Porter, et al v. Graves, et al
Plaintiff: RICKEY RAY REDFORD, DONALD E. ALEXANDER, JOSEPH F. EDWARDS, ROBERT DEMASS, THOMAS H. PORTER, DENNIS HOUSE, RANDALL WILLIAM MURPHY, LESLIE KEITH KIMBALL, ROBERT FRANCIS SMITH, JR., ANTHONY R. PALOCIOZ and LYLE C. SANDERS
Petitioner: D'ANDRE WILLIAMS, DANIEL P. PARKER and REGINALD D. STEWART
Defendant / Appellee: CHARLES E. SIMMONS, HONORABLE BILL GRAVES and RAYMOND ROBERTS
Petitioner / Appellant: ARTIS SWAFFORD
Case Number: 20-3016
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 [10726522] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: appellant has not filed an entry of appearance. Notice of appearance due on 03/25/2020 for Artis Swafford. [20-3016] [Entered: 03/18/2020 11:54 AM]
March 4, 2020 [10722488] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1. Volume I - Pleadings. [20-3016] [Entered: 03/04/2020 11:44 AM]
February 28, 2020 [10721339] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or 1915 forms and appellant's brief due on 04/08/2020 for Artis Swafford. Record on appeal due for 10th circuit 03/20/2020. [20-3016] [Entered: 02/28/2020 11:34 AM]
February 28, 2020 [10721338] District court order denying 1915(b) motion. [20-3016] [Entered: 02/28/2020 11:32 AM]
February 5, 2020 [10715833] Order filed by Clerk of the Court to clarify the appellant to this appeal as set forth in the attached order. The court has opened this appeal on behalf of Mr. Swafford only. The court will not accept any document Mr. Swafford files or attempts to file on behalf of another individual. Served on 02/05/2020. [20-3016] [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:01 PM]
February 5, 2020 [10715764] Entry of appearance filed by Kathleen M. Barceleau for Mr. Charles E. Simmons, Mr. Raymond Roberts and Mr. Bill Graves. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/05/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-3016] [Entered: 02/05/2020 02:06 PM]
February 5, 2020 [10715738] Entry of appearance submitted by Kathleen M. Barceleau for Appellees Mr. Bill Graves, Mr. Raymond Roberts and Mr. Charles E. Simmons for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/05/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-3016] --[Edited 02/05/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 2/5/20] KMB [Entered: 02/05/2020 01:11 PM]
February 5, 2020 [10715694] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/03/2020. Ruling on 1915 forms due in district court 03/06/2020 for Artis Swafford. Notice of appearance due on 02/19/2020 for Bill Graves, Raymond Roberts and Charles E. Simmons. Notice of appearance due on 03/06/2020 for Artis Swafford. [20-3016] [Entered: 02/05/2020 11:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Porter, et al v. Graves, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKEY RAY REDFORD
Represented By: Stephen W. Kessler
Represented By: William J. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD E. ALEXANDER
Represented By: Stephen W. Kessler
Represented By: William J. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH F. EDWARDS
Represented By: Stephen W. Kessler
Represented By: William J. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT DEMASS
Represented By: Stephen W. Kessler
Represented By: William J. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS H. PORTER
Represented By: Stephen W. Kessler
Represented By: William J. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS HOUSE
Represented By: Stephen W. Kessler
Represented By: William J. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDALL WILLIAM MURPHY
Represented By: Stephen W. Kessler
Represented By: William J. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE KEITH KIMBALL
Represented By: Stephen W. Kessler
Represented By: William J. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT FRANCIS SMITH, JR.
Represented By: Stephen W. Kessler
Represented By: William J. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY R. PALOCIOZ
Represented By: Stephen W. Kessler
Represented By: William J. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYLE C. SANDERS
Represented By: Stephen W. Kessler
Represented By: William J. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: D'ANDRE WILLIAMS
Represented By: D'Andre Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DANIEL P. PARKER
Represented By: Daniel P. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REGINALD D. STEWART
Represented By: Reginald D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES E. SIMMONS
Represented By: Kathleen M. Barceleau
Represented By: Timothy G. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HONORABLE BILL GRAVES
Represented By: Lawrence J. Logback
Represented By: Kathleen M. Barceleau
Represented By: Timothy G. Madden
Represented By: Whitney L. Casement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAYMOND ROBERTS
Represented By: Kathleen M. Barceleau
Represented By: Whitney L. Casement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ARTIS SWAFFORD
Represented By: Artis Swafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?