Wells Fargo Bank v. Mesh Suture, et al
Defendant: ADOM DUMANIAN, RANDA DUMANIAN and GREGORY A. DUMANIAN
Defendant / Appellant: MARK A. SCHWARTZ and MESH SUTURE, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 20-1041
Filed: February 12, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 [10731826] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on the April 7, 2020 "Response to Order to Show Cause by Appellees Dr. Gregory Dumanian, Randa Dumanian, and Adom Dumanian" and "Appellants Motion to Strike Response Filed by Matthew Johnson in the Alternative Granting Appellants Leave to File a Response Thereto Within 14 Days." The clerk of this court shall add Dr. Gregory Dumanian, Randa Dumanian, and Adom Dumanian to the docket as Appellees. The motion for leave to file a response to the April 7, 2020 response to order to show cause is granted. The response is due 14 days from the date of this order. Response due on 04/23/2020 for Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz. Served on 04/09/2020. [20-1041] [Entered: 04/09/2020 11:24 AM]
April 8, 2020 [10731587] Motion filed by Appellants Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz to strike APPELLANTS MOTION TO STRIKE RESPONSE FILED BY MATTHEW JOHNSON OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE GRANTING APPELLANTS LEAVE TO FILE A RESPONSE THERETO WITHIN 14 DAYS. Served on: 04/08/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1041] MAS [Entered: 04/08/2020 02:22 PM]
April 7, 2020 [10731359] Response filed by Dr. Greg Dumanian, Randa Dumanian, and Adom Dumanian (Defendants-Appellees) to Order to Show Cause (Document: 010110308691), Appellants Reply to Court's February 25, 2020 Order (Document: 010110322363), & Plaintiff-Appellee's Response Pursuant to the March 24, 2020 Order (Document: 010110330346). Served on 04/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 04/09/2020 by SDS to modify party filers] [20-1041] MEJ [Entered: 04/07/2020 03:47 PM]
April 7, 2020 [10731310] Motion filed by Appellants Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz, APPELLANTS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR REPLY TO WELLS RESPONSE TO THE MARCH 24 2020 ORDER for leave to file reply to PLAINTIFF-APPELLEE'S RESPONSE PURSUANT TO THE MARCH 24 2020 ORDER. Served on: 04/07/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1041] MAS [Entered: 04/07/2020 02:24 PM]
April 7, 2020 [10731202] Response filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to February 25, 2020 Order and Mark Schwartz's March 10, 2020 Response. Served on 04/07/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1041] CJD [Entered: 04/07/2020 11:49 AM]
March 24, 2020 [10727682] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing appellee to file a response appellant's jurisdictional memorandum brief filed 3/19/2020 and the court's 2/25/2020 order. Response due on 04/07/2020 for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Served on 03/24/2020. [20-1041] [Entered: 03/24/2020 08:47 AM]
March 19, 2020 [10726857] Response filed by Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz to APPELLANTS REPLY TO COURTS FEBRUARY 25 2020 ORDER. Served on 03/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1041] MAS [Entered: 03/19/2020 03:56 PM]
March 9, 2020 [10723652] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney motion to extend time to file response to show cause order. Response due on 03/23/2020 for Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz. See order for additional information. Served on 03/09/2020. [20-1041] [Entered: 03/09/2020 09:38 AM]
March 9, 2020 [10723564] Motion filed by Appellants Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz to extend time to file a response until 03/23/2020. Served on: 03/09/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1041] MAS [Entered: 03/09/2020 06:04 AM]
February 27, 2020 [10720863] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher J Dawes for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (note, all interested parties listed have been previously disclosed). Served on 02/26/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1041] [Entered: 02/27/2020 07:21 AM]
February 26, 2020 [10720838] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher J. Dawes for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/26/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1041] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 02/27/2020 by NA] CJD [Entered: 02/26/2020 05:38 PM]
February 25, 2020 [10731781] Entry of appearance filed by Matthew E. Johnson for Randa Dumanian, Gregory A. Dumanian and Adom Dumanian. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/09/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1041] [Entered: 04/09/2020 10:45 AM]
February 25, 2020 [10720423] Entry of appearance submitted by Matthew E. Johnson for Not Parties Gregory A. Dumanian, Randa Dumanian and Adom Dumanian for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 04/09/2020 by SDS as the pleading has been filed] [20-1041] MEJ [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:47 PM]
February 25, 2020 [10720158] Order filed by Clerk of the Court to show cause. This appeal is before the court following a review of the docketing statement and the district court docket. The court has identified a potential representation issue and potential jurisdictional issue, as explained in the attached order. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of the court. Within 14 days - 03-10-2020 - from the date of this order, Mr. Schwartz may file a response to the attached order. Served on 02/25/2020. [20-1041] [Entered: 02/25/2020 08:57 AM]
February 24, 2020 [10720104] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 02/24/2020. [text only entry - no document attached] [20-1041] [Entered: 02/25/2020 07:33 AM]
February 24, 2020 [10719850] Motion to Inform and motion for stay of All proceedings in the District Court pending the outcome of the instant Appeal filed by Appellants Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz. Served on: 02/24/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1041] --[Edited 02/24/2020 by AT to reflect title of pleading filed with the court. ] MAS [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:28 PM]
February 24, 2020 [10719702] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark A. Schwartz for Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1041] [Entered: 02/24/2020 07:52 AM]
February 24, 2020 [10719683] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 03/02/2020 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-1041] [Entered: 02/24/2020 07:17 AM]
February 23, 2020 [10719676] Motion filed by Appellants Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz for stay of All proceedings in District Court, Case No. 1:19-CV-03218 and this appeal while Debtors Bankruptcy remains pending; and thereafter, all proceedings in District Court Case No. 1:19-CV-03218 while the instant appear remains pending. Served on: 02/23/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1041] MAS [Entered: 02/23/2020 09:39 AM]
February 23, 2020 [10719675] Notice of automatic bankruptcy stay filed by Appellants Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz. Served on 02/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1041] MAS [Entered: 02/23/2020 09:10 AM]
February 23, 2020 [10719673] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz. Served on: 02/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1041] MAS [Entered: 02/23/2020 07:03 AM]
February 23, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket as counsel refiled notice that the transcript is already on file using the correct event code. [AT] [10719672] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz. Transcript ordered: Receivership Hearing 1/31/2020 [Docket No. 77] - Transcript already on file and available.. Served on: 02/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1041] MAS [Entered: 02/23/2020 07:02 AM]
February 23, 2020 [10719671] Docketing statement filed by Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz. Served on 02/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1041] MAS [Entered: 02/23/2020 06:59 AM]
February 23, 2020 [10719670] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark A. Schwartz for Appellants Mark A. Schwartz and Mesh Suture, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/24/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1041] MAS [Entered: 02/23/2020 06:58 AM]
February 12, 2020 [10717386] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/12/2020. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 02/26/2020 for Mesh Suture, Inc. and Mark A. Schwartz. Notice of appearance due on 02/26/2020 for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. [20-1041] [Entered: 02/12/2020 11:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank v. Mesh Suture, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARK A. SCHWARTZ
Represented By: Jenya Claire Berino
Represented By: Mark A. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MESH SUTURE, INC.
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still Berve
Represented By: Mark A. Schwartz
Represented By: Matthew E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADOM DUMANIAN
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still Berve
Represented By: Matthew E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDA DUMANIAN
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still Berve
Represented By: Matthew E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY A. DUMANIAN
Represented By: Kimberly Briggs Still Berve
Represented By: Matthew E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Esther H. Lee
Represented By: Christopher Dawes
Represented By: Christopher J. Dawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?