Foreman v. Elam, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JONNA PERRY, Case manager at Jackie Brannon Correctional Center and in her individual capacity, SERGEANT DAVID SUMMERS, and in his individual capacity, ROBERT RICHARD EDDE, M.D., Jess Dunn Correctional Center and in his individual capacity, JOEL BRENT MCCURDY, M.D., Director of Medical Services for the Oklahoma Department of Corrections and in his individual capacity, TERESA DELORIS ELAM, LPN, Jess Dunn Correctional Center and in her individual capacity, J. MARLAR, M.D., and in his individual capacity, MICHELLE LEHNUS, Medical Services Administrator, Jess Dunn Correctional Center and in her individual capacity, HEATHER HASENMEYER, Physician Assistant at Jess Dunn Correctional Center and in her individual capacity, AKA Heather Hansmeyer and ROBERT CORNEL BALOGH, M.D., Joseph Harp Correctional Center and in his individual capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: ASA S. FOREMAN, AKA Asa S. Forman
Case Number: 19-7020
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 6, 2019 Foreman v. Elam

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 [10652743] Minute order filed - Appellees' brief now due 07/01/2019 for Robert Cornel Balogh, Robert Richard Edde, Teresa Deloris Elam, Heather Hasenmeyer, Michelle Lehnus, J. Marlar, Joel Brent McCurdy, Jonna Perry and David Summers. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-7020] [Entered: 05/31/2019 04:53 PM]
May 30, 2019 [10652252] Errata sheet filed by Asa S. Foreman to Appellant's Brief. Served on 05/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7020] DKH [Entered: 05/30/2019 10:23 AM]
May 28, 2019 [10651634] Notice of appellant's deficient brief received from Asa S. Foreman. See attached letter for specifics. Appellant's errata sheet or corrected brief due on 06/07/2019 for Asa S. Foreman. [19-7020] [Entered: 05/28/2019 02:06 PM]
May 23, 2019 [10650894] Appellant's appendix filed by Asa S. Foreman. Total number of volumes filed: 1. Served on 05/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-7020] --[Edited 05/28/2019 by SLS to replace PDF with corrected bookmarks.] DKH [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:32 AM]
May 23, 2019 [10650879] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Asa S. Foreman. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 05/23/2019 by email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-7020] --[Edited 05/28/2019 by SLS to note the brief has been cited as deficient.] DKH [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:27 AM]
April 23, 2019 [10643339] Filed notice record is complete. Text only entry on the district court docket. Served on 04/23/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 06/03/2019 for Asa S. Foreman. [19-7020] [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:50 AM]
April 23, 2019 [10643303] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Kari Hawkins for J. Marlar, Teresa Deloris Elam, Robert Richard Edde, M.D., Michelle Lehnus, Robert Cornel Balogh, M.D., Joel Brent McCurdy, M.D., Heather Hasenmeyer, Jonna Perry and Sergeant David Summers. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/23/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-7020] [Entered: 04/23/2019 10:47 AM]
April 23, 2019 [10643268] Entry of appearance filed by Jon Williford for J. Marlar, Teresa Deloris Elam, Robert Richard Edde, M.D., Michelle Lehnus, Robert Cornel Balogh, M.D., Joel Brent McCurdy, M.D., Heather Hasenmeyer, Jonna Perry and Sergeant David Summers. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7020] [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:33 AM]
April 23, 2019 [10643265] Entry of appearance submitted by Jon Williford for Appellees Robert Cornel Balogh, M.D., Robert Richard Edde, M.D., Teresa Deloris Elam, Heather Hasenmeyer, Michelle Lehnus, J. Marlar, Joel Brent McCurdy, M.D., Jonna Perry and Sergeant David Summers for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/23/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7020]--[Edited 04/23/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] JW [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:22 AM]
April 23, 2019 [10643263] Entry of appearance submitted by Kari Y. Hawkins for Appellees Robert Cornel Balogh, M.D., Robert Richard Edde, M.D., Teresa Deloris Elam, Heather Hasenmeyer, Michelle Lehnus, J. Marlar, Joel Brent McCurdy, M.D., Jonna Perry and Sergeant David Summers for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/23/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7020]--[Edited 04/23/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 4/23/19.] KH [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:20 AM]
April 23, 2019 [10643258] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Debra K Hampton for Asa S. Foreman. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 04/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7020] [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:18 AM]
April 23, 2019 [10643239] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 04/30/2019 for Patrick Keaney, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-7020] [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:02 AM]
April 23, 2019 [10643182] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Asa S. Foreman. A transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 04/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/23/2019 by MLB to edit docket text and event code][19-7020] DKH [Entered: 04/23/2019 07:00 AM]
April 23, 2019 [10643181] Docketing statement filed by Asa S. Foreman. Served on 04/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7020] DKH [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:57 AM]
April 23, 2019 [10643180] Entry of appearance submitted by Debra K. Hampton for Appellant Asa S. Foreman for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 04/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7020]--[Edited 04/23/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DKH [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:55 AM]
April 9, 2019 [10639868] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/09/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form and Notice of Appearance due 04/23/2019 for Asa S. Foreman. Notice of appearance also due on 04/23/2019 for Robert Cornel Balogh, Robert Richard Edde, Teresa Deloris Elam, Heather Hasenmeyer, Michelle Lehnus, J. Marlar, Joel Brent McCurdy, Jonna Perry and David Summers [19-7020] [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Foreman v. Elam, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONNA PERRY, Case manager at Jackie Brannon Correctional Center and in her individual capacity
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Represented By: Jon Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT DAVID SUMMERS, and in his individual capacity
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Represented By: Jon Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT RICHARD EDDE, M.D., Jess Dunn Correctional Center and in his individual capacity
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Represented By: Jon Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOEL BRENT MCCURDY, M.D., Director of Medical Services for the Oklahoma Department of Corrections and in his individual capacity
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Represented By: Jon Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERESA DELORIS ELAM, LPN, Jess Dunn Correctional Center and in her individual capacity
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Represented By: Jon Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. MARLAR, M.D., and in his individual capacity
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Represented By: Jon Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHELLE LEHNUS, Medical Services Administrator, Jess Dunn Correctional Center and in her individual capacity
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Represented By: Jon Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEATHER HASENMEYER, Physician Assistant at Jess Dunn Correctional Center and in her individual capacity, AKA Heather Hansmeyer
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Represented By: Jon Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT CORNEL BALOGH, M.D., Joseph Harp Correctional Center and in his individual capacity
Represented By: Kari Hawkins
Represented By: Jon Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ASA S. FOREMAN, AKA Asa S. Forman
Represented By: Debra K. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?