United States v. Barrett
Defendant / Appellant: KENNETH EUGENE BARRETT
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-7049
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 19, 2021 Summary United States v. Barrett

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 [10699786] Minute order filed - Appellant/Petitioner's brief due on 01/13/2020 for Kenneth Eugene Barrett. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-7049] [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:29 AM]
December 4, 2019 [10699783] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 12 (This record was docketed in two transactions due to file size) Comments: Volume 6 - Sealed Pleadings, Volume 7 - Sealed Pleadings, Volume 8 - Sealed Pleadings, Volume 9 - Sealed Pleadings, Volume 10 - Sealed Pleadings, Volume 11 - Criminal Docket & Judgment, Volume 12 - 3 Boxes of Exhibits (Hard Copy Only). Hard copy filed in volume. Appellant/Petitioner's brief due on 01/13/2020 for Kenneth Eugene Barrett. [19-7049] [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:26 AM]
December 4, 2019 [10699775] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 12 (This record was docketed in two transactions due to file size) Comments: Volume 1 - Pleadings, Volume 2 - Pleadings, Volume 3 - Pleadings, Volume 4 - Pleadings, Volume 5 - Pleadings. Hard copy filed in volume. [19-7049] [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:09 AM]
December 2, 2019 [10699147] Sealed Ex Parte Proposed litigation budget filed by Mr. David B. Autry for Kenneth Eugene Barrett. [19-7049] [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:45 PM]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order [10691935] Order filed by Judge Murphy granting appellant's motion to continue appointment. CJA budget proposal and supporting memorandum due on 12/02/2019 for Kenneth Eugene Barrett. Appellants opening brief shall be filed and served within 40 days of the date the record on appeal is docketed. Served on 11/04/2019. [19-7049] [Entered: 11/04/2019 09:12 AM]
October 25, 2019 [10690089] Attorney Ms. Heather E. Williams for Kenneth Eugene Barrett admitted to the bar of this court. [19-7049] [Entered: 10/25/2019 04:48 PM]
October 23, 2019 [10689242] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 11/22/2019 for Heather E. Williams. [19-7049] [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:54 AM]
October 21, 2019 [10688731] Minute order filed - Record on appeal due district court 11/12/2019. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-7049] [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:19 PM]
October 21, 2019 [10688721] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David B. Autryt, Ms. Joan M. Fisher, Carrie Ward and Heather E. Williams for Kenneth Eugene Barrett. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/21/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-7049] [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:08 PM]
October 21, 2019 [10688645] Motion filed by Appellant Kenneth Eugene Barrett to continue appointment. Served on: 10/21/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-7049] JMF [Entered: 10/21/2019 01:58 PM]
October 21, 2019 [10688641] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Kenneth Eugene Barrett. Transcript ordered: Already on file, ordered previously on appeal number 12-7086 and 06-7005. Served on: 10/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7049] JMF [Entered: 10/21/2019 01:56 PM]
October 21, 2019 [10688636] Entry of appearance submitted by David Autry, Joan Fisher, Carrie Ward for Appellant Kenneth Eugene Barrett for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7049]--[Edited 10/21/2019 by PDW to remove the PDF from this entry and attach it to a subsequent entry] JMF [Entered: 10/21/2019 01:53 PM]
October 21, 2019 [10688634] Docketing statement filed by Kenneth Eugene Barrett. Served on 10/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7049] JMF [Entered: 10/21/2019 01:52 PM]
October 21, 2019 [10688633] Designation of record filed by Appellant Kenneth Eugene Barrett. Served on 10/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7049] JMF [Entered: 10/21/2019 01:51 PM]
October 17, 2019 [10687913] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffrey Bradford Kahan for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-7049] [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:09 PM]
October 17, 2019 [10687905] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey B. Kahan for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7049] --[Edited 10/17/2019 by KJS to remove PDF for filing in subsequent filing] JBK [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:00 PM]
October 8, 2019 [10685400] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/07/2019,10/07/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form, designation of record, motion to continue appointment due 10/22/2019 for Kenneth Eugene Barrett. Notice of appearance due on 10/22/2019 for Kenneth Eugene Barrett and United States of America. [19-7049] [Entered: 10/08/2019 12:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States v. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KENNETH EUGENE BARRETT
Represented By: David B. Autry
Represented By: Heather E. Williams
Represented By: Joan M. Fisher
Represented By: Carrie Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jeffrey Bradford Kahan
Represented By: Sheldon J. Sperling
Represented By: Christopher Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?