Williams v. United States, et al
Defendant: (FNU) CLARK, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, JOHN/JANE DOES, Unit Team or Other, in their individual and official capacities, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, Director of the Federal Burea of Prisons, in his individual and official capacity, LORETTA E. LYNCH, Attorney General, in her individual and official capacity and I. CONNORS, National Inmate Administrator, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Defendant / Appellee: BUREAU OF PRISONS, WITT, Correctional Officer, USP-Leavenworth, in her indiviudal and official capacity, LIONHART, Special Investigation Service, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, STANLEY, Food Service Administrator, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (FNU) JOHNSON, Unit manager, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, MANILY, Food Service Official, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, BLEVINS, Health Service Administrator, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, (FNU) PHELPS, Associate Warden, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, CRUZ, DIsciplinary Hearing Officer, USP-Leavenworth, in his indivual and official Capacity, C. MAYE, CEO, Warden, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, K. AULEPP, MD,DO, Clinical Director for the BOP, USP-Leavenworth, in her individual and official capacity, HERBIG, Special Investigative Services, USP-Leavenworth, in his indiviudal and official capacity, PAUL LEONHARD, Special Investigation Service, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, SHANNON PHELPS, Associate Warden, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, GLENNA CREWS, DIsciplinary Hearing Officer, USP-Leavenworth, in his indivual and official Capacity, CAROL WITT, Correctional Officer, USP-Leavenworth, in her indiviudal and official capacity, MICHAEL MANLEY, Food Service Official, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, JOHN JOHNSON, Unit manager, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, JARAD HERBIG, Special Investigative Services, USP-Leavenworth, in his indiviudal and official capacity, KRISTINE AULEPP, MD,DO, Clinical Director for the BOP, USP-Leavenworth, in her individual and official capacity, CLAUDE MAYE, CEO, Warden, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity, JUSTIN BLEVINS, Health Service Administrator, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity and SCOTT STANLEY, Food Service Administrator, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTHONY D. WILLIAMS
Case Number: 19-3047
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 27, 2020 Williams v. United States

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 [10644860] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant's motion to extend time. Appellant's brief and 1915 forms due on 06/05/2019 for Anthony D. Williams. No further extensions of time will be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 04/29/2019. [19-3047] [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:03 PM]
April 29, 2019 [10644800] Appellant's motion filed by Anthony D. Williams to extend time to file appellant's brief and to either pay the fee or file 1915 forms until 06/04/2019. Served on 04/25/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3047] [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:47 PM]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order [10641241] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich denying appellant's motion to appoint counsel filed by Appellant Anthony D. Williams. Served on 04/15/2019. [19-3047] [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:22 PM]
April 15, 2019 [10641240] Appellant's motion filed by Anthony D. Williams to appoint counsel. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3047] [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:21 PM]
April 2, 2019 [10637859] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 7, Comments: Volumes I - VI - Pleadings, Volume VII - Sealed Pleadings. [19-3047] [Entered: 04/02/2019 09:43 AM]
March 27, 2019 [10636170] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or 1915 forms and appellant's opening brief due on 05/06/2019 for Anthony D. Williams. Record on appeal due for 10th circuit 04/17/2019. [19-3047] [Entered: 03/27/2019 08:17 AM]
March 27, 2019 [10636169] District Court order granting IFP. [19-3047] [Entered: 03/27/2019 08:15 AM]
March 25, 2019 [10635649] Entry of appearance filed by Anthony D. Williams. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/15/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-3047] [Entered: 03/25/2019 01:37 PM]
March 20, 2019 [10634605] Certificate of service filed by Kristine Aulepp, Justin Blevins, Bureau of Prisons, Glenna Crews, Jarad Herbig, Sergeant John Johnson, Paul Leonhard, Michael Manley, Claude Maye, Shannon Phelps, Scott Stanley, United States of America and Carol Witt. Document served: Amended Certificate of Service of Entry of Appearance. Served on 03/20/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3047] CA [Entered: 03/20/2019 02:03 PM]
March 19, 2019 [10634060] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher Allman for United States of America and Bureau of Prisons. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/19/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3047] [Entered: 03/19/2019 08:11 AM]
March 19, 2019 [10634038] Entry of appearance submitted by James Christopher Allman for Appellees United States of America and Bureau of Prisons for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/18/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3047]--[Edited 03/19/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] CA [Entered: 03/19/2019 07:27 AM]
March 18, 2019 [10633868] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: BOP and the United States have not filed an entry of appearance. Notice of appearance due on 03/28/2019 for Bureau of Prisons and United States of America. [19-3047] [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:28 PM]
March 5, 2019 [10631098] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher Allman for Sergeant (FNU) Johnson, K. Aulepp, Blevins, Cruz, Leonhard,Manily, Maye,Stanley, Witt and Herbig. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/05/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3047] [Entered: 03/05/2019 12:10 PM]
March 5, 2019 [10631028] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher Allman for Appellees K. Aulepp, Blevins, Bureau of Prisons, Herbig, Sergeant (FNU) Johnson, (FNU) Phelps, Manily, Stanley, Witt, Cruz, C. Maye and Lionhart for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/05/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3047]--[Edited 03/05/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 3/5/19.] CA [Entered: 03/05/2019 09:35 AM]
March 1, 2019 [10630430] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/01/2019. Notice of appearance due on 03/15/2019 for K. Aulepp, Blevins, Bureau of Prisons, Cruz, Herbig, (FNU) Johnson, Lionhart, Manily, C. Maye, (FNU) Phelps, Stanley, United States of America and Witt, and Notice of appearance due on 04/01/2019 for Anthony D. Williams. [19-3047] [Entered: 03/01/2019 01:03 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Williams v. United States, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (FNU) CLARK, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES, Unit Team or Other, in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES E. SAMUELS, Director of the Federal Burea of Prisons, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORETTA E. LYNCH, Attorney General, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. CONNORS, National Inmate Administrator, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUREAU OF PRISONS
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WITT, Correctional Officer, USP-Leavenworth, in her indiviudal and official capacity
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIONHART, Special Investigation Service, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STANLEY, Food Service Administrator, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: (FNU) JOHNSON, Unit manager, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MANILY, Food Service Official, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLEVINS, Health Service Administrator, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: (FNU) PHELPS, Associate Warden, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRUZ, DIsciplinary Hearing Officer, USP-Leavenworth, in his indivual and official Capacity
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. MAYE, CEO, Warden, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: K. AULEPP, MD,DO, Clinical Director for the BOP, USP-Leavenworth, in her individual and official capacity
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HERBIG, Special Investigative Services, USP-Leavenworth, in his indiviudal and official capacity
Represented By: David Clay Britton III
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL LEONHARD, Special Investigation Service, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHANNON PHELPS, Associate Warden, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GLENNA CREWS, DIsciplinary Hearing Officer, USP-Leavenworth, in his indivual and official Capacity
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROL WITT, Correctional Officer, USP-Leavenworth, in her indiviudal and official capacity
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL MANLEY, Food Service Official, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN JOHNSON, Unit manager, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JARAD HERBIG, Special Investigative Services, USP-Leavenworth, in his indiviudal and official capacity
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTINE AULEPP, MD,DO, Clinical Director for the BOP, USP-Leavenworth, in her individual and official capacity
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLAUDE MAYE, CEO, Warden, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUSTIN BLEVINS, Health Service Administrator, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT STANLEY, Food Service Administrator, USP-Leavenworth, in his individual and official capacity
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY D. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Anthony D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?