In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Plaintiff: PINE HURST ACRES, CHARLES B. LEX, TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP, DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, DAVID SCHWANINGER, BIEBER FARM, D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC., FIVE STAR FARMS, BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC., RICHARD CRONE, STEVEN A. WENTWORTH, JPPL, INC., RON WETZ, ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC, GRAFEL FARMS, LLC, VJW FARM, INC., NEBCO, INC., BRADLEY J. VERMEER, AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC, BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP, KENNETH OSBORN, MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, CHARLES A. WELSH, MARVIN MILLER, CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC, KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY, DAVID POLIFKA, BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC., MICHAEL GRIES, PETER V. ANDERSON, GRANT ANNEXSTAD, DEMMER FARMS, INC., LEROY EDLUND, DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, CE COBB FARMS, NORMAN SIGRIST, TODD NIEMEYER, ROBERT NIEMEYER, CHARLES COBB and ROGER WARD
Defendant: SYNGENTA SEEDS, LLC, FKA Syngenta Seeds, Inc., SYNGENTA BIOTECHNOLOGY, INC., SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC, SYNGENTA AG, SYNGENTA CORPORATION and SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION AG
Undetermined: TEEL & MARONEY, PLC, ABREO & CARTER, MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE, RICHARDSON, PATRICK, WESTBROOK & BRICKMAN, LLC, DYE SNYDER, LLP, STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON LLP, JOHN L. JERNIGAN, III, Attorney at Law, GRAY REED & MCGRAW, P.C., RICHARD RUSSELL, Attorney at Law, JOHN E. TARBURTON, Attorney at Law, JAMES M. PIETZ, Attorney, Attorney at Law, CONRAD F. CROPSEY, Attorney at Law, HALLETT, HALLETT & NAGEL, TERRIE HARMAN, Attorney at Law, JOSEPH F. MANAK, Attorney at Law, TROUSDALE RYAN, P.C., THOMAS P. CALHOUN, III, Attorney at Law, WILLIAM THOMAS, Attorney at Law, BUTLER SNOW, LLP, SLAVEN LAW GROUP, BIGHAM LAW FIRM, WHITE & ALLEN, P.A., WELLER, GREEN, TOUPS & TERRELL, LLP, GREAK LAW, P.C., THOMPSON, GARRETT & HINES, FISHERBROYLES, LLP, BARRETT WYLIE, LLC, JOHN M. TOTTEN, P.C., W. DEAN BELK, JR., Attorney at Law, JINKS, CROW & DICKSON, P.C., GAMBLE & RUSSELL, P.C., RAY, WINTON & KELLEY, PLLC, HAJJAR PETERS, LLP, AARON D. HOVAN, Attorney at Law, E. RUDOLPH MCINTYRE, Attorney at Law, KENNETH G. WALSH, Attorney at Law, NATHAN A. EAST, Attorney at Law, DURRETT, ARKEMA, GERSON & GILL, P.C., WATTS GUERRA LLP, HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON, ORLANS, P.C., GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C., OTTS, MOORE, COALE, GODWIN, STEARNS & DARBY, ESTES & KENNEDY LAW OFFICES, PLLC, KIZER, BONDS, HUGHES & BOWEN, PLLC, RICHARD L. COFFMAN, P.C., DBA The Coffman Law Firm, CHRIS W. FITZGERALD, Attorney at Law, BYRON STONE, PLLC, BRIAN FITZWATER LAW OFFICE, SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C., ELLIS & JUDD LAW OFFICE, LLC, OVERBOE LAW, CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC, CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP, NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW, JENNA LAIRD LEGER, THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC, LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART, TOURKOW CRELL ROSENBLATT & JOHNSTON LLP, CLARK LOVE & HUTSON, GP, WALK & MURPHY, PLC, HERITAGE LEGAL GROUP PLLC, CARPENTER & SCHUMACHER, P.C., MORRIS LAING EVANS BROCK & KENNEDY, GREEN ESPEL PLLP, SIMMONS HANLY CONROY LLC, PHILLIPPI LAW FIRM, LLC, MUSKE, MUSKE, SUHRHOFF LTD, WEEKS & BRUCKER, LTD, VAN KLEY & WALKER, LLC, RICHARD D. LARSON, P.C., BATTS, BATTS & BELL, LLP, CLARK & CLARK P.C., MCCLURE, THOMAS & THOMAS, LAW OFFICES OF LEONEL ALEJANDRO PC, DILLON LEGAL GROUP, CHURCH, CHURCH, HITTLE & ANTRIM, JOHNSON LAW GROUP, CONNORS LLP, CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C., WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C., SEEGER WEISS LLP, HAWKINS LAW, PC, THE LAW OFFICE OF MARK L EUREK, HODGE LAW FIRM, MAYNES LAW OFFICE, LAW OFFICE OF MIKE CRANE, LLP, JEREMY P. COHEN, LAW OFFICES OF HANS A. BUEHLER, LLC, SORLING NORTHRUP ATTORNEYS, WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD, DANIEL M. HOMOLKA, P.A., ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP, ATLEE HALL, LLP, ANGEL, ISAACSON & TRACY, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, BRENNAN STEIL S.C., DENNEY & BARRETT, PC, ALERDING CASTOR HEWITT LLP, WADLER, PERCHES, HUNDL & KERLICK, MCFARLAND LAW, PC, OKOON HINTERMEISTER, PLLC, SHAMBERG, WOLF, MCDERMOTT & DEPUE, FELLHEIMER LAW FIRM LTD., BLOOM GATES & WHITELEATHER, LLP, RYAN MOORE & COOK, WOODS ROGERS PLC, WORTH LAW FIRM, BRAND & MORELOCK, THE LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS R. FIELDS, P.A., TULLY LAW OFFICE, PC, THE GIBBS LAW FIRM, FAITH INGLE SMITH LAW FIRM, JUSTIN HILL, PC, DOBBS LEGAL GROUP, QUIRK & HUNTER, PC, MOORE, SUSLER, MCNUTT & WRIGLEY, LLC, FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC, FOREMAN WATSON HOLTREY, LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA, JAKE W. BROOKS, TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP, CRITCHFIELD CRITCHFIELD & JOHSON, LTD., BRIANA DEANE, MAILANDER LAW OFFICE, BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC, THE LAW OFFICE OF ROB TULLY PC, HABUSH HABUSH & ROTTIER S.C., VANDERGINST LAW, GARY T. GEE LAW OFFICE, COLE, EASLEY, SCIBA & WILLIAMS, P.C., DAVID R. ADELMAN, DAVIS & CAMPBELL, LLC, KEVIN W. LILES PC, SONENBERG LAW LLC, WRIGHT SCHIMMEL LLC, PLEWS SHADLEY RACHER & BRAUN LLP, BOREN, OLVER AND COFFEY, LLP, HUME, SMITH, GEDDES, GREEN & SIMMONS, LLP, W. CALLOWAY HUFFAKER, BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE, ZEILINGER LAW OFFICE, REICHERT LAW OFFICE, LUNDBERG LAW FIRM PLC, SCHULTZ LAW, DEBORAH K. SMITH, RILEY-TANIS & ASSOCIATES PLLC, ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON, COOTS, HENKE & WHEELER, BERNATZ & VAN BEEK, ARNDT BUSWELL & THORN S.C., REICHERT WENNER, P.A., BROCK LAW OFFICES PC LLO, LAMKIN & LAMKIN, P.C., BURNS CRONAUER & BROWN LLP, PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, LLP, HENSLEY LEGAL GROUP PC, DARLING & DARLING, KOENIG LAW FIRM, MARTZ & LUCAS, LLC, MAZZANTI LAW OFFICE, PLLC, NATHAN J. NOBLE, P.C., LEE J. LEWIS, LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS, GREGG NEAL, CRESS LAW GROUP, PC, BILL J. MILNER LAW OFFICES, LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD HOFFMAN, ROB TULLY LAW FIRM, BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C., KITTELSEN, BARRY, WELLINGTON, THOMPSON, & SCHLUESCHE, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, CHARLES HEAR, SNEED LANG PC, HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C., DREW YOUNG LAW, ALLEN, STEIN & DURBIN, PC, DANIEL QUIGLEY, BORING & BORING, PC, MARK A. ROEDER, BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC, COTTON, BOLTON, HOYCHICK & DOUGHTY, LLP, SCHWARZ LAW OFFICE, BROOKS & OLSON, RHOADES MCKEE PC, CLINE FARRELL CHRISTIE & LEE, P.C., NORMAN PALOUCEK & HERMAN, JOHNSON & MOCK, PC LLO, JEFFERSON & BREWER, LLP, GRIFFIN DIETRICH & ELLIOT, LLC, WINSTEIN, KAVENSKY & CUNNINGHAM, LLC, TUCKER & TUCKER, P.C., MEADOR & CRUMP, P.A., STRITTMATTER LAW FIRM, WILLIS & WILLIS, MALONEY & CAMPOLO, CUSTY LAW FIRM, LLC, FEARER, NYE, & CHADWICK, MCNEELY STEPHENSON, BLAKEMAN & SCHROCK, LTD, KELLEY LAW FIRM, PC, BIRD, JACOBSEN & STEVENS, PC, MICHAEL ASHAR, OUDERKIRK LAW FIRM, BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS LLP, BROYLES KIGHT & RICAFORT, PC, KNUTH LAW OFFICE, BATTLE & WINN LLP, MAURO ARCHER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC, FRUNDT & JOHNSON, LTD., BROWN, DEPREZ & JOHNSON, P.A., JASON SCHUTTE, KOEPKE & HILTABRAND ATTORNEY AT LAW, LAURIE S. WARD, WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC, THE MCQUADES CO. LPA, PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P., STONE LAW OFFICE, P.L.L.C., RICCOLO, SEMELROTH, & HENNINGSEN, P.C., WELD, RILEY, PRENN & RICCI S.C., HART BELL, LLC, BRADFORD LAW FIRM, MORGAN & MEYERS, PLC, WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A., JEFF LINK, ROBERTS LAW OFFICE, ALLEN WELLMAN MCNEW HARVEY, LLP, BAKER, BODWELL, APPEL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, LAW OFFICE OF HAMMELL & MURPHY PLLP, JAMES & LARSON LAW, JAMES LAW, P.C., DEWALD DEAVER, P.C., MICHAEL J. GALANIS, IRVIN L. MASCHING, SCOTT POYNTER, LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER, LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY E. TONORE, MICHAEL GROSS, CHARLES E. CRONAUER & ASSOCIATES, DELZER LAW OFFICE, MILTNER LAW FIRM, LLC, PEN COSBY, MILLER SCHIRGER LLC, KUHLMAN & LUCAS, LLC, THE WINKIE LAW FIRM, LLC, STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP, THRASH LAW FIRM, P.A., GEORGE M. BISHOP, SEVER STOREY, LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS A. NOE, III, TUCKER LAW PRACTICE, BARBARA J. SIMMONS, MEIER, BRAGICICH & MOORE LLP, WOOD & RUE, PLLP, LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER H. POYNOR, SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C., ALEX KOENIGS, PATTERSON COMER, TROYER & GOOD, PC, OBEAR, OVERHOLSER, HUFFER & RIDER, LLC, MORRISSEY, MORRISSEY & DALLUGE, ROTH LAW FIRM, THE CANTLIN LAW FIRM, SHERMAN HOFFMAN & HIPP, LC, CORNELL LAW OFFICE, MARCH, MCMILLAN, DEJOODE & DUVALL, P.C., SPEER LAW FIRM, PC, LEO BOOTHE, SPENCER GILLAND, THE STROM LAW FIRM, LLC, HECKER LAW GROUP, PLC, CARABIN & SHAW, P.C., HEINISCH & LOVEGROVE LAW OFFICE, PC LLP, BROOKS PIERCE, HEHNER & ASSOCIATES, LLC, FAFINSKI MARK & JOHNSON, P.A., GORDON & ASSOCIATES, P.C., WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK, MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL, FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH, LANGDON & EMISON ATTORNEYS AT LAW, BARRETT, EASTERDAY, CUNNINGHAM & ESELGROTH, LLP, EMERSON POYNTER LLP, MORNING LAW OFFICE LLC, SATTERLEY AND KELLEY, PLLC, BRAU LAW OFFICE, COPLEY ROTH & WILSON, LLC, DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC, CHARNETSKI, LACINA & CLOWER, LLP, CAUGHEY, LEGNER & FREEHILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN, MYERS HOCKEMEYER & MCNAGNY LLP, FITZGERALD LAW P.A., WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP, STOERZBACH LAW OFFICE, P.C., RANDLE & SAMMONS, P.C., THE POPPE LAW FIRM, KC COHEN, LAWYER, PC, KEATON & KEATON PC, JANZEN AGRICULTURAL LAW, LLC, GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC, STOCKARD, JOHNSTON, & BROWN, P.C, HAMPTON & ROYCE, L.C., CULBERTSON & ALLEN, LLC, EMERICK, DIGGINS & ZABONA P.C., THE LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. LAPOINTE, P.C., KIRK LAW FIRM, GRAYBILL & WITCHER, LLP, SIMON HERBERT & MCCLELLAND, LLP, SMITH GARDNER SLUSKY LAZER POHREN & ROGERS LLP, NKA Smith Slusky Law, MITCHELL C. CHANEY, CLENDENING JOHNSON & BOHRER, P.C., BARBER, SEGATTO, HOFFEE, WILKE, & CATE, WILLADSEN & NEAL LLC, WALLACE LAW, GELLHAUS & GELLHAUS, P. C., WOLF ARDIS, P.C., PATRICK A. ELWARD, WHALEY LAW FIRM, ESPE LAW PLLC, KATZ & KORIN, P.C., WHITMAN, BABER, & SIEGEL, REILING TEDER & SCHRIER, LLC, PAUL LLP, LAW OFFICE OF EZEQUIEL REYNA, JR., WAYNE J. LENNINGTON, KRUSE & DAKIN LLP, VAUGHAN LAW FIRM, P.C., KOVARIK, ELLISON & MATHIS, P.C., NKA Ellison Kovarik & Turman Law Firm PC, LIND JENSEN SULLIVAN & PETERSON P.A., KEULER, KELLY HUTCHINS & BLANKENSHIP, LLP, MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP, CALL & GENTRY LAW GROUP, PAGEL & WEIKUM, PLLP, WOODARD LAW PC., PATTON HOVERSTEN & BERG P.A, DEBORAH SMITH MCCLURE, P.C., KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C., HOSTETTER & ASSOCIATES, BOHRER BRADY LLC, SWAIM LAW FIRM, PLLC, CARY, WELCH, HICKMAN & HAWK, LLP, MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC, WILLIAM F. SMITH, WRIGHT & SCHULTE LLC, KRAMER LAW, LLC, THE PRUNEDA LAW FIRM, PLLC, GREGORY L. CESHKER, P.C., TOM BENSON, EDMUND A. WEINHEIMER, JR., P. C., BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES, BRENT C. EMBREY, HOVLAND & RASMUS, PLLC, SOPER LEDDIN LAW FIRM, PC, MERCHO CAUGHEY & DELAY, VELA LAW OFFICES PLLC, HALL HUDSON, P.C., THE LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE P. ESCOBEDO & ASSOCIATES, THE CAHILL LAW OFFICES, LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP, BARRETT MCNAGNY LLP, SCHMITTINGER & RODRIGUEZ, P.A., MASSIE & QUICK, LLC, SHIMANEK, SHIMANEK, & BOWMAN, LLC, PICKNER LAW OFFICE, QUIGLEY LAW OFFICE, BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC, NIDEY ERDAHL TINDAL & FISCHER, PLC, COLE LAW OFFICE, SAEED & LITTLE, LLP, TROTH LAW OFFICE, WASKER DOOR WIMMER & MARCOUILLER, P.C., SCHNELKER, RASSI & MCCONNELL PLC, MEYER & MEYER LLP, SOUNDING BOARD LEGAL, S.C., TED B. LYON & ASSOCIATES, P.C., DAVE O'BRIEN LAW, WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC, EICH, VAN DYKE, WERDAN & STEGER P.C., LAW OFFICE OF BRENT GAINES, COCKERILL & COCKERILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, THE LAW OFFICE OF SAMUEL W. BEARMAN, L.C., JOHN R. DELZER, LAW OFFICE OF ADAM CRAWSHAW, PEMBERTON, SORLIE, RUFER, & KERSHNER, PLLP, MICHAEL SMITH LAW, VRIEZELAAR, TIGGES, EDINGTON, BOTTARO, BODEN, & ROSS, L.L.P., CROSS PENNAMPED WOOLSEY & GLAZIER, P.C., WAGNER REESE, LLP, ENDURANCE LAW GROUP PLC, JOHNSON, KRAMER, MULHOLLAND, COCHRANE, DRISCOLL & COCHRANE, P.L.C., SCHWEBEL GOETZ & SIEBEN PA, DENTON & KEULER, LLP, UNDERWOOD LAW FIRM, PC, BAKKE NORMAN, S.C., CHAPMAN LAW LLC, GRENFELL, SLEDGE AND STEVENS, MINER & LEMON, LLP, RAY A. FERGUSON & ASSOCIATES, LTD., LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY R. VAUGHAN, P.C., HOLLAND LAW FIRM, ROBINSON, CURPHEY & OCONNEL, LLC, JOHNSON, MOODY, SCHMIDT & KLEINHUIZEN, P.A., PEMBERTON LAW FIRM, BOLEN ROBINSON & ELLIS, LLP, LAW OFFICE OF LESTER WEINSTINE, P.C., WICKENS & WICKENS, LLC, EMERSON SCOTT LLP, RICHARD M. HOLMES, CHESTER LAW OFFICE, BASSFORD REMELE, PA, KEMPTON & RUSSELL, LLC, FLYNN & SULLIVAN PC, RAMMELKAMP BRADNEY, P.C., ANTHONY O'HANLON, P.C., WEXLER WALLACE LLP, PATTON BROWN LAW, PLLC, JEFFREY A. BOGGESS, P.C., KRAFT WALSER LAW OFFICE, PLLP, MILLER PEARSON GLOE BURNS BEATTY & PARRISH, P.L.C., FORDE LAW OFFICES LLP, DOERING & GRISELL, PA, INGEBRITSON & ASSOCIATES, P.A., WARNER NORCROSS & JUDD, LLP, MIDWEST AG SOLUTIONS LLC, ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP, BEINE & ROBERTS LAW FIRM, PLC, BRETT DUNN PLLC, WYLAND, HUMPHREY & CLEVENGER LLP, WIL GALLOWAY & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, YIRA LAW OFFICE, LTD, VANDERVOORT CHRIST & FISHER, P.C., FENCHEL, DOSTER & BUCK, PLC, LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM R. SHIRK, CRYSTAL D. PULLEY, COLVIN, CHANEY, SAENZ & RODRIGUEZ, LLP, MERTES & MERTES, P.C., BOSCHMA LAW OFFICE, CROSS LAW FIRM, LLC, VIRTUS LAW PLLC, GROSBOLL, BECKER, TICE & BARR, ADAMS, RIZZI & SWEEN, P.A., TAYLOR & RUHNKE, PC, OSTERBAUER LAW FIRM and STOUT LAW GROUP
Plaintiff / Appellee: TOUPS/COFFMAN PLAINTIFFS*
Case Number: 19-3032
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 [10641064] Status report filed by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3032. Served on 04/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032] PJS [Entered: 04/12/2019 06:19 PM]
April 1, 2019 [10637703] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3021, Toups Coffman Group I; Toups/Coffman Group II; Kansas Common Benefit Firms Group. Served on 04/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3021, 19-3032] BW [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:52 PM]
March 15, 2019 [10633598] Response filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, This is a Joint Response filed by Appellants, Appellees, Cross-Appellants, and Cross-Appellees in response to this Court's request to clarify who are the parties to these appeals. to The Court's March 1, 2019 Order directing the parties to file a Joint Response on parties to the Fee-Allocation appeals.. Served on 03/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032] EAI [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:24 PM]
March 6, 2019 [10631382] Entry of appearance filed by Leslie M. Smith for The Syngenta Appellees/Respondents. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 03/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] [Entered: 03/06/2019 02:35 PM]
March 6, 2019 [10631351] Entry of appearance submitted by Leslie Smith for Not Parties Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC and Syngenta Seeds, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] --[Edited 03/06/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] LMS [Entered: 03/06/2019 01:01 PM]
March 6, 2019 [10631301] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Scott Ashley Powell for "All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross Appellants" in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 03/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3032, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 03/06/2019 11:03 AM]
March 6, 2019 [10631270] Entry of appearance filed by Tempe D Smith and Bruce McKee for Steven A. Wentworth, Roger Ward, TRIPLE BG Partnership, David Schwaninger, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, David Polifka, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, NEBCO, Inc., Marvin Miller, Charles B. Lex, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., JPPL, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Five Star Farms, Leroy Edlund, Demmer Farms, Inc., David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Mike DaVault, David DaVault, Bradley DaVault, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Bottoms Farms Partnership, Bieber Farm, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Grant Annexstad, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Ron Wetz, Charles A. Welsh, Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Norman Sigrist, Pine Hurst Acres, Kenneth Osborn, Michael Gries, Richard Crone and Peter V. Anderson CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 03/04/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3032] [Entered: 03/06/2019 10:07 AM]
March 6, 2019 [10631257] Entry of appearance submitted by Tempe D. Smith and Bruce J. McKee for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Steven A. Wentworth and Appellees Peter V. Anderson, Mr. Richard Crone, Michael Gries, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. Norman Sigrist, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Mr. Charles A. Welsh and Mr. Ron Wetz for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] --[Edited 03/06/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 3/6/19] TDS [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:37 AM]
March 6, 2019 [10631254] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott A.Powell for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Steven A. Wentworth and Appellees Peter V. Anderson, Mr. Richard Crone, Michael Gries, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. Norman Sigrist, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Mr. Charles A. Welsh and Mr. Ron Wetz in 19-3032, Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Mr. Richard Crone, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Michael Gries, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, Mr. Norman Sigrist, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Roger Ward, Mr. Charles A. Welsh, Steven A. Wentworth and Mr. Ron Wetz in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] --[Edited 03/06/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] SAP [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:33 AM]
March 5, 2019 [10631070] Entry of appearance filed by Patrick T. Haney and Edwin John U for Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed.) Served on 03/05/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3032] --[Edited 03/05/2019 by DD to modify text] [Entered: 03/05/2019 10:44 AM]
March 5, 2019 [10631061] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 03/05/2019. [19-3032] [Entered: 03/05/2019 10:37 AM]
March 5, 2019 [10631019] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick Haney and Edwin John U for Not Parties Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC and Syngenta Seeds, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/05/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] --[Edited 03/05/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 3/5/19] PTH [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:17 AM]
March 5, 2019 [10630931] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP and Steven A. Wentworth. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 03/04/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3032] [Entered: 03/05/2019 07:27 AM]
March 4, 2019 [10630896] Entry of appearance submitted by William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 03/05/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 3/5/19][19-3032] WBC [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:44 PM]
March 4, 2019 [10630703] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 04/08/2019 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KSkc), Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3032] [Entered: 03/04/2019 11:22 AM]
March 4, 2019 [10630697] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Served on: 03/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] PJS [Entered: 03/04/2019 11:01 AM]
March 4, 2019 [10630635] Deficiency notice issued. Appellant's notice of appearance and transcript order form due on 03/14/2019 for Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. [19-3032] [Entered: 03/04/2019 09:29 AM]
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order [10630515] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach abating these cases pending a ruling by the district court on the motion for clarification; directing the parties to file a joint report within 30 days of the date of this order; directing the parties to file a joint response clarifying the parties in these appeals. (Status report due 04/01/2019 by Abreo & Carter, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., W. Dean Belk Jr., Bieber Farm, Bigham Law Firm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, Butler Snow, LLP, CE Cobb Farms, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Charles Cobb, Richard Crone, Conrad F. Cropsey, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Leroy Edlund, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Five Star Farms, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Grafel Farms, LLC, Greak Law, P.C., Michael Gries, Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Aaron D. Hovan, JPPL, Inc., John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Joseph F. Manak, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Marvin Miller, Molleur Law Office, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Orlans, P.C., Kenneth Osborn, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Pine Hurst Acres, David Polifka, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Richard Russell, David Schwaninger, Norman Sigrist, Slaven Law Group, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., VJW Farm, Inc., Bradley J. Vermeer, Kenneth G. Walsh, Roger Ward, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Charles A. Welsh, Steven A. Wentworth, Ron Wetz, White & Allen, P.A., Watts Guerra LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Response due on 03/15/2019 for Abreo & Carter, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., W. Dean Belk Jr., Bieber Farm, Bigham Law Firm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, Butler Snow, LLP, CE Cobb Farms, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Charles Cobb, Richard Crone, Conrad F. Cropsey, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Leroy Edlund, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Five Star Farms, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Grafel Farms, LLC, Greak Law, P.C., Michael Gries, Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Aaron D. Hovan, JPPL, Inc., John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Joseph F. Manak, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Marvin Miller, Molleur Law Office, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Orlans, P.C., Kenneth Osborn, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Pine Hurst Acres, David Polifka, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Richard Russell, David Schwaninger, Norman Sigrist, Slaven Law Group, Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., VJW Farm, Inc., Bradley J. Vermeer, Kenneth G. Walsh, Roger Ward, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Charles A. Welsh, Steven A. Wentworth, Ron Wetz, White & Allen, P.A., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Watts Guerra LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C. and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP.) (See the attachment for the entire order.) Served on 03/01/2019. [19-3008, 19-3032, 19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:36 PM]
February 28, 2019 [10630014] Response filed by Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, Cross-Appellants to Response to Court's Order. Served on 02/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 03/01/2019 by MLB to remove from cases 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] [19-3032] BW [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:10 AM]
February 27, 2019 [10629776] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Rachel E. Schwartz and Mr. Bradley T. Wilders for "All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross-Appellants. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:25 PM]
February 27, 2019 [10629731] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mitchell A. Toups for William Thomas, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Mr. James M. Pietz, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John E. Tarburton, Orlans, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Slaven Law Group, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Molleur Law Office, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, John M. Totten, P.C., Bigham Law Firm, Mr. Nathan A. East, Mr. Richard Russell, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Terrie Harman, White & Allen, P.A. and Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. The list of attorneys appearing in the district court who may have an interest in the courts award of attorneys fees and/or represented Plaintiffs who are likely covered by the settlement class runs into the thousands. Pursuant to the instruction of the Clerks Office, we will provide further information on request. Served on 02/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:21 PM]
February 27, 2019 [10629722] Entry of appearance filed by Richard L. Coffman for Toups-Coffman Cross-Appellees (Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., et al.) CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:04 PM]
February 27, 2019 [10629703] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard L. Coffman for Appellees Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Mr. James M. Pietz, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John E. Tarburton, Orlans, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Slaven Law Group, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Molleur Law Office, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, John M. Totten, P.C., Bigham Law Firm, Mr. Nathan A. East, Mr. Richard Russell, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Terrie Harman, William Thomas and White & Allen, P.A. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] --[Edited 02/27/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] RLC [Entered: 02/27/2019 01:35 PM]
February 27, 2019 [10629685] Entry of appearance submitted by Bradley T. Wilders and Rachel E. Schwartz for All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross-Appellants for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032]--[Edited 02/27/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] BW [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:58 PM]
February 27, 2019 [10629672] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Gretchen Garrison and Mr. Don Manley Downing for "All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross-Appellants" CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:26 PM]
February 27, 2019 [10629670] Entry of appearance submitted by Mitchell A. Toups for Appellee Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs* for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032]--[Edited 02/27/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 2/27/19.] MAT [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:24 PM]
February 27, 2019 [10629665] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher Adam Seeger for "All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross-Appellants" CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:16 PM]
February 27, 2019 [10629653] Entry of appearance filed by Eric Alan Isaacson for Appellees Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Mr. James M. Pietz, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John E. Tarburton, Orlans, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Slaven Law Group, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Molleur Law Office, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, John M. Totten, P.C., Bigham Law Firm, Mr. Nathan A. East, Mr. Richard Russell, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Terrie Harman, William Thomas and White & Allen, P.A.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/27/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3032] [Entered: 02/27/2019 11:55 AM]
February 27, 2019 [10629637] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric Alan Isaacson for Appellees Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Mr. James M. Pietz, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John E. Tarburton, Orlans, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Slaven Law Group, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Molleur Law Office, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, John M. Totten, P.C., Bigham Law Firm, Mr. Nathan A. East, Mr. Richard Russell, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Terrie Harman, William Thomas and White & Allen, P.A. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/27/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 2/27/19][19-3032] EAI [Entered: 02/27/2019 11:29 AM]
February 27, 2019 [10629580] Entry of appearance submitted by Don Downing and Gretchen Garrison for All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross-Appellants for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] --[Edited 02/27/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] DMD [Entered: 02/27/2019 10:25 AM]
February 27, 2019 [10629517] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Diogenes P. Kekatos, Esq. and Mr. Stephen A. Weiss for All Plaintiffs-Appellees. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/26/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3032] [Entered: 02/27/2019 08:34 AM]
February 27, 2019 [10629497] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric R. Nitz and Mr. Jeffrey A. Lamken for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] [Entered: 02/27/2019 07:57 AM]
February 26, 2019 [10629462] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen A. Weiss and Diogenes P. Kekatos for All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross-Appellants for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/27/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 02/27/19][19-3032] SAW [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:48 PM]
February 26, 2019 [10629455] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher A. Seeger for All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross-Appellants for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] --[Edited 02/27/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] CAS [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:39 PM]
February 26, 2019 [10629422] Docketing statement filed by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Served on 02/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] PJS [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:49 PM]
February 26, 2019 [10629284] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Thomas Wiegand for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032] [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:47 AM]
February 26, 2019 [10629248] Entry of appearance submitted by Thomas J. Wiegand for Appellee Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032]--[Edited 02/27/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 2/26/19.] TW [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:21 AM]
February 26, 2019 [10629247] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey A. Lamken, Eric R. Nitz for Appellee Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032]--[Edited 02/26/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] JAL [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:18 AM]
February 19, 2019 [10627562] Entry of appearance filed by Jennifer B. Wieland and Thomas P. Schult for Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC in 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/19/2019. Manner of Service: email [18-3253, 19-3032, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:07 PM]
February 19, 2019 [10627506] Entry of appearance submitted by Jennifer B. Wieland and Thomas P. Schult for Appellees Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC in 18-3253, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, Not Parties Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC in 19-3032, 19-3005 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3005] --[Edited 02/19/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JBW [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:18 AM]
February 15, 2019 [10627417] Entry of appearance filed by Clayton A Clark and Scott A. Love for Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Charles A. Welsh and Ron Wetz. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 02/15/2019. Manner of Service: email [18-3253, 19-3032, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] [Entered: 02/19/2019 08:39 AM]
February 15, 2019 [10627402] Entry of appearance filed by Jason Mark Milne and Martin John Phipps for Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Charles A. Welsh, and Ron Wetz. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50. Served on 02/15/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3032, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009] [Entered: 02/19/2019 08:18 AM]
February 15, 2019 [10627244] Entry of appearance submitted by Clayton A. Clark, Scott A. Love for Not Party Clark, Love & Hutson GP in 19-3032, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Charles A. Welsh, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, and Ron Wetz for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3032, 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022] --[Edited 02/19/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/19/19] CAC [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:58 PM]
February 15, 2019 [10627200] Entry of appearance submitted by Martin J. Phipps and Jason M. Milne for Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Charles A. Welsh, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, and Ron Wetz for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032] --[Edited 02/19/2019 by DD. REmoved PDF as pleading filed 2/19/19] MJP [Entered: 02/15/2019 12:42 PM]
February 14, 2019 [10626861] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. The appellants are directed to file a written response addressing whether, via this cross-appeal, they intend to raise alternative grounds for affirmance, see Jennings v. Stephens, 135 S. Ct. 793, 798-99 (2015) (holding that an appellee need not file a cross-appeal to urge alternative ground for relief); United Fire & Cas. Co. v. Boulder Plaza Residential, LLC, 633 F.3d 951, 958 (10th Cir. 2011) (noting that an appellee may raise any alternative ground for affirmance appearing in the record without filing a cross-appeal), or whether they intend to enlarge or diminish rights, see Jennings, 135 S. Ct. at 798-99 (noting that a cross-appeal is required for an appellee to enlarge his own rights or lessen those of his adversary). Response due on 02/28/2019 for Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. The deadlines for filing preliminary documents remian in effect. Served on 02/14/2019. [19-3032] [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:35 AM]
February 13, 2019 [10626740] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/10/2018 Docketing statement due 02/27/2019 for Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter & Graham, P.C., Hare Wynn Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Transcript order form due 02/27/2019 for Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter & Graham, P.C., Hare Wynn Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Notice of appearance due on 02/27/2019 for Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, W. Dean Belk Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter & Graham, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Hare Wynn Newell & Newton, Terrie Harman, Aaron D. Hovan, John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Joseph F. Manak, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs*, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Kenneth G. Walsh, Watts Guerra LLP, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. [19-3032] [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: TEEL & MARONEY, PLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ABREO & CARTER
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: RICHARDSON, PATRICK, WESTBROOK & BRICKMAN, LLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DYE SNYDER, LLP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON LLP
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JOHN L. JERNIGAN, III, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GRAY REED & MCGRAW, P.C.
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: RICHARD RUSSELL, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JOHN E. TARBURTON, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JAMES M. PIETZ, Attorney, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CONRAD F. CROPSEY, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HALLETT, HALLETT & NAGEL
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: TERRIE HARMAN, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JOSEPH F. MANAK, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: TROUSDALE RYAN, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THOMAS P. CALHOUN, III, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WILLIAM THOMAS, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BUTLER SNOW, LLP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SLAVEN LAW GROUP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BIGHAM LAW FIRM
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WHITE & ALLEN, P.A.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WELLER, GREEN, TOUPS & TERRELL, LLP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GREAK LAW, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THOMPSON, GARRETT & HINES
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: FISHERBROYLES, LLP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BARRETT WYLIE, LLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JOHN M. TOTTEN, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: W. DEAN BELK, JR., Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JINKS, CROW & DICKSON, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GAMBLE & RUSSELL, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: RAY, WINTON & KELLEY, PLLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HAJJAR PETERS, LLP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: AARON D. HOVAN, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: E. RUDOLPH MCINTYRE, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: KENNETH G. WALSH, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NATHAN A. EAST, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DURRETT, ARKEMA, GERSON & GILL, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WATTS GUERRA LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Represented By: Thomas Wiegand
Represented By: Eric R. Nitz
Represented By: William P. Ferranti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ORLANS, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: OTTS, MOORE, COALE, GODWIN, STEARNS & DARBY
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ESTES & KENNEDY LAW OFFICES, PLLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: KIZER, BONDS, HUGHES & BOWEN, PLLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: RICHARD L. COFFMAN, P.C., DBA The Coffman Law Firm
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CHRIS W. FITZGERALD, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BYRON STONE, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BRIAN FITZWATER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ELLIS & JUDD LAW OFFICE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: OVERBOE LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JENNA LAIRD LEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: TOURKOW CRELL ROSENBLATT & JOHNSTON LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CLARK LOVE & HUTSON, GP
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: William Wayne Lundquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WALK & MURPHY, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HERITAGE LEGAL GROUP PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CARPENTER & SCHUMACHER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MORRIS LAING EVANS BROCK & KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GREEN ESPEL PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SIMMONS HANLY CONROY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: PHILLIPPI LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MUSKE, MUSKE, SUHRHOFF LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WEEKS & BRUCKER, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: VAN KLEY & WALKER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: RICHARD D. LARSON, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BATTS, BATTS & BELL, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CLARK & CLARK P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MCCLURE, THOMAS & THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAW OFFICES OF LEONEL ALEJANDRO PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DILLON LEGAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CHURCH, CHURCH, HITTLE & ANTRIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JOHNSON LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CONNORS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SEEGER WEISS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HAWKINS LAW, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THE LAW OFFICE OF MARK L EUREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HODGE LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MAYNES LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAW OFFICE OF MIKE CRANE, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JEREMY P. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAW OFFICES OF HANS A. BUEHLER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SORLING NORTHRUP ATTORNEYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DANIEL M. HOMOLKA, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ATLEE HALL, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ANGEL, ISAACSON & TRACY, ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BRENNAN STEIL S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DENNEY & BARRETT, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ALERDING CASTOR HEWITT LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WADLER, PERCHES, HUNDL & KERLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MCFARLAND LAW, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: OKOON HINTERMEISTER, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SHAMBERG, WOLF, MCDERMOTT & DEPUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: FELLHEIMER LAW FIRM LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BLOOM GATES & WHITELEATHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: RYAN MOORE & COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WOODS ROGERS PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WORTH LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BRAND & MORELOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THE LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS R. FIELDS, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: TULLY LAW OFFICE, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THE GIBBS LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: FAITH INGLE SMITH LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JUSTIN HILL, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DOBBS LEGAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: QUIRK & HUNTER, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MOORE, SUSLER, MCNUTT & WRIGLEY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: FOREMAN WATSON HOLTREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JAKE W. BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CRITCHFIELD CRITCHFIELD & JOHSON, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BRIANA DEANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MAILANDER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THE LAW OFFICE OF ROB TULLY PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HABUSH HABUSH & ROTTIER S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: VANDERGINST LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GARY T. GEE LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: COLE, EASLEY, SCIBA & WILLIAMS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DAVID R. ADELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DAVIS & CAMPBELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: KEVIN W. LILES PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SONENBERG LAW LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WRIGHT SCHIMMEL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: PLEWS SHADLEY RACHER & BRAUN LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BOREN, OLVER AND COFFEY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HUME, SMITH, GEDDES, GREEN & SIMMONS, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: W. CALLOWAY HUFFAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ZEILINGER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: REICHERT LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LUNDBERG LAW FIRM PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SCHULTZ LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DEBORAH K. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: RILEY-TANIS & ASSOCIATES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: COOTS, HENKE & WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BERNATZ & VAN BEEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ARNDT BUSWELL & THORN S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: REICHERT WENNER, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BROCK LAW OFFICES PC LLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAMKIN & LAMKIN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BURNS CRONAUER & BROWN LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, LLP
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HENSLEY LEGAL GROUP PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DARLING & DARLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: KOENIG LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MARTZ & LUCAS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MAZZANTI LAW OFFICE, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NATHAN J. NOBLE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LEE J. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GREGG NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CRESS LAW GROUP, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BILL J. MILNER LAW OFFICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ROB TULLY LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: KITTELSEN, BARRY, WELLINGTON, THOMPSON, & SCHLUESCHE, ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CHARLES HEAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SNEED LANG PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DREW YOUNG LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ALLEN, STEIN & DURBIN, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DANIEL QUIGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BORING & BORING, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MARK A. ROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: COTTON, BOLTON, HOYCHICK & DOUGHTY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SCHWARZ LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BROOKS & OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: RHOADES MCKEE PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CLINE FARRELL CHRISTIE & LEE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: NORMAN PALOUCEK & HERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JOHNSON & MOCK, PC LLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JEFFERSON & BREWER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GRIFFIN DIETRICH & ELLIOT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WINSTEIN, KAVENSKY & CUNNINGHAM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: TUCKER & TUCKER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MEADOR & CRUMP, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: STRITTMATTER LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WILLIS & WILLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MALONEY & CAMPOLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CUSTY LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: FEARER, NYE, & CHADWICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MCNEELY STEPHENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BLAKEMAN & SCHROCK, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: KELLEY LAW FIRM, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BIRD, JACOBSEN & STEVENS, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MICHAEL ASHAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: OUDERKIRK LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BROYLES KIGHT & RICAFORT, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: KNUTH LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BATTLE & WINN LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MAURO ARCHER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: FRUNDT & JOHNSON, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BROWN, DEPREZ & JOHNSON, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JASON SCHUTTE, KOEPKE & HILTABRAND ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAURIE S. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THE MCQUADES CO. LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: STONE LAW OFFICE, P.L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: RICCOLO, SEMELROTH, & HENNINGSEN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WELD, RILEY, PRENN & RICCI S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HART BELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BRADFORD LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MORGAN & MEYERS, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JEFF LINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ROBERTS LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ALLEN WELLMAN MCNEW HARVEY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BAKER, BODWELL, APPEL ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAW OFFICE OF HAMMELL & MURPHY PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JAMES & LARSON LAW, JAMES LAW, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DEWALD DEAVER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MICHAEL J. GALANIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: IRVIN L. MASCHING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SCOTT POYNTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY E. TONORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MICHAEL GROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CHARLES E. CRONAUER & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DELZER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MILTNER LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: PEN COSBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MILLER SCHIRGER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: KUHLMAN & LUCAS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THE WINKIE LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THRASH LAW FIRM, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GEORGE M. BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SEVER STOREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS A. NOE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: TUCKER LAW PRACTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BARBARA J. SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MEIER, BRAGICICH & MOORE LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WOOD & RUE, PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER H. POYNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ALEX KOENIGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: PATTERSON COMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: TROYER & GOOD, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: OBEAR, OVERHOLSER, HUFFER & RIDER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MORRISSEY, MORRISSEY & DALLUGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ROTH LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THE CANTLIN LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SHERMAN HOFFMAN & HIPP, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CORNELL LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MARCH, MCMILLAN, DEJOODE & DUVALL, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SPEER LAW FIRM, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LEO BOOTHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SPENCER GILLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THE STROM LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HECKER LAW GROUP, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CARABIN & SHAW, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HEINISCH & LOVEGROVE LAW OFFICE, PC LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BROOKS PIERCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HEHNER & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: FAFINSKI MARK & JOHNSON, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GORDON & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: LANGDON & EMISON ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BARRETT, EASTERDAY, CUNNINGHAM & ESELGROTH, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: EMERSON POYNTER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MORNING LAW OFFICE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SATTERLEY AND KELLEY, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BRAU LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: COPLEY ROTH & WILSON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CHARNETSKI, LACINA & CLOWER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CAUGHEY, LEGNER & FREEHILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MYERS HOCKEMEYER & MCNAGNY LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: FITZGERALD LAW P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: STOERZBACH LAW OFFICE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: RANDLE & SAMMONS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THE POPPE LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: KC COHEN, LAWYER, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: KEATON & KEATON PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JANZEN AGRICULTURAL LAW, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC
Represented By: David A. Goodwin
Represented By: Eric S. Taubel
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: STOCKARD, JOHNSTON, & BROWN, P.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: HAMPTON & ROYCE, L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CULBERTSON & ALLEN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: EMERICK, DIGGINS & ZABONA P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THE LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. LAPOINTE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: KIRK LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GRAYBILL & WITCHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance |