Doe v. Hunter, et al
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, MIKE HUNTER, in his official capacity as Oklahoma Attorney General, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, in his official capacity as Acting U.S. Attorney General, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MARY FALLIN, in her official capacity as Oklahoma Governor and KEVIN STITT
Plaintiff / Appellant: JANE DOE, minor child who is unborn, by and through her father and next friend, John Doe
Case Number: 19-5005
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 6, 2019 Doe v. Hunter

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 [10634947] Minute order filed - Appellees' brief now due 04/18/2019 for Kevin Stitt, Matthew G. Whitaker, U.S. Department of Justice, Mike Hunter and United States of America. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-5005] [Entered: 03/21/2019 01:41 PM]
March 19, 2019 [10634383] Appellant's appendix filed by Jane Doe. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 03/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-5005] KLB [Entered: 03/19/2019 08:14 PM]
March 19, 2019 [10634382] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Jane Doe. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 03/19/2019 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-5005] KLB [Entered: 03/19/2019 08:11 PM]
February 7, 2019 [10625238] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 02/07/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 03/19/2019 for Jane Doe. [19-5005] [Entered: 02/07/2019 01:40 PM]
February 6, 2019 [10624984] Entry of appearance filed by Daniel C. Nunley and Kristine L. Brown for Jane Doe. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/06/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5005] [Entered: 02/06/2019 03:41 PM]
February 6, 2019 [10624924] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 02/13/2019 for Mark C. McCartt, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-5005] [Entered: 02/06/2019 02:06 PM]
February 6, 2019 [10624910] Docketing statement filed by Jane Doe. Served on 02/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5005] KLB [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:45 PM]
February 6, 2019 [10624907] Notice received from Jane Doe that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 02/06/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5005] KLB [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:41 PM]
February 6, 2019 [10624904] Entry of appearance submitted by Kristine L. Brown and Daniel C. Nunley for Appellant Jane Doe for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5005] --[Edited 02/06/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/6/19] KLB [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:37 PM]
February 1, 2019 [10623688] Entry of appearance filed by Cathryn Dawn McClanahan for United States of America, U.S. Department of Justice and Matthew G. Whitaker. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5005] [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:08 PM]
February 1, 2019 [10623671] Entry of appearance submitted by Cathryn D. McClanahan for Appellees U.S. Department of Justice, United States of America and Matthew G. Whitaker for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5005] --[Edited 02/01/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/1/19] CDM [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:39 PM]
January 25, 2019 [10621741] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Zachary Paul West for Mr. Mike Hunter and Mr. Kevin Stitt. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (already listed in the appeal). Served on 01/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5005] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:35 PM]
January 25, 2019 [10621730] Entry of appearance submitted by Zach West for Appellees Mr. Mike Hunter and Mary Fallin for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5005]--[Edited 01/25/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] ZPW [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:16 PM]
January 23, 2019 [10621022] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/23/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 02/06/2019 for Jane Doe. Notice of appearance due on 02/06/2019 for Mary Fallin, Mike Hunter, U.S. Department of Justice, United States of America and Matthew G. Whitaker [19-5005] [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Hunter, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Cathryn Dawn McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE HUNTER, in his official capacity as Oklahoma Attorney General
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, in his official capacity as Acting U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Cathryn Dawn McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Cathryn Dawn McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARY FALLIN, in her official capacity as Oklahoma Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN STITT
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANE DOE, minor child who is unborn, by and through her father and next friend, John Doe
Represented By: Daniel Clarence Nunley
Represented By: Kristine L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?