In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Plaintiff: CHARLES B. LEX, TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP, DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, BIEBER FARM, KRUSEMAN FERTILIZER COMPANY, JPPL, INC., ROLLING RIDGE RANCH, LLC, MIKE DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, BRADLEY DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, KAFFENBARGER FARMS, INC., KENNETH OSBORN, DEMMER FARMS, INC., CE COBB FARMS, D & S GRAIN & CATTLE CO. INC., MICHAEL GRIES, RICHARD CRONE, STEVEN A. WENTWORTH, CHARLES COBB, ROGER WARD, PINE HURST ACRES, DAVID SCHWANINGER, FIVE STAR FARMS, BEAVER CREEK FARMS, INC., VJW FARM, INC., GRAFEL FARMS, LLC, NEBCO, INC., AL-CORN CLEAN FUEL, LLC, DAVID POLIFKA, PETER V. ANDERSON, DAVID DAVAULT, DBA DaVault ArkMo Farms, ROBERT NIEMEYER, TODD NIEMEYER, NORMAN SIGRIST, RON WETZ, GRANT ANNEXSTAD, BRADLEY J. VERMEER, BOTTOMS FARMS PARTNERSHIP, MARVIN MILLER, LEROY EDLUND, CUSTOM FARM SERVICES, LLC and CHARLES A. WELSH
Defendant: SYNGENTA SEEDS, LLC, FKA Syngenta Seeds, Inc., SYNGENTA BIOTECHNOLOGY, INC., SYNGENTA AG, SYNGENTA CORPORATION, SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION AG and SYNGENTA CROP PROTECTION, LLC
Appellee: BYRON STONE, PLLC, TEEL & MARONEY, PLC, ABREO & CARTER, MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE, BRIAN FITZWATER LAW OFFICE, SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C., ELLIS & JUDD LAW OFFICE, LLC, OVERBOE LAW, CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC, CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP, NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW, JENNA LAIRD LEGER, THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC, LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART, TOURKOW CRELL ROSENBLATT & JOHNSTON LLP, CLARK LOVE & HUTSON, GP, WALK & MURPHY, PLC, HERITAGE LEGAL GROUP PLLC, CARPENTER & SCHUMACHER, P.C., MORRIS LAING EVANS BROCK & KENNEDY, PHILLIPPI LAW FIRM, LLC, MUSKE, MUSKE, SUHRHOFF LTD, VAN KLEY & WALKER, LLC, RICHARD D. LARSON, P.C., CLARK & CLARK P.C., WATTS GUERRA LLP, MCCLURE, THOMAS & THOMAS, LAW OFFICES OF LEONEL ALEJANDRO PC, DILLON LEGAL GROUP, CHURCH, CHURCH, HITTLE & ANTRIM, JOHNSON LAW GROUP, JOSEPH F. MANAK, Attorney at Law, CONNORS LLP, WALLACE LAW, HAWKINS LAW, PC, THE LAW OFFICE OF MARK L EUREK, MAYNES LAW OFFICE, THOMAS P. CALHOUN, III, Attorney at Law, LAW OFFICE OF MIKE CRANE, LLP, JEREMY P. COHEN, LAW OFFICES OF HANS A. BUEHLER, LLC, SORLING NORTHRUP ATTORNEYS, WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD, DANIEL M. HOMOLKA, P.A., ATLEE HALL, LLP, ANGEL, ISAACSON & TRACY, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, BRENNAN STEIL S.C., DENNEY & BARRETT, PC, ALERDING CASTOR HEWITT LLP, WADLER, PERCHES, HUNDL & KERLICK, WHITE & ALLEN, P.A., MCFARLAND LAW, PC, OKOON HINTERMEISTER, PLLC, GREAK LAW, P.C., SHAMBERG, WOLF, MCDERMOTT & DEPUE, FELLHEIMER LAW FIRM LTD., BLOOM GATES & WHITELEATHER, LLP, THOMPSON, GARRETT & HINES, RYAN MOORE & COOK, WOODS ROGERS PLC, WORTH LAW FIRM, BRAND & MORELOCK, THE LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS R. FIELDS, P.A., TULLY LAW OFFICE, PC, JOHN M. TOTTEN, P.C., WEEKS & BRUCKER, LTD, GAMBLE & RUSSELL, P.C., FAITH INGLE SMITH LAW FIRM, JUSTIN HILL, PC, DOBBS LEGAL GROUP, RAY, WINTON & KELLEY, PLLC, QUIRK & HUNTER, PC, MOORE, SUSLER, MCNUTT & WRIGLEY, LLC, FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC, FOREMAN WATSON HOLTREY, LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA, HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC, TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP, CRITCHFIELD CRITCHFIELD & JOHSON, LTD., BRIANA DEANE, MAILANDER LAW OFFICE, THE LAW OFFICE OF ROB TULLY PC, HABUSH HABUSH & ROTTIER S.C., VANDERGINST LAW, GARY T. GEE LAW OFFICE, COLE, EASLEY, SCIBA & WILLIAMS, P.C., DAVID R. ADELMAN, DAVIS & CAMPBELL, LLC, KEVIN W. LILES PC, WRIGHT SCHIMMEL LLC, PLEWS SHADLEY RACHER & BRAUN LLP, BOREN, OLVER AND COFFEY, LLP, HUME, SMITH, GEDDES, GREEN & SIMMONS, LLP, W. CALLOWAY HUFFAKER, ZEILINGER LAW OFFICE, REICHERT LAW OFFICE, SCHULTZ LAW, DEBORAH K. SMITH, RILEY-TANIS & ASSOCIATES PLLC, COOTS, HENKE & WHEELER, RICHARDSON, PATRICK, WESTBROOK & BRICKMAN, LLC, BERNATZ & VAN BEEK, ARNDT BUSWELL & THORN S.C., REICHERT WENNER, P.A., BROCK LAW OFFICES PC LLO, LAMKIN & LAMKIN, P.C., BURNS CRONAUER & BROWN LLP, PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, LLP, HENSLEY LEGAL GROUP PC, JOHN L. JERNIGAN, III, Attorney at Law, DARLING & DARLING, KOENIG LAW FIRM, MARTZ & LUCAS, LLC, MAZZANTI LAW OFFICE, PLLC, NATHAN J. NOBLE, P.C., LEE J. LEWIS, GREGG NEAL, CRESS LAW GROUP, PC, JOHN E. TARBURTON, Attorney at Law, BILL J. MILNER LAW OFFICES, LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD HOFFMAN, ROB TULLY LAW FIRM, KITTELSEN, BARRY, WELLINGTON, THOMPSON, & SCHLUESCHE, ATTORNEYS AT LAW, CHARLES HEAR, HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C., JAMES M. PIETZ, Attorney at Law, DREW YOUNG LAW, ALLEN, STEIN & DURBIN, PC, DANIEL QUIGLEY, CONRAD F. CROPSEY, Attorney at Law, BORING & BORING, PC, MARK A. ROEDER, PEMBERTON LAW FIRM, BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC, COTTON, BOLTON, HOYCHICK & DOUGHTY, LLP, SCHWARZ LAW OFFICE, BROOKS & OLSON, TERRIE HARMAN, Attorney at Law, RHOADES MCKEE PC, CLINE FARRELL CHRISTIE & LEE, P.C., NORMAN PALOUCEK & HERMAN, JOHNSON & MOCK, PC LLO, JEFFERSON & BREWER, LLP, GRIFFIN DIETRICH & ELLIOT, LLC, WINSTEIN, KAVENSKY & CUNNINGHAM, LLC, TUCKER & TUCKER, P.C., MEADOR & CRUMP, P.A., STRITTMATTER LAW FIRM, WILLIS & WILLIS, MALONEY & CAMPOLO, CUSTY LAW FIRM, LLC, FEARER, NYE, & CHADWICK, MCNEELY STEPHENSON, BLAKEMAN & SCHROCK, LTD, KELLEY LAW FIRM, PC, BIRD, JACOBSEN & STEVENS, PC, MICHAEL ASHAR, OUDERKIRK LAW FIRM, BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS LLP, BROYLES KIGHT & RICAFORT, PC, WRIGHT & SCHULTE LLC, KNUTH LAW OFFICE, MAURO ARCHER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC, BARRETT WYLIE, LLC, FRUNDT & JOHNSON, LTD., BROWN, DEPREZ & JOHNSON, P.A., JASON SCHUTTE, KOEPKE & HILTABRAND ATTORNEY AT LAW, LAURIE S. WARD, W. DEAN BELK, JR., Attorney at Law, THE MCQUADES CO. LPA, STONE LAW OFFICE, P.L.L.C., RICCOLO, SEMELROTH, & HENNINGSEN, P.C., HART BELL, LLC, BRADFORD LAW FIRM, MORGAN & MEYERS, PLC, HAJJAR PETERS, LLP, JEFF LINK, ROBERTS LAW OFFICE, ALLEN WELLMAN MCNEW HARVEY, LLP, LAW OFFICE OF HAMMELL & MURPHY PLLP, JAMES & LARSON LAW, JAMES LAW, P.C., DEWALD DEAVER, P.C., AARON D. HOVAN, Attorney at Law, SONENBERG LAW LLC, MICHAEL J. GALANIS, IRVIN L. MASCHING, LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER, LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY E. TONORE, MICHAEL GROSS, CHARLES E. CRONAUER & ASSOCIATES, DELZER LAW OFFICE, MILTNER LAW FIRM, LLC, PEN COSBY, RICHARD L. COFFMAN, P.C., DBA The Coffman Law Firm, KUHLMAN & LUCAS, LLC, THE WINKIE LAW FIRM, LLC, KIZER, BONDS, HUGHES & BOWEN, PLLC, GEORGE M. BISHOP, SEVER STOREY, LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS A. NOE, III, TUCKER LAW PRACTICE, BARBARA J. SIMMONS, MEIER, BRAGICICH & MOORE LLP, WOOD & RUE, PLLP, LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER H. POYNOR, ALEX KOENIGS, FLYNN & SULLIVAN PC, PATTERSON COMER, TROYER & GOOD, PC, OBEAR, OVERHOLSER, HUFFER & RIDER, LLC, MORRISSEY, MORRISSEY & DALLUGE, THE CANTLIN LAW FIRM, SHERMAN HOFFMAN & HIPP, LC, CORNELL LAW OFFICE, MARCH, MCMILLAN, DEJOODE & DUVALL, P.C., LEO BOOTHE, SPENCER GILLAND, THE STROM LAW FIRM, LLC, HECKER LAW GROUP, PLC, CARABIN & SHAW, P.C., HEINISCH & LOVEGROVE LAW OFFICE, PC LLP, HEHNER & ASSOCIATES, LLC, RICHARD RUSSELL, Attorney at Law, FAFINSKI MARK & JOHNSON, P.A., GORDON & ASSOCIATES, P.C., JINKS, CROW & DICKSON, P.C., WELD, RILEY, PRENN & RICCI S.C., BAKER, BODWELL, APPEL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH, LANGDON & EMISON ATTORNEYS AT LAW, BARRETT, EASTERDAY, CUNNINGHAM & ESELGROTH, LLP, MORNING LAW OFFICE LLC, SATTERLEY AND KELLEY, PLLC, HOVLAND & RASMUS, PLLC, BRAU LAW OFFICE, COPLEY ROTH & WILSON, LLC, CHARNETSKI, LACINA & CLOWER, LLP, CAUGHEY, LEGNER & FREEHILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, MYERS HOCKEMEYER & MCNAGNY LLP, FITZGERALD LAW P.A., STOERZBACH LAW OFFICE, P.C., RANDLE & SAMMONS, P.C., THE POPPE LAW FIRM, KC COHEN, LAWYER, PC, KEATON & KEATON PC, WILLIAM THOMAS, Attorney at Law, JANZEN AGRICULTURAL LAW, LLC, GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC, STOCKARD, JOHNSTON, & BROWN, P.C, HAMPTON & ROYCE, L.C., CULBERTSON & ALLEN, LLC, EMERICK, DIGGINS & ZABONA P.C., THE LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. LAPOINTE, P.C., KIRK LAW FIRM, GRAYBILL & WITCHER, LLP, BIGHAM LAW FIRM, SIMON HERBERT & MCCLELLAND, LLP, SMITH GARDNER SLUSKY LAZER POHREN & ROGERS LLP, NKA Smith Slusky Law, MITCHELL C. CHANEY, CLENDENING JOHNSON & BOHRER, P.C., BARBER, SEGATTO, HOFFEE, WILKE, & CATE, WILLADSEN & NEAL LLC, GELLHAUS & GELLHAUS, P. C., WOLF ARDIS, P.C., PATRICK A. ELWARD, FISHERBROYLES, LLP, ESPE LAW PLLC, KATZ & KORIN, P.C., WHITMAN, BABER, & SIEGEL, REILING TEDER & SCHRIER, LLC, WAYNE J. LENNINGTON, KRUSE & DAKIN LLP, VAUGHAN LAW FIRM, P.C., KOVARIK, ELLISON & MATHIS, P.C., NKA Ellison Kovarik & Turman Law Firm PC, LIND JENSEN SULLIVAN & PETERSON P.A., KEULER, KELLY HUTCHINS & BLANKENSHIP, LLP, CALL & GENTRY LAW GROUP, PAGEL & WEIKUM, PLLP, WOODARD LAW PC., DURRETT, ARKEMA, GERSON & GILL, P.C., PATTON HOVERSTEN & BERG P.A, ORLANS, P.C., DEBORAH SMITH MCCLURE, P.C., HOSTETTER & ASSOCIATES, SWAIM LAW FIRM, PLLC, CARY, WELCH, HICKMAN & HAWK, LLP, ESTES & KENNEDY LAW OFFICES, PLLC, WILLIAM F. SMITH, KENNETH G. WALSH, Attorney at Law, KRAMER LAW, LLC, THE PRUNEDA LAW FIRM, PLLC, GREGORY L. CESHKER, P.C., TOM BENSON, CHRIS W. FITZGERALD, Attorney at Law, EDMUND A. WEINHEIMER, JR., P. C., BRENT C. EMBREY, MERCHO CAUGHEY & DELAY, VELA LAW OFFICES PLLC, HALL HUDSON, P.C., THE LAW OFFICE OF GEORGE P. ESCOBEDO & ASSOCIATES, THE CAHILL LAW OFFICES, BARRETT MCNAGNY LLP, SCHMITTINGER & RODRIGUEZ, P.A., MASSIE & QUICK, LLC, SHIMANEK, SHIMANEK, & BOWMAN, LLC, PICKNER LAW OFFICE, QUIGLEY LAW OFFICE, NIDEY ERDAHL TINDAL & FISCHER, PLC, COLE LAW OFFICE, TED B. LYON & ASSOCIATES, P.C., TROTH LAW OFFICE, WASKER DOOR WIMMER & MARCOUILLER, P.C., SCHNELKER, RASSI & MCCONNELL PLC, MEYER & MEYER LLP, SOUNDING BOARD LEGAL, S.C., DAVE O'BRIEN LAW, EICH, VAN DYKE, WERDAN & STEGER P.C., LAW OFFICE OF BRENT GAINES, COCKERILL & COCKERILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW, THE LAW OFFICE OF SAMUEL W. BEARMAN, L.C., OTTS, MOORE, COALE, GODWIN, STEARNS & DARBY, JOHN R. DELZER, LAW OFFICE OF ADAM CRAWSHAW, HALLETT, HALLETT & NAGEL, PEMBERTON, SORLIE, RUFER, & KERSHNER, PLLP, MICHAEL SMITH LAW, VRIEZELAAR, TIGGES, EDINGTON, BOTTARO, BODEN, & ROSS, L.L.P., CROSS PENNAMPED WOOLSEY & GLAZIER, P.C., ENDURANCE LAW GROUP PLC, JOHNSON, KRAMER, MULHOLLAND, COCHRANE, DRISCOLL & COCHRANE, P.L.C., SCHWEBEL GOETZ & SIEBEN PA, DENTON & KEULER, LLP, UNDERWOOD LAW FIRM, PC, BAKKE NORMAN, S.C., CHAPMAN LAW LLC, GRENFELL, SLEDGE AND STEVENS, BUTLER SNOW, LLP, MINER & LEMON, LLP, RAY A. FERGUSON & ASSOCIATES, LTD., DYE SNYDER, LLP, LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY R. VAUGHAN, P.C., ROBINSON, CURPHEY & OCONNEL, LLC, JOHNSON, MOODY, SCHMIDT & KLEINHUIZEN, P.A., SLAVEN LAW GROUP, LAW OFFICE OF LESTER WEINSTINE, P.C., WELLER, GREEN, TOUPS & TERRELL, LLP, WICKENS & WICKENS, LLC, RICHARD M. HOLMES, CHESTER LAW OFFICE, BASSFORD REMELE, PA, KEMPTON & RUSSELL, LLC, RAMMELKAMP BRADNEY, P.C., ANTHONY O'HANLON, P.C., PATTON BROWN LAW, PLLC, JEFFREY A. BOGGESS, P.C., KRAFT WALSER LAW OFFICE, PLLP, MILLER PEARSON GLOE BURNS BEATTY & PARRISH, P.L.C., FORDE LAW OFFICES LLP, DOERING & GRISELL, PA, TROUSDALE RYAN, P.C., INGEBRITSON & ASSOCIATES, P.A., WARNER NORCROSS & JUDD, LLP, MIDWEST AG SOLUTIONS LLC, LAW OFFICE OF EZEQUIEL REYNA, JR., BEINE & ROBERTS LAW FIRM, PLC, E. RUDOLPH MCINTYRE, Attorney at Law, BRETT DUNN PLLC, NATHAN A. EAST, Attorney at Law, WYLAND, HUMPHREY & CLEVENGER LLP, WIL GALLOWAY & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, YIRA LAW OFFICE, LTD, VANDERVOORT CHRIST & FISHER, P.C., FENCHEL, DOSTER & BUCK, PLC, LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM R. SHIRK, CRYSTAL D. PULLEY, COLVIN, CHANEY, SAENZ & RODRIGUEZ, LLP, MERTES & MERTES, P.C., BOSCHMA LAW OFFICE, CROSS LAW FIRM, LLC, VIRTUS LAW PLLC, GROSBOLL, BECKER, TICE & BARR, ADAMS, RIZZI & SWEEN, P.A., TAYLOR & RUHNKE, PC, OSTERBAUER LAW FIRM, STOUT LAW GROUP and PATTON, HOVERSTEN & BERG, P.A.
Not Classified By Court: WALLER JORGENSON WARZYNSKI, PLLC, WHALEY LAW FIRM, THRASH LAW FIRM, P.A., SNEED LANG PC, SOPER LEDDIN LAW FIRM, PC, BATTS, BATTS & BELL, LLP, SHAMBERG JOHNSON & BERGMAN, LAW OFFICES OF JAMES S. ROGERS, BOHRER BRADY LLC, WALTERS BENDER STROHBEHN & VAUGHAN, P.C., CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C., SCOTT EMORY POYNTER, EMERSON POYNTER LLP, WESTERVELT, JOHNSON, NICOLL & KELLER, LLC, WAGSTAFF & CARTMELL, LLP, SAEED & LITTLE, LLP, HOLLAND LAW FIRM, BEASLEY, ALLEN, CROW, METHVIN, PORTIS & MILES, P.C., BENJAMIN MARSHALL & ASSOCIATES, DUNK LAW FIRM, PLLC, WESTERFIELD, JANOUSH & BELL, P.A., MILLER SCHIRGER LLC, ENGLISH, LUCAS, PRIEST & OWSLEY, LLP, PENDLEY, BAUDIN & COFFIN, L.L.P., SCHIRGER, KIRK, MCDOUGALL & WINZELER, P.C., BATTLE & WINN LLP, ANDERSON, BOTTRELL, SANDEN & THOMPSON, BRADY PRESTON GRONLUND PC, MILBERG TADLER PHILLIPS GROSSMAN LLP, STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP, THE GIBBS LAW FIRM, SEEGER WEISS LLP, LUNDBERG LAW FIRM PLC, GREEN ESPEL PLLP, MCCULLEY MCCLUER PLLC, MARTIN, BROWNE, HULL & HARPER PLL, BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE, ROTH LAW FIRM, HODGE LAW FIRM, ZIMMERMAN REED, LLP, WEXLER WALLACE LLP, SIMMONS HANLY CONROY LLC, JAKE W. BROOKS, WADLER PERCHES HUNDL & KERLICK, BROOKS PIERCE, WAGNER REESE, LLP, BOLEN ROBINSON & ELLIS, LLP, LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN PLLP, EMERSON SCOTT LLP, KRUML LAW OFFICE, P.C., SPEER LAW FIRM, PC, BRAD MORRIS LAW FIRM, PLLC, PAUL LLP and In re: GRAY REED & MCGRAW LLP
Appellant: STUEVE SIEGEL HANSON LLP, HARE, WYNN, NEWELL & NEWTON, GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C. and GRAY REED & MCGRAW LLP
Case Number: 20-3002
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 [10779875] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring Appellants' motion for leave to file additional briefing [ # 10777883-2 ] and Appellees' joint response in opposition [ # 10778802-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 10/20/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 10/20/2020 12:56 PM]
October 15, 2020 [10778802] Response filed by Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3079, 19-3082, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Clark, Love & Hutson, PLLC, Phipps Anderson Deacon LLP and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000 to Motion for Leave to File Additional Briefing. Served on 10/15/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 10/15/2020 02:39 PM]
October 13, 2020 [10777883] Motion filed by Appellants Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC and James J. Thompson, Jr. in 19-3174, Hossley-Embry, LLP for leave to file a supplemental brief. Served on: 10/13/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes..--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278.] [19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:16 PM]
September 28, 2020 [10774801] Paper copies of RESPONSE BRIEF OF JOINT APPELLEES received.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 09:00 AM]
September 28, 2020 [10774855] Paper copies of CONTINGENT CROSS-APPEAL BRIEF OF KANSAS CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:01 AM]
September 28, 2020 [10774881] Paper copies of OPENING BRIEF OF TOUPS/COFFMAN PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL & HOSSLEY-EMBRY (KANSAS POOL APPELLANTS) received..--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:25 AM]
September 28, 2020 [10774872] Paper copies of RESPONSE BRIEF OF HENINGER APPELLEE TO CONTINGENT CROSS-APPEAL BRIEF OF KANSAS CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:18 AM]
September 28, 2020 [10774791] Paper copies of CONTINGENT CROSS-APPEAL REPLY BRIEF OF KANSAS CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL received.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 08:48 AM]
September 28, 2020 [10774780] Paper copies of Reply and Response Brief of Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel & Hossley-Embry (Kansas Pool Appellants) received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 08:29 AM]
September 25, 2020 [10774981] Paper copies of Illinois Appellants' Brief received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 12:49 PM]
September 25, 2020 [10774937] Paper copies of CONTINGENT CROSS-APPEAL RESPONSE OF MINNESOTA CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:25 AM]
September 25, 2020 [10774931] Paper copies of Illinois Appellants and the Clark/Phipps Groups Combined Reply On Direct Appeal, Response to Kansas and Minnesota Appellants Briefs, and Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:18 AM]
September 24, 2020 [10774784] Paper copies of CONSOLIDATED REPLY BRIEF AND CROSS-APPEAL RESPONSE BRIEF OF MINNESOTA APPELLANTS WATTS GUERRA, LLP, PAUL BYRD LAW FIRM, PLLC AND SHIELDS LAW GROUP, LLC received.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 08:33 AM]
September 24, 2020 [10774941] Paper copies of CONSOLIDATED OPENING BRIEF OF MINNESOTA APPELLANTS WATTS GUERRA, LLP, PAUL BYRD LAW FIRM, PLLC AND SHIELDS LAW GROUP, LLC, received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:38 AM]
September 23, 2020 [10773055] Errata sheet filed by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, Henninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002 to Response Brief of Heninger Appellee to Contingent Cross-Appeal of Kansas Co-Lead Plaintiffs (Dkt. 010110411393). Served on 09/23/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] WLG [Entered: 09/23/2020 04:50 PM]
September 23, 2020 [10772891] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by REPLY AND RESPONSE BRIEF OF TOUPS/COFFMAN PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL & HOSSLEY-EMBRY (KANSAS POOL APPELLANTS) is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments. Paper copies 9/30/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 01:40 PM]
September 23, 2020 [10772877] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by OPENING BRIEF OF TOUPS/COFFMAN PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL & HOSSLEY-EMBRY (KANSAS POOL APPELLANTS) is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments. Paper copies are due 9/30/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 01:14 PM]
September 23, 2020 [10772863] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by Illinois Appellants and the Clark/Phipps Groups Combined Reply On Direct Appeal, Response to Kansas and Minnesota Appellants Briefs, and Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments. Paper copies are due 9/30/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 12:28 PM]
September 23, 2020 [10772850] Minute order filed - Contingent Cross-Appeal Brief Of Kansas Co-Lead Counsel is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing. Paper copies of the brief due 09/30/2020 by Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C. and Graybill & Witcher, LLP. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:56 AM]
September 23, 2020 [10772721] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by RESPONSE BRIEF OF JOINT APPELLEES is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments. Paper copies are due 9/30/2020. (Text Only - No Attachment). --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 09:21 AM]
September 23, 2020 [10772654] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellants Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo, The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland (Illinois Appellants Brief) is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments. Paper copies due by 9/30/2020. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 07:50 AM]
September 22, 2020 [10772616] Errata sheet filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3279, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, White & Allen, P.A. and FisherBroyles, LLP in 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002 to. Served on 09/22/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:59 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772613] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal and Reply Brief filed by KS Appellants (Toups/Coffman & Hossley/Embry). Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: US mail, email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 09/22/2020 08:28 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772611] Consolidated Opening Brief filed by KS Appellants (Toups/Coffman & Hossley/Embry). Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: US mail, email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 09/22/2020 08:08 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772606] Errata sheet filed by Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo in 19-3284, Clark Love Huston; Phipps Anderson Deacon LLP; Meyers & Flowers, LLC (Counsel for The Clark/Phipps Group) and The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, PC (Counsel for The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland) to Illinois Appellants and the Clark/Phipps Group Combined Reply on Direct Appeal, Response to Kansas and Minnesota Appellants Briefs, and Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal, originally filed with the Court on August 19, 2020. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/22/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JD [Entered: 09/22/2020 05:27 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772598] Reply brief filed by IL Appellants (Eiland & Demerath). Served on 09/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JD [Entered: 09/22/2020 05:06 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772595] Consolidated Opening Brief filed by IL Appellants (Eiland & Demerath). Served on 09/22/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JD [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:56 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772586] Notice filed by Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 20-3002. Served on 09/22/2020 by email.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:40 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772577] Errata sheet filed by Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000 to. Served on 09/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:35 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772573] Joint Appellees' Response Brief filed by KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel, Heninger Garrison (IL Counsel), MN Co-Lead Counsel. Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:30 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772566] Conditional Cross-Appeal Brief filed by KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel. Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:24 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772564] Minute order filed - the Contingent Cross-Appeal Reply Brief of Kansas Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments. Paper copies due by 9/29/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:24 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772556] Minute order filed - the Response Brief of Heninger Appellee to Contingent Cross-Appeal Brief of Kansas Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:08 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772538] Conditional Cross-Appeal Reply Brief filed by KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel. Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 09/22/2020 03:45 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772474] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal Brief filed by Heninger Garrison Davis (IL Counsel). Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: US mail, email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modfiy brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] WLG [Entered: 09/22/2020 02:36 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772448] Minute order filed - Shields Law Group and Paul Byrd Law Firm's opening and reply briefs are accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/22/2020 01:59 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772412] Minute order filed - the 2nd brief on cross-appeal filed by Minnesota Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments. Paper copies due by 9/29/20 from Minnesota Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel Gustafson Gluek PLLC. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/22/2020 12:54 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772401] Minute order filed - the Consolidated Opening Brief, and the Consolidated Reply Brief and Cross-Appeal Response Brief of MN Appellants Watts Guerra, Paul Byrd Law firm and Shields Law Group are accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments. Paper copies now due by 9/29/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/22/2020 12:24 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772379] Notice filed by Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC and James J. Thompson, Jr. in 19-3174. Served on 09/22/2020 by email. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 09/22/2020 12:06 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772375] Separate Reply Brief filed by Byrd/Shields. Served on 09/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 09/22/2020 12:01 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772373] Separate Opening brief filed by MN Appellants (Byrd/Shields). Served on 09/22/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 09/22/2020 11:57 AM]
September 22, 2020 [10772311] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal Brief filed by MN Co-Lead Counsel (except Watts Guerra). Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DEG [Entered: 09/22/2020 10:17 AM]
September 22, 2020 [10772263] Errata sheet filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002, Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC and Shields Law Group, LLC to Minnesota Appellants' Opening Brief. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:31 AM]
September 22, 2020 [10772259] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal and Reply filed by MN Appellants (Watts Guerra & Byrd/Shields). Served on: 09/22/2020. Manner of service: US mail, email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:27 AM]
September 22, 2020 [10772252] Consolidated Opening brief brief filed by MN Appellants (Watts Guerra & Bird/Shields). Served on 09/22/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:10 AM]
September 21, 2020 [10774863] Paper copies of appellant brief and reply brief received from Johnson Becker, PLLC. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:07 AM]
September 18, 2020 [10772864] Paper copies of the Joint Appendix and 2 USB drives (per 4/6/20 order) received. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/23/2020 12:40 PM]
September 18, 2020 [10771506] Minute order filed - the opening and reply briefs submitted by Appellant Johnson Becker, PLLC (No. 19-3175) are accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments and number of volumes filed (for appendices). Paper copies of opening and reply briefs due 09/25/2020 by Johnson Becker, PLLC. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/18/2020 11:47 AM]
September 18, 2020 [10771461] Reply brief filed by Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Served on 09/18/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify title of brief.][19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] TJB [Entered: 09/18/2020 10:35 AM]
September 18, 2020 [10771455] Opening brief filed by Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Served on 09/18/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify title of brief.][19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] TJB [Entered: 09/18/2020 10:31 AM]
September 17, 2020 [10771242] Supplemental preliminary record filed. Contents: Motions for reconsideration.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/17/2020 01:48 PM]
September 15, 2020 [10770471] Minute order filed - the joint appendix submitted is accepted for filing. One paper copy of each volume shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing. (Text Only - No Attachment)--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/15/2020 01:40 PM]
September 15, 2020 [10770377] Joint Deferred Appendix filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172, 20-3000 (Vols. 15-32). Total number of volumes filed: 32. Served on 09/15/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:12 AM]
September 15, 2020 [10770372] Joint Deferred Appendix filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3082, 19-3172, 20-3000 (Vols. 1-14). Total number of volumes filed: 32. Served on 09/15/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. .--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify appendix title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 09/15/2020 10:55 AM]
September 14, 2020 [10770136] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying without prejudice to renewal the joint motion for leave to file additional briefing filed by Appellants Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC, and Hossley-Embrey, LLP. See order. Served on 09/14/2020.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/14/2020 02:44 PM]
September 14, 2020 [10770034] Motion filed by Appellants Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC and James J. Thompson, Jr. in 19-3174, Hossley-Embry, LLP for leave to file a supplemental brief. Served on: 09/14/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:56 AM]
September 1, 2020 [10767041] Minute order filed -.Pursuant to this court's 4/06/20 order, the joint appendix remains due 9/15/20 and the final briefs shall be filed by 9/22/20. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/01/2020 12:29 PM]
September 1, 2020 [10767011] Minute order filed - the Conditional Cross-Appeal Reply brief submitted by Kansas MDL Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel is accepted for filing. Paper copies are not required per this court's 4/06/20 order. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 09/01/2020 11:48 AM]
September 1, 2020 [10766952] Conditional Cross-appeal Reply Brief filed by KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel. Served on: 09/01/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes..--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 09/01/2020 10:28 AM]
August 26, 2020 [10765610] Paper copies of appellant's reply brief received from Johnson Bekcer, PLLC --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:43 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764322] Minute order filed - Pursuant to the 04/06/2020 order, the Conditional Cross-Appeal Reply Brief (fourth brief on cross-appeal) of the Kansas MDL Co-Lead Counsel is due on 09/01/2020. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/20/2020 09:55 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764316] Minute order filed - the Reply and Response Brief submitted by Toups/Coffman Plaintiffs' Counsel & Hossley-Embry (Kansas Pool Appellants) is accepted for filing. Paper copies need not be submitted per the order of 04/06/2020. (Text Only - No Attachment)--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/20/2020 09:46 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764306] Minute order filed - the Consolidated Reply/Response Brief (third brief on cross-appeal) filed by the Minnesota Appellants Watts Guerra LLP, Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, and Shields Law Group, LLC is accepted for filing. Paper copies need not be submitted per this court's 04/06/2020 order. (Text Only - No Attachment)--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/20/2020 09:19 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764270] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellants Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC and James J. Thompson, Jr. is accepted for filing. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/20/2020 08:41 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764247] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC is accepted for filing. (Text Only - No Attachment)--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/20/2020 08:12 AM]
August 20, 2020 [10764239] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by Gustafson Gluek, PLLC, Minnesota Co-Lead Counsel is accepted for filing. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 08/20/2020 by MLB - no paper copies due at this time]--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/20/2020 07:54 AM]
August 19, 2020 [10764209] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal and Reply filed by KS Appellants (Toups/Coffman & Hossley/Embry). Served on: 08/19/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] --[Edited docket text 08/20/2020 by SLS.] EAI [Entered: 08/19/2020 06:14 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764210] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal Brief filed by Heninger Garrson Davis (IL Counsel). Served on: 08/19/2020. Manner of service: US mail, email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 08/20/2020 by MLB to clarify docket text].--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] WLG [Entered: 08/19/2020 06:15 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764208] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellants Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo in 19-3284, Clark Love Huston; Phipps Anderson Deacon LLP; Meyers & Flowers, LLC (Counsel for The Clark/Phipps Group)is accepted for filing. (Text Only - No Attachment)--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/19/2020 06:12 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764207] Response to Contingent Cross-Appeal and Reply filed by MN Appellants (Watts Guerra & Byrd/Shields). Served on: 08/19/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] --[Edited docket text 08/20/2020 by SLS] JAL [Entered: 08/19/2020 06:07 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764206] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellant Johnson Becker, PLLC is accepted for filing. (Text Only - No Attachment) --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 08/19/2020 06:04 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764195] Separate Reply Brief filed by Byrd/Shields. Served on 08/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 08/19/2020 04:55 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764122] Reply brief filed by IL Appellants (Eiland & Demerath). Served on 08/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JD [Entered: 08/19/2020 02:42 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764091] Reply brief filed by Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Served on 08/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] TJB [Entered: 08/19/2020 02:01 PM]
August 19, 2020 [10764073] Response to Contingent Cross Appeal Brief filed by MN Co-Lead Counse (except Watts Guerra). Served on: 08/19/2020. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 08/20/2020 by MLB to clarify docket text] --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DEG [Entered: 08/19/2020 01:28 PM]
July 31, 2020 [10759577] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the court on the Minnesota Appellants Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Order. The motion is unopposed. Upon consideration, the motion is granted. The Minnesota Appellants may file a consolidated reply brief limited to 6,000 words and Shields/Byrd may file a separate reply brief limited to 1,500 words. Both reply briefs shall be filed and served on or before August 19, 2020. Served on 07/31/2020. --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 07/31/2020 04:35 PM]
July 31, 2020 [10759411] Motion filed by Appellants Awbrey Law Firm, Clark Mason Attorneys, Kelly Law Firm, P.A., Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC, Shields Law Group, LLC and James J. Thompson, Jr. in 19-3174, Watts Guerra LLP to reconsider Minnesota Appellants' Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Order.. Served on: 07/31/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 07/31/2020 12:23 PM]
July 31, 2020 [10759383] Minute order filed - the Conditional Cross-Appeal Brief of Kansas CoLead Plaintiffs' Counsel is accepted for filing. The Reply and/or Response to Cross-Appeal Briefs shall be filed by 8/19/20 per this court's 4/6/20 Order. (Text Only - No Attachment)--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 07/31/2020 11:43 AM]
July 31, 2020 [10759338] Conditional Cross Appeal Brief filed by KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel. Served on: 07/31/2020. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 08/20/2020 by MLB to clarify docket text] --[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 07/31/2020 09:56 AM]
July 31, 2020 [10759282] Notice of deficient first brief on cross-appeal received from (Kansas CoLead Plaintiffs' Counsel) Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Type of deficiency: Missing order(s) appealed. See attached letter for specifics. Corrected brief due on 08/03/2020 for Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002]--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [Entered: 07/31/2020 07:28 AM]
July 30, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket.Brief refiled 7/31/20 [DD] [10759160] First brief on cross-appeal filed by Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002. Served on: 07/30/2020. Manner of service: email, US mail. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:12 PM]
July 21, 2020 [10756670] Minute order filed - the consolidated response brief submitted by joint appellees is accepted for filing. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002]--[Edited 07/21/2020 by DJD to remove deadline for paper copies]--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [Entered: 07/21/2020 07:57 AM]
July 20, 2020 [10756582] Joint Appellees' Response Brief filed by KS MDL Co-Lead Counsel, Heninger Garrison (IL Counsel), MN Co-Lead Counsel. Served on: 07/20/2020. Manner of service: email, US mail. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278 and modify brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] BW [Entered: 07/20/2020 04:13 PM]
June 23, 2020 [10749244] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting motion of Jason M. Milne to withdraw as counsel for the Clark/Phipps Group. Served on 06/23/2020. Text only entry - no attachment.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.][19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/23/2020 08:33 AM]
June 22, 2020 [10749163] Motion of Jason M. Milne to withdraw as counsel for the Clark/Phipps Group. Served on 06/22/2020. Manner of Service: email. .--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from dismissed appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/22/2020 03:49 PM]
June 4, 2020 [10745202] Minute order filed - The Illinois Appellants' brief is accepted for filing. Per the Court's General Order of March 16, 2020, paper copies are not required at this time. Parties may be directed to file paper copies at a later date. (Text Only - No Attachment) .--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/04/2020 03:39 PM]
June 4, 2020 [10745151] Consolidated Opening Brief filed by IL Appellants (Eiland & Demerath). Served on 06/04/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes..--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278 and edit brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JD [Entered: 06/04/2020 02:20 PM]
June 3, 2020 [10744884] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellant Johnson Becker PLLC is accepted for filing. Per the Court's General Order of March 16, 2020, paper copies are not required at this time. Parties may be directed to file paper copies at a later date. (Text Only - No Attachment).--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278.] [19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/03/2020 04:14 PM]
June 3, 2020 [10744877] Opening brief filed by Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Served on 06/03/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/21/2020 by LAB to remove from appeal 19-3278 and modify title of brief.] [19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] TJB [Entered: 06/03/2020 03:48 PM]
June 2, 2020 [10744343] Notice of appellants' deficient brief received from Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C., Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo. See attached letter for specifics. Appellants' corrected brief due on 06/05/2020 for Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, P.C., Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/02/2020 08:51 AM]
June 2, 2020 [10744328] Minute order filed - The Toups/Coffman & Hossley-Embry opening brief is accepted for filing. Per the Court's General Order of March 16, 2020, paper copies are not required at this time. Parties may be directed to file paper copies at a later date. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/02/2020 08:30 AM]
June 2, 2020 [10744306] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by the Minnesota appellants Watts Gierra, Paul Byrd Law Firm and Shields Law Group is accepted for filing. Per the Court's General Order of March 16, 2020, paper copies are not required at this time. Parties may be directed to file paper copies at a later date. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-3082, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/02/2020 07:59 AM]
June 1, 2020 [10744269] Notice filed by Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002. Served on 06/01/2020 by email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 06/01/2020 10:37 PM]
June 1, 2020 [10744265] Consolidated Opening Brief filed by KS Appellants (Toups/Coffman & Hossley Embry). Served on 06/01/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/22/2020 by LAB to modify brief title.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 06/01/2020 08:50 PM]
June 1, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] Brief refiled. [10744255] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo in 19-3284, The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland. Served on 06/01/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002]--[Edited 06/02/2020 by KLP - cited as deficient.]--[Edited 06/04/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; brief refiled.] JD [Entered: 06/01/2020 06:07 PM]
June 1, 2020 [10744254] Separate Opening Brief filed by MN Appellants (Byrd/Shields). Served on 06/01/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. --[Edited 10/22/2020 by LAB to edit brief title.][19-3174, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] CJN [Entered: 06/01/2020 05:59 PM]
June 1, 2020 [10744231] Consolidated Opening Brief filed by MN Appellants (Watts Guerra & Byrd/Shields). Served on 06/01/2020 by email, US mail. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 10/22/2020 by LAB to modify brief title.] [19-3082, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 06/01/2020 04:34 PM]
June 1, 2020 [10744163] Notice of appellant's deficient brief received from Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Type of deficiency: Missing order appealed. See attached letter for specifics. Appellant's brief due on 06/04/2020 for Johnson Becker, PLLC [19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 06/01/2020 02:51 PM]
June 1, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket.Corrected brief filed 6/03/20) [DD] [10744114] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Johnson Becker, PLLC in 19-3175. Served on 06/01/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3175, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] TJB [Entered: 06/01/2020 01:50 PM]
April 6, 2020 [10730918] Order filed by Clerk of the Court adopting the following briefing schedule: Stage 1: Appellants' Consolidated Opening Briefs (4) are due 06/01/2020; Stage 2: Joint Appellees' Consolidated Response Brief (1) is due 07/20/2020; Stage 3: Conditional Cross-Appeal Opening Brief (1) is due 07/30/2020; Stage 4: Reply and/or Response to Cross-Appeal Briefs (6) are due 08/19/2020; and Stage 5: Conditional CrossAppeal Reply (1) is due 09/01/2020. The request to file a joint deferred appendix as well as the request for an exemption from the requirement that the entire record be included in the appendix is granted. Please see the attached order for additional information. Served on 04/06/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 04/06/2020 02:41 PM]
March 30, 2020 [10729341] Response filed by Watts Guerra LLP in 19-3021, 19-3032, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002 to Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Served on 03/30/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3021, 19-3008, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] JAL [Entered: 03/30/2020 08:20 PM]
March 24, 2020 [10727861] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting in part and denying in part the motion to suspend or extend briefing. The motion is granted in part insofar as the deadline for the parties to submit a joint briefing proposal is extended to 3/30/20, but the motion is otherwise denied as premature. See order for details. Served on 03/24/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 03/24/2020 01:29 PM]
March 24, 2020 [10727737] Response filed by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3032, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3002 to Motion to Suspend or Extend Briefing in Light of Rapidly Unfolding COVID-19 Coronavirus Pandemic. Served on 03/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] PJS [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:41 AM]
March 23, 2020 [10727590] Motion filed by Appellants Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3008, Appellees Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. in 19-3021, Appellants Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, White & Allen, P.A. and Abreo & Carter in 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002 to extend time to file a response until 04/24/2020, to vacate March 11, 2020 Order, Doc. No. 010110317648, directing parties to submit a Joint Briefing Proposal under which the briefing of these appeals would be completed by September 1, 2020 order. Served on: 03/23/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] EAI [Entered: 03/23/2020 05:09 PM]
March 11, 2020 [10724467] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. The 17 appeals listed in the caption of this order are hereby consolidated for all procedural purposes including briefing, and submission to the court. Within 14 days from the date of this order parties are directed to confer and file a briefing proposal for the court's consideration. Briefing proposal is due on 03/25/2020 for all parties in all 17 appelas. Please see order for additional information and instructions. Served on 03/11/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 03/11/2020 10:46 AM]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order [10724436] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting the request to lift the abatement of these appeals. Procedural consolidation and briefing will be addressed by separate order. Served on 03/11/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 03/11/2020 09:37 AM]
February 20, 2020 [10719045] Reply filed by MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Served on 02/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:40 AM]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order [10719041] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. The joint reply shall be filed as of the date of this order. Served on 02/20/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:35 AM]
February 18, 2020 [10718502] Motion filed by Appellant Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3032, Appellee Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3002 for leave to file reply to. Served on: 02/18/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] PJS [Entered: 02/18/2020 04:24 PM]
February 14, 2020 [10718080] Response filed by Gustafson Gluek, PLLC in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 20-3000, 20-3002, MN Co-Lead Counsel to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Request to Lift Abatement. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DEG [Entered: 02/14/2020 12:22 PM]
February 14, 2020 [10718056] Response filed by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3278, 20-3002, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279 to MDL Co-Lead Counsels' Memorandum Concerning Finality of Fee Allocation Orders. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3278, 20-3002, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279] CBH [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:42 AM]
February 11, 2020 [10717184] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. An in-person mediation conference is scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 12:00 pm, and 2/28/2020 at 9:00 am (MT). [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/11/2020 02:35 PM]
January 31, 2020 [10714688] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Any party wishing to file a response supporting or opposing MDL Co-Lead Counsels memorandum and request to lift the abatement shall do so on or before 02/14/20. The responses shall be filed only in the appeal(s) corresponding to the filing party. These appeals shall remain abated pending further order of the court. Served on 01/31/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:45 PM]
January 28, 2020 [10713517] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Scott Ashley Powell and Bruce McKee for Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common benefit Firms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] [Entered: 01/28/2020 09:33 AM]
January 27, 2020 [10713360] Entry of appearance filed by Daniel E. Gustafson for Representative Plaintiffs and Gustafson Gluek PLLC, Bassford Remele, P.A., and Schwebel Goetz & Sieben PA (Minnesota Co-Lead Counsel). CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] [Entered: 01/27/2020 04:30 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713352] Entry of appearance filed by Diogenes P. Kekatos and Stephen A. Weiss for Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Fund Benefit Firms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] [Entered: 01/27/2020 04:17 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713348] Entry of appearance filed by Tempe D. Smith for Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al. (Kansas Common Benefit Firms) . CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] [Entered: 01/27/2020 04:13 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713342] Entry of appearance filed by Don Manley Downing and Gretchen Garrison for Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Benefit Firms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] [Entered: 01/27/2020 04:07 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713329] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. William B. Chaney and Mr. Andrew K. York for Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Benefit FirmsCERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] [Entered: 01/27/2020 04:00 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713287] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellee Gustafson Gluek, PLLCMinnesota Co-Lead Counsel for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] --[Edited 01/27/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] DEG [Entered: 01/27/2020 03:22 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713277] Entry of appearance submitted by Tempe D. Smith for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Charles B. Lex, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Steven A. Wentworth, Roger Ward, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Jake W. Brooks, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Scott Emory Poynter, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Saeed & Little, LLP, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP and The Gibbs Law Firm for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002]--[Edited 01/27/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] SAP [Entered: 01/27/2020 03:14 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713265] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott A. Powell and Bruce J. McKee for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Steven A. Wentworth, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, The Gibbs Law Firm and Scott Emory Poynter for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002]--[Edited 01/28/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 1/28/20.] SAP [Entered: 01/27/2020 03:06 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713226] Entry of appearance filed by Richard L. Coffman for William Thomas, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Mr. James M. Pietz, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John E. Tarburton, Orlans, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Slaven Law Group, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Molleur Law Office, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, John M. Totten, P.C., Bigham Law Firm, Mr. Nathan A. East, Mr. Richard Russell, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Terrie Harman and White & Allen, P.A. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] [Entered: 01/27/2020 02:25 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713205] Entry of appearance submitted by William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Leroy Edlund, Roger Ward, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company and Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002]--[Edited 01/27/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 1/27/20. ] WBC [Entered: 01/27/2020 02:00 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713198] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mitchell A. Toups for Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP. (Toups/Coffman attorneys) CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] [Entered: 01/27/2020 01:49 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713197] MDL Co-Lead Counsels Memorandum Concerning Finality. Served on 01/27/2020 by email.--[Edited 01/31/2020 by MLB to correct the name of the pleading] [20-3002] PJS [Entered: 01/27/2020 01:46 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713182] Entry of appearance submitted by Mitchell A. Toups for Appellees Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, White & Allen, P.A., Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and Richard L. Coffman, P.C. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002]--[Edited 01/27/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] MAT [Entered: 01/27/2020 01:24 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713155] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard L. Coffman for Appellees Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP and White & Allen, P.A. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] --[Edited 01/27/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] RLC [Entered: 01/27/2020 12:41 PM]
January 27, 2020 [10713070] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/27/2020. (This appeal is abated.) [20-3002] [Entered: 01/27/2020 10:11 AM]
January 27, 2020 [10712982] Entry of appearance filed by Bradley Wilders for Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al. (Kansas Common Benefit Firms) CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/27/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-3002] [Entered: 01/27/2020 07:47 AM]
January 27, 2020 [10712972] Entry of appearance filed by Christopher A. Seeger for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, The Gibbs Law Firm, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Appellants Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Appellees Wadler, Perches, Hundl & Kerlick and Wagner Reese, LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-3002] [Entered: 01/27/2020 07:30 AM]
January 27, 2020 [10712966] Entry of appearance filed by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Jake W. Brooks, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, The Gibbs Law Firm, Appellants Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP and Appellees Wadler, Perches, Hundl & Kerlick and Wagner Reese, LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-3002] [Entered: 01/27/2020 07:25 AM]
January 24, 2020 [10712922] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen A. Weiss; Diogenes P. Kekatos for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Appellees Custy Law Firm, LLC, Wagner Reese, LLP and Appellants Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP and Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] --[Edited 01/27/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] SAW [Entered: 01/24/2020 04:15 PM]
January 24, 2020 [10712915] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher A. Seeger for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, CE Cobb Farms, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, The Gibbs Law Firm, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Appellants Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Appellees Wadler, Perches, Hundl & Kerlick and Wagner Reese, LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 01/27/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/27/20] [20-3002] CAS [Entered: 01/24/2020 03:59 PM]
January 24, 2020 [10712907] Entry of appearance submitted by Don M. Downing; Gretchen Garrison for Appellant Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] --[Edited 01/27/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] DMD [Entered: 01/24/2020 03:52 PM]
January 24, 2020 [10712845] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 01/31/2020 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KSkc), Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-3002] [Entered: 01/24/2020 03:00 PM]
January 24, 2020 [10712835] Docketing statement filed by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Ritter & Graham P.C., Hare Wynn Newell & Newton, and Gray Reed & McGraw LLP. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] --[Edited 01/24/2020 by SLS to add filers.] PJS [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:48 PM]
January 24, 2020 [10712823] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Served on: 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002] PJS [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:43 PM]
January 24, 2020 [10712819] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Jake W. Brooks, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, The Gibbs Law Firm, Appellants Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP and Appellees Wadler, Perches, Hundl & Kerlick and Wagner Reese, LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/27/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/27/20][20-3002] PJS [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:40 PM]
January 24, 2020 [10712788] Entry of appearance submitted by Bradley T. Wilders for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Emory Poynter, Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Appellants Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Appellee Wagner Reese, LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002]--[Edited 01/27/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] BJV [Entered: 01/24/2020 02:14 PM]
January 24, 2020 [10712765] Entry of appearance filed by Eric Alan Isaacson for William Thomas, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Mr. James M. Pietz, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., Mr. John E. Tarburton, Orlans, P.C., Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Slaven Law Group, Teel & Maroney, PLC, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Molleur Law Office, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, John M. Totten, P.C., Bigham Law Firm, Mr. Nathan A. East, Mr. Richard Russell, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Terrie Harman and White & Allen, P.A.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-3002] [Entered: 01/24/2020 01:38 PM]
January 24, 2020 [10712750] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric Alan Isaacson for Appellees Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Abreo & Carter, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Mr. W. Dean Belk, Jr., Bigham Law Firm, Butler Snow, LLP, Mr. Thomas P. Calhoun, III, Mr. Conrad F. Cropsey, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Mr. Nathan A. East, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Greak Law, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Terrie Harman, Mr. Aaron D. Hovan, Mr. John L. Jernigan, III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Mr. Joseph F. Manak, Mr. E. Rudolph McIntyre, Molleur Law Office, Orlans, P.C., Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Mr. James M. Pietz, Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Mr. Richard Russell, Slaven Law Group, Mr. John E. Tarburton, Teel & Maroney, PLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Mr. Kenneth G. Walsh and White & Allen, P.A. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/24/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 1/24/20][20-3002] EAI [Entered: 01/24/2020 01:13 PM]
January 21, 2020 [10711118] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffrey A. Lamken and Mr. Eric R. Nitz for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/17/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-3002] [Entered: 01/21/2020 07:23 AM]
January 21, 2020 [10711107] Entry of appearance filed by Thomas J. Wiegand for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/17/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-3002] [Entered: 01/21/2020 06:57 AM]
January 17, 2020 [10711068] Entry of appearance submitted by Thomas J. Wiegand for Appellee Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/17/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3002]--[Edited 01/21/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/21/20] TW [Entered: 01/17/2020 07:22 PM]
January 17, 2020 [10711065] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey A. Lamken and Eric R. Nitz for Appellee Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/17/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/21/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 1/21/20][20-3002] JAL [Entered: 01/17/2020 07:14 PM]
January 15, 2020 [10710191] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case pending allocation of the IRPA Pool. The parties need not file reports in this appeal. Notwithstanding the abatement, the parties shall file all preliminary documents. Please see attached order for additional information. Served on 01/15/2020. [20-3002] [Entered: 01/15/2020 04:14 PM]
January 10, 2020 [10709032] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/07/2020. Entry of appearance, transcript order form and docketing statement due 01/24/2020 for Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP. Entry of appearance due on 01/24/2020 for Appellees. [20-3002] [Entered: 01/10/2020 04:03 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Syngenta AG MIR162
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BYRON STONE, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TEEL & MARONEY, PLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ABREO & CARTER
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRIAN FITZWATER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ELLIS & JUDD LAW OFFICE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OVERBOE LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JENNA LAIRD LEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TOURKOW CRELL ROSENBLATT & JOHNSTON LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CLARK LOVE & HUTSON, GP
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WALK & MURPHY, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HERITAGE LEGAL GROUP PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CARPENTER & SCHUMACHER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MORRIS LAING EVANS BROCK & KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PHILLIPPI LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MUSKE, MUSKE, SUHRHOFF LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: VAN KLEY & WALKER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RICHARD D. LARSON, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CLARK & CLARK P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WATTS GUERRA LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lamken
Represented By: Thomas Wiegand
Represented By: Eric R. Nitz
Represented By: William P. Ferranti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MCCLURE, THOMAS & THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICES OF LEONEL ALEJANDRO PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DILLON LEGAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CHURCH, CHURCH, HITTLE & ANTRIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHNSON LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOSEPH F. MANAK, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CONNORS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WALLACE LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HAWKINS LAW, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE LAW OFFICE OF MARK L EUREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MAYNES LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THOMAS P. CALHOUN, III, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF MIKE CRANE, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JEREMY P. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICES OF HANS A. BUEHLER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SORLING NORTHRUP ATTORNEYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WOJTALEWICZ LAW FIRM, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DANIEL M. HOMOLKA, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ATLEE HALL, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ANGEL, ISAACSON & TRACY, ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRENNAN STEIL S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DENNEY & BARRETT, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ALERDING CASTOR HEWITT LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WADLER, PERCHES, HUNDL & KERLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WHITE & ALLEN, P.A.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MCFARLAND LAW, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OKOON HINTERMEISTER, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GREAK LAW, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SHAMBERG, WOLF, MCDERMOTT & DEPUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FELLHEIMER LAW FIRM LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BLOOM GATES & WHITELEATHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THOMPSON, GARRETT & HINES
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RYAN MOORE & COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WOODS ROGERS PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WORTH LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRAND & MORELOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS R. FIELDS, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TULLY LAW OFFICE, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHN M. TOTTEN, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WEEKS & BRUCKER, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GAMBLE & RUSSELL, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FAITH INGLE SMITH LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JUSTIN HILL, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DOBBS LEGAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RAY, WINTON & KELLEY, PLLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: QUIRK & HUNTER, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MOORE, SUSLER, MCNUTT & WRIGLEY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FORBES LAW GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FOREMAN WATSON HOLTREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LOWE EKLUND WAKEFIELD CO., LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HENINGER GARRISON DAVIS, LLC
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison Jr.
Represented By: Christopher B. Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CRITCHFIELD CRITCHFIELD & JOHSON, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRIANA DEANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MAILANDER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE LAW OFFICE OF ROB TULLY PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HABUSH HABUSH & ROTTIER S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: VANDERGINST LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GARY T. GEE LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: COLE, EASLEY, SCIBA & WILLIAMS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DAVID R. ADELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DAVIS & CAMPBELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KEVIN W. LILES PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WRIGHT SCHIMMEL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PLEWS SHADLEY RACHER & BRAUN LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BOREN, OLVER AND COFFEY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HUME, SMITH, GEDDES, GREEN & SIMMONS, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: W. CALLOWAY HUFFAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ZEILINGER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: REICHERT LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SCHULTZ LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DEBORAH K. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RILEY-TANIS & ASSOCIATES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: COOTS, HENKE & WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RICHARDSON, PATRICK, WESTBROOK & BRICKMAN, LLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BERNATZ & VAN BEEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ARNDT BUSWELL & THORN S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: REICHERT WENNER, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BROCK LAW OFFICES PC LLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAMKIN & LAMKIN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BURNS CRONAUER & BROWN LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PHIPPS ANDERSON DEACON, LLP
Represented By: Martin John Phipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HENSLEY LEGAL GROUP PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHN L. JERNIGAN, III, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DARLING & DARLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KOENIG LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MARTZ & LUCAS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MAZZANTI LAW OFFICE, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NATHAN J. NOBLE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LEE J. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GREGG NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CRESS LAW GROUP, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHN E. TARBURTON, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BILL J. MILNER LAW OFFICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ROB TULLY LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KITTELSEN, BARRY, WELLINGTON, THOMPSON, & SCHLUESCHE, ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CHARLES HEAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JAMES M. PIETZ, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DREW YOUNG LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ALLEN, STEIN & DURBIN, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DANIEL QUIGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CONRAD F. CROPSEY, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BORING & BORING, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MARK A. ROEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PEMBERTON LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: COTTON, BOLTON, HOYCHICK & DOUGHTY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SCHWARZ LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BROOKS & OLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TERRIE HARMAN, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RHOADES MCKEE PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CLINE FARRELL CHRISTIE & LEE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NORMAN PALOUCEK & HERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHNSON & MOCK, PC LLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JEFFERSON & BREWER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GRIFFIN DIETRICH & ELLIOT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WINSTEIN, KAVENSKY & CUNNINGHAM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TUCKER & TUCKER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MEADOR & CRUMP, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STRITTMATTER LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WILLIS & WILLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MALONEY & CAMPOLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CUSTY LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FEARER, NYE, & CHADWICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MCNEELY STEPHENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BLAKEMAN & SCHROCK, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KELLEY LAW FIRM, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BIRD, JACOBSEN & STEVENS, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL ASHAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OUDERKIRK LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BOSE MCKINNEY & EVANS LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BROYLES KIGHT & RICAFORT, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WRIGHT & SCHULTE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KNUTH LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MAURO ARCHER AND ASSOCIATES PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BARRETT WYLIE, LLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FRUNDT & JOHNSON, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BROWN, DEPREZ & JOHNSON, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JASON SCHUTTE, KOEPKE & HILTABRAND ATTORNEY AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAURIE S. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: W. DEAN BELK, JR., Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE MCQUADES CO. LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STONE LAW OFFICE, P.L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RICCOLO, SEMELROTH, & HENNINGSEN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HART BELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRADFORD LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MORGAN & MEYERS, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HAJJAR PETERS, LLP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JEFF LINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ROBERTS LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ALLEN WELLMAN MCNEW HARVEY, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF HAMMELL & MURPHY PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JAMES & LARSON LAW, JAMES LAW, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DEWALD DEAVER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AARON D. HOVAN, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SONENBERG LAW LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL J. GALANIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: IRVIN L. MASCHING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY E. TONORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL GROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CHARLES E. CRONAUER & ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DELZER LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MILTNER LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PEN COSBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RICHARD L. COFFMAN, P.C., DBA The Coffman Law Firm
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KUHLMAN & LUCAS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE WINKIE LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KIZER, BONDS, HUGHES & BOWEN, PLLC
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GEORGE M. BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SEVER STOREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS A. NOE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TUCKER LAW PRACTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BARBARA J. SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MEIER, BRAGICICH & MOORE LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WOOD & RUE, PLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER H. POYNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ALEX KOENIGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FLYNN & SULLIVAN PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PATTERSON COMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TROYER & GOOD, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OBEAR, OVERHOLSER, HUFFER & RIDER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MORRISSEY, MORRISSEY & DALLUGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE CANTLIN LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SHERMAN HOFFMAN & HIPP, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CORNELL LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MARCH, MCMILLAN, DEJOODE & DUVALL, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LEO BOOTHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SPENCER GILLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE STROM LAW FIRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HECKER LAW GROUP, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CARABIN & SHAW, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HEINISCH & LOVEGROVE LAW OFFICE, PC LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HEHNER & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RICHARD RUSSELL, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FAFINSKI MARK & JOHNSON, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GORDON & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JINKS, CROW & DICKSON, P.C.
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WELD, RILEY, PRENN & RICCI S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BAKER, BODWELL, APPEL ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LANGDON & EMISON ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BARRETT, EASTERDAY, CUNNINGHAM & ESELGROTH, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MORNING LAW OFFICE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SATTERLEY AND KELLEY, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HOVLAND & RASMUS, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BRAU LAW OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: COPLEY ROTH & WILSON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CHARNETSKI, LACINA & CLOWER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CAUGHEY, LEGNER & FREEHILL ATTORNEYS AT LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MYERS HOCKEMEYER & MCNAGNY LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FITZGERALD LAW P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STOERZBACH LAW OFFICE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RANDLE & SAMMONS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE POPPE LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KC COHEN, LAWYER, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KEATON & KEATON PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WILLIAM THOMAS, Attorney at Law
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JANZEN AGRICULTURAL LAW, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GUSTAFSON GLUEK, PLLC
Represented By: David A. Goodwin
Represented By: Eric S. Taubel
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: STOCKARD, JOHNSTON, & BROWN, P.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HAMPTON & ROYCE, L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CULBERTSON & ALLEN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EMERICK, DIGGINS & ZABONA P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: THE LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. LAPOINTE, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KIRK LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GRAYBILL & WITCHER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BIGHAM LAW FIRM
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SIMON HERBERT & MCCLELLAND, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SMITH GARDNER SLUSKY LAZER POHREN & ROGERS LLP, NKA Smith Slusky Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MITCHELL C. CHANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CLENDENING JOHNSON & BOHRER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BARBER, SEGATTO, HOFFEE, WILKE, & CATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WILLADSEN & NEAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GELLHAUS & GELLHAUS, P. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WOLF ARDIS, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PATRICK A. ELWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FISHERBROYLES, LLP
Represented By: Eric Alan Isaacson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Toups
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ESPE LAW PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KATZ & KORIN, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WHITMAN, BABER, & SIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: REILING TEDER & SCHRIER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WAYNE J. LENNINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KRUSE & DAKIN LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance |