Andrew Wommack Ministries v. Polis, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANDREW WOMMACK MINISTRIES, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: JARED POLIS, in his official capacity as the Governor of the State of Colorado, JILL HUNSAKER RYAN, in her official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment and JACQUELINE REVELLO, in her official capacity as Director of Teller County Department of Public Health and Environment
Amicus Curiae: SOUTHWEST CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED CHURCH OF CHRIST, CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS, ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, INTERFAITH ALLIANCE FOUNDATION, COVENANT NETWORK OF PRESBYTERIANS, EQUAL PARTNERS IN FAITH, METHODIST FEDERATION FOR SOCIAL ACTION, RECONSTRUCTIONIST RABBINICAL ASSOCIATION, BEND THE ARC: A JEWISH PARTNERSHIP FOR JUSTICE, UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM, DISCIPLES JUSTICE ACTION NETWORK, AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE, DISCIPLES CENTER FOR PUBLIC WITNESS, MEN OF REFORM JUDAISM and WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM
Case Number: 20-1336
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 [10777855] Mandate issued. [20-1336] [Entered: 10/13/2020 02:37 PM]
October 13, 2020 [10777831] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action. Clerk of the Court. [20-1336] [Entered: 10/13/2020 01:58 PM]
October 13, 2020 [10777827] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting attorney motion to dismiss case as contained in the court's final order. Text only entry - no attachment. [20-1336] [Entered: 10/13/2020 01:49 PM]
October 13, 2020 [10777674] Motion filed by Appellant Andrew Wommack Ministries, Inc. to dismiss case. Served on: 10/13/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1336] DJS [Entered: 10/13/2020 09:56 AM]
October 7, 2020 [10776674] Notice filed by Jacqueline Revello. Served on 10/07/2020 by email. [20-1336] PWH [Entered: 10/07/2020 10:41 AM]
October 6, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket as the motion was filed in error per the notice of 10/7/20. [NA] [10776509] Emergency Motion for Injunction and Motion for Order to Show Cause why Andrew Wommack Minstries, Inc. Should not be Held in Contempt filed by Appellee Jacqueline Revello, Jill Hunsaker Ryan for injunction pending appeal. Served on: 10/06/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1336] --[Edited 10/07/2020 by AT to add complete title of pleading filed with the court.] PWH [Entered: 10/06/2020 05:07 PM]
October 5, 2020 [10776173] Amicus Curiae brief in support of Appellees and in Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Injunction filed by Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Anti-Defamation League, Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Covenant Network of Presbyterians, Disciples Center for Public Witness, Disciples Justice Action Network, Equal Partners in Faith, Interfaith Alliance Foundation, Men of Reform Judaism, Methodist Federation for Social Action, Reconstructionist Rabbinical Association, Southwest Conference of the United Church of Christ, Union for Reform Judaism and Women of Reform Judaism. Served on 10/05/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1336] [Entered: 10/05/2020 04:43 PM]
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order [10776165] Order filed by Judges Lucero, Moritz and Carson granting Americans United for Separation of Church and State et al. motion for leave to file an amicus brief. Order granting Appellees' motion to exceed the word count in their response. Order denying motion for injunction filed by Appellant Andrew Wommack Ministries, Inc.. Served on 10/05/2020. [20-1336] [Entered: 10/05/2020 04:34 PM]
October 5, 2020 [10775842] Reply filed by Andrew Wommack Ministries, Inc. to Appellant's Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. Served on 10/05/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1336] DJS [Entered: 10/05/2020 08:37 AM]
October 5, 2020 [10775807] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Patrick Grubel, Mr. Richard Brian Katskee and Mr. Alexander Joseph Luchenitser for Anti-Defamation League, Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Union for Reform Judaism, Women of Reform Judaism, Interfaith Alliance Foundation, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice, Reconstructionist Rabbinical Association, Covenant Network of Presbyterians, Methodist Federation for Social Action, Men of Reform Judaism, Southwest Conference of the United Church of Christ, Disciples Center for Public Witness, Disciples Justice Action Network and Equal Partners in Faith. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/05/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1336] [Entered: 10/05/2020 07:35 AM]
October 5, 2020 [10775803] Motion for leave to file an amicus brief filed by Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Anti-Defamation League, Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Covenant Network of Presbyterians, Disciples Center for Public Witness, Disciples Justice Action Network, Equal Partners in Faith, Interfaith Alliance Foundation, Men of Reform Judaism, Methodist Federation for Social Action, Reconstructionist Rabbinical Association, Southwest Conference of the United Church of Christ, Union for Reform Judaism and Women of Reform Judaism. Served on 10/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1336] [Entered: 10/05/2020 07:31 AM]
October 4, 2020 [10775794] Motion filed by Appellee Jill Hunsaker Ryan, Jared Polis, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Colorado; Jacqueline Revello, in her official capacity as Director of the Teller County Department of Health and Environment to file an oversize brief 8487 words long. Served on: 10/04/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1336] WEK [Entered: 10/04/2020 05:10 PM]
October 4, 2020 [10775793] Response filed by Jill Hunsaker Ryan, Jared Polis, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Colorado; Jacqueline Revello, in her official capacity as Director of Teller County Public Health and Environment to Plaintiff-Appellant's Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. Served on 10/04/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1336] WEK [Entered: 10/04/2020 05:01 PM]
October 3, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket. Motion with brief docketed as filed by clerk. [sds] [10775791] Motion submitted by Americans United for Separation of Church and State; ADL (Anti-Defamation League); Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice; Central Conference of American Rabbis; Covenant Network of Presbyterians; see cover of motion for more amici, for leave to file an amicus brief. Served on: 10/03/2020 Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1336] AJL [Entered: 10/03/2020 09:02 PM]
October 3, 2020 [10775790] Entry of appearance submitted by Alexander Joseph Luchenitser; Richard Brian Katskee; Patrick Grubel for amici curiae Americans United for Separation of Church and State; ADL (Anti-Defamation League); Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice; Central Conference of American Rabbis; Covenant Network of Presbyterians; see appearance form for more amici, for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/05/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1336] AJL [Entered: 10/03/2020 08:57 PM]
October 2, 2020 [10775728] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Paul W. Hurcomb for Jacqueline Revello. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/02/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1336] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:04 PM]
October 2, 2020 [10775714] Entry of appearance submitted by Paul Walter Hurcomb for Appellee Jacqueline Revello for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1336] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 10/02/2020 by NA] PWH [Entered: 10/02/2020 02:47 PM]
October 1, 2020 [10775469] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Response to motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction due by 5:00 p.m. MDT on Sunday, October 4, 2020, for Jill Hunsaker Ryan, Jared Polis and Jacqueline Revello. Served on 10/01/2020. [20-1336] [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:57 PM]
October 1, 2020 [10775371] Motion filed by Appellant Andrew Wommack Ministries, Inc. for injunction pending appeal. Served on: 10/01/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1336] DJS [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:01 PM]
September 30, 2020 [10774926] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/30/2020. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 10/14/2020 for Andrew Wommack Ministries, Inc. Notice of appearance due on 10/14/2020 for Jill Hunsaker Ryan. [20-1336] [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Andrew Wommack Ministries v. Polis, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDREW WOMMACK MINISTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JARED POLIS, in his official capacity as the Governor of the State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JILL HUNSAKER RYAN, in her official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment
Represented By: William Eric Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE REVELLO, in her official capacity as Director of Teller County Department of Public Health and Environment
Represented By: Paul W. Hurcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTHWEST CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED CHURCH OF CHRIST
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERFAITH ALLIANCE FOUNDATION
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COVENANT NETWORK OF PRESBYTERIANS
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EQUAL PARTNERS IN FAITH
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: METHODIST FEDERATION FOR SOCIAL ACTION
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RECONSTRUCTIONIST RABBINICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BEND THE ARC: A JEWISH PARTNERSHIP FOR JUSTICE
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISCIPLES JUSTICE ACTION NETWORK
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISCIPLES CENTER FOR PUBLIC WITNESS
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MEN OF REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Luchenitser
Represented By: Patrick Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?