Kansas Natural Resource v. United States Dept of Interior, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: KANSAS NATURAL RESOURCE COALITION
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, GREG SHEEHAN, in his official capacity as Principal Deputy Director of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and RYAN ZINKE, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Department of the Interior
Case Number: 19-3108
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 24, 2020 Summary Kansas Natural Resource v. United States Dept of Interior

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 [10664845] Appellant's appendix filed by Kansas Natural Resource Coalition. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 07/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3108] JW [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:57 PM]
July 22, 2019 [10664840] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Kansas Natural Resource Coalition. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 07/22/2019 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3108] JW [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:54 PM]
June 12, 2019 [10655355] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Brian C. Toth for United States Fish and Wildlife Service and United States Department of Interior. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/24/2019 by MLB - Entry of appearance includes Appellees Zinke and Sheehan - David Bernhardt as Secretary of DOI and Margaret Everson as Deputy Director for Wildlife are being subsitiuted for Appellees Zinke and Sheehan][19-3108] [Entered: 06/12/2019 01:20 PM]
June 12, 2019 [10655248] Entry of appearance submitted by Brian C. Toth for Appellees Greg Sheehan, United States Department of Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and Ryan Zinke for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3108]--[Edited 06/12/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 6/12/19.] BCT [Entered: 06/12/2019 09:43 AM]
June 11, 2019 [10655053] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 06/11/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 07/22/2019 for Kansas Natural Resource Coalition. [19-3108] [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:17 PM]
June 11, 2019 [10654805] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance due on 06/21/2019 for Greg Sheehan, United States Department of Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and Ryan Zinke. [19-3108] [Entered: 06/11/2019 07:10 AM]
June 7, 2019 [10654254] Entry of appearance filed by Jeffrey Wilson McCoy and and Caleb Randall Trotter for Kansas Natural Resource Coalition. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. (Previously disclosed.) Served on 06/07/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3108] [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:58 AM]
June 7, 2019 [10654246] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 06/14/2019 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KSwi), Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3108] [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:34 AM]
June 7, 2019 [10654245] Entry of appearance filed by Kenneth Estes for Kansas Natural Resource Coalition. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (already listed in the appeal). Served on 06/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3108] [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:30 AM]
June 7, 2019 [10654243] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jonathan Wood for Kansas Natural Resource Coalition. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (already listed in the appeal). Served on 06/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3108] [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:28 AM]
June 7, 2019 [10654233] Entry of appearance submitted by Kenneth Estes for Appellant Kansas Natural Resource Coalition for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3108]--[Edited 06/07/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] KE [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:12 AM]
June 7, 2019 [10654232] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey W. McCoy; Caleb R. Trotter for Appellant Kansas Natural Resource Coalition for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3108] --[Edited 06/07/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 6/7/19] JWM [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:08 AM]
June 7, 2019 [10654230] Notice received from Kansas Natural Resource Coalition that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 06/07/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail [19-3108] JW [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:05 AM]
June 7, 2019 [10654229] Docketing statement filed by Kansas Natural Resource Coalition. Served on 06/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3108] JW [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:03 AM]
June 7, 2019 [10654228] Entry of appearance submitted by Jonathan Wood for Appellant Kansas Natural Resource Coalition for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3108]--[Edited 06/07/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] JW [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:02 AM]
May 24, 2019 [10651155] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/24/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 06/07/2019 for Kansas Natural Resource Coalition. Notice of appearance also due on 06/07/2019 for Greg Sheehan, United States Department of Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and Ryan Zinke [19-3108] [Entered: 05/24/2019 08:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kansas Natural Resource v. United States Dept of Interior, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KANSAS NATURAL RESOURCE COALITION
Represented By: Jeffrey Wilson McCoy
Represented By: Todd F. Gaziano
Represented By: Kenneth Estes
Represented By: Jonathan Wood
Represented By: Caleb Randall Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Represented By: Bridget Kennedy McNeil
Represented By: Brian C. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Bridget Kennedy McNeil
Represented By: Brian C. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG SHEEHAN, in his official capacity as Principal Deputy Director of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Bridget Kennedy McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN ZINKE, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Department of the Interior
Represented By: Bridget Kennedy McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?