United States v. T.J. Enterprises, et al
Defendant: CHECKLINE, INC., DBA Check Max, AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, SAVAGE SCAFFOLD & EQUIPMENT, INC., NEW HAMPSHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a member company of, CERTIFIED REPROGRAPHICS, INC., STATE OF UTAH, DEPARTMENT OF WORKFORCE SERVICES, WORKERS COMPENSATION FUND OF UTAH, SALT LAKE COUNTY, UTAH, RDLC MANAGEMENT, STATE OF UTAH TAX COMMISSION and CHEKLINE, INC., DBA Check Max
Defendant / Appellee: GURULE PROPERTIES INCORPORATED, DBA Gurule Properties, Inc., T.J. ENTERPRISES & ACOUSTICAL, INC. and LINDA GURULE, AKA Linda Lee Roach
Plaintiff / Appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-4108
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 [10680573] Mandate issued. [19-4108] [Entered: 09/23/2019 01:03 PM]
September 23, 2019 [10680572] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action. [19-4108] [Entered: 09/23/2019 01:02 PM]
September 23, 2019 [10680568] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting attorney motion to dismiss case. Served on 09/23/2019. Text only entry - no attachment (entered for internal purposes; see subsequent order). [19-4108] [Entered: 09/23/2019 01:01 PM]
September 23, 2019 [10680442] Motion filed by Appellant United States of America to dismiss case. Served on: 09/23/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4108] KGG [Entered: 09/23/2019 09:40 AM]
September 6, 2019 [10676548] Entry of appearance filed by Jeffery Richard Price for T.J. Enterprises & Acoustical, Inc. and Linda Gurule. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (Previously disclosed.). Served on 09/06/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4108] [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:46 AM]
September 6, 2019 [10676537] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffery R. Price for Appellees T.J. Enterprises & Acoustical, Inc., Linda Gurule and Not Party Teddy J. Gurule for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4108] --[Edited 09/06/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 9/6/19] JRP [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:15 AM]
August 27, 2019 [10673759] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance or notice of non-participation now due on 09/06/2019 for Linda Gurule and T.J. Enterprises & Acoustical, Inc. [19-4108] [Entered: 08/27/2019 09:50 AM]
August 20, 2019 [10672135] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 09/09/2019 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-4108] [Entered: 08/20/2019 03:35 PM]
August 19, 2019 [10671768] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/19/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/30/2019 for United States of America. [19-4108] [Entered: 08/19/2019 01:58 PM]
August 16, 2019 [10671275] Entry of appearance filed by Jeffery Richard Price for Gurule Properties Incorporated. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed.). Served on 08/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4108] [Entered: 08/16/2019 10:07 AM]
August 16, 2019 [10671248] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffery R Price for Appellees Gurule Properties Incorporated, Linda Gurule, T.J. Enterprises & Acoustical, Inc. and Not Party Teddy J. Gurule for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4108] --[Edited 08/16/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 8/16/19] JRP [Entered: 08/16/2019 09:31 AM]
August 15, 2019 [10671137] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance or notice of non-participation now due on 08/26/2019 for Linda Gurule, Gurule Properties Incorporated and T.J. Enterprises & Acoustical, Inc. [19-4108] [Entered: 08/15/2019 04:10 PM]
August 13, 2019 [10670272] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/20/2019 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4108] [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:53 AM]
August 13, 2019 [10670258] Docketing statement filed by United States of America. Served on 08/13/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4108] KGG [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:24 AM]
August 13, 2019 [10670250] Notice filed by United States of America that a transcript is not necessary. Served on: 08/13/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4108] --[Edited 08/13/2019 by SLS to correct docket event and text.] KGG [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:20 AM]
August 1, 2019 [10667692] Entry of appearance filed by Karen G. Gregory for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4108] [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:49 PM]
August 1, 2019 [10667643] Entry of appearance submitted by Karen Grace Gregory for Appellant United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4108]--[Edited 08/01/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 8/1/19.] KGG [Entered: 08/01/2019 01:25 PM]
July 31, 2019 [10667147] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/30/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 08/14/2019 for United States of America. Notice of appearance due on 08/14/2019 for Linda Gurule, Gurule Properties Incorporated and T.J. Enterprises & Acoustical, Inc. [19-4108] [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:09 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States v. T.J. Enterprises, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GURULE PROPERTIES INCORPORATED, DBA Gurule Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Represented By: Steven D. Crawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T.J. ENTERPRISES & ACOUSTICAL, INC.
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINDA GURULE, AKA Linda Lee Roach
Represented By: Jeffery Richard Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHECKLINE, INC., DBA Check Max
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAVAGE SCAFFOLD & EQUIPMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW HAMPSHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a member company of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTIFIED REPROGRAPHICS, INC.
Represented By: Jason M. Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF UTAH, DEPARTMENT OF WORKFORCE SERVICES
Represented By: Rhonda B. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORKERS COMPENSATION FUND OF UTAH
Represented By: Ryan L. Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALT LAKE COUNTY, UTAH
Represented By: Valerie M. Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RDLC MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF UTAH TAX COMMISSION
Represented By: Stephen W. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEKLINE, INC., DBA Check Max
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: John K. Mangum Jr.
Represented By: Karen G. Gregory
Represented By: Ryan S. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?