Glossip, et al v. Gross, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MICHAEL W. ROACH, DIANNE B. OWENS, LAURA PITTMAN, JAMES M. TILLY, H-UNIT SECTION CHIEF, EDWARD EVANS, Warden, Associate Director of Field Operations, FRAZIER HENKE, SPECIAL OPERATIONS TEAM MEMBERS #1-10, JOHN T. HOLDER, GREG WILLIAMS, Division Manager of West Institutions, IV TEAM MEMBERS#1-10, SPECIAL OPERATIONS TEAM LEADER, IRMA J. NEWBURN, JOE M. ALLBAUGH, IV TEAM LEADER, MIKE CARPENTER, KEVIN J. GROSS, ANITA K. TRAMMELL, Warden Oklahoma State Penitentiary, DAVID PARKER, Division Manager of East Institutions, GENE HAYNES, ADAM LUCK and ROBERT C PATTON
Plaintiff / Appellee: ALFRED B. MITCHELL, JOHN M. GRANT, BENJAMIN R. COLE, by and through his next friend Robert S. Jackson, TREMANE WOOD, SHELTON D. JACKSON, JAMES A. CODDINGTON, RICHARD S. FAIRCHILD, PHILLIP D. HANCOCK, CARLOS CUESTA-RODRIGUEZ, JAMES D. PAVATT, JULIUS D. JONES, NICHOLAS ALEXANDER DAVIS, KEVIN R. UNDERWOOD, RAYMOND E. JOHNSON, BRENDA E. ANDREW, WENDELL A. GRISSOM, RICHARD E. GLOSSIP, KENDRICK A. SIMPSON, EMMANUEL A. LITTLEJOHN and MARLON D. HARMON
Petitioner / Appellant: WADE LAY
Case Number: 19-6002
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 [10626466] Memorandum Brief received from Wade Lay but not filed. Original only. Served on 02/06/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. (This document crossed in the mail with the 2/8/19 dismissal order.) [19-6002] [Entered: 02/13/2019 08:23 AM]
February 8, 2019 [10625439] Mandate issued. [19-6002] [Entered: 02/08/2019 08:37 AM]
February 8, 2019 [10625438] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [19-6002] [Entered: 02/08/2019 08:36 AM]
February 8, 2019 [10625429] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's letter motion to dismiss. Text only entry - no attachment. (See the case termination entry for the order.) [19-6002] [Entered: 02/08/2019 08:12 AM]
February 7, 2019 [10625425] Appellant's two letters filed by Wade Lay (construed as a motion to dismiss). Served on 02/08/2019. Manner of Service: Clerk via email. [19-6002] [Entered: 02/08/2019 08:05 AM]
February 6, 2019 [10624731] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief, fee or 1915 forms and Notice of Appearance due 03/18/2019 for Wade Lay. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 02/27/2019. [19-6002] [Entered: 02/06/2019 06:59 AM]
February 4, 2019 [10624277] Notice of non-participation filed by David B. Autry for David B. Autry. Date of Service: 02/04/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6002] DBA [Entered: 02/04/2019 05:57 PM]
February 1, 2019 [10623770] Notice of non-participation filed by Mark Henricksen for Shelton Jackson, Brenda Andrew, Phillip Hancock and Richard Glossip. Date of Service: 02/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6002] MH [Entered: 02/01/2019 02:58 PM]
January 30, 2019 [10623044] Order filed by Clerk - Appellant's letter will be construed as a motion for voluntary dismissal unless, appellant provides written notification to the court that he does in fact wish to continue pursuing the appeal. Response due on 02/20/2019 for Wade Lay. Served on 01/30/2019. [19-6002] [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:19 PM]
January 30, 2019 [10623042] Appellant's letter construed as a motion to voluntarily dismissal filed by Wade Lay to dismiss case. Served on 01/24/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-6002] [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:17 PM]
January 30, 2019 [10622962] Notice of non-participation filed by Patti Palmer Ghezzi for Patti Palmer Ghezzi. Date of Service: 01/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6002] --[Edited 01/30/2019 by DD to attach Certificate of Service] PPG [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:31 PM]
January 30, 2019 [10622729] Copy of pleading filed in the district court received from Wade Lay but not filed. Served on 01/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6002] [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:16 AM]
January 28, 2019 [10622125] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Dale A. Baich for Tremane Wood, Kevin R. Underwood, Kendrick A. Simpson, James D. Pavatt, Alfred B. Mitchell, Emmanuel A. Littlejohn, Julius D. Jones, Raymond E. Johnson, Shelton D. Jackson, Marlon D. Harmon, Phillip D. Hancock, Wendell A. Grissom, Richard S. Fairchild, Nicholas Alexander Davis, Carlos Cuesta-Rodriguez, James A. Coddington, Brenda E. Andrew, Benjamin R. Cole, John M. Grant, Richard E. Glossip and Tremane Wood. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6002] [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:51 PM]
January 28, 2019 [10622054] Entry of appearance submitted by Dale A. Baich for Appellees Richard E. Glossip, James A. Coddington, Benjamin R. Cole, Shelton D. Jackson, Carlos Cuesta-Rodriguez, Nicholas Alexander Davis, Richard S. Fairchild, John M. Grant, Wendell A. Grissom, Marlon D. Harmon, Raymond E. Johnson, Emmanuel A. Littlejohn, James D. Pavatt, Kendrick A. Simpson, Kevin R. Underwood, Brenda E. Andrew, Phillip D. Hancock, Julius D. Jones, Alfred B. Mitchell and Tremane Wood for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/28/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-6002]--[Edited 01/28/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DAB [Entered: 01/28/2019 01:05 PM]
January 28, 2019 [10621947] Entry of appearance filed by Lexie P. Norwood for Mr. Greg Williams, Anita K. Trammell, James M. Tilly, Robert C Patton, David Parker, Ms. Irma J. Newburn, John T. Holder and Edward Evans. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/25/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-6002] [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:10 AM]
January 28, 2019 [10621885] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard Mann for Mr. Greg Williams, Anita K. Trammell, James M. Tilly, Robert C Patton, David Parker, Ms. Irma J. Newburn, John T. Holder and Edward Evans. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-6002] [Entered: 01/28/2019 08:39 AM]
January 25, 2019 [10621845] Entry of appearance filed by Jeb Emmet Joseph for David Parker, Greg Williams, Edward Evans, Anita K. Trammell, Irma J. Newburn, John T. Holder, James M. Tilly and Robert C Patton. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/25/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-6002] [Entered: 01/25/2019 05:01 PM]
January 25, 2019 [10621842] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeb E. Joseph for Appellees Edward Evans, John T. Holder, Ms. Irma J. Newburn, David Parker, Robert C Patton, James M. Tilly, Anita K. Trammell and Mr. Greg Williams for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/25/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-6002] --[Edited 01/25/2019 by SLS to remove PDF file from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JEJ [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:49 PM]
January 25, 2019 [10621841] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard N. Mann for Appellees Edward Evans, John T. Holder, Ms. Irma J. Newburn, David Parker, Robert C Patton, James M. Tilly, Anita K. Trammell and Mr. Greg Williams for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/25/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-6002]--[Edited 01/28/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] RM [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:47 PM]
January 25, 2019 [10621839] Entry of appearance submitted by Lexie P. Norwood for Appellees Robert C Patton, Anita K. Trammell, Edward Evans, John T. Holder, Ms. Irma J. Newburn, James M. Tilly, David Parker and Mr. Greg Williams for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/25/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-6002]--[Edited 01/28/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 1/28/19.] LPN [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:45 PM]
January 24, 2019 [10621230] Deficiency notice issued. Appellees' notices of appearance past due. Notices of appearance now due by 02/04/2019 for Brenda E. Andrew, James A. Coddington, Benjamin R. Cole, Carlos Cuesta-Rodriguez, Nicholas Alexander Davis, Edward Evans, Warden, Richard S. Fairchild, Richard E. Glossip, John M. Grant, Wendell A. Grissom, Kevin J. Gross, Phillip D. Hancock, Marlon D. Harmon, Gene Haynes, Frazier Henke, John T. Holder, Shelton D. Jackson, Raymond E. Johnson, Julius D. Jones, Emmanuel A. Littlejohn, Alfred B. Mitchell, Irma J. Newburn, David Parker, Robert C Patton, James D. Pavatt, Michael W. Roach, Kendrick A. Simpson, James M. Tilly, Anita K. Trammell, Kevin R. Underwood, Greg Williams and Tremane Wood [19-6002] [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:43 AM]
January 7, 2019 [10616824] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/04/2009. Fee or 1915 forms due 02/06/2019 for Wade Lay. Notice of appearance due on 02/06/2019 for Wade Lay, and Notice of appearance due on 01/22/2019 for Brenda E. Andrew, James A. Coddington, Benjamin R. Cole, Carlos Cuesta-Rodriguez, Nicholas Alexander Davis, Edward Evans, Warden, Richard S. Fairchild, Richard E. Glossip, John M. Grant, Wendell A. Grissom, Kevin J. Gross, Phillip D. Handock, Marlon D. Harmon, Gene Haynes, Frazier Henke, John T. Holder, Shelton D. Jackson, Raymond E. Johnson, Julius D. Jones, Emmanuel A. Littlejohn, Alfred B. Mitchell, Irma J. Newburn, David Parker, Robert C Patton, James D. Pavatt, Michael W. Roach, Kendrick A. Simpson, James M. Tilly, Anita K. Trammell, Kevin R. Underwood, Greg Williams and Tremane Wood. [19-6002] [Entered: 01/07/2019 03:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glossip, et al v. Gross, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL W. ROACH
Represented By: John David Hadden Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIANNE B. OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURA PITTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES M. TILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H-UNIT SECTION CHIEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDWARD EVANS, Warden, Associate Director of Field Operations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRAZIER HENKE
Represented By: John David Hadden Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPECIAL OPERATIONS TEAM MEMBERS #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN T. HOLDER
Represented By: Lexie P. Norwood
Represented By: Jeb Emmet Joseph
Represented By: Richard Mann
Represented By: John David Hadden Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG WILLIAMS, Division Manager of West Institutions
Represented By: Lexie P. Norwood
Represented By: Jeb Emmet Joseph
Represented By: Richard Mann
Represented By: John David Hadden Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IV TEAM MEMBERS#1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPECIAL OPERATIONS TEAM LEADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IRMA J. NEWBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOE M. ALLBAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IV TEAM LEADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN J. GROSS
Represented By: John David Hadden Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANITA K. TRAMMELL, Warden Oklahoma State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID PARKER, Division Manager of East Institutions
Represented By: Lexie P. Norwood
Represented By: Jeb Emmet Joseph
Represented By: Richard Mann
Represented By: John David Hadden Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENE HAYNES
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADAM LUCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT C PATTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALFRED B. MITCHELL
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN M. GRANT
Represented By: Robin C. Konrad
Represented By: Randy A. Bauman
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BENJAMIN R. COLE, by and through his next friend Robert S. Jackson
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Robin C. Konrad
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TREMANE WOOD
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Robin C. Konrad
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHELTON D. JACKSON
Represented By: Mark Henricksen
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES A. CODDINGTON
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD S. FAIRCHILD
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Randy A. Bauman
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PHILLIP D. HANCOCK
Represented By: Mark Henricksen
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARLOS CUESTA-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Randy A. Bauman
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES D. PAVATT
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Randy A. Bauman
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JULIUS D. JONES
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NICHOLAS ALEXANDER DAVIS
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Randy A. Bauman
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEVIN R. UNDERWOOD
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Randy A. Bauman
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAYMOND E. JOHNSON
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Randy A. Bauman
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRENDA E. ANDREW
Represented By: Mark Henricksen
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WENDELL A. GRISSOM
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Randy A. Bauman
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD E. GLOSSIP
Represented By: Mark Henricksen
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Robin C. Konrad
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENDRICK A. SIMPSON
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Randy A. Bauman
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EMMANUEL A. LITTLEJOHN
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Randy A. Bauman
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARLON D. HARMON
Represented By: Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Represented By: Randy A. Bauman
Represented By: Dale A. Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: WADE LAY
Represented By: Wade Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?