Mitchell, et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, et al
Plaintiff: JAMAL DEAN, NATHAN ORNELLAS, ALLEN ROBERTS, KEVIN SALIVA, SAMULE HILLENBURG, SHARON WILLIAMS, MARCIA CAMERON, DENISE POE, PAUL FOS, GLENN GILLESHAMMER, JOANA ZELAYA, ANDROMANCHE HARVERY, KAY MITCHELL, STEVEN STETZEL, DOMINIQUE EVANS, CURTIS DOWDLE and BRANDON WESTMAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: REZA KAMALI, CONCEPCION POWELL, ERICA JONES, EDWARD KLANN, RICHARD FARR, CAMERON CASEY, ANU SOOD, BARBARA SHADOAN, ERIC TALASKA, BRENDON WESTMAN, GLORIA PLEDGER, EDWIN ZORILLA, CHARLES JONES, AARON BRODIE, DON BLACK, BRUCE BIRD, APRIL THOMAS, MATTHEW GRAGG, KEN GREGORY, TRACY KILGORE, MBEGANE DIOUF, JENNIFER K. ZELENY, DAVID SELS, ADRIAN THOMPSON, PATRICIA BURKHALTER, JENNIFER ELLSWORTH, MATTHEW C. BISHOP, TRAVIS ASHBY, SHANELL GOLDEN, JENNIFER KING, CARINA RHEA, AARON HANDS, RALPH MCCOY, BRENT MILLER, LAWRENCE J. MITCHELL, ZACHARY CHRISTENSEN, LORETTA GRADY, RICHARD FOUNTAIN, LISA STERN, ROBERT MOYER, KIM WESTON, SCOTT WESTIN, DOUG WATERS, JOSEPH W. STEELE, V, DAVID SELF, EDWARD DOWDY, ANDREW GORAYEB and JEFFERY TAYLOR
Defendant / Appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, National Association, a National Banking Assocaiton, WELLS FARGO & COMPANY, a Delaware corporation and WELLS FARGO BANK, National Association, a National Banking Assocation
Case Number: 19-4027
Filed: March 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 [10657225] Attorney Cameron S. Christensen for Mr. Jeffery Taylor, Mr. Don Black, Mr. Charles Jones, Mr. David Self, Richard Farr, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Matthew C. Bishop, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer K. Zeleny, Joseph W. Steele, V, Scott Westin, Bruce Bird, Anu Sood, Brent Miller, Richard Fountain, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Edward Dowdy, April Thomas, Reza Kamali, Carina Rhea, Shanell Golden, Kim Weston, Jennifer King, Ralph McCoy, Aaron Hands, Lisa Stern, Mbegane Diouf, Doug Waters, Patricia Burkhalter, Cameron Casey, Robert Moyer, Gloria Pledger, Aaron Brodie, Travis Ashby, Andrew Gorayeb, Edwin Zorilla, Edward Klann, Barbara Shadoan, Jennifer Ellsworth, Concepcion Powell, Adrian Thompson, Eric Talaska, Zachary Christensen, Erica Jones and Ms. Sharon Williams, Kay Mitchell, Allen Roberts, Nathan Ornellas, Joana Zelaya, Samule Hillenburg, Andromanche Harvery, Paul Fos, Marcia Cameron, Dominique Evans, Kevin Saliva, Curtis Dowdle, Steven Stetzel, Glenn Gilleshammer, Denise Poe, Jamal Dean and Brandon Westman admitted to the bar of this court. [19-4027] [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:18 PM]
June 11, 2019 [10654877] Attorney admission letter, second notice sent. Attorney admission response date set to 06/21/2019. [19-4027] [Entered: 06/11/2019 09:09 AM]
June 7, 2019 [10654270] Attorney Jacob M Rosen for Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Bank admitted to the bar of this court. [19-4027] [Entered: 06/07/2019 11:36 AM]
May 21, 2019 [10650179] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 05/21/2019. Appellants opening brief and appendix due on 07/01/2019 for Travis Ashby, Bruce Bird, Matthew C. Bishop, Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Mbegane Diouf, Edward Dowdy, Jennifer Ellsworth, Richard Farr, Richard Fountain, Shanell Golden, Andrew Gorayeb, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Charles Jones, Erica Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer King, Edward Klann, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Robert Moyer, Gloria Pledger, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, David Self, Barbara Shadoan, Anu Sood, Joseph W. Steele V, Lisa Stern, Eric Talaska, Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Doug Waters, Scott Westin, Kim Weston, Jennifer K. Zeleny and Edwin Zorilla. [19-4027] [Entered: 05/21/2019 10:00 AM]
May 20, 2019 [10649796] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 05/28/2019 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4027] [Entered: 05/20/2019 11:26 AM]
May 13, 2019 [10648394] Second amended entry of appearance filed by Cameron S. Christensen and Steven A. Christensen for Lawrence J. Mitchel, Matthew C. Bishop, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer K. Zeleny, Joseph W. Steele, V, Scott Westin, Bruce Bird, Anu Sood, Brent Miller, Richard Fountain, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Edward Dowdy, April Thomas, Don Black, Reza Kamali, Carina Rhea, Shanell Golden, Kim Weston, David Self, Jennifer King, Ralph McCoy, Aaron Hands, Lisa Stern, Mbegane Diouf; Doug Waters; Patricia Burkhalter, Cameron Casey, Jeffery Taylor, Robert Moyer, Gloria Pledger, Charles Jones, Aaron Brodie, Richard Farr, Travis Ashby, Andrew Gorayeb, Edwin Zorilla, Edward Klann, Barbara Shadoan, Jennifer Ellsworth, Concepcion Powell, Adrian Thompson, Eric Talaska, Zachary Christensen and Erica Jones. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 05/13/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4027] [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:52 PM]
May 13, 2019 [10648378] Entry of appearance submitted by Steven A. Christensen for Appellants Travis Ashby, Bruce Bird, Matthew C. Bishop, Mr. Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Mbegane Diouf, Jennifer Ellsworth, Richard Farr, Richard Fountain, Richard Fountain, Shanell Golden, Andrew Gorayeb, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Mr. Charles Jones, Erica Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer King, Edward Klann, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Robert Moyer, Gloria Pledger, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, Mr. David Self, Barbara Shadoan, Anu Sood, Joseph W. Steele, V, Lisa Stern, Eric Talaska, Mr. Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Doug Waters, Scott Westin, Kim Weston, Jennifer K. Zeleny and Edwin Zorilla for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/13/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4027] --[Edited 05/13/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] SAC [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:23 PM]
May 10, 2019 [10647963] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 06/10/2019 for J. Max Rosen. [19-4027] [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:43 PM]
May 10, 2019 [10647962] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 06/10/2019 for Cameron S. Christensen. [19-4027] [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:38 PM]
May 9, 2019 [10647392] Order filed by Clerk of the Court reactivating case for clerical purposes only. [19-4027] [Entered: 05/09/2019 08:01 AM]
May 8, 2019 [10647343] Recalled mandate returned from district court. [19-4027] [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:23 PM]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order [10647325] Order filed by Judge Bacharach granting Appellants' Motion to REINSTATE this matter. The mandate issued 4/15/19 is RECALLED. This Clerk's office shall revise the docket per instructions in this order. Counsel for Appellants shall file an amended entry of appearance that lists the names of only those plaintiffs whom counsel represents as appellants in this appeal. Amended notice of appearance due on 05/15/2019. Attorney Cameron Christensen's deadline for admission to this court is 5/13/19. Appellants' counsel shall make payment arrangements by 5/15/19 for the transcript ordered 3/18/19. Mandate return from District Court due 05/20/2019. See order for details. Served on 05/08/2019. [19-4027] [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:44 PM]
May 3, 2019 [10646274] Supplement filed by Travis Ashby, Bruce Bird, Matthew C. Bishop, Mr. Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Mbegane Diouf, Edward Dowdy, Jennifer Ellsworth, Richard Farr, Richard Fountain, Richard Fountain, Shanell Golden, Andrew Gorayeb, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Mr. Charles Jones, Erica Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer King, Edward Klann, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Robert Moyer, Gloria Pledger, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, Mr. David Self, Barbara Shadoan, Anu Sood, Joseph W. Steele, V, Lisa Stern, Eric Talaska, Mr. Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Doug Waters, Scott Westin, Kim Weston, Jennifer K. Zeleny and Edwin Zorilla to Motion to Reinstate. Served on 05/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4027] SAC [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:48 PM]
April 26, 2019 [10644275] Order filed by Clerk of the Court taking appellants' motion for reinstatement under advisement and directing appellants to supplement the motion within 7 days of the date of this order. (Supplemental motion due 05/03/2019 for appellants Travis Ashby, et al.) Served on 04/26/2019. (See the attachment for the order.) [19-4027] [Entered: 04/26/2019 09:33 AM]
April 26, 2019 [10644225] Motion filed by Appellants Richard Fountain, Travis Ashby, Bruce Bird, Matthew C. Bishop, Mr. Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Marcia Cameron, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Jamal Dean, Mbegane Diouf, Curtis Dowdle, Edward Dowdy, Jennifer Ellsworth, Dominique Evans, Richard Farr, Glenn Gilleshammer, Shanell Golden, Andrew Gorayeb, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Mr. Charles Jones, Erica Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer King, Edward Klann, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Kay Mitchell, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Robert Moyer, Nathan Ornellas, Gloria Pledger, Denise Poe, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, Kevin Saliva, Mr. David Self, Barbara Shadoan, Anu Sood, Joseph W. Steele, V, Lisa Stern, Steven Stetzel, Eric Talaska, Mr. Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Doug Waters, Scott Westin, Brandon Westman, Kim Weston, Ms. Sharon Williams, Jennifer K. Zeleny and Edwin Zorilla to reinstate appeal. Served on: 04/26/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4027] SAC [Entered: 04/26/2019 08:19 AM]
April 15, 2019 [10641333] Mandate issued. [19-4027] --[Edited 05/09/2019 by SLS to note the mandate was recalled pursuant to the order of 05/08/2019.] [Entered: 04/15/2019 02:10 PM]
April 15, 2019 [10641332] Default. Procedural termination without judicial action by Clerk of the Court. [19-4027] [Entered: 04/15/2019 02:09 PM]
April 11, 2019 [10640447] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 05/13/2019 for Cameron S. Christensen. [19-4027] [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:55 AM]
April 10, 2019 [10640303] Entry of appearance filed by Steven Alden Christensen, Cameron S. Christensen for Appellants Travis Ashby, Matthew C. Bishop, Mr. Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Glenn Gilleshammer, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Mr. Charles Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Kay Mitchell, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Gloria Pledger, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, Robert Moyer, Erica Jones, Barbara Shadoan, Joseph W. Steele, V, Lisa Stern, Eric Talaska, Mr. Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Scott Westin, Kim Weston, Jennifer K. Zeleny, Andrew Gorayeb and Mr. David Self. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all parties previously disclosed). Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email [Edited 04/11/2019 by MLB to correct counsel of record][19-4027] [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:50 PM]
April 10, 2019 [10640291] Entry of appearance submitted by Steven Alden Christensen, Cameron S. Christensen for Appellants Travis Ashby, Matthew C. Bishop, Mr. Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Glenn Gilleshammer, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Mr. Charles Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Kay Mitchell, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Gloria Pledger, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, Robert Moyer, Erica Jones, Barbara Shadoan, Joseph W. Steele, V, Lisa Stern, Eric Talaska, Mr. Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Scott Westin, Kim Weston, Jennifer K. Zeleny, Andrew Gorayeb and Mr. David Self for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/10/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 4/10/19][19-4027] SAC [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:37 PM]
April 3, 2019 [10638281] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 05/03/2019 for J. Max Rosen. [19-4027] [Entered: 04/03/2019 11:18 AM]
April 2, 2019 [10637933] Deficiency notice issued. Corrected entry of appearance (per deficiency notice of 03/22/2019) and notice (per order of 03/22/2019) now due on 04/12/2019 for Travis Ashby, Bruce Bird, Matthew C. Bishop, Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Marcia Cameron, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Jamal Dean, Mbegane Diouf, Curtis Dowdle, Edward Dowdy, Jennifer Ellsworth, Dominique Evans, Richard Farr, Paul Fos, Richard Fountain, Glenn Gilleshammer, Shanell Golden, Andrew Gorayeb, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Andromanche Harvery, Samule Hillenburg, Charles Jones, Erica Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer King, Edward Klann, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Kay Mitchell, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Robert Moyer, Nathan Ornellas, Gloria Pledger, Denise Poe, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, Allen Roberts, Kevin Saliva, David Self, Barbara Shadoan, Anu Sood, Joseph W. Steele V, Lisa Stern, Steven Stetzel, Eric Talaska, Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Doug Waters, Scott Westin, Brandon Westman, Kim Weston, Sharon Williams, Joana Zelaya, Jennifer K. Zeleny and Edwin Zorilla. [19-4027] [Entered: 04/02/2019 11:34 AM]
April 2, 2019 [10637834] Entry of appearance filed by J. Max Rosen and David Halleck Fry for Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Bank. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. (All previously disclosed.) Served on 04/01/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4027] [Entered: 04/02/2019 09:03 AM]
April 1, 2019 [10637662] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Erin J. Cox for Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Bank. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (some parties previously disclosed). Served on 04/01/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4027] [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:14 PM]
April 1, 2019 [10637650] Entry of appearance submitted by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. for Appellees for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4027] --[Edited 04/02/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 4/2/19] DHF [Entered: 04/01/2019 03:07 PM]
April 1, 2019 [10637637] Entry of appearance submitted by Erin J. Cox for Appellees - Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/01/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 4/1/19][19-4027] EJC [Entered: 04/01/2019 02:59 PM]
April 1, 2019 [10637283] Transcript order form filed by Ms. Laura Robinson. Transcript of 06/20/2018 motion hearing due 04/19/2019 for Laura Robinson. [19-4027] [Entered: 04/01/2019 08:08 AM]
March 22, 2019 [10635191] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing appellants' counsel to file a response regarding the case caption and identity of all persons seeking to participate in this case as appellants. See order for additional information. Appellees' counsel may--but is not required to file a contemporaneous written response advising the court of any changes they believe the court should make to the caption and docket. Response due on 04/01/2019 for Travis Ashby, Bruce Bird, Matthew C. Bishop, Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Marcia Cameron, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Jamal Dean, Mbegane Diouf, Curtis Dowdle, Edward Dowdy, Jennifer Ellsworth, Dominique Evans, Richard Farr, Paul Fos, Richard Fountain, Glenn Gilleshammer, Shanell Golden, Andrew Gorayeb, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Andromanche Harvery, Samule Hillenburg, Charles Jones, Erica Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer King, Edward Klann, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Kay Mitchell, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Robert Moyer, Nathan Ornellas, Gloria Pledger, Denise Poe, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, Allen Roberts, Kevin Saliva, David Self, Barbara Shadoan, Anu Sood, Joseph W. Steele V, Lisa Stern, Steven Stetzel, Eric Talaska, Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Doug Waters, Scott Westin, Brandon Westman, Kim Weston, Sharon Williams, Joana Zelaya, Jennifer K. Zeleny and Edwin Zorilla. Served on 03/22/2019. [19-4027] [Entered: 03/22/2019 12:10 PM]
March 22, 2019 [10635079] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Entry of Appearance is incomplete. Designation of record was removed as counsel is retained. Notice of appearance due on 04/01/2019 for Travis Ashby, Bruce Bird, Matthew C. Bishop, Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Marcia Cameron, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Jamal Dean, Mbegane Diouf, Curtis Dowdle, Edward Dowdy, Jennifer Ellsworth, Dominique Evans, Richard Farr, Paul Fos, Richard Fountain, Glenn Gilleshammer, Shanell Golden, Andrew Gorayeb, Loretta Grady, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Andromanche Harvery, Samule Hillenburg, Charles Jones, Erica Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer King, Edward Klann, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Kay Mitchell, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Robert Moyer, Nathan Ornellas, Gloria Pledger, Denise Poe, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, Allen Roberts, Kevin Saliva, David Self, David Sels, Barbara Shadoan, Anu Sood, Joseph W. Steele V, Lisa Stern, Steven Stetzel, Eric Talaska, Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Doug Waters, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, Scott Westin, Brendon Westman, Kim Weston, Sharon Williams, Joana Zelaya, Jennifer K. Zeleny and Edwin Zorilla [19-4027] [Entered: 03/22/2019 07:24 AM]
March 21, 2019 [10635059] Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Travis Ashby, Bruce Bird, Matthew C. Bishop, Mr. Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Marcia Cameron, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Jamal Dean, Mbegane Diouf, Curtis Dowdle, Edward Dowdy, Jennifer Ellsworth, Dominique Evans, Richard Farr, Paul Fos, Richard Fountain, Richard Fountain, Glenn Gilleshammer, Shanell Golden, Andrew Gorayeb, Loretta Grady, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Andromanche Harvery, Samule Hillenburg, Mr. Charles Jones, Erica Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer King, Edward Klann, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Kay Mitchell, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Robert Moyer, Nathan Ornellas, Gloria Pledger, Denise Poe, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, Allen Roberts, Kevin Saliva, Mr. David Self, David Sels, Barbara Shadoan, Anu Sood, Joseph W. Steele, V, Lisa Stern, Steven Stetzel, Eric Talaska, Mr. Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Doug Waters, Scott Westin, Brendon Westman, Kim Weston, Ms. Sharon Williams, Joana Zelaya, Jennifer K. Zeleny and Edwin Zorilla. Served on 03/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4027]--[Edited 03/22/2019 by DD to correct docketing event from designation of record to docketing statement] SAC [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:22 PM]
March 11, 2019 [10632431] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/11/2019 Docketing statement due 03/25/2019 for Travis Ashby, Bruce Bird, Matthew C. Bishop, Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Marcia Cameron, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Jamal Dean, Mbegane Diouf, Curtis Dowdle, Edward Dowdy, Jennifer Ellsworth, Dominique Evans, Richard Farr, Paul Fos, Richard Fountain, Glenn Gilleshammer, Shanell Golden, Andrew Gorayeb, Loretta Grady, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Andromanche Harvery, Samule Hillenburg, Charles Jones, Erica Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer King, Edward Klann, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Kay Mitchell, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Robert Moyer, Nathan Ornellas, Gloria Pledger, Denise Poe, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, Allen Roberts, Kevin Saliva, David Self, David Sels, Barbara Shadoan, Anu Sood, Joseph W. Steele V, Lisa Stern, Steven Stetzel, Eric Talaska, Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Doug Waters, Scott Westin, Brendon Westman, Kim Weston, Sharon Williams, Joana Zelaya, Jennifer K. Zeleny and Edwin Zorilla. Transcript order form due 03/25/2019 for Travis Ashby, Bruce Bird, Matthew C. Bishop, Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Marcia Cameron, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Jamal Dean, Mbegane Diouf, Curtis Dowdle, Edward Dowdy, Jennifer Ellsworth, Dominique Evans, Richard Farr, Paul Fos, Richard Fountain, Glenn Gilleshammer, Shanell Golden, Andrew Gorayeb, Loretta Grady, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Andromanche Harvery, Samule Hillenburg, Charles Jones, Erica Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer King, Edward Klann, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Kay Mitchell, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Robert Moyer, Nathan Ornellas, Gloria Pledger, Denise Poe, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, Allen Roberts, Kevin Saliva, David Self, David Sels, Barbara Shadoan, Anu Sood, Joseph W. Steele V, Lisa Stern, Steven Stetzel, Eric Talaska, Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Doug Waters, Scott Westin, Brendon Westman, Kim Weston, Sharon Williams, Joana Zelaya, Jennifer K. Zeleny and Edwin Zorilla. Notice of appearance due on 03/25/2019 for Travis Ashby, Bruce Bird, Matthew C. Bishop, Don Black, Aaron Brodie, Patricia Burkhalter, Marcia Cameron, Cameron Casey, Zachary Christensen, Jamal Dean, Mbegane Diouf, Curtis Dowdle, Edward Dowdy, Jennifer Ellsworth, Dominique Evans, Richard Farr, Paul Fos, Richard Fountain, Glenn Gilleshammer, Shanell Golden, Andrew Gorayeb, Loretta Grady, Matthew Gragg, Ken Gregory, Aaron Hands, Andromanche Harvery, Samule Hillenburg, Charles Jones, Erica Jones, Reza Kamali, Tracy Kilgore, Jennifer King, Edward Klann, Ralph McCoy, Brent Miller, Kay Mitchell, Lawrence J. Mitchell, Robert Moyer, Nathan Ornellas, Gloria Pledger, Denise Poe, Concepcion Powell, Carina Rhea, Allen Roberts, Kevin Saliva, David Self, David Sels, Barbara Shadoan, Anu Sood, Joseph W. Steele V, Lisa Stern, Steven Stetzel, Eric Talaska, Jeffery Taylor, April Thomas, Adrian Thompson, Doug Waters, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, Scott Westin, Brendon Westman, Kim Weston, Sharon Williams, Joana Zelaya, Jennifer K. Zeleny and Edwin Zorilla. [19-4027] [Entered: 03/11/2019 02:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell, et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMAL DEAN
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN ORNELLAS
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN ROBERTS
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN SALIVA
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMULE HILLENBURG
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON WILLIAMS
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCIA CAMERON
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE POE
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL FOS
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN GILLESHAMMER
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANA ZELAYA
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDROMANCHE HARVERY
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAY MITCHELL
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN STETZEL
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIQUE EVANS
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS DOWDLE
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON WESTMAN
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REZA KAMALI
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONCEPCION POWELL
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERICA JONES
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWARD KLANN
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD FARR
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CAMERON CASEY
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANU SOOD
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BARBARA SHADOAN
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC TALASKA
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRENDON WESTMAN
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLORIA PLEDGER
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWIN ZORILLA
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES JONES
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AARON BRODIE
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DON BLACK
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRUCE BIRD
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: APRIL THOMAS
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATTHEW GRAGG
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEN GREGORY
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TRACY KILGORE
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MBEGANE DIOUF
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER K. ZELENY
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID SELS
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ADRIAN THOMPSON
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICIA BURKHALTER
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER ELLSWORTH
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATTHEW C. BISHOP
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TRAVIS ASHBY
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHANELL GOLDEN
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER KING
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARINA RHEA
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AARON HANDS
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RALPH MCCOY
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRENT MILLER
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAWRENCE J. MITCHELL
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ZACHARY CHRISTENSEN
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LORETTA GRADY
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD FOUNTAIN
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LISA STERN
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT MOYER
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KIM WESTON
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCOTT WESTIN
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOUG WATERS
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH W. STEELE, V
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID SELF
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWARD DOWDY
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDREW GORAYEB
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFERY TAYLOR
Represented By: Steven A. Christensen
Represented By: Zane L. Christensen
Represented By: Cameron S. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, National Association, a National Banking Assocaiton
Represented By: Erin J. Cox
Represented By: Elaina M. Maragakis Esq.
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Represented By: Jacob M. Rosenhan
Represented By: Michael D. Mayfield
Represented By: David Halleck Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO & COMPANY, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Erin J. Cox
Represented By: Elaina M. Maragakis Esq.
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Represented By: Jacob M. Rosenhan
Represented By: Michael D. Mayfield
Represented By: David Halleck Fry
Represented By: J. Max Rosen
Represented By: Jacob M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, National Association, a National Banking Assocation
Represented By: Erin J. Cox
Represented By: Elaina M. Maragakis Esq.
Represented By: James S. Jardine
Represented By: Michael D. Mayfield
Represented By: David Halleck Fry
Represented By: J. Max Rosen
Represented By: Jacob M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?