Ortiz v. Perry, et al

Defendant: DAVE ROBERSON, individually
Defendant / Appellee: CHARLES PERRY, individually, MATTHEW POWELL, individually and JOSH BURSON, individually
Plaintiff / Appellant: CYNTHIA ORTIZ
Case Number: 19-5003
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order [10627191] Order filed by Judges Tymkovich, Lucero and Carson construing appellant's Motion for Full Panel Rehearing as a petition for panel and denying it as construed. [19-5003] [Entered: 02/15/2019 12:28 PM]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order [10627186] Order filed by Judges Tymkovich, Lucero and Carson denying appellant's notice of error/motion to correct. Served on 02/15/2019. [19-5003] [Entered: 02/15/2019 12:25 PM]
February 14, 2019 [10627035] Motion for Full Panel Rehearing filed by Ms. Cynthia Ortiz. Served on 02/06/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-5003] [Entered: 02/14/2019 05:16 PM]
February 14, 2019 [10627033] Appellant's motion filed by Ms. Cynthia Ortiz Notice of Error /Motion to Correct. Served on 02/06/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-5003] [Entered: 02/14/2019 05:02 PM]
February 14, 2019 This entry has been removed from the docket. [JMN to show this as being filed by the court on 2/14/19. ] [10626971] Petition for Full Panel Rehearing received from Ms. Cynthia Ortiz but not filed. Appellant also included a CD Rom of Exhbits attached to back of petition. Served on 02/06/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-5003] [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:09 PM]
February 14, 2019 This entry has been removed from the docket. [JMN to show this as being filed by the court on 2/14/19.] [10626967] Notice of Error/Motion to Correct received from Ms. Cynthia Ortiz but not filed. Served on 02/06/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-5003] [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:07 PM]
February 14, 2019 [10626964] Misc Corr requesting email notification and attaching copy of Id card received from Ms. Cynthia Ortiz but not filed. Served on 02/06/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-5003] [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:06 PM]
February 14, 2019 [10626961] Entry of appearance received from Ms. Cynthia Ortiz but not filed. Served on 02/06/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-5003] [Entered: 02/14/2019 03:05 PM]
January 22, 2019 [10620409] Jurisdictional Defect; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished; Judges Tymkovich, Lucero and Carson. [19-5003] [Entered: 01/22/2019 09:40 AM]
January 18, 2019 [10619992] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Alan Warman for Mr. Charles Perry. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (already listed in the appeal). Served on 01/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5003] [Entered: 01/18/2019 08:34 AM]
January 18, 2019 [10619976] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark Alan Warman for Appellee Mr. Charles Perry for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5003]--[Edited 01/18/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] MAW [Entered: 01/18/2019 08:21 AM]
January 17, 2019 [10619849] Entry of appearance filed by Seth Byron Dennis for Josh Burson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5003] [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:12 PM]
January 17, 2019 [10619823] Entry of appearance submitted by Seth Byron Dennis for Appellee Mr. Josh Burson for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5003] --[Edited 01/17/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/17/19] SBD [Entered: 01/17/2019 02:40 PM]
January 16, 2019 [10619334] Order filed by Clerk of the Court correcting the caption and clarifying the appellees. Served on 01/16/2019. (See the attachment for the entire order.) [19-5003]--[Edited 01/17/2019 by KLP to correct the attachment.] [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:01 PM]
January 9, 2019 [10617559] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/09/2018 Notice of appearance due on 01/23/2019 for Josh Burson, Charles Perry, Matthew Powell and Dave Roberson and on 02/08/2019 for Cynthia Ortiz.[19-5003]--[Edited 01/17/2019 by KLP to delete the IFP reference (IFP granted in district court on 10/23/17) and attach an amended letter.] [Entered: 01/09/2019 04:51 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Perry, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES PERRY, individually
Represented By: Mark Alan Warman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW POWELL, individually
Represented By: William S. Helfand
Represented By: Norman Ray Giles
Represented By: Robert S. Lafferrandre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSH BURSON, individually
Represented By: Seth Byron Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE ROBERSON, individually
Represented By: David Charles Youll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CYNTHIA ORTIZ
Represented By: Cynthia Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?