Denver Bible Church, et al v. Azar, et al
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, CHAD W. WOLF, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security, STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, in his official capacity as Secretary, United States Department of the Treasury, ALEX M. AZAR, II, in his official capacity as Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Plaintiff / Appellee: ROBERT A. ENYART, JOEY RHOADS, COMMUNITY BAPTIST CHURCH and DENVER BIBLE CHURCH
Defendant / Appellant: COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH AND ENVIRONMENT, GOVERNOR JARED POLIS, in his official capacity as Governor, State of Colorado and JILL HUNSAKER RYAN, in her official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment
Case Number: 20-1377
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order [10780861] Order filed by Judges Hartz, Matheson and Eid - Response to Emergency Motion for Stay of Injunction Pending Appeal due 10/29/2020 for Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart and Joey Rhoads. Appellants may file a reply on or before 11/03/2020. To give the court adequate time to consider the motion for stay and response, the district court's order is temporarily stayed pending further order of the court. This temporary stay is solely for the benefit of the court's review process and has no bearing on the ultimate merits of the motion for stay. Appellants' motion for excess words is granted. Served on 10/22/2020. [20-1377] [Entered: 10/22/2020 05:11 PM]
October 20, 2020 [10780074] Entry of appearance filed by Brad Bergford for Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Community Baptist Church and Joey Rhoads. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/20/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1377] [Entered: 10/21/2020 07:29 AM]
October 20, 2020 [10780060] Entry of appearance submitted by Jon Bradley Bergford for Appellees Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart and Joey Rhoads for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/20/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1377] BB [Entered: 10/20/2020 05:24 PM]
October 19, 2020 [10779596] Motion filed by Appellants Jared Polis, Jill Hunsaker Ryan and Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment for stay of Preliminary Injunction. Served on: 10/19/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1377] WEK [Entered: 10/19/2020 04:58 PM]
October 19, 2020 [10779584] Motion filed by Appellants Jared Polis, Jill Hunsaker Ryan and Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment to file an oversize brief 7508 words long. Served on: 10/19/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1377] WEK [Entered: 10/19/2020 04:42 PM]
October 19, 2020 [10779200] Entry of appearance filed by Rebecca Messall for Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, Community Baptist Church and Joey Rhoads. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1377] [Entered: 10/19/2020 07:16 AM]
October 17, 2020 [10779189] Entry of appearance submitted by Rebecca R. Messall for Appellees Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart and Joey Rhoads for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/17/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/19/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1377] RM [Entered: 10/17/2020 08:33 AM]
October 16, 2020 [10778979] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/16/2020 Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 10/30/2020 for Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment, Jill Hunsaker Ryan and Jared Polis. Notice of appearance due on 10/30/2020 for Community Baptist Church, Denver Bible Church, Robert A. Enyart, and Joey Rhoads [20-1377] [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Denver Bible Church, et al v. Azar, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD W. WOLF, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN T. MNUCHIN, in his official capacity as Secretary, United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, in his official capacity as Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Represented By: Jason C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT A. ENYART
Represented By: Rebecca Messall
Represented By: Brad Bergford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOEY RHOADS
Represented By: Rebecca Messall
Represented By: Brad Bergford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COMMUNITY BAPTIST CHURCH
Represented By: Rebecca Messall
Represented By: Brad Bergford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DENVER BIBLE CHURCH
Represented By: Rebecca Messall
Represented By: Brad Bergford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH AND ENVIRONMENT
Represented By: Ryan K. Lorch
Represented By: Grant Sullivan
Represented By: William Eric Kuhn
Represented By: Corelle Spettigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GOVERNOR JARED POLIS, in his official capacity as Governor, State of Colorado
Represented By: Ryan K. Lorch
Represented By: Grant Sullivan
Represented By: William Eric Kuhn
Represented By: Corelle Spettigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JILL HUNSAKER RYAN, in her official capacity as Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment
Represented By: Ryan K. Lorch
Represented By: Grant Sullivan
Represented By: William Eric Kuhn
Represented By: Corelle Spettigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?