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HERITAGE LEGAL GROUP PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PHILLIPPI LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DEBORAH K. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUP & NUZMAN, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SHERMAN HOFFMAN & HIPP, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web |