Merrill, et al v. Contract Freighters
Plaintiff / Appellant: TURRELL SANDERS, ADAM HEIDE, JEFFREY BIGGS, ORLANDO LEBRON, JOEY BROWN, TAMI POTIRALA, BENJAMIN JOHNSON, STEVEN KORTMAN, BECKY AUSTIN, JAIME PARRALES, LARRY JURCAK, ZIGMUND GUTOWSKI, JULIAN LAFRANKS, EARNEST WARD, JR., EDUARDO SUSTAITA, SAMI NASR, ERIC ARD, RAYNOLD CORNEILLE, DUANE VANDERKAMP, JAMES NEWBERRY, JESSIE BRAXTON, JR., PAULA HORION, CHARLES TANKSLEY, MELANIE BROWN, CHRISTOPHER ZDENEK, JOSE LIMON, CRAIG WILLIAMS, KEITH HERRING, ALEXANDER FLANIGAN, ALLEN CASHMAN, CHRIS BEAUPRE, TIM HOLLINGSWORTH, DONALD CREASMAN, DANNY LLOYD, TERRY JONES, FRANKLIN MERRILL, RODNEY LACY, JOSE GARCIA, ELVRETT LITTLEJOHN, JOHNNIE WYNNE, GARY GRUBBS, ANDRE ELLIS, ERIC ROBERTSON, GERORD THOMAS, JOSEPH HORION, ANTHONY GLOVER, RONALD DENNIS and ANTHONY DENNIS
Defendant / Appellee: CONTRACT FREIGHTERS, INC., a Missouri corporation registered to conduct business in Colorado, AKA CFI
Case Number: 20-1279
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 [10775421] Mandate issued. [20-1279] [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:16 PM]
October 1, 2020 [10775419] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [20-1279] [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:15 PM]
October 1, 2020 [10775417] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting stipulation to dismiss case. Served on 10/01/2020. Text only entry - no attachment - please see final order. [20-1279] [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:13 PM]
October 1, 2020 [10775342] Stipulation to dismiss case filed by Eric Ard, Becky Austin, Chris Beaupre, Jeffrey Biggs, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Joey Brown, Melanie Brown, Allen Cashman, Raynold Corneille, Donald Creasman, Anthony Dennis, Ronald Dennis, Andre Ellis, Alexander Flanigan, Mr. Jose Garcia, Anthony Glover, Gary Grubbs, Zigmund Gutowski, Adam Heide, Keith Herring, Tim Hollingsworth, Joseph Horion, Paula Horion, Mr. Benjamin Johnson, Terry Jones, Larry Jurcak, Steven Kortman, Rodney Lacy, Julian LaFranks, Orlando Lebron, Jose Limon, Elvrett Littlejohn, Danny Lloyd, Franklin Merrill, Sami Nasr, Mr. James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Tami Potirala, Eric Robertson, Turrell Sanders, Eduardo Sustaita, Charles Tanksley, Gerord Thomas, Duane Vanderkamp, Earnest Ward, Jr., Craig Williams, Johnnie Wynne and Christopher Zdenek, Contract Freighters, Inc.. Served on 10/01/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1279] JRC [Entered: 10/01/2020 12:51 PM]
September 15, 2020 [10770564] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney Matthew Cushing's Motion to Withdraw as counsel for the appellants. The appellants will continue to be represented by John R. Crone. Served on 09/15/2020. [20-1279] [Entered: 09/15/2020 04:17 PM]
September 15, 2020 [10770515] Motion filed by Appellants Eric Ard, Becky Austin, Chris Beaupre, Jeffrey Biggs, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Joey Brown, Melanie Brown, Allen Cashman, Raynold Corneille, Donald Creasman, Anthony Dennis, Ronald Dennis, Andre Ellis, Alexander Flanigan, Mr. Jose Garcia, Anthony Glover, Gary Grubbs, Zigmund Gutowski, Adam Heide, Keith Herring, Tim Hollingsworth, Joseph Horion, Paula Horion, Mr. Benjamin Johnson, Terry Jones, Larry Jurcak, Steven Kortman, Rodney Lacy, Julian LaFranks, Orlando Lebron, Jose Limon, Elvrett Littlejohn, Danny Lloyd, Franklin Merrill, Sami Nasr, Mr. James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Tami Potirala, Eric Robertson, Turrell Sanders, Eduardo Sustaita, Charles Tanksley, Gerord Thomas, Duane Vanderkamp, Earnest Ward, Jr., Craig Williams and Johnnie Wynne for attorney Matthew R. Cushing to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 09/15/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1279] MC [Entered: 09/15/2020 02:47 PM]
September 14, 2020 [10770158] Attorney Abigail S. Wallach for Contract Freighters, Inc. admitted to the bar of this court. [20-1279] [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:22 PM]
September 9, 2020 [10768846] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellants' Unopposed Motion for Extended Briefing Scheduled. Appellants' brief and appendix are due on or before 11/06/2020. Appellee's response brief is due on or before 12/31/2020. Appellants' reply brief is due on or before 01/14/2021. No further extensions will be granted on the Clerk's authority. Served on 09/09/2020. Text only entry - no attachment. [20-1279] [Entered: 09/09/2020 09:07 AM]
September 8, 2020 [10768421] Motion filed by Appellants Eric Ard, Becky Austin, Chris Beaupre, Jeffrey Biggs, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Joey Brown, Melanie Brown, Allen Cashman, Raynold Corneille, Donald Creasman, Anthony Dennis, Ronald Dennis, Andre Ellis, Alexander Flanigan, Mr. Jose Garcia, Anthony Glover, Gary Grubbs, Zigmund Gutowski, Adam Heide, Keith Herring, Tim Hollingsworth, Joseph Horion, Paula Horion, Mr. Benjamin Johnson, Terry Jones, Larry Jurcak, Steven Kortman, Rodney Lacy, Julian LaFranks, Orlando Lebron, Jose Limon, Elvrett Littlejohn, Danny Lloyd, Franklin Merrill, Sami Nasr, Mr. James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Tami Potirala, Eric Robertson, Turrell Sanders, Eduardo Sustaita, Charles Tanksley, Gerord Thomas, Duane Vanderkamp, Earnest Ward, Jr., Craig Williams and Johnnie Wynne to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 11/06/2020. Served on: 09/08/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1279] MC [Entered: 09/08/2020 11:24 AM]
September 2, 2020 [10767292] Entry of appearance filed by Matthew Cushing for Johnnie Wynne, Craig Williams, Earnest Ward, Jr., Duane Vanderkamp, Gerord Thomas, Charles Tanksley, Eduardo Sustaita, Turrell Sanders, Eric Robertson, Tami Potirala, Jaime Parrales, Mr. James Newberry, Sami Nasr, Franklin Merrill, Danny Lloyd, Elvrett Littlejohn, Jose Limon, Orlando Lebron, Rodney Lacy, Julian LaFranks, Steven Kortman, Larry Jurcak, Terry Jones, Mr. Benjamin Johnson, Paula Horion, Joseph Horion, Tim Hollingsworth, Keith Herring, Adam Heide, Zigmund Gutowski, Gary Grubbs, Anthony Glover, Mr. Jose Garcia, Alexander Flanigan, Andre Ellis, Ronald Dennis, Anthony Dennis, Donald Creasman, Raynold Corneille, Allen Cashman, Melanie Brown, Joey Brown, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Jeffrey Biggs, Chris Beaupre, Becky Austin and Eric Ard. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1279] [Entered: 09/02/2020 09:26 AM]
September 2, 2020 [10767191] Entry of appearance submitted by Matthew R. Cushing for Appellants Eric Ard, Becky Austin, Chris Beaupre, Jeffrey Biggs, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Joey Brown, Melanie Brown, Allen Cashman, Raynold Corneille, Donald Creasman, Anthony Dennis, Ronald Dennis, Andre Ellis, Alexander Flanigan, Mr. Jose Garcia, Anthony Glover, Gary Grubbs, Zigmund Gutowski, Adam Heide, Keith Herring, Tim Hollingsworth, Joseph Horion, Paula Horion, Mr. Benjamin Johnson, Terry Jones, Larry Jurcak, Steven Kortman, Rodney Lacy, Julian LaFranks, Orlando Lebron, Jose Limon, Elvrett Littlejohn, Danny Lloyd, Franklin Merrill, Sami Nasr, Mr. James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Tami Potirala, Eric Robertson, Turrell Sanders, Eduardo Sustaita, Charles Tanksley, Gerord Thomas, Duane Vanderkamp, Earnest Ward, Jr., Craig Williams, Johnnie Wynne and Christopher Zdenek for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1279]--[Edited 09/02/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 09/02/2020.] MC [Entered: 09/02/2020 06:49 AM]
August 27, 2020 [10765915] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 09/28/2020 for Abigail S. Wallach. [20-1279] [Entered: 08/27/2020 09:12 AM]
August 25, 2020 [10765393] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Michelle B. Muhleisen and Abigail S. Wallach for Contract Freighters, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (One of the parties listed is or was counsel of record). Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1279] [Entered: 08/25/2020 03:28 PM]
August 25, 2020 [10765363] Entry of appearance submitted by Michelle B. Muhleisen and Abigail S. Wallach for Appellee Contract Freighters, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1279] --[Edited 08/25/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 8/25/2020.] MBM [Entered: 08/25/2020 02:43 PM]
August 25, 2020 [10765310] Entry of appearance filed by John Reily Crone for Mr. Jose Garcia, Mr. Benjamin Johnson, Mr. James Newberry, Terry Jones, Anthony Glover, Franklin Merrill, Keith Herring, Anthony Dennis, Larry Jurcak, Sami Nasr, Ronald Dennis, Rodney Lacy, Tami Potirala, Craig Williams, Zigmund Gutowski, Joseph Horion, Eric Ard, Allen Cashman, Adam Heide, Eduardo Sustaita, Eric Robertson, Becky Austin, Jeffrey Biggs, Paula Horion, Jose Limon, Gerord Thomas, Jaime Parrales, Turrell Sanders, Earnest Ward, Jr., Christopher Zdenek, Danny Lloyd, Duane Vanderkamp, Joey Brown, Melanie Brown, Orlando Lebron, Charles Tanksley, Gary Grubbs, Chris Beaupre, Raynold Corneille, Julian LaFranks, Andre Ellis, Elvrett Littlejohn, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Johnnie Wynne, Steven Kortman, Donald Creasman, Alexander Flanigan, and Tim Hollingsworth. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1279] [Entered: 08/25/2020 01:02 PM]
August 25, 2020 [10765306] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 08/25/2020. Appellants opening brief and appendix due on 10/05/2020 for Eric Ard, Becky Austin, Chris Beaupre, Jeffrey Biggs, Jessie Braxton Jr., Joey Brown, Melanie Brown, Allen Cashman, Raynold Corneille, Donald Creasman, Anthony Dennis, Ronald Dennis, Andre Ellis, Alexander Flanigan, Jose Garcia, Anthony Glover, Gary Grubbs, Zigmund Gutowski, Adam Heide, Keith Herring, Tim Hollingsworth, Joseph Horion, Paula Horion, Benjamin Johnson, Terry Jones, Larry Jurcak, Steven Kortman, Julian LaFranks, Rodney Lacy, Orlando Lebron, Jose Limon, Elvrett Littlejohn, Danny Lloyd, Franklin Merrill, Sami Nasr, James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Tami Potirala, Eric Robertson, Turrell Sanders, Eduardo Sustaita, Charles Tanksley, Gerord Thomas, Duane Vanderkamp, Earnest Ward Jr., Craig Williams, Johnnie Wynne and Christopher Zdenek. [20-1279] [Entered: 08/25/2020 12:55 PM]
August 25, 2020 [10765296] Entry of appearance submitted by John Reily Crone for Appellants Eric Ard, Becky Austin, Chris Beaupre, Jeffrey Biggs, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Joey Brown, Melanie Brown, Allen Cashman, Raynold Corneille, Donald Creasman, Anthony Dennis, Ronald Dennis, Andre Ellis, Alexander Flanigan, Mr. Jose Garcia, Anthony Glover, Gary Grubbs, Zigmund Gutowski, Adam Heide, Keith Herring, Tim Hollingsworth, Joseph Horion, Paula Horion, Mr. Benjamin Johnson, Terry Jones, Larry Jurcak, Steven Kortman, Rodney Lacy, Julian LaFranks, Orlando Lebron, Jose Limon, Elvrett Littlejohn, Danny Lloyd, Franklin Merrill, Sami Nasr, Mr. James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Tami Potirala, Eric Robertson, Turrell Sanders, Eduardo Sustaita, Charles Tanksley, Gerord Thomas, Duane Vanderkamp, Earnest Ward, Jr., Craig Williams, Johnnie Wynne and Christopher Zdenek for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1279] --[Edited 08/25/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 8/25/2020.] JRC [Entered: 08/25/2020 12:17 PM]
August 25, 2020 [10765291] Docketing statement filed by Eric Ard, Becky Austin, Chris Beaupre, Jeffrey Biggs, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Joey Brown, Melanie Brown, Allen Cashman, Raynold Corneille, Donald Creasman, Anthony Dennis, Ronald Dennis, Andre Ellis, Alexander Flanigan, Mr. Jose Garcia, Anthony Glover, Gary Grubbs, Zigmund Gutowski, Adam Heide, Keith Herring, Tim Hollingsworth, Joseph Horion, Paula Horion, Mr. Benjamin Johnson, Terry Jones, Larry Jurcak, Steven Kortman, Rodney Lacy, Julian LaFranks, Orlando Lebron, Jose Limon, Elvrett Littlejohn, Danny Lloyd, Franklin Merrill, Sami Nasr, Mr. James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Tami Potirala, Eric Robertson, Turrell Sanders, Eduardo Sustaita, Charles Tanksley, Gerord Thomas, Duane Vanderkamp, Earnest Ward, Jr., Craig Williams, Johnnie Wynne and Christopher Zdenek. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1279] JRC [Entered: 08/25/2020 12:02 PM]
August 25, 2020 [10765283] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/01/2020 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-1279] [Entered: 08/25/2020 11:45 AM]
August 25, 2020 [10765271] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Eric Ard, Becky Austin, Chris Beaupre, Jeffrey Biggs, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Joey Brown, Melanie Brown, Allen Cashman, Raynold Corneille, Donald Creasman, Anthony Dennis, Ronald Dennis, Andre Ellis, Alexander Flanigan, Mr. Jose Garcia, Anthony Glover, Gary Grubbs, Zigmund Gutowski, Adam Heide, Keith Herring, Tim Hollingsworth, Joseph Horion, Paula Horion, Mr. Benjamin Johnson, Terry Jones, Larry Jurcak, Steven Kortman, Rodney Lacy, Julian LaFranks, Orlando Lebron, Jose Limon, Elvrett Littlejohn, Danny Lloyd, Franklin Merrill, Sami Nasr, Mr. James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Tami Potirala, Eric Robertson, Turrell Sanders, Eduardo Sustaita, Charles Tanksley, Gerord Thomas, Duane Vanderkamp, Earnest Ward, Jr., Craig Williams, Johnnie Wynne and Christopher Zdenek. Transcript ordered: N/A. Served on: 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1279] JRC [Entered: 08/25/2020 11:32 AM]
August 11, 2020 [10761895] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/10/2020. Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 08/25/2020 for Eric Ard, Becky Austin, Chris Beaupre, Jeffrey Biggs, Jessie Braxton Jr., Joey Brown, Melanie Brown, Allen Cashman, Raynold Corneille, Donald Creasman, Anthony Dennis, Ronald Dennis, Andre Ellis, Alexander Flanigan, Jose Garcia, Anthony Glover, Gary Grubbs, Zigmund Gutowski, Adam Heide, Keith Herring, Tim Hollingsworth, Joseph Horion, Paula Horion, Benjamin Johnson, Terry Jones, Larry Jurcak, Steven Kortman, Julian LaFranks, Rodney Lacy, Orlando Lebron, Jose Limon, Elvrett Littlejohn, Danny Lloyd, Franklin Merrill, Sami Nasr, James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Tami Potirala, Eric Robertson, Turrell Sanders, Eduardo Sustaita, Charles Tanksley, Gerord Thomas, Duane Vanderkamp, Earnest Ward Jr., Craig Williams, Johnnie Wynne and Christopher Zdenek. Notice of appearance due on 08/25/2020 for Contract Freighters, Inc. [20-1279] [Entered: 08/11/2020 08:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Merrill, et al v. Contract Freighters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TURRELL SANDERS
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ADAM HEIDE
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY BIGGS
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ORLANDO LEBRON
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOEY BROWN
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TAMI POTIRALA
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BENJAMIN JOHNSON
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVEN KORTMAN
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BECKY AUSTIN
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAIME PARRALES
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LARRY JURCAK
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ZIGMUND GUTOWSKI
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIAN LAFRANKS
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EARNEST WARD, JR.
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDUARDO SUSTAITA
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAMI NASR
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC ARD
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAYNOLD CORNEILLE
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DUANE VANDERKAMP
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES NEWBERRY
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JESSIE BRAXTON, JR.
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAULA HORION
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES TANKSLEY
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MELANIE BROWN
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER ZDENEK
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE LIMON
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CRAIG WILLIAMS
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEITH HERRING
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALEXANDER FLANIGAN
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALLEN CASHMAN
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRIS BEAUPRE
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIM HOLLINGSWORTH
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD CREASMAN
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANNY LLOYD
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERRY JONES
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANKLIN MERRILL
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RODNEY LACY
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE GARCIA
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELVRETT LITTLEJOHN
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHNNIE WYNNE
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GARY GRUBBS
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDRE ELLIS
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC ROBERTSON
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GERORD THOMAS
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH HORION
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY GLOVER
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD DENNIS
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY DENNIS
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONTRACT FREIGHTERS, INC., a Missouri corporation registered to conduct business in Colorado, AKA CFI
Represented By: Michelle B. Muhleisen
Represented By: Austin Evans Smith
Represented By: Abigail S. Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?