In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Plaintiff: CHARLES B. LEX, TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP, DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, BIEBER FARM, JPPL, INC., ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC, MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC., KENNETH OSBORN, DEMMER FARMS, INC., CE COBB FARMS, D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC., MICHAEL GRIES, RICHARD CRONE, STEVEN A. WENTWORTH, CHARLES COBB, ROGER WARD, PINE HURST ACRES, DAVID SCHWANINGER, FIVE STAR FARMS, BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC., VJW FARM, INC., GRAFEL FARMS, LLC, NEBCO, INC., AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC, KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY, DAVID POLIFKA, PETER V. ANDERSON, DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, ROBERT NIEMEYER, TODD NIEMEYER, NORMAN SIGRIST, RON WETZ, GRANT ANNEXSTAD, BRADLEY J. VERMEER, BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP, MARVIN MILLER, LEROY EDLUND, CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC and CHARLES A. WELSH
Defendant: SYNGENTA CORPORATION, SYNGENTA SEEDS, LLC, FKA Syngenta Seeds, Inc., SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION AG, SYNGENTA BIOTECHNOLOGY, INC., SYNGENTA AG and SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC
Appellee: BYRON STONE, PLLC, CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP, BRIAN FITZWATER LAW OFFICE, HOLLAND LAW FIRM, DEMERATH LAW OFFICE, SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C., ELLIS & JUDD LAW OFFICE, LLC, HOSSLEY-EMBRY, LLP, OVERBOE LAW, CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC, NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW, GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C., JENNA LAIRD LEGER, WOOD & RUE, PLLP, THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC, LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART, TOURKOW CRELL ROSENBLATT & JOHNSTON LLP, MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC, CLARK LOVE & HUTSON, GP, WALK & MURPHY, PLC, HERITAGE LEGAL GROUP PLLC, CARPENTER & SCHUMACHER, P.C., MORRIS LAING EVANS BROCK & KENNEDY, PHILLIPPI LAW FIRM, LLC, MUSKE, MUSKE, SUHRHOFF LTD, VAN KLEY & WALKER, LLC, RICHARD D. LARSON, P.C., CLARK & CLARK P.C., WATTS GUERRA LLP, MCCLURE, THOMAS & THOMAS, LAW OFFICES OF LEONEL ALEJANDRO PC, DILLON LEGAL GROUP, CHURCH, CHURCH, HITTLE & ANTRIM, JOHNSON LAW GROUP, STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON LLP, BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C., BATTLE & WINN LLP, CONNORS LLP, REDENBAUGH & MOHR, PC, WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC, WALLACE LAW, PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P., HAWKINS LAW, PC, THE LAW OFFICE OF MARK L EUREK, GRAY REED & MCGRAW, P.C., BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC, MAYNES LAW OFFICE, LAW OFFICE OF MIKE CRANE, LLP, JEREMY P. COHEN, LAW OFFICES OF HANS A. BUEHLER, LLC, SORLING NORTHRUP ATTORNEYS, WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD, DANIEL M. HOMOLKA, P.A., ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON, ATLEE HALL, LLP, DAVE O'BRIEN LAW, BRENNAN STEIL S.C., DENNEY & BARRETT, PC, MCFARLAND LAW, PC, OKOON HINTERMEISTER, PLLC, THE GIBBS LAW FIRM, SHAMBERG, WOLF, MCDERMOTT & DEPUE, FELLHEIMER LAW FIRM LTD., BLOOM GATES & WHITELEATHER, LLP, RYAN MOORE & COOK, WOODS ROGERS PLC, WORTH LAW FIRM, BRAND & MORELOCK, THE LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS R. FIELDS, P.A., TULLY LAW OFFICE, PC, WEEKS & BRUCKER, LTD, FAITH INGLE SMITH LAW FIRM, JUSTIN HILL, PC, DOBBS LEGAL GROUP, QUIRK & HUNTER, PC, MOORE, SUSLER, MCNUTT & WRIGLEY, LLC, FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC, BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE, FOREMAN WATSON HOLTREY, LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA, HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC, BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC, TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP, CRITCHFIELD CRITCHFIELD & JOHSON, LTD., BRIANA DEANE, MAILANDER LAW OFFICE, THE LAW OFFICE OF ROB TULLY PC, HABUSH HABUSH & ROTTIER S.C., VANDERGINST LAW, GARY T. GEE LAW OFFICE, COLE, EASLEY, SCIBA & WILLIAMS, P.C., DAVID R. ADELMAN, DAVIS & CAMPBELL, LLC, KEVIN W. LILES PC, SONENBERG LAW LLC, MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP, WRIGHT SCHIMMEL LLC, PLEWS SHADLEY RACHER & BRAUN LLP, BOREN, OLVER AND COFFEY, LLP, CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C., WOODARD LAW PC., HUME, SMITH, GEDDES, GREEN & SIMMONS, LLP, W. CALLOWAY HUFFAKER, ZEILINGER LAW OFFICE, REICHERT LAW OFFICE, TAPELLA & EBERSPACHER, LLC, SCHULTZ LAW, DEBORAH K. SMITH, RILEY-TANIS & ASSOCIATES PLLC, HANSEN, HOWELL & WILKIE, PLLC, ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP, ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP, COOTS, HENKE & WHEELER, BERNATZ & VAN BEEK, ARNDT BUSWELL & THORN S.C., REICHERT WENNER, P.A., BROCK LAW OFFICES PC LLO, LAMKIN & LAMKIN, P.C., SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN, BURNS CRONAUER & BROWN LLP, PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, LLP, HENSLEY LEGAL GROUP PC, DARLING & DARLING, KOENIG LAW FIRM, MARTZ & LUCAS, LLC, MAZZANTI LAW OFFICE, PLLC, NATHAN J. NOBLE, P.C., LEE J. LEWIS, GREGG NEAL, CRESS LAW GROUP, PC, BILL J. MILNER LAW OFFICES, LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD HOFFMAN, ROB TULLY LAW FIRM, KITTELSEN, BARRY, WELLINGTON, THOMPSON, & SCHLUESCHE, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, CHARLES HEAR, HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C., DREW YOUNG LAW, ALLEN, STEIN & DURBIN, PC, DANIEL QUIGLEY, GROSBOLL, BECKER, TICE & BARR, BORING & BORING, PC, MARK A. ROEDER, BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC, COTTON, BOLTON, HOYCHICK & DOUGHTY, LLP, SCHWARZ LAW OFFICE, BROOKS & OLSON, PAUL LLP, RHOADES MCKEE PC, CLINE FARRELL CHRISTIE & LEE, P.C., STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP, JOHNSON & MOCK, PC LLO, JEFFERSON & BREWER, LLP, GRIFFIN DIETRICH & ELLIOT, LLC, WINSTEIN, KAVENSKY & CUNNINGHAM, LLC, BLAKEMAN & SCHROCK, LTD, O'HANLON, DEMERATH & CASTILLO, TUCKER & TUCKER, P.C., MEADOR & CRUMP, P.A., STRITTMATTER LAW FIRM, WILLIS & WILLIS, MALONEY & CAMPOLO, OLDFIELD, MYERS, APKE & PAYNE, CUSTY LAW FIRM, LLC, FEARER, NYE, & CHADWICK, MERKEL & COCKE, MCNEELY STEPHENSON, HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON, KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C., BURKE HARVEY, LLC, KELLEY LAW FIRM, PC, BIRD, JACOBSEN & STEVENS, PC, MICHAEL ASHAR, OUDERKIRK LAW FIRM, BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS LLP, BROYLES KIGHT & RICAFORT, PC, KNUTH LAW OFFICE, MAURO ARCHER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC, FRUNDT & JOHNSON, LTD., BROWN, DEPREZ & JOHNSON, P.A., JASON SCHUTTE, KOEPKE & HILTABRAND ATTORNEY AT LAW, LAURIE S. WARD, WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C., THE MCQUADES CO. LPA, STONE LAW OFFICE, P.L.L.C., RICCOLO, SEMELROTH, & HENNINGSEN, P.C., HART BELL, LLC, BRADFORD LAW FIRM, MORGAN & MEYERS, PLC, JEFF LINK, ROBERTS LAW OFFICE, ALLEN WELLMAN MCNEW HARVEY, LLP, LAW OFFICE OF HAMMELL & MURPHY PLLP, JAMES & LARSON LAW, JAMES LAW, P.C., DEWALD DEAVER, P.C., BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES, EMERSON POYNTER LLP, FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH, IRVIN L. MASCHING, SNEED LANG PC, LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER, LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY E. TONORE, MICHAEL GROSS, CHARLES E. CRONAUER & ASSOCIATES, MASSIE & QUICK, LLC, DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC, MILTNER LAW FIRM, LLC, PEN COSBY, KUHLMAN & LUCAS, LLC, THE WINKIE LAW FIRM, LLC, GEORGE M. BISHOP, SEVER STOREY, LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS A. NOE, III, TUCKER LAW PRACTICE, BARBARA J. SIMMONS, WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP, MEIER, BRAGICICH & MOORE LLP, WILLADSEN & NEAL LLC, LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER H. POYNOR, ALEX KOENIGS, PATTERSON COMER, TROYER & GOOD, PC, OBEAR, OVERHOLSER, HUFFER & RIDER, LLC, MORRISSEY, MORRISSEY & DALLUGE, THE CANTLIN LAW FIRM, SHERMAN HOFFMAN & HIPP, LC, CORNELL LAW OFFICE, MARCH, MCMILLAN, DEJOODE & DUVALL, P.C., LEO BOOTHE, SPENCER GILLAND, THE STROM LAW FIRM, LLC, HECKER LAW GROUP, PLC, SAM C. MITCHELL & ASSOCIATES, CARABIN & SHAW, P.C., HEINISCH & LOVEGROVE LAW OFFICE, PC LLP, HEHNER & ASSOCIATES, LLC, NORMAN PALOUCEK & HERMAN, FAFINSKI MARK & JOHNSON, P.A., GORDON & ASSOCIATES, P.C., WELD, RILEY, PRENN & RICCI S.C., BAKER, BODWELL, APPEL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, ONDER LAW, LLC, MICHAEL J. GALANIS, LANGDON & EMISON ATTORNEYS AT LAW, BARRETT, EASTERDAY, CUNNINGHAM & ESELGROTH, LLP, BRAU LAW OFFICE, BOHRER BRADY LLC, SATTERLEY AND KELLEY, PLLC, MORNING LAW OFFICE LLC, COPLEY ROTH & WILSON, LLC, CHARNETSKI, LACINA & CLOWER, LLP, CAUGHEY, LEGNER & FREEHILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, LUNDBERG LAW FIRM PLC, JANZEN AGRICULTURAL LAW, LLC, MYERS HOCKEMEYER & MCNAGNY LLP, FITZGERALD LAW P.A., STOERZBACH LAW OFFICE, P.C., RANDLE & SAMMONS, P.C., THE POPPE LAW FIRM, KC COHEN, LAWYER, PC, KEATON & KEATON PC, LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS, GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC, STOCKARD, JOHNSTON, & BROWN, P.C, HAMPTON & ROYCE, L.C., MERCHO CAUGHEY & DELAY, EMERICK, DIGGINS & ZABONA P.C., THE LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. LAPOINTE, P.C., KIRK LAW FIRM, SOPER LEDDIN LAW FIRM, PC, GRAYBILL & WITCHER, LLP, MICHAEL SMITH LAW, SIMON HERBERT & MCCLELLAND, LLP, SMITH GARDNER SLUSKY LAZER POHREN & ROGERS LLP, NKA Smith Slusky Law, MITCHELL C. CHANEY, CLENDENING JOHNSON & BOHRER, P.C., BARBER, SEGATTO, HOFFEE, WILKE, & CATE, WARNER NORCROSS & JUDD, LLP, GELLHAUS & GELLHAUS, P. C., WOLF ARDIS, P.C., PATRICK A. ELWARD, FISHERBROYLES, LLP, ESPE LAW PLLC, KATZ & KORIN, P.C., SAEED & LITTLE, LLP, WHITMAN, BABER, & SIEGEL, REILING TEDER & SCHRIER, LLC, WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC, WAYNE J. LENNINGTON, KRUSE & DAKIN LLP, VAUGHAN LAW FIRM, P.C., KOVARIK, ELLISON & MATHIS, P.C., NKA Ellison Kovarik & Turman Law Firm PC, LIND JENSEN SULLIVAN & PETERSON P.A., KEULER, KELLY HUTCHINS & BLANKENSHIP, LLP, LAW OFFICES OF A. CRAIG EILAND, P.C., CALL & GENTRY LAW GROUP, PAGEL & WEIKUM, PLLP, WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK, PATTON HOVERSTEN & BERG P.A, DEBORAH SMITH MCCLURE, P.C., SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C., HOSTETTER & ASSOCIATES, SWAIM LAW FIRM, PLLC, LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP, CARY, WELCH, HICKMAN & HAWK, LLP, SEEGER WEISS LLP, WILLIAM F. SMITH, WRIGHT & SCHULTE LLC, CONMY FESTE, LTD., KRAMER LAW, LLC, THE PRUNEDA LAW FIRM, PLLC, GREGORY L. CESHKER, P.C., TOM BENSON, EDMUND A. WEINHEIMER, JR., P. C., BATTS, BATTS & BELL, LLP, BRENT C. EMBREY, EMERSON SCOTT LLP, HOVLAND & RASMUS, PLLC, CULBERTSON & ALLEN, LLC, VELA LAW OFFICES PLLC, HALL HUDSON, P.C., THE LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE P. ESCOBEDO & ASSOCIATES, THE CAHILL LAW OFFICES, BARRETT MCNAGNY LLP, SCHMITTINGER & RODRIGUEZ, P.A., BOLEN ROBINSON & ELLIS, LLP, DELZER LAW OFFICE, SHIMANEK, SHIMANEK, & BOWMAN, LLC, PICKNER LAW OFFICE, SCOTT EMORY POYNTER, QUIGLEY LAW OFFICE, WEXLER WALLACE LLP, HODGE LAW FIRM, WHALEY LAW FIRM, NIDEY ERDAHL TINDAL & FISCHER, PLC, COLE LAW OFFICE, TED B. LYON & ASSOCIATES, P.C., MILLER SCHIRGER LLC, TROTH LAW OFFICE, WASKER DOOR WIMMER & MARCOUILLER, P.C., SCHNELKER, RASSI & MCCONNELL PLC, THRASH LAW FIRM, P.A., MEYER & MEYER LLP, SOUNDING BOARD LEGAL, S.C., ANGEL, ISAACSON & TRACY, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, CRUMLEY ROBERTS, EICH, VAN DYKE, WERDAN & STEGER P.C., LAW OFFICE OF BRENT GAINES, COCKERILL & COCKERILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, THE LAW OFFICE OF SAMUEL W. BEARMAN, L.C., JOHN R. DELZER, WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A., LAW OFFICE OF ADAM CRAWSHAW, PEMBERTON, SORLIE, RUFER, & KERSHNER, PLLP, ALERDING CASTOR HEWITT LLP, ROTH LAW FIRM, VRIEZELAAR, TIGGES, EDINGTON, BOTTARO, BODEN, & ROSS, L.L.P., CROSS PENNAMPED WOOLSEY & GLAZIER, P.C., WAGNER REESE, LLP, ENDURANCE LAW GROUP PLC, JOHNSON, KRAMER, MULHOLLAND, COCHRANE, DRISCOLL & COCHRANE, P.L.C., SCHWEBEL GOETZ & SIEBEN PA, DENTON & KEULER, LLP, SPEER LAW FIRM, PC, UNDERWOOD LAW FIRM, PC, BAKKE NORMAN, S.C., CHAPMAN LAW LLC, BROOKS PIERCE, GRENFELL, SLEDGE AND STEVENS, MINER & LEMON, LLP, RAY A. FERGUSON & ASSOCIATES, LTD., LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY R. VAUGHAN, P.C., JOHNSON BECKER, PLLC, ROBINSON, CURPHEY & OCONNEL, LLC, JAKE W. BROOKS, JOHNSON, MOODY, SCHMIDT & KLEINHUIZEN, P.A., PEMBERTON LAW FIRM, MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL, LAW OFFICES OF WENDELL HOSKINS, LAW OFFICE OF LESTER WEINSTINE, P.C., WICKENS & WICKENS, LLC, RICHARD M. HOLMES, CHESTER LAW OFFICE, BASSFORD REMELE, PA, KEMPTON & RUSSELL, LLC, FLYNN & SULLIVAN PC, RAMMELKAMP BRADNEY, P.C., ANTHONY O'HANLON, P.C., PATTON BROWN LAW, PLLC, JEFFREY A. BOGGESS, P.C., GREEN ESPEL PLLP, SIMMONS HANLY CONROY LLC, KRAFT WALSER LAW OFFICE, PLLP, MILLER PEARSON GLOE BURNS BEATTY & PARRISH, P.L.C., FORDE LAW OFFICES LLP, DOERING & GRISELL, PA, INGEBRITSON & ASSOCIATES, P.A., MIDWEST AG SOLUTIONS LLC, LAW OFFICE OF EZEQUIEL REYNA, JR., BEINE & ROBERTS LAW FIRM, PLC, BRETT DUNN PLLC, WYLAND, HUMPHREY & CLEVENGER LLP, WIL GALLOWAY & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, YIRA LAW OFFICE, LTD, VANDERVOORT CHRIST & FISHER, P.C., FENCHEL, DOSTER & BUCK, PLC, LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM R. SHIRK, CRYSTAL D. PULLEY, COLVIN, CHANEY, SAENZ & RODRIGUEZ, LLP, MERTES & MERTES, P.C., BOSCHMA LAW OFFICE, CROSS LAW FIRM, LLC, VIRTUS LAW PLLC, ADAMS, RIZZI & SWEEN, P.A., TAYLOR & RUHNKE, PC, OSTERBAUER LAW FIRM and STOUT LAW GROUP
Appellant: BUTLER SNOW, LLP, WHITE & ALLEN, P.A., E. RUDOLPH MCINTYRE, W. DEAN BELK, JR., THOMAS P. CALHOUN, III, AARON D. HOVAN, JAMES M. PIETZ, KIZER, BONDS, HUGHES & BOWEN, PLLC, ORLANS, P.C., JINKS, CROW & DICKSON, P.C., JOSEPH F. MANAK, CHRIS W. FITZGERALD, BARRETT WYLIE, LLC, THOMPSON, GARRETT & HINES, HAJJAR PETERS, LLP, JOHN M. TOTTEN, P.C., RAY, WINTON & KELLEY, PLLC, BIGHAM LAW FIRM, JOHN E. TARBURTON, WILLIAM THOMAS, MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE, DURRETT, ARKEMA, GERSON & GILL, P.C., CONRAD F. CROPSEY, GREAK LAW, P.C., GAMBLE & RUSSELL, P.C., RICHARD L. COFFMAN, P.C., DBA The Coffman Law Firm, JOHN L. JERNIGAN, III, SLAVEN LAW GROUP, NATHAN A. EAST, TEEL & MARONEY, PLC, ABREO & CARTER, TROUSDALE RYAN, P.C., DYE SNYDER, LLP, WELLER, GREEN, TOUPS & TERRELL, LLP, OTTS, MOORE, COALE, GODWIN, STEARNS & DARBY, ESTES & KENNEDY LAW OFFICES, PLLC, TERRIE HARMAN, RICHARD RUSSELL, RICHARDSON, PATRICK, WESTBROOK & BRICKMAN, LLC, HALLETT, HALLETT & NAGEL and KENNETH G. WALSH
Case Number: 19-3280
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 [10719045] Reply filed by MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Served on 02/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:40 AM]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order [10719041] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. The joint reply shall be filed as of the date of this order. Served on 02/20/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:35 AM]
February 18, 2020 [10718502] Motion filed by Appellant Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3032, Appellee Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3002 for leave to file reply to. Served on: 02/18/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] PJS [Entered: 02/18/2020 04:24 PM]
February 14, 2020 [10718221] Response filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3079, 19-3176, 19-3280 to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Memorandum Concerning finality of Fee Allocation Orders (originally filed in No. 20-3002). Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3079, 19-3176, 19-3280] EAI [Entered: 02/14/2020 05:41 PM]
February 14, 2020 [10718143] Response filed by Hossley-Embry, LLP and Redenbaugh & Mohr, PC in 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284 to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Memorandum Concerning Finality of Fee Allocation Orders. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3178, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DAH [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:33 PM]
February 14, 2020 [10718080] Response filed by Gustafson Gluek, PLLC in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 20-3000, 20-3002, MN Co-Lead Counsel to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Request to Lift Abatement. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DEG [Entered: 02/14/2020 12:22 PM]
February 14, 2020 [10718056] Response filed by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3278, 20-3002, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279 to MDL Co-Lead Counsels' Memorandum Concerning Finality of Fee Allocation Orders. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3278, 20-3002, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279] CBH [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:42 AM]
February 11, 2020 [10717184] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. An in-person mediation conference is scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 12:00 pm, and 2/28/2020 at 9:00 am (MT). [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/11/2020 02:35 PM]
January 31, 2020 [10714688] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Any party wishing to file a response supporting or opposing MDL Co-Lead Counsels memorandum and request to lift the abatement shall do so on or before 02/14/20. The responses shall be filed only in the appeal(s) corresponding to the filing party. These appeals shall remain abated pending further order of the court. Served on 01/31/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:45 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10714672] MDL Co-Lead Counsels Memorandum Concerning Finality. Served on 01/27/2020 by email (copied from 20-3002; entered by clerk's office). [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:00 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713389] Response to 01/13/2020 order in 19-3280 and to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's memorandum in 20-3002 filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3280. Served on 01/27/2020 by email. [19-3280] --[Edited docket event and text 01/28/2020 by SLS.] --[Edited 01/31/2020 by SLS to remove docket event from 20-3002.] EAI [Entered: 01/27/2020 06:02 PM]
January 22, 2020 [10712010] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/22/2020. (This appeal is abated.) [19-3280] [Entered: 01/22/2020 02:09 PM]
January 13, 2020 [10709400] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating these appeals pending allocation of the IRPA Pool. The deadline for the opening brief and appendix in Appeal No. 19-3278 is vacated. Notwithstanding the abatement, on or before 01/27/2020, any appellant in these five appeals who wishes to address the finality of the district courts 11/19/2019 order shall file a jurisdictional memorandum brief in the appeal that corresponds to that appellant. Any appellant who does not believe additional jurisdictional briefing is necessary shall file a notice to that effect due 01/27/2020. Served on 01/13/2020. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/13/2020 02:32 PM]
January 10, 2020 [10708715] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 01/17/2020 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KSkc), Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3280] [Entered: 01/10/2020 07:35 AM]
January 9, 2020 [10708689] Docketing statement filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A.. Served on 01/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3280] EAI [Entered: 01/09/2020 06:13 PM]
January 9, 2020 [10708687] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A.. Served on: 01/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3280] EAI [Entered: 01/09/2020 05:39 PM]
January 8, 2020 [10708105] Entry of appearance filed by William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/08/2020 10:41 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708092] Entry of appearance submitted by William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC in 19-3278, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/08/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 1/8/20][19-3278, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280] WBC [Entered: 01/08/2020 10:15 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708076] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Daniel E. Gustafson for Gustafson Gluek PLLC, et al. (Minnesota Common Benefit Firms) in 19-3278, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/08/2020 09:53 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708064] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellee Gustafson Gluek, PLLC in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000Minnesota Common Benefit Firms for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000]--[Edited 01/08/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DEG [Entered: 01/08/2020 09:29 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708047] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Justin Demerath for O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo and Demerath Law Office in 19-3278, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/08/2020 08:34 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708012] Entry of appearance filed by A. Craig Eiland for Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3280, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/08/2020 06:51 AM]
January 8, 2020 [10708006] Entry of appearance submitted by Allen Craig Eiland for Appellant Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C. in 19-3279, Appellee Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C. in 19-3278, 19-3280, 20-3000, 19-3284 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/08/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3279, 19-3278, 19-3280, 20-3000, 19-3284] --[Edited 01/08/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/8/20] ACE [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:35 AM]
January 7, 2020 [10707999] Entry of appearance submitted by Justin Brooks Demerath for Appellants O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo and Demerath Law Office in 19-3284, Appellees O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo and Demerath Law Office in 19-3280, 19-3279, 19-3278, 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279, 19-3278, 20-3000]--[Edited 01/08/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] JD [Entered: 01/07/2020 05:09 PM]
January 7, 2020 [10707946] Entry of appearance filed by Don M. Downing, Gretchen Garrison for Kansas Common Benefit Firms CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/07/2020 02:39 PM]
January 7, 2020 [10707923] Entry of appearance submitted by Don M. Downing, Gretchen Garrison for Appellee Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. in 19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000Plaintiffs-Appellees, Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Benefit Firms for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/07/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/07/20][19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] DMD [Entered: 01/07/2020 01:56 PM]
January 7, 2020 [10707919] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard L. Coffman for Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, et al. (The Toups/Coffman parties) CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3280] [Entered: 01/07/2020 01:50 PM]
January 7, 2020 [10707915] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard L. Coffman for Appellant Richard L. Coffman, P.C.CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: yes, more than 50 parties. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3280]--[Edited 01/07/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] RLC [Entered: 01/07/2020 01:40 PM]
January 7, 2020 [10707792] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mitchell A. Toups for appellants Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, et al. (The Toups/Coffman parties) CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3280] [Entered: 01/07/2020 10:40 AM]
January 7, 2020 [10707786] Entry of appearance submitted by Mitchell A. Toups for Appellants Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, White & Allen, P.A., Richard L. Coffman, P.C. and Appellee Fitzgerald Law P.A.Toups-Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3280]--[Edited 01/07/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] MAT [Entered: 01/07/2020 10:28 AM]
January 7, 2020 [10707703] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher Adam Seeger for Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al. (Kansas Common Benefit Firms) in 19-3278, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/07/2020 08:18 AM]
January 7, 2020 [10707683] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Diogenes P. Kekatos and Mr. Steven A. Weiss for Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al. (Kansas Common Benefit Firms) in 19-3278, et al. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/07/2020 07:55 AM]
January 7, 2020 [10707664] Entry of appearance filed by Eric Alan Isaacson for William Thomas, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Mr. James M. Pietz, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John E. Tarburton, Orlans, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Slaven Law Group, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Molleur Law Office, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, John M. Totten, P.C., Bigham Law Firm, Mr. Nathan A. East, Mr. Richard Russell, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Terrie Harman, White & Allen, P.A. and FisherBroyles, LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/07/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3280] [Entered: 01/07/2020 07:33 AM]
January 6, 2020 [10707640] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric Alan Isaacson for Appellants Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh and White & Allen, P.A. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 01/07/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/07/20] [19-3280] EAI [Entered: 01/06/2020 06:39 PM]
January 6, 2020 [10707634] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen A. Weiss; Diogenes P. Kekatos for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Seeger Weiss LLP and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3278, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Seeger Weiss LLP and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 20-3000, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279]--[Edited 01/07/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] SAW [Entered: 01/06/2020 05:04 PM]
January 6, 2020 [10707618] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher A. Seeger for Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Seeger Weiss LLP and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3278, Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Seeger Weiss LLP and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 20-3000, Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279]--[Edited 01/07/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] CAS [Entered: 01/06/2020 04:45 PM]
January 6, 2020 [10707600] Entry of appearance filed by Bradley Wilders for Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al. (Kansas Common Benefit Firms and Representative Plaintiffs.). CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/06/2020 04:19 PM]
January 6, 2020 [10707536] Entry of appearance filed by Bruce McKee and Scott A. Powell for Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Wagner Reese, LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Seeger Weiss LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Battle & Winn LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, The Gibbs Law Firm, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Saeed & Little, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC and Mr. Norman Sigrist, Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Charles B. Lex, Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. Kenneth Osborn, Peter V. Anderson, Mr. Richard Crone, Pine Hurst Acres, Mr. Bradley J. Vermeer, VJW Farm, Inc., Michael Gries, Mr. Charles A. Welsh, Mr. Ron Wetz, Steven A. Wentworth, Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Charles Cobb, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer and CE Cobb Farms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3280, 19-3284] [Entered: 01/06/2020 03:04 PM]
January 6, 2020 [10707496] Entry of appearance filed by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Law Offices of James S. Rogers. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:55 PM]
January 6, 2020 [10707495] Entry of appearance submitted by Bradley T. Wilders for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3278, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3280, 19-3284, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] --[Edited 01/06/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/6/20] BW [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:52 PM]
January 6, 2020 [10707489] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Law Offices of James S. Rogers in 19-3278, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Law Offices of James S. Rogers in 19-3280, 19-3284, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Law Offices of James S. Rogers in 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/06/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/06/20][19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] PJS [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:33 PM]
January 3, 2020 [10707159] Entry of appearance filed by Tempe D. Smith for Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al. (Kansas Common Benefit Firms). CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/03/2020 03:36 PM]
January 3, 2020 [10707126] Entry of appearance submitted by Tempe D. Smith for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3278, Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000]--[Edited 01/06/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] SAP [Entered: 01/03/2020 02:52 PM]
January 3, 2020 [10707125] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott A. Powell and Bruce J. McKee for Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Roger Ward, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3278, 19-3279, Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Roger Ward, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000]--[Edited 01/07/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 1/6/2020 in 19-3280 and 19-3284. and filed in 19-3287and 20-3000 on 1/7/2020. Removed from case 19-3279. ] SAP [Entered: 01/03/2020 02:44 PM]
December 26, 2019 [10705228] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/19/2019 Docketing statement due 01/09/2020 for Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, W. Dean Belk Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Aaron D. Hovan, John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Joseph F. Manak, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A.. Transcript order form due 01/09/2020 for Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, W. Dean Belk Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Aaron D. Hovan, John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Joseph F. Manak, E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A.. Notice of appearance due on 01/09/2020 for Abreo & Carter, Adams, Rizzi & Sween, P.A., David R. Adelman, Alerding Castor Hewitt LLP, Allen Wellman McNew Harvey, LLP, Allen, Stein & Durbin, PC, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Angel, Isaacson & Tracy, Attorneys at Law, Anthony O'Hanlon, P.C., Arndt Buswell & Thorn S.C., Michael Ashar, Atlee Hall, LLP, Baker, Bodwell, Appel Attorneys at Law, Bakke Norman, S.C., Barada Law Offices, LLC, Barber, Segatto, Hoffee, Wilke, & Cate, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Barrett McNagny LLP, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Barrett, Easterday, Cunningham & Eselgroth, LLP, Bassford Remele, PA, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Beine & Roberts Law Firm, PLC, W. Dean Belk Jr., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Tom Benson, Bernatz & Van Beek, Bigham Law Firm, Bill J. Milner Law Offices, Bird, Jacobsen & Stevens, PC, George M. Bishop, Blakeman & Schrock, LTD, Bloom Gates & Whiteleather, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Leo Boothe, Boren, Olver and Coffey, LLP, Boring & Boring, PC, Boschma Law Office, Bose McKinney & Evans LLP, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Bradford Law Firm, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brand & Morelock, Brau Law Office, Brennan Steil S.C., Brett Dunn PLLC, Brian Fitzwater Law Office, Brock Law Offices PC LLO, Jake W. Brooks, Brooks & Olson, Brooks Pierce, Brown, DePrez & Johnson, P.A., Broyles Kight & Ricafort, PC, Burns Cronauer & Brown LLP, Butler Snow, LLP, Byron Stone, PLLC, Caldwell, Brierly, Chalupa & Nuzman, PLLC, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Call & Gentry Law Group, Carabin & Shaw, P.C., Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Carpenter & Schumacher, P.C., Cary, Welch, Hickman & Hawk, LLP, Caughey, Legner & Freehill Attorneys at Law, Mitchell C. Chaney, Chapman Law LLC, Charles E. Cronauer & Associates, Charnetski, Lacina & Clower, LLP, Chester Law Office, Church, Church, HIttle & Antrim, Clark & Clark P.C., Clark Love & Hutson, GP, Clark, Love & Hutson GP, Clendening Johnson & Bohrer, P.C., Cline Farrell Christie & Lee, P.C., Cline Williams Wright Johnson & Oldfather, LLP, Cockerill & Cockerill Attorneys at Law, Jeremy P. Cohen, Cole Law Office, Cole, Easley, Sciba & Williams, P.C., Colvin, Chaney, Saenz & Rodriguez, LLP, Connors LLP, Coots, Henke & Wheeler, Copley Roth & Wilson, LLC, Cornell Law Office, Pen Cosby, Cotton, Bolton, Hoychick & Doughty, LLP, Cress Law Group, PC, Critchfield Critchfield & Johson, Ltd., Conrad F. Cropsey, Cross Law Firm, LLC, Cross Pennamped Woolsey & Glazier, P.C., Culbertson & Allen, LLC, Custy Law Firm, LLC, Daniel M. Homolka, P.A., Darling & Darling, Dave O'Brien Law, Davis & Campbell, LLC, DeWald Deaver, P.C., Briana Deane, Deborah Smith McClure, P.C., John R. Delzer, Delzer Law Office, Denney & Barrett, PC, Denton & Keuler, LLP, Dillon Legal Group, Dobbs Legal Group, Doering & Grisell, PA, Drew Young Law, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Edmund A. Weinheimer, Jr., P. C., Eich, Van Dyke, Werdan & Steger P.C., Ellis & Judd Law Office, LLC, Patrick A. Elward, Brent C. Embrey, Emerick, Diggins & Zabona P.C., Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, Endurance Law Group PLC, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Espe Law PLLC, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A., Faith Ingle Smith Law Firm, Fearer, Nye, & Chadwick, Fellheimer Law Firm Ltd., Fenchel, Doster & Buck, PLC, Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Fitzgerald Law P.A., Flynn & Sullivan PC, Forbes Law Group, LLC, Forde Law Offices LLP, Foreman Watson Holtrey, Frundt & Johnson, Ltd., Michael J. Galanis, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Gary T. Gee Law Office, Gellhaus & Gellhaus, P. C., Spencer Gilland, Gordon & Associates, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Graybill & Witcher, LLP, Greak Law, P.C., Green Espel PLLP, Gregory L. Ceshker, P.C., Grenfell, Sledge and Stevens, Griffin Dietrich & Elliot, LLC, Grosboll, Becker, Tice & Barr, Michael Gross, Habush Habush & Rottier S.C., Hagen & Hagen, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hall Hudson, P.C., Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Hampton & Royce, L.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Terrie Harman, Hart Bell, LLC, Hawkins Law, PC, Charles Hear, Hecker Law Group, PLC, Hehner & Associates, LLC, Heinisch & Lovegrove Law Office, PC LLP, Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC, Hensley Legal Group PC, Heritage Legal Group PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Holland Law Firm, Richard M. Holmes, Hossley-Embry, LLP, Hostetter & Associates, Aaron D. Hovan, Hovland & Rasmus, PLLC, W. Calloway Huffaker, Hume, Smith, Geddes, Green & Simmons, LLP, Ingebritson & Associates, P.A., James & Larson Law, James Law, P.C., Janzen Agricultural Law, LLC, Jason Schutte, Koepke & Hiltabrand Attorney at Law, Jefferson & Brewer, LLP, Jeffrey A. Boggess, P.C., John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Johnson & Mock, PC LLO, Johnson Becker, PLLC, Johnson Law Group, Johnson, Kramer, Mulholland, Cochrane, Driscoll & Cochrane, P.L.C., Johnson, Moody, Schmidt & Kleinhuizen, P.A., Justin Hill, PC, KC Cohen, Lawyer, PC, Katz & Korin, P.C., Keaton & Keaton PC, Kelley Law Firm, PC, Kempton & Russell, LLC, Keuler, Kelly Hutchins & Blankenship, LLP, Kevin W. Liles PC, Kirk Law Firm, Kittelsen, Barry, Wellington, Thompson, & Schluesche, Attorneys at Law, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Knuth Law Office, Koenig Law Firm, Alex Koenigs, Kovarik, Ellison & Mathis, P.C., Kraft Walser Law Office, PLLP, Kramer Law, LLC, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Kruse & Dakin LLP, Kuhlman & Lucas, LLC, Lamkin & Lamkin, P.C., Langdon & Emison Attorneys at Law, Law Office of Adam Crawshaw, Law Office of Brent Gaines, Law Office of Christopher H. Poynor, Law Office of Ezequiel Reyna, Jr., Law Office of Gregory E. Tonore, Law Office of Hammell & Murphy PLLP, Law Office of Jeffrey R. Vaughan, P.C., Law Office of Lester Weinstine, P.C., Law Office of Michael Miller, Law Office of Mike Crane, LLP, Law Office of Thomas A. Noe, III, Law Office of William Enyart, Law Office of William R. Shirk, Law Offices of Hans A. Buehler, LLC, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Law Offices of Leonel Alejandro PC, Law Offices of Richard Hoffman, Jenna Laird Leger, Wayne J. Lennington, Lee J. Lewis, Lind Jensen Sullivan & Peterson P.A., Jeff Link, Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lowe Eklund Wakefield CO., LPA, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Mailander Law Office, Maloney & Campolo, Joseph F. Manak, March, McMillan, DeJoode & Duvall, P.C., Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, Martz & Lucas, LLC, Irvin L. Masching, Massie & Quick, LLC, Mauro Archer and Associates PLLC, Maynes Law Office, Mazzanti Law Office, PLLC, McClure, Thomas & Thomas, McCulley McCluer PLLC, McFarland Law, PC, E. Rudolph McIntyre, McNeely Stephenson, Meador & Crump, P.A., Meier, Bragicich & Moore LLP, Mercho Caughey & DeLay, Mertes & Mertes, P.C., Meyer & Meyer LLP, Michael Smith Law, Midwest AG Solutions LLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Pearson Gloe Burns Beatty & Parrish, P.L.C., Miller Schirger LLC, Miltner Law Firm, LLC, Miner & Lemon, LLP, Molleur Law Office, Moore, Susler, McNutt & Wrigley, LLC, Morgan & Meyers, PLC, Morning Law Office LLC, Morris Laing Evans Brock & Kennedy, Morrissey, Morrissey & Dalluge, Muske, Muske, Suhrhoff LTD, Myers Hockemeyer & McNagny LLP, Nathan J. Noble, P.C., Gregg Neal, Nelson, Young, & Braland Attorneys at Law, Nidey Erdahl Tindal & Fischer, PLC, Norman Paloucek & Herman, OKoon Hintermeister, PLLC, Obear, Overholser, Huffer & Rider, LLC, Orlans, P.C., Osterbauer Law Firm, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Ouderkirk Law Firm, Overboe Law, Pagel & Weikum, PLLP, Patterson Comer, Patton Brown Law, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg P.A, Paul LLP, Pemberton Law Firm, Pemberton, Sorlie, Rufer, & Kershner, PLLP, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Phillippi Law Firm, LLC, Phipps Anderson Deacon, LLP, Pickner Law Office, James M. Pietz, Attorney, Plews Shadley Racher & Braun LLP, Scott Emory Poynter, Crystal D. Pulley, Daniel Quigley, Quigley Law Office, Quirk & Hunter, PC, Rammelkamp Bradney, P.C., Randle & Sammons, P.C., Ray A.

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BYRON STONE, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRIAN FITZWATER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HOLLAND LAW FIRM
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DEMERATH LAW OFFICE
Represented By: Larry R. Demerath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ELLIS & JUDD LAW OFFICE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HOSSLEY-EMBRY, LLP
Represented By: Daniel Allen Hossley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OVERBOE LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C.
Represented By: Don Manley Downing
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JENNA LAIRD LEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WOOD & RUE, PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TOURKOW CRELL ROSENBLATT & JOHNSTON LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CLARK LOVE & HUTSON, GP
Represented By: William Wayne Lundquist
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WALK & MURPHY, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HERITAGE LEGAL GROUP PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CARPENTER & SCHUMACHER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MORRIS LAING EVANS BROCK & KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PHILLIPPI LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MUSKE, MUSKE, SUHRHOFF LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: VAN KLEY & WALKER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RICHARD D. LARSON, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CLARK & CLARK P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WATTS GUERRA LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Represented By: Thomas Wiegand
Represented By: Eric R. Nitz
Represented By: William P. Ferranti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MCCLURE, THOMAS & THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICES OF LEONEL ALEJANDRO PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DILLON LEGAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CHURCH, CHURCH, HITTLE & ANTRIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHNSON LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Stueve
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BATTLE & WINN LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CONNORS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: REDENBAUGH & MOHR, PC
Represented By: Daniel Allen Hossley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WALLACE LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HAWKINS LAW, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE LAW OFFICE OF MARK L EUREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GRAY REED & MCGRAW, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MAYNES LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF MIKE CRANE, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JEREMY P. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICES OF HANS A. BUEHLER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SORLING NORTHRUP ATTORNEYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DANIEL M. HOMOLKA, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ATLEE HALL, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DAVE O'BRIEN LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRENNAN STEIL S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DENNEY & BARRETT, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MCFARLAND LAW, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OKOON HINTERMEISTER, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE GIBBS LAW FIRM
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SHAMBERG, WOLF, MCDERMOTT & DEPUE
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FELLHEIMER LAW FIRM LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BLOOM GATES & WHITELEATHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RYAN MOORE & COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WOODS ROGERS PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WORTH LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRAND & MORELOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS R. FIELDS, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TULLY LAW OFFICE, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WEEKS & BRUCKER, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FAITH INGLE SMITH LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JUSTIN HILL, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DOBBS LEGAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: QUIRK & HUNTER, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MOORE, SUSLER, MCNUTT & WRIGLEY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FOREMAN WATSON HOLTREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher B. Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CRITCHFIELD CRITCHFIELD & JOHSON, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRIANA DEANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MAILANDER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE LAW OFFICE OF ROB TULLY PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HABUSH HABUSH & ROTTIER S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: VANDERGINST LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GARY T. GEE LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: COLE, EASLEY, SCIBA & WILLIAMS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DAVID R. ADELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DAVIS & CAMPBELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KEVIN W. LILES PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SONENBERG LAW LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WRIGHT SCHIMMEL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PLEWS SHADLEY RACHER & BRAUN LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BOREN, OLVER AND COFFEY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WOODARD LAW PC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HUME, SMITH, GEDDES, GREEN & SIMMONS, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: W. CALLOWAY HUFFAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ZEILINGER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: REICHERT LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TAPELLA & EBERSPACHER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SCHULTZ LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DEBORAH K. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RILEY-TANIS & ASSOCIATES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HANSEN, HOWELL & WILKIE, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: COOTS, HENKE & WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BERNATZ & VAN BEEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ARNDT BUSWELL & THORN S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: REICHERT WENNER, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BROCK LAW OFFICES PC LLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAMKIN & LAMKIN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BURNS CRONAUER & BROWN LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, LLP
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HENSLEY LEGAL GROUP PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DARLING & DARLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KOENIG LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MARTZ & LUCAS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MAZZANTI LAW OFFICE, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NATHAN J. NOBLE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LEE J. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GREGG NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CRESS LAW GROUP, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BILL J. MILNER LAW OFFICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ROB TULLY LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KITTELSEN, BARRY, WELLINGTON, THOMPSON, & SCHLUESCHE, ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CHARLES HEAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DREW YOUNG LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ALLEN, STEIN & DURBIN, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DANIEL QUIGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GROSBOLL, BECKER, TICE & BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BORING & BORING, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MARK A. ROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: COTTON, BOLTON, HOYCHICK & DOUGHTY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SCHWARZ LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BROOKS & OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PAUL LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RHOADES MCKEE PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CLINE FARRELL CHRISTIE & LEE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHNSON & MOCK, PC LLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JEFFERSON & BREWER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GRIFFIN DIETRICH & ELLIOT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WINSTEIN, KAVENSKY & CUNNINGHAM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BLAKEMAN & SCHROCK, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: O'HANLON, DEMERATH & CASTILLO
Represented By: Justin Demerath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TUCKER & TUCKER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MEADOR & CRUMP, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STRITTMATTER LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WILLIS & WILLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MALONEY & CAMPOLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OLDFIELD, MYERS, APKE & PAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CUSTY LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FEARER, NYE, & CHADWICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MERKEL & COCKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MCNEELY STEPHENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BURKE HARVEY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KELLEY LAW FIRM, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BIRD, JACOBSEN & STEVENS, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL ASHAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OUDERKIRK LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BROYLES KIGHT & RICAFORT, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KNUTH LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MAURO ARCHER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FRUNDT & JOHNSON, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BROWN, DEPREZ & JOHNSON, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JASON SCHUTTE, KOEPKE & HILTABRAND ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAURIE S. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C.
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE MCQUADES CO. LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STONE LAW OFFICE, P.L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RICCOLO, SEMELROTH, & HENNINGSEN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HART BELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRADFORD LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MORGAN & MEYERS, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JEFF LINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ROBERTS LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ALLEN WELLMAN MCNEW HARVEY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF HAMMELL & MURPHY PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JAMES & LARSON LAW, JAMES LAW, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DEWALD DEAVER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EMERSON POYNTER LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: IRVIN L. MASCHING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SNEED LANG PC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY E. TONORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL GROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CHARLES E. CRONAUER & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MASSIE & QUICK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MILTNER LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PEN COSBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KUHLMAN & LUCAS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE WINKIE LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GEORGE M. BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SEVER STOREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS A. NOE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TUCKER LAW PRACTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BARBARA J. SIMMONS
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MEIER, BRAGICICH & MOORE LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WILLADSEN & NEAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER H. POYNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ALEX KOENIGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PATTERSON COMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TROYER & GOOD, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OBEAR, OVERHOLSER, HUFFER & RIDER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MORRISSEY, MORRISSEY & DALLUGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE CANTLIN LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SHERMAN HOFFMAN & HIPP, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CORNELL LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MARCH, MCMILLAN, DEJOODE & DUVALL, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LEO BOOTHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SPENCER GILLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE STROM LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HECKER LAW GROUP, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SAM C. MITCHELL & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CARABIN & SHAW, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HEINISCH & LOVEGROVE LAW OFFICE, PC LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HEHNER & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NORMAN PALOUCEK & HERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FAFINSKI MARK & JOHNSON, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GORDON & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WELD, RILEY, PRENN & RICCI S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BAKER, BODWELL, APPEL ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ONDER LAW, LLC
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL J. GALANIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LANGDON & EMISON ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BARRETT, EASTERDAY, CUNNINGHAM & ESELGROTH, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRAU LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BOHRER BRADY LLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SATTERLEY AND KELLEY, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MORNING LAW OFFICE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: COPLEY ROTH & WILSON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CHARNETSKI, LACINA & CLOWER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CAUGHEY, LEGNER & FREEHILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LUNDBERG LAW FIRM PLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JANZEN AGRICULTURAL LAW, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MYERS HOCKEMEYER & MCNAGNY LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FITZGERALD LAW P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STOERZBACH LAW OFFICE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RANDLE & SAMMONS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE POPPE LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KC COHEN, LAWYER, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KEATON & KEATON PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC
Represented By: David A. Goodwin
Represented By: Eric S. Taubel
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STOCKARD, JOHNSTON, & BROWN, P.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HAMPTON & ROYCE, L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MERCHO CAUGHEY & DELAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EMERICK, DIGGINS & ZABONA P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. LAPOINTE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KIRK LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SOPER LEDDIN LAW FIRM, PC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GRAYBILL & WITCHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL SMITH LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SIMON HERBERT & MCCLELLAND, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SMITH GARDNER SLUSKY LAZER POHREN & ROGERS LLP, NKA Smith Slusky Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MITCHELL C. CHANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CLENDENING JOHNSON & BOHRER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BARBER, SEGATTO, HOFFEE, WILKE, & CATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WARNER NORCROSS & JUDD, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GELLHAUS & GELLHAUS, P. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WOLF ARDIS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PATRICK A. ELWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FISHERBROYLES, LLP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ESPE LAW PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KATZ & KORIN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SAEED & LITTLE, LLP
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WHITMAN, BABER, & SIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: REILING TEDER & SCHRIER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC
Represented By: Bradley Wilders
Represented By: Bruce McKee
Represented By: Scott Ashley Powell
Represented By: Tempe D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WAYNE J. LENNINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KRUSE & DAKIN LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: VAUGHAN LAW FIRM, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KOVARIK, ELLISON & MATHIS, P.C., NKA Ellison Kovarik & Turman Law Firm PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LIND JENSEN SULLIVAN & PETERSON P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KEULER, KELLY HUTCHINS & BLANKENSHIP, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt |