Boles v. CDOC, et al
Defendant: DEBRA GOHEEN
Defendant / Appellee: BRYAN REICHERT, SHAWN NYGAARD, CUSTER, DOC ACCOUNTING PERSONNEL, DERRICK ROBERTS, CYRUS CLARKSON, J. DORCEY, GARY WARD, KRISTY HOLJENIN, MARC TAYLOR, MAJOR ZWIRN, KENNETH PHIPPS, REIDER MAY, NICOLE WILSON, GTL, CHARLENE CROCKET, RABBI YISROEL ROSSKAMM, Rabbi, COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, FULLER, IAN BARNES and LT. MATTHEW POWELL
Plaintiff / Appellant: RUSSELL MARSHALL BOLES
Case Number: 20-1248
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 [10765131] District court order denying 1915(b) motion. [20-1248] [Entered: 08/24/2020 03:58 PM]
August 17, 2020 [10763274] Jurisdictional Defect. Procedural termination after other judicial action. Written, unsigned, and unpublished. Judges Tymkovich, Hartz, and McHugh. [20-1248] [Entered: 08/17/2020 11:55 AM]
August 6, 2020 [10760987] Appellant memorandum brief filed by Mr. Russell Marshall Boles. Served on 08/03/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1248] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:09 PM]
July 31, 2020 [10759417] Attorney Mr. Stephanie Lynn Clark for Doctor Bryan Reichert admitted to the bar of this court. [20-1248] [Entered: 07/31/2020 12:36 PM]
July 28, 2020 [10758551] Jurisdiction challenged. Appellant's memorandum brief due 08/11/2020 for Russell Marshall Boles. If the appellant elects not to respond to this order, the appeal may be dismissed without further notice for lack of prosecution. [20-1248] [Entered: 07/28/2020 12:05 PM]
July 27, 2020 [10758242] Response filed by Mr. Russell Marshall Boles to [ # 10752430-2 ], order to show cause. Served on 07/22/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1248] [Entered: 07/27/2020 03:11 PM]
July 23, 2020 [10757634] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Russell Marshall Boles. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/20/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1248] [Entered: 07/23/2020 02:17 PM]
July 20, 2020 [10756588] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 08/19/2020 for Stephanie Lynn Clark. [20-1248] [Entered: 07/20/2020 04:20 PM]
July 17, 2020 [10756052] Entry of appearance filed by Stephanie Lynn Clark and Mr. David B. Gelman for Bryan Reichert. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/17/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1248] [Entered: 07/17/2020 12:33 PM]
July 17, 2020 [10756018] Entry of appearance submitted by David Ben Gelman; and Stephanie Lynn Clark for Appellee Doctor Bryan Reichert for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/17/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 07/17/2020 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 7/17/20.] [20-1248] DBG [Entered: 07/17/2020 11:16 AM]
July 15, 2020 [10755509] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by Appellant Mr. Russell Marshall Boles. Served on 07/15/2020. [20-1248] [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:32 PM]
July 15, 2020 [10755468] Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by Mr. Russell Marshall Boles. Served on 07/09/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1248] [Entered: 07/15/2020 02:38 PM]
July 15, 2020 [10755464] Miscellaneous correspondence received from appellant but not filed. The correspondence crossed in the mail with the court's case opening letter and show cause order. [20-1248] [Entered: 07/15/2020 02:32 PM]
July 14, 2020 [10755087] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Joshua J. Luna and Mr. Joshua G. Urquhart for Lieutenant Ian Barnes, Captain Cyrus Clarkson, Colorado Department of Corrections, Charlene Crocket, Lieutenant Custer, Captain J. Dorcey, Ms. Fuller, Kristy Holjenin, Reider May, Lieutenant Shawn Nygaard, Captain Kenneth Phipps, Mr. Matthew Powell, Lieutenant Derrick Roberts, Lieutenant Marc Taylor, Gary Ward, Nicole Wilson, Zwirn and Debra Goheen. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/14/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1248] [Entered: 07/14/2020 02:43 PM]
July 14, 2020 [10755075] Entry of appearance submitted by Joshua G. Urquhart and Joshua J. Luna for Appellees Lieutenant Ian Barnes, Captain Cyrus Clarkson, Colorado Department of Corrections, Charlene Crocket, Lieutenant Custer, Captain J. Dorcey, Ms. Fuller, Kristy Holjenin, Reider May, Lieutenant Shawn Nygaard, Captain Kenneth Phipps, Mr. Matthew Powell, Lieutenant Derrick Roberts, Lieutenant Marc Taylor, Gary Ward, Nicole Wilson, Zwirn and Not Party Debra Goheen for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/14/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 07/14/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1248] JGU [Entered: 07/14/2020 02:23 PM]
July 6, 2020 [10752430] Order filed by Clerk of the Court to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prepay the entire filing fee or why PLRA does not apply. 1915 response due on 07/27/2020 for Russell Marshall Boles. See attached order for further information. Served on 07/06/2020. [20-1248] [Entered: 07/06/2020 03:32 PM]
July 6, 2020 [10752394] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/06/2020. Fee or 1915 forms due in district court on 08/05/2020 for Russell Marshall Boles. Notice of appearance due on 07/20/2020 for Ian Barnes, Cyrus Clarkson, Colorado Department of Corrections, Charlene Crocket, Custer, J. Dorcey, Fuller, Kristy Holjenin, Reider May, Shawn Nygaard, Kenneth Phipps, Matthew Powell, Bryan Reichert, Derrick Roberts, Marc Taylor, Gary Ward, Nicole Wilson and Zwirn. Notice of appearance due on 08/05/2020 for Russell Marshall Boles. [20-1248] [Entered: 07/06/2020 02:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Boles v. CDOC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRYAN REICHERT
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Clark
Represented By: David B. Gelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHAWN NYGAARD
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CUSTER
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOC ACCOUNTING PERSONNEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DERRICK ROBERTS
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CYRUS CLARKSON
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. DORCEY
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY WARD
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTY HOLJENIN
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARC TAYLOR
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAJOR ZWIRN
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH PHIPPS
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REIDER MAY
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICOLE WILSON
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GTL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLENE CROCKET
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RABBI YISROEL ROSSKAMM, Rabbi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FULLER
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IAN BARNES
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LT. MATTHEW POWELL
Represented By: Joshua G. Urquhart
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA GOHEEN
Represented By: Joshua J. Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RUSSELL MARSHALL BOLES
Represented By: Russell Marshall Boles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?