Cromar, et al v. United States, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WANDA I. MANLEY, JOAN FLACH, AKA Joan Flack, RYAN S. WATSON, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, NANCY K. PHILLIPS, R. A. MITCHELL, WILLIAM P. BARR, DOJ Attorney General and ROBERT J. SHELBY
Plaintiff / Appellant: BARBARA ANN CROMAR and PAUL KENNETH CROMAR
Case Number: 19-4129
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 12, 2020 Cromar v. United States

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 [10685234] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1 - pleadings. [19-4129] [Entered: 10/08/2019 08:06 AM]
October 7, 2019 [10684959] Entry of appearance filed by Barbara Ann Cromar and Paul Kenneth Cromar. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/03/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-4129] [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:22 PM]
October 4, 2019 [10684729] Jurisdictional review complete. Notice of appearance due on 11/13/2019 for Barbara Ann Cromar and Paul Kenneth Cromar. Appellant's brief due on 11/13/2019 for Barbara Ann Cromar and Paul Kenneth Cromar. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 10/25/2019. [19-4129] [Entered: 10/04/2019 03:45 PM]
October 4, 2019 [10684726] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 10/04/2019. [19-4129] [Entered: 10/04/2019 03:43 PM]
September 23, 2019 [10680763] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Robert Joel Branman, Esq. for United States of America, Mr. Ryan S. Watson, Ms. Nancy K. Phillips and Ms. Wanda I. Manley and William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4129] [Entered: 09/23/2019 04:13 PM]
September 23, 2019 [10680709] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert J. Branman for Appellees United States of America, Mr. Ryan S. Watson, Ms. Nancy K. Phillips, Ms. Wanda I. Manley and Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/23/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-4129]--[Edited 09/23/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 9/23/19.] RJB [Entered: 09/23/2019 03:19 PM]
September 19, 2019 [10679610] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance or notice of non-participation now due on 09/30/2019 for William P. Barr. [19-4129] [Entered: 09/19/2019 08:26 AM]
September 16, 2019 [10678638] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Robert Joel Branman, Esq. for Mr. Ryan S. Watson, United States of America, Ms. Nancy K. Phillips and Ms. Wanda I. Manley. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4129] [Entered: 09/16/2019 11:03 AM]
September 16, 2019 [10678596] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert J. Branman (lead counsel) for Appellees Ms. Wanda I. Manley, Ms. Nancy K. Phillips, United States of America and Mr. Ryan S. Watson for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/16/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-4129]--[Edited 09/16/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 9/16/19.] RJB [Entered: 09/16/2019 09:35 AM]
September 4, 2019 [10676003] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/04/2019. Fee or ifp forms due 10/04/2019 for Barbara Ann Cromar and Paul Kenneth Cromar. Notice of appearance due on 09/18/2019 for William P. Barr, Wanda I. Manley, Nancy K. Phillips, United States of America and Ryan S. Watson and on 10/04/2019 for Barbara Ann Cromar and Paul Kenneth Cromar. [19-4129] [Entered: 09/04/2019 04:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cromar, et al v. United States, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WANDA I. MANLEY
Represented By: John K. Mangum Jr.
Represented By: Charles M. Duffy
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOAN FLACH, AKA Joan Flack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN S. WATSON
Represented By: Charles M. Duffy
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jared Carl Bennett
Represented By: John K. Mangum Jr.
Represented By: Charles M. Duffy
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY K. PHILLIPS
Represented By: Charles M. Duffy
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. A. MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, DOJ Attorney General
Represented By: Charles M. Duffy
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT J. SHELBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BARBARA ANN CROMAR
Represented By: Barbara Ann Cromar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL KENNETH CROMAR
Represented By: Paul Kenneth Cromar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?