United Government Security, et al v. American Eagle Protective, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: UNITED GOVERNMENT SECURITY OFFICERS OF AMERICA INTERNATIONAL UNION and UNITED GOVERNMENT SECURITY OFFICERS OF AMERICA INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 320
Defendant / Appellee: PARAGON SYSTEMS, INC. and AMERICAN EAGLE PROTECTIVE SERVICE, INC.
Case Number: 19-4084
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 [10670312] Minute order filed - Appellees' brief now due 09/12/2019 for American Eagle Protective Service, Inc. and Paragon Systems, Inc.. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4084] [Entered: 08/13/2019 01:53 PM]
August 13, 2019 [10670296] Errata sheet filed by United Government Security Officers of America International Union and United Government Security Officers of America International Union Local 320 to Appellants' Opening Brief. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 08/13/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4084] LIS [Entered: 08/13/2019 01:04 PM]
August 13, 2019 [10670264] Notice of appellants' deficient brief received from Appellants. Type of deficiency: Missing orders appealed. See attached letter for specifics. Appellants' brief due on 08/23/2019 for United Government Security Officers of America International Union and United Government Security Officers of America International Union Local 320 [19-4084] [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:35 AM]
August 13, 2019 [10670261] Minute order filed - Appellees' brief now due 09/09/2019 for American Eagle Protective Service, Inc. and Paragon Systems, Inc.. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4084]--[Edited 08/13/2019 by DD - DISREGARD deadline. No deadline set yet for Appellees' brief] [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:31 AM]
August 9, 2019 [10669657] Appellant's appendix filed by United Government Security Officers of America International Union and United Government Security Officers of America International Union Local 320. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 08/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4084] LIS [Entered: 08/09/2019 12:10 PM]
August 9, 2019 [10669592] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by United Government Security Officers of America International Union Local 320 and United Government Security Officers of America International Union. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 08/09/2019 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4084] --[Edited 08/13/2019 by DD to attach errata sheet] LIS [Entered: 08/09/2019 09:43 AM]
July 3, 2019 [10660440] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/03/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 08/12/2019 for United Government Security Officers of America International Union and United Government Security Officers of America International Union Local 320. [19-4084] [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:55 AM]
July 2, 2019 [10660102] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 07/09/2019 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4084] [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:56 PM]
July 2, 2019 [10660079] Notice received from United Government Security Officers of America International Union and United Government Security Officers of America International Union Local 320 that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 07/02/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4084] LIS [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:36 PM]
June 19, 2019 [10656966] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Frank D. Davis for American Eagle Protective Service, Inc. and Paragon Systems, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4084] [Entered: 06/19/2019 05:20 PM]
June 19, 2019 [10656963] Entry of appearance submitted by Frank D. Davis for Appellees American Eagle Protective Service, Inc. and Paragon Systems, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4084]--[Edited 06/19/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 6/19/19.] FDD [Entered: 06/19/2019 04:51 PM]
June 19, 2019 [10656902] Entry of appearance filed by Dennis M. Coyne and Ms. Lauren I. Scholnick for United Government Security Officers of America International Union and United Government Security Officers of America International Union Local 320. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/19/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4084] [Entered: 06/19/2019 01:52 PM]
June 19, 2019 [10656896] Entry of appearance submitted by Lauren I. Scholnick, Dennis Coyne for Appellants United Government Security Officers of America International Union and United Government Security Officers of America International Union Local 320 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/19/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 06/19/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 6/19/19] [19-4084] LIS [Entered: 06/19/2019 01:43 PM]
June 19, 2019 [10656735] Docketing statement filed by United Government Security Officers of America International Union and United Government Security Officers of America International Union Local 320. Served on 06/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4084] DMC [Entered: 06/19/2019 08:20 AM]
June 18, 2019 [10656442] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/18/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 07/02/2019 for United Government Security Officers of America International Union and United Government Security Officers of America International Union Local 320. Notice of appearance also due on 07/02/2019 for American Eagle Protective Service, Inc. and Paragon Systems, Inc. [19-4084] [Entered: 06/18/2019 08:15 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Government Security, et al v. American Eagle Protective, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNITED GOVERNMENT SECURITY OFFICERS OF AMERICA INTERNATIONAL UNION
Represented By: Lauren I. Scholnick
Represented By: Dennis M. Coyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNITED GOVERNMENT SECURITY OFFICERS OF AMERICA INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 320
Represented By: Lauren I. Scholnick
Represented By: Dennis M. Coyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PARAGON SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Frank D. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN EAGLE PROTECTIVE SERVICE, INC.
Represented By: Frank D. Davis
Represented By: Steven R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?