In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Plaintiff: NORMAN SIGRIST, MICHAEL GRIES, RICHARD CRONE, RON WETZ, VJW FARM, INC., BRADLEY J. VERMEER, KENNETH OSBORN, PETER V. ANDERSON, PINE HURST ACRES and CHARLES A. WELSH
Defendant: SYNGENTA SEEDS, LLC, FKA Syngenta Seeds, Inc., SYNGENTA CORPORATION, SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION AG, SYNGENTA BIOTECHNOLOGY, INC., SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC and SYNGENTA AG
Plaintiff / Appellee: ROBERT NIEMEYER, GRAFEL FARMS, LLC, FIVE STAR FARMS, TODD NIEMEYER, STEVEN A. WENTWORTH, CE COBB FARMS, CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC, LEROY EDLUND, DAVID POLIFKA, TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP, NEBCO, INC., DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, CHARLES COBB, GRANT ANNEXSTAD, KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY, CHARLES B. LEX, BIEBER FARM, JPPL, INC., DAVID SCHWANINGER, MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP, D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC., DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, MARVIN MILLER, ROGER WARD, KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC., BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC., AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC, DEMMER FARMS, INC., BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms and ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC
Not Yet Classified: DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC, WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP, BUTLER SNOW, LLP, WHITE & ALLEN, P.A., WELLER, GREEN, TOUPS & TERRELL, LLP, PAUL LLP, HOLLAND LAW FIRM, EMERSON SCOTT LLP, ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP, ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP, BATTS, BATTS & BELL, LLP, KENNETH G. WALSH, Attorney at Law, BOLEN ROBINSON & ELLIS, LLP, SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN, BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC, ORLANS, P.C., SEEGER WEISS LLP, BOHRER BRADY LLC, BARRETT WYLIE, LLC, GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C., THOMPSON, GARRETT & HINES, WEXLER WALLACE LLP, HODGE LAW FIRM, PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, L.L.P., WILLIAM THOMAS, Attorney at Law, WHALEY LAW FIRM, MILLER SCHIRGER LLC, MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC, HAJJAR PETERS, LLP, JOHN M. TOTTEN, P.C., THRASH LAW FIRM, P.A., SCOTT EMORY POYNTER, DBA Poynter Law Group, RAY, WINTON & KELLEY, PLLC, BIGHAM LAW FIRM, E. RUDOLPH MCINTYRE, Attorney at Law, WATTS GUERRA LLP, AARON D. HOVAN, Attorney at Law, OTTS, MOORE, COALE, GODWIN, STEARNS & DARBY, WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC, FISHERBROYLES, LLP, NATHAN A. EAST, Attorney at Law, JAKE W. BROOKS ATTORNEY AT LAW, STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON LLP, BATTLE & WINN LLP, ROTH LAW FIRM, STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP, W. DEAN BELK, JR., Attorney at Law, WAGNER REESE, LLP, PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P., JOHN L. JERNIGAN, III, Attorney at Law, ESTES & KENNEDY LAW OFFICES, PLLC, BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC, SPEER LAW FIRM, PC, SLAVEN LAW GROUP, GRAY REED & MCGRAW LLP, WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC, MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP, BROOKS PIERCE, GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC, ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON, SOPER LEDDIN LAW FIRM, PC, DURRETT, ARKEMA, GERSON & GILL, P.C., HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON, MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL, THE GIBBS LAW FIRM, KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C., LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS, CONRAD F. CROPSEY, Attorney at Law, BASSFORD REMELE, PA, KIZER, BONDS, HUGHES & BOWEN, PLLC, SAEED & LITTLE, LLP, TERRIE HARMAN, Attorney at Law, CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P., WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A., SCHWEBEL GOETZ & SIEBEN PA, RICHARD L. COFFMAN, P.C., DBA The Coffman Law Firm, WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C., CHRIS W. FITZGERALD, Attorney at Law, JOHN E. TARBURTON, Attorney at Law, SIMMONS HANLY CONROY LLC, BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C., LUNDBERG LAW FIRM PLC, TEEL & MARONEY, PLC, ABREO & CARTER, THOMAS P. CALHOUN, III, Attorney at Law, BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES, BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE, RICHARDSON, PATRICK, WESTBROOK & BRICKMAN, LLC, EMERSON POYNTER LLP, LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP, WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK, TROUSDALE RYAN, P.C., SNEED LANG PC, JOSEPH F. MANAK, Attorney at Law, GREAK LAW, P.C., SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C., GREENE ESPEL PLLP, HALLETT, HALLETT & NAGEL, CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C., RICHARD RUSSELL, Attorney at Law, MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE, DYE SNYDER, LLP, JAMES M. PIETZ, Attorney, Attorney at Law, JINKS, CROW & DICKSON, P.C., GAMBLE & RUSSELL, P.C. and HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC
Case Number: 19-3176
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 [10684274] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. It is unclear whether any of the representative plaintiffs are parties, See order for additional information and instructions. On or before October 21, 2019, the parties shall file a joint response addressing parties in any of these matters. Response due on 10/21/2019 for appellants and appelles. Served on 10/03/2019. [19-3079, 19-3174, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 10/03/2019 02:13 PM]
October 3, 2019 [10684113] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These matters remain abated. The parties shall file status reports in accordance with the courts 5/15/19 order. The next status report is due 10/15/19. The parties may file a joint status report. Status reports must be filed in all abated appeals. The parties shall notify this court in writing within 5 days of any significant developments affecting any of the abated matters. Served on 10/03/2019. [19-3008, 19-3174, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] (See the attachment for the entire order.) [Entered: 10/03/2019 09:32 AM]
October 1, 2019 [10683583] Entry of appearance filed by Christopher B. Hood and William Lewis Garrison, Jr. for Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 10/01/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3008, 19-3174, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 10/01/2019 03:28 PM]
October 1, 2019 [10683497] Entry of appearance submitted by W. Lewis Garrison, Jr.; Christopher B. Hood for Appellee Henninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3175 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] --[Edited 10/01/2019 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 10/01/19] WLG [Entered: 10/01/2019 12:55 PM]
September 24, 2019 [10681026] Entry of appearance submitted by Clayton A. Clark; Scott A. Love for Not Party Clark, Love & Hutson GP in 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178Norman Sigrist; Kenneth Osborn; Peter V. Anderson; Charles A. Welsh; VJW Farm, Inc.; Michael Gries; Richard Crone; Pine Hurst Acres; Bradley J. Vermeer; Ron Wetz for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/24/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] CAC [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:46 PM]
September 16, 2019 [10678855] Status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] JAL [Entered: 09/16/2019 05:36 PM]
September 16, 2019 [10678761] Entry of appearance filed by Jason Mark Milne and Martin John Phipps for Plaintiffs/Appellees Norman Sigrist, Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Charles A. Welsh, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Bradley J. Vermeer, Ron Wetz. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3079, 19-3174, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 09/16/2019 02:43 PM]
September 16, 2019 [10678742] Entry of appearance submitted by Martin J. Phipps, Jason M. Milne for Appellee Phipps Anderson Deacon, L.L.P. in 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, Appellee Phipps Anderson Deacon, LLP in 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] --[Edited 09/16/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 9/16/19] MJP [Entered: 09/16/2019 01:52 PM]
September 13, 2019 [10678516] Response filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. to The Court's Order dated August 30, 2019 concerning clarification of parties to appeal.. Served on 09/13/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3176] EAI [Entered: 09/13/2019 10:21 PM]
August 30, 2019 [10675101] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case and directing the parties to file a status report by due 09/16/2019; directing appellants to file clairfication as to the parties, if necessary, within 14 days of the date of this order. (Appellants' response due 09/13/2019.) Served on 08/30/2019. (See the attachment fo the entire order.) [19-3176] [Entered: 08/30/2019 03:45 PM]
August 30, 2019 [10674888] Docketing statement filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A.. Served on 08/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176] EAI [Entered: 08/30/2019 10:26 AM]
August 30, 2019 [10674840] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/30/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 10/09/2019 for Abreo & Carter, et al. [19-3176] [Entered: 08/30/2019 09:37 AM]
August 29, 2019 [10674397] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/05/2019 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KSkc), Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3176] [Entered: 08/29/2019 07:29 AM]
August 28, 2019 [10674370] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A.. Served on: 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176] EAI [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:56 PM]
August 28, 2019 [10674288] Entry of appearance filed by Eric Alan Isaacson for all appellants. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176] [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:57 PM]
August 28, 2019 [10674282] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric Alan Isaacson for Appellants Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176]--[Edited 08/28/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] EAI [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:41 PM]
August 28, 2019 [10674245] Docketing statement filed by Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3175, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178] TJB [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:59 PM]
August 28, 2019 This entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] Unsigned. Attorney advised to sign and refile only in the appeal in which he represents the appellant(s). [10674241] Notice received from Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175 that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3175, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178] TJB [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:55 PM]
August 28, 2019 [10674156] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher Adam Seeger for All Plaintiffs-Appellees. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y more than 50. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176] [Entered: 08/28/2019 11:32 AM]
August 28, 2019 [10674147] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher A. Seeger for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176]--[Edited 08/28/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] CAS [Entered: 08/28/2019 11:11 AM]
August 28, 2019 [10674142] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Diogenes P. Kekatos and Mr. Steven A. Weiss for All Plaintiff-Appellees. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176] [Entered: 08/28/2019 11:07 AM]
August 28, 2019 [10674136] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen A. Weiss and Diogenes P. Kekatos for Appellees Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176]--[Edited 08/28/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] SAW [Entered: 08/28/2019 10:50 AM]
August 27, 2019 [10673989] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Mike DaVault, Bradley DaVault, and David DaVault d/b/a DaVault ArkMo Farms,Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Grafel entities (Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, and D. and S. Grain & Cattle Co.),David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL,Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms,Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb (CE Cobb Farms), Robert & Todd Niemeyer (Custom Farm Services LLC), Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, and Al-Corn Clean Fuel,LLC Gustafson Gluek PLLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/27/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 08/27/2019 05:13 PM]
August 27, 2019 [10673928] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Gustafson Gluek, PLLC, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3172, Appellees Gustafson Gluek, PLLC, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178]--[Edited 08/27/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 8/27/19.] DEG [Entered: 08/27/2019 02:59 PM]
August 27, 2019 [10673915] Order filed by Clerk of the Court on the parties' 08/16/2019 and 08/26/2019 status reports. The court notes that the joint status reports were not filed in case number 19-3032 and reminds the parties that status reports must be filed in all abated appeals. The parties shall file the required preliminary documents in appeal numbers 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, and 19-3178; those appeals have not yet been abated. Appeal numbers 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, and 19-3082 remain abated. The next status report is due 09/16/2019 in all abated appeals and in accordance with the court's 05/15/2019 order. Served on 08/27/2019. [19-3008, 19-3174, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 08/27/2019 02:40 PM]
August 26, 2019 [10673567] Joint status report filed by Watts Guerra LLP, appellant in Nos. 19-3021, 19-3082, and 19-3172; Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs Counsel, appellants in Nos. 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3079, and 19-3176; and MDL Co-Lead Plaintiffs Counsel, Minnesota Lead Counsel (except Watts Guerra LLP), and Illinois State Lead Counsel, appellees in all appeals. Served on 08/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] --[Edited docket text 08/26/2019 by SLS.] BW [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:08 PM]
August 26, 2019 [10673369] Entry of appearance filed by Richard L. Coffman for William Thomas, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Mr. James M. Pietz, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John E. Tarburton, Orlans, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Slaven Law Group, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Molleur Law Office, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, John M. Totten, P.C., Bigham Law Firm, Mr. Nathan A. East, Mr. Richard Russell, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Terrie Harman and White & Allen, P.A.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176] [Entered: 08/26/2019 09:34 AM]
August 25, 2019 [10673306] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard L. Coffman for Appellants Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Molleur Law Office, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, White & Allen, P.A., Orlans, P.C., Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Mr. Nathan A. East, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC and Terrie Harman for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176]--[Edited 08/26/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 8/26/19. ] RLC [Entered: 08/25/2019 04:11 PM]
August 22, 2019 [10672619] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Don Manley Downing and Ms. Gretchen Garrison for attorneys-appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al., and plaintiffs-appellees Mr. Mike DaVault, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/22/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 08/22/2019 07:59 AM]
August 21, 2019 [10672569] Entry of appearance submitted by Don M. Downing, Gretchen Garrison for Appellee Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. in 19-3172, 19-3174, Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. and Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. in 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178]--[Edited 08/22/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DMD [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:18 PM]
August 21, 2019 [10672564] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Thomas Wiegand for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176] [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:58 PM]
August 21, 2019 [10672501] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mitchell A. Toups for William Thomas, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Mr. James M. Pietz, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John E. Tarburton, Orlans, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Slaven Law Group, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Molleur Law Office, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, John M. Totten, P.C., Bigham Law Firm, Mr. Nathan A. East, Mr. Richard Russell, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Terrie Harman and White & Allen, P.A.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3176] [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:40 PM]
August 21, 2019 [10672492] Entry of appearance submitted by Mitchell A. Toups for Appellants Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 08/21/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 8/21/19][19-3176] MAT [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:34 PM]
August 21, 2019 [10672453] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric R. Nitz and Mr. Jeffrey A. Lamken for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176] [Entered: 08/21/2019 01:53 PM]
August 21, 2019 [10672439] Entry of appearance filed by Bradley Wilders for Appelleees "Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Benefit Firms" (Grant Annexstad, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Whaley Law Firm, Wexler Wallace LLP, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wadler, Perches, Hundl & Kerlick, Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Speer Law Firm, PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Sneed Lang PC, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Barbara J. Simmons, Shamberg, Wolf, McDermott & Depue, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Seeger Weiss LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Saeed & Little, LLP, Roth Law Firm, Scott Emory Poynter, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Paul LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Holland Law Firm, Hodge Law Firm, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Green Espel PLLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, Emerson Poynter LLP, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., CE Cobb Farms, Brooks Pierce, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bieber Farm, Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Battle & Winn LLP, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Mike DaVault, Bradley DaVault, David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms).CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 08/21/2019 01:27 PM]
August 21, 2019 [10672400] Entry of appearance filed by Tempe D. Smith for Appellees "Representative Plaintiffs" (Mike DaVault, Bradley DaVault, and David DaVault d/b/a DaVault ArkMo Farms, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Grafel entities (Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, and D. and S. Grain & Cattle Co.), David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb (CE Cobb Farms), Robert & Todd Niemeyer (Custom Farm Services LLC), Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC) & "Kansas MDL Co-Lead Counsel" (Gray, Ritter & Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, LLP and Hare Wynn Newell & Newton) & other firms sharing in the Kansas fee allocation who are not Appellants in this appeal collectively as Kansas Common Benefit Firms (listed in attachment). CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 08/21/2019 12:13 PM]
August 21, 2019 [10672332] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey A. Lamken and Eric R. Nitz for Appellee Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176] --[Edited 08/21/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JAL [Entered: 08/21/2019 10:20 AM]
August 21, 2019 [10672326] Entry of appearance submitted by Thomas J. Wiegand for Appellee Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176]--[Edited 08/21/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 8/21/19.] TW [Entered: 08/21/2019 10:16 AM]
August 21, 2019 [10672317] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Rachel E. Schwartz and Patrick J. Stueve for Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Benefit Firms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] [Entered: 08/21/2019 09:59 AM]
August 21, 2019 [10672306] Entry of appearance submitted by Bradley T. Wilders for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Green Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3174, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3176, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Green Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Seeger Weiss LLP, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3178 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178]--[Edited 08/21/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 8/21/19] BW [Entered: 08/21/2019 09:54 AM]
August 21, 2019 [10672290] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Appellants Wagner Reese, LLP and Shamberg, Wolf, McDermott & Depue in 19-3172, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Green Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg, Wolf, McDermott & Depue, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3174, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Green Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Seeger Weiss LLP, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg, Wolf, McDermott & Depue, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3175, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3176, 19-3178 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 08/21/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 8/21/19][19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178] PJS [Entered: 08/21/2019 09:28 AM]
August 21, 2019 [10672264] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Scott A. Powell and Mr. Bruce McKee for attorney-appellees Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al., and plaintiff-appellees Mike DaVault, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y more than 50. Served on 08/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3176] [Entered: 08/21/2019 08:49 AM]
August 16, 2019 [10671374] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/16/2019 Docketing statement due 08/30/2019 for Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, W. Dean Belk Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Aaron D. Hovan, John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Joseph F. Manak, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A.. Transcript order form due 08/30/2019 for Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, W. Dean Belk Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Aaron D. Hovan, John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Joseph F. Manak, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A.. Notice of appearance due on 08/30/2019 for Abreo & Carter, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Bassford Remele, PA, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., W. Dean Belk Jr., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Bigham Law Firm, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Butler Snow, LLP, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Clark, Love & Hutson, G.P., Conrad F. Cropsey, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Gustafson Gluek, PLLC, Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Terrie Harman, Hodge Law Firm, Holland Law Firm, Aaron D. Hovan, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Joseph F. Manak, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Paul LLP, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Phipps Anderson Deacon, L.L.P., James M. Pietz, Attorney, Scott Emory Poynter, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Roth Law Firm, Richard Russell, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Schwebel Goetz & Sieben PA, Seeger Weiss LLP, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Slaven Law Group, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Speer Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, The Gibbs Law Firm, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Kenneth G. Walsh, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Watts Guerra LLP, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Whaley Law Firm, White & Allen, P.A. and Zimmerman Reed, LLP [19-3176] [Entered: 08/16/2019 12:59 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT NIEMEYER
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GRAFEL FARMS, LLC
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FIVE STAR FARMS
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TODD NIEMEYER
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEVEN A. WENTWORTH
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CE COBB FARMS
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEROY EDLUND
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID POLIFKA
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NEBCO, INC.
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES COBB
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GRANT ANNEXSTAD
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES B. LEX
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BIEBER FARM
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JPPL, INC.
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID SCHWANINGER
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARVIN MILLER
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROGER WARD
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEMMER FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BUTLER SNOW, LLP
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WHITE & ALLEN, P.A.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WELLER, GREEN, TOUPS & TERRELL, LLP
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PAUL LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HOLLAND LAW FIRM
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EMERSON SCOTT LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BATTS, BATTS & BELL, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KENNETH G. WALSH, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BOLEN ROBINSON & ELLIS, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ORLANS, P.C.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SEEGER WEISS LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BOHRER BRADY LLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARRETT WYLIE, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THOMPSON, GARRETT & HINES
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WEXLER WALLACE LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HODGE LAW FIRM
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WILLIAM THOMAS, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WHALEY LAW FIRM
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MILLER SCHIRGER LLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HAJJAR PETERS, LLP
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHN M. TOTTEN, P.C.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THRASH LAW FIRM, P.A.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SCOTT EMORY POYNTER, DBA Poynter Law Group
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RAY, WINTON & KELLEY, PLLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BIGHAM LAW FIRM
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: E. RUDOLPH MCINTYRE, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WATTS GUERRA LLP
Represented By: Thomas Wiegand
Represented By: Eric R. Nitz
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: AARON D. HOVAN, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: OTTS, MOORE, COALE, GODWIN, STEARNS & DARBY
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FISHERBROYLES, LLP
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NATHAN A. EAST, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAKE W. BROOKS ATTORNEY AT LAW
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BATTLE & WINN LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ROTH LAW FIRM
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: W. DEAN BELK, JR., Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WAGNER REESE, LLP
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHN L. JERNIGAN, III, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ESTES & KENNEDY LAW OFFICES, PLLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SPEER LAW FIRM, PC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SLAVEN LAW GROUP
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GRAY REED & MCGRAW LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BROOKS PIERCE
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SOPER LEDDIN LAW FIRM, PC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DURRETT, ARKEMA, GERSON & GILL, P.C.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THE GIBBS LAW FIRM
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CONRAD F. CROPSEY, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BASSFORD REMELE, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KIZER, BONDS, HUGHES & BOWEN, PLLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SAEED & LITTLE, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TERRIE HARMAN, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SCHWEBEL GOETZ & SIEBEN PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RICHARD L. COFFMAN, P.C., DBA The Coffman Law Firm
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHRIS W. FITZGERALD, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOHN E. TARBURTON, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SIMMONS HANLY CONROY LLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LUNDBERG LAW FIRM PLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TEEL & MARONEY, PLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ABREO & CARTER
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: THOMAS P. CALHOUN, III, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RICHARDSON, PATRICK, WESTBROOK & BRICKMAN, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: EMERSON POYNTER LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TROUSDALE RYAN, P.C.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SNEED LANG PC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JOSEPH F. MANAK, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GREAK LAW, P.C.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GREENE ESPEL PLLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HALLETT, HALLETT & NAGEL
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: RICHARD RUSSELL, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DYE SNYDER, LLP
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAMES M. PIETZ, Attorney, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JINKS, CROW & DICKSON, P.C.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GAMBLE & RUSSELL, P.C.
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC
Represented By: Chris Hood
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMAN SIGRIST
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL GRIES
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD CRONE
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON WETZ
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VJW FARM, INC.
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADLEY J. VERMEER
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH OSBORN
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER V. ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PINE HURST ACRES
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES A. WELSH
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA SEEDS, LLC, FKA Syngenta Seeds, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA CORPORATION
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION AG
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA BIOTECHNOLOGY, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA AG
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?