In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Plaintiff: CHARLES B. LEX, TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP, DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, BIEBER FARM, JPPL, INC., ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC, RON WETZ, MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC., KENNETH OSBORN, DEMMER FARMS, INC., TODD NIEMEYER, DAVID SCHWANINGER, D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC., MICHAEL GRIES, RICHARD CRONE, CE COBB FARMS, STEVEN A. WENTWORTH, CHARLES COBB, ROGER WARD, PINE HURST ACRES, FIVE STAR FARMS, BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC., VJW FARM, INC., GRAFEL FARMS, LLC, NEBCO, INC., AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC, KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY, DAVID POLIFKA, PETER V. ANDERSON, DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, ROBERT NIEMEYER, NORMAN SIGRIST, GRANT ANNEXSTAD, BRADLEY J. VERMEER, BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP, MARVIN MILLER, LEROY EDLUND, CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC and CHARLES A. WELSH
Defendant: SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION AG, SYNGENTA SEEDS, LLC, FKA Syngenta Seeds, Inc., SYNGENTA BIOTECHNOLOGY, INC., SYNGENTA AG, SYNGENTA CORPORATION and SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC
Not Yet Classified: HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C., CHAPMAN LAW LLC, DENNEY & BARRETT, PC, DANIEL QUIGLEY, MCFARLAND LAW, PC, LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY R. VAUGHAN, P.C., TED B. LYON & ASSOCIATES, P.C., HOLLAND LAW FIRM, BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC, RYAN MOORE & COOK, WICKENS & WICKENS, LLC, RHOADES MCKEE PC, RICHARD M. HOLMES, GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C., CHESTER LAW OFFICE, CRYSTAL D. PULLEY, ATTORNEY AT LAW, WINSTEIN, KAVENSKY & CUNNINGHAM, LLC, MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC, KEMPTON & RUSSELL, LLC, WASKER DOOR WIMMER & MARCOUILLER, P.C., FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC, GREGORY L. CESHKER, P.C., TOM BENSON, FORDE LAW OFFICES LLP, LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA, MCNEELY STEPHENSON, TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP, OUDERKIRK LAW FIRM, GARY T. GEE LAW OFFICE, THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC, COLE, EASLEY, SCIBA & WILLIAMS, P.C., HALL HUDSON, P.C., THE CAHILL LAW OFFICES, SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C., WIL GALLOWAY & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, BARRETT MCNAGNY LLP, BATTLE & WINN LLP, WRIGHT SCHIMMEL LLC, MAURO ARCHER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC, BOREN, OLVER AND COFFEY, LLP, FENCHEL, DOSTER & BUCK, PLC, DENTON & KEULER, LLP, WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC, CHARLES HEAR, ATTORNEY AT LAW, QUIGLEY LAW OFFICE, PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P., COLVIN, CHANEY, SAENZ & RODRIGUEZ, LLP, BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC, REICHERT LAW OFFICE, JEFF LINK, TROTH LAW OFFICE, SCHNELKER, RASSI & MCCONNELL PLC, MEYER & MEYER LLP, ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON, BERNATZ & VAN BEEK, MASSIE & QUICK, LLC, THE GIBBS LAW FIRM, SWAIM LAW FIRM, PLLC, JOHN R. DELZER, BARBARA J. SIMMONS ATTORNEY AT LAW, DARLING & DARLING, BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE, NATHAN J. NOBLE, P.C., O'KOON HINTERMEISTER, PLLC, CROSS PENNAMPED WOOLSEY & GLAZIER, P.C., FEARER, NYE, & CHADWICK, BILL J. MILNER LAW OFFICES, GORDON & ASSOCIATES, P.C., TOURKOW CRELL ROSENBLATT & JOHNSTON LLP, BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C., JUSTIN HILL, PC, MEIER, BRAGICICH & MOORE LLP, BAKKE NORMAN, S.C., CARPENTER & SCHUMACHER, P.C., GRENFELL, SLEDGE AND STEVENS, TROYER & GOOD, PC, CLARK & CLARK P.C., JOHNSON, MOODY, SCHMIDT & KLEINHUIZEN, P.A., MCCLURE, THOMAS & THOMAS, COTTON, BOLTON, HOYCHICK & DOUGHTY, LLP, WRIGHT & SCHULTE LLC, THE CANTLIN LAW FIRM, BROOKS & OLSON, CHURCH, CHURCH, HITTLE & ANTRIM, SPENCER GILLAND, THE STROM LAW FIRM, LLC, CARABIN & SHAW, P.C., WELD, RILEY, PRENN & RICCI S.C., HEINISCH & LOVEGROVE LAW OFFICE, PC LLP, HEHNER & ASSOCIATES, LLC, CONNORS LLP, NORMAN PALOUCEK & HERMAN, FAFINSKI MARK & JOHNSON, P.A., STRITTMATTER LAW FIRM, RAMMELKAMP BRADNEY, P.C., THE LAW OFFICE OF MARK L EUREK, JEFFREY A. BOGGESS, P.C., SHIMANEK, SHIMANEK, & BOWMAN, LLC, FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH, KRAFT WALSER LAW OFFICE, PLLP, MILLER PEARSON GLOE BURNS BEATTY & PARRISH, P.L.C., WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD, DOERING & GRISELL, PA, CHARLES E. CRONAUER & ASSOCIATES, BLAKEMAN & SCHROCK, LTD, WARNER NORCROSS & JUDD, LLP, ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP, ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP, BEINE & ROBERTS LAW FIRM, PLC, BRENNAN STEIL S.C., BIRD, JACOBSEN & STEVENS, PC, MICHAEL ASHAR, SATTERLEY AND KELLEY, PLLC, SORLING NORTHRUP ATTORNEYS, BROYLES KIGHT & RICAFORT, PC, BRETT DUNN PLLC, CAUGHEY, LEGNER & FREEHILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN, SHAMBERG, WOLF, MCDERMOTT & DEPUE, VANDERVOORT CHRIST & FISHER, P.C., THE POPPE LAW FIRM, LAURIE S. WARD, MERTES & MERTES, P.C., STOCKARD, JOHNSTON, & BROWN, P.C, WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A., EMERICK, DIGGINS & ZABONA P.C., ADAMS, RIZZI & SWEEN, P.A., FAITH INGLE SMITH LAW FIRM, JAMES & LARSON LAW, JAMES LAW, P.C., GRAYBILL & WITCHER, LLP, OSTERBAUER LAW FIRM, MICHAEL SMITH LAW, SIMON HERBERT & MCCLELLAND, LLP, CLENDENING JOHNSON & BOHRER, P.C., DOBBS LEGAL GROUP, MILTNER LAW FIRM, LLC, GELLHAUS & GELLHAUS, P. C., BRIANA DEANE, JAKE W. BROOKS ATTORNEY AT LAW, WHITMAN, BABER, & SIEGEL, VANDERGINST LAW, PAUL LLP, THE WINKIE LAW FIRM, LLC, CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC, STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP, VELA LAW OFFICES PLLC, NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW, MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL, JENNA LAIRD LEGER, VAUGHAN LAW FIRM, P.C., SEVER STOREY, TUCKER LAW PRACTICE, MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP, WOOD & RUE, PLLP, HERITAGE LEGAL GROUP PLLC, PHILLIPPI LAW FIRM, LLC, WOODARD LAW PC., DEBORAH K. SMITH, HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON, KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C., SHERMAN HOFFMAN & HIPP, LC, DILLON LEGAL GROUP, ARNDT BUSWELL & THORN S.C., LEO BOOTHE, JOHNSON LAW GROUP, WILLIAM F. SMITH, HECKER LAW GROUP, PLC, WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C., MORGAN & MEYERS, PLC, EDMUND A. WEINHEIMER, JR., P. C., JEREMY P. COHEN, KOVARIK, ELLISON & MATHIS, P.C., BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES, PEMBERTON, SORLIE, RUFER, & KERSHNER, PLLP, GRIFFIN DIETRICH & ELLIOT, LLC, BARRETT, EASTERDAY, CUNNINGHAM & ESELGROTH, LLP, EMERSON POYNTER LLP, ATLEE HALL, LLP, LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP, ANGEL, ISAACSON & TRACY, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, HABUSH HABUSH & ROTTIER, S.C., SNEED LANG PC, MICHAEL GOSS, DREW YOUNG LAW, ALLEN, STEIN & DURBIN, PC, WADLER, PERCHES, HUNDL & KERLICK, MORNING LAW OFFICE LLC, CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC, MYERS HOCKEMEYER & MCNAGNY LLP, GREENE ESPEL PLLP, KC COHEN, LAWYER, PC, SCHWARZ LAW OFFICE, ZEILINGER LAW OFFICE, WOODS ROGERS PLC, HAMPTON & ROYCE, L.C., EICH, VAN DYKE, WERDAN & STEGER P.C., WEEKS & BRUCKER, LTD, KIRK LAW FIRM, LAW OFFICE OF BRENT GAINES, WILLIS & WILLIS, QUIRK & HUNTER, PC, MALONEY & CAMPOLO, CUSTY LAW FIRM, LLC, MITCHELL C. CHANEY, BORING & BORING, PC, PATRICK A. ELWARD, STOERZBACH LAW OFFICE, P.C., CRITCHFIELD CRITCHFIELD & JOHSON, LTD., BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC, THE LAW OFFICE OF ROB TULLY PC, REILING TEDER & SCHRIER, LLC, ENDURANCE LAW GROUP PLC, LANGDON & EMISON ATTORNEYS AT LAW, PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, L.L.P., DAVIS & CAMPBELL, LLC, KNUTH LAW OFFICE, KEVIN W. LILES PC, MINER & LEMON, LLP, FRUNDT & JOHNSON, LTD., KEULER, KELLY HUTCHINS & BLANKENSHIP, LLP, BROWN, DEPREZ & JOHNSON, P.A., LAW OFFICE OF MIKE CRANE, LLP, W. CALLOWAY HUFFAKER, CALL & GENTRY LAW GROUP, BRADFORD LAW FIRM, WILLADSEN & NEAL LLC, LAW OFFICE OF LESTER WEINSTINE, P.C., LAW OFFICE OF HAMMELL & MURPHY PLLP, RILEY-TANIS & ASSOCIATES PLLC, DEBORAH SMITH MCCLURE, P.C., COOTS, HENKE & WHEELER, BOHRER BRADY LLC, LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER, REICHERT WENNER, P.A., BROCK LAW OFFICES PC LLO, LAMKIN & LAMKIN, P.C., FLYNN & SULLIVAN PC, LAW OFFICE OF EZEQUIEL REYNA, JR., ANTHONY O'HANLON, P.C., MARTZ & LUCAS, LLC, INGEBRITSON & ASSOCIATES, P.A., LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS, GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC, HOVLAND & RASMUS, PLLC, STONE LAW OFFICE, P.L.L.C., WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP, ROB TULLY LAW FIRM, WYLAND, HUMPHREY & CLEVENGER LLP, LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER H. POYNOR, SCHMITTINGER & RODRIGUEZ, P.A., GROSBOLL, BECKER, TICE & BARR, PATTERSON COMER, BRENT C. EMBREY, MARK A. ROEDER, MORRISSEY, MORRISSEY & DALLUGE, CROSS LAW FIRM, LLC, NIDEY ERDAHL TINDAL & FISCHER, PLC, COLE LAW OFFICE, SAEED & LITTLE, LLP, CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P., CORNELL LAW OFFICE, CLINE FARRELL CHRISTIE & LEE, P.C., JOHNSON & MOCK, PC LLO, TAYLOR & RUHNKE, PC, STOUT LAW GROUP, JEFFERSON & BREWER, LLP, WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC, CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP, CULBERTSON & ALLEN, LLC, MEADOR & CRUMP, P.A., JANZEN AGRICULTURAL LAW, LLC, THE LAW OFFICE OF SAMUEL W. BEARMAN, L.C., WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK, MICHAEL J. GALANIS, LAW OFFICE OF ADAM CRAWSHAW, SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C., KELLEY LAW FIRM, PC, WAGNER REESE, LLP, BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS LLP, LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART, WALLACE LAW, DAVE O'BRIEN LAW, FITZGERALD LAW P.A., MORRIS LAING EVANS BROCK & KENNEDY, RAY A. FERGUSON & ASSOCIATES, LTD., MUSKE, MUSKE, SUHRHOFF LTD, JASON SCHUTTE, KOEPKE & HILTABRAND ATTORNEY AT LAW, THE MCQUADES CO. LPA, RICCOLO, SEMELROTH, & HENNINGSEN, P.C., BATTS, BATTS & BELL, LLP, HART BELL, LLC, BLOOM GATES & WHITELEATHER, LLP, WATTS GUERRA LLP, PEMBERTON LAW FIRM, LAW OFFICES OF LEONEL ALEJANDRO PC, ROBERTS LAW OFFICE, ALLEN WELLMAN MCNEW HARVEY, LLP, THE LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. LAPOINTE, P.C., EMERSON SCOTT LLP, DEWALD DEAVER, P.C., IRVIN L. MASCHING, BOLEN ROBINSON & ELLIS, LLP, LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY E. TONORE, SEEGER WEISS LLP, BRAU LAW OFFICE, HAWKINS LAW, PC, WEXLER WALLACE LLP, HODGE LAW FIRM, PATTON BROWN LAW, PLLC, MAYNES LAW OFFICE, PEN COSBY, PAGEL & WEIKUM, PLLP, WHALEY LAW FIRM, KATZ & KORIN, P.C., ROBINSON, CURPHEY & O'CONNEL, LLC, MILLER SCHIRGER LLC, KUHLMAN & LUCAS, LLC, THRASH LAW FIRM, P.A., MIDWEST AG SOLUTIONS LLC, KRUSE & DAKIN LLP, BOSCHMA LAW OFFICE, LIND JENSEN SULLIVAN & PETERSON P.A., ALERDING CASTOR HEWITT LLP, LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS A. NOE, III, THE PRUNEDA LAW FIRM, PLLC, VAN KLEY & WALKER, LLC, BASSFORD REMELE, P.A., YIRA LAW OFFICE, LTD, FELLHEIMER LAW FIRM LTD., ALEX KOENIGS, LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM R. SHIRK, OBEAR, OVERHOLSER, HUFFER & RIDER, LLC, STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON LLP, BRAND & MORELOCK, THE LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS R. FIELDS, P.A., THE LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE P. ESCOBEDO & ASSOCIATES, VIRTUS LAW PLLC, ROTH LAW FIRM, TULLY LAW OFFICE, PC, HOSTETTER & ASSOCIATES, TUCKER & TUCKER, P.C., WOLF ARDIS, P.C., DELZER LAW OFFICE, SCHWEBEL GOETZ & SIEBEN PA, CARY, WELCH, HICKMAN & HAWK, LLP, SCOTT POYNTER (POYNTER LAW GROUP), MARCH, MCMILLAN, DEJOODE & DUVALL, P.C., SPEER LAW FIRM, PC, GRAY REED & MCGRAW LLP, BYRON STONE, PLLC, MOORE, SUSLER, MCNUTT & WRIGLEY, LLC, PATTON HOVERSTEN & BERG P.A, BROOKS PIERCE, BRIAN FITZWATER LAW OFFICE, WAYNE J. LENNINGTON, ELLIS & JUDD LAW OFFICE, LLC, MAILANDER LAW OFFICE, BAKER, BODWELL, APPEL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, OVERBOE LAW, DAVID R. ADELMAN, GEORGE M. BISHOP, BARBER, SEGATTO, HOFFEE, WILKE & CATE, SONENBERG LAW LLC, PLEWS SHADLEY RACHER & BRAUN LLP, PICKNER LAW OFFICE, COPLEY ROTH & WILSON, LLC, HUME, SMITH, GEDDES, GREEN & SIMMONS, LLP, CHARNETSKI, LACINA & CLOWER, LLP, WALK & MURPHY, PLC, RANDLE & SAMMONS, P.C., SIMMONS HANLY CONROY LLC, LUNDBERG LAW FIRM PLC, SCHULTZ LAW, KEATON & KEATON PC, RICHARD D. LARSON, P.C., SOUNDING BOARD LEGAL, S.C., KRAMER LAW, LLC, MERCHO CAUGHEY & DELAY, SMITH GARDNER SLUSKY LAZER POHREN & ROGERS LLP, GREGG NEAL, WORTH LAW FIRM, BURNS CRONAUER & BROWN LLP, COCKERILL & COCKERILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, HENSLEY LEGAL GROUP PC, SOPER LEDDIN LAW FIRM, PC, KOENIG LAW FIRM, MAZZANTI LAW OFFICE, PLLC, FOREMAN WATSON HOLTREY, LEE J. LEWIS, LAW OFFICES OF HANS A. BUEHLER, LLC, ESPE LAW PLLC, VRIEZELAAR, TIGGES, EDINGTON, BOTTARO, BODEN, & ROSS, L.L.P., CRESS LAW GROUP, PC, DANIEL M. HOMOLKA, P.A., JOHNSON, KRAMER, MULHOLLAND, COCHRANE, DRISCOLL & COCHRANE, P.L.C., LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD HOFFMAN, KITTELSEN, BARRY, WELLINGTON, THOMPSON, & SCHLUESCHE, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, UNDERWOOD LAW FIRM, PC, TEEL & MARONEY, PLC, ABREO & CARTER, RICHARD L. COFFMAN, P.C., MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE, TERRIE HARMAN, WHITE & ALLEN, P.A., GREAK LAW, P.C., CHRIS W. FITZGERALD, THOMPSON, GARRETT & HINES, JOHN M. TOTTEN, P.C., GAMBLE & RUSSELL, P.C., RAY, WINTON & KELLEY, PLLC, THOMAS P. CALHOUN, III, HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC, AARON D. HOVAN, RICHARD RUSSELL, RICHARDSON, PATRICK, WESTBROOK & BRICKMAN, LLC, NATHAN A. EAST, JOSEPH F. MANAK, BARRETT WYLIE, LLC, JOHN E. TARBURTON, JOHN L. JERNIGAN, III, KIZER, BONDS, HUGHES & BOWEN, PLLC, E. RUDOLPH MCINTYRE, CONRAD F. CROPSEY, TROUSDALE RYAN, P.C., WILLIAM THOMAS, HAJJAR PETERS, LLP, BIGHAM LAW FIRM, FISHERBROYLES, LLP, KENNETH G. WALSH, DURRETT, ARKEMA, GERSON & GILL, P.C., ORLANS, P.C., ESTES & KENNEDY LAW OFFICES, PLLC, HALLETT, HALLETT & NAGEL, BUTLER SNOW, LLP, JAMES M. PIETZ, Attorney, DYE SNYDER, LLP, WELLER, GREEN, TOUPS & TERRELL, LLP, W. DEAN BELK, JR., JINKS, CROW & DICKSON, P.C., SLAVEN LAW GROUP and OTTS, MOORE, COALE, GODWIN, STEARNS & DARBY
Case Number: 19-3172
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 [10684274] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. It is unclear whether any of the representative plaintiffs are parties, See order for additional information and instructions. On or before October 21, 2019, the parties shall file a joint response addressing parties in any of these matters. Response due on 10/21/2019 for appellants and appelles. Served on 10/03/2019. [19-3079, 19-3174, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 10/03/2019 02:13 PM]
October 3, 2019 [10684113] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These matters remain abated. The parties shall file status reports in accordance with the courts 5/15/19 order. The next status report is due 10/15/19. The parties may file a joint status report. Status reports must be filed in all abated appeals. The parties shall notify this court in writing within 5 days of any significant developments affecting any of the abated matters. Served on 10/03/2019. [19-3008, 19-3174, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] (See the attachment for the entire order.) [Entered: 10/03/2019 09:32 AM]
October 1, 2019 [10683590] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. To the extent that there is any dispute as to proper parties, the response [ # 10678511-2 ] is referred to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits. Served on 10/01/2019. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172]--[Edited 10/02/2019 by DJD to correct response reference] [Entered: 10/01/2019 03:41 PM]
October 1, 2019 [10683583] Entry of appearance filed by Christopher B. Hood and William Lewis Garrison, Jr. for Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 10/01/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3008, 19-3174, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 10/01/2019 03:28 PM]
October 1, 2019 [10683497] Entry of appearance submitted by W. Lewis Garrison, Jr.; Christopher B. Hood for Appellee Henninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3175 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] --[Edited 10/01/2019 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 10/01/19] WLG [Entered: 10/01/2019 12:55 PM]
September 24, 2019 [10681026] Entry of appearance submitted by Clayton A. Clark; Scott A. Love for Not Party Clark, Love & Hutson GP in 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178Norman Sigrist; Kenneth Osborn; Peter V. Anderson; Charles A. Welsh; VJW Farm, Inc.; Michael Gries; Richard Crone; Pine Hurst Acres; Bradley J. Vermeer; Ron Wetz for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/24/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] CAC [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:46 PM]
September 17, 2019 [10679005] Entry of appearance filed by Richard L. Coffman for Appellees Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel: White & Allen, P.A., Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Thompson, Garrett & Hines, William Thomas, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Slaven Law Group, Mr. Richard Russell, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Mr. James M. Pietz, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Orlans, P.C., Molleur Law Office, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, John M. Totten, P.C., Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Terrie Harman, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Hajjar Peters, LLP, Greak Law, P.C., Gamble & Russell, P.C., Chris W. Fitzgerald, FisherBroyles, LLP, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Mr. Nathan A. East, Dye Snyder, LLP, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Butler Snow, LLP, Bigham Law Firm, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Barrett Wylie, LLC and Abreo & Carter in 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 09/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172] [Entered: 09/17/2019 10:57 AM]
September 17, 2019 [10678992] Entry of appearance filed by Eric Alan Isaacson for Appellees Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel: White & Allen, P.A., Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Thompson, Garrett & Hines, William Thomas, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Slaven Law Group, Mr. Richard Russell, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Mr. James M. Pietz, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Orlans, P.C., Molleur Law Office, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, John M. Totten, P.C., Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Terrie Harman, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Hajjar Peters, LLP, Greak Law, P.C., Gamble & Russell, P.C., Chris W. Fitzgerald, FisherBroyles, LLP, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Mr. Nathan A. East, Dye Snyder, LLP, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Butler Snow, LLP, Bigham Law Firm, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Barrett Wylie, LLC and Abreo & Carter. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 09/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172] [Entered: 09/17/2019 10:31 AM]
September 17, 2019 [10678979] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mitchell A. Toups for Appellees Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel: White & Allen, P.A., Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Thompson, Garrett & Hines, William Thomas, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Slaven Law Group, Mr. Richard Russell, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Mr. James M. Pietz, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Orlans, P.C., Molleur Law Office, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, John M. Totten, P.C., Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Terrie Harman, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Hajjar Peters, LLP, Greak Law, P.C., Gamble & Russell, P.C., Chris W. Fitzgerald, FisherBroyles, LLP, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Mr. Nathan A. East, Dye Snyder, LLP, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Butler Snow, LLP, Bigham Law Firm, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Barrett Wylie, LLC and Abreo & Carter in 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 09/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172] [Entered: 09/17/2019 10:19 AM]
September 16, 2019 [10678862] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric Alan Isaacson for Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel (see Ex. A to entry of appearance) for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172] --[Edited 09/17/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] EAI [Entered: 09/16/2019 09:46 PM]
September 16, 2019 [10678855] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] JAL [Entered: 09/16/2019 05:36 PM]
September 16, 2019 [10678837] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard L. Coffman for Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs Counsel listed on Exhibit A hereto for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172] --[Edited 09/17/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] RLC [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:26 PM]
September 16, 2019 [10678773] Entry of appearance submitted by Mitchell A. Toups for Appellee-Plaintiff Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs Listed on Exhibit A hereto for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172] --[Edited 09/17/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] MAT [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:02 PM]
September 16, 2019 [10678761] Entry of appearance filed by Jason Mark Milne and Martin John Phipps for Plaintiffs/Appellees Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Charles A. Welsh, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, Ron Wetz. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3079, 19-3174, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 09/16/2019 02:43 PM]
September 16, 2019 [10678742] Entry of appearance submitted by Martin J. Phipps, Jason M. Milne for Appellee Phipps Anderson Deacon, L.L.P. in 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, Appellee Phipps Anderson Deacon, LLP in 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] --[Edited 09/16/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 9/16/19] MJP [Entered: 09/16/2019 01:52 PM]
September 13, 2019 [10678512] Docketing statement filed by Watts Guerra LLP. Served on 09/13/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172] JAL [Entered: 09/13/2019 06:06 PM]
September 13, 2019 [10678511] Notice filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3172, 19-3021, 19-3082. Served on 09/13/2019 by email. [19-3172, 19-3021, 19-3082] JAL [Entered: 09/13/2019 06:05 PM]
August 30, 2019 [10675042] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case pending allocation determinations in the remaining pools. The 10/09/19 deadline to file the opening brief and appendix is vacated. Status report due 09/16/2019 by Watts Guerra LLP. In addition, the parties are directed to file a joint response listing the designations for appellants and appellees. The joint response is due 09/13/19 (see order for details).. Served on 08/30/2019. [19-3172] [Entered: 08/30/2019 02:30 PM]
August 30, 2019 [10674813] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/30/2019. --[Edited 08/30/2019 by MLB to remove brief and appendix deadline. It was vacated per 08/30/19 order] [19-3172] [Entered: 08/30/2019 08:54 AM]
August 28, 2019 [10674347] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/04/2019 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KSkc), Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3172] [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:16 PM]
August 28, 2019 [10674265] Docketing statement filed by Watts Guerra LLP. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172] JAL [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:15 PM]
August 28, 2019 [10674245] Docketing statement filed by Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3175, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178] TJB [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:59 PM]
August 28, 2019 This entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] Unsigned. Attorney advised to sign and refile only in the appeal in which he represents the appellant(s). [10674241] Notice received from Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175 that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3175, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178] TJB [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:55 PM]
August 28, 2019 [10674227] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Watts Guerra LLP. Served on: 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172] JAL [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:28 PM]
August 28, 2019 [10674171] Entry of appearance filed by Christopher A. Seeger for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3172] [Entered: 08/28/2019 12:15 PM]
August 28, 2019 [10674139] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher A. Seeger for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 08/28/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 8/28/19] [19-3172] CAS [Entered: 08/28/2019 10:57 AM]
August 28, 2019 [10674127] Entry of appearance filed by Stephen A. Weiss and Diogenes P. Kekatos for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3172] [Entered: 08/28/2019 10:41 AM]
August 28, 2019 [10674124] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen A. Weiss and Diogenes P. Kekatos for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 08/28/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 8/28/19][19-3172] SAW [Entered: 08/28/2019 10:31 AM]
August 27, 2019 [10673989] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Mike DaVault, Bradley DaVault, and David DaVault d/b/a DaVault ArkMo Farms,Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Grafel entities (Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, and D. and S. Grain & Cattle Co.),David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL,Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms,Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb (CE Cobb Farms), Robert & Todd Niemeyer (Custom Farm Services LLC), Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, and Al-Corn Clean Fuel,LLC Gustafson Gluek PLLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/27/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 08/27/2019 05:13 PM]
August 27, 2019 [10673928] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Gustafson Gluek, PLLC, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3172, Appellees Gustafson Gluek, PLLC, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178]--[Edited 08/27/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 8/27/19.] DEG [Entered: 08/27/2019 02:59 PM]
August 27, 2019 [10673915] Order filed by Clerk of the Court on the parties' 08/16/2019 and 08/26/2019 status reports. The court notes that the joint status reports were not filed in case number 19-3032 and reminds the parties that status reports must be filed in all abated appeals. The parties shall file the required preliminary documents in appeal numbers 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, and 19-3178; those appeals have not yet been abated. Appeal numbers 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, and 19-3082 remain abated. The next status report is due 09/16/2019 in all abated appeals and in accordance with the court's 05/15/2019 order. Served on 08/27/2019. [19-3008, 19-3174, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 08/27/2019 02:40 PM]
August 26, 2019 [10673567] Joint status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP, appellant in Nos. 19-3021, 19-3082, and 19-3172; Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs Counsel, appellants in Nos. 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3079, and 19-3176; and MDL Co-Lead Plaintiffs Counsel, Minnesota Lead Counsel (except Watts Guerra LLP), and Illinois State Lead Counsel, appellees in all appeals. Served on 08/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] --[Edited docket text 08/26/2019 by SLS.] BW [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:08 PM]
August 22, 2019 [10672837] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. William P. Ferranti for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172] [Entered: 08/22/2019 01:28 PM]
August 22, 2019 [10672731] Entry of appearance submitted by William P. Ferranti for Appellant Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172]--[Edited 08/22/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 8/22/19.] WPF [Entered: 08/22/2019 10:41 AM]
August 22, 2019 [10672607] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Don Manley Downing and Ms. Gretchen Garrison for attorney-appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al., and plaintiff-appellees Mr. Mike DaVault, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172] [Entered: 08/22/2019 07:45 AM]
August 21, 2019 [10672569] Entry of appearance submitted by Don M. Downing, Gretchen Garrison for Appellee Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. in 19-3172, 19-3174, Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. and Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. in 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178]--[Edited 08/22/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DMD [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:18 PM]
August 21, 2019 [10672400] Entry of appearance filed by Tempe D. Smith for Appellees "Representative Plaintiffs" (Mike DaVault, Bradley DaVault, and David DaVault d/b/a DaVault ArkMo Farms, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Grafel entities (Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, and D. and S. Grain & Cattle Co.), David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb (CE Cobb Farms), Robert & Todd Niemeyer (Custom Farm Services LLC), Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC) & "Kansas MDL Co-Lead Counsel" (Gray, Ritter & Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, LLP and Hare Wynn Newell & Newton) & other firms sharing in the Kansas fee allocation who are not Appellants in this appeal collectively as Kansas Common Benefit Firms (listed in attachment). CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 08/21/2019 12:13 PM]
August 21, 2019 [10672317] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Rachel E. Schwartz and Patrick J. Stueve for Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Benefit Firms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 08/21/2019 09:59 AM]
August 21, 2019 [10672290] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Appellants Wagner Reese, LLP and Shamberg, Wolf, McDermott & Depue in 19-3172, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Green Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg, Wolf, McDermott & Depue, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3174, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Green Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Seeger Weiss LLP, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg, Wolf, McDermott & Depue, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3175, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3176, 19-3178 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 08/21/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 8/21/19][19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] PJS [Entered: 08/21/2019 09:28 AM]
August 21, 2019 [10672223] Entry of appearance filed by Bruce McKee and Scott A. Powell for attorney-appellees Anderson Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al., and plaintiff-appellees Mike DaVault, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y more than 50 parties. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172] [Entered: 08/21/2019 07:51 AM]
August 20, 2019 [10672137] Entry of appearance submitted by Tempe D. Smith for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Steven A. Wentworth, Five Star Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Emerson Poynter LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Hodge Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Speer Law Firm, PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and Appellant Wagner Reese, LLP in 19-3172, Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Steven A. Wentworth, Five Star Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Emerson Poynter LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Hodge Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Speer Law Firm, PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Zimmerman Reed, LLP and Law Offices of James S. Rogers in 19-3174, Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Steven A. Wentworth, Five Star Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Emerson Poynter LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Hodge Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Seeger Weiss LLP, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Speer Law Firm, PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Zimmerman Reed, LLP and Law Offices of James S. Rogers in 19-3175, 19-3178 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/20/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3178] --[Edited 08/21/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] SAP [Entered: 08/20/2019 03:37 PM]
August 20, 2019 [10672121] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott A. Powell and Bruce J. McKee for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, Seeger Weiss LLP, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Steven A. Wentworth and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Law Offices of James S. Rogers in 19-3172, Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Steven A. Wentworth and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Green Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Law Offices of James S. Rogers in 19-3174, Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward, Steven A. Wentworth and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Green Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Law Offices of James S. Rogers in 19-3175, 19-3178 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/20/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3178]--[Edited 08/21/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed (including 19-3176.)] SAP [Entered: 08/20/2019 03:02 PM]
August 20, 2019 [10671946] Entry of appearance filed by William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Steven A. Wentworth, Roger Ward, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, NEBCO, Inc., Marvin Miller, Charles B. Lex, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Five Star Farms, Leroy Edlund, Demmer Farms, Inc., Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc. Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Grant Annexstad, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bieber Farm, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/19/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175] [Entered: 08/20/2019 09:13 AM]
August 19, 2019 [10671847] Entry of appearance submitted by William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC in 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175]--[Edited 08/20/2019 by JM PDF removed Filed by the court on 8/20.19.] WBC [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:51 PM]
August 16, 2019 [10671434] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175. Served on 08/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175] JAL [Entered: 08/16/2019 02:32 PM]
August 16, 2019 [10671250] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Thomas Wiegand for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3172] [Entered: 08/16/2019 09:32 AM]
August 16, 2019 [10671178] Entry of appearance submitted by Thomas J. Wiegand for Appellant Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 08/16/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 8/16/19][19-3172] TW [Entered: 08/16/2019 07:40 AM]
August 15, 2019 [10671120] Entry of appearance filed by Bradley Wilders for Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Whaley Law Firm, Wexler Wallace LLP, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., The Gibbs Law Firm, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Speer Law Firm, PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Sneed Lang PC, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Seeger Weiss LLP, Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Schwebel Goetz & Sieben PA, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Saeed & Little, LLP, Roth Law Firm, Phipps Anderson Deacon, L.L.P., Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Paul LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Hodge Law Firm, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Gustafson Gluek, PLLC, Greene Espel PLLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, Emerson Poynter LLP, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Clark, Love & Hutson, G.P., Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Brooks Pierce, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Battle & Winn LLP, Bassford Remele, P.A., Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson and Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y.1,900 pages. will provide this information upon request. Served on 08/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172] [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:42 PM]
August 15, 2019 [10671076] Entry of appearance submitted by Bradley T. Wilders for Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, The Gibbs Law Firm, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellant Wagner Reese, LLP in 19-3172, Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler, Perches, Hundl & Kerlick, Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, The Gibbs Law Firm, Green Espel PLLP and Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Gray Reed & McGraw LLP in 19-3175 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172, 19-3175]--[Edited 08/15/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 8/15/19.] BW [Entered: 08/15/2019 02:36 PM]
August 15, 2019 [10671029] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric R. Nitz and Mr. Jeffrey A. Lamken for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172] [Entered: 08/15/2019 01:34 PM]
August 15, 2019 [10670947] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey A. Lamken, Eric R. Nitz for Appellant Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172]--[Edited 08/15/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] JAL [Entered: 08/15/2019 11:56 AM]
August 14, 2019 [10670694] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/14/2019 Transcript order form and docketing statement due 08/28/2019 for Watts Guerra LLP, et al. Notice of appearance due on 08/28/2019 for Adams, Rizzi & Sween, P.A., David R. Adelman, Alerding Castor Hewitt LLP, Allen Wellman McNew Harvey, LLP, Allen, Stein & Durbin, PC, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Angel, Isaacson & Tracy, Attorneys at Law, Anthony O'Hanlon, P.C., Arndt Buswell & Thorn S.C., Michael Ashar, Atlee Hall, LLP, Baker, Bodwell, Appel Attorneys at Law, Bakke Norman, S.C., Barada Law Offices, LLC, Barbara J. Simmons Attorney at Law, Barber, Segatto, Hoffee, Wilke & Cate, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Barrett McNagny LLP, Barrett, Easterday, Cunningham & Eselgroth, LLP, Bassford Remele, P.A., Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Beine & Roberts Law Firm, PLC, Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Tom Benson, Bernatz & Van Beek, Bill J. Milner Law Offices, Bird, Jacobsen & Stevens, PC, George M. Bishop, Blakeman & Schrock, LTD, Bloom Gates & Whiteleather, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Leo Boothe, Boren, Olver and Coffey, LLP, Boring & Boring, PC, Boschma Law Office, Bose McKinney & Evans LLP, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Bradford Law Firm, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brand & Morelock, Brau Law Office, Brennan Steil S.C., Brett Dunn PLLC, Brian Fitzwater Law Office, Brock Law Offices PC LLO, Brooks & Olson, Brooks Pierce, Brown, DePrez & Johnson, P.A., Broyles Kight & Ricafort, PC, Burns Cronauer & Brown LLP, Byron Stone, PLLC, Caldwell, Brierly, Chalupa & Nuzman, PLLC, Call & Gentry Law Group, Carabin & Shaw, P.C., Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Carpenter & Schumacher, P.C., Cary, Welch, Hickman & Hawk, LLP, Caughey, Legner & Freehill Attorneys at Law, Mitchell C. Chaney, Chapman Law LLC, Charles E. Cronauer & Associates, Charles Hear, Attorney at Law, Charnetski, Lacina & Clower, LLP, Chester Law Office, Church, Church, HIttle & Antrim, Clark & Clark P.C., Clark, Love & Hutson, G.P., Clendening Johnson & Bohrer, P.C., Cline Farrell Christie & Lee, P.C., Cline Williams Wright Johnson & Oldfather, LLP, Cockerill & Cockerill Attorneys at Law, Jeremy P. Cohen, Cole Law Office, Cole, Easley, Sciba & Williams, P.C., Colvin, Chaney, Saenz & Rodriguez, LLP, Connors LLP, Coots, Henke & Wheeler, Copley Roth & Wilson, LLC, Cornell Law Office, Pen Cosby, Cotton, Bolton, Hoychick & Doughty, LLP, Cress Law Group, PC, Critchfield Critchfield & Johson, Ltd., Cross Law Firm, LLC, Cross Pennamped Woolsey & Glazier, P.C., Crystal D. Pulley, Attorney at Law, Culbertson & Allen, LLC, Custy Law Firm, LLC, Daniel M. Homolka, P.A., Darling & Darling, Dave O'Brien Law, Davis & Campbell, LLC, DeWald Deaver, P.C., Briana Deane, Deborah Smith McClure, P.C., John R. Delzer, Delzer Law Office, Denney & Barrett, PC, Denton & Keuler, LLP, Dillon Legal Group, Dobbs Legal Group, Doering & Grisell, PA, Drew Young Law, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Edmund A. Weinheimer, Jr., P. C., Eich, Van Dyke, Werdan & Steger P.C., Ellis & Judd Law Office, LLC, Patrick A. Elward, Brent C. Embrey, Emerick, Diggins & Zabona P.C., Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, Endurance Law Group PLC, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Espe Law PLLC, Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A., Faith Ingle Smith Law Firm, Fearer, Nye, & Chadwick, Fellheimer Law Firm Ltd., Fenchel, Doster & Buck, PLC, Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough, Fitzgerald Law P.A., Flynn & Sullivan PC, Forbes Law Group, LLC, Forde Law Offices LLP, Foreman Watson Holtrey, Frundt & Johnson, Ltd., Michael J. Galanis, Gary T. Gee Law Office, Gellhaus & Gellhaus, P. C., Spencer Gilland, Gordon & Associates, P.C., Michael Goss, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Graybill & Witcher, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Gregory L. Ceshker, P.C., Grenfell, Sledge and Stevens, Griffin Dietrich & Elliot, LLC, Grosboll, Becker, Tice & Barr, Gustafson Gluek, PLLC, Habush Habush & Rottier, S.C., Hagen & Hagen, P.C., Hall Hudson, P.C., Hampton & Royce, L.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Hart Bell, LLC, Hawkins Law, PC, Hecker Law Group, PLC, Hehner & Associates, LLC, Heinisch & Lovegrove Law Office, PC LLP, Hensley Legal Group PC, Heritage Legal Group PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Holland Law Firm, Richard M. Holmes, Hostetter & Associates, Hovland & Rasmus, PLLC, W. Calloway Huffaker, Hume, Smith, Geddes, Green & Simmons, LLP, Ingebritson & Associates, P.A., Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, James & Larson Law, James Law, P.C., Janzen Agricultural Law, LLC, Jason Schutte, Koepke & Hiltabrand Attorney at Law, Jefferson & Brewer, LLP, Jeffrey A. Boggess, P.C., Johnson & Mock, PC LLO, Johnson Law Group, Johnson, Kramer, Mulholland, Cochrane, Driscoll & Cochrane, P.L.C., Johnson, Moody, Schmidt & Kleinhuizen, P.A., Justin Hill, PC, KC Cohen, Lawyer, PC, Katz & Korin, P.C., Keaton & Keaton PC, Kelley Law Firm, PC, Kempton & Russell, LLC, Keuler, Kelly Hutchins & Blankenship, LLP, Kevin W. Liles PC, Kirk Law Firm, Kittelsen, Barry, Wellington, Thompson, & Schluesche, Attorneys at Law, Knuth Law Office, Koenig Law Firm, Alex Koenigs, Kovarik, Ellison & Mathis, P.C., Kraft Walser Law Office, PLLP, Kramer Law, LLC, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Kruse & Dakin LLP, Kuhlman & Lucas, LLC, Lamkin & Lamkin, P.C., Langdon & Emison Attorneys at Law, Law Office of Adam Crawshaw, Law Office of Brent Gaines, Law Office of Christopher H. Poynor, Law Office of Ezequiel Reyna, Jr., Law Office of Gregory E. Tonore, Law Office of Hammell & Murphy PLLP, Law Office of Jeffrey R. Vaughan, P.C., Law Office of Lester Weinstine, P.C., Law Office of Michael Miller, Law Office of Mike Crane, LLP, Law Office of Thomas A. Noe, III, Law Office of William Enyart, Law Office of William R. Shirk, Law Offices of Hans A. Buehler, LLC, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Law Offices of Leonel Alejandro PC, Law Offices of Richard Hoffman, Jenna Laird Leger, Wayne J. Lennington, Lee J. Lewis, Lind Jensen Sullivan & Peterson P.A., Jeff Link, Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lowe Eklund Wakefield CO., LPA, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Mailander Law Office, Maloney & Campolo, March, McMillan, DeJoode & Duvall, P.C., Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, Martz & Lucas, LLC, Irvin L. Masching, Massie & Quick, LLC, Mauro Archer and Associates PLLC, Maynes Law Office, Mazzanti Law Office, PLLC, McClure, Thomas & Thomas, McCulley McCluer PLLC, McFarland Law, PC, McNeely Stephenson, Meador & Crump, P.A., Meier, Bragicich & Moore LLP, Mercho Caughey & DeLay, Mertes & Mertes, P.C., Meyer & Meyer LLP, Michael Smith Law, Midwest AG Solutions LLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Pearson Gloe Burns Beatty & Parrish, P.L.C., Miller Schirger LLC, Miltner Law Firm, LLC, Miner & Lemon, LLP, Moore, Susler, McNutt & Wrigley, LLC, Morgan & Meyers, PLC, Morning Law Office LLC, Morris Laing Evans Brock & Kennedy, Morrissey, Morrissey & Dalluge, Muske, Muske, Suhrhoff LTD, Myers Hockemeyer & McNagny LLP, Nathan J. Noble, P.C., Gregg Neal, Nelson, Young, & Braland Attorneys at Law, Nidey Erdahl Tindal & Fischer, PLC, Norman Paloucek & Herman, O'Koon Hintermeister, PLLC, Obear, Overholser, Huffer & Rider, LLC, Osterbauer Law Firm, Ouderkirk Law Firm, Overboe Law, Pagel & Weikum, PLLP, Patterson Comer, Patton Brown Law, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg P.A, Paul LLP, Pemberton Law Firm, Pemberton, Sorlie, Rufer, & Kershner, PLLP, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Phillippi Law Firm, LLC, Phipps Anderson Deacon, L.L.P., Pickner Law Office, Plews Shadley Racher & Braun LLP, Daniel Quigley, Quigley Law Office, Quirk & Hunter, PC, Rammelkamp Bradney, P.C., Randle & Sammons, P.C., Ray A. Ferguson & Associates, Ltd., Reichert Law Office, Reichert Wenner, P.A., Reiling Teder & Schrier, LLC, Rhoades McKee PC, Riccolo, Semelroth, & Henningsen, P.C., Richard D. Larson, P.C., Riley-Tanis & Associates PLLC, Rob Tully Law Firm, Roberts Law Office, Robinson, Curphey & O'Connel, LLC, Mark A. Roeder, Roth Law Firm, Ryan Moore & Cook, Saeed & Little, LLP, Satterley and Kelley, PLLC, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Schmittinger & Rodriguez, P.A., Schnelker, Rassi & McConnell PLC, Schultz Law, Schwarz Law Office, Schwebel Goetz & Sieben PA, Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Sever Storey, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Shamberg, Wolf, McDermott & Depue, Shatzman & Associates, P.C., Sherman Hoffman & Hipp, LC, Shimanek, Shimanek, & Bowman, LLC, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Simon Herbert & McClelland, LLP, Deborah K. Smith, William F. Smith, Smith Gardner Slusky Lazer Pohren & Rogers LLP, Sneed Lang PC, Sonenberg Law LLC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Sorling Northrup Attorneys, Sounding Board Legal, S.C., Speer Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stockard, Johnston, & Brown, P.C, Stoerzbach Law Office, P.C., Stone Law Office, P.L.L.C., Stout Law Group, Strittmatter Law Firm, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Swaim Law Firm, PLLC, Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP, Taylor & Ruhnke, PC, Ted B. Lyon & Associates, P.C., The Cahill Law Offices, The Cantlin Law Firm, The Gibbs Law Firm, The Julian C. Gomez Law Firm, PLLC, The Law Office of George P. Escobedo & Associates, The Law Office of Mark L Eurek, The Law Office of Rob Tully PC, The Law Office of Samuel W. Bearman, L.C., The Law Office of Thomas R. Fields, P.A., The Law Offices of Timothy L. Lapointe, P.C., The McQuades Co. LPA, The Poppe Law Firm, The Pruneda Law Firm, PLLC, The Strom Law Firm, LLC, The Winkie Law Firm, LLC, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Tourkow Crell Rosenblatt & Johnston LLP, Troth Law Office, Troyer & Good, PC, Tucker & Tucker, P.C., Tucker Law Practice, Tully Law Office, PC, Underwood Law Firm, PC, Van Kley & Walker, LLC, VanDerGinst Law, Vandervoort Christ & Fisher, P.C., Vaughan Law Firm, P.C., Vela Law Offices PLLC, Virtus Law PLLC, Vriezelaar, Tigges, Edington, Bottaro, Boden, & Ross, L.L.P., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wadler, Perches, Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Walk & Murphy, PLC, Wallace Law, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Laurie S. Ward, Warner Norcross & Judd, LLP, Wasker Door Wimmer & Marcouiller, P.C., Watts Guerra LLP, W

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHAPMAN LAW LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DENNEY & BARRETT, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DANIEL QUIGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MCFARLAND LAW, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY R. VAUGHAN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TED B. LYON & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HOLLAND LAW FIRM
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RYAN MOORE & COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WICKENS & WICKENS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RHOADES MCKEE PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RICHARD M. HOLMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHESTER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CRYSTAL D. PULLEY, ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WINSTEIN, KAVENSKY & CUNNINGHAM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KEMPTON & RUSSELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WASKER DOOR WIMMER & MARCOUILLER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GREGORY L. CESHKER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TOM BENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FORDE LAW OFFICES LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MCNEELY STEPHENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: OUDERKIRK LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GARY T. GEE LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COLE, EASLEY, SCIBA & WILLIAMS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HALL HUDSON, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE CAHILL LAW OFFICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WIL GALLOWAY & ASSOCIATES, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARRETT MCNAGNY LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BATTLE & WINN LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WRIGHT SCHIMMEL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MAURO ARCHER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BOREN, OLVER AND COFFEY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FENCHEL, DOSTER & BUCK, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DENTON & KEULER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHARLES HEAR, ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: QUIGLEY LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COLVIN, CHANEY, SAENZ & RODRIGUEZ, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: REICHERT LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JEFF LINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TROTH LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SCHNELKER, RASSI & MCCONNELL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MEYER & MEYER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BERNATZ & VAN BEEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MASSIE & QUICK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE GIBBS LAW FIRM
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SWAIM LAW FIRM, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHN R. DELZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARBARA J. SIMMONS ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DARLING & DARLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NATHAN J. NOBLE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: O'KOON HINTERMEISTER, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CROSS PENNAMPED WOOLSEY & GLAZIER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FEARER, NYE, & CHADWICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BILL J. MILNER LAW OFFICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GORDON & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TOURKOW CRELL ROSENBLATT & JOHNSTON LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JUSTIN HILL, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MEIER, BRAGICICH & MOORE LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BAKKE NORMAN, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CARPENTER & SCHUMACHER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GRENFELL, SLEDGE AND STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TROYER & GOOD, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CLARK & CLARK P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHNSON, MOODY, SCHMIDT & KLEINHUIZEN, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MCCLURE, THOMAS & THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COTTON, BOLTON, HOYCHICK & DOUGHTY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WRIGHT & SCHULTE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE CANTLIN LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BROOKS & OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHURCH, CHURCH, HITTLE & ANTRIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SPENCER GILLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE STROM LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CARABIN & SHAW, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WELD, RILEY, PRENN & RICCI S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HEINISCH & LOVEGROVE LAW OFFICE, PC LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HEHNER & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CONNORS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NORMAN PALOUCEK & HERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FAFINSKI MARK & JOHNSON, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STRITTMATTER LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RAMMELKAMP BRADNEY, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE LAW OFFICE OF MARK L EUREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JEFFREY A. BOGGESS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHIMANEK, SHIMANEK, & BOWMAN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KRAFT WALSER LAW OFFICE, PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MILLER PEARSON GLOE BURNS BEATTY & PARRISH, P.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DOERING & GRISELL, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHARLES E. CRONAUER & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BLAKEMAN & SCHROCK, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WARNER NORCROSS & JUDD, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BEINE & ROBERTS LAW FIRM, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRENNAN STEIL S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BIRD, JACOBSEN & STEVENS, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHAEL ASHAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SATTERLEY AND KELLEY, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SORLING NORTHRUP ATTORNEYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BROYLES KIGHT & RICAFORT, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRETT DUNN PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CAUGHEY, LEGNER & FREEHILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHAMBERG, WOLF, MCDERMOTT & DEPUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: VANDERVOORT CHRIST & FISHER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE POPPE LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAURIE S. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MERTES & MERTES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STOCKARD, JOHNSTON, & BROWN, P.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EMERICK, DIGGINS & ZABONA P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ADAMS, RIZZI & SWEEN, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FAITH INGLE SMITH LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAMES & LARSON LAW, JAMES LAW, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GRAYBILL & WITCHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: OSTERBAUER LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHAEL SMITH LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SIMON HERBERT & MCCLELLAND, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CLENDENING JOHNSON & BOHRER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DOBBS LEGAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MILTNER LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GELLHAUS & GELLHAUS, P. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRIANA DEANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAKE W. BROOKS ATTORNEY AT LAW
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WHITMAN, BABER, & SIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: VANDERGINST LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PAUL LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE WINKIE LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: VELA LAW OFFICES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JENNA LAIRD LEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: VAUGHAN LAW FIRM, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SEVER STOREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TUCKER LAW PRACTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WOOD & RUE, PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HERITAGE LEGAL GROUP PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PHILLIPPI LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WOODARD LAW PC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DEBORAH K. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHERMAN HOFFMAN & HIPP, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DILLON LEGAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ARNDT BUSWELL & THORN S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LEO BOOTHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHNSON LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WILLIAM F. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HECKER LAW GROUP, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MORGAN & MEYERS, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EDMUND A. WEINHEIMER, JR., P. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JEREMY P. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KOVARIK, ELLISON & MATHIS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PEMBERTON, SORLIE, RUFER, & KERSHNER, PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GRIFFIN DIETRICH & ELLIOT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARRETT, EASTERDAY, CUNNINGHAM & ESELGROTH, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EMERSON POYNTER LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ATLEE HALL, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ANGEL, ISAACSON & TRACY, ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HABUSH HABUSH & ROTTIER, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SNEED LANG PC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHAEL GOSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DREW YOUNG LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ALLEN, STEIN & DURBIN, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WADLER, PERCHES, HUNDL & KERLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MORNING LAW OFFICE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MYERS HOCKEMEYER & MCNAGNY LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GREENE ESPEL PLLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KC COHEN, LAWYER, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SCHWARZ LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ZEILINGER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WOODS ROGERS PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HAMPTON & ROYCE, L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EICH, VAN DYKE, WERDAN & STEGER P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WEEKS & BRUCKER, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KIRK LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF BRENT GAINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WILLIS & WILLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: QUIRK & HUNTER, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MALONEY & CAMPOLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CUSTY LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MITCHELL C. CHANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BORING & BORING, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PATRICK A. ELWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STOERZBACH LAW OFFICE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CRITCHFIELD CRITCHFIELD & JOHSON, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE LAW OFFICE OF ROB TULLY PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: REILING TEDER & SCHRIER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENDURANCE LAW GROUP PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LANGDON & EMISON ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, L.L.P.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DAVIS & CAMPBELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KNUTH LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KEVIN W. LILES PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MINER & LEMON, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FRUNDT & JOHNSON, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KEULER, KELLY HUTCHINS & BLANKENSHIP, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BROWN, DEPREZ & JOHNSON, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF MIKE CRANE, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: W. CALLOWAY HUFFAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CALL & GENTRY LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRADFORD LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WILLADSEN & NEAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF LESTER WEINSTINE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF HAMMELL & MURPHY PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RILEY-TANIS & ASSOCIATES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DEBORAH SMITH MCCLURE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COOTS, HENKE & WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BOHRER BRADY LLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: REICHERT WENNER, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BROCK LAW OFFICES PC LLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAMKIN & LAMKIN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FLYNN & SULLIVAN PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF EZEQUIEL REYNA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ANTHONY O'HANLON, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MARTZ & LUCAS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: INGEBRITSON & ASSOCIATES, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HOVLAND & RASMUS, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STONE LAW OFFICE, P.L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ROB TULLY LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WYLAND, HUMPHREY & CLEVENGER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER H. POYNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SCHMITTINGER & RODRIGUEZ, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GROSBOLL, BECKER, TICE & BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PATTERSON COMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRENT C. EMBREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MARK A. ROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MORRISSEY, MORRISSEY & DALLUGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CROSS LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NIDEY ERDAHL TINDAL & FISCHER, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COLE LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SAEED & LITTLE, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CORNELL LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CLINE FARRELL CHRISTIE & LEE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHNSON & MOCK, PC LLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TAYLOR & RUHNKE, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STOUT LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JEFFERSON & BREWER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CULBERTSON & ALLEN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MEADOR & CRUMP, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JANZEN AGRICULTURAL LAW, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE LAW OFFICE OF SAMUEL W. BEARMAN, L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHAEL J. GALANIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF ADAM CRAWSHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KELLEY LAW FIRM, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WAGNER REESE, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WALLACE LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DAVE O'BRIEN LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FITZGERALD LAW P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MORRIS LAING EVANS BROCK & KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RAY A. FERGUSON & ASSOCIATES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MUSKE, MUSKE, SUHRHOFF LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JASON SCHUTTE, KOEPKE & HILTABRAND ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE MCQUADES CO. LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RICCOLO, SEMELROTH, & HENNINGSEN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers |