In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Plaintiff: CHARLES B. LEX, TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP, DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, BIEBER FARM, JPPL, INC., ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC, RON WETZ, MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC., KENNETH OSBORN, DEMMER FARMS, INC., TODD NIEMEYER, DAVID SCHWANINGER, D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC., MICHAEL GRIES, RICHARD CRONE, CE COBB FARMS, STEVEN A. WENTWORTH, CHARLES COBB, ROGER WARD, PINE HURST ACRES, FIVE STAR FARMS, BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC., VJW FARM, INC., GRAFEL FARMS, LLC, NEBCO, INC., AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC, KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY, DAVID POLIFKA, PETER V. ANDERSON, DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, ROBERT NIEMEYER, NORMAN SIGRIST, GRANT ANNEXSTAD, BRADLEY J. VERMEER, BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP, MARVIN MILLER, LEROY EDLUND, CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC and CHARLES A. WELSH
Defendant: SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION AG, SYNGENTA SEEDS, LLC, FKA Syngenta Seeds, Inc., SYNGENTA BIOTECHNOLOGY, INC., SYNGENTA AG, SYNGENTA CORPORATION and SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC
Not Yet Classified: HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C., CHAPMAN LAW LLC, DENNEY & BARRETT, PC, DANIEL QUIGLEY, MCFARLAND LAW, PC, LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY R. VAUGHAN, P.C., TED B. LYON & ASSOCIATES, P.C., HOLLAND LAW FIRM, BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC, RYAN MOORE & COOK, WICKENS & WICKENS, LLC, RHOADES MCKEE PC, RICHARD M. HOLMES, GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C., CHESTER LAW OFFICE, CRYSTAL D. PULLEY, ATTORNEY AT LAW, WINSTEIN, KAVENSKY & CUNNINGHAM, LLC, MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC, KEMPTON & RUSSELL, LLC, WASKER DOOR WIMMER & MARCOUILLER, P.C., FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC, GREGORY L. CESHKER, P.C., TOM BENSON, FORDE LAW OFFICES LLP, LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA, MCNEELY STEPHENSON, TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP, OUDERKIRK LAW FIRM, GARY T. GEE LAW OFFICE, THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC, COLE, EASLEY, SCIBA & WILLIAMS, P.C., HALL HUDSON, P.C., THE CAHILL LAW OFFICES, SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C., WIL GALLOWAY & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, BARRETT MCNAGNY LLP, BATTLE & WINN LLP, WRIGHT SCHIMMEL LLC, MAURO ARCHER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC, BOREN, OLVER AND COFFEY, LLP, FENCHEL, DOSTER & BUCK, PLC, DENTON & KEULER, LLP, WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC, CHARLES HEAR, ATTORNEY AT LAW, QUIGLEY LAW OFFICE, PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P., COLVIN, CHANEY, SAENZ & RODRIGUEZ, LLP, BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC, REICHERT LAW OFFICE, JEFF LINK, TROTH LAW OFFICE, SCHNELKER, RASSI & MCCONNELL PLC, MEYER & MEYER LLP, ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON, BERNATZ & VAN BEEK, MASSIE & QUICK, LLC, THE GIBBS LAW FIRM, SWAIM LAW FIRM, PLLC, JOHN R. DELZER, BARBARA J. SIMMONS ATTORNEY AT LAW, DARLING & DARLING, BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE, NATHAN J. NOBLE, P.C., O'KOON HINTERMEISTER, PLLC, CROSS PENNAMPED WOOLSEY & GLAZIER, P.C., FEARER, NYE, & CHADWICK, BILL J. MILNER LAW OFFICES, GORDON & ASSOCIATES, P.C., TOURKOW CRELL ROSENBLATT & JOHNSTON LLP, BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C., JUSTIN HILL, PC, MEIER, BRAGICICH & MOORE LLP, BAKKE NORMAN, S.C., CARPENTER & SCHUMACHER, P.C., GRENFELL, SLEDGE AND STEVENS, TROYER & GOOD, PC, CLARK & CLARK P.C., JOHNSON, MOODY, SCHMIDT & KLEINHUIZEN, P.A., MCCLURE, THOMAS & THOMAS, COTTON, BOLTON, HOYCHICK & DOUGHTY, LLP, WRIGHT & SCHULTE LLC, THE CANTLIN LAW FIRM, BROOKS & OLSON, CHURCH, CHURCH, HITTLE & ANTRIM, SPENCER GILLAND, THE STROM LAW FIRM, LLC, CARABIN & SHAW, P.C., WELD, RILEY, PRENN & RICCI S.C., HEINISCH & LOVEGROVE LAW OFFICE, PC LLP, HEHNER & ASSOCIATES, LLC, CONNORS LLP, NORMAN PALOUCEK & HERMAN, FAFINSKI MARK & JOHNSON, P.A., STRITTMATTER LAW FIRM, RAMMELKAMP BRADNEY, P.C., THE LAW OFFICE OF MARK L EUREK, JEFFREY A. BOGGESS, P.C., SHIMANEK, SHIMANEK, & BOWMAN, LLC, FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH, KRAFT WALSER LAW OFFICE, PLLP, MILLER PEARSON GLOE BURNS BEATTY & PARRISH, P.L.C., WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD, DOERING & GRISELL, PA, CHARLES E. CRONAUER & ASSOCIATES, BLAKEMAN & SCHROCK, LTD, WARNER NORCROSS & JUDD, LLP, ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP, ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP, BEINE & ROBERTS LAW FIRM, PLC, BRENNAN STEIL S.C., BIRD, JACOBSEN & STEVENS, PC, MICHAEL ASHAR, SATTERLEY AND KELLEY, PLLC, SORLING NORTHRUP ATTORNEYS, BROYLES KIGHT & RICAFORT, PC, BRETT DUNN PLLC, CAUGHEY, LEGNER & FREEHILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN, SHAMBERG, WOLF, MCDERMOTT & DEPUE, VANDERVOORT CHRIST & FISHER, P.C., THE POPPE LAW FIRM, LAURIE S. WARD, MERTES & MERTES, P.C., STOCKARD, JOHNSTON, & BROWN, P.C, WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A., EMERICK, DIGGINS & ZABONA P.C., ADAMS, RIZZI & SWEEN, P.A., FAITH INGLE SMITH LAW FIRM, JAMES & LARSON LAW, JAMES LAW, P.C., GRAYBILL & WITCHER, LLP, OSTERBAUER LAW FIRM, MICHAEL SMITH LAW, SIMON HERBERT & MCCLELLAND, LLP, CLENDENING JOHNSON & BOHRER, P.C., DOBBS LEGAL GROUP, MILTNER LAW FIRM, LLC, GELLHAUS & GELLHAUS, P. C., BRIANA DEANE, JAKE W. BROOKS ATTORNEY AT LAW, WHITMAN, BABER, & SIEGEL, VANDERGINST LAW, PAUL LLP, THE WINKIE LAW FIRM, LLC, CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC, STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP, VELA LAW OFFICES PLLC, NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW, MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL, JENNA LAIRD LEGER, VAUGHAN LAW FIRM, P.C., SEVER STOREY, TUCKER LAW PRACTICE, MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP, WOOD & RUE, PLLP, HERITAGE LEGAL GROUP PLLC, PHILLIPPI LAW FIRM, LLC, WOODARD LAW PC., DEBORAH K. SMITH, HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON, KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C., SHERMAN HOFFMAN & HIPP, LC, DILLON LEGAL GROUP, ARNDT BUSWELL & THORN S.C., LEO BOOTHE, JOHNSON LAW GROUP, WILLIAM F. SMITH, HECKER LAW GROUP, PLC, WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C., MORGAN & MEYERS, PLC, EDMUND A. WEINHEIMER, JR., P. C., JEREMY P. COHEN, KOVARIK, ELLISON & MATHIS, P.C., BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES, PEMBERTON, SORLIE, RUFER, & KERSHNER, PLLP, GRIFFIN DIETRICH & ELLIOT, LLC, BARRETT, EASTERDAY, CUNNINGHAM & ESELGROTH, LLP, EMERSON POYNTER LLP, ATLEE HALL, LLP, LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP, ANGEL, ISAACSON & TRACY, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, HABUSH HABUSH & ROTTIER, S.C., SNEED LANG PC, MICHAEL GOSS, DREW YOUNG LAW, ALLEN, STEIN & DURBIN, PC, WADLER, PERCHES, HUNDL & KERLICK, MORNING LAW OFFICE LLC, CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC, MYERS HOCKEMEYER & MCNAGNY LLP, GREENE ESPEL PLLP, KC COHEN, LAWYER, PC, SCHWARZ LAW OFFICE, ZEILINGER LAW OFFICE, WOODS ROGERS PLC, HAMPTON & ROYCE, L.C., EICH, VAN DYKE, WERDAN & STEGER P.C., WEEKS & BRUCKER, LTD, KIRK LAW FIRM, LAW OFFICE OF BRENT GAINES, WILLIS & WILLIS, QUIRK & HUNTER, PC, MALONEY & CAMPOLO, CUSTY LAW FIRM, LLC, MITCHELL C. CHANEY, BORING & BORING, PC, PATRICK A. ELWARD, STOERZBACH LAW OFFICE, P.C., CRITCHFIELD CRITCHFIELD & JOHSON, LTD., BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC, THE LAW OFFICE OF ROB TULLY PC, REILING TEDER & SCHRIER, LLC, ENDURANCE LAW GROUP PLC, LANGDON & EMISON ATTORNEYS AT LAW, PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, L.L.P., DAVIS & CAMPBELL, LLC, KNUTH LAW OFFICE, KEVIN W. LILES PC, MINER & LEMON, LLP, FRUNDT & JOHNSON, LTD., KEULER, KELLY HUTCHINS & BLANKENSHIP, LLP, BROWN, DEPREZ & JOHNSON, P.A., LAW OFFICE OF MIKE CRANE, LLP, W. CALLOWAY HUFFAKER, CALL & GENTRY LAW GROUP, BRADFORD LAW FIRM, WILLADSEN & NEAL LLC, LAW OFFICE OF LESTER WEINSTINE, P.C., LAW OFFICE OF HAMMELL & MURPHY PLLP, RILEY-TANIS & ASSOCIATES PLLC, DEBORAH SMITH MCCLURE, P.C., COOTS, HENKE & WHEELER, BOHRER BRADY LLC, LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER, REICHERT WENNER, P.A., BROCK LAW OFFICES PC LLO, LAMKIN & LAMKIN, P.C., FLYNN & SULLIVAN PC, LAW OFFICE OF EZEQUIEL REYNA, JR., ANTHONY O'HANLON, P.C., MARTZ & LUCAS, LLC, INGEBRITSON & ASSOCIATES, P.A., LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS, GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC, HOVLAND & RASMUS, PLLC, STONE LAW OFFICE, P.L.L.C., WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP, ROB TULLY LAW FIRM, WYLAND, HUMPHREY & CLEVENGER LLP, LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER H. POYNOR, SCHMITTINGER & RODRIGUEZ, P.A., GROSBOLL, BECKER, TICE & BARR, PATTERSON COMER, BRENT C. EMBREY, MARK A. ROEDER, MORRISSEY, MORRISSEY & DALLUGE, CROSS LAW FIRM, LLC, NIDEY ERDAHL TINDAL & FISCHER, PLC, COLE LAW OFFICE, SAEED & LITTLE, LLP, CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P., CORNELL LAW OFFICE, CLINE FARRELL CHRISTIE & LEE, P.C., JOHNSON & MOCK, PC LLO, TAYLOR & RUHNKE, PC, STOUT LAW GROUP, JEFFERSON & BREWER, LLP, WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC, CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP, CULBERTSON & ALLEN, LLC, MEADOR & CRUMP, P.A., JANZEN AGRICULTURAL LAW, LLC, THE LAW OFFICE OF SAMUEL W. BEARMAN, L.C., WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK, MICHAEL J. GALANIS, LAW OFFICE OF ADAM CRAWSHAW, SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C., KELLEY LAW FIRM, PC, WAGNER REESE, LLP, BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS LLP, LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART, WALLACE LAW, DAVE O'BRIEN LAW, FITZGERALD LAW P.A., MORRIS LAING EVANS BROCK & KENNEDY, RAY A. FERGUSON & ASSOCIATES, LTD., MUSKE, MUSKE, SUHRHOFF LTD, JASON SCHUTTE, KOEPKE & HILTABRAND ATTORNEY AT LAW, THE MCQUADES CO. LPA, RICCOLO, SEMELROTH, & HENNINGSEN, P.C., BATTS, BATTS & BELL, LLP, HART BELL, LLC, BLOOM GATES & WHITELEATHER, LLP, WATTS GUERRA LLP, PEMBERTON LAW FIRM, LAW OFFICES OF LEONEL ALEJANDRO PC, ROBERTS LAW OFFICE, ALLEN WELLMAN MCNEW HARVEY, LLP, THE LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. LAPOINTE, P.C., EMERSON SCOTT LLP, DEWALD DEAVER, P.C., IRVIN L. MASCHING, BOLEN ROBINSON & ELLIS, LLP, LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY E. TONORE, SEEGER WEISS LLP, BRAU LAW OFFICE, HAWKINS LAW, PC, WEXLER WALLACE LLP, HODGE LAW FIRM, PATTON BROWN LAW, PLLC, MAYNES LAW OFFICE, PEN COSBY, PAGEL & WEIKUM, PLLP, WHALEY LAW FIRM, KATZ & KORIN, P.C., ROBINSON, CURPHEY & O'CONNEL, LLC, MILLER SCHIRGER LLC, KUHLMAN & LUCAS, LLC, THRASH LAW FIRM, P.A., MIDWEST AG SOLUTIONS LLC, KRUSE & DAKIN LLP, BOSCHMA LAW OFFICE, LIND JENSEN SULLIVAN & PETERSON P.A., ALERDING CASTOR HEWITT LLP, LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS A. NOE, III, THE PRUNEDA LAW FIRM, PLLC, VAN KLEY & WALKER, LLC, BASSFORD REMELE, P.A., YIRA LAW OFFICE, LTD, FELLHEIMER LAW FIRM LTD., ALEX KOENIGS, LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM R. SHIRK, OBEAR, OVERHOLSER, HUFFER & RIDER, LLC, STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON LLP, BRAND & MORELOCK, THE LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS R. FIELDS, P.A., THE LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE P. ESCOBEDO & ASSOCIATES, VIRTUS LAW PLLC, ROTH LAW FIRM, TULLY LAW OFFICE, PC, HOSTETTER & ASSOCIATES, TUCKER & TUCKER, P.C., WOLF ARDIS, P.C., DELZER LAW OFFICE, SCHWEBEL GOETZ & SIEBEN PA, CARY, WELCH, HICKMAN & HAWK, LLP, SCOTT POYNTER (POYNTER LAW GROUP), MARCH, MCMILLAN, DEJOODE & DUVALL, P.C., SPEER LAW FIRM, PC, GRAY REED & MCGRAW LLP, BYRON STONE, PLLC, MOORE, SUSLER, MCNUTT & WRIGLEY, LLC, PATTON HOVERSTEN & BERG P.A, BROOKS PIERCE, BRIAN FITZWATER LAW OFFICE, WAYNE J. LENNINGTON, ELLIS & JUDD LAW OFFICE, LLC, MAILANDER LAW OFFICE, BAKER, BODWELL, APPEL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, OVERBOE LAW, DAVID R. ADELMAN, GEORGE M. BISHOP, BARBER, SEGATTO, HOFFEE, WILKE & CATE, SONENBERG LAW LLC, PLEWS SHADLEY RACHER & BRAUN LLP, PICKNER LAW OFFICE, COPLEY ROTH & WILSON, LLC, HUME, SMITH, GEDDES, GREEN & SIMMONS, LLP, CHARNETSKI, LACINA & CLOWER, LLP, WALK & MURPHY, PLC, RANDLE & SAMMONS, P.C., SIMMONS HANLY CONROY LLC, LUNDBERG LAW FIRM PLC, SCHULTZ LAW, KEATON & KEATON PC, RICHARD D. LARSON, P.C., SOUNDING BOARD LEGAL, S.C., KRAMER LAW, LLC, MERCHO CAUGHEY & DELAY, SMITH GARDNER SLUSKY LAZER POHREN & ROGERS LLP, GREGG NEAL, WORTH LAW FIRM, BURNS CRONAUER & BROWN LLP, COCKERILL & COCKERILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, HENSLEY LEGAL GROUP PC, SOPER LEDDIN LAW FIRM, PC, KOENIG LAW FIRM, MAZZANTI LAW OFFICE, PLLC, FOREMAN WATSON HOLTREY, LEE J. LEWIS, LAW OFFICES OF HANS A. BUEHLER, LLC, ESPE LAW PLLC, VRIEZELAAR, TIGGES, EDINGTON, BOTTARO, BODEN, & ROSS, L.L.P., CRESS LAW GROUP, PC, DANIEL M. HOMOLKA, P.A., JOHNSON, KRAMER, MULHOLLAND, COCHRANE, DRISCOLL & COCHRANE, P.L.C., LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD HOFFMAN, KITTELSEN, BARRY, WELLINGTON, THOMPSON, & SCHLUESCHE, ATTORNEYS AT LAW and UNDERWOOD LAW FIRM, PC
Case Number: 19-3082
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 [10664392] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - The appeal remains abated pending allocation determinations in the remaining pools. The parties shall file a status report on or before 08/16/19 or within 5 days of any significant developments affecting any of these abated matters. Served on 07/19/2019. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082] [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:59 AM]
July 17, 2019 [10663764] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3082. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3079, 19-3082] JAL [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:14 PM]
July 1, 2019 [10659602] Minute order filed -These matters are before the court on the Toups/Coffman Groups Status Report and on the Watts Guerra Groups notice that it joins in the Toups/Coffman Groups status report. These matters remain abated pending allocation determinations in the remaining pools. The parties shall file a status report in accordance with the courts May 15, 2019 order. The next status report is due July 17, 2019. The parties may file joint status reports. The parties shall notify this court in writing within 5 days of any significant developments affecting any of these abated matters. Status report due 07/17/2019 by Abreo & Carter, et al. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082] --[Edited to condense docket text 07/19/2019 by SLS.] [Entered: 07/01/2019 03:48 PM]
June 17, 2019 [10656356] Notice filed by Watts Guerra LLP Watts Guerra LLP joins in the status report filed by the Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs Counsel Group. in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082. Served on 06/17/2019 by email. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082]--[Edited 06/17/2019 by JM to add docket text. ] JAL [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:23 PM]
June 17, 2019 [10656111] Status report filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079. Served on 06/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082] EAI [Entered: 06/17/2019 07:49 AM]
May 24, 2019 [10651137] Notice filed by Watts Guerra LLP in response to the 05/15/2019 order. Served on 05/24/2019 by email. [19-3082] --[Edited 05/29/2019 by SLS to remove docket entry from 18-3253, 19-3005, 19-3006, 19-3008, 19-3009, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3066, 19-3079] JAL [Entered: 05/24/2019 07:11 AM]
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order [10648806] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach continuing the abatement of 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022 and 19-3032; abating 19-3079 and 19-3082; directing the parties in 19-3079 and 19-3082 to file a written statement within 14 days of the date of this order if they believe that additional jurisdictional briefing is needed; directing the parties to file written status reports within 30 days from the date of this order. (Status reports due 06/14/2019 by parties in 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079 & 19-3082.) Served on 05/15/2019. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082] --[Edited 05/15/2019 by KLP to correct the text.] --[Edited 05/24/2019 by SLS to condense docket text.] [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:19 AM]
May 8, 2019 [10647028] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. William P. Ferranti for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (previously disclosed). Served on 05/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3082] [Entered: 05/08/2019 07:44 AM]
May 7, 2019 [10647008] Entry of appearance submitted by William P. Ferranti for Appellant Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3082] --[Edited 05/08/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] WPF [Entered: 05/07/2019 09:53 PM]
May 6, 2019 [10646363] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Diogenes P. Kekatos and Mr. Stephen A. Weiss for All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross-Appellants. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 05/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3082] [Entered: 05/06/2019 10:06 AM]
May 6, 2019 [10646355] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Gretchen Garrison and Mr. Don Manley Downing for Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Benefit Firms listed in the attachment - Plaintiffs-Appellees in 19-3079, 19-3082. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 05/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3079, 19-3082] [Entered: 05/06/2019 09:52 AM]
May 6, 2019 [10646319] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher Adam Seeger for appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al., CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/06/2019. Manner of Service: Clerk via email. [19-3082] [Entered: 05/06/2019 08:48 AM]
May 6, 2019 [10646301] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 05/06/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 06/17/2019 for Adams, Rizzi & Sween, P.A., David R. Adelman, Alerding Castor Hewitt LLP, Allen Wellman McNew Harvey, LLP, Allen, Stein & Durbin, PC, Angel, Isaacson & Tracy, Attorneys at Law, Anthony O'Hanlon, P.C., Arndt Buswell & Thorn S.C., Michael Ashar, Atlee Hall, LLP, Baker, Bodwell, Appel Attorneys at Law, Bakke Norman, S.C., Barada Law Offices, LLC, Barbara J. Simmons Attorney at Law, Barber, Segatto, Hoffee, Wilke & Cate, Barrett McNagny LLP, Barrett, Easterday, Cunningham & Eselgroth, LLP, Beine & Roberts Law Firm, PLC, Tom Benson, Bernatz & Van Beek, Bill J. Milner Law Offices, Bird, Jacobsen & Stevens, PC, George M. Bishop, Blakeman & Schrock, LTD, Bloom Gates & Whiteleather, LLP, Leo Boothe, Boren, Olver and Coffey, LLP, Boring & Boring, PC, Boschma Law Office, Bose McKinney & Evans LLP, Bradford Law Firm, Brand & Morelock, Brau Law Office, Brennan Steil S.C., Brett Dunn PLLC, Brian Fitzwater Law Office, Brock Law Offices PC LLO, Brooks & Olson, Brown, DePrez & Johnson, P.A., Broyles Kight & Ricafort, PC, Burns Cronauer & Brown LLP, Byron Stone, PLLC, Caldwell, Brierly, Chalupa & Nuzman, PLLC, Call & Gentry Law Group, Carabin & Shaw, P.C., Carpenter & Schumacher, P.C., Cary, Welch, Hickman & Hawk, LLP, Caughey, Legner & Freehill Attorneys at Law, Mitchell C. Chaney, Chapman Law LLC, Charles E. Cronauer & Associates, Charles Hear, Attorney at Law, Charnetski, Lacina & Clower, LLP, Chester Law Office, Church, Church, HIttle & Antrim, Clark & Clark P.C., Clendening Johnson & Bohrer, P.C., Cline Farrell Christie & Lee, P.C., Cline Williams Wright Johnson & Oldfather, LLP, Cockerill & Cockerill Attorneys at Law, Jeremy P. Cohen, Cole Law Office, Cole, Easley, Sciba & Williams, P.C., Colvin, Chaney, Saenz & Rodriguez, LLP, Connors LLP, Coots, Henke & Wheeler, Copley Roth & Wilson, LLC, Cornell Law Office, Pen Cosby, Cotton, Bolton, Hoychick & Doughty, LLP, Cress Law Group, PC, Critchfield Critchfield & Johson, Ltd., Cross Law Firm, LLC, Cross Pennamped Woolsey & Glazier, P.C., Crystal D. Pulley, Attorney at Law, Culbertson & Allen, LLC, Custy Law Firm, LLC, Daniel M. Homolka, P.A., Darling & Darling, Dave O'Brien Law, Davis & Campbell, LLC, DeWald Deaver, P.C., Briana Deane, Deborah Smith McClure, P.C., John R. Delzer, Delzer Law Office, Denney & Barrett, PC, Denton & Keuler, LLP, Dillon Legal Group, Dobbs Legal Group, Doering & Grisell, PA, Drew Young Law, Edmund A. Weinheimer, Jr., P. C., Eich, Van Dyke, Werdan & Steger P.C., Ellis & Judd Law Office, LLC, Patrick A. Elward, Brent C. Embrey, Emerick, Diggins & Zabona P.C., Endurance Law Group PLC, Espe Law PLLC, Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A., Faith Ingle Smith Law Firm, Fearer, Nye, & Chadwick, Fellheimer Law Firm Ltd., Fenchel, Doster & Buck, PLC, Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough, Fitzgerald Law P.A., Flynn & Sullivan PC, Forbes Law Group, LLC, Forde Law Offices LLP, Foreman Watson Holtrey, Frundt & Johnson, Ltd., Michael J. Galanis, Gary T. Gee Law Office, Gellhaus & Gellhaus, P. C., Spencer Gilland, Gordon & Associates, P.C., Michael Goss, Graybill & Witcher, LLP, Gregory L. Ceshker, P.C., Grenfell, Sledge and Stevens, Griffin Dietrich & Elliot, LLC, Grosboll, Becker, Tice & Barr, Habush Habush & Rottier, S.C., Hagen & Hagen, P.C., Hall Hudson, P.C., Hampton & Royce, L.C., Hart Bell, LLC, Hawkins Law, PC, Hecker Law Group, PLC, Hehner & Associates, LLC, Heinisch & Lovegrove Law Office, PC LLP, Hensley Legal Group PC, Heritage Legal Group PLLC, Richard M. Holmes, Hostetter & Associates, Hovland & Rasmus, PLLC, W. Calloway Huffaker, Hume, Smith, Geddes, Green & Simmons, LLP, Ingebritson & Associates, P.A., James & Larson Law, James Law, P.C., Janzen Agricultural Law, LLC, Jason Schutte, Koepke & Hiltabrand Attorney at Law, Jefferson & Brewer, LLP, Jeffrey A. Boggess, P.C., Johnson & Mock, PC LLO, Johnson Law Group, Johnson, Kramer, Mulholland, Cochrane, Driscoll & Cochrane, P.L.C., Johnson, Moody, Schmidt & Kleinhuizen, P.A., Justin Hill, PC, KC Cohen, Lawyer, PC, Katz & Korin, P.C., Keaton & Keaton PC, Kelley Law Firm, PC, Kempton & Russell, LLC, Keuler, Kelly Hutchins & Blankenship, LLP, Kevin W. Liles PC, Kirk Law Firm, Kittelsen, Barry, Wellington, Thompson, & Schluesche, Attorneys at Law, Knuth Law Office, Koenig Law Firm, Alex Koenigs, Kovarik, Ellison & Mathis, P.C., Kraft Walser Law Office, PLLP, Kramer Law, LLC, Kruse & Dakin LLP, Kuhlman & Lucas, LLC, Lamkin & Lamkin, P.C., Langdon & Emison Attorneys at Law, Law Office of Adam Crawshaw, Law Office of Brent Gaines, Law Office of Christopher H. Poynor, Law Office of Ezequiel Reyna, Jr., Law Office of Gregory E. Tonore, Law Office of Hammell & Murphy PLLP, Law Office of Jeffrey R. Vaughan, P.C., Law Office of Lester Weinstine, P.C., Law Office of Michael Miller, Law Office of Mike Crane, LLP, Law Office of Thomas A. Noe, III, Law Office of William Enyart, Law Office of William R. Shirk, Law Offices of Hans A. Buehler, LLC, Law Offices of Leonel Alejandro PC, Law Offices of Richard Hoffman, Jenna Laird Leger, Wayne J. Lennington, Lee J. Lewis, Lind Jensen Sullivan & Peterson P.A., Jeff Link, Lowe Eklund Wakefield CO., LPA, Mailander Law Office, Maloney & Campolo, March, McMillan, DeJoode & Duvall, P.C., Martz & Lucas, LLC, Irvin L. Masching, Massie & Quick, LLC, Mauro Archer and Associates PLLC, Maynes Law Office, Mazzanti Law Office, PLLC, McClure, Thomas & Thomas, McFarland Law, PC, McNeely Stephenson, Meador & Crump, P.A., Meier, Bragicich & Moore LLP, Mercho Caughey & DeLay, Mertes & Mertes, P.C., Meyer & Meyer LLP, Michael Smith Law, Midwest AG Solutions LLC, Miller Pearson Gloe Burns Beatty & Parrish, P.L.C., Miltner Law Firm, LLC, Miner & Lemon, LLP, Moore, Susler, McNutt & Wrigley, LLC, Morgan & Meyers, PLC, Morning Law Office LLC, Morris Laing Evans Brock & Kennedy, Morrissey, Morrissey & Dalluge, Muske, Muske, Suhrhoff LTD, Myers Hockemeyer & McNagny LLP, Nathan J. Noble, P.C., Gregg Neal, Nelson, Young, & Braland Attorneys at Law, Nidey Erdahl Tindal & Fischer, PLC, Norman Paloucek & Herman, O'Koon Hintermeister, PLLC, Obear, Overholser, Huffer & Rider, LLC, Osterbauer Law Firm, Ouderkirk Law Firm, Overboe Law, Pagel & Weikum, PLLP, Patterson Comer, Patton Brown Law, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg P.A, Pemberton Law Firm, Pemberton, Sorlie, Rufer, & Kershner, PLLP, Phillippi Law Firm, LLC, Pickner Law Office, Plews Shadley Racher & Braun LLP, Daniel Quigley, Quigley Law Office, Quirk & Hunter, PC, Rammelkamp Bradney, P.C., Randle & Sammons, P.C., Ray A. Ferguson & Associates, Ltd., Reichert Law Office, Reichert Wenner, P.A., Reiling Teder & Schrier, LLC, Rhoades McKee PC, Riccolo, Semelroth, & Henningsen, P.C., Richard D. Larson, P.C., Riley-Tanis & Associates PLLC, Rob Tully Law Firm, Roberts Law Office, Robinson, Curphey & O'Connel, LLC, Mark A. Roeder, Ryan Moore & Cook, Satterley and Kelley, PLLC, Schmittinger & Rodriguez, P.A., Schnelker, Rassi & McConnell PLC, Schultz Law, Schwarz Law Office, Sever Storey, Shamberg, Wolf, McDermott & Depue, Shatzman & Associates, P.C., Sherman Hoffman & Hipp, LC, Shimanek, Shimanek, & Bowman, LLC, Simon Herbert & McClelland, LLP, Deborah K. Smith, William F. Smith, Smith Gardner Slusky Lazer Pohren & Rogers LLP, Sonenberg Law LLC, Sorling Northrup Attorneys, Sounding Board Legal, S.C., Stockard, Johnston, & Brown, P.C, Stoerzbach Law Office, P.C., Stone Law Office, P.L.L.C., Stout Law Group, Strittmatter Law Firm, Swaim Law Firm, PLLC, Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP, Taylor & Ruhnke, PC, Ted B. Lyon & Associates, P.C., The Cahill Law Offices, The Cantlin Law Firm, The Julian C. Gomez Law Firm, PLLC, The Law Office of George P. Escobedo & Associates, The Law Office of Mark L Eurek, The Law Office of Rob Tully PC, The Law Office of Samuel W. Bearman, L.C., The Law Office of Thomas R. Fields, P.A., The Law Offices of Timothy L. Lapointe, P.C., The McQuades Co. LPA, The Poppe Law Firm, The Pruneda Law Firm, PLLC, The Strom Law Firm, LLC, The Winkie Law Firm, LLC, Tourkow Crell Rosenblatt & Johnston LLP, Troth Law Office, Troyer & Good, PC, Tucker & Tucker, P.C., Tucker Law Practice, Tully Law Office, PC, Underwood Law Firm, PC, Van Kley & Walker, LLC, VanDerGinst Law, Vandervoort Christ & Fisher, P.C., Vaughan Law Firm, P.C., Vela Law Offices PLLC, Virtus Law PLLC, Vriezelaar, Tigges, Edington, Bottaro, Boden, & Ross, L.L.P., Wadler, Perches, Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Walk & Murphy, PLC, Wallace Law, Laurie S. Ward, Warner Norcross & Judd, LLP, Wasker Door Wimmer & Marcouiller, P.C., Watts Guerra LLP, Weeks & Brucker, Ltd, Weld, Riley, Prenn & Ricci S.C., Whitman, Baber, & Siegel, Wickens & Wickens, LLC, Wil Galloway & Associates, PLLC, Willadsen & Neal LLC, Willis & Willis, Winstein, Kavensky & Cunningham, LLC, Wojtalewicz Law Firm, LTD, Wolf Ardis, P.C., Wood & Rue, PLLP, Woodard Law PC., Woods Rogers PLC, Worth Law Firm, Wright & Schulte LLC, Wright Schimmel LLC, Wyland, Humphrey & Clevenger LLP, Yira Law Office, Ltd and Zeilinger Law Office. [19-3082] [Entered: 05/06/2019 08:21 AM]
May 6, 2019 [10646298] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen A. Weiss and Diogenes P. Kekatos for All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross-Appellants for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3082] --[Edited 05/06/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] SAW [Entered: 05/06/2019 08:16 AM]
May 6, 2019 [10646295] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher A. Seeger for All Plaintiffs-Appellees/Cross-Appellants for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3082]--[Edited 05/06/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] CAS [Entered: 05/06/2019 08:13 AM]
May 3, 2019 [10646261] Docketing statement filed by Watts Guerra LLP. Served on 05/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3082] JAL [Entered: 05/03/2019 05:26 PM]
May 3, 2019 [10646257] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 05/10/2019 for Timothy M. O'Brien, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3082] [Entered: 05/03/2019 05:02 PM]
May 3, 2019 [10646243] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Watts Guerra LLP. Served on: 05/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3082] JAL [Entered: 05/03/2019 04:29 PM]
May 3, 2019 [10646197] Entry of appearance submitted by Don M. Downing and Gretchen Garrison for Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Benefit Firms listed in the Attachment - Plaintiffs-Appellees in 19-3079, 19-3082. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3079, 19-3082] --[Edited 05/06/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] DMD [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:08 PM]
May 2, 2019 [10645847] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Scott Ashley Powell for Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. 1,900 pages will provide upon request. Served on 05/02/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3082] [Entered: 05/02/2019 03:17 PM]
May 2, 2019 [10645801] Entry of appearance filed by William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Not Parties Steven A. Wentworth, Roger Ward, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Polifka, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, NEBCO, Inc., Marvin Miller, Charles B. Lex, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., JPPL, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Five Star Farms, Leroy Edlund, Demmer Farms, Inc., David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Bottoms Farms Partnership, Bieber Farm, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Grant Annexstad and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC in 19-3079, 19-3082 CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 05/02/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3079, 19-3082] [Entered: 05/02/2019 01:50 PM]
May 2, 2019 [10645796] Entry of appearance submitted by William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Not Parties Steven A. Wentworth, Roger Ward, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Polifka, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, NEBCO, Inc., Marvin Miller, Charles B. Lex, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., JPPL, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Five Star Farms, Leroy Edlund, Demmer Farms, Inc., David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Bottoms Farms Partnership, Bieber Farm, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Grant Annexstad and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC in 19-3079, 19-3082 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/02/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 05/02/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 5/2/19][19-3079, 19-3082] WBC [Entered: 05/02/2019 01:33 PM]
May 2, 2019 [10645721] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott A. Powell for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Bieber Farm, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Grant Annexstad, Leroy Edlund, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Custom Farm Services, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Mr. David Polifka, NEBCO, Inc., Charles B. Lex, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, TRIPLE BG Partnership and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3079, 19-3082 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/02/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3079, 19-3082]--[Edited 05/02/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 5/2/19.] SAP [Entered: 05/02/2019 11:16 AM]
May 2, 2019 [10645658] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Rachel E. Schwartz and Patrick J. Stueve for Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y.1,900 pages will provide upon request. Served on 05/01/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3079, 19-3082] [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:28 AM]
May 1, 2019 [10645499] Entry of appearance filed by Bradley Wilders for Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Benefit Firms listed in the attachment - Plaintiffs-Appellees in 19-3079, 19-3082. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 05/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3079, 19-3082] [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:34 PM]
May 1, 2019 [10645478] Entry of appearance submitted by Bradley T. Wilders for Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, The Gibbs Law Firm and Not Parties Seeger Weiss LLP, Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC in 19-3079, Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, The Gibbs Law Firm, Not Parties Seeger Weiss LLP, Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellant Wagner Reese, LLP in 19-3082 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3079, 19-3082] --[Edited 05/01/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] BW [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:42 PM]
May 1, 2019 [10645472] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, The Gibbs Law Firm and Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC in 19-3079, Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, The Gibbs Law Firm, Appellant Wagner Reese, LLP and Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC in 19-3082 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3079, 19-3082]--[Edited 05/02/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 5/2/19.] PJS [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:26 PM]
April 26, 2019 [10644444] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffrey A. Lamken and Mr. Eric R. Nitz for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 04/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3082] [Entered: 04/26/2019 02:53 PM]
April 26, 2019 [10644439] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Thomas Wiegand for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 04/26/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3082] [Entered: 04/26/2019 02:41 PM]
April 26, 2019 [10644416] Entry of appearance submitted by Thomas J. Wiegand for Appellant Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3082]--[Edited 04/26/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 4/26/19] TW [Entered: 04/26/2019 02:08 PM]
April 26, 2019 [10644414] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey A. Lamken, Eric R. Nitz for Appellant Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3082] --[Edited 04/26/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JAL [Entered: 04/26/2019 02:06 PM]
April 23, 2019 [10643294] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/22/2019. Transcript order form and dcketing statement due 05/07/2019 for Watts Guerra LLP, et al. Notice of appearance due on 05/07/2019 for Adams, Rizzi & Sween, P.A., David R. Adelman, Alerding Castor Hewitt LLP, Allen Wellman McNew Harvey, LLP, Allen, Stein & Durbin, PC, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Angel, Isaacson & Tracy, Attorneys at Law, Anthony O'Hanlon, P.C., Arndt Buswell & Thorn S.C., Michael Ashar, Atlee Hall, LLP, Baker, Bodwell, Appel Attorneys at Law, Bakke Norman, S.C., Barada Law Offices, LLC, Barbara J. Simmons Attorney at Law, Barber, Segatto, Hoffee, Wilke & Cate, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Barrett McNagny LLP, Barrett, Easterday, Cunningham & Eselgroth, LLP, Bassford Remele, P.A., Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Beine & Roberts Law Firm, PLC, Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Tom Benson, Bernatz & Van Beek, Bill J. Milner Law Offices, Bird, Jacobsen & Stevens, PC, George M. Bishop, Blakeman & Schrock, LTD, Bloom Gates & Whiteleather, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Leo Boothe, Boren, Olver and Coffey, LLP, Boring & Boring, PC, Boschma Law Office, Bose McKinney & Evans LLP, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Bradford Law Firm, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brand & Morelock, Brau Law Office, Brennan Steil S.C., Brett Dunn PLLC, Brian Fitzwater Law Office, Brock Law Offices PC LLO, Brooks & Olson, Brooks Pierce, Brown, DePrez & Johnson, P.A., Broyles Kight & Ricafort, PC, Burns Cronauer & Brown LLP, Byron Stone, PLLC, Caldwell, Brierly, Chalupa & Nuzman, PLLC, Call & Gentry Law Group, Carabin & Shaw, P.C., Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Carpenter & Schumacher, P.C., Cary, Welch, Hickman & Hawk, LLP, Caughey, Legner & Freehill Attorneys at Law, Mitchell C. Chaney, Chapman Law LLC, Charles E. Cronauer & Associates, Charles Hear, Attorney at Law, Charnetski, Lacina & Clower, LLP, Chester Law Office, Church, Church, HIttle & Antrim, Clark & Clark P.C., Clark, Love & Hutson, G.P., Clendening Johnson & Bohrer, P.C., Cline Farrell Christie & Lee, P.C., Cline Williams Wright Johnson & Oldfather, LLP, Cockerill & Cockerill Attorneys at Law, Jeremy P. Cohen, Cole Law Office, Cole, Easley, Sciba & Williams, P.C., Colvin, Chaney, Saenz & Rodriguez, LLP, Connors LLP, Coots, Henke & Wheeler, Copley Roth & Wilson, LLC, Cornell Law Office, Pen Cosby, Cotton, Bolton, Hoychick & Doughty, LLP, Cress Law Group, PC, Critchfield Critchfield & Johson, Ltd., Cross Law Firm, LLC, Cross Pennamped Woolsey & Glazier, P.C., Crystal D. Pulley, Attorney at Law, Culbertson & Allen, LLC, Custy Law Firm, LLC, Daniel M. Homolka, P.A., Darling & Darling, Dave O'Brien Law, Davis & Campbell, LLC, DeWald Deaver, P.C., Briana Deane, Deborah Smith McClure, P.C., John R. Delzer, Delzer Law Office, Denney & Barrett, PC, Denton & Keuler, LLP, Dillon Legal Group, Dobbs Legal Group, Doering & Grisell, PA, Drew Young Law, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Edmund A. Weinheimer, Jr., P. C., Eich, Van Dyke, Werdan & Steger P.C., Ellis & Judd Law Office, LLC, Patrick A. Elward, Brent C. Embrey, Emerick, Diggins & Zabona P.C., Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, Endurance Law Group PLC, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Espe Law PLLC, Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A., Faith Ingle Smith Law Firm, Fearer, Nye, & Chadwick, Fellheimer Law Firm Ltd., Fenchel, Doster & Buck, PLC, Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough, Fitzgerald Law P.A., Flynn & Sullivan PC, Forbes Law Group, LLC, Forde Law Offices LLP, Foreman Watson Holtrey, Frundt & Johnson, Ltd., Michael J. Galanis, Gary T. Gee Law Office, Gellhaus & Gellhaus, P. C., Spencer Gilland, Gordon & Associates, P.C., Michael Goss, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Graybill & Witcher, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Gregory L. Ceshker, P.C., Grenfell, Sledge and Stevens, Griffin Dietrich & Elliot, LLC, Grosboll, Becker, Tice & Barr, Gustafson Gluek, PLLC, Habush Habush & Rottier, S.C., Hagen & Hagen, P.C., Hall Hudson, P.C., Hampton & Royce, L.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Hart Bell, LLC, Hawkins Law, PC, Hecker Law Group, PLC, Hehner & Associates, LLC, Heinisch & Lovegrove Law Office, PC LLP, Hensley Legal Group PC, Heritage Legal Group PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Holland Law Firm, Richard M. Holmes, Hostetter & Associates, Hovland & Rasmus, PLLC, W. Calloway Huffaker, Hume, Smith, Geddes, Green & Simmons, LLP, Ingebritson & Associates, P.A., Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, James & Larson Law, James Law, P.C., Janzen Agricultural Law, LLC, Jason Schutte, Koepke & Hiltabrand Attorney at Law, Jefferson & Brewer, LLP, Jeffrey A. Boggess, P.C., Johnson & Mock, PC LLO, Johnson Law Group, Johnson, Kramer, Mulholland, Cochrane, Driscoll & Cochrane, P.L.C., Johnson, Moody, Schmidt & Kleinhuizen, P.A., Justin Hill, PC, KC Cohen, Lawyer, PC, Katz & Korin, P.C., Keaton & Keaton PC, Kelley Law Firm, PC, Kempton & Russell, LLC, Keuler, Kelly Hutchins & Blankenship, LLP, Kevin W. Liles PC, Kirk Law Firm, Kittelsen, Barry, Wellington, Thompson, & Schluesche, Attorneys at Law, Knuth Law Office, Koenig Law Firm, Alex Koenigs, Kovarik, Ellison & Mathis, P.C., Kraft Walser Law Office, PLLP, Kramer Law, LLC, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Kruse & Dakin LLP, Kuhlman & Lucas, LLC, Lamkin & Lamkin, P.C., Langdon & Emison Attorneys at Law, Law Office of Adam Crawshaw, Law Office of Brent Gaines, Law Office of Christopher H. Poynor, Law Office of Ezequiel Reyna, Jr., Law Office of Gregory E. Tonore, Law Office of Hammell & Murphy PLLP, Law Office of Jeffrey R. Vaughan, P.C., Law Office of Lester Weinstine, P.C., Law Office of Michael Miller, Law Office of Mike Crane, LLP, Law Office of Thomas A. Noe, III, Law Office of William Enyart, Law Office of William R. Shirk, Law Offices of Hans A. Buehler, LLC, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Law Offices of Leonel Alejandro PC, Law Offices of Richard Hoffman, Jenna Laird Leger, Wayne J. Lennington, Lee J. Lewis, Lind Jensen Sullivan & Peterson P.A., Jeff Link, Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lowe Eklund Wakefield CO., LPA, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Mailander Law Office, Maloney & Campolo, March, McMillan, DeJoode & Duvall, P.C., Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, Martz & Lucas, LLC, Irvin L. Masching, Massie & Quick, LLC, Mauro Archer and Associates PLLC, Maynes Law Office, Mazzanti Law Office, PLLC, McClure, Thomas & Thomas, McCulley McCluer PLLC, McFarland Law, PC, McNeely Stephenson, Meador & Crump, P.A., Meier, Bragicich & Moore LLP, Mercho Caughey & DeLay, Mertes & Mertes, P.C., Meyer & Meyer LLP, Michael Smith Law, Midwest AG Solutions LLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Pearson Gloe Burns Beatty & Parrish, P.L.C., Miller Schirger LLC, Miltner Law Firm, LLC, Miner & Lemon, LLP, Moore, Susler, McNutt & Wrigley, LLC, Morgan & Meyers, PLC, Morning Law Office LLC, Morris Laing Evans Brock & Kennedy, Morrissey, Morrissey & Dalluge, Muske, Muske, Suhrhoff LTD, Myers Hockemeyer & McNagny LLP, Nathan J. Noble, P.C., Gregg Neal, Nelson, Young, & Braland Attorneys at Law, Nidey Erdahl Tindal & Fischer, PLC, Norman Paloucek & Herman, O'Koon Hintermeister, PLLC, Obear, Overholser, Huffer & Rider, LLC, Osterbauer Law Firm, Ouderkirk Law Firm, Overboe Law, Pagel & Weikum, PLLP, Patterson Comer, Patton Brown Law, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg P.A, Paul LLP, Pemberton Law Firm, Pemberton, Sorlie, Rufer, & Kershner, PLLP, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Phillippi Law Firm, LLC, Phipps Anderson Deacon, L.L.P., Pickner Law Office, Plews Shadley Racher & Braun LLP, Daniel Quigley, Quigley Law Office, Quirk & Hunter, PC, Rammelkamp Bradney, P.C., Randle & Sammons, P.C., Ray A. Ferguson & Associates, Ltd., Reichert Law Office, Reichert Wenner, P.A., Reiling Teder & Schrier, LLC, Rhoades McKee PC, Riccolo, Semelroth, & Henningsen, P.C., Richard D. Larson, P.C., Riley-Tanis & Associates PLLC, Rob Tully Law Firm, Roberts Law Office, Robinson, Curphey & O'Connel, LLC, Mark A. Roeder, Roth Law Firm, Ryan Moore & Cook, Saeed & Little, LLP, Satterley and Kelley, PLLC, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Schmittinger & Rodriguez, P.A., Schnelker, Rassi & McConnell PLC, Schultz Law, Schwarz Law Office, Schwebel Goetz & Sieben PA, Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Sever Storey, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Shamberg, Wolf, McDermott & Depue, Shatzman & Associates, P.C., Sherman Hoffman & Hipp, LC, Shimanek, Shimanek, & Bowman, LLC, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Simon Herbert & McClelland, LLP, Deborah K. Smith, William F. Smith, Smith Gardner Slusky Lazer Pohren & Rogers LLP, Sneed Lang PC, Sonenberg Law LLC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Sorling Northrup Attorneys, Sounding Board Legal, S.C., Speer Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stockard, Johnston, & Brown, P.C, Stoerzbach Law Office, P.C., Stone Law Office, P.L.L.C., Stout Law Group, Strittmatter Law Firm, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Swaim Law Firm, PLLC, Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP, Taylor & Ruhnke, PC, Ted B. Lyon & Associates, P.C., The Cahill Law Offices, The Cantlin Law Firm, The Gibbs Law Firm, The Julian C. Gomez Law Firm, PLLC, The Law Office of George P. Escobedo & Associates, The Law Office of Mark L Eurek, The Law Office of Rob Tully PC, The Law Office of Samuel W. Bearman, L.C., The Law Office of Thomas R. Fields, P.A., The Law Offices of Timothy L. Lapointe, P.C., The McQuades Co. LPA, The Poppe Law Firm, The Pruneda Law Firm, PLLC, The Strom Law Firm, LLC, The Winkie Law Firm, LLC, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Tourkow Crell Rosenblatt & Johnston LLP, Troth Law Office, Troyer & Good, PC, Tucker & Tucker, P.C., Tucker Law Practice, Tully Law Office, PC, Underwood Law Firm, PC, Van Kley & Walker, LLC, VanDerGinst Law, Vandervoort Christ & Fisher, P.C., Vaughan Law Firm, P.C., Vela Law Offices PLLC, Virtus Law PLLC, Vriezelaar, Tigges, Edington, Bottaro, Boden, & Ross, L.L.P., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wadler, Perches, Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Walk & Murphy, PLC, Wallace Law, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Laurie S. Ward, Warner Norcross & Judd, LLP, Wasker Door Wimmer & Marcouiller, P.C., Watts Guerra LLP, W

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHAPMAN LAW LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DENNEY & BARRETT, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DANIEL QUIGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MCFARLAND LAW, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY R. VAUGHAN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TED B. LYON & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HOLLAND LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RYAN MOORE & COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WICKENS & WICKENS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RHOADES MCKEE PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RICHARD M. HOLMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHESTER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CRYSTAL D. PULLEY, ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WINSTEIN, KAVENSKY & CUNNINGHAM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KEMPTON & RUSSELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WASKER DOOR WIMMER & MARCOUILLER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GREGORY L. CESHKER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TOM BENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FORDE LAW OFFICES LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MCNEELY STEPHENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: OUDERKIRK LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GARY T. GEE LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COLE, EASLEY, SCIBA & WILLIAMS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HALL HUDSON, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE CAHILL LAW OFFICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WIL GALLOWAY & ASSOCIATES, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARRETT MCNAGNY LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BATTLE & WINN LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WRIGHT SCHIMMEL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MAURO ARCHER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BOREN, OLVER AND COFFEY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FENCHEL, DOSTER & BUCK, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DENTON & KEULER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHARLES HEAR, ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: QUIGLEY LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COLVIN, CHANEY, SAENZ & RODRIGUEZ, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: REICHERT LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JEFF LINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TROTH LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SCHNELKER, RASSI & MCCONNELL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MEYER & MEYER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BERNATZ & VAN BEEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MASSIE & QUICK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE GIBBS LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SWAIM LAW FIRM, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHN R. DELZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARBARA J. SIMMONS ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DARLING & DARLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NATHAN J. NOBLE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: O'KOON HINTERMEISTER, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CROSS PENNAMPED WOOLSEY & GLAZIER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FEARER, NYE, & CHADWICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BILL J. MILNER LAW OFFICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GORDON & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TOURKOW CRELL ROSENBLATT & JOHNSTON LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JUSTIN HILL, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MEIER, BRAGICICH & MOORE LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BAKKE NORMAN, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CARPENTER & SCHUMACHER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GRENFELL, SLEDGE AND STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TROYER & GOOD, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CLARK & CLARK P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHNSON, MOODY, SCHMIDT & KLEINHUIZEN, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MCCLURE, THOMAS & THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COTTON, BOLTON, HOYCHICK & DOUGHTY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WRIGHT & SCHULTE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE CANTLIN LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BROOKS & OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHURCH, CHURCH, HITTLE & ANTRIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SPENCER GILLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE STROM LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CARABIN & SHAW, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WELD, RILEY, PRENN & RICCI S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HEINISCH & LOVEGROVE LAW OFFICE, PC LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HEHNER & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CONNORS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NORMAN PALOUCEK & HERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FAFINSKI MARK & JOHNSON, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STRITTMATTER LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RAMMELKAMP BRADNEY, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE LAW OFFICE OF MARK L EUREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JEFFREY A. BOGGESS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHIMANEK, SHIMANEK, & BOWMAN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KRAFT WALSER LAW OFFICE, PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MILLER PEARSON GLOE BURNS BEATTY & PARRISH, P.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DOERING & GRISELL, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHARLES E. CRONAUER & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BLAKEMAN & SCHROCK, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WARNER NORCROSS & JUDD, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BEINE & ROBERTS LAW FIRM, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRENNAN STEIL S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BIRD, JACOBSEN & STEVENS, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHAEL ASHAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SATTERLEY AND KELLEY, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SORLING NORTHRUP ATTORNEYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BROYLES KIGHT & RICAFORT, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRETT DUNN PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CAUGHEY, LEGNER & FREEHILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHAMBERG, WOLF, MCDERMOTT & DEPUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: VANDERVOORT CHRIST & FISHER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE POPPE LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAURIE S. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MERTES & MERTES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STOCKARD, JOHNSTON, & BROWN, P.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EMERICK, DIGGINS & ZABONA P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ADAMS, RIZZI & SWEEN, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FAITH INGLE SMITH LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAMES & LARSON LAW, JAMES LAW, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GRAYBILL & WITCHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: OSTERBAUER LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHAEL SMITH LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SIMON HERBERT & MCCLELLAND, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CLENDENING JOHNSON & BOHRER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DOBBS LEGAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MILTNER LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GELLHAUS & GELLHAUS, P. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRIANA DEANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAKE W. BROOKS ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WHITMAN, BABER, & SIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: VANDERGINST LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PAUL LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE WINKIE LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: VELA LAW OFFICES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JENNA LAIRD LEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: VAUGHAN LAW FIRM, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SEVER STOREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TUCKER LAW PRACTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WOOD & RUE, PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HERITAGE LEGAL GROUP PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PHILLIPPI LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WOODARD LAW PC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DEBORAH K. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHERMAN HOFFMAN & HIPP, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DILLON LEGAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ARNDT BUSWELL & THORN S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LEO BOOTHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHNSON LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WILLIAM F. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HECKER LAW GROUP, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MORGAN & MEYERS, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EDMUND A. WEINHEIMER, JR., P. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JEREMY P. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KOVARIK, ELLISON & MATHIS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PEMBERTON, SORLIE, RUFER, & KERSHNER, PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GRIFFIN DIETRICH & ELLIOT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARRETT, EASTERDAY, CUNNINGHAM & ESELGROTH, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EMERSON POYNTER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ATLEE HALL, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ANGEL, ISAACSON & TRACY, ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HABUSH HABUSH & ROTTIER, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SNEED LANG PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHAEL GOSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DREW YOUNG LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ALLEN, STEIN & DURBIN, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WADLER, PERCHES, HUNDL & KERLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MORNING LAW OFFICE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MYERS HOCKEMEYER & MCNAGNY LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GREENE ESPEL PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KC COHEN, LAWYER, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SCHWARZ LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ZEILINGER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WOODS ROGERS PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HAMPTON & ROYCE, L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EICH, VAN DYKE, WERDAN & STEGER P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WEEKS & BRUCKER, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KIRK LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF BRENT GAINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WILLIS & WILLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: QUIRK & HUNTER, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MALONEY & CAMPOLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CUSTY LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MITCHELL C. CHANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BORING & BORING, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PATRICK A. ELWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STOERZBACH LAW OFFICE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CRITCHFIELD CRITCHFIELD & JOHSON, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE LAW OFFICE OF ROB TULLY PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: REILING TEDER & SCHRIER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENDURANCE LAW GROUP PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LANGDON & EMISON ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DAVIS & CAMPBELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KNUTH LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KEVIN W. LILES PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MINER & LEMON, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FRUNDT & JOHNSON, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KEULER, KELLY HUTCHINS & BLANKENSHIP, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BROWN, DEPREZ & JOHNSON, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF MIKE CRANE, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: W. CALLOWAY HUFFAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CALL & GENTRY LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRADFORD LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WILLADSEN & NEAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF LESTER WEINSTINE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF HAMMELL & MURPHY PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RILEY-TANIS & ASSOCIATES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DEBORAH SMITH MCCLURE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COOTS, HENKE & WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BOHRER BRADY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: REICHERT WENNER, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BROCK LAW OFFICES PC LLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAMKIN & LAMKIN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FLYNN & SULLIVAN PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF EZEQUIEL REYNA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ANTHONY O'HANLON, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MARTZ & LUCAS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: INGEBRITSON & ASSOCIATES, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HOVLAND & RASMUS, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STONE LAW OFFICE, P.L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ROB TULLY LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WYLAND, HUMPHREY & CLEVENGER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER H. POYNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SCHMITTINGER & RODRIGUEZ, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GROSBOLL, BECKER, TICE & BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PATTERSON COMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRENT C. EMBREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MARK A. ROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MORRISSEY, MORRISSEY & DALLUGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CROSS LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NIDEY ERDAHL TINDAL & FISCHER, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COLE LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SAEED & LITTLE, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CORNELL LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CLINE FARRELL CHRISTIE & LEE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHNSON & MOCK, PC LLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TAYLOR & RUHNKE, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STOUT LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JEFFERSON & BREWER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CULBERTSON & ALLEN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MEADOR & CRUMP, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JANZEN AGRICULTURAL LAW, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE LAW OFFICE OF SAMUEL W. BEARMAN, L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHAEL J. GALANIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF ADAM CRAWSHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KELLEY LAW FIRM, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WAGNER REESE, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WALLACE LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DAVE O'BRIEN LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FITZGERALD LAW P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MORRIS LAING EVANS BROCK & KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RAY A. FERGUSON & ASSOCIATES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MUSKE, MUSKE, SUHRHOFF LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JASON SCHUTTE, KOEPKE & HILTABRAND ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE MCQUADES CO. LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RICCOLO, SEMELROTH, & HENNINGSEN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BATTS, BATTS & BELL, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HART BELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BLOOM GATES & WHITELEATHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WATTS GUERRA LLP
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Represented By: Thomas Wiegand
Represented By: Eric R. Nitz
Represented By: William P. Ferranti
Represented By: Francisco Guerra
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PEMBERTON LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICES OF LEONEL ALEJANDRO PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ROBERTS LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ALLEN WELLMAN MCNEW HARVEY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. LAPOINTE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EMERSON SCOTT LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DEWALD DEAVER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: IRVIN L. MASCHING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BOLEN ROBINSON & ELLIS, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY E. TONORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SEEGER WEISS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRAU LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HAWKINS LAW, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WEXLER WALLACE LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HODGE LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PATTON BROWN LAW, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | <