Ulloa-Lucio v. Barr
Petitioner: DAVID ULLOA-LUCIO
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting United States Attorney General and WILLIAM P. BARR, Acting United States Attorney General
Case Number: 19-9508
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 [10629551] Agency record filed. Number of volumes filed: 1. [19-9508] TS [Entered: 02/27/2019 09:45 AM]
February 22, 2019 [10628685] Jurisdictional Defect; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished; Judges Hartz, Holmes and Bacharach. [19-9508] [Entered: 02/22/2019 12:52 PM]
February 21, 2019 [10628423] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Robert Michael Stalzer for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/21/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-9508] [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:41 PM]
February 21, 2019 [10628410] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert Michael Stalzer for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/21/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-9508]--[Edited 02/21/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 2/21/2019] RMS [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:11 PM]
February 19, 2019 [10627792] Appellant/Petitioner's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed by David Ulloa-Lucio. Served on 02/19/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-9508] MHS [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:41 PM]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order [10626912] Order filed by Judges Holmes and Eid denying Petitioner's motion for stay of removal filed by Petitioner David Ulloa-Lucio. Served on 02/14/2019. [19-9508] [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:31 PM]
February 11, 2019 [10626022] Entry of appearance filed by Mitchell H. Shen for David Ulloa-Lucio. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/06/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. Counsel is reminded that all pleadings must be filed using the court's CM/ECF system. [19-9508] [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:08 PM]
February 7, 2019 [10625172] Order filed by Clerk of the Court upon review of Petitioner's Motion for Late Filing. Petitioner's memorandum brief addressing the issue of whether the court may grant this motion due 03/21/2019 for David Ulloa-Lucio. See attached order for further information. Served on 02/07/2019. [19-9508] [Entered: 02/07/2019 11:13 AM]
February 6, 2019 [10624861] Petitioner's motion filed by David Ulloa-Lucio for stay of of removal. Served on 02/05/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-9508] [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:21 PM]
February 6, 2019 [10624858] Petitioner's motion filed by David Ulloa-Lucio to file petition for review out of time. Served on 02/05/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-9508] [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:19 PM]
February 6, 2019 [10624856] Docketing statement filed by David Ulloa-Lucio. Served on 02/05/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-9508] [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:16 PM]
February 6, 2019 [10624848] Petition for review filed. Served on 02/05/2019. Manner of Service: email - Attorney for Respondents: DOH/EOIR/BIA, Lynch, Oil. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 02/06/2019 letter. Fee paid. Agency record due 03/18/2019 for Matthew G. Whitaker. Notice of appearance due on 02/20/2019 for David Ulloa-Lucio and Matthew G. Whitaker. [19-9508] [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulloa-Lucio v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, Acting United States Attorney General
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Lynch
Represented By: Robert Michael Stalzer
Represented By: Oil Oil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID ULLOA-LUCIO
Represented By: Mitchell H. Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?