In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Plaintiff: CHARLES B. LEX, TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP, NORMAN SIGRIST, DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, DAVID SCHWANINGER, BIEBER FARM, BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC., FIVE STAR FARMS, BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC., MICHAEL GRIES, JPPL, INC., ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC, RICHARD CRONE, RON WETZ, VJW FARM, INC., GRANT ANNEXSTAD, BRADLEY J. VERMEER, BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP, NEBCO, INC., AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC, MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, MARVIN MILLER, CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC, KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY, DAVID POLIFKA, PETER V. ANDERSON, KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC., GRAFEL FARMS, LLC, KENNETH OSBORN, DEMMER FARMS, INC., LEROY EDLUND, STEVEN A. WENTWORTH, DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, CE COBB FARMS, CHARLES A. WELSH, ROBERT NIEMEYER, CHARLES COBB, ROGER WARD, TODD NIEMEYER and PINE HURST ACRES
Defendant: SYNGENTA SEEDS, LLC, FKA Syngenta Seeds, Inc., SYNGENTA BIOTECHNOLOGY, INC., SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC, SYNGENTA AG, SYNGENTA CORPORATION and SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION AG
Appellee: TAPELLA & EBERSPACHER, LLC, BATTS, BATTS & BELL, LLP, CONMY FESTE, LTD., TEEL & MARONEY, PLC, ABREO & CARTER, CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, PLLC, MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE, CONRAD F. CROPSEY, RICHARD RUSSELL, HANSEN, HOWELL & WILKIE, PLLC, HOLLAND LAW FIRM, EMERSON SCOTT LLP, ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP, ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP, DEMERATH LAW OFFICE, RICHARDSON, PATRICK, WESTBROOK & BRICKMAN, LLC, DYE SNYDER, LLP, SCHWEBEL GOETZ & SIEBEN PA, BOLEN ROBINSON & ELLIS, LLP, SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN, BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC, E. RUDOLPH MCINTYRE, SEEGER WEISS LLP, BOHRER BRADY LLC, GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C., WEXLER WALLACE LLP, HODGE LAW FIRM, WHALEY LAW FIRM, MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC, MILLER SCHIRGER LLC, TROUSDALE RYAN, P.C., PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON LLP, WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A., TERRIE HARMAN, WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP, SCOTT EMORY POYNTER, DBA Poynter Law Group, CRUMLEY ROBERTS, JAMES M. PIETZ, ONDER LAW, LLC, WATTS GUERRA LLP, OTTS, MOORE, COALE, GODWIN, STEARNS & DARBY, SIMMONS HANLY CONROY LLC, WELLER, GREEN, TOUPS & TERRELL, LLP, HALLETT, HALLETT & NAGEL, JAKE W. BROOKS ATTORNEY AT LAW, STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON LLP, BATTLE & WINN LLP, PAUL LLP, ROTH LAW FIRM, STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP, THRASH LAW FIRM, P.A., WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC, WAGNER REESE, LLP, PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P., NATHAN A. EAST, BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC, SPEER LAW FIRM, PC, GRAY REED & MCGRAW LLP, O'HANLON, DEMERATH & CASTILLO, MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP, BROOKS PIERCE, BUTLER SNOW, LLP, WILLIAM THOMAS, OLDFIELD, MYERS, APKE & PAYNE, ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON, SOPER LEDDIN LAW FIRM, PC, GREAK LAW, P.C., MEYERS & FLOWERS, LLC, BIGHAM LAW FIRM, MERKEL & COCKE, HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON, MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL, WHITE & ALLEN, P.A., LAW OFFICES OF WENDELL HOSKINS, THE GIBBS LAW FIRM, KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C., LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS, CHRIS W. FITZGERALD, BURKE HARVEY, LLC, JOSEPH F. MANAK, THOMPSON, GARRETT & HINES, BASSFORD REMELE, PA, FISHERBROYLES, LLP, W. DEAN BELK, JR., SAEED & LITTLE, LLP, KENNETH G. WALSH, BARRETT WYLIE, LLC, JOHN M. TOTTEN, P.C., WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C., JINKS, CROW & DICKSON, P.C., GAMBLE & RUSSELL, P.C., WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC, BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C., LUNDBERG LAW FIRM PLC, RAY, WINTON & KELLEY, PLLC, SLAVEN LAW GROUP, HAJJAR PETERS, LLP, BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES, BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE, THOMAS P. CALHOUN, III, SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C., LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP, WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK, HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC, JOHN E. TARBURTON, JOHN L. JERNIGAN, III, DURRETT, ARKEMA, GERSON & GILL, P.C., SAM C. MITCHELL & ASSOCIATES, ORLANS, P.C., DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC, AARON D. HOVAN, EMERSON POYNTER LLP, GREENE ESPEL PLLP, RICHARD L. COFFMAN, P.C., DBA The Coffman Law Firm, ESTES & KENNEDY LAW OFFICES, PLLC, KIZER, BONDS, HUGHES & BOWEN, PLLC, CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C., GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC and SNEED LANG PC
Appellant: LAW OFFICES OF A. CRAIG EILAND, P.C.
Case Number: 19-3279
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 [10719045] Reply filed by MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Served on 02/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:40 AM]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order [10719041] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. The joint reply shall be filed as of the date of this order. Served on 02/20/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:35 AM]
February 18, 2020 [10718502] Motion filed by Appellant Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3032, Appellee Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3002 for leave to file reply to. Served on: 02/18/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] PJS [Entered: 02/18/2020 04:24 PM]
February 14, 2020 [10718143] Response filed by Hossley-Embry, LLP and Redenbaugh & Mohr, PC in 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284 to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Memorandum Concerning Finality of Fee Allocation Orders. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3178, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DAH [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:33 PM]
February 14, 2020 [10718080] Response filed by Gustafson Gluek, PLLC in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 20-3000, 20-3002, MN Co-Lead Counsel to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Request to Lift Abatement. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DEG [Entered: 02/14/2020 12:22 PM]
February 14, 2020 [10718056] Response filed by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3278, 20-3002, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279 to MDL Co-Lead Counsels' Memorandum Concerning Finality of Fee Allocation Orders. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3278, 20-3002, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279] CBH [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:42 AM]
February 11, 2020 [10717184] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. An in-person mediation conference is scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 12:00 pm, and 2/28/2020 at 9:00 am (MT). [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/11/2020 02:35 PM]
January 31, 2020 [10714688] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Any party wishing to file a response supporting or opposing MDL Co-Lead Counsels memorandum and request to lift the abatement shall do so on or before 02/14/20. The responses shall be filed only in the appeal(s) corresponding to the filing party. These appeals shall remain abated pending further order of the court. Served on 01/31/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:45 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10714672] MDL Co-Lead Counsels Memorandum Concerning Finality. Served on 01/27/2020 by email (copied from 20-3002; entered by clerk's office). [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:00 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713388] Notice filed by Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C.. Served on 01/27/2020 by email. [19-3279] ACE [Entered: 01/27/2020 05:07 PM]
January 22, 2020 [10712043] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/22/2020. (This matter is currently abated.) [19-3279] [Entered: 01/22/2020 02:49 PM]
January 13, 2020 [10709400] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating these appeals pending allocation of the IRPA Pool. The deadline for the opening brief and appendix in Appeal No. 19-3278 is vacated. Notwithstanding the abatement, on or before 01/27/2020, any appellant in these five appeals who wishes to address the finality of the district courts 11/19/2019 order shall file a jurisdictional memorandum brief in the appeal that corresponds to that appellant. Any appellant who does not believe additional jurisdictional briefing is necessary shall file a notice to that effect due 01/27/2020. Served on 01/13/2020. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/13/2020 02:32 PM]
January 10, 2020 [10708746] Attorney Allen Craig Eiland for Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C. admitted to the bar of this court. [19-3279] [Entered: 01/10/2020 08:44 AM]
January 9, 2020 [10708382] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 02/10/2020 for Allen Craig Eiland. [19-3279] [Entered: 01/09/2020 08:29 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708181] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 01/15/2020 for Timothy M. O'Brien, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3279] [Entered: 01/08/2020 12:08 PM]
January 8, 2020 [10708154] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C.. Served on: 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3279] ACE [Entered: 01/08/2020 11:26 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708150] Docketing statement filed by Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C.. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3279] ACE [Entered: 01/08/2020 11:24 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708076] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Gustafson Gluek PLLC, et al. (Minnesota Common Benefit Firms) in 19-3278, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/08/2020 09:53 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708064] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellee Gustafson Gluek, PLLC in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000Minnesota Common Benefit Firms for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000]--[Edited 01/08/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DEG [Entered: 01/08/2020 09:29 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708047] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Justin Demerath for O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo and Demerath Law Office in 19-3278, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/08/2020 08:34 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708012] Entry of appearance filed by A. Craig Eiland for Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3280, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/08/2020 06:51 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708006] Entry of appearance submitted by Allen Craig Eiland for Appellant Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C. in 19-3279, Appellee Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C. in 19-3278, 19-3280, 20-3000, 19-3284 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3279, 19-3278, 19-3280, 20-3000, 19-3284] --[Edited 01/08/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/8/20] ACE [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:35 AM]
January 7, 2020 [10707999] Entry of appearance submitted by Justin Brooks Demerath for Appellants O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo and Demerath Law Office in 19-3284, Appellees O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo and Demerath Law Office in 19-3280, 19-3279, 19-3278, 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279, 19-3278, 20-3000]--[Edited 01/08/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] JD [Entered: 01/07/2020 05:09 PM]
January 7, 2020 [10707981] Entry of appearance filed by Richard L. Coffman for Troups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:17 PM]
January 7, 2020 [10707910] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard L. Coffman for Appellee Richard L. Coffman, P.C. in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: yes, more than 50 parties for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000]--[Edited 01/07/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 1/7/2020.] RLC [Entered: 01/07/2020 01:35 PM]
January 7, 2020 [10707852] Entry of appearance filed by Mitchell A. Toups for for Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, et al. (Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel (see Exhibit A)) in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/07/2020 12:02 PM]
January 7, 2020 [10707790] Entry of appearance submitted by Mitchell A. Toups for Appellees Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] --[Edited 01/07/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] MAT [Entered: 01/07/2020 10:37 AM]
January 7, 2020 [10707733] Entry of appearance filed by Eric Alan Isaacson for Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, et al. (Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel (see Exhibit A)) in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/07/2020 08:57 AM]
January 7, 2020 [10707703] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher Adam Seeger for Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al. (Kansas Common Benefit Firms) in 19-3278, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/07/2020 08:18 AM]
January 7, 2020 [10707683] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Diogenes P. Kekatos and Mr. Steven A. Weiss for Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al. (Kansas Common Benefit Firms) in 19-3278, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/07/2020 07:55 AM]
January 7, 2020 [10707660] Entry of appearance filed by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership and Steven A. Wentworth. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/06/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-3279] [Entered: 01/07/2020 07:26 AM]
January 7, 2020 [10707657] Entry of appearance filed by Bradley Wilders for Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al. (Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Benefit Firms) . CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3279] [Entered: 01/07/2020 07:01 AM]
January 6, 2020 [10707639] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric Alan Isaacson for Appellees Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3278, 19-3279, 20-3000, 19-3284 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 20-3000, 19-3284] --[Edited 01/07/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] EAI [Entered: 01/06/2020 06:27 PM]
January 6, 2020 [10707634] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen A. Weiss; Diogenes P. Kekatos for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Seeger Weiss LLP and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3278, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Seeger Weiss LLP and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 20-3000, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279]--[Edited 01/07/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] SAW [Entered: 01/06/2020 05:04 PM]
January 6, 2020 [10707618] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher A. Seeger for Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Seeger Weiss LLP and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3278, Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Seeger Weiss LLP and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 20-3000, Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279]--[Edited 01/07/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] CAS [Entered: 01/06/2020 04:45 PM]
January 6, 2020 [10707567] Entry of appearance submitted by Bradley T. Wilders for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3279] --[Edited 01/07/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/7/20] BW [Entered: 01/06/2020 03:45 PM]
January 6, 2020 [10707563] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership and Steven A. Wentworth for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/07/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/07/20][19-3279] PJS [Entered: 01/06/2020 03:41 PM]
January 3, 2020 [10707185] Entry of appearance filed by William Lewis Garrison, Jr. and Mr. Christopher B. Hood for Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/03/2020 03:53 PM]
January 3, 2020 [10707126] Entry of appearance submitted by Tempe D. Smith for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3278, Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000]--[Edited 01/06/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] SAP [Entered: 01/03/2020 02:52 PM]
January 3, 2020 [10707096] Entry of appearance submitted by W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. and Christopher B. Hood for Appellee Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/03/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/03/20][19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] WLG [Entered: 01/03/2020 01:55 PM]
December 27, 2019 [10705519] Notice of an NDA re-sent to A. Craig Eiland. [19-3279] [Entered: 12/27/2019 09:36 AM]
December 26, 2019 [10705195] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/19/2019. Transcript order form and docketing statement due 01/09/2020 for The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C. Notice of appearance due on 01/09/2020 for Abreo & Carter, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Bassford Remele, PA, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., W. Dean Belk Jr., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Bigham Law Firm, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Burke Harvey, LLC, Butler Snow, LLP, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Clark, Love & Hutson, PLLC, Conmy Feste, Ltd., Conrad F. Cropsey, Crumley Roberts, Demerath Law Office, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Greene Espel PLLP, Gustafson Gluek, PLLC, Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Hansen, Howell & Wilkie, PLLC, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Terrie Harman, Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC, Hodge Law Firm, Holland Law Firm, Aaron D. Hovan, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Law Offices of Wendell Hoskins, Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Joseph F. Manak, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Merkel & Cocke, Meyers & Flowers, LLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Molleur Law Office, O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo, Oldfield, Myers, Apke & Payne, Onder Law, LLC, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Paul LLP, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Phipps Anderson Deacon LLP, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Scott Emory Poynter, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Roth Law Firm, Richard Russell, Saeed & Little, LLP, Sam C. Mitchell & Associates, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Schwebel Goetz & Sieben PA, Seeger Weiss LLP, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Slaven Law Group, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Speer Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Tapella & Eberspacher, LLC, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, The Gibbs Law Firm, The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C., William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Kenneth G. Walsh, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Watts Guerra LLP, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Whaley Law Firm, White & Allen, P.A. and Zimmerman Reed, LLP. [19-3279] [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TAPELLA & EBERSPACHER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BATTS, BATTS & BELL, LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CONMY FESTE, LTD.
Represented By: Douglas Murch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TEEL & MARONEY, PLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ABREO & CARTER
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, PLLC
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CONRAD F. CROPSEY
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RICHARD RUSSELL
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HANSEN, HOWELL & WILKIE, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HOLLAND LAW FIRM
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EMERSON SCOTT LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DEMERATH LAW OFFICE
Represented By: Larry R. Demerath
Represented By: Justin Demerath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RICHARDSON, PATRICK, WESTBROOK & BRICKMAN, LLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DYE SNYDER, LLP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SCHWEBEL GOETZ & SIEBEN PA
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BOLEN ROBINSON & ELLIS, LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: E. RUDOLPH MCINTYRE
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SEEGER WEISS LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BOHRER BRADY LLC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C.
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WEXLER WALLACE LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HODGE LAW FIRM
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WHALEY LAW FIRM
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MILLER SCHIRGER LLC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TROUSDALE RYAN, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON LLP
Represented By: Barry Deacon
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A.
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TERRIE HARMAN
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SCOTT EMORY POYNTER, DBA Poynter Law Group
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CRUMLEY ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JAMES M. PIETZ
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ONDER LAW, LLC
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WATTS GUERRA LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OTTS, MOORE, COALE, GODWIN, STEARNS & DARBY
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SIMMONS HANLY CONROY LLC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WELLER, GREEN, TOUPS & TERRELL, LLP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HALLETT, HALLETT & NAGEL
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JAKE W. BROOKS ATTORNEY AT LAW
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BATTLE & WINN LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PAUL LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ROTH LAW FIRM
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THRASH LAW FIRM, P.A.
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WAGNER REESE, LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P.
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NATHAN A. EAST
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SPEER LAW FIRM, PC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GRAY REED & MCGRAW LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: O'HANLON, DEMERATH & CASTILLO
Represented By: Justin Demerath
Represented By: David Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BROOKS PIERCE
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BUTLER SNOW, LLP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WILLIAM THOMAS
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OLDFIELD, MYERS, APKE & PAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SOPER LEDDIN LAW FIRM, PC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GREAK LAW, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MEYERS & FLOWERS, LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BIGHAM LAW FIRM
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MERKEL & COCKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WHITE & ALLEN, P.A.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICES OF WENDELL HOSKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE GIBBS LAW FIRM
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C.
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CHRIS W. FITZGERALD
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BURKE HARVEY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOSEPH F. MANAK
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THOMPSON, GARRETT & HINES
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BASSFORD REMELE, PA
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FISHERBROYLES, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: W. DEAN BELK, JR.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SAEED & LITTLE, LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KENNETH G. WALSH
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BARRETT WYLIE, LLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHN M. TOTTEN, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C.
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JINKS, CROW & DICKSON, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GAMBLE & RUSSELL, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C.
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LUNDBERG LAW FIRM PLC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RAY, WINTON & KELLEY, PLLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SLAVEN LAW GROUP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HAJJAR PETERS, LLP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THOMAS P. CALHOUN, III
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C.
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher B. Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHN E. TARBURTON
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHN L. JERNIGAN, III
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DURRETT, ARKEMA, GERSON & GILL, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SAM C. MITCHELL & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ORLANS, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AARON D. HOVAN
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EMERSON POYNTER LLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GREENE ESPEL PLLP
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RICHARD L. COFFMAN, P.C., DBA The Coffman Law Firm
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ESTES & KENNEDY LAW OFFICES, PLLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KIZER, BONDS, HUGHES & BOWEN, PLLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C.
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SNEED LANG PC
Represented By: Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES B. LEX
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMAN SIGRIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID SCHWANINGER
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIEBER FARM
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC.
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIVE STAR FARMS
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL GRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPPL, INC.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD CRONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON WETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VJW FARM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRANT ANNEXSTAD
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADLEY J. VERMEER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEBCO, INC.
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARVIN MILLER
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID POLIFKA
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER V. ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAFEL FARMS, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH OSBORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMMER FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEROY EDLUND
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN A. WENTWORTH
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CE COBB FARMS
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES A. WELSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT NIEMEYER
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES COBB
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER WARD
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD NIEMEYER
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PINE HURST ACRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA SEEDS, LLC, FKA Syngenta Seeds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA BIOTECHNOLOGY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LAW OFFICES OF A. CRAIG EILAND, P.C.
Represented By: A. Craig Eiland
Represented By: Allen Craig Eiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?