Donahue v. Kansas Board of Education, et al
Respondent / Appellee: KANSAS BOARD OF EDUCATION, OLATHE SCHOOL DISTRICT USD #233, JOHN ALLISON, Superintendent, ELENA LINCOLN, individually and as Appeal Officer, MARK WARD, individually and as Officer of Agency, DEBORAH CHAPPELL, individually and as Officer of Agency, SCOTT GORDON, individually and as Officer of Agency, LLOYD SWARTZ, individually and as Due Process Hearing Officer and RANDY WATSON, Commissioner of Education
Petitioner / Appellant: TONI R. DONAHUE and TONI R. DONAHUE, individually and on behalf of minor D. C. D.
Case Number: 19-3180
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 [10687862] District Court order filed denying plaintiff's motion to alter or amend judgment. [19-3180] [Entered: 10/17/2019 12:18 PM]
October 17, 2019 [10687860] Appellee's notice that a response brief will not be filed by Lloyd Swartz. Served on 10/14/2019 via US mail to apet; 10/17/19 via email to counsel of record. [19-3180] [Entered: 10/17/2019 12:16 PM]
October 7, 2019 [10685063] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Toni R. Donahue. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/02/2019. Manner of Service: US mail.[19-3180] [Entered: 10/07/2019 02:11 PM]
October 3, 2019 [10684059] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance due on 10/15/2019 for Lloyd Swartz. [19-3180] [Entered: 10/03/2019 07:07 AM]
October 2, 2019 [10683684] Deficiency notice issued. Appellant's status report now due 10/15/2019 by Toni R. Donahue [19-3180] [Entered: 10/02/2019 08:14 AM]
September 25, 2019 [10681617] Entry of appearance filed by Michael G. Norris and Emily Tung for John Allison and Deborah Chappell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/25/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3180] [Entered: 09/25/2019 04:16 PM]
September 25, 2019 [10681606] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael G. Norris; Emily R. Tung for Appellees Mr. John Allison and Deborah Chappell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/25/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-3180] --[Edited 09/25/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] MGN [Entered: 09/25/2019 04:03 PM]
September 13, 2019 [10678237] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Gregory P. Goheen for Elena Lincoln. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3180] [Entered: 09/13/2019 09:46 AM]
September 13, 2019 [10678226] Entry of appearance submitted by Gregory P. Goheen for Appellee Elena Lincoln for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3180]--[Edited 09/13/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] GPG [Entered: 09/13/2019 09:38 AM]
September 13, 2019 [10678136] Minute order filed - Notice of appearance due on 09/27/2019 for John Allison, Deborah Chappell, Elena Lincoln and Lloyd Swartz. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3180] [Entered: 09/13/2019 07:17 AM]
September 13, 2019 [10678135] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stephen Phillips for Mr. Randy Watson, Scott Gordon, Mr. Mark Ward and Kansas Board of Education. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/12/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3180] [Entered: 09/13/2019 07:16 AM]
September 12, 2019 [10677975] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen Phillips for Appellee Kansas Board of EducationRandy Watson, Mark Ward and Scott Gordon for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/12/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 09/13/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 9/13/19][19-3180] SP [Entered: 09/12/2019 01:01 PM]
September 10, 2019 This entry has been removed from the docket. Form is for Elena Lincoln who is not a party. Docket text states Toni Donahue. No response from Attorney. [DD] [10677347] Entry of appearance submitted by Gregory P. Goheen for Appellant Ms. Toni R. Donahue for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/10/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3180] GPG [Entered: 09/10/2019 01:10 PM]
September 10, 2019 [10677218] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance due on 09/20/2019 for Kansas Board of Education. [19-3180] [Entered: 09/10/2019 09:27 AM]
September 5, 2019 [10676443] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Michael G. Norris and Emily Tung for Olathe School District USD #233. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/05/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3180] [Entered: 09/05/2019 05:06 PM]
September 5, 2019 [10676425] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael G. Norris; Emily Tung for Appellee Olathe School District USD #233 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/05/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-3180]--[Edited 09/05/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 9/5/19.] MGN [Entered: 09/05/2019 03:57 PM]
August 26, 2019 [10673424] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case until district court disposes of plaintiff's motion to alter or amend. If the district court has not decided the motion within 30 days from the date of this order, Appellant shall file a status report in this court advising what, if anything, has occurred in district court toward resolution of the motions. (Status report due 09/25/2019 by Toni R. Donahue.) Please see attached order for additional information. Served on 08/26/2019. [19-3180] [Entered: 08/26/2019 11:04 AM]
August 22, 2019 [10672842] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/22/2019. Notice of appearance due on 09/23/2019 for Toni R. Donahue. Notice of appearance due on 09/05/2019 for Kansas Board of Education and Olathe School District USD #233. [19-3180] [Entered: 08/22/2019 01:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donahue v. Kansas Board of Education, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: KANSAS BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Stephen Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: OLATHE SCHOOL DISTRICT USD #233
Represented By: Emily Tung
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JOHN ALLISON, Superintendent
Represented By: Emily Tung
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ELENA LINCOLN, individually and as Appeal Officer
Represented By: Gregory P. Goheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MARK WARD, individually and as Officer of Agency
Represented By: Stephen Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DEBORAH CHAPPELL, individually and as Officer of Agency
Represented By: Emily Tung
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SCOTT GORDON, individually and as Officer of Agency
Represented By: Stephen Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: LLOYD SWARTZ, individually and as Due Process Hearing Officer
Represented By: Lloyd Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: RANDY WATSON, Commissioner of Education
Represented By: Stephen Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TONI R. DONAHUE
Represented By: Toni R. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TONI R. DONAHUE, individually and on behalf of minor D. C. D.
Represented By: Toni R. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?