United States v. RaPower-3, et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: RAPOWER-3, LLC, R. GREGORY SHEPARD, LTB1, NELDON P. JOHNSON and INTERNATIONAL AUTOMATED SYSTEMS
Defendant / Appellant: SOLSTICE ENTERPRISES, INC., XSUN ENERGY, LLC, SOLCO I, LLC, N.P. JOHNSON FAMILY, L.P., STARLIGHT HOLDINGS, INC. and BLACK NIGHT ENTERPRISES, INC.
Not Yet Classified: R. WAYNE KLEIN
Case Number: 19-4089
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 22, 2020 Summary United States v. RaPower-3

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 [10673254] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellants' motion for extension of time to file appellant's opening brief to 09/09/2019 for Black Night Enterprises, Inc., N.P. Johnson Family, L.P., Solco I, LLC, Solstice Enterprises, Inc., Starlight Holdings, Inc. and Xsun Energy, LLC. Served on 08/23/2019. Text only entry - no attachment. (14-day extension.) [19-4089] [Entered: 08/23/2019 03:27 PM]
August 23, 2019 [10673248] Motion filed by Appellants Black Night Enterprises, Inc., N.P. Johnson Family, L.P., Solco I, LLC, Solstice Enterprises, Inc., Starlight Holdings, Inc. and Xsun Energy, LLC to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 09/09/2019. Served on: 08/23/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4089] SRP [Entered: 08/23/2019 03:16 PM]
July 16, 2019 [10663522] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing the parties to specify in their briefs whether this court has jurisdiction to review the district court's order and judgment and whether the extension of the established receivership to the 'Affiliated Entities' is immedately appealable. See order for details. Appellants' opening brief and appendix remain due 8/26/19. Served on 07/16/2019. [19-4089] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:52 PM]
July 15, 2019 [10663229] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/15/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 08/26/2019 for Black Night Enterprises, Inc., N.P. Johnson Family, L.P., Solco I, LLC, Solstice Enterprises, Inc., Starlight Holdings, Inc. and Xsun Energy, LLC. [19-4089] [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:13 PM]
July 12, 2019 [10662899] Attorney Michael S. Lehr for R. Wayne Klein admitted to the bar of this court. [19-4089] [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:45 PM]
July 11, 2019 [10662331] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 08/12/2019 for Michael S. Lehr. [19-4089, 18-4150] [Entered: 07/11/2019 11:07 AM]
July 10, 2019 [10661664] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 07/17/2019 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4089] [Entered: 07/10/2019 07:31 AM]
July 9, 2019 [10661620] Entry of appearance filed by Steven Richard Paul and Denver C. Snuffer, Jr. for Solco I, LLC, Xsun Energy, LLC, N.P. Johnson Family, L.P., Solstice Enterprises, Inc., Black Night Enterprises, Inc., and Starlight Holdings, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4089] [Entered: 07/09/2019 04:01 PM]
July 9, 2019 [10661613] Docketing statement filed by Black Night Enterprises, Inc., N.P. Johnson Family, L.P., Solco I, LLC, Solstice Enterprises, Inc., Starlight Holdings, Inc. and Xsun Energy, LLC. Served on 07/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4089] SRP [Entered: 07/09/2019 03:50 PM]
July 9, 2019 [10661611] Notice received from Jane Doe that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal filed by Black Night Enterprises, Inc., N.P. Johnson Family, L.P., Solco I, LLC, Solstice Enterprises, Inc., Starlight Holdings, Inc. and Xsun Energy, LLC. Served on: 07/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/10/2019 by MLB to correct event code and docket text][19-4089] SRP [Entered: 07/09/2019 03:47 PM]
July 9, 2019 [10661609] Entry of appearance submitted by Denver C. Snuffer, Jr. and Steven R. Paul for Appellants Black Night Enterprises, Inc., N.P. Johnson Family, L.P., Solco I, LLC, Solstice Enterprises, Inc., Starlight Holdings, Inc. and Xsun Energy, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/09/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4089] --[Edited 07/09/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] SRP [Entered: 07/09/2019 03:45 PM]
July 9, 2019 [10661596] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffery A Balls for R. Wayne Klein. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/09/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-4089] [Entered: 07/09/2019 03:32 PM]
July 9, 2019 [10661529] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jonathan O. Hafen, Esq. and Michael S. Lehr for R. Wayne Klein. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/09/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email [19-4089] [Entered: 07/09/2019 02:17 PM]
July 9, 2019 [10661525] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffery A. Balls for Appellee R. Wayne Klein for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/09/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-4089]--[Edited 07/09/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 7/9/19.] MSL [Entered: 07/09/2019 02:15 PM]
July 9, 2019 [10661521] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael S. Lehr and Jonathan O. Hafen for Appellee R. Wayne Klein for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/09/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. --[Edited 07/09/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 7/9/19][19-4089] MSL [Entered: 07/09/2019 02:11 PM]
June 25, 2019 [10657952] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/24/2019 Docketing statement, notice of appearance and transcript order form due 07/09/2019 for Black Night Enterprises, Inc., N.P. Johnson Family, L.P., Solco I, LLC, Solstice Enterprises, Inc., Starlight Holdings, Inc. and Xsun Energy, LLC. Notice of appearance due on 07/09/2019 for R. Wayne Klein [19-4089] [Entered: 06/25/2019 07:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States v. RaPower-3, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPOWER-3, LLC
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. GREGORY SHEPARD
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTB1
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NELDON P. JOHNSON
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL AUTOMATED SYSTEMS
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SOLSTICE ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: XSUN ENERGY, LLC
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SOLCO I, LLC
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: N.P. JOHNSON FAMILY, L.P.
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STARLIGHT HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BLACK NIGHT ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Denver C. Snuffer Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Garriott
Represented By: Steven Richard Paul
Represented By: Joshua D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: R. WAYNE KLEIN
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen Esq.
Represented By: Michael S. Lehr
Represented By: Joseph M.R. Covey
Represented By: Jeffery A. Balls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joan I. Oppenheimer
Represented By: Clint Carpenter
Represented By: Erin R. Hines
Represented By: Erin Healy Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?