Acosta v. Paragon Contractors, et al
Defendant: JAMES JESSOP
Plaintiff / Appellee: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor
Defendant / Appellant: PARAGON CONTRACTORS CORPORATION and BRIAN JESSOP
Not Yet Classified: PAR 2 CONTRACTORS, LLC
Case Number: 19-4097
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 [10676408] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellants' unopposed motion for a 30-day extension of time to file appellants' brief. Appellants' brief and appendix are now due on or before October 11, 2019. No further extensions of time will be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 09/05/2019. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-4097] [Entered: 09/05/2019 03:23 PM]
September 5, 2019 [10676402] Motion filed by Appellants Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation to extend time to file a reply brief until 10/11/2019. Served on: 09/05/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4097] RJS [Entered: 09/05/2019 03:11 PM]
August 2, 2019 [10668027] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/02/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 09/11/2019 for Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation. [19-4097] [Entered: 08/02/2019 05:04 PM]
July 31, 2019 [10667099] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/07/2019 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4097] [Entered: 07/31/2019 08:09 AM]
July 31, 2019 [10667076] Entry of appearance filed by M. Christopher Moon and Rick James Sutherland for Paragon Contractors Corporation and Brian Jessop. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4097] [Entered: 07/31/2019 06:48 AM]
July 30, 2019 [10667052] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation. Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] RJS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:53 PM]
July 30, 2019 [10667048] Docketing statement filed by Paragon Contractors Corporation and Brian Jessop. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] RJS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:52 PM]
July 30, 2019 [10667046] Entry of appearance submitted by Rick J. Sutherland, M. Christopher Moon for Appellants Paragon Contractors Corporation and Brian Jessop for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] --[Edited 07/31/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 7/31/19] RJS [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:51 PM]
July 18, 2019 [10664266] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Mr. Jeffrey E. Nelson's motion to withdraw as appellee's counsel. Served on 07/18/2019. [19-4097] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:28 PM]
July 18, 2019 [10664223] Motion filed by Appellee Mr. R. Alexander Acosta for attorney Jeffrey E. Nelson to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 07/18/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4097] JEN [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:36 PM]
July 18, 2019 [10664222] Entry of appearance filed by Erin M. Mohan for R. Alexander Acosta. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:35 PM]
July 18, 2019 [10664051] Entry of appearance submitted by Erin Mohan for Appellee Mr. R. Alexander Acosta for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4097] --[Edited 07/18/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] EMM [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:05 AM]
July 16, 2019 [10663319] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/16/2019. Docketing statement due 07/30/2019 for Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation. Transcript order form due 07/30/2019 for Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation. Notice of appearance due on 07/30/2019 for R. Alexander Acosta, Brian Jessop and Paragon Contractors Corporation. [19-4097] [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Paragon Contractors, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Karen E. Bobela
Represented By: Alicia Truman
Represented By: John K. Mangum Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Nelson
Represented By: Amanda A. Berndt
Represented By: Lydia A. Tzagoloff
Represented By: Erin M. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PARAGON CONTRACTORS CORPORATION
Represented By: Rick James Sutherland
Represented By: Kenneth A. Okazaki
Represented By: Deborah Rae Chandler
Represented By: Heath H. Snow
Represented By: M. Christopher Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BRIAN JESSOP
Represented By: Rick James Sutherland
Represented By: Kenneth A. Okazaki
Represented By: Deborah Rae Chandler
Represented By: Heath H. Snow
Represented By: M. Christopher Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PAR 2 CONTRACTORS, LLC
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: Melissa J. England
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Matura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES JESSOP
Represented By: Heath H. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?