United States v. RaPower-3, et al
Defendant: RAPOWER-3, LLC, R. GREGORY SHEPARD, LTB1 and INTERNATIONAL AUTOMATED SYSTEMS
Respondent: HEIDEMAN & ASSOCIATES, re 290 Motion
Defendant / Appellant: NELDON P. JOHNSON
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-4066
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order [10666671] Order filed by Judges Hartz, Holmes and Eid denying petition for rehearing filed by Appellant Mr. Neldon P. Johnson. [19-4066] [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:20 AM]
July 2, 2019 [10660017] Petition for rehearing filed by Mr. Neldon P. Johnson. Served on 07/01/2019. Manner of Service: email via Utah e-filing (no envelope attached). [19-4066] [Entered: 07/02/2019 01:21 PM]
June 24, 2019 [10657639] Jurisdictional Defect; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished. Judges Hartz, Holmes and Eid. [19-4066] [Entered: 06/24/2019 08:48 AM]
June 13, 2019 [10655588] Appellant's "Reply to Government's Response Regarding Jurisdiction" filed by Mr. Neldon P. Johnson (attachments included only available in hard-copy). Served on 06/12/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4066] [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:32 AM]
June 3, 2019 [10653091] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court on Appellant's Notice of Intent to Respond to the Government's Opposition about Jurisdiction. If the appellant files a reply, it must be filed on or before June 14, 2019 for Neldon P. Johnson. Served on 06/03/2019. [19-4066] [Entered: 06/03/2019 03:17 PM]
June 3, 2019 [10653005] Notice of intent to respond to the government's opposition about jurisdcition filed by Mr. Neldon P. Johnson. Served on 05/31/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4066] [Entered: 06/03/2019 01:43 PM]
May 31, 2019 [10652486] Response filed by United States of America to Court's jurisdictional show cause order entered May 1, 2019, and Appellant's response thereto. Served on 05/31/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4066] CC [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:18 AM]
May 17, 2019 [10649644] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court on Appellant's Response to this court's show cause order regarding jurisdiction. The appellee is directed to file a response to the appellant's response and the court's show cause order of May 1, 2019. Response due on 05/31/2019 for United States of America. Served on 05/17/2019. [19-4066] [Entered: 05/17/2019 03:59 PM]
May 17, 2019 [10649610] Appellant memorandum brief filed by Mr. Neldon P. Johnson. Served on 05/15/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4066] [Entered: 05/17/2019 03:03 PM]
May 14, 2019 [10648595] Entry of appearance filed by Clint Carpenter for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/14/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-4066] [Entered: 05/14/2019 12:21 PM]
May 14, 2019 [10648559] Entry of appearance submitted by Clint A. Carpenter (Lead Counsel) for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/14/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-4066] --[Edited 05/14/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 5/14/19] CC [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:32 AM]
May 1, 2019 [10645361] Jurisdiction challenged. Appellant's memorandum brief due 05/22/2019 for Neldon P. Johnson. (See the attachment for the entire order.) [19-4066] [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:16 PM]
May 1, 2019 [10645301] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/10/2018. Notice of appearance due on 05/31/2019 for Neldon P. Johnson and on 05/15/2019 for United States of America. Fee or ifp forms due 05/31/2019 for Neldon P. Johnson. [19-4066] [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States v. RaPower-3, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPOWER-3, LLC
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Represented By: David E. Leta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. GREGORY SHEPARD
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTB1
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Represented By: David E. Leta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL AUTOMATED SYSTEMS
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Represented By: David E. Leta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NELDON P. JOHNSON
Represented By: Neldon P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joan I. Oppenheimer
Represented By: Christopher J. Moran
Represented By: Clint Carpenter
Represented By: Erin R. Hines
Represented By: Erin Healy Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HEIDEMAN & ASSOCIATES, re 290 Motion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?